Grooms v. City of Chicago et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Grooms and Allisah Love
Defendant: City of Chicago, David Tencza, Michelle Wantuck, John Lee, Officer Powell, Officer Fisher, Officer Houston, David Glenn, Sergeant Sutter, Captain McMahon and United Road Services
Case Number: 1:2009cv03631
Filed: June 12, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Wayne R. Andersen
Referring Judge: Maria Valdez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2015 384 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. For the reasons stated in the Opinion, the dismissal motion of most of the individual-officer defendants and the City is granted in part and denied in part [280, 316]; Fahey's motion to dismiss 365 is granted; and United Road's motion to dismiss 365 is granted. The only remaining claims are: (1) violation of the Fourth Amendment, asserted under Section 1983 against Powell, Fisher, Houston, and Davis for the Novem ber 2007 arrest and detention; (2) conspiracy under Section 1983 against the same four individuals for the November 2007 events; (3) false imprisonment, false arrest, and malicious prosecution claims under Illinois common law against the same four in dividuals for the November 2007 events; and (4) indemnification against the City for any potential liability for damages by the City employees named in these claims. Discovery must be limited those claims related to Love's arrest on November 2007 at the City auto pound and the ensuing imprisonment. All other claims and Defendants are dismissed. Emailed and mailed notice(slb, )
May 22, 2014 249 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 5/22/2014: Status and motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion to issue summons 240 is granted in part and denied in part as unnecessary. The motion is granted as to the unserved Defendants. Th e Clerk shall issue summons to Defendants United Road Services, Inc., Terrance Fahey, James Murray, Martin Anderson, Glen Lanier, Jr., Mr. Caddigan, Mr. Woods, Ms. Urbon and Mr. Robinson. Plaintiff shall obtain USM-285 service forms from the Marsha ls Service or the Clerk's Office, and then provide them to the Marshals Service. The already-served Defendants shall answer or respond by 06/05/2014. Counsel for the served Defendants stated that Defendants will be filing a motion to dismiss. The motion to dismiss is due by 06/05/2014, brief not to exceed 25 pages. Plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss is due by 08/04/2014, brief not to exceed 25 pages. Defendants' reply is due by 08/18/2014. Defendants' current motion to dismiss 242 is terminated as moot. Plaintiff's motion for Rule 55 default judgment 245 is denied for the reasons stated in open court. With regard to Defendant "Sergeant Sutter," defense counsel explained that the Star Number does not match a "Sutter." Defense counsel shall file a status report on service of process, attaching a CPD record that shows the identity of the person with the Star Number in the second amended complaint. Counsel may redact personal information, such as SSN, date of birth, address, and so on. The filing is due by 06/02/2014. Fact discovery deadline of 08/08/2014 is extended to 1/03/2014. Status hearing set for 06/26/2014 at 10:00 a.m.Mailed notice (mgh, )
April 13, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Wayne R. Andersen on 4/13/2010.(tsa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grooms v. City of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Grooms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allisah Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago
Represented By: David Justin Seery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Tencza
Represented By: Joel G. Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Wantuck
Represented By: Joel G. Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Lee
Represented By: Joel G. Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Road Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?