Groupon, Inc. v. Groupocity, LLC Featured Case

Plaintiff: Groupon, Inc.
Defendant: Groupocity, LLC
Case Number: 1:2010cv01126
Filed: February 19, 2010
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Marvin E. Aspen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2010 MAILED Closing Patent Report with certified copy of minute order dated 4/9/2010 to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (vmj, )
April 9, 2010 11 MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:Plaintiffs' Stipulation and joint Motion to dismiss 10 is granted. Motion terminated. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), and stipulation and joint motion for dismissal filed on 3/26/10 (10), all pending claims against Groupocity, LLC are dismissed. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorney's fees. The status hearing set for 4/15/10 is stricken. Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
March 26, 2010 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Groupon, Inc. to dismiss by Stipulation and Joint Motion for Dismissal (Pine, Jeffrey)
February 22, 2010 8 MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Status hearing set for 4/15/2010 at 10:30 AM., in Courtroom 2525. The plaintiff is to notify the defendant of status date.Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
February 19, 2010 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Groupon, Inc. by Allison Michelle Corder (Corder, Allison)
February 19, 2010 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Martin C. Ashman. (ef, )
February 19, 2010 6 Notice of Claims Involving Patents or Trademarks by Groupon, Inc. (Pine, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2010 5 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Groupon, Inc. (Pine, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2010 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Groupon, Inc. by Jeffrey A Pine of Allison M. Corder (Pine, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2010 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Groupon, Inc. by Jeffrey A Pine (Pine, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2010 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Pine, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2010 1 COMPLAINT (Verified) for Trademark Infringement, Unfair Competition, Dilution, Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Trade Practices filed by Groupon, Inc. ; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-4543490. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(Pine, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Groupon, Inc. v. Groupocity, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Groupon, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A Pine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Groupocity, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?