Persis International, Inc. et al v. Burgett, Inc.

Plaintiff: Persis International, Inc. and Edward F. Richards
Defendant: Burgett, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv07451
Filed: November 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Ronald A. Guzman
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 228 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 9/18/2012:(mb, )
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MOTION by Counter Defendants Persis International, Inc., Edward F. Richards, Plaintiffs Persis International, Inc., Edward F. Richards for judgment (Biagi, Richard)
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 9/26/2011. Mailed notice (cjg, )
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 9/19/2011. Mailed notice (cjg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Persis International, Inc. et al v. Burgett, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Persis International, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Mote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward F. Richards
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Mote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burgett, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?