Lane v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Anthony P Lane
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2009cv03277
Filed: May 28, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R. Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2012 101 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/8/2012: Mailed notice(etv, )
May 28, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 5/28/09. (bkp) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 6/1/2009.]
January 7, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file a pleading within eleven days of the date of this Order indicating that he does not want counsel appointed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 1/7/09. (bkp) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 6/1/2009.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lane v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony P Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?