Intellect Wireless, Inc. v. HTC Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Intellect Wireless, Inc.
Defendant: HTC Corporation and HTC America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv02945
Filed: May 14, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: William T. Hart
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2015 374 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order: Defendants' motion for judgment 363 is granted in part and denied in part. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendants HTC Corporation and HTC America, Inc. and against plaintiff Intellect W ireless, Inc., and attorneys Raymond Niro, Paul Vickrey, Paul Gibbons, and David Mahalek jointly and severally in the amount of $4,090,030.53 representing attorney fees, costs, expenses, and prejudgment interest on the costs and expenses. Signed by the Honorable William T. Hart on 7/21/2015:Mailed notice(clw, )
April 30, 2015 363 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendants HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Counter Claimants HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation for judgment (Bader, Martin)
January 8, 2015 343 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order: Defendants HTC Corporation's and HTC America's motions for an adverse inference [307, 312] are granted. Defendants' motion to hold plaintiff Intellect Wireless, Inc. and Attorneys Raymond Niro, Paul Vickrey, Pau l Gibbons and David Mahalek jointly and severally liable for attorney fees and costs 300 is granted. Defendants' motions for fees and expenses [329, 330] are granted in part and denied in part. Defendants' bill of costs 222 is granted in part and denied in part. A status hearing is set for January 22, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by the Honorable William T. Hart on 1/8/2015:Mailed notice(clw, )
May 6, 2014 291 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order; Defendants' motion to compel 276 is granted. Within seven days, Intellect Wireless and the Niro law firm shall produce the requested documents. A hearing on status will be held on May 29, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by the Honorable William T. Hart on 5/6/2014:Mailed notice(clw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intellect Wireless, Inc. v. HTC Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intellect Wireless, Inc.
Represented By: Paul K. Vickrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?