The Morrish National Republic: Federal Government Moorish Divine and National Movement of the World et al v. City of Chicago et al
Plaintiff: The Morrish National Republic: Federal Government Moorish Divine and National Movement of the World, Moorish Science Temple of America, Sheikess Diana EL and Sheik L Love EL
Defendant: City of Chicago and Richard M Daley
Case Number: 1:2010cv01047
Filed: February 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 177 WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 2/5/2013: For the reasons set forth below, the Court denies Plaintiff's Rule 60 Motion to Vacate Previous Voidable Order Granting Defendants' Initial Motion to Dismiss 168 and denies as moot Plaintiff's Motion for a Rule 57 Declaratory Judgment 172 as the Court declines to reopen this case. This case remains closed. Mailed notice(tbk, )
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 162 WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 8/25/2011: This matter is before the Court on an Objection to Memorandum Opinion and Order of the Court 157 , filed by Plaintiffs on July 25, 2011. The Court construes the objection as a motion to reconsider the Courts ruling of July 19, 2011, which granted Defendants motion to dismiss in its entirety. Also before the Court is Plaintiffs motion for leave to amend additional defendants to complaint 153 . For the reasons set forth be low, Plaintiffs objection/motion for reconsideration 157 is denied, and Plaintiffs motion for leave to amend 153 is denied as moot. The remaining pending motions [94, 98, 99, 118, 119, 135, 138, 142, and 159] also are denied as moot given the Cou rts previous rulings, including the ruling on Defendants motion to dismiss. This case is closed in its entirety. Plaintiff Sheik Love ELs federal claims are dismissed with prejudice and a Rule 58 final judgment will be entered on those claims for Defendants and against Plaintiff Sheik Love EL. Notices Mailed by Judge's Staff (tbk, )
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 7/19/2011. (lw, )
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 141 WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 6/29/2011:Before the Court are several motions [125, 126, 127, 128, 129] filed by Plaintiff. As explained below, the motions concerning the reply brief and the schedule for its submission [125, 126, 127] are denied. The motions seeking clarification [128, 129] are granted in part, with clarification provided below. The notice of motion date of 6/30/2011 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Please see below for further details and information concerning the anticipated disposition of the pending motion to dismiss and the handling of any further motions that may be filed in the interim. Notices Mailed by Judge's Staff (tbk, )
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 5/27/2011:Before the Court are the following: (1) Plaintiffs motion to state for the public record by what authority does the court dismiss Plaintiffs prior motion to rule on docket entri es 49 and 50 89 , (2) Plaintiffs motion to strikepending motion docket entry 43 and deadline to file reply brief 91 , and (3) Plaintiffs objections to docket entry 88 93 . For the reasons stated below, the motions [89, 91] are denied and the objections 93 are overruled. Inview of this ruling, the notice of motion date of 5/31/2011 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Notices Mailed by Judge's Staff (tbk, )
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 4/18/2011. For the reasons set forth below, the Court denies Defendants' motion to dismiss this lawsuit 56 , but sanctions Plaintiff Sheik L. Love EL in the amount of $450 for t he material omissions in his application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this lawsuit, he is ordered to pay $350 to the Clerk of Court and $100 to the United States of America (through the Clerk of the Court) on or before May 9, 2011. If payment is not made by May 9, this case will be dismissed with prejudice. [For further details see written opinion.] Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 4/18/2011. Mailed notice (lw, )
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 1/26/2011: For the reasons set forth below, Plaintiffs motion to strike Defendants granted motion for stay of discovery 31 , which the Court construes as an objection to Magistrate Judge Keys order of 7/28/10 granting Defendants motion to stay discovery, is denied. Mailed by Judge's Staff notice(tbk, )
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 WRITTEN Opinion signed by Judge Dow, dated 1/3/2011: For the reasons stated below, Plaintiffs motion to consolidate related cases and joinder of claims 60 is denied. The notice of motion date of 1/5/2011 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice(tbk, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Morrish National Republic: Federal Government Moorish Divine and National Movement of the World et al v. City of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Morrish National Republic: Federal Government Moorish Divine and National Movement of the World
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moorish Science Temple of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheikess Diana EL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheik L Love EL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard M Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?