Morningware, Inc. v. Hearthware Home Products, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Morningware, Inc.
Defendant: Hearthware Home Products, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv04348
Filed: July 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Mason
Presiding Judge: Amy J. St. Eve
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 373 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/26/2012:Mailed notice(kef, )
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 367 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/4/2012:Mailed notice(kef, )
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 365 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/27/2012:Mailed notice(kef, )
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 267 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 12/22/2011:Mailed notice(kef, )
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 241 WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/1/2011: The Court grants in part and denies in part Morningware's motion for leave to file a First Amended Complaint 220 . The Court further orders Morningware to file its First Amended Complaint by 11/4/11. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 229 WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 10/6/2011: The Court grants Morningware's Motion to Compel Hearthware's Production of Documents Relating to SKE 200 , but denies its request for attorneys' fees. Specificall y, the Court orders Hearthware to send written correspondence by 10/10/11, with a copy to Morningware's counsel, to SKE's successor granting permission to produce the documents at issue directly to Morningware instead of Hearthware. The Co urt further directs Morningware to provide a complete copy to Hearthware of all of the documents it receives from SKE within three business days of receipt. To the extent it has not already done so, Hearthware must produce any documents in its possession that are responsive to Morningware's document requests relating to SKE. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 185 WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 4/12/2011: The Court grants IBC-Hearthware, Inc.'s motion for partial reconsideration 166 . [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order construing the claim, Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 2/23/2011:Mailed notice(kef, )
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/22/2010:Mailed notice(kef, )
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/16/2009. Mailed notice. (kef, ) Modified on 11/18/2009 (kj, ).
July 20, 2009 Filing 1
COMPLAINT filed by Morningware, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 07520000000003940168. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Search Results)(Bishop, Edward)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morningware, Inc. v. Hearthware Home Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morningware, Inc.
Represented By: Edward L. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hearthware Home Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?