Fifth Third Bank (Chicago) v. Stocks et al

Plaintiff: Fifth Third Bank (Chicago)
Defendant: Daniel A. Stocks and Debra Stocks
Case Number: 1:2009cv03463
Filed: June 8, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Ruben Castillo
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 15, 2013 104 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 2/15/2013.Mailed notice.(jlj)
July 1, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 7/1/2010. (gmr, )
March 2, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 3/2/2010.(ea, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fifth Third Bank (Chicago) v. Stocks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fifth Third Bank (Chicago)
Represented By: Daniel F. Gosch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel A. Stocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Stocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?