Stevenson v. Stroger et al

Plaintiff: Rickey L. Stevenson
Defendant: John H. Stroger, Jr., Thomas S. Dart, Salvador A. Godinez, J. Maverick, Jane and John Does and County of Cook
Case Number: 1:2009cv02698
Filed: May 4, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2012 178 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Maria Valdez on 8/31/2012: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file motion to reconsider 175 is granted. The motion to reconsider is construed by the Court to be a motion for relief from judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b), and is denied. Plaintiff's motion for writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum or in the alternative for a telephone or videoconference 174 is denied. Plaintiff's motion to substitute judge 176 is denied as moot. This case remains closed on the Court's docket. (For further details see minute order.) Mailed notice(yp, )
March 22, 2012 168 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Maria Valdez on 3/22/2012.Mailed notice(yp, )
September 8, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion; Defendants motion for miscellaneous relief under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g) # 81 is denied. Plaintiffs motion to reconsider order denying appointment of counsel # 74 is denied. Defendants are ordered to respond to Plaintiffs motion to compel # 76 within 30 days of the date of this order. Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment # 77 is denied as premature. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice (ph, )
May 7, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 5/7/2009:Mailed notice(srn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevenson v. Stroger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickey L. Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H. Stroger, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas S. Dart
Represented By: Michael L. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvador A. Godinez
Represented By: Michael L. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Maverick
Represented By: Michael L. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Cook
Represented By: Michael L. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?