Hicks v. Poppish et al

Plaintiff: Kimberly Hicks
Defendant: M. Poppish and The City of Chicago
Case Number: 1:2009cv03514
Filed: June 10, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2012 94 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 2/13/2012: For the reasons stated below, Defendants are awarded costs in the amount of $4,163.20; however, execution on the award of costs is stayed until further order of the Court . The parties are directed to confer to determine whether to work out a payment plan or stay the execution of the judgment on costs until the plaintiffs financial circumstances improve and to file a joint status report by 3/9/2012 advising whether they have come to agreement. If they have not come to an agreement, the parties should include in the status report a short statementof their respective positions. Mailed notice(tbk, )
January 4, 2012 93 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 1/4/2012. Following entry of judgment in their favor, Defendants submitted a bill of costs 85 seeking $4,163.20. Plaintiff objects to the imposition of costs on the grounds that s he is indigent. Because Plaintiffs financial affidavit isincomplete, the Court grants her leave to supplement her filing to provide the Court with a more complete picture of her past, current, and future financial situation. Plaintiff is given until 1/20/2012 to supplement her filing. Mailed notice(tbk, )
August 25, 2011 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 8/25/2011. Notices Mailed by Judge's Staff (tbk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks v. Poppish et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Hicks
Represented By: Thomas M. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Poppish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?