Case name not on file

In Re: Dairy Farmers of America, Inc. Cheese Antitrust Litigation
Case Number: 1:2009cv03690
Filed: June 15, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: William J. Hibbler
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2015 732 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 6/29/2015. Mailed notice(cdh, )
February 20, 2015 716 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 2/20/2015. For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants Class Counsel's fee petition 613 , awarding them one-third of the $46 million common fund ($ ;15,333,333.33) with interest thereon at the same rate paid on the Settlement Fund, plus $488,491.24 in costs and expenses. The Court grants DFA's motion for leave to file a response to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' reply memoran dum in further support of Class Counsel's fee petition 649 . The Court denies Schreiber's motion for Rule 11 sanctions 676 . The Court grants in part and denies in part Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' motion to file a surreply 703 and Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' motion to file exhibit 1 to their 36 surreply under seal 701 , granting Plaintiffs leave to file only the exhibits to their motion to file a surreply, which will remain under seal on the Court's docket as currently filed. Finally, the Court grants Schreiber's bill of costs 694 , and awards them $32,215.23 plus interest, although enforcement of this award is stayed pending resolution of Plaintiffs' appeal of this Court's order granting summary judgment in favor of Schreiber. Mailed notice(cdh, )
August 18, 2014 652 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: the Court grants Defendant Schreiber's motion for summary judgment 430 . Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 8/18/2014. Mailed notice(tbk, )
November 15, 2013 413 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 11/15/2013. (ao,)
August 23, 2013 365 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTER MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: the Court concludes that Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs have Article III standing to pursue state-law claims based on New York, Tennessee, Michigan, and Kansas law, but lack antitrust standing to pursue their fede ral claims. Defendants motions to dismiss [160, 197] are granted in part such that the federal claims are dismissed and the remaining issues are deferred pending further input from the parties as to (1) the Court's subject matter jurisdiction un der CAFA, (2) whether, if CAFA jurisdiction is lacking, the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs state law claims given that all federal claims of the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs are subject to dis missal, and (3) how the Court's ruling today should affect the overall case management of these MDL proceedings. This matter is set for a status hearing on September 6, 2013 at 10:30 a.m. to address how best to obtain the parties input on these matters. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 8/23/2013. Mailed notice(tbk, )
January 18, 2013 314 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 1/18/2013. Mailed notice(tbk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Dairy Farmers of America, Inc. Cheese Antitrust Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?