Timberland Machines & Irrigation Inc v. Echo Inc et al

Plaintiff: Timberland Machines & Irrigation Inc
Defendant: Echo Inc and Lawn Equipment Parts Co
Case Number: 1:2009cv02673
Filed: May 1, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Charles P. Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 18, 2011 92 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 1/18/2011.Mailed notice(sct, )
August 26, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/26/2009.Mailed notice(sct, )
April 13, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Denying 14 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; Denying 16 Defendants' Motion to Stay; Granting 16 Defendants' Motion to Transfer to Another District. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/13/2009. (D'Andrea, S.)[Transferred from Connecticut on 5/7/2009.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Timberland Machines & Irrigation Inc v. Echo Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timberland Machines & Irrigation Inc
Represented By: Christopher J. Trombetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Echo Inc
Represented By: Jason Michael Metnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawn Equipment Parts Co
Represented By: Jason Michael Metnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?