Warren et al v. Dart et al

Plaintiff: Gabrielle Warren and Darlene Warren
Defendant: Thomas Dart, Cook County, John Doe Officers, John Doe Supervisors and John Doe employees of Cermak Health Services of Cook County
Case Number: 1:2009cv03512
Filed: June 9, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2013 203 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 10/30/2013. (ma,)
May 22, 2012 118 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 5/22/2012: Before the Court is Defendants motion 104 to bifurcate and to stay discovery and trial as to Plaintiffs Monell claims. For the reasons set forth below, the motion 104 is respectfully denied. All further discovery supervision and discovery motions will be referred to a magistrate judge. Mailed notice(tbk, )
September 22, 2011 110 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 9/22/2011:Before the Court is Plaintiffs motion to reinstate claims against Defendants Barnes, Pearson, Mohammed, Hunter, Vaughn, McDonald, Sampson, Smith, and Morris (the Nurse Defendant s) 89 . For the reasons stated below, the Court grants Plaintiffs motion and reinstates Counts II-V of the second amended complaint against the Nurse Defendants. The Nurse Defendants have until October 14, 2011 to file an answer as to Counts II-V. Notices Mailed by Judge's Staff (tbk, )
November 24, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 11/24/2010. Mailed notice(tbk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren et al v. Dart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabrielle Warren
Represented By: Heidi Karr Sleper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Warren
Represented By: Heidi Karr Sleper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe employees of Cermak Health Services of Cook County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?