Creative Montessori Learning Center v. Ashford Gear LLC

Plaintiff: Creative Montessori Learning Center
Defendant: Ashford Gear LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv03963
Filed: July 1, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Referring Judge: Jeffrey Cole
Presiding Judge: Robert W. Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2014 323 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/3/2014: Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment 263 is denied. Status hearing is set for 4/2/2014 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (gds)
September 10, 2012 239 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/10/2012: Mailed notice (gds)
July 27, 2011 165 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/27/2011: Mailed notice (gds, )
September 2, 2010 101 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/2/2010. (gmr, )
April 8, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 4/8/2010. Mailed notice(cdh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Creative Montessori Learning Center v. Ashford Gear LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashford Gear LLC
Represented By: Erin Anne Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Creative Montessori Learning Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?