On Command Video Corporation v. Roti

Plaintiff: On Command Video Corporation
Defendant: Sam Roti
Case Number: 1:2009cv03130
Filed: May 25, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Robert W. Gettleman
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2011 89 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 1/3/2011: Mailed notice ( gds, )
July 12, 2010 60 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/12/2010: Mailed notice (gds, )
April 30, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/30/2010: Mailed notice (gds, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: On Command Video Corporation v. Roti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: On Command Video Corporation
Represented By: Lisa Kristin Shebar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Roti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?