Soleau v. Illinois Department Of Transportation

Plaintiff: Barbara Soleau
Defendant: Illinois Department Of Transportation
Case Number: 1:2009cv03582
Filed: June 12, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Suzanne B. Conlon
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2011 159 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Suzanne B. Conlon on 6/9/2011:(gcy, )
June 8, 2011 157 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Suzanne B. Conlon on 6/8/2011:(gcy, )
September 13, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Suzanne B. Conlon on 9/13/2010. Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration 78 of the order granting defendant's second motion in limine is denied. SEE MINUTE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.Mailed notice(air, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soleau v. Illinois Department Of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Soleau
Represented By: Stephen J. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Department Of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?