Ortiz v. Edwards et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Ortiz, Sr.
Defendant: D Edwards, A. Hicks, C Hall and The City of Chicago
Case Number: 1:2009cv02636
Filed: April 30, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2012 110 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 8/16/2012: Final pre-trial conference held on 8/14/2012. For the reasons stated on the record in open court, Plaintiff's motions in limine 89 are withdrawn in part, granted in p art, and reserved in part, and Defendants' motions in limine 90 are granted in part, denied in part, and reserved in part. For additional detail, please see below. In addition, Defendants are directed to give notice by 8/15/2012 of whether the y would like to conduct criminal background checks on jurors; Plaintiff is given until 8/17/2012 to respond if Defendants indicate that they are so inclined. Parties are given until 8/21/2012 to submit revised exhibit and witness lists and any supplemental briefing as discussed on the record during the pre-trial conference. Jury trial remains set for 8/27/2012 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel are asked to be present by 8:30 a.m. Mailed notice(tbk, )
May 18, 2011 76 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 5/18/2011. Notices Mailed by Judge's Staff (tbk, )
September 22, 2010 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 9/22/2010.(vmj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Edwards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Ortiz, Sr.
Represented By: Kathleen Coyne Ropka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?