Kolcraft Enterprises, Inc. v. Graco Children's Products, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Kolcraft Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Graco Children's Products, Inc. and Chicco USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv03339
Filed: June 3, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Norgle
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2018 285 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. This is the claim-construction Opinion on Claim 20. Additionally, the schedule going forward is as follows, and the deadlines are strict because the parties have been litigating t his dispute for years (and indeed not only in this forum) and the arguments should be well known to them. Expert discovery shall commence on this schedule: opening expert reports due 04/27/2018. Rebuttal expert reports due 05/04/2018. Depositions of experts to be completed by 05/18/2018, so the parties shall schedule the dates now to avoid scheduling conflicts. For summary judgment motions on infringement, Plaintiff's opening brief due 06/01/2018 (assuming Plaintiff decides to file an infri ngement summary judgment motion). Defendant's cross motion on non-infringement and response to Plaintiff's motion due 06/22/2018. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's non-infringement motion and Plaintiff's reply on its motion due 07/06/2018. Defendant's reply due 07/13/2018. The same briefing schedule shall apply for any defense motion for summary judgment on invalidity or damages (or any other issue), with Defendant filing the opening brief. All summary judgment is sues shall be combined into the two parallel briefing tracks (move for extra pages as needed). Jury trial remains set for 07/30/2018 at 9:00 a.m. The pretrial conference is reset to 07/19/2018 at 1:30 p.m. The proposed pretrial order (see Judge Chang 's website for the very detailed requirements) and motions in limine are due by 06/20/2018. Responses to the motions in limine are due by 06/27/2018. Replies are due by 07/12/2018. Those deadlines are firm in order to give the Court enough time to review motions in limine and other disputes in detail before the pretrial conference (and to issue as many decisions as possible before the conference). Status hearing set for 04/19/2018 at 11:15 a.m. Emailed notice(slb, )
September 2, 2016 216 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. This Opinion explains the claims-construction decisions. The status hearing of 09/15/2016 remains in place to discuss the next step of the litigation. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
October 23, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 10/23/2009. Mailed notice (tlm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kolcraft Enterprises, Inc. v. Graco Children's Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kolcraft Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond Pardo Niro, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graco Children's Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicco USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?