Smith et al

Plaintiff: Amanda Smith and James Smith
Case Number: 1:2009cv03908
Filed: June 29, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2011 178 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/15/2011: The Court rules on defendant's motions in limine [# 167] as stated below. The Court advises that it anticipates entering an order on the morning of 6/16/11 dealing with most, and perhaps all, of plaintiffs' motions in limine. Mailed notice. [For further detail see minute order.] (kj, )
May 5, 2011 156 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/5/2011: For the reasons stated below, the Court grants plaintiff's motion to strike certain opinions in part and denies it in part [# 130]. Mailed notice. [For further detail see minute order.](kj, )
May 3, 2011 155 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/3/2011.(kj, )
November 29, 2010 114 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/29/2010. (kj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Smith
Represented By: Hal Jon Kleinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Smith
Represented By: Hal Jon Kleinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?