Specht et al v. Google Inc et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Erich Specht and The Android's Dungeon Incorporated
Defendant: Google Inc, Open Handset Alliance, China Mobile Communications Corporation, KDDI Corporation, NTT DoCoMo Inc, Softbank Mobile Corp, Sprint Nextel, T-Mobile, Telecom Italia, Telefonica, Vodafone, AKN Semiconductor, Audience, ARM, Atheros Communications, Broadcom Corporation, Ericsson, Latel Corporation, Marvell Semiconductor Inc, Nvidia Corporation, Qualcomm Inc, SiRF Technology Holdings Inc, Synaptics Inc, Texas Instruments Incorporated, Asustek Computer Incorporated, HTC Corporation, Huawei Technologies, LG Electronics Inc, Motorola Inc, Samsung Electronics, Sony Ericsson, Toshiba Corporation, Ascender Corp, eBay Inc, LivingImage Ltd, Myriad, Nuance Communications Inc, Omron Software Co Ltd, Packet Video (PV), SkyPop, SoniVox, Aplix Corporation, Borqs, Noser Engineering Inc, TAT - The Astonishing Tribe AB, Teleca AB, Wind River and Garmin International Inc
Case Number: 1:2009cv02572
Filed: April 28, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Harry D. Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2011 397 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 08/17/11 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Court Reporter Contact Information: Gayle A. McGuigan, CSR, RMR, CRR (312) 435-6047, Gayle_McGuigan@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 1/10/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/20/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2012. (McGuigan, Gale)
December 20, 2011 396 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 09/01/11 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Court Reporter Contact Information: Gayle A. McGuigan, CSR, RMR, CRR (312) 435-6047, Gayle_McGuigan@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 1/10/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/20/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2012. (McGuigan, Gale)
December 16, 2011 395 USCA RECEIVED on 12/16/11 the supplemental record regarding notice of appeal 375 (dj, )
December 16, 2011 394 RE-TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal 375 (USCA no. 11-3317). (gel, )
December 15, 2011 393 LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 11-3317 consisting of 1 sealed Envelopes. (gcy, )
November 9, 2011 392 USCA RECEIVED on 11/9/2011 the long record regarding notice of appeal 375 . (gel, )
November 8, 2011 391 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal 375 (USCA no. 11-3317). (gel, ) (Main Document 391 replaced on 11/9/2011) (gel, ).
November 3, 2011 390 Featured Case ORDER Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 11/3/2011:(gcy, )
November 3, 2011 389 MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion to approve is granted. Plaintiff shall deposit a Cashier's Check with the Clerk of the Court in the amount of $19,586.53, instanter, in lieu of posting a supersedas bond. The funds shall be held by the Clerk until further order of Court. [For further detail see separate order(s).] Mailed notices (gcy, )
October 31, 2011 388 NOTICE of Motion by Martin Joseph Murphy for presentment of motion for bond 387 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 11/3/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Murphy, Martin)
October 31, 2011 387 MOTION by Plaintiffs Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht for bond approval (Murphy, Martin)
October 26, 2011 386 MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Plaintiffs' Motion to vacate 382 is denied. Mailed notice (wp, )
October 25, 2011 385 REPLY by Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht to response to motion 384 by Defendant, Google. (Murphy, Martin)
October 24, 2011 384 RESPONSE by Google Inc to MOTION by Plaintiffs Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht to vacate memorandum opinion and order 360 382 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Dunning, Jeffrey)
October 20, 2011 383 NOTICE of Motion by Martin Joseph Murphy for presentment of motion to vacate, motion for relief 382 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 10/26/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Murphy, Martin)
October 20, 2011 382 MOTION by Plaintiffs Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht to vacate memorandum opinion and order 360 (Murphy, Martin)
October 14, 2011 381 SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht (Murphy, Martin)
October 13, 2011 380 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 375 ; USCA Case No. 11-3317 (gcy, )
October 13, 2011 379 NOTICE of Case Opening: USCA No. 11-3317. (gcy, )
October 13, 2011 378 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal 375 . Notified counsel (gel, )
October 13, 2011 377 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record. (gel, )
October 12, 2011 376 DOCKETING Statement by Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht regarding notice of appeal 375 (Murphy, Martin)
October 12, 2011 375 NOTICE of appeal by Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht regarding orders 374 , 373 Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0752-6465019. (Murphy, Martin)
October 6, 2011 374 ENTERED JUDGMENT on 10/6/2011:Mailed notice(wp, )
October 6, 2011 373 WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 10/6/2011: For the reasons stated herein, Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Judgment under Fed. R. Civ.P 54(b) is granted.Mailed notice(wp, )
September 14, 2011 370 MANDATE of USCA dated 8/22/11 regarding notice of appeal 312 ; DISMISSED ; USCA No. 11-1689. (gcy, )
September 13, 2011 371 LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 11-1689. No record to return. (gcy, )
August 29, 2011 369 NOTICE of Motion by Martin Joseph Murphy for presentment of motion to amend/correct 368 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 9/1/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Murphy, Martin)
August 29, 2011 368 MOTION by Plaintiffs Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht to amend/correct final judgment pursuant to Rule 60 (b) (Murphy, Martin)
August 17, 2011 367 Featured Case ORDER Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 8/17/2011.(mjc, )
August 17, 2011 366 MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion for enforcement is granted and will become effective upon the posting of a supersedeas bond in the amount of $21,000.00. In lieu of a bond, Plaintiffs may deposit $21,000.00 with the Clerk of the Court not to be disbursed until further order of the court. [For further detail see separate order(s).]Mailed notice (mjc, )
August 9, 2011 365 Amended NOTICE of Motion by Martin Joseph Murphy for presentment of motion to stay, motion for relief, 363 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 8/17/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Murphy, Martin)
August 2, 2011 364 NOTICE of Motion by Martin Joseph Murphy for presentment of motion to stay, motion for relief, 363 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 8/4/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Murphy, Martin)
August 2, 2011 363 MOTION by Plaintiffs Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht to stay regarding memorandum opinion and order 360 , text entry, 359 (Murphy, Martin)
July 27, 2011 362 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 7/27/2011:Mailed notice(wp, )
July 27, 2011 361 MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:ENTER MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motions to Strike are denied. Google's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Sanctions is denied.Mailed notice (wp, )
June 27, 2011 360 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 6/27/2011:Mailed notice(wp, )
June 27, 2011 359 MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:ENTER MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Defendant's Bill of Costs is granted in part and denied in part. Defendant can recover $18,213.65 in transcript, court reporter, and video fees; $300.00 in document fees; $495.00 in process service fees; and $55.00 in witness fees. Plaintiffs are liable to Defendant for a total of $19,063.65 in costs.Mailed notice (wp, )
June 22, 2011 358 SUR-REPLY by Respondent Novack and Macey LLP to motion for attorney fees, motion for sanctions 314 (Macey, Eric)
June 22, 2011 357 MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:P. Andrew Fleming and Novack and Macey LLP's Motion for leave to file sur-reply 355 is granted. Mailed notice (wp, )
June 17, 2011 356 NOTICE of Motion by Eric Neal Macey for presentment of motion for leave to file 355 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 6/22/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Macey, Eric)
June 17, 2011 355 MOTION by Respondent Novack and Macey LLP for leave to file Instanter Sur-Reply in Opposition to Google's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Sanctions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Macey, Eric)
June 9, 2011 354 REPLY by Martin J Murphy to MOTION by Counter Defendants Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Erich Specht, Plaintiffs Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht to strike MOTION by Defendant Google 333 , MOTION by Defendant Google Inc for attorney feesMOTION by Defendant Google Inc for sanctions 314 (Murphy, Martin)
June 9, 2011 353 REPLY by Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht(an Individual), Erich Specht to MOTION by Counter Defendants Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Erich Specht, Plaintiffs Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht to strike MOTION by Defendant Google 333 , MOTION by Defendant Google Inc for attorney feesMOTION by Defendant Google Inc for sanctions 314 , MOTION by Counter Defendants Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, Plaintiffs Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht to strike MOTION by Defendant Google Inc for attorne 332 (Murphy, Martin)
June 2, 2011 352 REPLY by Defendant Google Inc Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Attorney's Fees and Sanctions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Finn, Herbert)
May 31, 2011 350 MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:P. Andrew Fleming and Novack and Macey LLP's Motion for leave to file excess pages 345 is granted.Mailed notice (wp, )
May 19, 2011 349 SEALED DOCUMENT by Third Party Defendant Martin J Murphy Exhibits 1-5 and (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6-10)(Murphy, Martin)
May 19, 2011 348 RESPONSE by Martin J Murphyin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Google Inc for attorney feesMOTION by Defendant Google Inc for sanctions 314 (Murphy, Martin)
May 19, 2011 347 RESPONSE by Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Spechtin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Google Inc for attorney feesMOTION by Defendant Google Inc for sanctions 314 (Murphy, Martin)
May 19, 2011 346 NOTICE of Motion by Eric Neal Macey for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 345 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 5/24/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Macey, Eric)
May 19, 2011 345 MOTION by Respondent Novack and Macey LLP for leave to file excess pages (Macey, Eric)
May 19, 2011 344 APPENDIX response in opposition to motion 343 of Google Inc. for Attorney's Fees and Sanctions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E-G, # 2 Exhibit H-J)(Macey, Eric)
May 19, 2011 343 RESPONSE by Novack and Macey LLPin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Google Inc for attorney feesMOTION by Defendant Google Inc for sanctions 314 (Macey, Eric)
May 19, 2011 342 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 04/28/11 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Court Reporter Contact Information: Gayle A. McGuigan, 312/435-6047, Gayle_McGuigan@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/9/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/20/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/17/2011. (McGuigan, Gale)
May 19, 2011 341 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 05/12/11 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Court Reporter Contact Information: Gayle A. McGuigan, 312/435-6047, Gayle_McGuigan@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/9/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/20/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/17/2011. (McGuigan, Gale)
May 12, 2011 351 MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Google's Motion for protective order 337 is granted. The Court orders plaintiffs to destroy or return all copies of the invoice and the court awards Google costs. Google's motion to strike Exhibit 1 from the record is granted. Google's response to the motion to strike to be filed by 6/2/2011. Plaintiffs reply brief to be filed by 6/9/2011. Mailed notice (wp, )
May 11, 2011 340 SEALED DOCUMENT by Counter Defendants Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, Plaintiffs Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht Exhibits to ECF 339 Response in Opposition to Google's Motion for a Protective Order (Murphy, Martin)
May 11, 2011 339 SEALED DOCUMENT by Counter Defendants Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, Plaintiffs Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht Response in Opposition to Google's Motion For a Protective Order ECF 337 (Murphy, Martin)
May 9, 2011 338 NOTICE of Motion by Herbert H. Finn for presentment of motion for protective order 337 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 5/12/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Finn, Herbert)
May 9, 2011 337 MOTION by Defendant Google Inc for protective order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Finn, Herbert)
May 2, 2011 335 REPLY by Defendant Google Inc in Support of its Bill of Costs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Finn, Herbert)
April 28, 2011 336 MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Defendant's Motion for Leave to File an Oversize Brief 315 is granted. Plaintiffs' counsel shall file their responses to Defendant's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Sanctions 314 by 5/19/2011. Google shall reply by 6/2/2011. Andrew Fleming of Novack and Macey LLP need only respond to Defendant's claim for sanctions under 28 U.S.C. Section 1927. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiffs' Motions to Strike 332 333 by 5/19/2011. The Court grants Defendant leave to file an oversize brief in response. Plaintiffs shall reply by 6/2/2011. The Court grants Plaintiffs leave to file an oversize brief in reply. The Court will reply by mail in one consolidated opinion on all Motions.Mailed notice (wp, )
April 26, 2011 334 NOTICE of Motion by Martin Joseph Murphy for presentment of motion to strike, motion for relief,,,, 333 , motion to strike, motion for relief,,,, 332 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 4/28/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Murphy, Martin)
April 26, 2011 333 MOTION by Counter Defendants Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Erich Specht, Plaintiffs Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht to strike MOTION by Defendant Google Inc for attorney feesMOTION by Defendant Google Inc for sanctions 314 Motion to Strike Sanctions (Murphy, Martin)
April 26, 2011 332 MOTION by Counter Defendants Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, Plaintiffs Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht to strike MOTION by Defendant Google Inc for attorney feesMOTION by Defendant Google Inc for sanctions 314 (Murphy, Martin)
April 19, 2011 331 USCA RECEIVED on 4/19/2011 the long record regarding notice of appeal 312 . (gel, )
April 19, 2011 330 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal 312 (USCA no. 11-1689). (gel, )
April 18, 2011 329 MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Googles' Motion for Attorney Fees and Sanctions now set for 4/21/2011 is rescheduled for 4/28/2011 at 09:30 AM.Mailed notice (wp, )
April 13, 2011 328 OBJECTIONS by Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht to bill of costs 321 (Murphy, Martin)
April 6, 2011 327 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Novack and Macey LLP by Eric Neal Macey (Macey, Eric)
March 24, 2011 326 MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Google's Motion for Attorney's fees and Sanctions and the Motion for leave to file oversized brief reset for 4/21/2011 at 09:30 AM.Mailed notice (wp, )
March 24, 2011 325 MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Defendant Google filed a Bill of Costs on 3/23/2011. Plaintiffs shall respond to the Bill of Costs by 4/13/2011. If it chooses to file a reply, Google shall do so by 4/30/2011. The Court will rule by mail.Mailed notice (wp, )
March 23, 2011 324 NOTICE Of Case Opening: USCA 11-1689. (gcy, )
March 23, 2011 323 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 312 ; USCA Case No. 11-1689. (gcy, )
March 23, 2011 322 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 01/11/11 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Court Reporter Contact Information: Gayle A. McGuigan, CSR, RMR, CRR, 312.435.6047, Gayle_McGuigan@ilnd.uscourt.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/13/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2011. (McGuigan, Gale)
March 23, 2011 321 BILL of Costs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C1, # 4 Exhibit C2, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Nelson, Cameron)
March 23, 2011 320 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal 312 . Notified counsel (gel, )
March 23, 2011 319 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record. (gel, )
March 22, 2011 318 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Google Inc [Memorandum in Support of Motion for Attorney's Fees and Sanctions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I part 1, # 10 Exhibit I part 2, # 11 Exhibit J part 1, # 12 Exhibit J part 2, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L)(Finn, Herbert)
March 22, 2011 317 NOTICE of Motion by Herbert H. Finn for presentment of motion for leave to file 315 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 3/29/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Finn, Herbert)
March 22, 2011 316 NOTICE of Motion by Herbert H. Finn for presentment of motion for attorney fees, motion for sanctions 314 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 3/29/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Finn, Herbert)
March 22, 2011 315 MOTION by Defendant Google Inc for leave to file oversize brief in support of its motion for attorney's fees and sanctions (Finn, Herbert)
March 22, 2011 314 MOTION by Defendant Google Inc for attorney fees, MOTION by Defendant Google Inc for sanctions (Finn, Herbert)
March 22, 2011 313 DOCKETING Statement by Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht regarding notice of appeal 312 (Murphy, Martin)
March 22, 2011 312 NOTICE of appeal by Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht regarding orders 310 , 311 Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0752-5821622. (Murphy, Martin)
February 24, 2011 311 ENTERED JUDGMENT on 2/24/2011:Mailed notice(wp, )
February 24, 2011 310 MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Plaintiffs' Motion for reconsideration is denied on all counts. Google's oral motion to dismiss without prejudice Counts II, IV, V, VI, VII of the counterclaim is granted. The Court having previously granted Google's Motion for summary judgment on Counts I-V of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, and Counts I and III of Google's counterclaim. Judgment is hereby final for purposes of appeal. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (wp, )
February 17, 2011 309 MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing and motion reset for 2/24/2011 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (wp, )
February 7, 2011 307 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12-15-10 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Court Reporter Contact Information: KRISTA BURGESON, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/28/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2011. (Burgeson, Krista)
February 3, 2011 308 MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: P. Andrew Fleming, John F. Shonkwiler, Richard G. Douglas, John Harlow, Jr. And Christopher G. Dean Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiffs is granted. The Court will review plaintiffs' motionfor reconsideration and rule on 2/23/2011 at 9:00 a.m. Attorney Patrick A. Fleming; John B Haarlow, Jr; John F. Shonkwiler; Christopher Graham Dean and Richard George Douglass terminated. Mailed notice (mjc, )
January 31, 2011 306 NOTICE of Motion by Patrick A. Fleming for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 305 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 2/3/2011 at 09:00 AM. (Fleming, Patrick)
January 31, 2011 305 MOTION by counsel for Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporated to withdraw as attorney (Fleming, Patrick)
January 31, 2011 304 NOTICE of Motion by Martin Joseph Murphy for presentment of motion for reconsideration, 302 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 2/3/2011 at 09:00 AM. (Murphy, Martin)
January 31, 2011 303 SEALED EXHIBIT by Counter Defendants Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, Plaintiffs Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht regarding MOTION by Counter Defendants Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, Plaintiffs Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht for reconsideration of Court's Order 296 GMOTION by Counter Defendants Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, Plaintiffs Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht for reconsideration of Court's Order 296 G 302 (Murphy, Martin)
January 31, 2011 302 MOTION by Counter Defendants Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, Plaintiffs Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht for reconsideration of Court's Order 296 Granting Summary Judgment (Murphy, Martin)
January 31, 2011 301 MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing reset for 2/3/2011 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (wp, )
January 11, 2011 300 MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Status hearing held on 1/11/2011. Status hearing set for 2/2/2011 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (wp, )
December 22, 2010 298 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/2/10 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Court Reporter Contact Information: KRISTA BURGESON, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 1/12/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/24/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/22/2011. (Burgeson, Krista)
December 22, 2010 297 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 09/30/10 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Court Reporter Contact Information: KRISTA BURGESON, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 1/12/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/24/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/22/2011. (Burgeson, Krista)
December 17, 2010 296 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 12/17/2010:Mailed notice(wp, )
December 17, 2010 295 MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:ENTER MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Defendant Google's Motion for Summary Judgment is granted for Counts I-V of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, and for Counts I and III of Google's Counterclaim. Status hearing set for 1/11/2011 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (wp, )
December 15, 2010 299 MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike 292 is denied. Plaintiffs' response to be filed by 12/15/2010. Mailed notice (wp, )
December 15, 2010 294 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporated Brief in Response to Googles Reply in Support of its Statement of Facts (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Fleming, Patrick)
December 10, 2010 293 NOTICE of Motion by Patrick A. Fleming for presentment of Sealed motion, 292 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 12/15/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Fleming, Patrick)
December 10, 2010 292 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht to Strike Google's "Reply" to Plaintiffs' Response to Google's LR56.1 Statement or, in the Alternative, to Allow Plaintiffs to File a Response to Google's "Reply" (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fleming, Patrick)
November 8, 2010 291 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 10/14/2010 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Court Reporter Contact Information: Mary C. Kelly, 708-769-0950, mckellycsr@sbcglobal.net. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 11/29/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/9/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/7/2011. (td, )
November 2, 2010 290 MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Google's Unopposed Motion for extension of time to 11/2/2010 in which to file its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment regarding is granted. Mailed notice (wp, )
November 2, 2010 289 SEALED REPLY by Google Inc to sealed response 271 To Google's LR 56.1 Statement of Uncontested Material Facts (Finn, Herbert)
November 2, 2010 288 DECLARATION of Cameron M. Nelson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Nelson, Cameron)
November 2, 2010 287 SEALED REPLY by Google Inc to MOTION by Defendant Google Inc for summary judgment of abandonment 252 (Finn, Herbert)
November 2, 2010 286 RESPONSE by Google Inc to MOTION by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporated to strike statement,, 256 and Certain of Google's Summary Judgment Exhibits 277 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Finn, Herbert)
November 2, 2010 285 SEALED RESPONSE by Google Inc to sealed document 272 (Finn, Herbert)
November 2, 2010 284 REPLY by Defendant Google Inc in support of motion to exclude due to plaintiffs' untimely document production and interrogatory responses (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Finn, Herbert)
October 26, 2010 283 NOTICE of Motion by Herbert H. Finn for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief 282 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 11/2/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Finn, Herbert)
October 26, 2010 282 MOTION by Defendant Google Inc for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for summary judgment 252 [Unopposed] (Finn, Herbert)
October 26, 2010 281 NOTICE by Mariah E Moran of Change of Address (Moran, Mariah)
October 26, 2010 280 NOTICE by Jonathan M. Cyrluk of Change of Address and Firm Name (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
October 14, 2010 279 MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Plaintiffs' Motion for leave to file excess pages 266 is granted.Plaintiffs' Motion to clarify 268 is denied. The Court will rule on plaintiffs' motion to strike when it rules on the pending motion for summary judgment. Mailed notice (wp, )
October 11, 2010 278 NOTICE of Motion by Patrick A. Fleming for presentment of motion to strike, motion for relief 277 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 10/14/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Fleming, Patrick)
October 11, 2010 277 MOTION by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporated to strike statement,, 256 and Certain of Google's Summary Judgment Exhibits (Fleming, Patrick)
October 8, 2010 276 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporated Plaintiffs' Appendix of Summary Judgment Exhibits Part 4 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 30, # 2 Exhibit Part 31, # 3 Exhibit Part 32, # 4 Exhibit Part 33, # 5 Exhibit Part 34, # 6 Exhibit Part 35, # 7 Exhibit Part 36, # 8 Exhibit Part 37, # 9 Exhibit Part 38, # 10 Exhibit Part 39)(Fleming, Patrick)
October 8, 2010 275 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporated Plaintiffs' Appendix of Summary Judgment Exhibits Part 3 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 20, # 2 Exhibit Part 21, # 3 Exhibit Part 22, # 4 Exhibit Part 23, # 5 Exhibit Part 24, # 6 Exhibit Part 25, # 7 Exhibit Part 26, # 8 Exhibit Part 27, # 9 Exhibit Part 28, # 10 Exhibit Part 29)(Fleming, Patrick)
October 8, 2010 274 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporated Plaintiffs' Appendix of Summary Judgment Exhibits Part 2 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 10, # 2 Exhibit Part 11, # 3 Exhibit Part 12, # 4 Exhibit Part 13, # 5 Exhibit Part 14, # 6 Exhibit Part 15, # 7 Exhibit Part 16, # 8 Exhibit Part 17, # 9 Exhibit Part 18, # 10 Exhibit Part 19)(Fleming, Patrick)
October 8, 2010 273 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporated Plaintiffs' Appendix of Summary Judgment Exhibits Part 1 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 1, # 2 Exhibit Part 2, # 3 Exhibit Part 3, # 4 Exhibit Part 4, # 5 Exhibit Part 5, # 6 Exhibit Part 6, # 7 Exhibit Part 7, # 8 Exhibit Part 8, # 9 Exhibit Part 9)(Fleming, Patrick)
October 8, 2010 272 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporated Local Rule 56.1 Statement of Additional Facts that Require the Denial of Summary Judgment (Fleming, Patrick)
October 8, 2010 271 SEALED RESPONSE to Google's Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Fleming, Patrick)
October 8, 2010 270 SEALED RESPONSE by Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporated to MOTION by Defendant Google Inc for summary judgment of abandonment 252 (Fleming, Patrick)
October 8, 2010 269 NOTICE of Motion by Patrick A. Fleming for presentment of motion to clarify 268 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 10/14/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Fleming, Patrick)
October 8, 2010 268 MOTION by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporated to clarify or in the Alternative to Reconsider Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (Fleming, Patrick)
October 8, 2010 267 NOTICE of Motion by Patrick A. Fleming for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 266 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 10/14/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Fleming, Patrick)
October 8, 2010 266 MOTION by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporated for leave to file excess pages in Response to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment of Abandonment (Fleming, Patrick)
October 8, 2010 265 RESPONSE by Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporatedin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Google Inc exclude under federal rule of civil procedure rule 37(C)(1) due to plaintiffs' untimely document production and iterrogatory responses 261 (Fleming, Patrick)
September 30, 2010 264 MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:For the reasons stated in open Court, Google's Motion to Exclude Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 37 (C)(1) Due to Plaintiffs' Untimely Document Product and Interrogatory Responses 261 is continued. Plaintiffs' deadline to file their response to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment is extended to 10/8/2010. Google's reply brief deadline remains 10/26/2010. Mailed notice (wp, )
September 28, 2010 263 NOTICE of Motion by Herbert H. Finn for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 261 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 9/30/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Finn, Herbert)
September 28, 2010 262 MEMORANDUM by Google Inc in support of motion for miscellaneous relief 261 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-I)(Finn, Herbert)
September 28, 2010 261 MOTION by Defendant Google Inc exclude under federal rule of civil procedure rule 37(C)(1) due to plaintiffs' untimely document production and iterrogatory responses (Finn, Herbert)
September 27, 2010 260 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 08/24/2010 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Court Reporter Contact Information: KRISTA BURGESON, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/18/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/28/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2010. (Burgeson, Krista)
September 2, 2010 258 NOTICE by John B Haarlow, Jr of Change of Address (Haarlow, John)
August 24, 2010 257 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Google Inc Exhibit 31 regarding statement,, 256 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 32, # 2 Exhibit 33, # 3 Exhibit 34, # 4 Exhibit 35, # 5 Exhibit 36, # 6 Exhibit 37, # 7 Exhibit 38, # 8 Exhibit 39, # 9 Exhibit 40, # 10 Exhibit 41, # 11 Exhibit 42, # 12 Exhibit 43, # 13 Exhibit 44, # 14 Exhibit 45, # 15 Exhibit 46, # 16 Exhibit 47, # 17 Exhibit 48, # 18 Exhibit 49, # 19 Exhibit 50, # 20 Exhibit 51, # 21 Exhibit 52, # 22 Exhibit 53, # 23 Exhibit 54, # 24 Exhibit 55, # 25 Exhibit 56, # 26 Exhibit 57, # 27 Exhibit 58, # 28 Exhibit 59, # 29 Exhibit 60)(Finn, Herbert)
August 24, 2010 256 STATEMENT by Google Inc of uncontested material facts in support of motion for summary judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Notice of Filing 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30)(Finn, Herbert)(RESTRICTED) Modified on 8/24/2010 (cdy, ).
August 20, 2010 255 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Herbert H. Finn for presentment of motion for summary judgment 252 , motion for leave to file excess pages 253 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 8/24/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Finn, Herbert)
August 20, 2010 254 Featured Case MEMORANDUM by Google Inc in support of motion for summary judgment 252 (Finn, Herbert)
August 20, 2010 253 Featured Case MOTION by Defendant Google Inc for leave to file excess pages brief in support of its motion for summary judgment (Finn, Herbert)
August 20, 2010 252 Featured Case MOTION by Defendant Google Inc for summary judgment of abandonment (Finn, Herbert)
August 6, 2010 251 Featured Case USCA ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Google, Inc. and AT&T Mobility, LLC file responses to the petition by August 20, 2010. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that District Judge Leinenweber is invited to file a response, if he chooses to do so, by August 20, 2010. USCA no. 10-2823. (gcy, )
August 3, 2010 250 Featured Case NOTICE of Docketing-Short Form; USCA no. 10-2823. (gcy, )
August 2, 2010 249 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5-11-10 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Court Reporter Contact Information: KRISTA BURGESON, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/2/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/1/2010. (Burgeson, Krista)
August 2, 2010 248 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 7-27-10 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Court Reporter Contact Information: KRISTA BURGESON, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/2/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/1/2010. (Burgeson, Krista)
August 2, 2010 247 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 7-20-10 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Court Reporter Contact Information: KRISTA BURGESON, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/2/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/1/2010. (Burgeson, Krista)
August 2, 2010 246 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 6-17-10 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Court Reporter Contact Information: KRISTA BURGESON, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/2/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/1/2010. (Burgeson, Krista)
August 2, 2010 245 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5-27-10 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Court Reporter Contact Information: KRISTA BURGESON, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/2/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/1/2010. (Burgeson, Krista)
August 2, 2010 244 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 4-22-10 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Court Reporter Contact Information: KRISTA BURGESON, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/2/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/1/2010. (Burgeson, Krista)
August 2, 2010 243 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 3-24-10 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Court Reporter Contact Information: KRISTA BURGESON, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/2/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/1/2010. (Burgeson, Krista)
August 2, 2010 242 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2-23-10 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Court Reporter Contact Information: KRISTA BURGESON, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/2/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/1/2010. (Burgeson, Krista)
August 2, 2010 241 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2-17-10 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Court Reporter Contact Information: KRISTA BURGESON, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/2/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/1/2010. (Burgeson, Krista)
August 2, 2010 240 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 1-7-10 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Court Reporter Contact Information: KRISTA BURGESON, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/2/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/1/2010. (Burgeson, Krista)
August 2, 2010 239 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Defendant's motion for clarification 237 reset to 8/24/2010 at 09:30 AM.Mailed notice (mad, )
July 30, 2010 238 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Herbert H. Finn for presentment of motion to clarify 237 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 8/3/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Finn, Herbert)
July 30, 2010 237 Featured Case MOTION by Defendant Google Inc to clarify scheduling order regarding timing of dispositive motions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Finn, Herbert)
July 27, 2010 236 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Plaintiffs' Motion for extension of time 206 is denied. The Court will allow the parties to depose Linda Tong. Mailed notice (wp, )
July 27, 2010 235 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Before the Court are Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file third amended complaint 217 and motion for disqualification 227 . For the reasons stated below, both motions are denied. Defendant's motion to strike the third amended complaint 221 is granted. The third amended complaint 216 is stricken.Mailed notice (wp, )
July 26, 2010 234 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporated by Richard George Douglass (Douglass, Richard)
July 26, 2010 233 Featured Case RESPONSE by Defendant Google Inc to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum in Support of their Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D, # 2 Exhibit E-H, # 3 Exhibit I-K)(Nelson, Cameron)
July 26, 2010 232 Featured Case REPLY by Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht to MOTION by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporated to disqualify judge pursuant to 28 USC § 455 227 (Fleming, Patrick)
July 26, 2010 231 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Google Inc /Brief Regarding Plaintiffs' Request For Recusal (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Nelson, Cameron)
July 23, 2010 230 Featured Case RESPONSE by Google Incin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporated to disqualify judge pursuant to 28 USC § 455 227 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C)(Nelson, Cameron)
July 23, 2010 229 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Patrick A. Fleming for presentment of motion to disqualify judge 227 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 7/27/2010 at 09:00 AM. (Fleming, Patrick)
July 23, 2010 228 Featured Case MEMORANDUM by Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporated in support of motion to disqualify judge 227 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fleming, Patrick)
July 23, 2010 227 Featured Case MOTION by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporated to disqualify judge pursuant to 28 USC § 455 (Fleming, Patrick)
July 22, 2010 226 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporated Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4, # 2 Exhibit 5-11)(Fleming, Patrick)
July 20, 2010 225 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Plaintiffs' Motion for leave to file third amended complaint 217 is entered and continued to 7/27/2010 at 9:00 a.m. Additional briefs to be filed by 7/22/2010. Defendant's Motion to compel 219 is granted. Defendant's Motion to strike 221 is entered and continued to 7/27/2010 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (wp, )
July 19, 2010 224 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporated Memorandum In Support Of Their Motion For Leave To File Third Amended Complaint And In Opposition To Googles Motion To Strike The Same (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B, # 2 Exhibit C-E)(Shonkwiler, John)
July 16, 2010 223 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Herbert H. Finn for presentment of motion to strike, motion for relief 221 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 7/20/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Finn, Herbert)
July 16, 2010 222 Featured Case RESPONSE by Defendant Google Inc to motion for leave to file 217 and memorandum in support of its motion to strike same (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Finn, Herbert)
July 16, 2010 221 Featured Case MOTION by Defendant Google Inc to strike amended complaint, 216 (Finn, Herbert)
July 16, 2010 220 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Herbert H. Finn for presentment of motion to compel 219 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 7/20/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Finn, Herbert)
July 16, 2010 219 Featured Case MOTION by Defendant Google Inc to compel (and Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Compel) Plaintiffs to Attend Schedulded Depositions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-K)(Finn, Herbert)
July 15, 2010 218 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by John F. Shonkwiler for presentment of motion for leave to file 217 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 7/20/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Shonkwiler, John)
July 15, 2010 217 Featured Case MOTION by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporated for leave to file Third Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Shonkwiler, John)
July 14, 2010 Featured Case SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership, Sprint Nextel Corporation, T-Mobile USA, Inc. (ef, )
July 13, 2010 216 Featured Case THIRD AMENDED complaint by Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporated against Google Inc, Sprint Nextel Corporation, AT&T Mobility LLC, T-Mobile USA, Inc., Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Shonkwiler, John)
June 25, 2010 215 Featured Case MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 6/25/2010:Mailed notice(wp, )
June 25, 2010 214 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:ENTER MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Compel 192 is granted in part. Mr. Murphy must be available for a second deposition of no more than seven hours with all costs and reasonable attorneys' fees to be paid by plaintiffs. Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for a Protective Order 201 is denied. Defendant's Motion for Sanctions 192 is granted in part. Plaintiffs' attorney, Mr. Fleming is ordered to pay a court fine of $1,000.00. Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Sanctions 201 is denied. Mailed notice (wp, )
June 21, 2010 212 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Ruling date stricken. The Court will rule by mail.Mailed notice (wp, )
June 21, 2010 211 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: The Court's oral ruling date on plaintiffs' cross motion for protective order now set for 6/22/2010 is reset by the court for 6/24/2010 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (wp, )
June 17, 2010 213 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of time to complete oral discovery 206 is entered and continued 7/27/2010 at 9:00a.m. Plaintiffs' to supplement its motion by 7/21/2010. Mailed notice (wp, )
June 16, 2010 210 Featured Case RESPONSE by Google Incin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht for extension of time to Complete Oral Discovery 206 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Nelson, Cameron)
June 16, 2010 209 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:The oral ruling set for 6/22/2010 is stricken. The Court will rule by mail on Google's motion to compel 192 and Specht's cross motion for protective order 201 .Mailed notice (wp, )
June 9, 2010 208 Featured Case REPLY by Plaintiffs Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht to motion for protective order 201 Reply Memorandum In Support of Their Cross-Motion For a Protective Order and For Sanctions Against Google (Fleming, Patrick)
June 8, 2010 207 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Patrick A. Fleming for presentment of extension of time 206 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 6/17/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Fleming, Patrick)
June 8, 2010 206 Featured Case MOTION by Plaintiffs Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht for extension of time to Complete Oral Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A - F)(Fleming, Patrick)
June 2, 2010 204 Featured Case REPLY by Counter Claimant Google Inc in support of its motion to compel and for sanctions in relation to the deposition of Martin Murphy (Nelson, Cameron)
May 27, 2010 205 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Under the conditions set forth in open court, Google Inc's Motion to compel 199 is granted. Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' cross motion for entry of a protective to be filed by 6/2/2010. Plaintiffs' reply brief to be filed by 6/9/2010. The Court will rule orally on 6/22/2010 at 09:00 AM. Defendant's reply to its motion to compel to be filed by 6/2/2010.Mailed notice (wp, )
May 25, 2010 203 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporated Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel and for Sanctions and in Support of Motion for Protective Order and for Sanctions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A part 1, # 2 Exhibit Ex A part 2, # 3 Exhibit Exs B through G)(Fleming, Patrick)
May 25, 2010 202 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Patrick A. Fleming for presentment of motion for protective order 201 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 5/27/2010 at 9:30 AM. (Fleming, Patrick)
May 25, 2010 201 Featured Case MOTION by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporated for protective order and for sanctions (Fleming, Patrick)
May 25, 2010 200 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Herbert H. Finn for presentment of motion to compel 199 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 5/27/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Finn, Herbert)
May 25, 2010 199 Featured Case MOTION by Defendant Google Inc to compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-7)(Finn, Herbert)
May 11, 2010 198 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Parties granted leave to file oversize briefs.Mailed notice (wp, )
May 11, 2010 197 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: For the reasons stated in open court, Plaintiff Specht's Motion to Compel is denied. Plaintiffs' response to defendant Google's Motion to compel and for sanctions to be filed by 5/25/2010. Defendant's reply brief is due by 6/1/2010. The Court will rule orally on 6/22/2010 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (wp, )
May 5, 2010 196 Featured Case Amended NOTICE of Motion by Herbert H. Finn for presentment of motion to compel 192 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 5/11/2010 at 09:00 AM. (Finn, Herbert)
May 4, 2010 195 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Claimant Google Inc by Cameron Matthew Nelson (Nelson, Cameron)
May 4, 2010 194 Featured Case Notice of Motion to Compel and for Sanctions Relating to the Deposition of Martin Murphy NOTICE of Motion by Cameron Matthew Nelson for presentment of (Nelson, Cameron)
May 4, 2010 193 Featured Case MEMORANDUM by Google Inc(a Delaware corporation) in support of motion to compel 192 and for Sanctions Relating to the Deposition of Martin Murphy (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R)(Nelson, Cameron)
May 4, 2010 192 Featured Case MOTION by Counter Claimant Google Inc to compel and for Sanctions Relating to the Deposition of Martin Murphy (Nelson, Cameron)
April 28, 2010 189 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Defendants Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, Plaintiffs Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht by Christopher Graham Dean (Dean, Christopher)
April 22, 2010 191 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Google Inc's Motion to compel 186 is granted in part and denied in part.Mailed notice (wp, )
April 22, 2010 190 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Google's Motion for leave to file a brief surreply 183 is denied. Mailed notice (wp, )
April 21, 2010 188 Featured Case RESPONSE by Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Spechtin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Google Inc to compel Plaintiffs to Respond to Google's Interrogatory No. 12 186 (Fleming, Patrick)
April 21, 2010 187 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Herbert H. Finn for presentment of motion to compel 186 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 4/22/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Finn, Herbert)
April 9, 2010 182 Featured Case ANSWER to counterclaim and affirmative defenses by Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht(Shonkwiler, John)
April 8, 2010 181 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: The Ruling date on Plaintiffs Motion to Compel is reset for 5/11/2010 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (wp, )
March 24, 2010 180 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Plaintiffs' Motion for reconsideration 176 is granted. Motorola's Motion to Quash is denied as moot. Mailed notice (wp, )
March 16, 2010 179 Featured Case SEALED REPLY by Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporated to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporated to Compel 172 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Shonkwiler, John)
March 15, 2010 178 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: By agreement, Plaintiffs' Motion to Reconsider is reset for 3/24/2010 at 09:30 AM.Mailed notice (wp, )
March 12, 2010 177 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Patrick A. Fleming for presentment of motion for reconsideration,, motion for relief,,,,,,,,,,, 176 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 3/16/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Fleming, Patrick)
March 12, 2010 176 Featured Case MOTION by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporated for reconsideration regarding order on motion to quash,,, order on motion to strike,,, terminate hearings,,, motion hearing,,, set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings,,, set/reset hearings,, 174 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Fleming, Patrick)
March 9, 2010 175 Featured Case RESPONSE by Google Inc(a Delaware corporation) to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporated to Compel 172 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Finn, Herbert)
February 23, 2010 174 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:For the reasons stated in open court, Motorola's Motion to quash 154 is granted in part and denied in part. Motorola is ordered to respond to Plaintiffs' request 12 through 15. Plaintiffs' Motion to strike or in the alternative, to file sur-reply 170 is denied as moot. Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel 172 to be filed by 3/9/2010. Plaintiffs' reply brief due due by 3/16/2010. The Court will rule orally on 4/14/2010 at 09:00 AM. Oral discovery to close 7/30/2010. Parties to file amended pleadings by 7/15/2010. Dispositive motions due by 7/30/2010. Status hearing stricken.Mailed notice (wp, )
February 22, 2010 173 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by John B Haarlow, Jr for presentment of Sealed motion, 172 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 2/24/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Haarlow, John)
February 22, 2010 172 Featured Case SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporated to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Haarlow, John)
February 19, 2010 171 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by John B Haarlow, Jr for presentment of motion to strike, motion for relief 170 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 2/23/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Haarlow, John)
February 19, 2010 170 Featured Case MOTION by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporated to strike reply 167 or for Leave to File Sur-Reply (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Haarlow, John)
February 17, 2010 169 Featured Case PROTECTIVE Order Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 2/19/2010:(gcy, ) Modified on 3/25/2010 (gcy, ).
February 17, 2010 168 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: For reasons stated in open court. Specht's Motion to Strike or Dismiss certain of Google's counterclaims is Denied. For the reasons stated in open court, Google's Motion for Protective order is Granted in full. As Google concedes, the designating party shall bear the burden of justifying the confidential treatment of any disputed materials. Parties to submit a joint discovery plan. Status hearing reset for 2/24/2010 at 09:00 a.m [For further detail see separate order(s)]. Mailed notices (gcy, ) Modified on 2/19/2010 (wp, ).
February 8, 2010 167 Featured Case REPLY by Defendant Motorola Inc to motion to quash 154 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2-3)(Cyrluk, Jonathan) Modified on 2/9/2010 (cdy, ).
February 1, 2010 166 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12-17-09 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Court Reporter Contact Information: KRISTA BURGESON, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/22/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/3/2010. (Burgeson, Krista)
February 1, 2010 165 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12-03-09 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Court Reporter Contact Information: KRISTA BURGESON, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/22/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/3/2010. (Burgeson, Krista)
February 1, 2010 164 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 01-07-2010 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Court Reporter Contact Information: KRISTA BURGESON, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/22/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/3/2010. (Burgeson, Krista)
January 29, 2010 163 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Status hearing stricken.Mailed notice (wp, )
January 28, 2010 162 Featured Case RESPONSE by Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht(an Individual), The Android's Dungeon Incorporatedin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Motorola Inc to quash Non-Party Subpoena 154 (Haarlow, John)
January 19, 2010 160 Featured Case REPLY by Android Data Corporation, Erich Specht(an Individual), The Android's Dungeon Incorporated to MOTION by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Erich Specht to dismiss Counterclaims 131 , response in opposition to motion,, 158 (Haarlow, John)
January 15, 2010 159 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Status hearing stricken.Mailed notice (wp, )
January 7, 2010 161 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Response to Motorola's Motion to Quash to be filed by 1/28/2010. Reply brief due 2/4/2010. The Court will rule orally on 2/25/2010 at 9:00 a.m. Status hearing set for 2/4/2010 at 9:00 a.m.As indicated in open court, plaintiff to respond to outstanding discovery by 2/4/2010. Mailed notice (wp, ) Modified on 1/20/2010 (wp, ).
January 4, 2010 158 Featured Case RESPONSE by Google Incin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Erich Specht, Counter Defendants Erich Specht, Android Data Corporation, Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The to dismiss CounterclaimsMOTION by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Erich Specht, Counter Defendants Erich Specht, Android Data Corporation, Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The to strike Counterclaims 142 (Finn, Herbert)
December 18, 2009 156 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan M. Cyrluk for presentment of motion to quash 154 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 1/7/2010 at 09:00 AM. (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
December 18, 2009 155 Featured Case MEMORANDUM by Motorola Inc in support of motion to quash 154 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cyrluk, Jonathan)
December 18, 2009 154 Featured Case MOTION by Defendant Motorola Inc to quash Non-Party Subpoena (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
December 18, 2009 153 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Motorola Inc by Mariah E Moran (Moran, Mariah)
December 17, 2009 157 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:The Court will rule orally on the motions for protective order on 1/20/2010 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (wp, )
December 16, 2009 152 Featured Case REPLY by Counter Claimant Google Inc in support of its motion for entry of a protective order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Finn, Herbert)
December 10, 2009 151 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by John B Haarlow, Jr for presentment of motion for protective order, 150 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 12/17/2009 at 09:30 AM. (Haarlow, John)
December 10, 2009 150 Featured Case MOTION by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Erich Specht, Counter Defendants Erich Specht, Android Data Corporation, Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The for protective order (Cross Motion) (Haarlow, John)
December 10, 2009 149 Featured Case RESPONSE by Android Data Corporation, Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Erich Specht(an Individual), Erich Spechtin Opposition to MOTION by Counter Claimant Google Inc for protective order and Memorandum in Support Thereof 140 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Haarlow, John)
December 3, 2009 148 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Google's Motion to Compel is continued to 1/7/2010 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiffs' to supplement its answers by 12/24/2009. Defendant's response to plaintiffs' motion to strike and dismiss to be filed by 1/4/2010. Plaintiffs' reply brief to be filed by 1/19/2010. The Court will rule orally on 2/17/2010 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (wp, )
November 30, 2009 146 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Herbert H. Finn for presentment of motion to compel, 145 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 12/3/2009 at 09:30 AM. (Finn, Herbert)
November 30, 2009 145 Featured Case MOTION by Counter Claimant Google Inc to compel Plaintiffs To Provide Complete Responses To Interrogatories And Memorandum In Support (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Finn, Herbert)
November 20, 2009 144 Featured Case MEMORANDUM by Android Data Corporation, Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Erich Specht in support of motion to dismiss, motion to strike,, 142 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Haarlow, John)
November 20, 2009 143 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by John B Haarlow, Jr for presentment of motion to dismiss, motion to strike,, 142 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 12/3/2009 at 09:30 AM. (Haarlow, John)
November 20, 2009 142 Featured Case MOTION by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Erich Specht, Counter Defendants Erich Specht, Android Data Corporation, Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The to dismiss Counterclaims, MOTION by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Erich Specht, Counter Defendants Erich Specht, Android Data Corporation, Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The to strike Counterclaims (Haarlow, John)
November 19, 2009 147 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Plaintiffs' response to defendant's motion for entry of a protective order to be filed by 12/10/2009. Defendant's reply brief to be filed by 12/17/2009. The Court will rule orally on 1/20/2010 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (wp, )
November 16, 2009 141 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Herbert H. Finn for presentment of motion for protective order, 140 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 11/19/2009 at 09:30 AM. (Finn, Herbert)
November 16, 2009 140 Featured Case MOTION by Counter Claimant Google Inc for protective order and Memorandum in Support Thereof (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Finn, Herbert)
November 5, 2009 137 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 10/13/09 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Court Reporter Contact Information: KRISTA BURGESON, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 11/30/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/7/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/3/2010. (Burgeson, Krista)
October 27, 2009 139 Featured Case AGREED ORDER Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 10/27/2009:(gcy, )
October 27, 2009 138 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Enter Agreed Order. Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike and Dismiss Counterclaims is withdrawn as moot. Plaintiffs given to 11/20/2009, to answer or otherwise plead in response to Google Inc's Answer Defense and Counterclaims. [For further details see separate order(s)]. Mailed notices (gcy, )
October 23, 2009 136 Featured Case ANSWER to amended complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and COUNTERCLAIM filed by Google Inc against Android Data Corporation, Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Erich Specht. by Google Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Finn, Herbert)
October 13, 2009 135 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Plaintiffs' Motion to strike and dismiss 131 is entered and continued10/27/2009 at 9:00 a.m. Status hearing set for 10/27/2009 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (wp, )
October 6, 2009 134 Featured Case Second AMENDED complaint by Android Data Corporation, Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Erich Specht(an Individual) against Google Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - E, # 2 Exhibit F - K)(Shonkwiler, John)
October 6, 2009 133 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by John F. Shonkwiler for presentment of before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 10/13/2009 at 09:30 AM. (Shonkwiler, John)
October 6, 2009 132 Featured Case MEMORANDUM by Android Data Corporation, Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Erich Specht(an Individual) in support of motion to dismiss 131 Counterclaims (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Shonkwiler, John)
October 6, 2009 131 Featured Case MOTION by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Erich Specht to dismiss Counterclaims (Shonkwiler, John)
September 22, 2009 130 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 09/03/09 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Court Reporter Contact Information: KRISTA BURGESON, 312-435-5567, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/13/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/23/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2009. (Burgeson, Krista)
September 22, 2009 129 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 08/18/09 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Court Reporter Contact Information: KRISTA BURGESON, 312-435-5567, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/13/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/23/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2009. (Burgeson, Krista)
September 16, 2009 128 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 8/18/09 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Court Reporter Contact Information: Mary C. Kelly, (708) 769-0950, mckellycsr@sbcglobal.net. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/7/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/19/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2009. (lcw, )
September 14, 2009 127 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Pursuant to the Court's order in open court on 6/30/2009, Defendants' stipulated Motion to stay deadlines for responsive pleadings 72 is granted, nunc pro tunc, to that date. Mailed notice (wp, )
September 10, 2009 126 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:The Court's minute entry dated 9/3/2009 125 is corrected to read as follows: Plaintiffs Motion for extension of time to 10/6/2009 in which to respond to Google's Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims 122 is granted. Plaintiffs' given to 10/6/2009 in which to file amended complaint.Mailed notice (wp, )
September 3, 2009 125 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Plaintiffs Motion for extension of time to 10/1/2009 in which to respond to Google's Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims 122 is granted. Plaintiffs' given to 10/1/2009 in which to file amended complaint. Mailed notice (wp, )
September 1, 2009 123 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by John F. Shonkwiler for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, 122 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 9/3/2009 at 09:30 AM. (Shonkwiler, John)
September 1, 2009 122 Featured Case MOTION by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Erich SpechtExtension of Time to Respond to Google's Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims and to Set a Scheduling Conference with the Court (Shonkwiler, John)
September 1, 2009 121 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The by John F. Shonkwiler (Shonkwiler, John)
September 1, 2009 120 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The by John B Haarlow, Jr (Haarlow, John)
September 1, 2009 119 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The by Patrick A. Fleming (Fleming, Patrick)
August 31, 2009 124 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed 7/15/09 as to Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications, AB. (gcy, )
August 18, 2009 118 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Plaintiffs' Motion for leave to take certain depositions prior to filing their second amended complaint 114 is denied. Mailed notice (wp, )
August 18, 2009 117 Featured Case NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Google Inc (Finn, Herbert)
August 18, 2009 116 Featured Case ANSWER to amended complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and COUNTERCLAIM filed by Google Inc against Erich Specht, Android Data Corporation, Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The. by Google Inc(Finn, Herbert)
August 12, 2009 115 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Martin Joseph Murphy for presentment of motion for discovery 114 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 8/18/2009 at 09:30 AM. (Murphy, Martin)
August 12, 2009 114 Featured Case MOTION by Plaintiffs Android Data Corporation, Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Erich Specht for discovery depositions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Murphy, Martin)
August 3, 2009 113 Featured Case MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 8/3/2009:(gcy, )
August 3, 2009 112 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Enter Memorandum Opinion and Order: This Court grants in part and denies in part defendants' Motions to dismiss. Plaintiffs' claims against all defendants, other than Google, are dismissed without prejudice. The trademark infringement claim (Count I) brought by Plaintiffs' Specht and ADC is dismissed with prejudice for lack of standing. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file a Second Amended Complaint that provides supporting factual information of some specificity as to each individual defendant. [For further details see separate order(s). Mailed notices (gcy, )
July 28, 2009 111 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:The oral ruling date of 8/27/2009, on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is stricken. The Court will rule by mail.Mailed notice (wp, )
July 22, 2009 110 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by China Mobile Communications Corporation as to China Mobile Communications Corporation on 7/20/2009, answer due 8/10/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
July 21, 2009 109 Featured Case REPLY by Defendants Android, Inc., Andy Rubin, Nick Sears, Rich Miner, Chris White, Google Inc to motion to dismiss 73 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Finn, Herbert)
July 20, 2009 108 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Status hearing stricken.Mailed notice (wp, )
July 17, 2009 106 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 6-30-09 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. COURT REPORTER CONTACT INFORMATION: Krista Burgeson, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter, Krista Burgeson, before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/7/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2009. (Burgeson, Krista)
July 14, 2009 105 Featured Case ALIAS Summons Issued as to China Mobile Communications Corporation. (gcy, )
July 14, 2009 104 Featured Case MEMORANDUM by Android Data Corporation, Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Erich Specht in Opposition to motion to dismiss 73 First Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Murphy, Martin)
July 13, 2009 107 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Vodafone Group Services Ltd. on 7/8/09 (gcy, ) (Poor Quality Original - Paper Document on File).Modified on 7/17/2009 (gcy, ).
July 9, 2009 103 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by Telefonica S.A. as to Telefonica S.A. on 6/22/2009, answer due 7/13/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
July 2, 2009 101 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by T-Mobile International AG as to T-Mobile International AG on 6/19/2009, answer due 7/9/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
June 30, 2009 102 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Unopposed Motion to stay 74 is granted. Wind River's Motion to join 92 is granted. Plaintiffs' responses to Defendants motion to dismiss to be filed by 7/14/2009. Defendants' reply briefs to be filed by 7/21/2009. The Court will rule orally on 8/27/2009 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (wp, )
June 30, 2009 100 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chris White as to Chris White on 6/19/2009, answer due 7/9/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
June 30, 2009 99 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andy Rubin as to Andy Rubin on 6/19/2009, answer due 7/9/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
June 30, 2009 98 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nick Sears as to Nick Sears on 6/19/2009, answer due 7/9/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
June 30, 2009 97 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by Audience, Inc. as to Audience, Inc. on 6/22/2009, answer due 7/13/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
June 30, 2009 96 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rich Miner as to Rich Miner on 6/19/2009, answer due 7/9/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
June 26, 2009 95 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Wind River Systems, Inc., Texas Instruments Incorporated by Jeffrey P. Dunning (Dunning, Jeffrey)
June 26, 2009 94 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Wind River Systems, Inc., Texas Instruments Incorporated by Richard Daniel Harris (Harris, Richard)
June 26, 2009 93 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Herbert H. Finn for presentment of motion to join 92 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 6/30/2009 at 09:30 AM. (Finn, Herbert)
June 26, 2009 92 Featured Case MOTION by Defendants Wind River Systems, Inc., Texas Instruments Incorporated to join the Motion to Stay Deadlines for Responsive Pleadings (Finn, Herbert)
June 26, 2009 91 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Wind River Systems, Inc., Texas Instruments Incorporated by Herbert H. Finn (Finn, Herbert)
June 26, 2009 90 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by LG Electronics Inc as to LG Electronics Inc on 6/18/2009, answer due 7/8/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
June 26, 2009 89 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by Teleca AB as to Teleca AB on 6/16/2009, answer due 7/6/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
June 26, 2009 88 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nuance Communications Inc as to Nuance Communications Inc on 6/16/2009, answer due 7/6/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
June 25, 2009 87 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by Packetvideo Corporation as to Packetvideo Corporation on 6/15/2009, answer due 7/6/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
June 23, 2009 86 Featured Case RESPONSE by Android Data Corporation, Andoid's Dungeon Incorporated, The, Erich Spechtin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Intel Corporation, AKM Semiconductor, Inc., Audience, Inc., Qualcomm Incorporated, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Atheros Communications, Inc., Broadcom Corporation, Marvell Semiconductor Inc, Synaptics Inc, HTC Corporation, Asc 74 , MOTION by Defendants Android, Inc., Andy Rubin, Nick Sears, Rich Miner, Chris White, Audience, Broadcom Corporation to stay DEADLINES FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS 72 (Murphy, Martin)
June 23, 2009 85 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by SkyPop Corporation as to SkyPop Corporation on 6/19/2009, answer due 7/9/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
June 23, 2009 84 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by Android, Inc. as to Android, Inc. on 6/16/2009, answer due 7/6/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
June 23, 2009 83 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Nvidia Corporation by Jonathan M. Cyrluk (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
June 23, 2009 82 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Motorola Inc by Jonathan M. Cyrluk (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
June 23, 2009 81 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Nvidia Corporation by Henry M. Baskerville (Baskerville, Henry)
June 23, 2009 80 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Motorola Inc by Henry M. Baskerville (Baskerville, Henry)
June 23, 2009 79 Featured Case Amended NOTICE of Motion by Herbert H. Finn for presentment of motion to dismiss 73 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 6/30/2009 at 09:30 AM. (Finn, Herbert)
June 23, 2009 78 Featured Case Amended NOTICE of Motion by Herbert H. Finn for presentment of motion to stay, 74 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 6/30/2009 at 09:30 AM. (Finn, Herbert)
June 22, 2009 77 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Herbert H. Finn for presentment of motion to stay, 74 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 6/25/2009 at 09:30 AM. (Finn, Herbert)
June 22, 2009 76 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Herbert H. Finn for presentment of motion to dismiss 73 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 6/25/2009 at 09:30 AM. (Finn, Herbert)
June 22, 2009 75 Featured Case MEMORANDUM by Android, Inc., Andy Rubin, Nick Sears, Rich Miner, Chris White, Google Inc in support of motion to dismiss 73 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Finn, Herbert)
June 22, 2009 74 Featured Case MOTION by Defendants Intel Corporation, AKM Semiconductor, Inc., Audience, Inc., Qualcomm Incorporated, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Atheros Communications, Inc., Broadcom Corporation, Marvell Semiconductor Inc, Synaptics Inc, HTC Corporation, Ascender Corp, Garmin International Inc to stay DEADLINES FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS (Unopposed) (Finn, Herbert)
June 22, 2009 73 Featured Case MOTION by Defendants Android, Inc., Andy Rubin, Nick Sears, Rich Miner, Chris White, Google Inc to dismiss PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Finn, Herbert)
June 22, 2009 72 Featured Case MOTION by Defendants Android, Inc., Andy Rubin, Nick Sears, Rich Miner, Chris White, Audience, Broadcom Corporation to stay DEADLINES FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS (Finn, Herbert)
June 22, 2009 71 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Android, Inc., Andy Rubin, Nick Sears, Rich Miner, Chris White, Audience, Inc., Broadcom Corporation by Herbert H. Finn (Finn, Herbert)
June 22, 2009 70 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Android, Inc., Andy Rubin, Nick Sears, Rich Miner, Chris White, Audience, Inc., Broadcom Corporation by Jeffrey P. Dunning (Dunning, Jeffrey)
June 22, 2009 69 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Android, Inc., Andy Rubin, Nick Sears, Rich Miner, Chris White, Audience, Inc., Broadcom Corporation by Richard Daniel Harris (Harris, Richard)
June 22, 2009 68 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonic Network, Inc. as to Sonic Network, Inc. on 6/18/2009, answer due 7/8/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
June 17, 2009 67 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aplix Corporation as to Aplix Corporation on 6/17/2009, answer due 7/7/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
June 17, 2009 66 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by Asustek Computer Incorporated as to Asustek Computer Incorporated on 6/17/2009, answer due 7/7/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
June 16, 2009 65 Featured Case SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant LG Electronics Inc. (gcy, )
June 16, 2009 64 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by LivingImage Ltd as to LivingImage Ltd on 6/15/2009, answer due 7/6/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
June 16, 2009 63 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Intel Corporation, AKM Semiconductor, Inc., Qualcomm Incorporated, Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Atheros Communications, Inc., Marvell Semiconductor Inc, Synaptics Inc, HTC Corporation, Ascender Corp, Garmin International Inc by Jeffrey P. Dunning (Dunning, Jeffrey)
June 16, 2009 62 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants AKM Semiconductor, Inc., Qualcomm Incorporated, Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Atheros Communications, Inc., Marvell Semiconductor Inc, Synaptics Inc, HTC Corporation, Ascender Corp, Garmin International Inc by Richard Daniel Harris (Harris, Richard)
June 16, 2009 61 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Intel Corporation, AKM Semiconductor, Inc., Qualcomm Incorporated, Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Atheros Communications, Inc., Marvell Semiconductor Inc, HTC Corporation, Ascender Corp, Garmin International Inc by Herbert H. Finn (Finn, Herbert)
June 16, 2009 60 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by Toshiba America, Inc. as to Toshiba America, Inc. on 6/12/2009, answer due 7/2/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
June 15, 2009 57 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by eBay Inc as to eBay Inc on 6/15/2009, answer due 7/6/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
June 15, 2009 56 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by Motorola Inc as to Motorola Inc on 6/15/2009, answer due 7/6/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
June 15, 2009 55 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by Myriad Group AG as to Myriad Group AG on 6/15/2009, answer due 7/6/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
June 15, 2009 54 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by TAT - The Astonishing Tribe AB as to TAT - The Astonishing Tribe AB on 6/15/2009, answer due 7/6/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
June 15, 2009 53 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by Open Handset Alliance as to Open Handset Alliance on 6/15/2009, answer due 7/6/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
June 15, 2009 52 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd as to Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd on 6/15/2009, answer due 7/6/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
June 15, 2009 51 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by KDDI Corporation as to KDDI Corporation on 6/15/2009, answer due 7/6/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
June 13, 2009 50 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by ST-Ericsson, Inc. as to ST-Ericsson, Inc. on 6/12/2009, answer due 7/2/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
June 13, 2009 49 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by Qualcomm Incorporated as to Qualcomm Incorporated on 6/12/2009, answer due 7/2/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
June 12, 2009 59 Featured Case SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Android, Inc. (gcy, )
June 12, 2009 58 Featured Case SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Vodafone Group Services Ltd. (gcy, )
June 11, 2009 48 Featured Case SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Softbank Mobile Corp, Andy Rubin, Nick Sears, Rich Miner, Chris White, T-Mobile International AG, Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications, AB, SiRF Technology Holdings Inc, TAT - The Astonishing Tribe AB. (gcy, )
June 11, 2009 46 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 06/04/09 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. COURT REPORTER CONTACT INFORMATION: Krista Burgeson, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 7/2/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/13/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/9/2009. (Burgeson, Krista)
June 10, 2009 47 Featured Case SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Noser Engineering AG. (gcy, )
June 9, 2009 45 Featured Case SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Telefonica S.A. (gcy, )
June 9, 2009 44 Featured Case SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Telecom Italia SP, Telefonica S.A., ST-Ericsson, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Toshiba America, Inc., Myriad Group AG, SkyPop Corporation, Sonic Network, Inc., Teleca AB. (gcy, )
June 9, 2009 43 Featured Case SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Audience, Inc., Qualcomm Incorporated, Packetvideo Corporation, Borqs Beijing Ltd., Asustek Computer Incorporated, Motorola Inc, eBay Inc, Nuance Communications Inc, Omron Software Co Ltd, Aplix Corporation, Open Handset Alliance, China Mobile Communications Corporation, KDDI Corporation. (gcy, )
June 5, 2009 42 Featured Case WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Wind River Systems, Inc.. Wind River Systems, Inc. waiver sent on 4/29/2009, answer due 6/29/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
June 5, 2009 41 Featured Case WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by AKM Semiconductor, Inc.. AKM Semiconductor, Inc. waiver sent on 4/29/2009, answer due 6/29/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
June 5, 2009 40 Featured Case WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Atheros Communications, Inc.. Atheros Communications, Inc. waiver sent on 4/29/2009, answer due 6/29/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
June 5, 2009 39 Featured Case WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Ascender Corp. Ascender Corp waiver sent on 4/29/2009, answer due 6/29/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
June 4, 2009 38 Featured Case First AMENDED complaint by Erich Specht against all defendants and terminating Atheros Communications; Audience; Borqs; Ericsson; Huawei Technologies; Myriad; Noser Engineering Inc; Packet Video (PV); Qualcomm Inc; Samsung Electronics; SkyPop; SoniVox; Sony Ericsson; Sprint Nextel; Telecom Italia; Telefonica; Toshiba Corporation; Vodafone; Wind River; AKN Semiconductor and ARM (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Murphy, Martin)
June 4, 2009 37 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Status hearing held and continued to 7/22/2009 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiffs' Motion for leave to file first amended complaint is granted. Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction is withdrawn. Hearing stricken. Under the conditions set forth in open court, plaintiff and defendant Google allowed to conduct limited discovery.Mailed notice (wp, )
June 3, 2009 36 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant T-Mobile by Emily R. Haus (Haus, Emily)
June 3, 2009 35 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant T-Mobile by Douglas N. Masters (Masters, Douglas)
June 3, 2009 34 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant T-Mobile by Robert M. Andalman (Andalman, Robert)
June 2, 2009 33 Featured Case WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Intel Corporation. Intel Corporation waiver sent on 4/29/2009, answer due 6/29/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
June 1, 2009 32 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Martin Joseph Murphy for presentment of motion for leave to file 31 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 6/4/2009 at 09:30 AM. (Murphy, Martin)
June 1, 2009 31 Featured Case MOTION by Plaintiff Erich Specht for leave to file First Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Notice of Motion)(Murphy, Martin)
June 1, 2009 29 Featured Case WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Marvell Semiconductor Inc. Marvell Semiconductor Inc waiver sent on 4/29/2009, answer due 6/29/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
May 30, 2009 28 Featured Case WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Nvidia Corporation. Nvidia Corporation waiver sent on 5/29/2009, answer due 7/28/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
May 29, 2009 27 Featured Case WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Samsung Electronics. Samsung Electronics waiver sent on 4/30/2009, answer due 6/29/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
May 28, 2009 30 Featured Case SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants NTT DoCoMo Inc, LivingImage Ltd, Noser Engineering Inc. (rp, )
May 28, 2009 26 Featured Case WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Broadcom Corporation. Broadcom Corporation waiver sent on 4/30/2009, answer due 6/29/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
May 26, 2009 24 Featured Case WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Google Inc. Google Inc waiver sent on 5/1/2009, answer due 6/30/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
May 26, 2009 23 Featured Case WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Wind River. Wind River waiver sent on 5/1/2009, answer due 6/30/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
May 26, 2009 22 Featured Case WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Texas Instruments Incorporated. Texas Instruments Incorporated waiver sent on 5/1/2009, answer due 6/30/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
May 26, 2009 21 Featured Case WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Synaptics Inc. Synaptics Inc waiver sent on 5/1/2009, answer due 6/30/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
May 26, 2009 20 Featured Case WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Sprint Nextel. Sprint Nextel waiver sent on 5/1/2009, answer due 6/30/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
May 26, 2009 19 Featured Case WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Garmin International Inc. Garmin International Inc waiver sent on 4/29/2009, answer due 6/29/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
May 26, 2009 18 Featured Case WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Atheros Communications. Atheros Communications waiver sent on 5/1/2009, answer due 6/30/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
May 26, 2009 17 Featured Case WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by AKN Semiconductor. AKN Semiconductor waiver sent on 5/1/2009, answer due 6/30/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
May 26, 2009 16 Featured Case WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by HTC Corporation. HTC Corporation waiver sent on 5/1/2009, answer due 6/30/2009. (Murphy, Martin)
May 26, 2009 15 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 05/21/09 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. COURT REPORTER CONTACT INFORMATION: Krista Burgeson, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter, Krista Burgeson, before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter, Krista Burgeson, or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2009. (Burgeson, Krista)
May 26, 2009 14 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 05/07/09 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. COURT REPORTER CONTACT INFORMATION: Krista Burgeson, Krista_Burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter, Krista Burgeson, before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter, Krista Burgeson, or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2009. (Burgeson, Krista)
May 21, 2009 25 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 7/8/2009 at 10:00 a.m. Status hearing set for 6/4/2009 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (wp, )
May 7, 2009 13 Featured Case PROPOSED MOTION to intervene as an additional plaintiff and Motion for joinder by Kenneth Robblee. (gcy, )
May 7, 2009 12 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction is continued to 5/21/09 at 09:00 a.m. Kenneth Robblee Proposed Motion to intervene as an additional plaintiff and motion for Joinder is denied. Mailed notices (gcy, )
May 7, 2009 11 Featured Case NOTICE of claims Involving Patents or Trademarks Pursuant to LR3.4 by Erich Specht (gcy, )
May 7, 2009 10 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Google Inc by Jeffrey P. Dunning (Dunning, Jeffrey)
May 7, 2009 9 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Google Inc by Richard Daniel Harris (Harris, Richard)
May 7, 2009 8 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Google Inc by Herbert H. Finn (Finn, Herbert)
May 4, 2009 7 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Martin Joseph Murphy for presentment of plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order, motion for preliminary injunction 6 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 5/7/2009 at 09:30 AM. (gcy, )
May 4, 2009 6 Featured Case MOTION by Plaintiff Erich Specht for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction. (gcy, )(Poor Quality Original - Paper Document on File). Modified on 5/6/2009 (gcy, ).
April 28, 2009 3 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporated by Martin Joseph Murphy. (gcy, )
April 28, 2009 2 Featured Case CIVIL Cover Sheet. (gcy, )
April 28, 2009 1 Featured Case COMPLAINT filed by Erich Specht, The Android's Dungeon Incorporated; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350.(gcy, )(Poor Quality Original - Paper Document on File).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Specht et al v. Google Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erich Specht
Represented By: Martin Joseph Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Android's Dungeon Incorporated
Represented By: Martin Joseph Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Open Handset Alliance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China Mobile Communications Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KDDI Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NTT DoCoMo Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Softbank Mobile Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Nextel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telecom Italia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telefonica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vodafone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AKN Semiconductor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audience
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atheros Communications
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadcom Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvell Semiconductor Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nvidia Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualcomm Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SiRF Technology Holdings Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synaptics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Instruments Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asustek Computer Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huawei Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Ericsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascender Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eBay Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LivingImage Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myriad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nuance Communications Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omron Software Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Packet Video (PV)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SkyPop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SoniVox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aplix Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borqs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noser Engineering Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAT - The Astonishing Tribe AB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teleca AB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wind River
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garmin International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?