Najjar v. Dahleh et al

Plaintiff: Pierre Najjar
Defendant: Gus Dahleh and Mortgage Direct Company
Case Number: 1:2009cv03554
Filed: June 11, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: Blanche M. Manning
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2014 157 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John F. Grady on July 23, 2014. (ph, )
November 29, 2011 149 Opinion or Order of the Court The defendants motion in limine no. 9 is denied. WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 11/29/2011: Mailed notice(rth, )
September 14, 2011 144 Opinion or Order of the Court The defendants' motion in limine 143 , which contains multiple requests for relief, is granted in part and denied in part as specified below. The parties are reminded that federal law, as opposed to state law, governs the resolution of procedural issues. WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 9/14/2011: Mailed notice(rth, )
May 9, 2011 129 Opinion or Order of the Court The parties' cross-motions for summary judgment are before the court. For the following reasons, Mr. Najjar's motion for summary judgment as to Counts I-III [Dkt. 87] and the defendants' motion for summary judgment as to Counts I, III, and IV [Dkt. 127] are granted in part and denied in part as specified below. Inaddition, Dkt. 128 is stricken as duplicative of Dkt. 127. This matter is set for a status hearing on June 2, 2011 at 11:00 a.m. At this time, the parties should be prepared to agree to a firm trial date. WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 5/9/2011.Mailed notice(rth, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Najjar v. Dahleh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pierre Najjar
Represented By: Maurice J Salem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gus Dahleh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Direct Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?