Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association et al. vs. Blue Cross Blue Shield Association et al.
Plaintiff: Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, David R Barber, D.C., Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Eric Thompson, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., California Chiropractic Association, Jerry Capone, D.C., Ryan S Ford, D.C., Kendall Gearhart, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Casey Paulsen, D.C., Dean Renneke, D.C., Susanna Wood and Ronald L. Young, D.C.
Defendant: Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Independence Blue Cross, Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Premera Blue Cross, WellPoint, Inc. and Wellmark, Inc.
Petitioner: Jonathan M Cyrluk
Intervenor Plaintiff: Tri3 Enterprises LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: The Regence Group
3Rd Party Defendant: Miggins & Miggins, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv05619
Filed: September 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2017 Filing 1117 CERTIFIED copy of order dated 11/07/2017 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of cross appeal #1103 , notice of appeal #1097 ; Appellate case no. : 16-2588 & 16-2845; Upon consideration of the JOINT STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF APPEAL AND CROSS-APPEAL, filed on November 6, 2017, by counsel for the parties, IT IS ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). (jk, )
November 7, 2017 Filing 1116 MANDATE of USCA dated 11/07/2017 regarding notice of cross appeal #1103 , notice of appeal #1097 ;USCA No.16-2588 & 16-2845 ; No record to be returned. (jk, )
July 16, 2017 Filing 1114 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motions to withdraw the apperanes of David J. Stetler, Mariah E. Moran, and Charles C. Jackson are granted #1110 #1112 . (mk)
July 14, 2017 Filing 1115 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #1113 , #1112 sent to Attorney Robert J. Axelrod returned as: Bad destination host. Mailed to attorney Robert J. Axelrod a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ek, )
July 14, 2017 Filing 1113 NOTICE of Motion by Deborah S. Davidson for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #1112 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/19/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Davidson, Deborah)
July 14, 2017 Filing 1112 MOTION by Attorney Charles C. Jackson to withdraw as attorney for Independence Blue Cross. No party information provided (Davidson, Deborah)
July 10, 2017 Filing 1111 NOTICE of Motion by Mariah E Moran for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #1110 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/18/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Moran, Mariah)
July 10, 2017 Filing 1110 MOTION by Attorney David J. Stetler and Mariah E. Moran to withdraw as attorney for The Regence Group. (Moran, Mariah)
July 15, 2016 Filing 1109 SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Barry A Wahner, D.C. (Hufford, D.)
July 1, 2016 Filing 1108 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of cross appeal #1103 ; USCA Case No. 16-2845. (kp, )
July 1, 2016 Filing 1107 DESIGNATION by Independence Blue Cross of record on appeal (Shelley, Anthony)
July 1, 2016 Filing 1106 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of cross appeal #1103 . Notified counsel (ek, )
July 1, 2016 Filing 1105 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of cross appeal #1103 (ek, )
June 30, 2016 Filing 1104 DOCKETING Statement by Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Barry A Wahner, D.C. regarding notice of cross appeal #1103 (Hufford, D.)
June 30, 2016 Filing 1103 NOTICE of cross appeal by Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Barry A Wahner, D.C. regarding orders #1096 ; Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0752-12107844. (Hufford, D.)
June 30, 2016 Filing 1102 Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Independence Blue Cross (Shelley, Anthony)
June 21, 2016 Filing 1101 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #1097 ; USCA Case No. 16-2588 (sr, )
June 20, 2016 Filing 1100 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #1097 . Notified counsel (ek, )
June 20, 2016 Filing 1099 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal #1097 (ek, )
June 20, 2016 Filing 1098 DOCKETING Statement by Independence Blue Cross regarding notice of appeal #1097 (Shelley, Anthony)
June 20, 2016 Filing 1097 NOTICE of appeal by Independence Blue Cross regarding orders #1096 Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0752-12060877. (Shelley, Anthony)
May 23, 2016 Filing 1096 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/23/2016: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and ORder, the Court denies defendant's motion for fees and costs [dkt. no. 1052] and plaintiffs' motion for discovery sanctions [dkt. no. 1066]. Plaintiffs' motion for an order to show cause is denied as moot [dkt. no. 1076]. (mk)
April 26, 2016 Filing 1095 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendants' motion to withdraw the appearances of Elizabeth Herrington and John Litwinski is granted. (mk)
April 13, 2016 Filing 1094 NOTICE of Motion by Bryan Matthew Webster for presentment of motion to withdraw,, #1093 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/3/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Webster, Bryan)
April 13, 2016 Filing 1093 MOTION by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, CareFirst, Inc., Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Wellmark, Inc. to withdraw the appearances of Elizabeth Herrington and John Litwinski (Webster, Bryan)
April 12, 2016 Filing 1092 SUR-REPLY by Defendant Independence Blue Cross to memorandum in opposition to motion #1074 (Shelley, Anthony)
April 12, 2016 Filing 1091 PLAINTIFFS' Sur-Surreply in Further Support of Their Motion for Sanctions by Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Barry A Wahner, D.C. (Hufford, D.)(Docket Text modified by Clerk's Office) (sr, ).
April 12, 2016 Filing 1090 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant's motion for leave to file a surreply is granted. The Court also grants plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a surreply responsive to defendant's surreply. Plaintiffs are to file that surreply forthwith. No further briefing will be entertained. (mk)
April 8, 2016 Filing 1089 MEMORANDUM by Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Barry A Wahner, D.C. in Opposition to motion for leave to file #1087 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sur-Surreply in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions)(Hufford, D.)
April 1, 2016 Filing 1088 NOTICE of Motion by Anthony F Shelley for presentment of motion for leave to file #1087 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/13/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Shelley, Anthony)
April 1, 2016 Filing 1087 MOTION by Defendant Independence Blue Cross for leave to file a Surreply in Further Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Proposed Surreply)(Shelley, Anthony)
March 28, 2016 Filing 1086 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #1083 , #1084 sent to Attorney Steven E. Siff returned as: Unknown Address Error. Mailed to attorney Steven E. Siff a Letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ek, )
March 28, 2016 Filing 1085 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #1083 , #1084 sent to Attorney John Andrew Litwinski returned as: Unknown Address Error. Mailed to attorney John Andrew Litwinski a Letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ek, )
March 28, 2016 Filing 1084 REPLY by Plaintiffs Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Barry A Wahner, D.C. to motion for sanctions #1066 (Hufford, D.)
March 28, 2016 Filing 1083 SUR-REPLY by Plaintiffs Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Barry A Wahner, D.C. to motion for attorney fees,, #1052 (Hufford, D.)
March 18, 2016 Filing 1082 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on March 7, 2016 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Carolyn Cox, Carolyn_Cox@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/8/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/16/2016. (Cox, Carolyn)
March 16, 2016 Filing 1081 NOTICE by Anthony F Shelley of Change of Address (Shelley, Anthony)
March 15, 2016 Filing 1080 NOTICE by Timothy P. O'toole of Change of Address (O'toole, Timothy)
March 7, 2016 Filing 1079 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing and motion hearing held on 3/7/2016. Motion for order to show cause #1076 is entered and continued pending the Court's consideration of motion for sanctions. Reply on motion for sanctions is due by 3/28/2016. Leave to file a three page sur-reply to motion for attorney fees #1052 by 3/28/2016 is granted. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
March 2, 2016 Filing 1078 NOTICE of Motion by D. Brian Hufford for presentment of motion for order to show cause #1076 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/7/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Hufford, D.)
March 2, 2016 Filing 1077 MEMORANDUM by Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Barry A Wahner, D.C. in support of motion for order to show cause #1076 why Independence should not be required to produce governing plan documents (Hufford, D.)
March 2, 2016 Filing 1076 MOTION by Plaintiffs Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Barry A Wahner, D.C. for order to show cause why Independence should not be required to produce governing plan documents (Hufford, D.)
February 18, 2016 Filing 1075 REPLY by Defendant Independence Blue Cross to motion for attorney fees,, #1052 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- March 2014 Press Release, #2 Exhibit B - JUne 2014 Press Release, #3 Exhibit C - Sept. 2015 Press Release)(Shelley, Anthony)
February 18, 2016 Filing 1074 MEMORANDUM by Independence Blue Cross in Opposition to motion for sanctions #1066 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pls' First Set of Document Requests to Def. IBC, #2 Exhibit B - Adjustment Claimlines)(Shelley, Anthony)
February 8, 2016 Filing 1073 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The time for defendant Independence to file its reply in support of the motion for attorney fees and costs #1052 is extended until 2/18/2016. Mailed notice (am)
February 3, 2016 Filing 1072 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion hearing held in chambers with attorneys for both sides on 2/3/2016. Motion to file response under seal is granted #1057 . A redacted version is to be filed in the public record. Motion for sanctions #1066 is taken under advisement. Response is to be filed by 2/18/2016. Status hearing is set for 3/7/2016 at 9:30 a.m., at which time the Court will set a date for plaintiffs' reply. Mailed notice (am)
February 2, 2016 Filing 1071 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the Court's instance, to avoid interference with an ongoing criminal jury trial, the motion hearing set for 2/3/2016 at 9:30 AM is advanced to 9:15 AM, and it will be held in chambers (Room 2188). (mk)
February 1, 2016 Filing 1070 DECLARATION of Anthony F. Maul regarding motion for sanctions #1066 (Supplemental Declaration) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 18)(Hufford, D.)
January 28, 2016 Filing 1069 NOTICE of Motion by D. Brian Hufford for presentment of motion for sanctions #1066 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/3/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Hufford, D.)
January 28, 2016 Filing 1068 DECLARATION of Anthony F. Maul regarding motion for sanctions #1066 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 12, #11 Exhibit 13, #12 Exhibit 14, #13 Exhibit 15, #14 Exhibit 16)(Hufford, D.)
January 28, 2016 Filing 1067 MEMORANDUM by Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Barry A Wahner, D.C. in support of motion for sanctions #1066 (Hufford, D.)
January 28, 2016 Filing 1066 MOTION by Plaintiffs Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Barry A Wahner, D.C. for sanctions (Hufford, D.)
January 28, 2016 Filing 1065 MEMORANDUM by Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Barry A Wahner, D.C. in Opposition to motion for attorney fees,, #1052 (Hufford, D.)
January 28, 2016 Filing 1064 NOTICE of Motion by D. Brian Hufford for presentment of motion to seal document, #1057 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/3/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Hufford, D.)
January 28, 2016 Filing 1063 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Barry A Wahner, D.C. (Exhibit F to Motion to Seal - Exhibit 17 to the Declaration of Anthony F. Maul in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions) (Hufford, D.)
January 28, 2016 Filing 1062 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Barry A Wahner, D.C. (Exhibit E to Motion to Seal - Exhibit 11 to the Declaration of Anthony F. Maul in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions) (Hufford, D.)
January 28, 2016 Filing 1061 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Barry A Wahner, D.C. (Exhibit D to Motion to Seal - Exhibit 10 to the Declaration of Anthony F. Maul in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions) (Hufford, D.)
January 28, 2016 Filing 1060 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Barry A Wahner, D.C. (Exhibit C to Motion to Seal - Declaration of Barry Wahner, D.C. in Opposition to Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs) (Hufford, D.)
January 28, 2016 Filing 1059 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Barry A Wahner, D.C. (Exhibit B to Motion to Seal - Declaration of Mark Barnard, D.C. in Opposition to Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs) (Hufford, D.)
January 28, 2016 Filing 1058 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Barry A Wahner, D.C. (Exhibit A to Motion to Seal - Declaration of Casey Phillips, D.C. in Opposition to Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs) (Hufford, D.)
January 28, 2016 Filing 1057 MOTION by Plaintiffs Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Barry A Wahner, D.C. to seal document in opposition to Independence's motion for attorneys' fees and costs and in support of plaintiffs' motion for sanctions (Hufford, D.)
December 10, 2015 Filing 1056 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on December 1, 2015 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Carolyn Cox, Carolyn_Cox@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 12/31/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/11/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2016. (Cox, Carolyn)
December 2, 2015 ***Civil Case Terminated. (pjg, )
December 1, 2015 Filing 1055 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #1054 sent to Attorney Kevin Case returned as: Unknown Address Error. Mailed to attorney Kevin Case Letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ea, )
December 1, 2015 Filing 1054 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion hearing held on 12/1/2015. Response to motion for attorney fees #1052 regarding entitlement to fees and costs due by 1/28/2016; replies due by 2/11/2016. Plaintiffs have leave to serve limited discovery promptly. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
November 23, 2015 Filing 1053 NOTICE of Motion by Anthony F Shelley for presentment of motion for attorney fees,, #1052 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/1/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Shelley, Anthony)
November 23, 2015 Filing 1052 MOTION by Defendant Independence Blue Cross for attorney fees and Costs (Attachments: #1 Memorand in Suppport, #2 Declaration of C. Jackson (Ex. 1 to Memo), #3 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of C. Jackson, #4 Exhibit 2 part 1 to Decl. of C. Jackson, #5 Exhibit 2 part 2 to Decl. of C. Jackson, #6 Exhibit 2 part 3 to Decl. of C. Jackson, #7 Exhibit 2 part 4 to Decl. of C. Jackson, #8 Exhibit 3 to Decl. of C. Jackson, #9 Declaration of A. Shelley (Ex. to Memo))(Shelley, Anthony)
November 9, 2015 Filing 1051 OPINION from the USCA for the 7th Circuit; Argued 9/9/2015; Decided 10/1/2015 in USCA case no. 14-2322, 14-3174 & 15-1274. (sxn, )
November 9, 2015 Filing 1050 USCA BILL of Costs; appeal no. 14-2322, 14-3174, 15-1274. (sxn, )
November 9, 2015 Filing 1049 MANDATE of USCA dated 10/1/2015 regarding notice of appeal #928 , notice of appeal #1013 , notice of appeal #1036 ; USCA No. 14-2322, 14-3174 & 15-1274. The judgment of the District Court is REVERSED, with costs, in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. (sxn, )
November 9, 2015 Filing 1048 USCA order dated 10/30/2015 from the Seventh Circuit regarding notice of appeal #928 , notice of appeal #1013 , notice of appeal #1036 ; Appellate case no. : 14-2322, 14-3174 & 15-1274. Plaintiffs-appellees filed a petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc on October 15, 2015. No judge in regular active service has requested a vote on the petition for rehearing en banc, and all othe judges on the panel have voted to deny rehearing. The petition for rehearing is therefore DENIED. (sxn, )
November 9, 2015 Filing 1047 LETTER from the Seventh Circuit USCA returning the record on appeal in USCA case no 14-2322, 14-3174, 15-1274: Pleadings, 157 vols on CD and 5 (1 folder; 4 vol. of pleading 20 on cd); Sealed Envelopes,42 on CD. (sxn, )
June 18, 2015 Filing 1046 COPY of order dated 06/18/2015 from the U.S. Courts of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit regarding notice of appeal #928 , #1013 , #1036 ; Appellate case no. : 14-2322, 14-3174 and 15-1274 (sr, )
March 2, 2015 Filing 1045 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit supplemental record on appeal #928 , #1013 , #1036 (USCA no. 14-2322,14-3174,15-1274) consisting of 22 pleadings and 2 transcripts. (rm, )
March 2, 2015 Filing 1044 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant Independence Hospital Indemnity Plan's motion to modify or correct the record #1042 is granted. The Clerk is directed to supplement the record on appeal in the consolidated Seventh Circuit appeals, 14-2322, 14-3174, and 15-1274 with the docket entries specified in the motion's descriptive list. The motion hearing date of 3/6/2015 is vacated. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
February 25, 2015 Filing 1043 NOTICE of Motion by Charles Clark Jackson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief # 1042 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/6/2015 at 10:00 AM. (Jackson, Charles)
February 25, 2015 Filing 1042 MOTION by Defendant Independence Blue Cross to Modify or Correct the Record and Filing of Descriptive List in Support of Appeal (Jackson, Charles)
February 24, 2015 Filing 1041 SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Independence Blue Cross (Shelley, Anthony)
February 11, 2015 Filing 1040 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal # 1036 ; USCA Case No. 15-1274 (mmy, )
February 11, 2015 Filing 1039 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal # 1036 . Notified counsel. (ea, )
February 11, 2015 Filing 1038 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal # 1036 . (ea, )
February 11, 2015 Filing 1037 DOCKETING Statement by Independence Blue Cross regarding notice of appeal # 1036 (Jackson, Charles)
February 11, 2015 Filing 1036 NOTICE of appeal by Independence Blue Cross regarding orders # 1030 , # 704 , # 998 , # 1035 , # 919 , # 846 , # 1009 , # 1008 , # 912 , # 918 Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0752-10337562. (Jackson, Charles)
January 17, 2015 Filing 1035 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Pursuant to the Court's memorandum opinion and order dated December 17, 2014 and the parties' joint status report filed on January 5, 2015, the Court awards plaintiffs' counsel attorney's fees and expenses against defendant Independence Hospital Plan, Inc. f/k/a Independence Blue Cross, as follows: Pomerantz LLP - $1,223,240.88; Buttaci & Leardi, LLC - $174,308.60; The Maul Firm, PC - $238,321.19; Zuckerman Spaeder LLP - $162,908.74; and Axelrod & Dean LLP - $15,950.00, for a total of $1,814,729.41. Any requests for reconsideration of the Court's December 17, 2014 ruling must be presented by appropriate motion. (mk)
January 5, 2015 Filing 1034 STATUS Report Parties' Joint Status Report regarding calculation of fee and expense awards by Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Barry A Wahner, D.C. (Maul, Anthony)
December 28, 2014 Filing 1033 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 9/04/2014 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Valarie M. Ramsey valharam@aol.com (708) 860-8482. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 1/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/28/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/30/2015. (rp, )
December 18, 2014 Filing 1032 NOTICE by Jason S. Cowart of Change of Address (Cowart, Jason)
December 18, 2014 Filing 1031 NOTICE by D. Brian Hufford of Change of Address (Hufford, D.)
December 17, 2014 Filing 1030 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/17/2014: The Court grants plaintiffs' motions for attorney's fees and expenses in part and denies them in part as stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order. Plaintiffs are directed to apply the reductions ordered by the Court and provide a calculation and explanation to IBC by no later than December 23, 2014. IBC is directed to provide a point-by-point response to plaintiffs by no later than December 29, 2014. The parties are directed to make a joint submission to the Court by no later than January 5, 2015 that describes and explains their contentions regarding the fees and expenses to be awarded pursuant to the Court's ruling. The attorney time for plaintiffs' counsel associated with this additional work will not be compensable, unless the Court finds that IBC's counsel have acted unreasonably or in a dilatory fashion in connection with the additional work required. (mk)
October 27, 2014 Filing 1029 USCA RECEIVED on 10/27/14 the Long record regarding notice of appeal # 928 , notice of appeal # 1013 . (gcy, )
October 27, 2014 Filing 1028 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal # 928 , # 1013 (USCA no. 14-2322 and 14-3174. (gcy, )
October 22, 2014 Filing 1024 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant's motion to modify or correct the record on appeal # 1022 is granted. (mk)
October 17, 2014 Filing 1023 NOTICE of Motion by Charles Clark Jackson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief # 1022 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/23/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Jackson, Charles)
October 17, 2014 Filing 1022 MOTION by Defendant Independence Blue Cross to Modify or Correct the Record and Filing of Descriptive List in Support of Appeal (Jackson, Charles)
October 16, 2014 Filing 1021 SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Independence Blue Cross (Shelley, Anthony)
October 15, 2014 Filing 1020 REPLY by Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Barry A Wahner, D.C. to memorandum in opposition to motion # 1011 for attorneys' fees and expenses (Hufford, D.)
October 15, 2014 Filing 1019 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a reply # 1017 is granted. (mk)
October 8, 2014 Filing 1018 NOTICE of Motion by D. Brian Hufford for presentment of motion for leave to file, # 1017 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/16/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Hufford, D.)
October 8, 2014 Filing 1017 MOTION by Plaintiffs Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Barry A Wahner, D.C. for leave to file reply memorandum in further support of Plaintiffs' supplemental motion for attorney's fees and expenses (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hufford, D.)
October 6, 2014 Filing 1016 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal # 1013 . Notified counsel. (gcy, )
October 6, 2014 Filing 1015 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal # 1013 . (gcy, )
October 3, 2014 Filing 1014 DOCKETING Statement by Independence Blue Cross regarding notice of appeal # 1013 (Jackson, Charles)
October 3, 2014 Filing 1013 NOTICE of appeal by Independence Blue Cross regarding orders # 704 , # 998 , # 846 , # 1009 , # 1008 , # 912 Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0752-9926434. (Jackson, Charles)
October 3, 2014 Filing 1012 Supplemental Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Independence Blue Cross (Jackson, Charles)
October 2, 2014 Filing 1011 MEMORANDUM by Independence Blue Cross in Opposition to motion for attorney fees, # 1010 (Jackson, Charles)
September 18, 2014 Filing 1010 MOTION by Plaintiffs Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Barry A Wahner, D.C. for attorney fees and expenses incurred after May 31, 2014 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Declaration of D. Brian Hufford, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Hufford Declaration, # 4 Declaration of Anthony F. Maul, # 5 Exhibit 1 to Maul Declaration, # 6 Declaration of Robert J. Axelrod, # 7 Exhibit 1 to Axelrod Declaration)(Hufford, D.)
September 5, 2014 Filing 1009 ENTERED JUDGMENT on 9/5/2014. Mailed notice.(pjg, )
September 4, 2014 Filing 1008 PERMANENT INJUNCTION signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/4/2014. Mailed notice.(pjg, )
September 4, 2014 Filing 1007 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of plaintiff Mark Barnard and against defendant Independence Blue Cross in the amount of $5,975.70, and in favor of plaintiff Barry Wahner and against defendant Independence Blue Cross in the amount of $4,486.87. The Court will separately enter a permanent injunction consistent with its earlier decision in this case. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
September 4, 2014 Filing 1006 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing held on 9/4/2014. Agreed injunction to be submitted to Judge Kennelly's proposed order email address. Plaintiffs have until 9/18/2014 to supplement fee petition; defendants have until 10/2/2014 to respond. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
September 2, 2014 Filing 1005 STATUS Report Parties' Updated Joint Status Report Regarding Interest Calculation and Form of Injunction for Individual Claims by Independence Blue Cross (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A - Form of Injunction)(Sweitzer, Stephanie)
August 27, 2014 Filing 1004 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 7/9/2014 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Valarie M. Ramsey valharam@aol.com (708) 860-8482). IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/17/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/29/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/25/2014. (rp, )
August 26, 2014 Filing 1003 STATUS Report Parties' Joint Status Report regarding Interest Calculations and Form of Injunction by Mark Barnard, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. (Maul, Anthony)
August 22, 2014 Filing 1002 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the parties' request, the Status hearing set for 8/28/14 is stricken and reset to 9/4/2014 at 09:30 AM. (lcw, )
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1001 ORDER ON MOTION TO STAY signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/21/2014: For the reasons stated in the accompanying order, the Court grants IBC's motion to stay the injunction that the Court previously issued against IBC pending its appeal to the Seventh Circuit. (mk)
August 20, 2014 Filing 999 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit supplemental record on appeal # 928 (USCA no. 14-2322). (kj, )
August 19, 2014 Filing 998 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/19/2014: For the reasons stated in the accompanying decision, the Court approves in part plaintiffs Barnard and Wahner's proposed injunction as well as their motion for payment of the funds IBC recouped from them, plus prejudgment interest. The parties are directed to confer and attempt to agree on the amount of prejudgment interest that Barnard and Wahner are due based on monthly compounding through the date of September 2, 2014. They are also to prepare a proposed form of injunction consistent with this decision. A joint report addressing both of these elements, and attaching a copy of the proposed form of injunction, is to be submitted by August 26, 2014. The case is set for a status hearing on August 28, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. (mk)
August 18, 2014 Filing 997 SUR-SUR-REPLY Memorandum in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Barry A Wahner, D.C. (Hufford, D.)
August 18, 2014 Filing 996 USCA RECEIVED on 8/18/2014 the supplemental record. (kj, )
August 18, 2014 Filing 994 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit supplemental record on appeal # 928 (USCA no. 14-2322). (kj, )
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 995 ORDER dated 8/14/2014 from the USCA regarding notice of appeal # 928 ; Appellate case no. : 14-2322; IT IS ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The clerk of this court shall return the electronic files bearing the numbers 348, 551 Part 1, 551 Part 2, 551 Part 3, 552, 553, 554, 555, 556 Part 1, 556 Part 2, 556 Part 3, 556 Part 4, 557, 586, 589, 592, 601, 602, 603, 604, 622, 629 Part 1, 629 Part 2, 650, 651 Part 1, 651 Part 2, 651 Part 3, 656, 669 Part 1, 669 Part 2, 669 Part 3, 669 Part 4, 670, 677 Part 1, 677 Part 2, 677 Part 3, 680 Part 1, 680 Part 2, 680 Part 3, 765, 779, 780, 781, 782, 783, 784, 785, 786, 787, 810, 821 Part 1, 821 Part 2, 854, 855, 955 Part 1, 955 Part 2, 955 Part 3, 956 Part 1, 956 Part 2, 956 Part 3, 956 Part 4, 962 Part 1, and 962 Part 2 to the district court to be maintained under seal in that court. The district court shall separate and resubmit document numbers 656, 656-1, 656-2, 656-3, 656-5, 656-7, 656-9, 656-10, 656-11, 656-12, 955 (minus exhibit number PX 67), 956 (minus exhibit number DX 19, and 962 (minus exhibit number DX 69.27) to be filed in the public record. The district court shall also separate and resubmit document numbers 656-4, 656-6, 680-15, 680-16, and exhibit numbers PX 67, DX 19, and DX 69.27 to be maintained under seal in this court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of this court shall UNSEAL the documents contained in electronic files 818 Part 1 and 818 Part 2. (jh, )
August 12, 2014 Filing 993 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion hearing held on 8/12/2014. Motion for leave to file sur-reply # 988 is granted. Plaintiffs have until 8/18/2014 to submit a sur-reply of no more than three pages which addresses the issues in response. Response to fee petition and reply to motion to stay is due by noon today. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
August 12, 2014 Filing 992 NOTICE of Correction regarding # 952 # 961 and # 967 (tg, )
August 11, 2014 Filing 991 REPLY by Independence Blue Cross to response in opposition to motion, # 990 , MOTION by Defendant Independence Blue Cross for leave to file Sur-Reply In Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Attorney's Fees # 988 (Jackson, Charles)
August 8, 2014 Filing 990 RESPONSE by Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Barry A Wahner, D.C.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Independence Blue Cross for leave to file Sur-Reply In Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Attorney's Fees # 988 (Hufford, D.)
August 6, 2014 Filing 989 NOTICE of Motion by Charles Clark Jackson for presentment of motion for leave to file # 988 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/12/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Jackson, Charles)
August 6, 2014 Filing 988 MOTION by Defendant Independence Blue Cross for leave to file Sur-Reply In Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Attorney's Fees (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Sur-Reply)(Jackson, Charles)
August 2, 2014 Filing 987 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The 8/7/14 ruling date on defendants' motion to stay is vacated. The Court anticipates issuing a written ruling sometime with in the next 14 to 21 days. (mk)
August 1, 2014 Filing 986 REPLY by Independence Blue Cross to MOTION by Defendant Independence Blue Cross to stay enforcement of order and injunction pending appeal # 938 , memorandum in opposition to motion # 976 (Jackson, Charles)
July 30, 2014 Filing 984 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The ruling date on defendant's motion to stay is vacated and reset to 8/7/2014 at 9:30 AM. (mk)
July 28, 2014 Filing 985 MEMORANDUM by Independence Blue Cross of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney's Fees and Expenses. (rm, )
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 983 ORDER: The Court grants the following motions and vacates the hearing date of 7/29/2014 for all of them: defendant's unopposed motion to file instanter a response brief in excess of 15 pages [# 974]; the motion of Anthony F. Shelley to appear pro hac vice [# 978]; and the motion of Timothy P. O'Toole to appear pro hac vice [# 979]. Mr. Shelley and Mr. O'Toole are directed to promptly contact the Clerk of Court to establish e-filing accounts in this district. Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/28/2014. (rm, )
July 28, 2014 Filing 982 DECLARATION of Anthony F. Maul in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses regarding motion for attorney fees,,, # 942 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Hufford, D.)
July 28, 2014 Filing 981 REPLY by Plaintiffs Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Barry A Wahner, D.C. to motion for attorney fees,,, # 942 Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses (Hufford, D.)
July 24, 2014 Filing 980 NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie Lynn Sweitzer for presentment of motion to appear pro hac vice # 978 , motion to appear pro hac vice # 979 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/29/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Sweitzer, Stephanie)
July 24, 2014 Filing 979 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9702765. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment to Pro Hac Vice Application for T. O'Toole)(O'toole, Timothy)
July 24, 2014 Filing 978 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9702705. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment to Pro Hac Vice Application for A. Shelley)(Shelley, Anthony)
July 22, 2014 Filing 977 DECLARATION of D. Brian Hufford in Opposition to Independence Blue Cross's Motion to Stay Enforcement of Order and Injunction Pending Appeal regarding motion to stay # 938 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hufford, D.)
July 22, 2014 Filing 976 MEMORANDUM by Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association in Opposition to motion to stay # 938 (Hufford, D.)
July 18, 2014 Filing 975 NOTICE of Motion by Charles Clark Jackson for presentment of motion to file instanter, # 974 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/29/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Jackson, Charles)
July 18, 2014 Filing 974 MOTION by Defendant Independence Blue Cross to file instanter Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Instanter a Response Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses in Excess of 15 Pages (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney's Fees and Expenses)(Jackson, Charles)
July 16, 2014 Filing 973 REPLY by Plaintiffs Mark Barnard, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. to Response # 941 , memorandum # 926 , other # 925 in Further Support of their Claims Against Defendant Independence Blue Cross (Hufford, D.)
July 11, 2014 Filing 971 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal # 928 (USCA no. 14-2322). (kj, )
July 10, 2014 Filing 970 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Independence Blue Cross by Erin Eveleen Mcadams (Mcadams, Erin)
July 10, 2014 Filing 969 MINUTE entry # 968 is corrected as follows: The response to motion to stay # 938 is due by 7/22/2014; replies due by 8/1/2014. The response and reply deadlines for motion for attorneys fees # 942 remain as previously set. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
July 9, 2014 Filing 968 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion hearing held on 7/9/2014. Response to motion for attorney fees # 942 is due by 7/22/2014; Replies due by 8/1/2014. Motion to seal document # 943 is granted. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
July 8, 2014 Filing 945 DECLARATION of Robert J. Axelrod in Support of Application for Attorneys' Fees (CORRECTED) (Replaces Dkt. 942-8) regarding motion for attorney fees,,, # 942 (Hufford, D.)
July 3, 2014 Filing 944 NOTICE of Motion by Deborah S. Davidson for presentment of motion to seal document # 943 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/9/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Davidson, Deborah)
July 3, 2014 Filing 943 MOTION by Defendant Independence Blue Cross to seal document (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A_DX 19, # 2 Exhibit B_DX 69.27, # 3 Exhibit C_PX 67 (part 1), # 4 Exhibit C_PX 67 (part 2))(Davidson, Deborah)
July 2, 2014 Filing 942 MOTION by Plaintiffs Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Barry A Wahner, D.C. for attorney fees and expenses (Attachments: # 1 Joint Statement Pursuant to Local Rule 54.3(e), # 2 Appendix 1 to Joint Statement, # 3 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion, # 4 Hufford Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 1 to Hufford Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 2 to Hufford Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 3 to Hufford Declaration, # 8 Axelrod (Pomerantz) Declaration, # 9 Maul (Pomerantz) Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 1 to Maul (Pomerantz) Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 2 to Maul (Pomerantz) Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 3 to Maul (Pomerantz) Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 4 to Maul (Pomerantz) Declaration, # 14 Leardi Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 1 to Leardi Declaration, # 16 Maul Firm Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 1 to Maul Firm Declaration, # 18 Axelrod Dean Declaration, # 19 Exhibit 1 to Axelrod Dean Declaration)(Hufford, D.)
July 2, 2014 Filing 941 RESPONSE by Defendant Independence Blue Cross to memorandum # 926 , other # 925 proposed order and judgment (Jackson, Charles)
July 2, 2014 Filing 940 NOTICE of Motion by Charles Clark Jackson for presentment of motion to stay # 938 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/9/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Jackson, Charles)
July 2, 2014 Filing 939 MEMORANDUM by Independence Blue Cross in support of motion to stay # 938 enforcement of order and injunction pending appeal (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Linda Paterson - II)(Jackson, Charles)
July 2, 2014 Filing 938 MOTION by Defendant Independence Blue Cross to stay enforcement of order and injunction pending appeal (Jackson, Charles)
July 1, 2014 Filing 937 NOTICE by Independence Blue Cross of Filing As To Its Descriptive List, Exhibit List/Exhibits, And the Docket in Support of Appeal (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A: Descriptive List in Support of Appeal, # 2 Attachment B: Exhibit List in Support of Appeal, # 3 Attachment C: Docket Designations Part 1, # 4 Attachment C: Attachment C: Docket Designations Part 2, # 5 Attachment C: Docket Designations Part 3, # 6 Attachment C: Docket Designations Part 4, # 7 Attachment C: Docket Designations Part 5, # 8 Attachment C: Docket Designations Part 6, # 9 Attachment C: Docket Designations Part 7)(Jackson, Charles)
July 1, 2014 Filing 936 SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Independence Blue Cross (Davidson, Deborah)
June 18, 2014 Filing 934 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephone status hearing held on 6/18/2014 with attorneys for both sides. Agreed schedule is set on plaintiffs' petition for attorney's fees and costs: 6/24/2014 - parties will reach agreement, or defendant will produce LR 54.3(b)(5) materials; 6/25/2014 - defendant will identify objections to fee request; 7/2/2014 - fee petition and joint statement per LR 54.3(e) will be filed; 7/19/2014 - response to petition will be filed; 7/28/2014 - reply will be filed. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
June 18, 2014 Filing 933 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Independence Blue Cross by Stephanie Lynn Sweitzer (Sweitzer, Stephanie)
June 18, 2014 Filing 932 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal # 928 . Notified counsel. (kj, )
June 18, 2014 Filing 931 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal # 928 . (kj, )
June 17, 2014 Filing 930 NOTICE by Robert J. Axelrod of Change of Address (Axelrod, Robert)
June 17, 2014 Filing 929 DOCKETING Statement by Independence Blue Cross regarding notice of appeal # 928 (Jackson, Charles)
June 17, 2014 Filing 928 NOTICE of appeal by Independence Blue Cross regarding orders # 704 , # 919 , # 846 , # 912 , # 918 Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0752-9586659. (Jackson, Charles)
June 12, 2014 Filing 927 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephone status hearing held on 6/12/2014 with attorneys for both sides. Telephone status hearing, to be initiated by the parties, is set for 6/18/2014 at 8:45 AM. The Court directed the parties to confer to attempt to reach agreement on a fee petition schedule that is shorter than the default schedule in Local Rule 54.3.Mailed notice (pjg, )
June 11, 2014 Filing 926 MEMORANDUM other # 925 by Mark Barnard, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. in Further Support of their Claims Against Defendant Independence Blue Cross (Hufford, D.)
June 11, 2014 Filing 925 PROPOSED Order and Judgment by Mark Barnard, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. (Hufford, D.)
June 2, 2014 Filing 924 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephone status hearing held on 6/2/2014 and continued to a telephone status hearing, to be initiated by the parties, on 6/12/2014 at 8:45 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
June 2, 2014 Filing 923 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant Independence Blue Cross's motion to withdraw the appearances of Kirsten Milton and Charis Runnels are granted # 921 . Mailed notice. (pjg, )
May 21, 2014 Filing 920 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephone status hearing held on 5/21/2014 with attorneys for both sides. Telephone status hearing, to be initiated by the parties, is set for 6/2/2014 at 9:00 a.m. for the purpose of discussing whether a "judgment" form is necessary on the plea claims and setting a schedule for briefing plaintiffs' fee petition. Neither side intends to offer further testimony on the Barnard/Wahner individual claims. Plaintiffs' brief on those claims is due 6/11/2014; defendant's brief is due 7/2/2014; plaintiffs' reply is due 7/16/2014. Ruling is set to 7/31/2014 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
May 19, 2014 Filing 919 PERMANENT INJUNCTION signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/19/2014. (mk)
May 19, 2014 Filing 918 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/19/2014: For the reasons stated in this decision, the Court approves in part PCA's proposed injunction. The injunction will be contained in a separate entry. (mk)
May 18, 2014 Filing 917 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiffs' motion to withdraw the appearance of Brian Hufford # 897 is terminated as moot. The Court was not previously aware of the motion, which was filed several months ago. It appears, however, that Mr. Hufford has continued to make submissions on behalf of plaintiffs, though he is associated with a different law firm than previously. His appearance has already been revised on the docket. It does not appear that withdrawal is appropriate. If the Court is missing something, and there is a basis to withdraw Mr. Hufford's appearance, a more particularized motion should be filed. (mk)
April 24, 2014 Filing 916 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephone status hearing held on 4/24/2014 with attorneys for all remaining parties. Telephone status hearing, to be initiated by the parties, is set for 5/21/2014 at 09:00 AM. for the purpose of discussing status of individual claims of Barnard and Wahner.Mailed notice (rth, )
April 21, 2014 Filing 915 RESPONSE by Defendant Independence Blue Cross to other # 913 , memorandum in support of motion # 914 in Opposition to Plaintiff's Proposed Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Jackson, Charles)
April 11, 2014 Filing 914 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Form of Injunction (Hufford, D.)
April 11, 2014 Filing 913 PROPOSED Permanent Injunction by Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association (Hufford, D.)
March 28, 2014 Filing 912 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order written by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/28/2014. For the reasons stated in this memorandum opinion and order, the Court finds in favor of PCA on its claims against IBC and concludes that PCA is entitled to an appropriate permanent injunction. Because the parties have not yet briefed the question of the precise contours the injunction should take, the Court orders further briefing in that regard. Plaintiff is to submit a proposed form of injunction and a supporting memorandum by no later than April 11, 2014; defendant is to reply by no later than April 21, 2014. The case is set for a status conference, to be conducted by telephone, on April 24, 2014 at 8:45 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel is to get defendant's counsel on the telephone and then call chambers (312-435-5618). (pjg, )
March 13, 2014 Filing 911 NOTICE by Anthony F. Maul of Change of Address (Maul, Anthony)
February 10, 2014 Filing 910 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant IBC's motion for leave to file supplemental authority # 904 is granted. (mk)
February 7, 2014 Filing 909 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/4/13 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura Brennan, 312-435-5785, Laura_M_Brennan@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2014. (Brennan, Laura)
February 7, 2014 Filing 908 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/3/13 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura Brennan, 312-435-5785, Laura_M_Brennan@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2014. (Brennan, Laura)
February 7, 2014 Filing 907 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/2/13 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura Brennan, 312-435-5785, Laura_M_Brennan@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2014. (Brennan, Laura)
February 7, 2014 Filing 906 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/26/13 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura Brennan, 312-435-5785, Laura_M_Brennan@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2014. (Brennan, Laura)
February 5, 2014 Filing 905 NOTICE of Motion by Charles Clark Jackson for presentment of motion for leave to file # 904 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/11/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Jackson, Charles)
February 5, 2014 Filing 904 MOTION by Defendant Independence Blue Cross for leave to file Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Kolbe & Kolbe v. Med. College of Wis., Inc.)(Jackson, Charles)
January 28, 2014 Filing 903 NOTICE by Leigh Handelman Smollar of Change of Address Change of Firm Name (Smollar, Leigh)
January 28, 2014 Filing 902 NOTICE by Louis Carey Ludwig of Change of Address Change of Firm Name (Ludwig, Louis)
January 28, 2014 Filing 901 NOTICE by Patrick Vincent Dahlstrom of Change of Address Change of Firm Name (Dahlstrom, Patrick)
January 9, 2014 Filing 900 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, David R Barber, D.C., Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Eric Thompson, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. by D. Brian Hufford (Hufford, D.)
January 9, 2014 Filing 899 NOTICE by D. Brian Hufford of Change of Address (Hufford, D.)
January 9, 2014 Filing 898 NOTICE by Jason S. Cowart of Change of Address (Cowart, Jason)
January 7, 2014 Filing 897 MOTION by counsel for Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, David R Barber, D.C., Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Eric Thompson, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. to withdraw as attorney D. Brian Hufford (Axelrod, Robert)
January 7, 2014 Filing 896 Notice of Change of Firm Name by Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. (Axelrod, Robert)
January 2, 2014 Filing 895 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiffs' motion to voluntarily dismiss their claims against the WellPoint defendants with prejudice and without costs is granted. (mk)
December 27, 2013 Filing 894 NOTICE of Motion by Anthony F. Maul for presentment of motion to dismiss # 893 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/7/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Maul, Anthony)
December 27, 2013 Filing 893 MOTION by Plaintiffs Andrew Reno, D.C., Jay Korsen, D.C., International Chiropractors Association to dismiss with prejudice claims against WellPoint Defendants (Maul, Anthony)
December 27, 2013 Filing 892 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims Against WellPoint Defendants (Axelrod, Robert)
December 26, 2013 Filing 891 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiffs' motion to voluntarily dismiss # 889 is granted; all claims against defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas are dismissed with prejudice and without costs pursuant to the parties' settlement agreement. (mk)
December 25, 2013 Filing 890 NOTICE of Motion by Anthony F. Maul for presentment of motion to dismiss,, # 889 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/7/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Maul, Anthony)
December 25, 2013 Filing 889 MOTION by Plaintiffs Andrew Reno, D.C., Jay Korsen, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Peri Dwyer, D.C., International Chiropractors Association, Larry Miggins, D.C., Michelle M Askar, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Barry A Wahner, D.C., Mark Barnard, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Katherine Hopkins, Ian Barlow, Susanna Wood, Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C. to dismiss claims against Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas (Maul, Anthony)
December 16, 2013 Filing 888 Agreed Motion to dismiss # 886 is granted; all claims against defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island are dismissed with prejudice and without costs. (mk)
December 13, 2013 Filing 887 NOTICE of Motion by D. Brian Hufford for presentment of motion to dismiss,, # 886 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/17/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Hufford, D.)
December 13, 2013 Filing 886 MOTION by Plaintiffs Andrew Reno, D.C., Jay Korsen, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Peri Dwyer, D.C., International Chiropractors Association, Michelle M Askar, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Barry A Wahner, D.C., Mark Barnard, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island to dismiss with prejudice Plaintiffs' claims against Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island (Hufford, D.)
December 9, 2013 Filing 885 Post-Trial Statement of Supporting Authority STATEMENT by Independence Blue Cross (Jackson, Charles)
December 9, 2013 Filing 884 Letter STATEMENT by Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association regarding points of law and legal authority (Hufford, D.)
December 4, 2013 Filing 883 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Bench trial held and concluded on claims of plaintiff Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association against defendant Independence Blue Cross. Simultaneous post-argument submission of authorities as discussed in open court is due by 12/9/2013. (pjg, )
December 3, 2013 Filing 882 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Bench trial held on 12/3/2013 and continued to 12/4/2013 at 09:30 a.m.Mailed notice. (pjg, )
December 2, 2013 Filing 881 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Bench trial held on 12/2/2013 and continued to 12/3/2013 at 9:45 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
November 29, 2013 Filing 880 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court rules as follows on the parties' objections, contained in the final pretrial order, to designated deposition testimony: PLAINTIFFS' DESIGNATIONS : Deposition of Edward Litchko : All objections are overruled. Deposition of John McCarrin : The following objections are sustained on hearsay grounds: pp. 18:22 - 20:15, and pp. 57:24 - 58:4. All remaining objections are overruled. Deposition of Marc Persson : All objections are overruled. The Court notes, with the regard to the objection to p. 180:9-22, that defendant IBC's hearsay objection is overruled because the testimony in question recounts a conversation with an IBC representative and thus the testimony is not hearsay. Deposition of Gene Veno : All objections are overruled. DEFENDANT IBC'S DESIGNATIONS : Deposition of Gene Veno: The following objections are sustained pursuant to Rules 402 and 403 - pp. 75:16 - 79:10; pp. 91:15 - 95:9; pp. 103:4 - 104:6; pp. 119:1 - 120:8; pp. 125:11 - 135:25; pp. 139:3 - 141:11; pp. 145:8 - 146:4; pp. 146:17 - 147:9; pp. 147:21 - 148:20; pp. 199:22 - 203:24; pp. 206:25 - 209:25; pp. 221:4 - 223:20; and pp. 226:9 - 227:24. All remaining objections are overruled. Deposition of John McCarrin : All objections are overruled. Deposition of Marc Persson : The objection to pp. 123:25 - 125:20 is sustained pursuant to Rules 402 and 403. All remaining objections are overruled. DESIGNATIONS BY AND AGAINST WELLPOINT DEFENDANTS : The Court has not ruled on objections to testimony designated by and against the WellPoint defendants in light of the impending settlement as to those defendants. (mk)
November 27, 2013 Filing 879 STIPULATION Regarding Claims Against Wellpoint, Inc. and Anthem Virginia (Conway, Michael)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 878 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/27/2013: Final pretrial conference held on 11/27/2013. Defendants' motions in limine are ruled upon as stated in the accompanying order. (mk)
November 26, 2013 Filing 877 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, WellPoint, Inc. by John Friedrich Zabriskie (Zabriskie, John)
November 26, 2013 Filing 876 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiffs' motion to voluntarily dismiss claims against certain defendants # 873 is granted; all claims by plaintiffs against defendants Cambia Health Solutions, Inc. (f/k/a The Regence Group), Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, and Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina are dismissed with prejudice and without costs. (mk)
November 26, 2013 Filing 875 PROPOSED Pretrial Order Final Pretrial Order (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1, # 2 Appendix 2, # 3 Appendix 3, # 4 Appendix 4, # 5 Appendix 5, # 6 Appendix 6)(Maul, Anthony)
November 25, 2013 Filing 874 NOTICE of Motion by Anthony F. Maul for presentment of motion to dismiss,, # 873 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/3/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Maul, Anthony)
November 25, 2013 Filing 873 MOTION by Plaintiffs Andrew Reno, D.C., Jay Korsen, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Peri Dwyer, D.C., International Chiropractors Association, Larry Miggins, D.C., Michelle M Askar, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Barry A Wahner, D.C., Mark Barnard, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Katherine Hopkins, Ian Barlow, Susanna Wood, Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C. to dismiss with Prejudice Claims Against Certain Defendants (Maul, Anthony)
November 22, 2013 Filing 872 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The starting time for the final pretrial conference and the hearing on all other pending motions on 11/26/2013 is moved to 2:30 PM. (mk)
November 20, 2013 Filing 871 MEMORANDUM by International Chiropractors Association in Opposition to motion in limine,, # 850 # 6 To Bar The Trial Testimony of Plaintiff Jay Korsen (Maul, Anthony)
November 20, 2013 Filing 870 MEMORANDUM by International Chiropractors Association in Opposition to motion in limine,, # 849 # 5 TO Bar Plaintiff Andrew Reno From Testifying In Support Of Plaintiff International Chiropractic Association's Claims (Maul, Anthony)
November 20, 2013 Filing 869 MEMORANDUM by International Chiropractors Association in Opposition to motion in limine,,, # 848 # 2 To Bar Plaintiff International Ch iropractic Association From Offering Any Evidence or Presenting Argument That Any Of Its members Other Than Jay Korsen and Andrew Reno Were Subject to Repayment Recoveries As Alleged In The Complaint (Maul, Anthony)
November 20, 2013 Filing 868 MEMORANDUM by Independence Blue Cross in Opposition to motion in limine, # 859 (Jackson, Charles)
November 20, 2013 Filing 867 MEMORANDUM by Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., WellPoint, Inc. in Opposition to motion in limine, # 859 (Conway, Michael)
November 20, 2013 Filing 866 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Telephone status hearing held on 11/20/2013 regarding effect of impending settlements as to certain defendants. (mk)
November 20, 2013 Filing 865 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The motion of Jason Cowart to appear pro hac vice is granted # 862 . Mr. Cowart is directed to promptly contact the Clerk of Court to establish an e-filing account in this district. The motion hearing date of 11/21/2013 for this motion is vacated. (lcw, )
November 19, 2013 Filing 864 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephone conference set for 11/20/2013 at 2:00 p.m. (pjg, )
November 19, 2013 Filing 863 NOTICE of Motion by Patrick Vincent Dahlstrom for presentment of motion to appear pro hac vice # 862 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/21/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Dahlstrom, Patrick)
November 19, 2013 Filing 862 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-8945124. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Dahlstrom, Patrick)
November 15, 2013 Filing 861 STIPULATION Regarding Defendants' Motions in Limine (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing, # 2 Exhibit)(Conway, Michael)
November 14, 2013 Filing 860 NOTICE of Motion by Anthony F. Maul for presentment of motion in limine, # 859 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/26/2013 at 02:00 PM. (Maul, Anthony)
November 14, 2013 Filing 859 MOTION by Plaintiffs Mark Barnard, D.C., International Chiropractors Association, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C.in limine to Exclude Evidence as to Claims or Issues the Court Granted Summary Judgment (Maul, Anthony)
November 14, 2013 Filing 858 STATUS Report (Joint) Regarding Trial of the Remaining Individual Claims by Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Mark Barnard, D.C., Independence Blue Cross, Andrew Reno, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., WellPoint, Inc. (Runnels, Charis)
November 14, 2013 Filing 857 NOTICE of Motion by Michael M. Conway for presentment of motion to seal document, motion for relief,,,,,,, # 856 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/26/2013 at 02:00 PM. (Conway, Michael)
November 14, 2013 Filing 856 MOTION by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc. to seal document sealed document, # 854 , sealed document, # 855 For Motion In Limine #5 (DKT 849) (Conway, Michael)
November 14, 2013 Filing 855 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc. (Conway, Michael)
November 14, 2013 Filing 854 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc. (Conway, Michael)
November 14, 2013 Filing 853 NOTICE of Motion by Michael M. Conway for presentment of motion in limine,, # 850 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/26/2013 at 02:00 PM. (Conway, Michael)
November 14, 2013 Filing 852 NOTICE of Motion by Michael M. Conway for presentment of motion in limine,, # 849 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/26/2013 at 02:00 PM. (Conway, Michael)
November 14, 2013 Filing 851 NOTICE of Motion by Michael M. Conway for presentment of motion in limine,, # 848 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/26/2013 at 02:00 PM. (Conway, Michael)
November 14, 2013 Filing 850 MOTION by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Independence Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc.in limine # 6 To Bar The Trial Testimony of Plaintiff Jay Korsen (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Conway, Michael)
November 14, 2013 Filing 849 MOTION by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc.in limine # 5 TO Bar Plaintiff Andrew Reno From Testifying In Support Of Plaintiff International Chiropractic Association's Claims (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Conway, Michael)
November 14, 2013 Filing 848 MOTION by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Independence Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc.in limine # 2 To Bar Plaintiff International Chiropractic Association From Offering Any Evidence or Presenting Argument That Any Of Its members Other Than Jay Korsen and Andrew Reno Were Subject to Repayment Recoveries As Alleged In The Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Conway, Michael) (Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 11/18/2013, to reflect missing filer "The Regence Group.") (tg, ).
November 8, 2013 Filing 847 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing held on 11/8/2013 with attorneys for all remaining parties. The claims of the association plaintiffs against the remaining defendants will proceed to trial first starting as scheduled on 12/2/2013, followed immediately by a trial of what remains of the claims of individual plaintiffs Reno, Barnard, and Wahner. If a settlement is reached regarding the claims of the association plaintiffs prior to 12/2/2013, then the trial of the remaining claims of Reno, Barnard, and Wahner will proceed on that date. The final pretrial orders (separate final pretrial orders for the association plaintiffs' claims and claims of the three remaining individual plaintiffs) are to be filed by 11/22/2013. The parties need not include proposed findings and conclusions with the final pretrial order. Motions in limine are to be filed by 11/14/2013, and responses are to be filed by 11/20/2013. The final pretrial conference is set for 11/26/2013 at 2:00 p.m. In addition to the matters discussed at the status hearing, a joint status report is to be filed by no later than 11/14/2013 regarding the claims of Reno, Barnard, and Wahner, including the parties' positions on the following: (a) whether, in view of the Court's grant of summary judgment in each of those plaintiffs' favor on certain of their claims, trial of any remaining claims and issues is necessary, and why or why not; (b) with specificity, what relief (including dollar amounts) is sought, and against whom, on the claims on which the Court granted summary judgment for the plaintiffs, and the procedures by which each party proposes to have the Court make a final determination regarding relief on those claims; and (c) with specificity, what relief (including dollar amounts) is sought, and against whom, on the claims on which the Court did not grant summary judgment for the plaintiffs. (mk)
November 7, 2013 Filing 846 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/7/2013: For the reasons stated in this memorandum opinion and order, the Court grants plaintiff Reno's motion for summary judgment [docket no. 793] on the question of liability as to defendant Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc. but denies the motion with regard to defendant WellPoint, Inc. The Court grants plaintiffs Barnard & Wahner's motion for summary judgment [docket no. 795] as to liability on their claim against defendant Independence Blue Cross for improper denial of benefits but denies in part plaintiffs' motion on their claim that Independence denied them the appropriate notice and appeal rights, while making findings in plaintiffs' favor on certain points pursuant to Rule 56(g). At tomorrow's status hearing, counsel should be prepared to discuss what further proceedings are required on the claims of these plaintiffs. (mk)
November 7, 2013 Filing 845 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/7/2013: For the reasons stated above, the Court grants defendant's motion for summary judgment as to plaintiffs Korsen and Barlow and denies those plaintiffs' cross-motion [docket nos. 759 and 791]. (mk)
November 7, 2013 Filing 844 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/7/2013: For the reasons stated in this memorandum opinion and order, the Court denies both the association plaintiffs' and various defendants' motions for summary judgment regarding the claims of the association plaintiffs [docket nos. 759 and 789]. (mk)
October 24, 2013 Filing 843 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing held on 10/24/2013 and continued to 11/8/2013 at 09:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
September 25, 2013 Filing 842 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendants' motion to withdraw the appearance of Brian A. Fogerty # 840 is granted; attorney Brian Alexander Fogerty terminated. The stipulated motion for entry of an amended order # 838 is granted; all claims by plaintiffs against defendants Blue Cross Blue Shielf of Michigan and Excellus Health Plan, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice and without costs. (mk)
September 20, 2013 Filing 841 NOTICE of Motion by Bryan Matthew Webster for presentment of motion to withdraw, # 840 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/26/2013 at 01:30 PM. (Webster, Bryan)
September 20, 2013 Filing 840 MOTION by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, CareFirst, Inc., Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Wellmark, Inc. to withdraw appearance of Brian A. Fogerty (Webster, Bryan)
September 20, 2013 Filing 839 NOTICE of Motion by Bryan Matthew Webster for presentment of motion to amend/correct,,, motion for relief,,,,, # 838 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/26/2013 at 01:30 PM. (Webster, Bryan)
September 20, 2013 Filing 838 MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield to amend/correct order on motion to dismiss,, terminate motions, # 717 (Webster, Bryan)
September 12, 2013 Filing 837 DECLARATION of D. Brian Hufford in further support of Plaintiffs' motions for summary judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15)(Hufford, D.)
September 12, 2013 Filing 836 RULE 56 LR 56.1(a) Statement by Ian Barlow, Jay Korsen, D.C. regarding motion for summary judgment # 791 against BCBSRI (Attachments: # 1 Objections to BCBSRI's Rule 56.1 Statement)(Hufford, D.)
September 12, 2013 Filing 835 RULE 56 LR 56.1(a) Statement by Mark Barnard, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. regarding motion for summary judgment # 795 against IBC (Attachments: # 1 Objections to IBC's Rule 56.1 Statement)(Hufford, D.)
September 12, 2013 Filing 834 RULE 56 LR 56.1(a) Statement by Andrew Reno, D.C. regarding motion for summary judgment # 793 against WellPoint Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Objection to WellPoint's Rule 56.1 Statement)(Hufford, D.)
September 12, 2013 Filing 833 REPLY by Mark Barnard, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. to memorandum in opposition to motion # 816 for summary judgment against IBC (Hufford, D.)
September 11, 2013 Filing 832 REPLY by International Chiropractors Association, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association to reply to response to motion,,,, # 813 for summary judgment by Association Plaintiffs (Hufford, D.)
September 11, 2013 Filing 831 REPLY by Ian Barlow, Jay Korsen, D.C. to reply to response to motion,,,, # 814 for summary judgment against BCBSRI (Hufford, D.)
September 11, 2013 Filing 830 REPLY by Andrew Reno, D.C. to memorandum in opposition to motion # 826 (Hufford, D.)
September 9, 2013 Filing 829 AMENDED MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Hearing held on9/5/2013. MOTION by defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida for summaryjudgment # 771 is terminated. MOTION by Plaintiffs for summary judgment againstdefendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Florida # 797 is terminated. Motions for leave to file documents under seal # 809 , # 819 , # 821 , # 822 are granted. Plaintiffs' motion to dismiss # 824 is granted. Separate order to follow. Status hearing set for 10/24/2013 a t 09:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 828 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Agreed Motion to Dismiss # 824 is granted. The claims of plaintiffs Michele Askar, D.C., Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri L. Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc., d/b/a Transitions Recovery Program ("Transitions"), Jay Korsen, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda R. Tomanek, D.C., Barry A. Wahner, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, International Chiropractors Association, New York Chiropractic Council, Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, and Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association against defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., d/b/a Florida Blue ("BCBSF"), Highmark Health Services, f/k/a Highmark Inc. ("Highmark"), and Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey ("Horizon") are hereby dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear his, her or its own attorneys' fees and costs. The Clerk is directed to terminate Defendants BCBSF, Highmark, and Horizon as parties. Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/5/2013. Mailed notice (np, )
September 5, 2013 Filing 827 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Hearing held on 9/5/2013. MOTION by defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida for summary judgment # 771 is granted. MOTION by Plaintiffs for summary judgment against defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Florida # 797 is terminated. Motions for leave to file documents under seal # 809 , # 819 , # 821 , # 822 are granted. Plaintiffs' motion to dismiss # 824 is granted. Separate order to follow. Status hearing set for 10/24/2013 at 09:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
August 30, 2013 Filing 826 MEMORANDUM by Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., WellPoint, Inc. in Opposition to motion for summary judgment # 793 Refiled to Include Two Missing Pages (Hanson, Rebecca)
August 28, 2013 Filing 825 NOTICE of Motion by D. Brian Hufford for presentment of motion to dismiss,, # 824 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/5/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Hufford, D.)
August 28, 2013 Filing 824 MOTION by Plaintiffs Andrew Reno, D.C., Jay Korsen, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Peri Dwyer, D.C., International Chiropractors Association, Michelle M Askar, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Barry A Wahner, D.C., Mark Barnard, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey to dismiss with prejudice Plaintiffs' claims against Certain Defendants (Hufford, D.)
August 27, 2013 Filing 823 NOTICE of Motion by Charles Clark Jackson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief # 822 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/5/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Jackson, Charles)
August 27, 2013 Filing 822 MOTION by Defendant Independence Blue Cross to Preserve Under Seal Seven (7) Exhibits Docketed at Dkt. #821 (Jackson, Charles)
August 26, 2013 Filing 821 MOTION by Defendant Independence Blue Cross to seal document notice of motion # 820 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit E-1, # 4 Exhibit E-1 (Tab 1), # 5 Exhibit E-1 (Tab 2), # 6 Exhibit E-1 (Tabs 3-24), # 7 Exhibit E-2)(Jackson, Charles)
August 26, 2013 Filing 820 NOTICE of Motion by Charles Clark Jackson for presentment of (Jackson, Charles)
August 26, 2013 Filing 819 MOTION by Defendant Independence Blue Cross for leave to file documents under seal (Jackson, Charles)
August 26, 2013 Filing 818 Rule 56.1(b)(3) Additional Facts STATEMENT by Independence Blue Cross (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Index, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit E-1, # 8 Exhibit E-1 (Tab 1), # 9 Exhibit E-1 (Tab 2), # 10 Exhibit E-1 (Tabs 3-24), # 11 Exhibit E-1 (Tabs 25-43), # 12 Exhibit E-2, # 13 Exhibit E-2 (Tabs 1-8), # 14 Exhibit E-3, # 15 Exhibit E-4, # 16 Exhibit E-5, # 17 Exhibit E-6, # 18 Exhibit E-7, # 19 Exhibit E-8, # 20 Exhibit F)(Jackson, Charles)
August 26, 2013 Filing 817 RESPONSE by Defendant Independence Blue Cross to Rule 56 statement,,,,,,, # 800 (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A)(Jackson, Charles)
August 26, 2013 Filing 816 MEMORANDUM by Independence Blue Cross in Opposition to motion for summary judgment # 795 filed on behalf of Barnard and Wahner (Jackson, Charles)
August 26, 2013 Filing 815 RULE 56.1 Statement by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island regarding motion for summary judgment # 791 Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Rhode Island's Responses to Plaintiffs' Joint Rule 56.1 Statement of Undisputed Facts (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 3A, # 5 Exhibit 3B, # 6 Exhibit 3C, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5)(Webster, Bryan)
August 26, 2013 Filing 814 REPLY by Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Independence Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiffs Jay Korsen, D.C., Ian Barlow for summary judgment against Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island # 791 , MOTION by Defendants WellPoint, Inc., Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Independence Blue Cross, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Anthem Blue Cross of California, The Regence Group, Anthem Hea # 759 Defendants' Combined Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Plaintiffs Jay Korsen and Ian Barlow and Opposition to Plaintiffs Jay Korsen and Ian Barlow's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (Webster, Bryan)
August 26, 2013 Filing 813 REPLY by Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Independence Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc. to MOTION by Defendants WellPoint, Inc., Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Independence Blue Cross, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Anthem Blue Cross of California, The Regence Group, Anthem Hea # 759 , MOTION by Plaintiffs Florida Chiropractic Association, International Chiropractors Association, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association for summary judgment # 789 Moving Defendants' Combined Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of the Association Plaintiffs and Opposition Brief to the Association Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (Webster, Bryan)
August 26, 2013 Filing 812 RESPONSE by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Shield of California, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc. to Rule 56 statement,,,,,,, # 800 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Declaration McCaughey Declaration, # 4 Declaration Paola Declaration)(Hanson, Rebecca)
August 26, 2013 Filing 811 NOTICE of Motion by Rebecca R. Hanson for presentment of motion for leave to file # 809 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/5/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Hanson, Rebecca)
August 26, 2013 Filing 810 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., WellPoint, Inc. Exhibits O, U, V and AA (Hanson, Rebecca)
August 26, 2013 Filing 809 MOTION by Defendants Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., WellPoint, Inc. for leave to file Under Seal Four Exhibits Attached to Their Response to Pltf Reno's 56.1 Statement (Hanson, Rebecca)
August 26, 2013 Filing 808 RESPONSE by Defendants Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., WellPoint, Inc. to Rule 56 statement,,,,,,, # 800 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Hanson, Rebecca)
August 26, 2013 Filing 807 MEMORANDUM by Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., WellPoint, Inc. in Opposition to motion for summary judgment # 793 (Hanson, Rebecca)
August 26, 2013 Filing 806 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Independence Blue Cross by Deborah S. Davidson (Davidson, Deborah)
August 5, 2013 Filing 805 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion to clarify and extend schedule # 803 is denied. The proposed extension would leave insufficient time for the court to rule given the number of summary judgment motions and the scheduled trial date. (mk)
August 2, 2013 Filing 804 NOTICE of Motion by Anthony F. Maul for presentment of motion to clarify, # 803 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/14/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Maul, Anthony)
August 2, 2013 Filing 803 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Florida Chiropractic Association, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. to clarify Minute Entry and for Extension of Briefing Schedule (Maul, Anthony)
July 11, 2013 Filing 802 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing held. Motion to place certain exhibits attached to their Rule 56.1(a) statement of facts, under seal is granted (763). Motion by Michael L. McCluggage to withdraw is granted (769). Response by defendant to all motions for summary judgment and cross motions is to be filed by 8/26/2013; reply by plaintiff is to be filed by 9/11/2013. Mailed notice (np, )
July 2, 2013 Filing 801 NOTICE of Motion by Anthony F. Maul for presentment of motion for summary judgment # 795 , motion for summary judgment # 793 , motion for summary judgment # 797 , motion for summary judgment # 791 , motion for summary judgment # 789 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/11/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Maul, Anthony)
July 2, 2013 Filing 800 RULE 56 LR 56.1(a)(3) Statement by Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Florida Chiropractic Association, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. regarding motion for summary judgment # 793 , motion for summary judgment # 795 , motion for summary judgment # 791 , motion for summary judgment # 789 , motion for summary judgment # 797 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit 35, # 37 Exhibit 36, # 38 Exhibit 37, # 39 Exhibit 38, # 40 Exhibit 39, # 41 Exhibit 40, # 42 Exhibit 41, # 43 Exhibit 42, # 44 Exhibit 43, # 45 Exhibit 44, # 46 Exhibit 45, # 47 Exhibit 46, # 48 Exhibit 47, # 49 Exhibit 48, # 50 Exhibit 49, # 51 Exhibit 50, # 52 Exhibit 51, # 53 Exhibit 52, # 54 Exhibit 53, # 55 Exhibit 54, # 56 Exhibit 55, # 57 Exhibit 56, # 58 Exhibit 57, # 59 Exhibit 58, # 60 Exhibit 59, # 61 Exhibit 60, # 62 Exhibit 61, # 63 Exhibit 62, # 64 Exhibit 63, # 65 Exhibit 64, # 66 Exhibit 65, # 67 Exhibit 66, # 68 Exhibit 67, # 69 Exhibit 68, # 70 Exhibit 69, # 71 Exhibit 70, # 72 Exhibit 71, # 73 Exhibit 72, # 74 Exhibit 73, # 75 Exhibit 74, # 76 Exhibit 75, # 77 Exhibit 76)(Hufford, D.)
July 1, 2013 Filing 799 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Ian Barlow, Florida Chiropractic Association, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association to Rule 56 statement,,,,, # 762 (Hufford, D.)
July 1, 2013 Filing 798 MEMORANDUM by Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program in support of motion for summary judgment # 797 against Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Florida (Hufford, D.)
July 1, 2013 Filing 797 MOTION by Plaintiffs Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program for summary judgment against Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Florida (Hufford, D.)
July 1, 2013 Filing 796 MEMORANDUM by Mark Barnard, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. in support of motion for summary judgment # 795 against Defendant Independence Blue Cross (Hufford, D.)
July 1, 2013 Filing 795 MOTION by Plaintiffs Barry A Wahner, D.C., Mark Barnard, D.C. for summary judgment against Defendant Independence Blue Cross (Hufford, D.)
July 1, 2013 Filing 794 MEMORANDUM by Andrew Reno, D.C. in support of motion for summary judgment # 793 against Defendants WellPoint, Inc. and Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc. (Hufford, D.)
July 1, 2013 Filing 793 MOTION by Plaintiff Andrew Reno, D.C. for summary judgment against Defendants WellPoint, Inc. and Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc. (Hufford, D.)
July 1, 2013 Filing 792 MEMORANDUM by Ian Barlow, Jay Korsen, D.C. in support of motion for summary judgment # 791 and in opposition to Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Hufford, D.)
July 1, 2013 Filing 791 MOTION by Plaintiffs Jay Korsen, D.C., Ian Barlow for summary judgment against Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island (Hufford, D.)
July 1, 2013 Filing 790 MEMORANDUM by Florida Chiropractic Association, International Chiropractors Association, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association in support of motion for summary judgment # 789 and in opposition to Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Hufford, D.)
July 1, 2013 Filing 789 MOTION by Plaintiffs Florida Chiropractic Association, International Chiropractors Association, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association for summary judgment (Hufford, D.)
July 1, 2013 Filing 788 NOTICE of Motion by Bryan Matthew Webster for presentment of motion for summary judgment # 771 , motion for summary judgment # 778 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/11/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Webster, Bryan)
July 1, 2013 Filing 787 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida Exhibit A to Declaration of Victoria Burnett in Support of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment (Webster, Bryan)
July 1, 2013 Filing 786 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida Declaration of Victoria Burnett in Support of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment (Webster, Bryan)
July 1, 2013 Filing 785 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida Exhibit C to Declaration of Don-L Maurer in Support of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment (Webster, Bryan)
July 1, 2013 Filing 784 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida Exhibit A to Declaration of Don-L Maurer in Support of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment (Webster, Bryan)
July 1, 2013 Filing 783 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida Exhibit M to Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.'s Rule 56.1(a) Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment (Webster, Bryan)
July 1, 2013 Filing 782 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida Exhibit J to Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.'s Rule 56.1(a) Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment (Webster, Bryan)
July 1, 2013 Filing 781 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida Exhibit F to Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.'s Rule 56.1(a) Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment (Webster, Bryan)
July 1, 2013 Filing 780 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida Exhibit E to Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.'s Rule 56.1(a) Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment (Webster, Bryan)
July 1, 2013 Filing 779 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida Exhibit B to Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.'s Rule 56.1(a) Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment (Webster, Bryan)
July 1, 2013 Filing 778 MOTION by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida for summary judgment Motion to File Certain Documents in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment (Webster, Bryan)
July 1, 2013 Filing 777 NOTICE of Motion by Bryan Matthew Webster for presentment of motion for summary judgment # 771 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/11/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Webster, Bryan)
July 1, 2013 Filing 776 AFFIDAVIT of Victoria Burnett regarding motion for summary judgment # 771 Declaration of Victoria Burnett in Support of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Webster, Bryan)
July 1, 2013 Filing 775 AFFIDAVIT by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida in Support of MOTION by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida for summary judgment # 771 Declaration of Deborah Wilson in Support of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Webster, Bryan)
July 1, 2013 Filing 774 AFFIDAVIT by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida in Support of MOTION by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida for summary judgment # 771 Declaration of Don-L Maurer in Support of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Webster, Bryan)
July 1, 2013 Filing 773 RULE 56.1(a) Statement Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.'s Rule 56.1(a) Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M)(Webster, Bryan)
July 1, 2013 Filing 772 MEMORANDUM by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida in support of motion for summary judgment # 771 (Webster, Bryan)
July 1, 2013 Filing 771 MOTION by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida for summary judgment (Webster, Bryan)
July 1, 2013 Filing 770 NOTICE of Motion by Michael Lee McCluggage for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney # 769 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/16/2013 at 09:30 AM. (McCluggage, Michael)
July 1, 2013 Filing 769 MOTION by counsel for Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan to withdraw as attorney Michael L. McCluggage (McCluggage, Michael)
June 27, 2013 Filing 768 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Motion for leave to file memorandum in support of motion for summary judgment, in excess of 15 pages # 766 is granted in part and denied in part. (or, )
June 24, 2013 Filing 767 NOTICE of Motion by Anthony F. Maul for presentment of motion for leave to file, # 766 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/27/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Maul, Anthony)
June 24, 2013 Filing 766 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Florida Chiropractic Association, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. for leave to file excess pages (Maul, Anthony)
June 13, 2013 Filing 765 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Independence Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 10 (unredacted), # 2 Exhibit 11 (unredacted), # 3 Exhibit 12 (unredacted), # 4 Exhibit 13 (unredacted), # 5 Exhibit 14 (unredacted), # 6 Exhibit 15 (unredacted), # 7 Exhibit 16 (unredacted), # 8 Exhibit 17 (unredacted), # 9 Exhibit 18 (unredacted), # 10 Exhibit 19 (unredacted), # 11 Exhibit 20 (unredacted), # 12 Exhibit 21 (unredacted), # 13 Exhibit 22 (unredacted))(Webster, Bryan)
June 13, 2013 Filing 764 NOTICE of Motion by Bryan Matthew Webster for presentment of motion to seal,, # 763 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/19/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Webster, Bryan)
June 13, 2013 Filing 763 MOTION by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Independence Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc. to seal Certain Exhibits Attached to Their Rule 56.1(a) Statement of Facts (Webster, Bryan)
June 13, 2013 Filing 762 RULE 56 56.1(a) Statement by Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Independence Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc. regarding motion for summary judgment,, # 759 Moving Defendants' Rule 56.1(a) Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss or For Summary Judgment on the Claims of Plaintiffs Jay Korsen and Ian Barlow and for Summary Judgment on the Claims of the Association Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26)(Webster, Bryan)
June 13, 2013 Filing 761 MEMORANDUM by Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Independence Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc. in support of motion for summary judgment,, # 759 (Webster, Bryan)
June 13, 2013 Filing 760 NOTICE of Motion by Bryan Matthew Webster for presentment of motion for summary judgment,, # 759 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/19/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Webster, Bryan)
June 13, 2013 Filing 759 MOTION by Defendants WellPoint, Inc., Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Independence Blue Cross, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Anthem Blue Cross of California, The Regence Group, Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc. for summary judgment Moving Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or For Summary Judgment on the Claims of Plaintiffs Jay Korsen and Ian Barlow and for Summary Judgment on the Claims of the Associatoin Plaintiffs (Webster, Bryan)
June 11, 2013 Filing 758 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The motion for leave to file a memorandum in support of a joint motion for summary judgment in excess of 15 pages is granted # 756 . The moving defendants may file a memorandum of up to 30 pages in support of their joint motion for summary judgment. The motion hearing date of 6/13/2013 is vacated. Mailed notice (meg, )
June 10, 2013 Filing 757 NOTICE of Motion by Bryan Matthew Webster for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages,, # 756 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/13/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Webster, Bryan)
June 10, 2013 Filing 756 MOTION by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Independence Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc. for leave to file excess pages (Webster, Bryan)
May 31, 2013 Filing 755 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The order of today's date is amended to reflect that all claims against defendant CareFirst, Inc. are also dismissed with prejudice and without costs. (mk)
May 31, 2013 Filing 754 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Agreed motion to dismiss with prejudice plaintiffs' claims against certain defendants # 752 is granted. The claims against the following defendants are dismissed with prejudice and without costs: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Health Care Services Corporation, Wellmark, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama and Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc. Those defendants are hereby terminated. (mk)
May 30, 2013 Filing 753 NOTICE of Motion by D. Brian Hufford for presentment of motion to dismiss,,, # 752 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/4/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Hufford, D.)
May 21, 2013 Filing 752 MOTION by Plaintiffs Andrew Reno, D.C., Jay Korsen, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Peri Dwyer, D.C., International Chiropractors Association, Michelle M Askar, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Barry A Wahner, D.C., Mark Barnard, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Wellmark, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Health Care Services Corporation, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, CareFirst, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama to dismiss with prejudice Plaintiffs' claims against Certain Defendants (Hufford, D.)
May 8, 2013 Filing 751 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Motion to dismiss # 724 is withdrawn. Status hearing held and continued to 7/11/2013 at 09:30 AM. (or, )
May 7, 2013 Filing 750 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, David R Barber, D.C., Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Eric Thompson, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. by Louis Carey Ludwig (Ludwig, Louis)
April 22, 2013 Filing 749 STIPULATION regarding notice of filing, # 748 Regarding Identification of Association Plaintiffs' Members (Webster, Bryan)
April 22, 2013 Filing 748 NOTICE by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Wellmark, Inc. of Filing Stipulation Regarding Identification of Association Plaintiffs' MEmbers (Webster, Bryan)
April 18, 2013 Filing 747 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 3/7/13 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Kathleen M. Fennell, Kathleen_Fennell@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/9/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2013. (Fennell, Kathleen)
April 2, 2013 Filing 746 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Hearing held on motion to compel # 735 . Motion is granted. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida is to produce a knowledgeable Rule 30(b)(6) witness or witnesses for deposition by no later than 4/23/13. Motion by Susan Weiswasser for leave to withdraw is granted # 741 . Motion by Steven Siff for leave to withdraw is granted # 739 . Motion to dismiss without prejudice the claims asserted by plaintiff Extended Care Treatment, against defendant Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey is granted # 743 . Mailed notice (tlm)
March 28, 2013 Filing 745 REPLY by Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program to response in opposition to motion, # 738 to compel Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Florida to Designate and Produce a Knowledgeable Rule 30(b)(6) Witness for Deposition (Maul, Anthony)
March 28, 2013 Filing 744 NOTICE of Motion by Anthony F. Maul for presentment of motion to dismiss, # 743 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/2/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Maul, Anthony)
March 28, 2013 Filing 743 MOTION by Plaintiff Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Defendant Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey to dismiss without prejudice the claims asserted by Plaintiff Extended Care Treatment, Inc. against Defendant Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Maul, Anthony)
March 28, 2013 Filing 742 NOTICE of Motion by Anthony F. Maul for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney,, # 741 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/2/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Maul, Anthony)
March 28, 2013 Filing 741 MOTION by counsel for Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. to withdraw as attorney Susan J. Weiswasser (Maul, Anthony)
March 21, 2013 Filing 740 NOTICE of Motion by Bryan Matthew Webster for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney # 739 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/2/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Webster, Bryan)
March 21, 2013 Filing 739 MOTION by counsel for Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida to withdraw as attorney Steven E. Siff (Webster, Bryan)
March 21, 2013 Filing 738 RESPONSE by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Floridain Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program to compel Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Florida to Designate and Produce a Knowledgeable Rule 30(b)(6) Witness for Deposition # 735 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Webster, Bryan)
March 14, 2013 Filing 737 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Motion hearing held on 3/14/2013 regarding motion to compel, # 735 . Response to motion is to be filed by 3/21/2013; Reply is to be filed by 3/28/2013. Ruling is set for 4/2/2013 at 09:30 AM. (or, )
March 11, 2013 Filing 736 NOTICE of Motion by Anthony F. Maul for presentment of motion to compel, # 735 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/14/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Maul, Anthony)
March 11, 2013 Filing 735 MOTION by Plaintiffs Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program to compel Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Florida to Designate and Produce a Knowledgeable Rule 30(b)(6) Witness for Deposition (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert J. Axelrod, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Maul, Anthony)
March 7, 2013 Filing 734 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Hearing held on motion to compel # 732 . Motion is denied for the reasons stated in open court. Status hearing held and continued to 5/8/2013 at 09:30 AM. (or, )
March 4, 2013 Filing 733 NOTICE of Motion by Bryan Matthew Webster for presentment of motion to compel # 732 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/7/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Webster, Bryan)
March 4, 2013 Filing 732 MOTION by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island to compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Webster, Bryan)
February 14, 2013 Filing 731 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Motion to compel # 720 is granted in part. Motion to compel # 722 is granted in part but depositions are limited to 90 minutes per notice. Response to motion to dismiss is to be filed by 3/14/2013 and reply brief is to be filed by 3/28/2013. Motion to leave to depose defendants is granted in part. Depositions are limited to 90 minutes. (729) (or, )
February 13, 2013 Filing 730 NOTICE of Motion by Anthony F. Maul for presentment of motion to compel,, # 729 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/14/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Maul, Anthony)
February 13, 2013 Filing 729 MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. to compel - Cross-Motion for leave to compel taking of depositions (Maul, Anthony)
February 13, 2013 Filing 728 MEMORANDUM by Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. in Opposition to motion to compel # 720 (Maul, Anthony)
February 13, 2013 Filing 727 MEMORANDUM by Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Dean Renneke, D.C., Andrew Reno, D.C., The Regence Group, Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. in Opposition to motion to compel, # 722 (Maul, Anthony)
February 11, 2013 Filing 726 NOTICE of Motion by Bryan Matthew Webster for presentment of motion to dismiss # 724 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/14/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Webster, Bryan)
February 11, 2013 Filing 725 MEMORANDUM by Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey in support of motion to dismiss # 724 Claims Asserted by Plaintiff Transitions Recovery Program (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Webster, Bryan)
February 11, 2013 Filing 724 MOTION by Defendant Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey to dismiss Claims Asserted by Plaintiff Transitions Recovery Program (Webster, Bryan)
February 11, 2013 Filing 723 NOTICE of Motion by Bryan Matthew Webster for presentment of motion to compel, # 722 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/14/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Webster, Bryan)
February 11, 2013 Filing 722 MOTION by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey to compel depositions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit A (Part 2), # 3 Exhibit A (Part 3), # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C)(Webster, Bryan)
February 11, 2013 Filing 721 NOTICE of Motion by Michael M. Conway for presentment of motion to compel # 720 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/14/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Conway, Michael)
February 11, 2013 Filing 720 MOTION by Defendant WellPoint, Inc. to compel Depositions (Conway, Michael)
February 7, 2013 Filing 719 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing held and continued to 3/7/2013 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (meg, )
January 17, 2013 Filing 718 WITHDRAWING Michael M. Smith as counsel for Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, The Regence Group, ThirdParty Plaintiff The Regence Group, Counter Claimants The Regence Group, The Regence Group and substituting Emily M Yinger as counsel of record (Yinger, Emily)
December 14, 2012 Filing 717 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The stipulated motion for dismissal without prejudice of plaintiffs' claims against Blue Cross Blue Shield Michigan and Excellus Health Plan, Inc. # 716 is granted pursuant to the terms stated in the motion. (mk)
December 7, 2012 Filing 716 STIPULATED Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice (Weiswasser, Susan) (Clerk's Office modified docket text.) Modified on 12/10/2012 (tlm, ).
December 5, 2012 Filing 715 REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of $50.00, receipt no. 0752-7746199, (Maul, Anthony)
November 29, 2012 Filing 714 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 10/30/2012 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Valarie M. Ramsey valharam@aol.com (708) 860-8482. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 12/20/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/27/2013. (rp, )
November 19, 2012 Filing 713 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing held and continued to 2/7/2013 at 9:30 AM. Motion to withdraw by Amy Carletti is granted # 709 . Fact discovery is ordered closed 3/1/13; 26(a)(2) disclosure are due 4/1/13; rebuttal disclosures are due 5/17/13; expert discovery is ordered closed 6/3/13; deadline for filing dispositive motions is 7/1/13. Bench trial is set for 12/2/13 at 9:45 AM. Mailed notice (tlm)
November 19, 2012 Filing 712 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The motion of Anthony Maul to appear pro hac vice is granted. Counsel is directed to contact the Clerk ofCourt to establish an e-filing account in this district. The motion hearing date of 11/20/12 is vacated. # 706 Mailed notice (tlm)
November 19, 2012 Filing 711 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas by Rebecca R. Hanson (Hanson, Rebecca)
November 13, 2012 Filing 710 NOTICE of Motion by Bryan Matthew Webster for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney,,,, # 709 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/19/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Webster, Bryan)
November 13, 2012 Filing 709 MOTION by counsel for Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. to withdraw as attorney Appearance of Amy J. Carletti (Webster, Bryan)
November 13, 2012 Filing 708 STATUS Report Joint Status Report Regarding Scheduling by Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, CareFirst, Inc., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. (Webster, Bryan)
November 12, 2012 Filing 707 NOTICE of Motion by Susan Jessica Weiswasser for presentment of motion to appear pro hac vice # 706 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/20/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Weiswasser, Susan)
November 12, 2012 Filing 706 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7746262. (Maul, Anthony)
October 30, 2012 Filing 705 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Status hearing held on 10/30/2012, and continued to 11/19/2012 at 09:30 AM. A joint status report is to be filed by 11/1312, with a courtesy copy to Chambers, Room 2188.Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
October 12, 2012 Filing 704 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/12/12: For the reasons stated in this Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court denies Anthem and WellPoint's motion for summary judgment against Reno and Independence's motion for summary judgment against Wahner and Barnard (docket nos. # 617 and # 625 ). The Court also grants defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings against Tomanek in part and denies it in part (docket no. # 621 ). Specifically, the Court grants the motion with regard to Tomaneks claim under section 502(a)(1)(B) of ERISA and otherwise denies the motion. (mk)
October 12, 2012 Filing 703 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/12/12: For the reasons stated in this Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court denies plaintiffs' motions to certify provider classes and their motion to certify the Florida discrimination class (docket nos. # 581 , # 584 , # 587 , # 590 , # 593 , # 595 , # 597 , # 599 , # 602 & # 606 ). (mk)
August 29, 2012 Filing 702 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing held on 8/29/12. Motion by defendant Highmark Inc for leave to file instanter a sur-reply # 698 is granted. Status hearing is set for 10/30/12 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (tlm)
August 28, 2012 Filing 701 MEMORANDUM by Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. in Opposition to motion to file instanter, # 698 (Hufford, D.)
August 28, 2012 Filing 700 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas by John Louis Litchfield (Litchfield, John)
August 22, 2012 Filing 699 NOTICE of Motion by Bryan Matthew Webster for presentment of motion to file instanter, # 698 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/29/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Webster, Bryan)
August 22, 2012 Filing 698 MOTION by Defendant Highmark, Inc. to file instanter Motion for Leave to File Instanter a Sur-Reply Brief Identifying Factual Misstatements in Plaintiffs' Class Certification Reply Memorandum (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Webster, Bryan)
August 20, 2012 Filing 697 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendants' motion for leave to submit supplemental authority is granted. The motion hearing date of 8/21/12 is vacated. Mailed notice (tlm)
August 16, 2012 Filing 696 NOTICE of Motion by Michael M. Conway for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief,,,, # 695 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/21/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Conway, Michael)
August 16, 2012 Filing 695 MOTION by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. Defendants' Motion for Leave to Submit Supplemental Authority (Conway, Michael)
July 31, 2012 Filing 694 NOTICE by D. Brian Hufford of Change of Address and Change of Firm Name (Hufford, D.)
July 28, 2012 Filing 693 REPLY by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. to motion to certify class,, # 597 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Hufford, D.)
July 28, 2012 Filing 692 REPLY by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. to motion to certify class # 587 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Hufford, D.)
July 28, 2012 Filing 691 REPLY by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. to motion to certify class # 581 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6)(Hufford, D.)
July 27, 2012 Filing 690 REPLY by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. to motion to certify class # 584 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Hufford, D.)
July 27, 2012 Filing 689 REPLY by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. to motion to certify class # 595 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Hufford, D.)
July 27, 2012 Filing 688 REPLY by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. to motion to certify class # 593 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6)(Hufford, D.)
July 27, 2012 Filing 687 REPLY by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. to motion to certify class # 590 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Hufford, D.)
July 27, 2012 Filing 686 REPLY by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. to motion to certify class # 599 (Hufford, D.)
July 20, 2012 Filing 685 REPLY by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. to motion for judgment on the pleadings,,,, # 621 Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Rule 12(c) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Brenda Tomanek's Claims (Webster, Bryan)
July 20, 2012 Filing 684 REPLY by Independence Blue Cross to memorandum in opposition to motion,,, # 654 and in support of IBC's Motion/Memo For Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs Barnard and Wahner [625/626] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Jackson, Charles)
July 20, 2012 Filing 683 REPLY by Defendants Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., WellPoint, Inc. to memorandum in support of motion # 618 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(Conway, Michael)
July 20, 2012 Filing 682 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Hearing held on motion to re-file restricted exhibits (680). Motion is granted. Clerk of Court is directed to place the following documents under seal: 586, 589, 592, 601, 602, 603, 604, 656. Redacted versions are to be filed. # 680 Mailed notice (tlm)
July 10, 2012 Filing 681 NOTICE of Motion by Susan Jessica Weiswasser for presentment of Sealed motion,,,, # 680 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/19/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Weiswasser, Susan)
July 10, 2012 Filing 680 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. - Amended and Renoticed for July 19, 2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit filed as DE 586-5, # 2 Exhibit filed as DE 586-6, # 3 Exhibit filed as DE 589-5, # 4 Exhibit filed as DE 592-4, # 5 Exhibit filed as DE 592-5, # 6 Exhibit filed as DE 592-6, # 7 Exhibit filed as DE 602-6, # 8 Exhibit filed as DE 602-9, # 9 Exhibit filed as DE 603-1, # 10 Exhibit filed as DE 603-2, # 11 Exhibit filed as DE 603-3, # 12 Exhibit filed as DE 604-1, # 13 Exhibit filed as DE 604-6, # 14 Exhibit filed as DE 656-1, # 15 Exhibit filed as DE 656-4, # 16 Exhibit filed as DE 656-6, # 17 Exhibit filed as DE 656-8, # 18 Exhibit filed as DE 601-6, # 19 Exhibit filed as DE 602-3)(Weiswasser, Susan)
July 9, 2012 Filing 679 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiffs' motion to extend time and page limitations is granted. The due date for plaintiffs' class certification reply briefs is extended to 7/27/12. The page limitations are as set forth in plaintiffs' motion. The motion hearing date of 7/12/12 is vacated. Mailed notice (tlm)
July 9, 2012 Filing 678 NOTICE of Motion by Susan Jessica Weiswasser for presentment of Sealed motion,,,, # 677 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/12/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Weiswasser, Susan)
July 9, 2012 Filing 677 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit filed as DE 586-5, # 2 Exhibit filed as DE 586-6, # 3 Exhibit filed as DE 589-5, # 4 Exhibit filed as DE 592-4, # 5 Exhibit filed as DE 592-5, # 6 Exhibit filed as DE 592-6, # 7 Exhibit filed as DE 602-6, # 8 Exhibit filed as DE 602-9, # 9 Exhibit filed as DE 603-1, # 10 Exhibit filed as DE 603-2, # 11 Exhibit filed as DE 603-3, # 12 Exhibit filed as DE 604-1, # 13 Exhibit filed as DE 604-6, # 14 Exhibit filed as DE 656-1, # 15 Exhibit filed as DE 656-4, # 16 Exhibit filed as DE 656-6, # 17 Exhibit filed as DE 656-8)(Weiswasser, Susan)
July 5, 2012 Filing 676 NOTICE of Motion by Susan Jessica Weiswasser for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for leave to file excess pages, motion for relief, # 675 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/12/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Weiswasser, Susan)
July 5, 2012 Filing 675 MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion to certify class # 595 , motion to certify class # 587 , motion to certify class # 584 , motion to certify class # 593 , motion to certify class # 581 , motion to certify class # 599 , motion to certify class,, # 597 , motion to certify class # 590 to July 27, 2012 , MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. for leave to file excess pages for Plaintiffs' replies on their renewed Motions for Class Certification (Weiswasser, Susan)
July 5, 2012 Filing 674 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice (Yinger, Emily)
June 26, 2012 Filing 673 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant's motion to file under seal certain exhibits # 669 and certain defendants' motion to file certain exhibits under seal # 646 are both granted. A redacted version of the filing is to be made in the public record, and the complete filing is to be filed under seal. The chambers copy must be a complete, single, and unredacted copy of the filing. The motion hearing date of 6/28/12 is vacated. Mailed notice (tlm)
June 26, 2012 Filing 672 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. - CORRECTED RESPONSE to Defendants Wellpoint, Inc.'s and Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.'s Local 56.1 Statement of Undisputed Facts TO REPLACE DOCUMENT 660 (Hufford, D.)
June 26, 2012 Filing 671 NOTICE of Motion by Bryan Matthew Webster for presentment of Sealed motion,,,,,,,, # 669 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/28/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Webster, Bryan)
June 26, 2012 Filing 670 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 66 to Dkt. No. 659, # 2 Exhibit 85 to Dkt. No. 659, # 3 Exhibit 87 to Dkt. No. 659, # 4 Exhibit 93 to Dkt. No. 659, # 5 Exhibit 94 to Dkt. No. 659, # 6 Exhibit 95 to Dkt. No. 659, # 7 Exhibit 96 to Dkt. No. 659, # 8 Exhibit 98 to Dkt. No. 659, # 9 Exhibit 99 to Dkt. No. 659, # 10 Exhibit 102 to Dkt. No. 659, # 11 Exhibit 104 to Dkt. No. 659, # 12 Exhibit 116 to Dkt. No. 659, # 13 Exhibit 117 to Dkt. No. 659, # 14 Exhibit 118 to Dkt. No. 659, # 15 Exhibit 119 to Dkt. No. 659, # 16 Exhibit 123 to Dkt. No. 659, # 17 Exhibit 130 to Dkt. No. 659)(Webster, Bryan)
June 26, 2012 Filing 669 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Dkt. No. 659, # 2 Exhibit 5 to Dkt. No. 659, # 3 Exhibit 7 to Dkt. No. 659, # 4 Exhibit 16 to Dkt. No. 659, # 5 Exhibit 19 to Dkt. No. 659, # 6 Exhibit 21 to Dkt. No. 659, # 7 Exhibit 22 to Dkt. No. 659, # 8 Exhibit 24 to Dkt. No. 659, # 9 Exhibit 26 to Dkt. No. 659, # 10 Exhibit 27 to Dkt. No. 659, # 11 Exhibit 29 to Dkt. No. 659, # 12 Exhibit 30 to Dkt. No. 659, # 13 Exhibit 32 to Dkt. No. 659, # 14 Exhibit 33 to Dkt. No. 659, # 15 Exhibit 34 to Dkt. No. 659, # 16 Exhibit 35 to Dkt. No. 659, # 17 Exhibit 37 to Dkt. No. 659, # 18 Exhibit 38 to Dkt. No. 659, # 19 Exhibit 39 to Dkt. No. 659, # 20 Exhibit 40 to Dkt. No. 659, # 21 Exhibit 41 to Dkt. No. 659, # 22 Exhibit 42 to Dkt. No. 659, # 23 Exhibit 43 to Dkt. No. 659, # 24 Exhibit 44 to Dkt. No. 659, # 25 Exhibit 45 to Dkt. No. 659, # 26 Exhibit 46 to Dkt. No. 659, # 27 Exhibit 47 to Dkt. No. 659, # 28 Exhibit 52 to Dkt. No. 659, # 29 Exhibit 53 to Dkt. No. 659, # 30 Exhibit 54 to Dkt. No. 659, # 31 Exhibit 55 to Dkt. No. 659, # 32 Exhibit 56 to Dkt. No. 659, # 33 Exhibit 57 to Dkt. No. 659)(Webster, Bryan)
June 26, 2012 Filing 668 EXHIBIT by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 114 (Part A), # 2 Exhibit 114 (Part B), # 3 Exhibit 114 (Part C))(Webster, Bryan)
June 26, 2012 Filing 667 EXHIBIT by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 121, # 2 Exhibit 122, # 3 Exhibit 123, # 4 Exhibit 124, # 5 Exhibit 125, # 6 Exhibit 126, # 7 Exhibit 127, # 8 Exhibit 128, # 9 Exhibit 129, # 10 Exhibit 130)(Webster, Bryan)
June 26, 2012 Filing 666 EXHIBIT by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 120)(Webster, Bryan)
June 26, 2012 Filing 665 EXHIBIT by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 115, # 2 Exhibit 116, # 3 Exhibit 117, # 4 Exhibit 118, # 5 Exhibit 119)(Webster, Bryan)
June 26, 2012 Filing 664 EXHIBIT by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 111, # 2 Exhibit 112, # 3 Exhibit 113)(Webster, Bryan)
June 25, 2012 Filing 663 EXHIBIT by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Independence Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 91, # 2 Exhibit 92, # 3 Exhibit 93, # 4 Exhibit 94, # 5 Exhibit 95, # 6 Exhibit 96, # 7 Exhibit 97, # 8 Exhibit 98, # 9 Exhibit 99, # 10 Exhibit 100, # 11 Exhibit 101, # 12 Exhibit 102, # 13 Exhibit 103, # 14 Exhibit 104, # 15 Exhibit 105, # 16 Exhibit 106, # 17 Exhibit 107, # 18 Exhibit 108, # 19 Exhibit 109, # 20 Exhibit 110)(Webster, Bryan)
June 25, 2012 Filing 662 EXHIBIT by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 61, # 2 Exhibit 62, # 3 Exhibit 63, # 4 Exhibit 64, # 5 Exhibit 65, # 6 Exhibit 66, # 7 Exhibit 67, # 8 Exhibit 68, # 9 Exhibit 69, # 10 Exhibit 70, # 11 Exhibit 71, # 12 Exhibit 72, # 13 Exhibit 73, # 14 Exhibit 74, # 15 Exhibit 75, # 16 Exhibit 76, # 17 Exhibit 77, # 18 Exhibit 78, # 19 Exhibit 79, # 20 Exhibit 80, # 21 Exhibit 81, # 22 Exhibit 82, # 23 Exhibit 83, # 24 Exhibit 84, # 25 Exhibit 85, # 26 Exhibit 86, # 27 Exhibit 87, # 28 Exhibit 88, # 29 Exhibit 89, # 30 Exhibit 90)(Webster, Bryan)
June 25, 2012 Filing 661 EXHIBIT by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. regarding response in opposition to motion,,,,,,,,,, # 659 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 31, # 2 Exhibit 32, # 3 Exhibit 33, # 4 Exhibit 34, # 5 Exhibit 35, # 6 Exhibit 36, # 7 Exhibit 37, # 8 Exhibit 38, # 9 Exhibit 39, # 10 Exhibit 40, # 11 Exhibit 41, # 12 Exhibit 42, # 13 Exhibit 43, # 14 Exhibit 44, # 15 Exhibit 45, # 16 Exhibit 46, # 17 Exhibit 47, # 18 Exhibit 48, # 19 Exhibit 49, # 20 Exhibit 50, # 21 Exhibit 51, # 22 Exhibit 52, # 23 Exhibit 53, # 24 Exhibit 54, # 25 Exhibit 55, # 26 Exhibit 56, # 27 Exhibit 57, # 28 Exhibit 58, # 29 Exhibit 59, # 30 Exhibit 60)(Webster, Bryan)
June 25, 2012 Filing 660 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, David R Barber, D.C., Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., California Chiropractic Association, Jerry Capone, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Ryan S Ford, D.C., Kendall Gearhart, D.C., Katherine Hopkins, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Casey Paulsen, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Dean Renneke, D.C., Andrew Reno, D.C., Eric Thompson, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Susanna Wood, Ronald L. Young, D.C. to memorandum in opposition to motion,,, # 658 to Defendants Wellpoint, Inc.'s and Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.'s Local 56.1 Statement of Undisputed Facts (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 2A, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9)(Hufford, D.)
June 25, 2012 Filing 659 RESPONSE by Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Mark Barnard, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. to certify class of Independence Blue Cross Providers # 595 , MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Jay Korsen, D.C., Jeffrey P. # 606 , MOTION by Plaintiffs Ian Barlow, Jay Korsen, D.C. to certify class of BCBS Rhode Island Providers # 593 , MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C. to certify class of Highmark Providers # 599 , MOTION by Plaintiff Anthony Fava, D.C. to certify class of Horizon Providers # 590 , MOTION by Plaintiffs Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program to certify class of BCBS Florida Providers # 584 , MOTION by Plaintiff Andrew Reno, D.C. to certify class # 581 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30)(Webster, Bryan)
June 25, 2012 Filing 658 MEMORANDUM by Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, David R Barber, D.C., Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., California Chiropractic Association, Jerry Capone, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Ryan S Ford, D.C., Kendall Gearhart, D.C., Katherine Hopkins, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Casey Paulsen, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Dean Renneke, D.C., Andrew Reno, D.C., Eric Thompson, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Susanna Wood, Ronald L. Young, D.C. in Opposition to motion for summary judgment # 617 (Hufford, D.)
June 25, 2012 Filing 657 MEMORANDUM by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida in Opposition to motion to certify class # 587 Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.'s Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff Peri Dwyer's Renewed Motion to Certify a Florida Chiropractic Discrimination Class (Webster, Bryan)
June 25, 2012 Filing 656 DECLARATION of D. Brian Hufford regarding memorandum in opposition to motion,,, # 654 in Support of Plaintiff's Motion in Opposition to Independence Blue Cross' Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, RESTRICTED # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4 RESTRICTED, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6 RESTRICTED, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8 RESTRICTED, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)(Hufford, D.) (Clerk's Office modified docket text.) (RESTRICTED)
June 25, 2012 Filing 655 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, David R Barber, D.C., Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., California Chiropractic Association, Jerry Capone, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Ryan S Ford, D.C., Kendall Gearhart, D.C., Katherine Hopkins, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Casey Paulsen, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Dean Renneke, D.C., Andrew Reno, D.C., Eric Thompson, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Susanna Wood, Ronald L. Young, D.C. to memorandum in opposition to motion,,, # 654 to Defendants' Rule 56.1(a)(3) Statement of Undisputed Material Facts (Hufford, D.)
June 25, 2012 Filing 654 MEMORANDUM by Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, David R Barber, D.C., Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., California Chiropractic Association, Jerry Capone, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Ryan S Ford, D.C., Kendall Gearhart, D.C., Katherine Hopkins, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Casey Paulsen, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Dean Renneke, D.C., Andrew Reno, D.C., Eric Thompson, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Susanna Wood, Ronald L. Young, D.C. in Opposition to motion for summary judgment # 625 (Hufford, D.)
June 25, 2012 Filing 653 MEMORANDUM by Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, David R Barber, D.C., Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., California Chiropractic Association, Jerry Capone, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Ryan S Ford, D.C., Kendall Gearhart, D.C., Katherine Hopkins, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Casey Paulsen, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Dean Renneke, D.C., Andrew Reno, D.C., Eric Thompson, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Susanna Wood, Ronald L. Young, D.C. in Opposition to motion for judgment on the pleadings,,,, # 621 (Hufford, D.)
June 25, 2012 Filing 652 NOTICE by Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. re sealed document,,,,, # 651 Notice of Filing Exhibits Under Seal to Certain Defendants Joint Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Certification of BlueCard Classes (Yinger, Emily)
June 25, 2012 Filing 651 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. Under Seal Exhibit Numbers 1-3, 18-20, 23, 25-50, 56-59, 60-64 to Certain Defendants Joint Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Certification of BlueCard Classes (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3, # 2 Exhibit 18-20, # 3 Exhibit 23, # 4 Exhibit 25-28, # 5 Exhibit 29 part 1, # 6 Exhibit 29 part 2, # 7 Exhibit 30-50, # 8 Exhibit 56-59, # 9 Exhibit 60-64)(Yinger, Emily)
June 25, 2012 Filing 650 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant WellPoint, Inc. Exhibit 6 to Docket 649 (Hanson, Rebecca)
June 25, 2012 Filing 649 RESPONSE by WellPoint, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Andrew Reno, D.C. to certify class # 581 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 through 18)(Hanson, Rebecca)
June 25, 2012 Filing 648 MEMORANDUM by Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. in Opposition to motion to certify class,, # 606 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-64)(Yinger, Emily)
June 25, 2012 Filing 647 NOTICE of Motion by Emily M Yinger for presentment of motion for leave to file,,,, # 646 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/28/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Yinger, Emily)
June 25, 2012 Filing 646 MOTION by Defendants Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. for leave to file CERTAIN EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR JOINT BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CERTIFY BLUECARD CLASSES UNDER SEAL (Yinger, Emily)
June 25, 2012 Filing 645 MEMORANDUM by Independence Blue Cross in Opposition to motion to certify class # 595 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Exs. A-E)(Jackson, Charles)
June 21, 2012 Filing 644 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion for extension of time to file response # 643 is granted. Responses due on 6/22/12 will be due on 6/25/12 due to the power outage expected to begin at 6 pm on 6/22/12. (mk)
June 21, 2012 Filing 643 MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. for extension of time to file response/reply - Letter to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly with request to extend Plaintiffs' and Defendants' time to respond to certain motions from Friday, June 22 to Monday, June 25 - (Weiswasser, Susan)
June 7, 2012 Filing 641 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Jay Korsen, D.C., Jeffrey P. # 606 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Smoller, Leigh)
June 5, 2012 Filing 642 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Hearing held on motions to dismiss # 635 , # 638 . Motion to voluntarily dismiss Blue Shield of California is granted. Stipulated motion for dismissal of defendant Premera Blue Cross, is granted. Clerk of Court is directed to modify the docket to reflect the dismissals. Mailed notice (tlm)
May 30, 2012 Filing 640 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The agreed motion for entry of stipulation is granted. The motion hearing date of 5/31/12 is vacated. # 633 Mailed notice (tlm)
May 30, 2012 Filing 639 NOTICE of Motion by Michael P. Padden for presentment of motion to dismiss # 638 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/5/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Padden, Michael)
May 30, 2012 Filing 638 MOTION by Defendant Premera Blue Cross to dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice (Padden, Michael)
May 30, 2012 Filing 637 NOTICE of Motion by Leigh Handelman Smoller for presentment of motion to dismiss,, # 635 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/5/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Smoller, Leigh)
May 30, 2012 Filing 636 AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Jay Korsen, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. in Support of MOTION by Plaintiffs Andrew Reno, D.C., Jay Korsen, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Peri Dwyer, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., Michelle M Askar, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Barry A Wahner, D.C., Mark Barn # 635 Blue Shield of California (Smoller, Leigh)
May 30, 2012 Filing 635 MOTION by Plaintiffs Andrew Reno, D.C., Jay Korsen, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Peri Dwyer, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., Michelle M Askar, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Barry A Wahner, D.C., Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Ian Barlow, Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, David R Barber, D.C., Katherine Hopkins, International Chiropractors Association, New York Chiropractic Council, Eric Thompson, D.C. to dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Smoller, Leigh)
May 25, 2012 Filing 634 NOTICE of Motion by Susan Jessica Weiswasser for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief,, # 633 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/31/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Weiswasser, Susan)
May 25, 2012 Filing 633 MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C.for Court's So-Ordering of Agreed Stipulation Concerning Certain Claims - and the modification and clarification thereof (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Agreed Stipulation)(Weiswasser, Susan)
May 16, 2012 Filing 632 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Status hearing held and continued to 8/29/2012 at 09:30 AM. Responses to motions for summary judgment are to be filed by 6/22/2012; replies to motions are to be filed by 7/20/2012. (or, )
May 15, 2012 Filing 631 Revised Exhibit by Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. - Revised Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Susan J. Weiswasser in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Certification of the BlueCard Classes originally filed at Doc. 602 (Weiswasser, Susan)
May 14, 2012 Filing 630 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendants' renewed motion to dismiss the claims of plaintiffs Korsen and Barlow # 569 is denied without prejudice. Defendants may renew the motion, if they wish, upon disposition of the Rhode Island litigation referenced in the motion. They may also, if they wish, argue the topics contained in the motion in addressing the issue of whether Korsen and Barlow are appropriate representatives of any class for which they have been proposed as representatives. (mk)
May 11, 2012 Filing 629 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Independence Blue Cross (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Ex. 4, # 2 Exhibit B, Exs 2-3, # 3 Exhibit D and Tab 1, # 4 Exhibit E and Tab 1, # 5 Exhibit F, # 6 Exhibit G (part 1), # 7 Exhibit G (part 2))(Jackson, Charles)
May 11, 2012 Filing 628 NOTICE of Motion by Charles Clark Jackson for presentment of motion for summary judgment # 625 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/16/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Jackson, Charles)
May 11, 2012 Filing 627 RULE 56.1(a)(3) Statement by Independence Blue Cross regarding motion for summary judgment # 625 Against Plaintiffs Barnard and Wahner (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Index, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E (part 1), # 7 Exhibit E (part 2), # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G (part 1), # 10 Exhibit G (part 2), # 11 Exhibit H (part 1), # 12 Exhibit H (part 2), # 13 Exhibit I (part 1), # 14 Exhibit I (part), # 15 Exhibit J, # 16 Exhibit K)(Jackson, Charles)
May 11, 2012 Filing 626 MEMORANDUM by Independence Blue Cross in support of motion for summary judgment # 625 Against Plaintiffs Barnard and Wahner (Jackson, Charles)
May 11, 2012 Filing 625 MOTION by Defendant Independence Blue Cross for summary judgment Against Plaintiffs Barnard and Wahner (Jackson, Charles)
May 11, 2012 Filing 624 NOTICE of Motion by Bryan Matthew Webster for presentment of motion for judgment on the pleadings,,,, # 621 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/16/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Webster, Bryan)
May 11, 2012 Filing 623 MEMORANDUM by Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. in support of motion for judgment on the pleadings,,,, # 621 as to Brenda Tomanek's Claims (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Webster, Bryan)
May 11, 2012 Filing 622 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., WellPoint, Inc. regarding Rule 56 statement, # 619 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C, # 2 Exhibit G through K, O and Q)(Conway, Michael)
May 11, 2012 Filing 621 MOTION by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. for judgment on the pleadings as to Brenda Tomanek's Claims (Webster, Bryan)
May 11, 2012 Filing 620 NOTICE of Motion by Michael M. Conway for presentment of motion for summary judgment # 617 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/16/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Conway, Michael)
May 11, 2012 Filing 619 RULE 56.1 Statement by Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., WellPoint, Inc. regarding motion for summary judgment # 617 on the Claims of Plaintiff Andrew Reno (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through E, # 2 Exhibit F through Q)(Conway, Michael)
May 11, 2012 Filing 618 MEMORANDUM by Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., WellPoint, Inc. in support of motion for summary judgment # 617 on the Claims of Plaintiff Andrew Reno (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Conway, Michael)
May 11, 2012 Filing 617 MOTION by Defendants WellPoint, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc. for summary judgment on the Claims of Plaintiff Andrew Reno (Conway, Michael)
May 9, 2012 Filing 616 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The motion hearing date of 5/10/12 is vacated, because the motions in question have been re-noticed for 5/16/12. (mk)
May 7, 2012 Filing 615 NOTICE of Motion by Susan Jessica Weiswasser for presentment of motion to certify class,, # 606 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/16/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Weiswasser, Susan)
May 7, 2012 Filing 614 NOTICE of Motion by Susan Jessica Weiswasser for presentment of motion to certify class # 584 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/16/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Weiswasser, Susan)
May 7, 2012 Filing 613 NOTICE of Motion by Susan Jessica Weiswasser for presentment of motion to certify class # 593 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/16/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Weiswasser, Susan)
May 7, 2012 Filing 612 NOTICE of Motion by Susan Jessica Weiswasser for presentment of motion to certify class # 595 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/16/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Weiswasser, Susan)
May 7, 2012 Filing 611 NOTICE of Motion by Susan Jessica Weiswasser for presentment of motion to certify class # 599 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/16/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Weiswasser, Susan)
May 7, 2012 Filing 610 NOTICE of Motion by Susan Jessica Weiswasser for presentment of motion to certify class # 590 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/16/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Weiswasser, Susan)
May 7, 2012 Filing 609 NOTICE of Motion by Susan Jessica Weiswasser for presentment of motion to certify class # 587 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/16/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Weiswasser, Susan)
May 7, 2012 Filing 608 NOTICE of Motion by Susan Jessica Weiswasser for presentment of motion to certify class # 581 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/16/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Weiswasser, Susan)
May 2, 2012 Filing 607 NOTICE of Motion by D. Brian Hufford for presentment of motion to certify class,, # 606 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/10/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Hufford, D.)
May 2, 2012 Filing 606 MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Jay Korsen, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. to certify class Plaintiffs' CORRECTED Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of Certification of the BlueCard Classes Responses due by 5/14/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hufford, D.)
April 26, 2012 Filing 605 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL of Appearance of Jacqueline M. Saue by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas (Hanson, Rebecca)
April 24, 2012 Filing 604 DECLARATION of Susan J Weiswasser regarding motion to certify class # 593 of BCBS Rhode Island Providers (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Weiswasser, Susan) (RESTRICTED)
April 24, 2012 Filing 603 DECLARATION of Susan J. Weiswasser regarding motion to certify class # 599 Highmark Providers (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Hufford, D.)
April 24, 2012 Filing 602 MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. to certify class BlueCard (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Hufford, D.) (RESTRICTED)
April 24, 2012 Filing 601 DECLARATION of Susan J Weiswasser regarding motion to certify class # 595 of IBC Providers (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6 (Restricted), # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15)(Weiswasser, Susan) Modified Exhibit 6 on 4/24/2012 (tlm).
April 24, 2012 Filing 600 NOTICE of Motion by D. Brian Hufford for presentment of motion to certify class # 599 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/10/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Hufford, D.)
April 24, 2012 Filing 599 MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C. to certify class of Highmark Providers Responses due by 5/24/2012 (Hufford, D.)
April 24, 2012 Filing 598 NOTICE of Motion by D. Brian Hufford for presentment of motion to certify class,, # 597 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/10/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Hufford, D.)
April 24, 2012 Filing 597 MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. to certify class - the BlueCard Classes Responses due by 5/24/2012 (Hufford, D.)
April 24, 2012 Filing 596 NOTICE of Motion by D. Brian Hufford for presentment of motion to certify class # 595 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/10/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Hufford, D.)
April 24, 2012 Filing 595 MOTION by Plaintiffs Mark Barnard, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. to certify class of Independence Blue Cross Providers Responses due by 5/24/2012 (Hufford, D.)
April 24, 2012 Filing 594 NOTICE of Motion by D. Brian Hufford for presentment of motion to certify class # 593 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/10/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Hufford, D.)
April 24, 2012 Filing 593 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ian Barlow, Jay Korsen, D.C. to certify class of BCBS Rhode Island Providers Responses due by 5/24/2012 (Hufford, D.)
April 24, 2012 Filing 592 DECLARATION of Susan J Weiswasser regarding motion to certify class # 590 of Horizon Providers (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Errata 8)(Hufford, D.) (RESTRiCTED)
April 24, 2012 Filing 591 NOTICE of Motion by D. Brian Hufford for presentment of motion to certify class # 590 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/10/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Hufford, D.)
April 24, 2012 Filing 590 MOTION by Plaintiff Anthony Fava, D.C. to certify class of Horizon Providers Responses due by 5/24/2012 (Hufford, D.)
April 24, 2012 Filing 589 DECLARATION of Susan J Weiswasser regarding motion to certify class # 587 - Florida Discrimination (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Hufford, D.) (RESTRICTED)
April 24, 2012 Filing 588 NOTICE of Motion by D. Brian Hufford for presentment of motion to certify class # 587 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/10/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Hufford, D.)
April 24, 2012 Filing 587 MOTION by Plaintiff Peri Dwyer, D.C. to certify class - Florida Discrimination Responses due by 5/24/2012 (Hufford, D.)
April 24, 2012 Filing 586 DECLARATION of Susan J Weiswasser regarding motion to certify class # 584 of BCBS Florida Providers (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Errata 6)(Hufford, D.) (RESTRICTED)
April 24, 2012 Filing 585 NOTICE of Motion by D. Brian Hufford for presentment of motion to certify class # 584 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/10/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Hufford, D.)
April 24, 2012 Filing 584 MOTION by Plaintiffs Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program to certify class of BCBS Florida Providers Responses due by 5/24/2012 (Hufford, D.)
April 24, 2012 Filing 583 DECLARATION of Susan J Weiswasser regarding motion to certify class # 581 of WellPoint Providers (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15)(Hufford, D.)
April 24, 2012 Filing 582 NOTICE of Motion by D. Brian Hufford for presentment of motion to certify class # 581 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/15/2012 at 9:30 AM. (Hufford, D.) (Clerk's Office Modified text (tlm).
April 24, 2012 Filing 581 MOTION by Plaintiff Andrew Reno, D.C. to certify class Responses due by 5/24/2012 (Hufford, D.)
April 3, 2012 Filing 580 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Motion for extension of time # 577 is granted. Renewed class certification motions are to be filed by 4/23/2012. Motion for leave to file excess pages # 577 is granted. Page limites as stated in open court. Responses to motions for class certification due 6/22/2012; reply briefs due 7/20/2012. Status hearing set for 4/19/2012 is vacated and reset to 5/16/2012 at 09:30 AM. (or, )
March 27, 2012 Filing 579 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The motion to withdraw the appearance of Jonathan Cyrluk is granted. The motion hearing date of 3/29/12 is vacated. Mailed notice (tlm)
March 27, 2012 Filing 578 NOTICE of Motion by Susan Jessica Weiswasser for presentment of extension of time,,,,, motion for leave to file excess pages,,,, # 577 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/3/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Weiswasser, Susan)
March 27, 2012 Filing 577 MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. for extension of time of one week to file Plaintiffs' Renewed Motions for Class Certification , MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. for leave to file excess pages for Plaintiffs' briefing on their Renewed Motions for Class Certification (Weiswasser, Susan)
March 23, 2012 Filing 576 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan M. Cyrluk for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief # 575 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/29/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
March 23, 2012 Filing 575 MOTION by Movant Jonathan M Cyrluk to Withdraw Appearance (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
March 14, 2012 Filing 574 REPLY by Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. to memorandum in support of motion,,,,, # 570 , memorandum in opposition to motion,, # 573 , MOTION by Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Highmark, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, WellPoint, Inc., Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross B # 569 Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Renewed Motion to Dismiss Claims Asserted by Plaintiffs Jay Korsen and Ian Barlow (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Webster, Bryan)
February 29, 2012 Filing 573 MEMORANDUM by Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, David R Barber, D.C., Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Eric Thompson, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. in Opposition to motion to dismiss,,,, # 569 Claims Asserted by Jay Korsen DC and Ian Barlow OT (Hufford, D.)
February 8, 2012 Filing 572 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Motion hearing held on 2/8/2012 regarding motion to dismiss. Response to motion is to be filed by 2/29/2012; Reply is due by 3/14/2012. Status hearing set for 4/19/2012 at 09:30 AM. Renewed motion for class certification is to be filed by 4/16/2012. (or, )
February 3, 2012 Filing 571 Notice of Defendants' Renewed Motion to Dismiss Claims Asserted by Plaintiffs Jay Korsen and Ian Barlow NOTICE of Motion by Bryan Matthew Webster for presentment of before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/8/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Webster, Bryan)
February 3, 2012 Filing 570 MEMORANDUM by Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss,,,, # 569 Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Renewed Motion to Dismiss Claims Asserted by Plaintiffs Jay Korsen and Ian Barlow (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Webster, Bryan)
February 3, 2012 Filing 569 MOTION by Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Highmark, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, WellPoint, Inc., Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Premera Blue Cross, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Wellmark, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Health Care Services Corporation, Independence Blue Cross, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Anthem Blue Cross of California, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, The Regence Group, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Shield of California, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, CareFirst, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc. to dismiss Claims Asserted by Plaintiffs Jay Korsen and Ian Barlow (Webster, Bryan)
February 1, 2012 Filing 568 NOTICE by Mark E Schmidtke of Change of Address (Schmidtke, Mark)
January 23, 2012 Filing 567 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/23/12. (mk)
January 23, 2012 Filing 566 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court grants defendants Anthem Ohio and WellPoint's motion for summary judgment on the remaining claims of plaintiff Katherine Hopkins [docket no. 497]. (mk)
December 28, 2011 Filing 565 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/28/2011. (mk)
December 28, 2011 Filing 564 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: For the reasons stated above, the Court denies plaintiffs' motion for certification of the Provider and Florida Chiropractic Discrimination Classes and defers consideration of plaintiffs' motion for certification of the Subscriber Class [dkt. no. 460]. In addition, the claims of plaintiff Gregory Kuhlman are voluntarily dismissed without prejudice. The Court terminates defendant's motion to cite supplemental authority [dkt. no. 539], their motion for leave to file response [dkt. no. 541], and several documents incorrectly docketed as motions [dkt. nos. 551, 552 & 553]. The Court will set the next status hearing once it rules on the motion for summary judgment concerning the claims of plaintiff Katherine Hopkins. (mk)
December 19, 2011 Filing 563 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendants' motions to file under seal are granted, as modified by defendants' motion to withdraw one of those motions in part [docket nos. # 555 , # 556 , # 561 ]. The Court reminds defendants that the under-seal filings must be complete versions of their submissions, not piecemeal or partial versions. The motion hearing date of 12/20/11 is vacated. Mailed notice. (ea, ) (ea, ).
December 15, 2011 Filing 562 NOTICE of Motion by Bryan Matthew Webster for presentment of motion to unseal document, motion for relief,,,,,,,,,,,, # 561 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/20/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Webster, Bryan)
December 15, 2011 Filing 561 MOTION by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. to unseal document response in opposition to motion,,,,, # 514 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Dkt. No. 514, # 2 Exhibit 2-1 to Dkt. No. 514, # 3 Exhibit 2-2 to Dkt. No. 514, # 4 Exhibit 2-3 to Dkt. No. 514, # 5 Exhibit 2-4 to Dkt. No. 514, # 6 Exhibit 3 to Dkt. No. 514, # 7 Exhibit 37 to Dkt. No. 514, # 8 Exhibit 38 to Dkt. No. 514, # 9 Exhibit 41 to Dkt. No. 514, # 10 Exhibit 46 to Dkt. No. 514, # 11 Exhibit 54 to Dkt. No. 514, # 12 Exhibit 56 to Dkt. No. 514)(Webster, Bryan)
December 12, 2011 Filing 560 Notice of Motion of Defendants' Motion to File Certain Exhibits In Support of Their Class Certification Opposition Brief Under Seal NOTICE of Motion by Bryan Matthew Webster for presentment of Sealed motion,,,,,,,,, # 556 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/20/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Webster, Bryan)
December 12, 2011 Filing 559 Notice of Motion of Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.'s Motion to File Certain Exhibits in Support of the Florida Class Certification Opposition Brief Under Seal NOTICE of Motion by Bryan Matthew Webster for presentment of Sealed motion, # 555 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/20/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Webster, Bryan)
December 12, 2011 Filing 558 NOTICE by Anthem Ohio, WellPoint, Inc. re sealed document, # 557 Unredacted Exhibits D, E, H, I, and J (In the Form Received from Plaintiff Hopkins) to Defendant WellPoint Inc's and Community Insurance Company's Rule 56.1 Statement (Docket No. 500-1) Filed Under Seal Pursuant to the December 11, 2011 Order of the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly (Conway, Michael)
December 12, 2011 Filing 557 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Anthem Ohio, WellPoint, Inc. Unredacted Exhibits D, E, H, I and J (In the form received from Plaintiff Hopkins) to Defendant Wellpoint's and Community Insurance Company's Rule 56.1 Statement (docket # 500-1) filed Under Seal pursuant to the December 11, 2011 Order of the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly (Conway, Michael)
December 12, 2011 Filing 556 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. Defendants' Motion to File Certain Exhibits in Support of Their Class Certification Opposition Brief Under Seal (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Dkt. No. 514, # 2 Exhibit 2-1 to Dkt. No. 514, # 3 Exhibit 2-2 to Dkt. No. 514, # 4 Exhibit 2-3 to Dkt. No. 514, # 5 Exhibit 2-4 to Dkt. No. 514, # 6 Exhibit 3 to Dkt. No. 514, # 7 Exhibit 17 to Dkt. No. 514, # 8 Exhibit 20 to Dkt. No. 514, # 9 Exhibit 26 to Dkt. No. 514, # 10 Exhibit 27 to Dkt. No. 514, # 11 Exhibit 30 to Dkt. No. 514, # 12 Exhibit 31 to Dkt. No. 514, # 13 Exhibit 31 to Dkt. No. 514, # 14 Exhibit 34 to Dkt. No. 514, # 15 Exhibit 35 to Dkt. No. 514, # 16 Exhibit 37 to Dkt. No. 514, # 17 Exhibit 38 to Dkt. No. 514, # 18 Exhibit 39 to Dkt. No. 514, # 19 Exhibit 40 to Dkt. No. 514, # 20 Exhibit 41 to Dkt. No. 514, # 21 Exhibit 42 to Dkt. No. 514, # 22 Exhibit 43 to Dkt. No. 514, # 23 Exhibit 44 to Dkt. No. 514, # 24 Exhibit 45 to Dkt. No. 514, # 25 Exhibit 46 to Dkt. No. 514, # 26 Exhibit 48 to Dkt. No. 514, # 27 Exhibit 50 to Dkt. No. 514, # 28 Exhibit 51 to Dkt. No. 514, # 29 Exhibit 52 to Dkt. No. 514, # 30 Exhibit 54 to Dkt. No. 514, # 31 Exhibit 55 to Dkt. No. 514, # 32 Exhibit 56 to Dkt. No. 514, # 33 Exhibit 59 to Dkt. No. 514)(Webster, Bryan)
December 12, 2011 Filing 555 SEALED MOTION by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.'s Motion to File Certain Exhibits in Support of the Florida Class Certification Opposition Brief Under Seal (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3 to Dkt. No. 513, # 2 Exhibit 4 to Dkt. No. 513, # 3 Exhibit 6 to Dkt. No. 513)(Webster, Bryan)
December 11, 2011 Filing 554 SEALED REPLY by Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Tri3 Enterprises LLC, Barry A Wahner, D.C. to memorandum in support of motion,,, # 525 Unredacted exhibits to the Reply Declaration of D. Brian Hufford in support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class filed under seal pursuant to the December 11, 2011 Order of the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly [Doc #550] (Attachments: # 1 2, # 2 4, # 3 6, # 4 7, # 5 8, # 6 9, # 7 10, # 8 11, # 9 13, # 10 14, # 11 17, # 12 18)(Weiswasser, Susan)
December 11, 2011 Filing 553 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Intervenor Plaintiff Tri3 Enterprises LLC Unredacted exhibits to the Declaration of D. Brian Hufford in support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class filed under seal pursuant to the December 11, 2011 Order of the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly [Doc #550] (Attachments: # 1 55, # 2 56, # 3 57, # 4 58, # 5 59, # 6 60, # 7 61, # 8 62, # 9 63, # 10 64, # 11 65, # 12 66, # 13 67, # 14 68, # 15 69, # 16 70, # 17 70A, # 18 76)(Weiswasser, Susan)
December 11, 2011 Filing 552 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Intervenor Plaintiff Tri3 Enterprises LLC Unredacted exhibits to the Declaration of D. Brian Hufford in support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class filed under seal pursuant to the December 11, 2011 Order of the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly [Doc #550] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 31, # 2 Exhibit 32, # 3 Exhibit 33, # 4 Exhibit 34, # 5 Exhibit 35, # 6 Exhibit 36, # 7 Exhibit 37, # 8 Exhibit 38, # 9 Exhibit 39, # 10 Exhibit 40, # 11 Exhibit 41, # 12 Exhibit 42, # 13 Exhibit 43, # 14 Exhibit 44, # 15 Exhibit 45, # 16 Exhibit 46, # 17 Exhibit 47, # 18 Exhibit 48, # 19 Exhibit 49, # 20 Exhibit 50, # 21 Exhibit 51, # 22 Exhibit 52, # 23 Exhibit 53, # 24 Exhibit 54)(Weiswasser, Susan)
December 11, 2011 Filing 551 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Intervenor Plaintiff Tri3 Enterprises LLC Unredacgted exhibits to the Declaration of D. Brian Hufford in support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class filed under seal pursuant to the December 11, 2011 Order of the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly [Doc #550] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3, # 2 Exhibit 5, # 3 Exhibit 6, # 4 Exhibit 7, # 5 Exhibit 8, # 6 Exhibit 9, # 7 Exhibit 10, # 8 Exhibit 11, # 9 Exhibit 12, # 10 Exhibit 13, # 11 Exhibit 14, # 12 Exhibit 15, # 13 Exhibit 17, # 14 Exhibit 18, # 15 Exhibit 19, # 16 Exhibit 20, # 17 Exhibit 21, # 18 Exhibit 22, # 19 Exhibit 23, # 20 Exhibit 24, # 21 Exhibit 25, # 22 Exhibit 26, # 23 Exhibit 27, # 24 Exhibit 28, # 25 Exhibit 29, # 26 Exhibit 30)(Weiswasser, Susan)
December 11, 2011 Filing 550 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: It appears to the Court that the parties have filed in the public record redacted submissions with regard to the pending motions for class certification and the pending motion for summary judgment with regard to plaintiff Hopkins. This is permitted by the protective order entered by the Court with regard to a particular filing only if a non-redacted version is filed under seal so that there is a complete record of what has been submitted to the Court for consideration. See Protective Order (dated Sept. 14, 2010), par. 19. It does not appear to the Court that any non-redacted versions of these submissions have been filed under seal. The parties are directed to rectify this by filing under seal unredacted versions of these submissions, by no later than 12:00 p.m. Chicago time on 12/12/11. (mk)
October 17, 2011 Filing 549 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., J # 460 , declaration, # 463 , declaration # 462 , declaration # 464 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Handelman, Leigh)
October 13, 2011 Filing 548 RESPONSE by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. to notice of filing # 547 of Dismissal of Gregory Kuhlman's Claims (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Yinger, Emily)
October 7, 2011 Filing 547 NOTICE by Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C. of Dismissal (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Handelman, Leigh)
September 23, 2011 Filing 546 NOTICE by Steven E. Siff of Change of Address (Siff, Steven)
September 20, 2011 Filing 545 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Susanna Wood to notice of filing # 544 of Order Granting Motion to Enforce Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Handelman, Leigh)
September 20, 2011 Filing 544 NOTICE by All Defendants of Order Granting Motion to Enforce Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Order))(Runnels, Charis)
September 20, 2011 Filing 543 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Katherine Hopkins, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. to notice of motion, # 542 (Axelrod, Robert)
September 16, 2011 Filing 542 NOTICE of Defendants Motion for Leave to file Response to Plaintiffs Letter to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly Regarding the Love Settlement NOTICE of Motion by Emily M Yinger for presentment of motion for leave to file, # 541 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/21/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Yinger, Emily)
September 16, 2011 Filing 541 MOTION by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. for leave to file Response to Plaintiffs Letter to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly regarding the Love Settlement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit One, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit Two, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit Three, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit Four)(Yinger, Emily)
September 9, 2011 Filing 540 Notice of Defendants' Motion for Leave to Advise the Court of Supplemental Authority NOTICE of Motion by Bryan Matthew Webster for presentment of motion for leave to file,,,, # 539 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/14/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Webster, Bryan)
September 9, 2011 Filing 539 MOTION by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. for leave to file Defendants' Motion for Leave to Advise the Court of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Webster, Bryan)
September 9, 2011 Filing 538 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Handelman, Leigh)
September 7, 2011 Filing 537 Letter by Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C. Letter from Robert J. Axelrod to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly filed pursuant to the order of Judge Federico Moreno, U.S.D.J. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Axelrod, Robert)
August 19, 2011 Filing 536 RULE 56 Local Rule 56.1 Statement by Anthem Ohio, WellPoint, Inc. regarding motion for summary judgment # 497 Response to Plaintiff's Additional Statements of Undisputed Material Fact (Conway, Michael)
August 19, 2011 Filing 535 MEMORANDUM by Anthem Ohio, WellPoint, Inc. in support of motion for summary judgment # 497 on the remaining claims of Plaintiff Katherine Hopkins (Conway, Michael)
July 28, 2011 Filing 534 RULE 56 c Statement by Katherine Hopkins regarding motion for summary judgment # 497 Response to Defendants' LR 56.1 Statement (Handelman, Leigh)
July 28, 2011 Filing 533 MEMORANDUM by Katherine Hopkins in Opposition to motion for summary judgment # 497 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Redacted, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Redacted, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Redacted, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 Redacted, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 Redacted, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 Redacted)(Handelman, Leigh)
July 13, 2011 Filing 532 SUR-REPLY by Defendant Health Care Services Corporation to memorandum in support of motion,,, # 525 Sur-reply on Class Certification Daubert Issues (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Gaier Dep Transcript Pages)(Witt, Helen)
July 8, 2011 Filing 531 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. to order on motion for leave to file,, status hearing,,, # 530 Plaintiffs' response to memorandum by defendants concerning supplemental authority (519, 520) per order 7/6/11 (Axelrod, Robert)
July 6, 2011 Filing 530 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing held. Defendants' surreply relating exclusively to the Daubert issue is due 7/13/2011. Motion for leave to submit supplemental authority and motion for leave to advise court about supplemental authority are granted (519, 520). Plaintiff's response to memorandum by defendants concerning supplemental authority is due 7/8/2011. (or, )
July 1, 2011 Filing 529 RESPONSE by Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. to MOTION by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shiel # 520 (refiled under correct user name) (Axelrod, Robert)
July 1, 2011 Filing 528 RESPONSE by Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. to MOTION by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida for leave to file BCBSFL, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Submit Supplemental Authority in Support of Its Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify A Florida Chiropractic Discrimination # 519 (refiled under correct user name) (Axelrod, Robert)
June 30, 2011 Filing 527 RESPONSE by Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. to MOTION by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shiel # 520 (Hufford, D.)
June 30, 2011 Filing 526 RESPONSE by Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. to MOTION by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida for leave to file BCBSFL, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Submit Supplemental Authority in Support of Its Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify A Florida Chiropractic Discrimination # 519 (Hufford, D.)
June 30, 2011 Filing 525 MEMORANDUM by Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. in support of motion to certify class,, # 460 Reply Memorandum of Law and Declaration of D. Brian Hufford (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19)(Hufford, D.)
June 28, 2011 Filing 524 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 6/14/2011 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Valarie M. Ramsey, valharam@aol.com, (708) 860-8482. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 7/19/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/29/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2011. (td, )
June 28, 2011 Filing 523 ANSWER to counterclaim by Miggins & Miggins, Inc., Larry Miggins, D.C. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Handelman, Leigh)
June 27, 2011 Filing 522 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5/19/2011 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Valarie M. Ramsey, valharam@aol.com, (708) 860-8482. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 7/18/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2011. (td, )
June 27, 2011 Filing 521 NOTICE of Motion by Michael M. Conway for presentment of motion for leave to file,,,, # 520 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/6/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Conway, Michael)
June 27, 2011 Filing 520 MOTION by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. for leave to file Defendants' Motion For Leave To Advise The Court About Supplemental Authority (Conway, Michael)
June 24, 2011 Filing 519 MOTION by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida for leave to file BCBSFL, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Submit Supplemental Authority in Support of Its Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify A Florida Chiropractic Discrimination Class (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Pope, Michael)
June 14, 2011 Filing 518 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing held and continued to 7/6/2011 at 9:30 AM. Motion to withdraw the appearance of Joel Reid Skinner is granted (493). Remainder of motion to dismiss is denied subject to comments made in open court (381). Mailed notice (tlm)
June 2, 2011 Filing 517 Third Amended COUNTERCLAIM filed by The Regence Group against Miggins & Miggins, Inc., Larry Miggins, D.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Moran, Mariah)
May 24, 2011 Filing 516 EXHIBIT by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. Defendants' Joint Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Joint Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinions of Stephen Foreman regarding response in opposition to motion,,,,, # 514 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 31, # 2 Exhibit 32, # 3 Exhibit 33, # 4 Exhibit 34, # 5 Exhibit 35, # 6 Exhibit 36, # 7 Exhibit 37, # 8 Exhibit 38, # 9 Exhibit 39, # 10 Exhibit 40, # 11 Exhibit 41, # 12 Exhibit 42, # 13 Exhibit 43, # 14 Exhibit 44, # 15 Exhibit 45, # 16 Exhibit 46, # 17 Exhibit 47, # 18 Exhibit 48, # 19 Exhibit 49, # 20 Exhibit 50, # 21 Exhibit 51, # 22 Exhibit 52, # 23 Exhibit 53, # 24 Exhibit 54, # 25 Exhibit 55, # 26 Exhibit 56, # 27 Exhibit 57, # 28 Exhibit 58, # 29 Exhibit 59, # 30 Exhibit 60, # 31 Exhibit 61)(Pope, Michael)
May 24, 2011 Filing 515 EXHIBIT by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. Exhibits to Defendants' Joint Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for class Certification and Joint Motion to Exclude the Report and Opinions of Stephen Foreman regarding response in opposition to motion,,,,, # 514 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30)(Pope, Michael)
May 23, 2011 Filing 514 RESPONSE by Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., J # 460 (Pope, Michael)
May 23, 2011 Filing 513 MEMORANDUM by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., J # 460 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6)(Pope, Michael) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office.) Modified on 5/24/2011 (ea, ).
May 19, 2011 Filing 512 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Hearing held on motion to dismiss second amended counterclaim and third party complaint (495). Motion is granted as stated in open court. Any amended third amended counterclaim and third-party complaint are to be filed by 6/2/2011. The sufficiency of any amendment will be considered at the previously scheduled 6/14/2011 status hearing. Response to motion for summary judgment as to Hopkins (497) is to be filed by 7/29/2011; reply is to be filed by 8/19/2011. Mailed notice (tlm)
May 19, 2011 Filing 511 WITHDRAWING Eric Gortner as counsel for Defendant Health Care Services Corporation and substituting Helen E. Witt as counsel of record (Witt, Helen)
May 19, 2011 Filing 510 AMENDED Answer by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint amended complaint,,, # 370 (Green, Patrick)
May 19, 2011 Filing 509 ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses To Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint by Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield(Conway, Michael)
May 19, 2011 Filing 508 ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses To Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint by Anthem Ohio(Conway, Michael)
May 19, 2011 Filing 507 ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses To Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint by Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut(Conway, Michael)
May 19, 2011 Filing 506 ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses To Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint by Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.(Conway, Michael)
May 19, 2011 Filing 505 ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses To Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint by Anthem Blue Cross of California(Conway, Michael)
May 19, 2011 Filing 504 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Nunc pro tunc 4/28/11:v For the reasons stated in open court on 4/28/11, the motion to dismiss as to plaintiff Hopkins is granted to the extent Hopkins seeks injunctive relief but is otherwise denied. (mk)
May 18, 2011 Filing 503 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Counsel for The Regence Group and the Miggins parties should be prepared to address at tomorrow's status / motion hearing the motion to dismiss the second amended counterclaim / third party complaint in light of the more definite statement filed by The Regence Group and the supplemental memorandum filed by the Miggins parties. (mk)
May 18, 2011 Filing 502 RESPONSE by Counter Claimant The Regence Group to motion to dismiss # 495 (Moran, Mariah)
May 17, 2011 Filing 501 Amended NOTICE of Motion by Michael M. Conway for presentment of motion for summary judgment # 497 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/19/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Conway, Michael)
May 13, 2011 Filing 500 RULE 56 Local Rule 56.1 Statement by Anthem Ohio, WellPoint, Inc. regarding motion for summary judgment # 497 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A - J)(Conway, Michael)
May 13, 2011 Filing 499 MEMORANDUM by Anthem Ohio, WellPoint, Inc. in support of motion for summary judgment # 497 On The Remaining Claims of Plaintiff Katherine Hopkins (Conway, Michael)
May 13, 2011 Filing 498 NOTICE of Motion by Michael M. Conway for presentment of motion for summary judgment # 497 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/18/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Conway, Michael)
May 13, 2011 Filing 497 MOTION by Defendants WellPoint, Inc., Anthem Ohio for summary judgment On The Remaining Claims Of Plaintiff Katherine Hopkins (Conway, Michael)
May 13, 2011 Filing 496 NOTICE of Motion by Robert J. Axelrod for presentment of motion to dismiss # 495 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/19/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Axelrod, Robert)
May 13, 2011 Filing 495 MOTION by Third Party Defendant Miggins & Miggins, Inc., Counter Defendant Larry Miggins, D.C. to dismiss the Regence Group's Second Amended Counterclaim and Third Party Complaint (Axelrod, Robert)
May 11, 2011 Filing 494 NOTICE of Motion by Helen E. Witt for presentment of motion to withdraw # 493 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/18/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Witt, Helen)
May 11, 2011 Filing 493 MOTION by Defendant Health Care Services Corporation to withdraw Appearance of Joel Reid Skinner (Unopposed) (Witt, Helen)
May 10, 2011 Filing 492 Defendant WellPoint, Inc's Amended Answer And Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by WellPoint, Inc.(Conway, Michael)
May 10, 2011 Filing 491 Second Amended COUNTERCLAIM filed by The Regence Group against Miggins & Miggins, Inc., Larry Miggins, D.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Moran, Mariah)
April 29, 2011 Filing 489 WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/29/2011: The Court grants defendants' motion to dismiss the claims of plaintiff Susanna Wood [# 400] for the reasons stated below and directs the Clerk to terminate Wood as a plaintiff. Mailed notice (tlm)
April 28, 2011 Filing 490 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Status hearing held and continued to 6/14/2011 at 09:30 AM. Answer to complaint is to be filed by 5/19/2011. (or, )
April 28, 2011 Filing 488 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/28/2011. Mailed notice (tlm)
April 28, 2011 Filing 487 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court denies in part thecounterclaim defendants' motion to dismiss the counterclaim of The Regence Group [docket no. 381]. The Court orders Regence to file, by May 12, 2011, a second amended counterclaim and third party complaint containing a more definite statement as described in this decision. The motion is entered and continued to May 19, 2011, at 9:30 a.m. Only counsel for Regence and Miggins need appear on that date. Mailed notice (tlm)
April 27, 2011 Filing 486 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: For the reasons stated below, the Court grants WellPoint, Inc.'s motion to dismiss in part and denies it in part [# 396]. Plaintiff Hopkins' prospective equitable relief claims against WellPoint are dismissed. The Court otherwise denies the motion. WellPoint is directed to answer the remaining claims by no later than 5/10/11. Mailed notice (tlm)
April 20, 2011 Filing 485 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, CareFirst, Inc., Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Wellmark, Inc. by Brian Alexander Fogerty (Fogerty, Brian)
April 14, 2011 Filing 484 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., California Chiropractic Association, Peri Dwyer, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, International Chiropractors Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Susanna Wood to notice of filing # 482 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Handelman, Leigh)
April 12, 2011 Filing 483 REPLY by Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield to MOTION by Defendants Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc. to dismiss The Fourth Amended Co # 457 (Conway, Michael)
April 11, 2011 Filing 482 NOTICE by All Defendants of Filing Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Michael)
April 5, 2011 Filing 481 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Reno, D.C., Jay Korsen, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Peri Dwyer, D.C., International Chiropractors Association, Larry Miggins, D.C., Michelle M Askar, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Barry A Wahner, D.C., Mark Barnard, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Katherine Hopkins, Ian Barlow, Susanna Wood, Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C. as to Anthem Ohio on 3/24/2011, answer due 4/14/2011. (Weiswasser, Susan)
April 5, 2011 Filing 480 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Reno, D.C., Jay Korsen, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Peri Dwyer, D.C., International Chiropractors Association, Larry Miggins, D.C., Michelle M Askar, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Barry A Wahner, D.C., Mark Barnard, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Katherine Hopkins, Ian Barlow, Susanna Wood, Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C. as to Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield on 3/16/2011, answer due 4/6/2011. (Weiswasser, Susan)
April 5, 2011 Filing 479 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Reno, D.C., Jay Korsen, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Peri Dwyer, D.C., International Chiropractors Association, Larry Miggins, D.C., Michelle M Askar, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program, Barry A Wahner, D.C., Mark Barnard, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Katherine Hopkins, Ian Barlow, Susanna Wood, Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C. as to Anthem Blue Cross of California on 3/24/2011, answer due 4/14/2011. (Weiswasser, Susan)
April 5, 2011 Filing 478 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Reno, D.C., Jay Korsen, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Peri Dwyer, D.C., Miggins & Miggins, Inc., Larry Miggins, D.C., Michelle M Askar, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Mark Barnard, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Anthony Fava, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Katherine Hopkins, Ian Barlow, Susanna Wood, Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., International Chiropractors Association, Brenda Tomanek, D.C., Extended Care Treatment, Inc. d/b/a/ Transitions Recovery Program as to Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc. on 3/18/2011, answer due 4/8/2011. (Weiswasser, Susan)
April 5, 2011 Filing 477 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Reno, D.C., Jay Korsen, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Peri Dwyer, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Anthony Fava, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Katherine Hopkins, Ian Barlow, Michelle M Askar, D.C., Susanna Wood, Barry A Wahner, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C. as to Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut on 3/18/2011, answer due 4/8/2011. (Weiswasser, Susan)
April 5, 2011 Filing 476 MEMORANDUM by Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, David R Barber, D.C., Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., California Chiropractic Association, Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Kendall Gearhart, D.C., Katherine Hopkins, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Casey Paulsen, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Dean Renneke, D.C., Andrew Reno, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Susanna Wood in Opposition to motion to dismiss, # 457 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Handelman, Leigh)
March 31, 2011 Filing 475 REPLY by Defendant WellPoint, Inc. to motion to dismiss # 396 WellPoint, Inc.'s Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Katherine Hopkins' ERISA Claims in the Fourth Amended Complaint Against WellPoint, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Conway, Michael)
March 24, 2011 Filing 472 NOTICE by Blue Shield of California re MOTION by Defendant Blue Shield of California for leave to file Summary Judgment Motion without Prejudice to Filing Subsequent Motion # 438 (Fogarty, John)
March 23, 2011 Filing 471 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant Wellpoint's motion for leave to serve subpoena on Miami Valley Hospital is granted as stated in open court on 3/22/11. Mailed notice (tlm)
March 22, 2011 Filing 474 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing held and continued to 4/28/2011. Consolidated response to motion to certify (460) is to be filed by 5/23/2011 and may consist of 65 pages. Separate brief on Florida issues is limited to 15 pages. Reply brief is to be filed by 6/30/2011. Response to motion to dismiss (457) is to be filed by 4/5/2011 and reply brief by 4/12/2011. Ruling set for 4/28/2011 at 9:30 AM. Motion to intervene is denied for the reasons stated in open court (454). Motion to compel is granted in part and denied in part as stated in open court (377). Mailed notice (tlm)
March 22, 2011 Filing 473 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion to voluntarily dismiss defendant Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield is granted (447). Motion to file summary judgment motion is denied (438). Motion for protective order is denied in part and granted in part as stated in open court (371). Motions to compel production are denied as stated in open court (360 & 379). Mailed notice (tlm)
March 22, 2011 Filing 470 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant HCSC's motion to compel production of documents from plaintiff Kuhlman # 360 is terminated as moot. See docket entry 395. (mk)
March 21, 2011 Filing 469 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Minute entry of 3/21/2011, document number 468, is amended to correct the hearing date as scheduled for Tuesday, 3/22/2011 at 9:30 AM. Remaining minute entry to stand. (or, )
March 21, 2011 Filing 468 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The attorneys who attend the motion hearing set for 3/23/11 should be prepared to identify for the Court all motions that are fully briefed or in the process of being briefed (not including those being presented for the first time on 3/23/11), including when any remaining briefs are due. It would be particularly helpful and would streamline matters considerably if counsel were able to agree upon and prepare a list of those motions to present to the Court at the hearing. (mk)
March 21, 2011 Filing 467 NOTICE of Motion by Michael M. Conway for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief # 466 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/24/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Conway, Michael)
March 21, 2011 Filing 466 MOTION by Defendant WellPoint, Inc.Motion For Leave to Serve Subpoena On Miami Valley Hospital for Production of Documents and Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition (Conway, Michael)
March 18, 2011 Filing 465 REPLY by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Susanna Wood, Third Party Defendant Miggins & Miggins, Inc., Counter Defendant Larry Miggins, D.C. to motion to dismiss # 381 (Axelrod, Robert)
March 17, 2011 Filing 464 DECLARATION of D. Brian Hufford regarding motion to certify class,, # 460 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 75A, # 2 Exhibit 76 - redacted)(Hufford, D.)
March 17, 2011 Filing 463 DECLARATION of D. Brian Hufford regarding motion to certify class,, # 460 [CORRECTED DECLARATION] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 - redacted, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5-15 - redacted, # 6 Exhibit 16, # 7 Exhibit 17-50 - redacted, # 8 Exhibit 51-70A - redacted, # 9 Exhibit 71, # 10 Exhibit 72, # 11 Exhibit 73, # 12 Exhibit 74, # 13 Exhibit 75)(Hufford, D.)
March 17, 2011 Filing 462 DECLARATION of D. Brian Hufford regarding motion to certify class,, # 460 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 - redacted, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Hufford, D.)
March 17, 2011 Filing 461 Notice of Presentment - NOTICE of Motion by D. Brian Hufford for presentment of motion to certify class,, # 460 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/22/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Hufford, D.)
March 17, 2011 Filing 460 MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Susanna Wood, Intervenor Plaintiff Tri3 Enterprises LLC to certify class and Memorandum of Law Responses due by 3/22/2011 (Hufford, D.)
March 17, 2011 Filing 459 NOTICE of Motion by Michael M. Conway for presentment of motion to dismiss, # 457 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/22/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Conway, Michael)
March 17, 2011 Filing 458 MEMORANDUM by Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield in support of motion to dismiss, # 457 For Improper Venue Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(3) and To Dismiss Katherine Hopkins' Claims for Injunctive Relief Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Conway, Michael)
March 17, 2011 Filing 457 MOTION by Defendants Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc. to dismiss The Fourth Amended Complaint For Improper Venue Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(3) and To Dismiss Katherine Hopkins' Claims For Injunctive Relief Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (Conway, Michael)
March 17, 2011 Filing 456 NOTICE of Motion by Leigh Robbin Handelman for presentment of motion to intervene # 454 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/22/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Handelman, Leigh)
March 17, 2011 Filing 455 MEMORANDUM by Tri3 Enterprises LLC in support of motion to intervene # 454 (Handelman, Leigh)
March 17, 2011 Filing 454 MOTION by Intervenor Plaintiff Tri3 Enterprises LLC to intervene (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Handelman, Leigh)
March 16, 2011 Filing 453 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc. (Conway, Michael)
March 16, 2011 Filing 452 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield (Conway, Michael)
March 16, 2011 Filing 451 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut (Conway, Michael)
March 16, 2011 Filing 450 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Anthem Blue Cross of California (Conway, Michael)
March 16, 2011 Filing 449 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Anthem Ohio (Conway, Michael)
March 16, 2011 Filing 448 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by Leigh Robbin Handelman for presentment of motion to dismiss,, # 447 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/22/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Handelman, Leigh)
March 16, 2011 Filing 447 MOTION by Plaintiffs Andrew Reno, D.C., Jay Korsen, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Peri Dwyer, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, California Chiropractic Association, Anthony Fava, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Katherine Hopkins, Ian Barlow, Michelle M Askar, D.C., Susanna Wood, Barry A Wahner, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., David R Barber, D.C., Jerry Capone, D.C., Ryan S Ford, D.C., Kendall Gearhart, D.C., Casey Paulsen, D.C., Dean Renneke, D.C., Eric Thompson, D.C., Susanna Wood, Ronald L. Young, D.C. to dismiss UNOPPOSED (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Handelman, Leigh)
March 16, 2011 Filing 446 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield by Rebecca R. Hanson (Hanson, Rebecca)
March 16, 2011 Filing 445 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield by Martin J. Bishop (Bishop, Martin)
March 16, 2011 Filing 444 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield by Michael J Tuteur (Tuteur, Michael)
March 16, 2011 Filing 443 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield by Michael M. Conway (Conway, Michael)
March 16, 2011 Filing 442 AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., California Chiropractic Association, Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C. in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant WellPoint, Inc. to dismiss PLAINTIFF KATHERINE HOPKINS'S ERISA CLAIMS IN THE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT AGAINST WELLPOINT, INC # 396 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Handelman, Leigh)
March 16, 2011 Filing 441 MEMORANDUM by Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., California Chiropractic Association, Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Casey Paulsen, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Dean Renneke, D.C., Andrew Reno, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Susanna Wood(Plaintiff) in Opposition to motion to dismiss # 396 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Handelman, Leigh)
March 14, 2011 Filing 440 REPLY by Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. to memorandum in opposition to motion,, # 433 to Dismiss the Claims of Plaintiff Wood (Smith, Michael)
March 11, 2011 Filing 439 NOTICE of Motion by John T. Fogarty for presentment of motion for leave to file,, # 438 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/22/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Fogarty, John)
March 11, 2011 Filing 438 MOTION by Defendant Blue Shield of California for leave to file Summary Judgment Motion without Prejudice to Filing Subsequent Motion (Attachments: # 1 Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Declaration of Michael Brandt in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Declaration of John T. Fogarty in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Exhibits A through G to Fogarty Declaration, # 6 Exhibits H through M to Fogarty Declaration, # 7 Exhibit N to Fogarty Declaration, # 8 Exhibits O through R to Fogarty Declaration, # 9 Exhibits S through V to Fogarty Declaration)(Fogarty, John)
March 10, 2011 Filing 437 Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida(Webster, Bryan)
March 9, 2011 Filing 436 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for leave to file consolidated memorandum in excess of 15 pages is granted. Plaintiffs' opening class certification memorandum may be up to 50 pages but must conform to the formatting and binding requirements of Local Rule 5.2 and may not contain excessive footnotes. Defendants should be prepared to discuss at the upcoming status how they propose to handle response briefing. Mailed notice (tlm)
March 7, 2011 Filing 435 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield (ea, )
March 7, 2011 Filing 434 AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Katherine Hopkins, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Susanna Wood in Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Highmark, Inc., Anthem Blue Cross of California, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, WellPoint, Inc., The Regence Grou # 400 Declaration of D. Brian Hufford in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss the Claims of Plaintiff Wood (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Hufford, D.)
March 7, 2011 Filing 433 MEMORANDUM by Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Susanna Wood(Plaintiff) in Opposition to motion to dismiss,,,, # 400 the Claims of Plaintiff Wood (Hufford, D.)
March 7, 2011 Filing 432 NOTICE of Motion by Leigh Robbin Handelman for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages, # 431 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/10/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Handelman, Leigh)
March 7, 2011 Filing 431 MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Katherine Hopkins, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., Andrew Reno, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Susanna Wood for leave to file excess pages Unopposed (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Handelman, Leigh)
March 7, 2011 Filing 430 SUR-REPLY by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Casey Paulsen, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Dean Renneke, D.C., Andrew Reno, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Susanna Wood to sur-reply,, # 410 Amended (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Handelman, Leigh)
March 4, 2011 Filing 429 MEMORANDUM by The Regence Group in Opposition to motion to dismiss # 381 (Moran, Mariah)
March 4, 2011 Filing 428 ANSWER to Complaint Premera Blue Cross' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint by Premera Blue Cross (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 - Pgs. 61-122, # 2 Part 3 - Pgs. 123-190)(Payton, Gwendolyn)
March 3, 2011 Filing 427 Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama(Palmer, Timothy)
March 3, 2011 Filing 426 Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas(Bishop, Martin)
March 3, 2011 Filing 425 Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield's Answer and Affirmative Defenses To Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield(Bishop, Martin)
March 3, 2011 Filing 424 Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses To Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Part II (pages 71-140), # 2 Part III (pages 141-195))(Conway, Michael)
March 3, 2011 Filing 423 Defendant Independence Blue Cross' Answer to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint [Dkt #370] ANSWER to Complaint by Independence Blue Cross(Runnels, Charis)
March 3, 2011 Filing 422 Defendant WellPoint, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by WellPoint, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Part II (pages 71-140), # 2 Part III (pages 141-195))(Conway, Michael)
March 3, 2011 Filing 421 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan (Green, Patrick)
March 3, 2011 Filing 420 Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina(Webster, Bryan)
March 3, 2011 Filing 419 Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc.(Webster, Bryan)
March 3, 2011 Filing 418 Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota(Webster, Bryan)
March 3, 2011 Filing 417 Defendant Wellmark, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by Wellmark, Inc.(Webster, Bryan)
March 3, 2011 Filing 416 Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Rhode Island's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island(Webster, Bryan)
March 3, 2011 Filing 415 Defendant Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey(Webster, Bryan)
March 3, 2011 Filing 414 Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee(Webster, Bryan)
March 3, 2011 Filing 413 Defendant CareFirst, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by CareFirst, Inc.(Webster, Bryan)
March 3, 2011 Filing 412 Defendant Excellus BlueCross and BlueShield's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield(Webster, Bryan)
March 3, 2011 Filing 411 Defendant Highmark Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by Highmark, Inc.(Webster, Bryan)
March 3, 2011 Filing 410 SUR-REPLY by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, David R Barber, D.C., Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., California Chiropractic Association, Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Susanna Wood to motion to compel,,, # 377 , motion for protective order,,,, # 371 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Handelman, Leigh)
March 3, 2011 Filing 409 Defendant The Regence Group's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint (DKT #370) ANSWER to Complaint by The Regence Group(Smith, Michael)
March 3, 2011 Filing 408 ANSWER by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint # 370 . (Smith, Michael) Modified on 3/3/2011 (kj, ).
March 3, 2011 Filing 407 ANSWER by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint # 370 . (Smith, Michael) Modified on 3/3/2011 (kj, ).
March 3, 2011 Filing 406 ANSWER by Blue Shield of California to Fourth Amended Complaint # 370 . (Attachments: # 1 Part II, # 2 Part III)(McNally, Laura) Modified on 3/3/2011 (kj, ).
March 3, 2011 Filing 405 ANSWER by Health Care Services Corporation and Affirmative Defenses to Fourth Amended Complaint # 370 . (Witt, Helen) Modified on 3/3/2011 (kj, ).
March 2, 2011 Filing 404 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant Wellpoint's motion to dismiss plaintiff Hopkins' ERISA claims is taken under advisement. # 396 Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, plaintiff's response to the motion is to be filed by 3/17/11, and defendants' reply is to be filed by 3/31/11. Mailed notice (tlm)
March 1, 2011 Filing 403 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The motion for leave to withdraw the appearances of John Thies and Kara Wade on behalf of Health CareService Corp. is granted. The Clerk is directed to remove those appearances from the docket. # 220 , # 221 Mailed notice (tlm)
March 1, 2011 Filing 402 STIPULATION regarding motion to dismiss # 396 Proposed Briefing Schedule (Conway, Michael)
February 28, 2011 Filing 401 MEMORANDUM by Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio, Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss,,,, # 400 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2, # 2 Exhibit 3-7, # 3 Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibit 9, # 5 Exhibit 10, # 6 Exhibit 11, # 7 Exhibit 12, # 8 Exhibit 13, # 9 Exhibit 14, # 10 Exhibit 15, # 11 Exhibit 16, # 12 Exhibit 17, # 13 Exhibit 18 part 1, # 14 Exhibit 18 part 2, # 15 Exhibit 19)(Moran, Mariah)
February 28, 2011 Filing 400 MOTION by Defendants Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Highmark, Inc., Anthem Blue Cross of California, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, WellPoint, Inc., The Regence Group, Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Anthem Ohio, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Shield of California, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Premera Blue Cross, CareFirst, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Wellmark, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Health Care Services Corporation, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Independence Blue Cross to dismiss Plaintiff Susanna J. Wood's Claim (Moran, Mariah)
February 28, 2011 Filing 399 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendants' unopposed motion to extend the deadline for their expert disclosures on class issues is granted, based on the representation that this will not require altering any other deadlines or delaying the case, as well as on the agreed condition set forth in paragraph 8 of the motion. The deadline is extended to 3/22/11. Mailed notice (tlm)
February 28, 2011 Filing 398 MEMORANDUM by WellPoint, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss # 396 Plaintiff Katherine Hopkins' ERISA Claims in the Fourth Amended Complaint against WellPoint, Inc (Conway, Michael)
February 28, 2011 Filing 397 NOTICE of Motion by Michael M. Conway for presentment of motion to dismiss # 396 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/3/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Conway, Michael)
February 28, 2011 Filing 396 MOTION by Defendant WellPoint, Inc. to dismiss Plaintiff Katherine Hopkins' ERISA Claims in the Fourth Amended Complaint against WellPoint, Inc (Conway, Michael)
February 25, 2011 Filing 395 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant HCSC previously filed a motion to compel production of documents from plaintiff Kuhlman (docket no. 360). The Court does not believe this has been discussed at any of the intervening open-court hearings in this case. The Court will assume that the motion is moot and will terminate it unless, by 3/3/11, HCSC advises the Court via noticing the motion for presentment in open court that the motion still presents a live controversy. (mk)
February 24, 2011 Filing 394 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion by Timothy Palmer, for leave to appear pro hac vice, is granted # 314 . The Clerk is directed to make sure that an e-mail addresses is associated with this attorneys' appearances on the docket to permit service of electronic notices. Mailed notice (tlm)
February 24, 2011 Filing 393 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Hearing held on motion to dismiss amended counterclaim (381. Response to motion due 3/4/2011; reply brief due 3/18/2011. Motion for expedited granted (373). Sur-reply to motion for protective order is to be filed by 3/7/2011 (371, 377). Motion to compel is denied (379, 375). Opposition is construed by the Court as a motion for protective order and is granted (386). (or, )
February 23, 2011 Filing 392 NOTICE of Motion by Mariah E Moran for presentment of extension of time,,, # 391 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/1/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Moran, Mariah)
February 23, 2011 Filing 391 MOTION by Defendants Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. for extension of time to Extend the Deadline for Defendants' Expert Disclosures (UNOPPOSED) (Moran, Mariah)
February 23, 2011 Filing 390 NOTICE of Motion by John E. Thies for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney # 389 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/2/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Thies, John)
February 23, 2011 Filing 389 MOTION by counsel for Defendant Health Care Services Corporation to withdraw as attorney (Thies, John)
February 22, 2011 Filing 388 REPLY by Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. to MOTION by Defendants Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Ka # 371 In Support of Motion For the Entry of a Protective Order Regarding Merits Discovery Sought By Plaintiffs After the Court's January 17, 2011 Class Discovery Deadline (Webster, Bryan)
February 22, 2011 Filing 387 REPLY by Independence Blue Cross to memorandum in opposition to motion, # 386 to Compel # 379 (Milton, Kirsten)
February 19, 2011 Filing 386 MEMORANDUM by Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Susanna Wood(Plaintiff) in Opposition to motion to compel, # 379 (Axelrod, Robert)
February 18, 2011 Filing 385 RESPONSE by WellPoint, Inc.in Support of MOTION by Defendant WellPoint, Inc.Motion for Leave to take Expedited Discovery from Plaintiff Katherine Hopkins # 373 (Conway, Michael)
February 18, 2011 Filing 384 RESPONSE by Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, Jay Korsen, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Susanna Wood(Plaintiff)in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant WellPoint, Inc.Motion for Leave to take Expedited Discovery from Plaintiff Katherine Hopkins # 373 (Axelrod, Robert)
February 18, 2011 Filing 383 DECLARATION of Robert J. Axelrod regarding notice of motion # 382 , motion to dismiss # 381 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Axelrod, Robert)
February 18, 2011 Filing 382 Notice of Presentment - NOTICE of Motion by Robert J. Axelrod for presentment of motion to dismiss # 381 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/24/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Axelrod, Robert)
February 18, 2011 Filing 381 MOTION by Third Party Defendant Miggins & Miggins, Inc., Counter Defendant Larry Miggins, D.C. to dismiss The Regence Group's Amended Counterclaim (Axelrod, Robert)
February 18, 2011 Filing 380 NOTICE of Motion by Kirsten Ann Milton for presentment of motion to compel, # 379 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/24/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Milton, Kirsten)
February 18, 2011 Filing 379 MOTION by Defendant Independence Blue Cross to compel Production of Salary and Severance Information for the Former Executive Vice President of Plaintiff Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association (CORRECTED) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Milton, Kirsten)
February 18, 2011 Filing 378 Corrected Motion to Compel Production of Salary and Severance Information for the Former Executive Vice President of Plaintiff Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association by Independence Blue Cross (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Milton, Kirsten)
February 18, 2011 Filing 377 MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, David R Barber, D.C., Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., California Chiropractic Association, Jerry Capone, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Ryan S Ford, D.C., Kendall Gearhart, D.C., Katherine Hopkins, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Casey Paulsen, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Dean Renneke, D.C., Andrew Reno, D.C., Eric Thompson, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Susanna Wood, Ronald L. Young, D.C. to compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Handelman, Leigh)
February 18, 2011 Filing 376 NOTICE of Motion by Leigh Robbin Handelman for presentment of motion for protective order,,,, # 371 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/24/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Handelman, Leigh)
February 18, 2011 Filing 375 MOTION by Defendant Independence Blue Cross to compel Production of Salary and Severance Information for the Former Executive Vice President of Plaintiff Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Milton, Kirsten)
February 18, 2011 Filing 374 NOTICE of Motion by Michael M. Conway for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief # 373 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/24/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Conway, Michael)
February 18, 2011 Filing 373 MOTION by Defendant WellPoint, Inc.Motion for Leave to take Expedited Discovery from Plaintiff Katherine Hopkins (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Conway, Michael)
February 17, 2011 Filing 372 NOTICE of Motion by Bryan Matthew Webster for presentment of motion for protective order,,,, # 371 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/24/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Webster, Bryan)
February 17, 2011 Filing 371 MOTION by Defendants Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. for protective order Regarding Merits Discovery Sought By Plaintiffs After the Court's January 17, 2011 Class Discovery Deadline (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Webster, Bryan)
February 17, 2011 Filing 370 Fourth AMENDED complaint by Andrew Reno, D.C., Jerry Capone, D.C., Jay Korsen, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Peri Dwyer, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, David R Barber, D.C., Ryan S Ford, D.C., Dean Renneke, D.C., Casey Paulsen, D.C., Kendall Gearhart, D.C., California Chiropractic Association, Anthony Fava, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Katherine Hopkins, Ian Barlow, Michelle M Askar, D.C., Susanna Wood, Barry A Wahner, D.C., Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Susanna Wood, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield, Anthem Health Plans, Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut, Anthem Ohio against All Plaintiffs (Handelman, Leigh) Modified on 3/3/2011 (kj, ).
February 17, 2011 Filing 369 WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/17/2011: For the reasons stated below, the Court grants plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a fourth amended complaint [docket no. 354], on the express condition that plaintiffs serve the newly named defendants with summonses, not waivers, within seven days of entry of this order on the docket. Any Rule 12, transfer, or arbitration related motion regarding the claims of newly added plaintiff Susanna Wood must be filed by no later than 2/28/11; the response is due by 3/7/11; and the reply is due by 3/14/11. Mailed notice (tlm)
February 15, 2011 Filing 368 NOTICE by Michael P. Padden of Change of Address (Padden, Michael)
February 11, 2011 Filing 367 AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. in Support of MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, California Chiropractic Association, Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T # 354 Reply Declaration of D. Brian Hufford (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2-30 - REDACTED, # 3 Exhibit 31, # 4 Exhibit 32, # 5 Exhibit 33, # 6 Exhibit 34, # 7 Exhibit 35, # 8 Exhibit 36, # 9 Exhibit 37)(Hufford, D.)
February 11, 2011 Filing 366 REPLY by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. to motion to amend/correct,,, motion for relief,, # 354 Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Leave to File a Fourth Amended Complaint (Hufford, D.)
February 11, 2011 Filing 365 AMENDED counterclaims # 237 The Regence Group's Amended Counterclaims against Larry Miggins and Miggins & Miggins, Inc. (Moran, Mariah) Text corrected on 2/14/2011 (tlm).
February 9, 2011 Filing 364 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to the third amended complaint # 358 is granted. Mailed notice (tlm)
February 7, 2011 Filing 363 Amended NOTICE of Motion by Helen E. Witt for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer # 358 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/10/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Witt, Helen)
February 4, 2011 Filing 362 RESPONSE by All Defendants in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, California Chiropractic Association, Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T # 354 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 5-6, # 5 Exhibit 7, # 6 Exhibit 8-17)(Moran, Mariah) Modified on 2/7/2011 (ph, ).
February 3, 2011 Filing 361 NOTICE of Motion by Alexis P. Robertson for presentment of motion to compel # 360 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/9/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Robertson, Alexis)
February 3, 2011 Filing 360 MOTION by Defendant Health Care Services Corporation to compel the Production of Documents from Plaintiff Kuhlman (Robertson, Alexis)
February 1, 2011 Filing 359 Notice of motion for presentment of Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to the Third Amended Complaint NOTICE of Motion by Helen E. Witt for presentment of (Witt, Helen)
February 1, 2011 Filing 358 MOTION by Defendant Health Care Services Corporation for extension of time to file answer Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to the third amended complaint (Witt, Helen)
January 28, 2011 Filing 357 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The joint motion for leave to take certain depositions out of time is granted, based on the representation made in paragraph 3 of the motion. Defendants are directed to file a joint response to plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a fourth amended complaint, by no later than 2/4/11; plaintiffs are directed to file a reply to the response, by no later than 2/11/11. (mk)
January 27, 2011 Filing 356 MEMORANDUM by Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., California Chiropractic Association, Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. in support of motion to amend/correct,,, motion for relief,, # 354 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Handelman, Leigh)
January 27, 2011 Filing 355 NOTICE of Motion by Leigh Robbin Handelman for presentment of motion to amend/correct,,, motion for relief,, # 354 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/1/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Handelman, Leigh)
January 27, 2011 Filing 354 MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, California Chiropractic Association, Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Dean Renneke, D.C., Andrew Reno, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Susanna Wood to amend/correct amended complaint,, # 353 for leave to amend (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Handelman, Leigh)
January 27, 2011 Filing 353 (Corrected) THIRD AMENDED complaint by Andrew Reno, D.C., Jay Korsen, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Peri Dwyer, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Anthony Fava, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Michelle M Askar, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Katherine Hopkins against All Defendants filed pursuant to the Minute Entry of the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/26/11 at DE 351 (Hufford, D.)
January 26, 2011 Filing 352 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Clerk is directed to immediately correct the appearance on the docket of Robert J. Axelrod as counsel for Larry Miggins and Miggins & Miggins so that it includes Mr. Axelrod's e-mail address, rjaxelrod@pomlaw.com. Though Mr. Axelrod's appearance on the docket includes his e-mail address, his appearance for these particular defendants does not have the e-mail address associated with it, which complicates sending electronic notices. Mailed notice (tlm)
January 26, 2011 Filing 351 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court has reviewed defendants' motion to strike the third amended complaint and plaintiffs' response. The Court denies the motion with regard to the amendment of plaintiff Hopkins' ERISA claims and the addition of defendants with regard to those claims. The order of 10/5/10 expressly gave Hopkins leave to amend those claims and add defendants on those claims if appropriate. Though the Court did not contemplate at the time that the amendment would come more than three months later, Hopkins has provided sufficient justification for the delay. The Court otherwise strikes the amended complaint, however, because to the extent other changes were made (including the addition of a new plaintiff), this was improperly done without leave of court. The Court set a deadline for amendments, but a deadline does not constitute permission, and plaintiffs cannot appropriately derive from the Court's comments at the 12/6/10 hearing that it expressly or even implicitly granted permission to add the new claims. Plaintiffs are directed to file a corrected third amended complaint that conforms to this ruling, by no later than 1/28/10. Any request to add a new plaintiff or other new claims beyond what the Court expressly authorized must be made by way of a motion seeking leave to amend beyond the deadline that the Court previously set. (mk)
January 25, 2011 Filing 350 Notice of Motion for presentment of Joint Motion for Leave to Complete Certain Depositions Out of Time NOTICE of Motion by Helen E. Witt for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief # 349 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/1/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Witt, Helen)
January 25, 2011 Filing 349 MOTION by Defendant Health Care Services CorporationJoint Motion for Leave to Complete Certain Depositions Out of Time (Witt, Helen)
January 25, 2011 Filing 348 MEMORANDUM by Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, David R Barber, D.C., Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., California Chiropractic Association, Jerry Capone, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Ryan S Ford, D.C., Kendall Gearhart, D.C., Katherine Hopkins, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Casey Paulsen, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Dean Renneke, D.C., Andrew Reno, D.C., Eric Thompson, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Ronald L. Young, D.C. in Opposition to motion to strike,,,, motion for relief,,, # 346 , motion to strike,,,, motion for relief,,, # 344 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Handelman, Leigh)
January 25, 2011 Filing 347 Notice of Motion for Corrected Motion to Strike Third Amended Complaint NOTICE of Motion by Michael M. Conway for presentment of motion to strike, motion for relief, # 346 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/27/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Conway, Michael)
January 25, 2011 Filing 346 MOTION by Defendants Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. to strike amended complaint, # 340 Corrected Motion to Strike Third Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C)(Conway, Michael)
January 24, 2011 Filing 345 NOTICE of Motion by Michael M. Conway for presentment of motion to strike,,,, motion for relief,,, # 344 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/27/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Conway, Michael)
January 24, 2011 Filing 344 MOTION by Defendants Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. to strike amended complaint,,,,, # 340 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C)(Conway, Michael)
January 21, 2011 Filing 343 WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/21/2011: For the reasons stated below, the Court grants plaintiff Miggins and third party defendant Miggins & Miggins, Inc.'s motion to dismiss The Regence Group's counterclaim, docket no. # 276 . The Court also directs the Clerk to terminate the remaining motions to dismiss, all of which the Court believes it has previously ruled upon, docket nos. # 259 , # 261 & # 267 . The Regence Group is granted leave to file an amended complaint in conformity with this order on or before 2/11/11. Mailed notice (tlm)
January 20, 2011 Filing 342 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order, Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/20/2011.(ea, )
January 20, 2011 Filing 341 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court denies defendants' motion to dismiss or compel arbitration as to plaintiffs Dwyer, FCA, and ICA [docket no. # 226 ]. Mailed notice (ea, )
January 20, 2011 Filing 340 THIRD AMENDED complaint by Andrew Reno, D.C., Jay Korsen, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Peri Dwyer, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Anthony Fava, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Michelle M Askar, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C. against Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. and terminating Kendall Gearhart, D.C., Casey Paulsen, D.C., Dean Renneke, D.C., Eric Thompson, D.C., Ronald L. Young, D.C., Blue Cross Blue Shield Association and Ryan S Ford, D.C. (Hufford, D.)
January 19, 2011 Filing 339 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court has considered the motion to compel by defendant BCBS of Georgia, joined in by defendant BCBS of Alabama. The Court finds plaintiffs' claim of lack of sufficient knowledge or information justified and therefore denies defendants' motions. The in court hearing / ruling date of 1/20/11 is vacated. (mk)
January 17, 2011 Filing 338 MEMORANDUM by Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, David R Barber, D.C., Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., California Chiropractic Association, Jerry Capone, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Ryan S Ford, D.C., Kendall Gearhart, D.C., Katherine Hopkins, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Casey Paulsen, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Dean Renneke, D.C., Andrew Reno, D.C., Eric Thompson, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Ronald L. Young, D.C. in Opposition to motion to compel # 333 BCBS Alabama Docket #337 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Handelman, Leigh)
January 14, 2011 Filing 337 Joinder in Blue Cross Blue Shield's Motion to Compel by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Askar, # 2 Exhibit B-Barlow, # 3 Exhibit C-Bernard, # 4 Exhibit D-Dwyer, # 5 Exhibit E-Fava, # 6 Exhibit F-Korsen, # 7 Exhibit G-Kuhlman, # 8 Exhibit H-Leri, # 9 Exhibit I-Miggins, # 10 Exhibit J-Reno, # 11 Exhibit K-Tomanek, # 12 Exhibit L-Wahner)(Mathisen, Eric)
January 13, 2011 Filing 336 MEMORANDUM by Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, David R Barber, D.C., Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., California Chiropractic Association, Jerry Capone, D.C., CareFirst, Inc., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Ryan S Ford, D.C., Kendall Gearhart, D.C., Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Miggins & Miggins, Inc., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Casey Paulsen, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Dean Renneke, D.C., Andrew Reno, D.C., The Regence Group, Eric Thompson, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Ronald L. Young, D.C. in Opposition to motion to compel # 333 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit)(Handelman, Leigh)
January 10, 2011 Filing 335 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Response to motion to compel is to be filed by 1/14/11. The motion will not be called for hearing on 1/12/11. Ruling is set for 1/20/11 at 9:30 AM, though the Court may rule in writing before that date. (mk)
January 7, 2011 Filing 334 NOTICE of Motion by Michael M. Conway for presentment of motion to compel # 333 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/12/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Conway, Michael)
January 7, 2011 Filing 333 MOTION by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc. to compel Regarding Certain Plaintiffs' Inadequate Responses To Rule 36 Requests To Admit 2-6 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-E, # 2 Exhibits F-L)(Conway, Michael)
December 15, 2010 Filing 332 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Status hearing held and continued to 3/22/2010 at 09:30 AM. (or, )
December 15, 2010 Filing 331 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: For the reasons stated below, the Court denies defendants' motion to dismiss or stay the claims of plaintiff Transitions Recovery Program [docket no. # 226 ]. Mailed notice (tlm)
December 15, 2010 Filing 330 WRITTEN Opinion signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/15/2010. For the reasons stated below, the Court denies BCBSRI's motion to dismiss or to stay the claims by Korsen and Barlow # 126 . Mailed notice(tlm)
December 6, 2010 Filing 329 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Motion to expand discovery # 323 is denied without prejudice. Deadline to request to amend pleadings and to add parties is 1/20/2011. (or, )
December 3, 2010 Filing 328 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 10/7/2010 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Valarie M. Ramsey, valharam@aol.com,(708) 860-8482. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 12/27/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/3/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/3/2011. (td, )
November 30, 2010 Filing 327 RESPONSE by Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, David R Barber, D.C., Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., California Chiropractic Association, Jerry Capone, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropract # 323 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7(A), # 8 Exhibit 7(B), # 9 Exhibit 7(C))(Milton, Kirsten)
November 20, 2010 Filing 326 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendants are directed to file a single, joint response to plaintiffs' motion to expand discovery, by no later than 11/30/2010. The motion is set for ruling on 12/6/2010 at 9:30 AM. The motion will not be called for hearing on 11/23/2010, so no one should appear at that time. (mk)
November 18, 2010 Filing 325 MEMORANDUM by Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, David R Barber, D.C., Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., California Chiropractic Association, Jerry Capone, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Ryan S Ford, D.C., Kendall Gearhart, D.C., Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Miggins & Miggins, Inc., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Casey Paulsen, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Dean Renneke, D.C., Andrew Reno, D.C., Eric Thompson, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Ronald L. Young, D.C. in support of motion for discovery,,, # 323 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Handelman, Leigh)
November 18, 2010 Filing 324 NOTICE of Motion by Leigh Robbin Handelman for presentment of motion for discovery,,, # 323 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/23/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Handelman, Leigh)
November 18, 2010 Filing 323 MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, David R Barber, D.C., Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., California Chiropractic Association, Jerry Capone, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Ryan S Ford, D.C., Kendall Gearhart, D.C., Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Casey Paulsen, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Dean Renneke, D.C., Andrew Reno, D.C., Eric Thompson, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Ronald L. Young, D.C., Third Party Defendant Miggins & Miggins, Inc., Counter Defendant Larry Miggins, D.C. for discovery Expansion Beyond Chiropractic Services (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Handelman, Leigh)
November 16, 2010 Filing 322 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Hearing held on motion to extend discovery # 320 . Motion is granted. Plaintiffs 26(a)(2) disclosures onclass issues are due 1/17/2011; defendant's on 3/3/2011. Class certification motion deadline is extended to 3/17/2011. Mailed notice (tlm)
November 12, 2010 Filing 321 NOTICE of Motion by Susan Jessica Weiswasser for presentment of extension of time,, # 320 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/16/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Weiswasser, Susan)
November 12, 2010 Filing 320 MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. for extension of time for Disclosing Experts Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(2) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Weiswasser, Susan)
November 10, 2010 Filing 319 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 10/7/2010 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Valarie M. Ramsey, valharam@aol.com, (708) 860-8482. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 12/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/13/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/8/2011. (td, )
November 10, 2010 Filing 318 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 10/28/2010 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Valarie M. Ramsey, valharam@aol.com, (708) 860-8482. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 12/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/13/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/8/2011. (td, )
November 9, 2010 Filing 317 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, CareFirst, Inc., Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Wellmark, Inc. by John Andrew Litwinski (Litwinski, John) Modified on 11/9/2010 (ph, ).
November 9, 2010 Filing 316 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, CareFirst, Inc., Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Wellmark, Inc. by Amy J Carletti (Carletti, Amy) Modified on 11/9/2010 (ph, ).
November 9, 2010 Filing 315 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, CareFirst, Inc., Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Wellmark, Inc. by Amy Graham Doehring (Doehring, Amy) Modified on 11/9/2010 (ph, ).
November 5, 2010 Filing 314 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-5393625. (Palmer, Timothy)
November 2, 2010 Filing 313 STATUS Report Joint Status Report Regarding Pending Motions by Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, David R Barber, D.C., Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Blue Cross Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, California Chiropractic Association, Jerry Capone, D.C., CareFirst, Inc., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Ryan S Ford, D.C., Kendall Gearhart, D.C., Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Katherine Hopkins, Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Miggins & Miggins, Inc., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Casey Paulsen, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Premera Blue Cross, Dean Renneke, D.C., Andrew Reno, D.C., The Regence Group, Eric Thompson, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc., Ronald L. Young, D.C. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Webster, Bryan)
October 29, 2010 Filing 312 NOTICE by Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, David R Barber, D.C., Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Miggins & Miggins, Inc., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. re MOTION by Third Party Defendant Miggins & Miggins, Inc., Counter Defendant Larry Miggins, D.C. to dismiss Memorandum of Law in Support of Miggins Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim and Third Party Complaint of Regence Group, Motion and Notice of Presentm # 276 (Axelrod, Robert)
October 28, 2010 Filing 311 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Motions to compel are granted subject to agreement and comments made in open court. Status report regarding pending substantive motions is to be filed by 11/2/2010. Status hearing held and continued to 12/15/2010 at 09:30 AM. (or, )
October 26, 2010 Filing 310 NOTICE by Mariah E Moran of Change of Address (Moran, Mariah)
October 26, 2010 Filing 309 NOTICE by David J. Stetler of Change of Address (Stetler, David)
October 25, 2010 Filing 308 REPLY by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. to memorandum in opposition to motion # 303 , motion to compel,,,, # 291 , response in opposition to motion,,,, # 301 , response in opposition to motion, # 304 (Axelrod, Robert)
October 25, 2010 Filing 307 REPLY by Third Party Defendant Miggins & Miggins, Inc., Counter Defendant Larry Miggins, D.C. to response in opposition to motion, # 294 , motion to dismiss, # 276 (Axelrod, Robert)
October 18, 2010 Filing 306 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Status hearing held and continued to 10/28/2010 at 9:30 AM. Motions to compel are entered and continued to status hearing date. (or, )
October 15, 2010 Filing 305 STATUS Report Joint Status Report Regarding Deposition Scheduling by Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, David R Barber, D.C., Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Blue Cross Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, California Chiropractic Association, Jerry Capone, D.C., CareFirst, Inc., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Ryan S Ford, D.C., Kendall Gearhart, D.C., Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Katherine Hopkins, Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Miggins & Miggins, Inc., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Casey Paulsen, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Premera Blue Cross, Dean Renneke, D.C., Andrew Reno, D.C., The Regence Group, Eric Thompson, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc., Ronald L. Young, D.C. (Webster, Bryan)
October 15, 2010 Filing 304 RESPONSE by Independence Blue Crossin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, David R Barber, D.C., Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., California Chiropractic Association, Jerry Capone, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropract # 291 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Runnels, Charis)
October 15, 2010 Filing 303 MEMORANDUM by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama in Opposition to motion to compel,,,, # 291 , Corrected (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nancy Beasley)(Schmidtke, Mark)
October 15, 2010 Filing 302 MEMORANDUM by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama in Opposition to motion to compel,,,, # 291 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nancy Beasley)(Schmidtke, Mark)
October 15, 2010 Filing 301 RESPONSE by Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, David R Barber, D.C., Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., California Chiropractic Association, Jerry Capone, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropract # 291 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-8)(Conway, Michael)
October 13, 2010 Filing 300 NOTICE of Correction regarding exhibit to document # 294 . (psm, )
October 13, 2010 Filing 299 EXHIBIT 1 (corrected) to Regence Group's Response # 294 in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim and Third-Party Complaint by The Regence Group (Moran, Mariah) Modified on 10/13/2010 (psm, ).
October 13, 2010 Filing 298 NOTICE of Motion by Michael M. Conway for presentment of motion to compel # 297 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/18/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Conway, Michael)
October 13, 2010 Filing 297 MOTION by Defendant WellPoint, Inc. to compel Plaintiff Andrew Reno To Answer All Interrogatories By October 28, 2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C)(Conway, Michael)
October 13, 2010 Filing 296 NOTICE of Motion by Mariah E Moran for presentment of motion to compel,, # 295 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/18/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Moran, Mariah)
October 13, 2010 Filing 295 MOTION by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, CareFirst, Inc., Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc. to compel Production of Documents (Moran, Mariah)
October 13, 2010 Filing 294 RESPONSE by The Regence Groupin Opposition to MOTION by Third Party Defendant Miggins & Miggins, Inc., Counter Defendant Larry Miggins, D.C. to dismiss Memorandum of Law in Support of Miggins Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim and Third Party Complaint of Regence Group, Motion and Notice of Presentm # 276 . (2) Exhibit Entered in Error (psm, ). Modified on 10/13/2010 (psm, ).
October 13, 2010 Filing 293 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Per the parties' proposed schedule, Regence's response to the motion to dismiss its counterclaim is to be filed by 10/13/10, and defendants' reply is to be filed by 10/25/10. The Court will rule by mail. (mk)
October 12, 2010 Filing 292 Notice of Presentment of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel NOTICE of Motion by Robert Michael Axelrod for presentment of motion to compel,,,, # 291 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/18/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Axelrod, Robert)
October 12, 2010 Filing 291 MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, David R Barber, D.C., Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., California Chiropractic Association, Jerry Capone, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Ryan S Ford, D.C., Kendall Gearhart, D.C., Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Casey Paulsen, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Dean Renneke, D.C., Andrew Reno, D.C., Eric Thompson, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Ronald L. Young, D.C., Intervenor Plaintiff Katherine Hopkins to compel Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motio to Compel Production of Certain Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' First Set of Document Requests and to Designate Deponents as set out in 30(b)(6) notices (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-B to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 1 to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 2 to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits D-G to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel, # 5 Notice of Filing Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery and to Designate Deponents)(Axelrod, Robert)
October 7, 2010 Filing 290 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion for order regarding the number of depositions is denied in part without prejudice, granted regarding location of depositions, and entered and continued in part to 10/18/2010. Motion to compel is granted as stated in open court. Answer to be provided by 10/28/2010. Status hearing set for 10/18/2010 at 9:30 AM. Response to motion to dismiss is to be filed by 10/13/2010 and reply by 10/25/2010. (or, )
October 6, 2010 Filing 289 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/6/2010. Mailed notice (tlm)
October 6, 2010 Filing 288 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: MFor the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court grants the defendants' motion to dismiss (Docket no. # 226 ). Plaintiffs RICO claims (Counts 3, 4, 5, and 6) are dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff Hopkins' claims against defendant WellPoint in counts 1, 2, 3, and 7 of the second amended complaint are likewise dismissed. Mailed notice (tlm)
October 4, 2010 Filing 287 NOTICE of Motion by Michael M. Conway for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief,,,, # 286 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/7/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Conway, Michael)
October 4, 2010 Filing 286 MOTION by Defendants Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc.Joint Motion For Court to Issue Order Regarding The Number of Depositions, Duration of Depositions, Location of Depositions and to Require Scheduling of Depositions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-E)(Conway, Michael)
October 4, 2010 Filing 285 NOTICE of Motion by Michael M. Conway for presentment of motion to compel # 284 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/7/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Conway, Michael)
October 4, 2010 Filing 284 MOTION by Defendant WellPoint, Inc. to compel Plaintiff Andrew Reno To Answer An Interrogatory Asking For Facts Supporting Allegations Of The Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-G)(Conway, Michael)
September 24, 2010 Filing 283 REPLY by Defendants Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. Memorandum In Support Of Their Motion To Dismiss All Rico Claims (Hamill, John)
September 24, 2010 Filing 282 REPLY by WellPoint, Inc. to MOTION by Defendant WellPoint, Inc. to dismiss Plaintiff Katherine Hopkins's ERISA Claims Against Wellpoint, Inc. # 261 (Conway, Michael)
September 24, 2010 Filing 281 REPLY by Defendants Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. to motion to dismiss,,, # 226 Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Proceedings with Respect to the Florida Plaintiffs' Claims (Webster, Bryan)
September 24, 2010 Filing 280 EXHIBIT by Defendants Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. to Defendants Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively Compel Arbitration and Stay the Proceedings With Respect to International Chiropractors Association regarding reply,,,, # 279 (Webster, Bryan)
September 24, 2010 Filing 279 REPLY by Defendants Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. to motion to dismiss,,, # 226 Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Proceedings With Respect to International Chiropractors Association (Webster, Bryan)
September 24, 2010 Filing 278 REPLY by Defendants Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. to motion to dismiss,,, # 226 the Claims of Plaintiff Transitions Recovery Program (Webster, Bryan)
September 16, 2010 Filing 277 Notice of Presentment of Motion by Counter-Defendant Larry Miggins and Third-Party Defendant Miggins & Miggins to Dismiss Counterclaim and Third Party Complaint by Regence Group NOTICE of Motion by Robert Michael Axelrod for presentment of motion to dismiss, # 276 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/14/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Axelrod, Robert)
September 16, 2010 Filing 276 MOTION by Third Party Defendant Miggins & Miggins, Inc., Counter Defendant Larry Miggins, D.C. to dismiss Memorandum of Law in Support of Miggins Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim and Third Party Complaint of Regence Group, Motion and Notice of Presentment (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Notice of Presentment of Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim and Third Party Complaint, # 2 Notice of Filing Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim and Third Party Complaint of Regence Group)(Axelrod, Robert)
September 14, 2010 Filing 275 PROTECTIVE Order Regarding Confidential Information signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/14/2010. Mailed notice (tlm)
September 14, 2010 Filing 274 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion for protective order # 271 is granted. Enter Order as approved by the Court. Mailed notice (tlm)
September 10, 2010 Filing 273 MEMORANDUM by Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Katherine Hopkins, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. in Opposition to motion to dismiss,,, # 226 and motion to compel arbitration (Axelrod, Robert)
August 31, 2010 Filing 272 NOTICE of Motion by Bryan Matthew Webster for presentment of motion for protective order,,,,,,, # 271 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/15/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Webster, Bryan)
August 31, 2010 Filing 271 MOTION by Defendants Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc., Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, David R Barber, D.C., Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., California Chiropractic Association, Jerry Capone, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Ryan S Ford, D.C., Kendall Gearhart, D.C., Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Casey Paulsen, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Dean Renneke, D.C., Andrew Reno, D.C., Eric Thompson, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Ronald L. Young, D.C., Intervenor Plaintiff Katherine Hopkins, Third Party Defendant Miggins & Miggins, Inc., Counter Defendant Larry Miggins, D.C., ThirdParty Plaintiff The Regence Group, Counter Claimant The Regence Group for protective order Joint Motion for Entry of a Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Webster, Bryan)
August 26, 2010 Filing 270 AGREED STIPULATION Concerning Certain Claims signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/26/2010. Mailed notice (tlm)
August 26, 2010 Filing 269 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Hearing held on motion for agreed stipulation # 266 . Motion is granted. Enter Agreed Stipulation concerning certain claims. Motion for extension of time to file response is granted. # 268 Responses by Defendant Miggins is to be filed by 9/16/2010. Mailed notice (tlm)
August 23, 2010 Filing 268 MOTION by Third Party Defendant Miggins & Miggins, Inc., Counter Defendant Larry Miggins, D.C. for extension of time to file (Agreed Motion) , MOTION by Third Party Defendant Miggins & Miggins, Inc., Counter Defendant Larry Miggins, D.C. for extension of time to file response/reply as to notice of motion, # 266 for Counter-Defendant and Third-Party Defendant to Respond to Counterclaim and Third-Party Complaint (refiled per Clerk's instructions) (Weiswasser, Susan)
August 23, 2010 Filing 267 MOTION by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Florida Chiropractic Association, Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Andrew Reno, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C. Agreed Motion for Entry of Stipulation Concerning Certain Claims (refiled per Clerk's instructions) (Weiswasser, Susan)
August 20, 2010 Filing 266 Notice of Presentment of Agreed Motion to Extend Time for Counter-Defendant and Third-Party Defendant to Respond to Counterclaim and Third-Party Complaint NOTICE of Motion by Susan Jessica Weiswasser for presentment of (Attachments: # 1 Agreed Motion to Extend Time for Counter-Defendant and Third-Party Defendant to Respond to Counterclaim and Third-Party Complaint)(Weiswasser, Susan)
August 20, 2010 Filing 265 Notice of Presentment of Agreed Motion for Entry of Stipulation - NOTICE of Motion by Susan Jessica Weiswasser for presentment of before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/26/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Motion for Entry of Stipulation Concerning Certain Claims, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Agreed Stipulation Concerning Certain Claims)(Weiswasser, Susan)
August 18, 2010 Filing 264 EXHIBIT by Defendant WellPoint, Inc. Exhibits A through C regarding memorandum in support of motion # 262 (Conway, Michael)
August 12, 2010 Filing 263 NOTICE of Correction regarding document # 262 . (tlm,
August 11, 2010 Filing 262 MEMORANDUM by WellPoint, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss # 261 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration, # 3 Exhibit D1 - D2)(Conway, Michael). Modified on 8/12/2010 (tlm).
August 11, 2010 Filing 261 MOTION by Defendant WellPoint, Inc. to dismiss Plaintiff Katherine Hopkins's ERISA Claims Against Wellpoint, Inc. (Conway, Michael)
August 11, 2010 Filing 260 MEMORANDUM by Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss,,, # 259 (Hamill, John)
August 11, 2010 Filing 259 MOTION by Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Highmark, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, WellPoint, Inc., The Regence Group, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Shield of California, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Premera Blue Cross, CareFirst, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Wellmark, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Health Care Services Corporation, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Independence Blue Cross to dismiss Hopkins' RICO Claims (Hamill, John)
August 5, 2010 Filing 258 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Status hearing pursuant to Rule 16(b) held. Any and all motions to dismiss plaintiff Hopkins' claims must be filed no later than 8/11/2010, with supporting memoranda. Responses to all motions to dismiss are to be filed by 9/10/2010; Replies are to be filed by 9/24/2010. (or, )
August 5, 2010 Filing 257 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiffs' motion to amend the complaint to add Katherine Hopkins as a plaintiff is granted, without prejudice to the arguments defendants make against this amendment. Hopkins' claims appear to overlap factually and legally with those of at least some other plaintiffs. Defendants raise legitimate concerns regarding manageability, but the Court is not persuaded at this point that adding Hopkins as a plaintiff makes the case unmanageable. The Court can and will revisit this question later as appropriate. Defendants' argument that a class represented by Hopkins cannot properly be certified is premature, as there is no pending motion seeking to certify a class of subscriber plaintiffs. Finally, defendants' arguments regarding the merits of Hopkins' claim are best raised via a motion to dismiss (if appropriate) or a motion for summary judgment. (mk)
July 29, 2010 SUMMONS Issued as to Third Party Defendant Miggins & Miggins, Inc. (kjd, )
July 28, 2010 Filing 256 NOTICE by Christopher M. Burke of Change of Address (Burke, Christopher)
July 27, 2010 Filing 255 REPLY by Plaintiffs Michelle M Askar, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Mark Barnard, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Jay Korsen, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, Andrew Reno, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Intervenor Plaintiff Katherine Hopkins to notice of motion, # 192 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Amend to Add Katherine Hopkins as a Plaintiff (Weiswasser, Susan)
July 27, 2010 Filing 254 ANSWER to amended complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas(Bishop, Martin)
July 27, 2010 Filing 253 ANSWER to amended complaint by Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield(Bishop, Martin)
July 27, 2010 Filing 252 ANSWER to amended complaint by Wellmark, Inc.(Webster, Bryan)
July 27, 2010 Filing 251 ANSWER to amended complaint by Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey(Webster, Bryan)
July 27, 2010 Filing 250 ANSWER to amended complaint by Highmark, Inc.(Webster, Bryan)
July 27, 2010 Filing 249 ANSWER to amended complaint by Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield(Webster, Bryan)
July 27, 2010 Filing 248 ANSWER to amended complaint by CareFirst, Inc.(Webster, Bryan)
July 27, 2010 Filing 247 ANSWER to amended complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee(Webster, Bryan)
July 27, 2010 Filing 246 ANSWER to amended complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina(Webster, Bryan)
July 27, 2010 Filing 245 ANSWER to amended complaint by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island(Webster, Bryan)
July 27, 2010 Filing 244 ANSWER to amended complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota(Webster, Bryan)
July 27, 2010 Filing 243 ANSWER to amended complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc.(Webster, Bryan)
July 27, 2010 Filing 242 ANSWER to amended complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida(Webster, Bryan)
July 27, 2010 Filing 241 MEMORANDUM by Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss,,, # 226 Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively Compel Arbitration and Stay the Proceedings with Respect to International Chiropractors Association (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2A, # 4 Exhibit 2B, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Notice of Filing 9)(Webster, Bryan)
July 27, 2010 Filing 240 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively or Compel Arbitration and Stay the Proceedings with Respect to the Florida Plaintiffs' Claims (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Webster, Bryan)
July 27, 2010 Filing 239 MEMORANDUM by Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss,,, # 226 Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss the Claims of Plaintiff Transitions Recovery Program (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Webster, Bryan)
July 27, 2010 Filing 238 MEMORANDUM by Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss,,, # 226 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hamill, John)
July 27, 2010 Filing 237 ANSWER to amended complaint, THIRD party complaint by The Regence Group against Miggins & Miggins, Inc, d/b/a HealthSource Chiropractic of Seattle, Washington., COUNTERCLAIM filed by The Regence Group against Larry Miggins, D.C.. by The Regence Group(Moran, Mariah)
July 27, 2010 Filing 236 ANSWER to amended complaint by Premera Blue Cross(Padden, Michael)
July 27, 2010 Filing 235 ANSWER to amended complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina(Moran, Mariah)
July 27, 2010 Filing 234 ANSWER to amended complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City(Moran, Mariah)
July 27, 2010 Filing 233 ANSWER to amended complaint by Independence Blue Cross(Runnels, Charis)
July 27, 2010 Filing 232 ANSWER to amended complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan(Green, Patrick)
July 27, 2010 Filing 231 ANSWER to amended complaint by Health Care Services Corporation(Robertson, Alexis)
July 27, 2010 Filing 230 Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia's ANSWER to amended complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc.(Conway, Michael)
July 27, 2010 Filing 229 WellPoint, Inc's ANSWER to amended complaint by WellPoint, Inc.(Conway, Michael)
July 27, 2010 Filing 228 ANSWER to amended complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama(Schmidtke, Mark)
July 27, 2010 Filing 227 NOTICE of Motion by Bryan Matthew Webster for presentment of motion to dismiss,,, # 226 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/5/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Webster, Bryan)
July 27, 2010 Filing 226 MOTION by Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Highmark, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, WellPoint, Inc., The Regence Group, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Shield of California, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Premera Blue Cross, CareFirst, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Wellmark, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Health Care Services Corporation, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Independence Blue Cross to dismiss Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss or Compel Arbitration (Webster, Bryan)
July 27, 2010 Filing 225 ANSWER to amended complaint -- Defendant Blue Shield of California's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Blue Shield of California(McCallum, Joanna)
July 23, 2010 Filing 223 CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant Health Care Services Corporation Amended (Wade, Kara)
July 23, 2010 Filing 222 CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant Health Care Services Corporation Amended (Thies, John)
July 22, 2010 Filing 221 DOCUMENT removed per court order of 3/1/2011. (Wade, Kara) Modified on 3/1/2011 (tlm).
July 22, 2010 Filing 220 DOCUMENT remove per court order of 3/1/2011. (Thies, John) Modified on 3/1/2011 (tlm).
July 21, 2010 Filing 219 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The motion for leave to file an additional appearance on behalf of defendant Health Care Service Corp. is granted. # 217 Mailed notice (tlm)
July 16, 2010 Filing 218 NOTICE of Motion by John E. Thies for presentment of motion for leave to file # 217 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/22/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Thies, John)
July 16, 2010 Filing 217 MOTION by Defendant Health Care Services Corporation for leave to file Additional Appearance (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Thies, John)
July 13, 2010 Filing 216 RESPONSE by Defendants Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. to notice of motion, # 192 Defendants' Joint Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion To Amend To Add Katherine Hopkins As A Plaintiff (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Conway, Michael)
July 13, 2010 Filing 215 Attorney Appearance Form by Health Care Services Corporation Kara J. Wade (Thies, John)
July 13, 2010 Filing 214 Attorney Appearance Form by Health Care Services Corporation (Thies, John)
July 9, 2010 Filing 213 NOTICE by Alexis P. Clowney of Change of Address Notification of Name Change from Alexis P. Clowney to Alexis P. Robertson (Clowney, Alexis)
July 2, 2010 Filing 212 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Independence Blue Cross by Kirsten Ann Milton (Milton, Kirsten)
June 29, 2010 Filing 224 SECOND AMENDED complaint by Andrew Reno, D.C., Jay Korsen, D.C., Peri Dwyer, D.C., New York Chiropractic Council, Mark Barnard, D.C., Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association, David R Barber, D.C., Ryan S Ford, D.C., Dean Renneke, D.C., Casey Paulsen, D.C., Kendall Gearhart, D.C., Anthony Fava, D.C., Jeffrey P. Leri, D.C., Larry Miggins, D.C., Association of New Jersey Chiropractors, Ian Barlow, Michelle M Askar, D.C., Ronald L. Young, D.C., Barry A Wahner, D.C., Eric Thompson, D.C., Gregory T Kuhlman, D.C. against Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Tennessee, Blue Shield of California, CareFirst, Inc., Excellus Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Health Care Services Corporation, Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey, Independence Blue Cross, Premera Blue Cross, The Regence Group, WellPoint, Inc., Wellmark, Inc. and terminating California Chiropractic Association and Florida Chiropractic Association. (tlm)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER Relating to the Discovery of Electronically Stored Information # 210 signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/29/2010. Mailed notice (tlm)
June 29, 2010 Filing 210 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Hearing held on motion requesting assignment (190). Motion is granted. Enter Order. Motion to amendcomplaint is granted in part # 192 . Response to balance of motion to amend complaint is to be filed by 7/13/2010 and reply brief by 7/27/2010. Motion to set class expert discovery date is granted # 201 . Plaintiff's 26(a)(2) disclosures for class experts are 11/19/2010 and defendant's are due 12/17/2010. Motion to dismiss is to be filed by 7/27/2010. Status hearing set for 8/5/2010. Motion to intervene is terminated as moot # 159 . Mailed notice (tlm)
June 29, 2010 Filing 209 WITHDRAWING Shana A. Shifrin as counsel for Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield Association and substituting Casey T. Grabenstein as counsel of record (Grabenstein, Casey)
June 29, 2010 Filing 208 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield Association by Casey T. Grabenstein (Grabenstein, Casey)
June 28, 2010 Filing 207 RESPONSE by Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association to MOTION by Defendants Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Ka # 201 (Axelrod, Robert)
June 28, 2010 Filing 206 REPLY by Pennsylvania Chiropractic Association to Response,,, # 200 (Axelrod, Robert)
June 27, 2010 Filing 205 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Counsel are directed to be prepared to advise the Court at the scheduled date of 6/29/10 whether plaintiffs' motion to amend supersedes or otherwise renders moot the previously-filed motion to intervene. (mk)
June 25, 2010