Miller UK Ltd. et al v. Caterpillar, Inc.
Plaintiff: Miller UK Ltd. and Miller International Ltd.
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv03770
Filed: June 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2017 Filing 1187 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: The Court has been informed that all outstanding issues have been resolved by the parties' negotiated resolution of their respective appeals. The parties' petitions for attorney fees and costs are denied as moot. All other pending motions and hearing dates are stricken. Mailed notice (ef, )
November 13, 2017 Filing 1186 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Parties' Motions to Return Sealed Documents Pursuant to This Court's Protective Order #1182 and #1184 are granted. The motion presentment date of 11/21/2017 is stricken. Parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
November 10, 2017 Filing 1185 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1184 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 11/21/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
November 10, 2017 Filing 1184 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to Return Sealed Documents Pursuant to this Court's Protective Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Oslan, Reed) (Docket Text Modified on 11/13/2017 by Clerk's Office) (eaa, ).
November 9, 2017 Filing 1183 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory J Commins, Jr for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1182 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 11/21/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Commins, Gregory)
November 9, 2017 Filing 1182 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc.Motion to Return Sealed Documents Pursuant to This Court's Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Commins, Gregory)
September 6, 2017 Filing 1181 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #1180 , #1178 , #1177 , #1179 sent to Attorney Edward H. Williams returned as: Unknown Address Error. Mailed to attorney Edward H. Williams a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ek, )
September 6, 2017 Filing 1180 CERTIFIED copy of order dated 09/06/2017 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal #1098 , notice of appeal #1156 , amended notice of appeal #1165 , amended notice of appeal, #1171 ; Appellate case no.: 17-1890, 17-2015, 17-2059 and 17-2130: Upon consideration of the JOINT MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, filed on September 6, 2017, by counsel for the parties, IT IS ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). (bg, )
September 6, 2017 Filing 1179 MANDATE of USCA dated 09/06/2017 regarding notice of appeal #1098 , notice of appeal #1156 , amended notice of appeal #1165 , amended notice of appeal, #1171 ; USCA No.17-1890, 17-2015, 17-2059 and 17-2130 ; No record to be returned. (bg, )
September 6, 2017 Filing 1178 SATISFACTION of Judgment regarding order #1159 (Oslan, Reed)
September 6, 2017 Filing 1177 Joint Notice of Voluntary Withdrawal by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. (Oslan, Reed)
July 6, 2017 Filing 1176 DECLARATION of Ronald Keith Miller regarding order #1159 (Oslan, Reed)
June 5, 2017 Filing 1175 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1106 sent to Terry L. Sullivan returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form (ek, )
May 30, 2017 Filing 1174 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding amended notice of appeal, #1171 ; USCA Case No. 17-2130. (bg, )
May 30, 2017 Filing 1173 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on amended notice of appeal #1171 . Notified counsel (smm)
May 30, 2017 Filing 1172 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding amended notice of appeal #1171 . (smm)
May 30, 2017 Filing 1171 AMENDED notice of appeal by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. regarding orders #1159 , #1018 , #1097 ; Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0752-13224773. (Attachments: #1 Docketing Statement for Amended Notice of Appeal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Oslan, Reed)
May 22, 2017 Filing 1170 EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. (bg, )
May 22, 2017 Filing 1169 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. MTX750 (Baker, Gregory)
May 19, 2017 Filing 1168 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding amended notice of appeal #1165 ; USCA Case No. 17-2059. (bg, )
May 19, 2017 Filing 1167 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on amended notice of appeal #1165 . Notified counsel (ek, )
May 19, 2017 Filing 1166 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding amended notice of appeal #1165 (ek, )
May 19, 2017 Filing 1165 AMENDED notice of appeal by Caterpillar, Inc. ; Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0752-13194777. (Baker, Gregory) (Linked document has the incorrect case number (bg)))
May 15, 2017 Filing 1163 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #1156 ; USCA Case No. 17-2015. (bg, )
May 15, 2017 Filing 1162 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #1156 . Notified counsel (smm)
May 15, 2017 Filing 1161 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion by counsel to withdraw as attorney #1119 is granted. Attorney Terry L Sullivan is withdrawn as counsel of record. Mailed notice (ef, )
May 15, 2017 Filing 1160 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal #1156 . (smm)
May 15, 2017 Filing 1159 AMENDED JUDGMENT ORDER signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 5/15/2017. Mailed notice(ef, )
May 15, 2017 Filing 1158 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Consistent with the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order dated 3/31/2016 #1097 and in consideration of the parties' letter submissions of 5/10/2017 #1115 , #1118 , the Court enters the accompanying Amended Judgment Order, which clarifies and supersedes the earlier Judgment Order entered 4/11/2016 #1018 . Mailed notice (ef, )
May 12, 2017 Filing 1164 EXHIBIT filed (bg, )
May 12, 2017 Filing 1157 EXHIBIT by Counter Claimants Caterpillar, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc., Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. (bg, )
May 12, 2017 Filing 1156 NOTICE of appeal by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. regarding orders #1018 , #1097 Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0752-13171140. (Oslan, Reed)
May 12, 2017 Filing 1155 SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Caterpillar, Inc. (Baker, Gregory)
May 12, 2017 Filing 1154 Exhibit List Exhibits Admitted into Evidence by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Baker, Gregory)
May 12, 2017 Filing 1153 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. JTX1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit JTX2, #2 Exhibit JTX3, #3 Exhibit JTX4, #4 Exhibit JTX5, #5 Exhibit JTX6, #6 Exhibit JTX7, #7 Exhibit JTX8, #8 Exhibit JTX9, #9 Exhibit JTX10)(Baker, Gregory)
May 12, 2017 Filing 1152 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. MTX521 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MTX558, #2 Exhibit MTX580, #3 Exhibit MTX596.001, #4 Exhibit MTX722.004, #5 Exhibit MTX723.001, #6 Exhibit MTX734.285, #7 Exhibit MTX751)(Baker, Gregory)
May 12, 2017 Filing 1151 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. MTX324 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MTX326, #2 Exhibit MTX335, #3 Exhibit MTX465, #4 Exhibit MTX469, #5 Exhibit MTX483, #6 Exhibit MTX500)(Baker, Gregory)
May 12, 2017 Filing 1150 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. MTX322 (Baker, Gregory)
May 12, 2017 Filing 1149 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. MTX241 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MTX247, #2 Exhibit MTX264, #3 Exhibit MTX265, #4 Exhibit MTX279, #5 Exhibit MTX285, #6 Exhibit MTX290, #7 Exhibit MTX294, #8 Exhibit MTX296)(Baker, Gregory)
May 12, 2017 Filing 1148 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. MTX166 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MTX167, #2 Exhibit MTX171, #3 Exhibit MTX172, #4 Exhibit MTX173, #5 Exhibit MTX174, #6 Exhibit MTX175, #7 Exhibit MTX177, #8 Exhibit MTX182, #9 Exhibit MTX191, #10 Exhibit MTX192, #11 Exhibit MTX198, #12 Exhibit MTX199, #13 Exhibit MTX200, #14 Exhibit MTX212, #15 Exhibit MTX234)(Baker, Gregory)
May 12, 2017 Filing 1147 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. MTX152 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MTX153, #2 Exhibit MTX154, #3 Exhibit MTX160, #4 Exhibit MTX161, #5 Exhibit MTX162, #6 Exhibit MTX163, #7 Exhibit MTX164, #8 Exhibit MTX165)(Baker, Gregory)
May 12, 2017 Filing 1146 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. MTX111.001 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MTX118, #2 Exhibit MTX124, #3 Exhibit MTX127, #4 Exhibit MTX131, #5 Exhibit MTX132, #6 Exhibit MTX133, #7 Exhibit MTX134, #8 Exhibit MTX137, #9 Exhibit MTX138, #10 Exhibit MTX139, #11 Exhibit MTX140, #12 Exhibit MTX141, #13 Exhibit MTX143, #14 Exhibit MTX144, #15 Exhibit MTX146)(Baker, Gregory)
May 12, 2017 Filing 1145 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. MTX25 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MTX30, #2 Exhibit MTX33.004, #3 Exhibit MTX33.008, #4 Exhibit MTX33.009, #5 Exhibit MTX33.010, #6 Exhibit MTX41, #7 Exhibit MTX60, #8 Exhibit MTX86, #9 Exhibit MTX96, #10 Exhibit MTX99, #11 Exhibit MTX102, #12 Exhibit MTX110)(Baker, Gregory)
May 12, 2017 Filing 1144 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. MTX12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MTX13, #2 Exhibit MTX14, #3 Exhibit MTX15, #4 Exhibit MTX16, #5 Exhibit MTX17, #6 Exhibit MTX18, #7 Exhibit MTX19, #8 Exhibit MTX20, #9 Exhibit MTX21, #10 Exhibit MTX22)(Baker, Gregory)
May 12, 2017 Filing 1143 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. MTX1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MTX2, #2 Exhibit MTX5, #3 Exhibit MTX6, #4 Exhibit MTX8, #5 Exhibit MTX10, #6 Exhibit MTX11)(Baker, Gregory)
May 12, 2017 Filing 1142 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. MILLER UK LTD. AND MILLER INTERNATIONAL LTD TRIAL EXHIBIT MTX0337 FILED ON CD WITH COURT.S (Baker, Gregory)
May 12, 2017 Filing 1141 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 417 (Attachments: #1 452, #2 453, #3 832.5, #4 832.6, #5 832.7, #6 832.8, #7 832.9, #8 832.10, #9 1482.1)(Baker, Gregory)
May 11, 2017 Filing 1140 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 1432 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1434, #2 Exhibit 1435, #3 Exhibit 1436, #4 Exhibit 1440, #5 Exhibit 1447, #6 Exhibit 1449, #7 Exhibit 1456, #8 Exhibit 1458, #9 Exhibit 1459, #10 Exhibit 1462, #11 Exhibit 1464, #12 Exhibit 1547, #13 Exhibit 1567, #14 Exhibit 1581, #15 Exhibit 1585.1, #16 Exhibit 1585.2, #17 Exhibit 1585.3, #18 Exhibit 1585.4, #19 Exhibit 1594, #20 Exhibit 1595, #21 Exhibit 1608)(Baker, Gregory)
May 11, 2017 Filing 1139 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 1337 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1338, #2 Exhibit 1346, #3 Exhibit 1366, #4 Exhibit 1408, #5 Exhibit 1423.1, #6 Exhibit 1425.1, #7 Exhibit 1425.2, #8 Exhibit 1425.3, #9 Exhibit 1425.4, #10 Exhibit 1425.5, #11 Exhibit 1426.6, #12 Exhibit 1426, #13 Exhibit 1430, #14 Exhibit 1431)(Baker, Gregory)
May 11, 2017 Filing 1138 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 1245 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1248, #2 Exhibit 1258, #3 Exhibit 1264, #4 Exhibit 1282, #5 Exhibit 1288, #6 Exhibit 1290, #7 Exhibit 1293, #8 Exhibit 1298, #9 Exhibit 1308, #10 Exhibit 1309, #11 Exhibit 1310, #12 Exhibit 1327, #13 Exhibit 1328, #14 Exhibit 1329, #15 Exhibit 1330, #16 Exhibit 1331, #17 Exhibit 1332, #18 Exhibit 1333, #19 Exhibit 1334, #20 Exhibit 1335)(Baker, Gregory)
May 11, 2017 Filing 1137 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 833.8 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 852, #2 Exhibit 963, #3 Exhibit 1017, #4 Exhibit 1089, #5 Exhibit 1096, #6 Exhibit 1105, #7 Exhibit 1125, #8 Exhibit 1135, #9 Exhibit 1141, #10 Exhibit 1142, #11 Exhibit 1146, #12 Exhibit 1149, #13 Exhibit 1150, #14 Exhibit 1152, #15 Exhibit 1154, #16 Exhibit 1164, #17 Exhibit 1218, #18 Exhibit 1226, #19 Exhibit 1240, #20 Exhibit 1244)(Baker, Gregory)
May 11, 2017 Filing 1136 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 833.7 [Part 3] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 833.7 [Part 4])(Baker, Gregory)
May 11, 2017 Filing 1135 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 833.7 [Part1] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 833.7 [Part 2])(Baker, Gregory)
May 11, 2017 Filing 1134 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 832.2 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 832.3, #2 Exhibit 832.4, #3 Exhibit 832.15, #4 Exhibit 833.1, #5 Exhibit 833.2, #6 Exhibit 833.3, #7 Exhibit 833.4, #8 Exhibit 833.6)(Baker, Gregory)
May 11, 2017 Filing 1133 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 628 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 630, #2 Exhibit 631, #3 Exhibit 632, #4 Exhibit 637, #5 Exhibit 719, #6 Exhibit 720, #7 Exhibit 740, #8 Exhibit 753, #9 Exhibit 765, #10 Exhibit 785, #11 Exhibit 821, #12 Exhibit 832.1)(Baker, Gregory)
May 11, 2017 Filing 1132 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 539 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 540, #2 Exhibit 541, #3 Exhibit 542, #4 Exhibit 544, #5 Exhibit 546, #6 Exhibit 549, #7 Exhibit 551, #8 Exhibit 552, #9 Exhibit 564, #10 Exhibit 568, #11 Exhibit 587, #12 Exhibit 597, #13 Exhibit 601, #14 Exhibit 602, #15 Exhibit 626, #16 Exhibit 627)(Baker, Gregory)
May 11, 2017 Filing 1131 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 454 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 455, #2 Exhibit 460, #3 Exhibit 464, #4 Exhibit 483, #5 Exhibit 484, #6 Exhibit 485, #7 Exhibit 497, #8 Exhibit 523, #9 Exhibit 526, #10 Exhibit 535, #11 Exhibit 536, #12 Exhibit 538)(Baker, Gregory)
May 11, 2017 Filing 1130 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 413 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 414, #2 Exhibit 415, #3 Exhibit 416, #4 Exhibit 418, #5 Exhibit 419, #6 Exhibit 420, #7 Exhibit 421, #8 Exhibit 426, #9 Exhibit 427, #10 Exhibit 428, #11 Exhibit 429, #12 Exhibit 449, #13 Exhibit 450, #14 Exhibit 451)(Baker, Gregory)
May 11, 2017 Filing 1129 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 333 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 334, #2 Exhibit 342, #3 Exhibit 355, #4 Exhibit 357, #5 Exhibit 361, #6 Exhibit 364, #7 Exhibit 365, #8 Exhibit 387, #9 Exhibit 392, #10 Exhibit 404, #11 Exhibit 406, #12 Exhibit 408, #13 Exhibit 411)(Baker, Gregory)
May 11, 2017 Filing 1128 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 259 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 262, #2 Exhibit 263, #3 Exhibit 266, #4 Exhibit 267, #5 Exhibit 268, #6 Exhibit 269, #7 Exhibit 270, #8 Exhibit 271, #9 Exhibit 272, #10 Exhibit 273, #11 Exhibit 274, #12 Exhibit 276, #13 Exhibit 283, #14 Exhibit 284, #15 Exhibit 298, #16 Exhibit 322)(Baker, Gregory)
May 11, 2017 Filing 1127 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 239 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 240, #2 Exhibit 241, #3 Exhibit 243, #4 Exhibit 248, #5 Exhibit 249, #6 Exhibit 250, #7 Exhibit 254, #8 Exhibit 255, #9 Exhibit 256, #10 Exhibit 257, #11 Exhibit 258)(Baker, Gregory)
May 11, 2017 Filing 1126 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 219 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 227, #2 Exhibit 228, #3 Exhibit 229, #4 Exhibit 230, #5 Exhibit 231, #6 Exhibit 234)(Baker, Gregory)
May 11, 2017 Filing 1125 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 168 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 169, #2 Exhibit 170, #3 Exhibit 171, #4 Exhibit 176, #5 Exhibit 177, #6 Exhibit 178, #7 Exhibit 179, #8 Exhibit 181, #9 Exhibit 193, #10 Exhibit 194, #11 Exhibit 195, #12 Exhibit 196, #13 Exhibit 197, #14 Exhibit 203.2, #15 Exhibit 203.3)(Baker, Gregory)
May 11, 2017 Filing 1124 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 115 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 116, #2 Exhibit 125, #3 Exhibit 137, #4 Exhibit 138, #5 Exhibit 144, #6 Exhibit 149, #7 Exhibit 150, #8 Exhibit 151, #9 Exhibit 156, #10 Exhibit 157, #11 Exhibit 160, #12 Exhibit 163, #13 Exhibit 165)(Baker, Gregory)
May 11, 2017 Filing 1123 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 93 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 94, #2 Exhibit 95, #3 Exhibit 96, #4 Exhibit 97, #5 Exhibit 98, #6 Exhibit 99, #7 Exhibit 100, #8 Exhibit 101, #9 Exhibit 102, #10 Exhibit 103)(Baker, Gregory)
May 11, 2017 Filing 1122 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 63 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 64, #2 Exhibit 65, #3 Exhibit 67, #4 Exhibit 77, #5 Exhibit 84, #6 Exhibit 86, #7 Exhibit 87, #8 Exhibit 88, #9 Exhibit 89, #10 Exhibit 90, #11 Exhibit 91, #12 Exhibit 92)(Baker, Gregory)
May 11, 2017 Filing 1121 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 40 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 41, #2 Exhibit 44, #3 Exhibit 49, #4 Exhibit 50, #5 Exhibit 52, #6 Exhibit 53, #7 Exhibit 54, #8 Exhibit 56, #9 Exhibit 59, #10 Exhibit 60, #11 Exhibit 62)(Baker, Gregory)
May 11, 2017 Filing 1120 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 2 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13, #2 Exhibit 26, #3 Exhibit 27, #4 Exhibit 35, #5 Exhibit 36, #6 Exhibit 38, #7 Exhibit 39)(Baker, Gregory)
May 10, 2017 Filing 1119 MOTION by Attorney Terry L. Sullivan to withdraw as attorney for Caterpillar, Inc.. No party information provided (Sullivan, Terry)
May 10, 2017 Filing 1118 Letter by Caterpillar, Inc. in response to Docket 1115 (Baker, Gregory)
May 10, 2017 Filing 1117 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 3/15/2016 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/31/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/12/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2017. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
May 10, 2017 Filing 1116 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 01/07/2016 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/31/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/12/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2017. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
May 10, 2017 Filing 1115 Letter by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Oslan, Reed)
May 9, 2017 Filing 1114 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 10/21/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/30/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/7/2017. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
May 9, 2017 Filing 1113 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 10/13/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/30/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/7/2017. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
May 9, 2017 Filing 1112 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 9/25/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/30/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/7/2017. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
May 9, 2017 Filing 1111 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 8/27/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/30/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/7/2017. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
May 9, 2017 Filing 1110 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 7/15/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/30/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/7/2017. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
May 9, 2017 Filing 1109 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5/21/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/30/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/7/2017. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
May 9, 2017 Filing 1108 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 4/15/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/30/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/7/2017. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
May 9, 2017 Filing 1107 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 01/15/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/30/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/7/2017. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
May 8, 2017 Filing 1106 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #1102 , #1105 , #1104 , #1103 sent to Attorney Terry L Sullivan returned as: Unknown Address Error. Mailed to attorney Terry L Sullivan a Letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ek, )
May 8, 2017 Filing 1105 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 01/15/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/30/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/8/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/7/2017. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
May 8, 2017 Filing 1104 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 10/08/2014 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/30/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/8/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/7/2017. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
May 8, 2017 Filing 1103 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 6/24/2014 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/30/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/8/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/7/2017. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
May 8, 2017 Filing 1102 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 4/02/2014 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/30/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/8/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/7/2017. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
April 28, 2017 Filing 1101 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #1098 ; USCA Case No. 17-1890. (bg, )
April 28, 2017 Filing 1100 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #1098 . Notified counsel (ek, )
April 28, 2017 Filing 1099 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal #1098 (ek, )
April 28, 2017 Filing 1098 NOTICE of appeal by Caterpillar, Inc. regarding orders #1018 , #1096 , #1097 Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0752-13120985. (Baker, Gregory)
March 31, 2017 Filing 1097 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 3/31/2017:Mailed notice(rth, )
March 31, 2017 Filing 1096 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, Defendant / Counter-Plaintiff Caterpillar Inc.'s motion for judgment as a matter of law or, in the alternative, motion for a new trial #1032 is denied, and Plaintiff / Counter-Defendant Miller UK Ltd and Miller International Ltd.'s renewed motion for judgment as a matter of law #1034 is granted to the extent that it seeks clarification of the Court's final judgment order, but otherwise denied.Mailed notice (rth, )
March 31, 2017 Filing 1095 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Upon review of the parties' supplemental filings in support of their respective unopposed motions for leave to file material related to their fee petitions under seal #1050 , #1057 , #1060 , #1069 , #1071 , #1073 , #1081 , #1084 , #1092 , those motions are granted. The parties are advised, however, that this ruling should not be understood to indicate that the Court's ruling on the fee petitions will be docketed under seal. While the Court will endeavor to omit legitimately confidential trade secrets from its public ruling, the parties' desire for confidentiality must be considered in light of the long-standing tradition that litigation is open to the public. See Union Oil Co. of Cal. v. Leavell, 220 F.3d 562, 567-68 (7th Cir. 2000) (noting that even matters of national security are litigated in the open and that "[a]ny step that withdraws an element of the judicial process from public view makes the ensuing decision look more like fiat, which requires compelling justification"). Mailed notice (ef, )
October 19, 2016 Filing 1094 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendant's Motion to seal document #1092 is taken under advisement. The motion presentment date of 10/20/2016 is stricken. Parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
October 14, 2016 Filing 1093 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion to seal document, motion for relief,, #1092 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 10/20/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
October 14, 2016 Filing 1092 MOTION by Counter Claimant Caterpillar, Inc., Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to seal document sealed document, #1091 Unopposed Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Leave to File Under Seal Reply Memorandum of Caterpillar Inc. in Support of its Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs Pursuant to 815 ILCS 510/3 (Baker, Gregory)
October 14, 2016 Filing 1091 SEALED DOCUMENT by Counter Claimants Caterpillar, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc., Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Reply Memorandum of Caterpillar Inc. In Support Of Its Motion For Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant To 815 ILCS 510/3 (Baker, Gregory)
October 14, 2016 Filing 1090 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. MILLER UK LTD. AND MILLER INTERNATIONAL LTD.S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Oslan, Reed)
October 5, 2016 Filing 1089 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendant's Motion to seal document #1081 is taken under advisement for ruling. The motion presentment date of 10/6/2016 is stricken. Parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
September 28, 2016 Filing 1088 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for leave to file under seal #1084 is taken under advisement. The motion presentment date of 9/29/2016 is stricken. Parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
September 23, 2016 Filing 1087 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. MILLER UK LTD. AND MILLER INTERNATIONAL LTD.S OPPOSITION TO MOTION OF CATERPILLAR INC. FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Oslan, Reed)
September 23, 2016 Filing 1086 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion to seal document #1084 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/29/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
September 23, 2016 Filing 1085 MEMORANDUM MILLER UK LTD. AND MILLER INTERNATIONAL LTD.S MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO FILE FEE PETITION MATERIAL UNDER SEAL (Oslan, Reed)
September 23, 2016 Filing 1084 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to seal document (Oslan, Reed)
September 23, 2016 Filing 1083 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Opposition of Caterpillar Inc. to Plaintiffs' Motion for Fees and Costs (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7, #8 8, #9 9, #10 10, #11 11, #12 12, #13 13, #14 14, #15 15, #16 16, #17 17, #18 18, #19 19, #20 20, #21 21)(Baker, Gregory)
September 23, 2016 Filing 1082 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion to seal document #1081 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 10/6/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
September 23, 2016 Filing 1081 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to seal document (Baker, Gregory)
September 23, 2016 Filing 1080 Response of Caterpillar Inc. to Order Regarding the Sealing of Information relating to Caterpillar's Attorneys' Fees by Caterpillar, Inc. (Baker, Gregory)
September 7, 2016 Filing 1078 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file an oversized brief #1065 is granted. Plaintiffs' 57-page brief #1074 is accepted by the Court. Defendant is granted leave to file a response brief of no more than 60 pages. Plaintiffs' reply shall be no more than 15 pages. With regard to the parties' pending motions to seal regarding Plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees and costs, #1050 , #1057 , #1060 , #1069 , #1071 , #1073 , the Court notes that although the motions are unopposed, the Seventh Circuit has directed that the sealing of documents must be supported by a showing of good cause even where the parties agree to their confidentiality. Citizens First Nat. Bank of Princeton v. Cincinnati Ins. Co., 178 F.3d 943, 945 (7th Cir. 1999); see also Baxter Int'l, Inc. v. Abbott Labs., 297 F.3d 544, 546 (7th Cir. 2002). The basis for good cause to seal this briefing in its entirety is not readily apparent. Accordingly, the parties may each submit by 9/23/2016 a single brief of not more than five pages to provide support for their motions to seal. This submission may also be made jointly. The Court will take the motions under advisement thereafter. The motion presentment scheduled for 9/07/2016 is stricken; parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
September 6, 2016 Filing 1079 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Case called for Motion hearing. Parties did not appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
August 31, 2016 Filing 1077 REPLY by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to response in opposition to motion #1075 PLAINTIFFS MILLER UK LTD. AND MILLER INTERNATIONAL LTD.S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO FILE THEIR MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS IN EXCESS OF 15 PAGES (Oslan, Reed)
August 31, 2016 Filing 1076 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: The motion presentment date of 9/1/2016 #1066 is stricken. The Court will rule by separate order. Mailed notice (ef, )
August 31, 2016 Filing 1075 RESPONSE by Caterpillar, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for leave to file excess pages #1065 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Baker, Gregory)
August 30, 2016 Filing 1074 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. MILLER UK LTD. AND MILLER INTERNATIONAL LTD.S MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C-1, #4 Exhibit C-2, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Oslan, Reed)
August 30, 2016 Filing 1073 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for attorney fees and costs (Oslan, Reed)
August 30, 2016 Filing 1072 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion to seal #1071 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/6/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
August 30, 2016 Filing 1071 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to seal (Oslan, Reed)
August 30, 2016 Filing 1070 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion to seal #1069 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/7/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
August 30, 2016 Filing 1069 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to seal (Baker, Gregory)
August 30, 2016 Filing 1068 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 815 ILCS 510/3 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B-1)(Baker, Gregory)
August 30, 2016 Filing 1067 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to 815 ILCS 510/3 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baker, Gregory)
August 29, 2016 Filing 1066 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #1065 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/1/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
August 29, 2016 Filing 1065 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for leave to file excess pages (Oslan, Reed)
August 23, 2016 Filing 1064 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiffs' Motion to seal document #1057 and Defendant's Motion to seal document #1060 are taken under advisement. The motion presentment date of 8/24/2016 is stricken. Parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
August 15, 2016 Filing 1063 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2016 is stricken and reset for 8/24/2016 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
August 9, 2016 Filing 1062 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. JOINT STATEMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 54.3(e) REGARDING MILLER UK LTD.S AND MILLER INTERNATIONAL LTD.S PETITION FOR FEES AND EXPENSES (Oslan, Reed)
August 9, 2016 Filing 1061 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion to seal document #1060 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 8/24/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
August 9, 2016 Filing 1060 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to seal document UNOPPOSED MOTION OF MILLER FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL (Oslan, Reed)
August 9, 2016 Filing 1059 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Joint Statement Pursuant to Local Rule 54.3 Regarding Caterpillar Inc.'s Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Baker, Gregory)
August 9, 2016 Filing 1058 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion to seal document, #1057 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 8/23/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
August 9, 2016 Filing 1057 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to seal document Unopposed Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Leave to File Under Seal Joint Statement Pursuant to Local Rule 54.3 Regarding Caterpillar Inc.'s Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Baker, Gregory)
August 8, 2016 Filing 1056 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Unopposed Motion by Caterpillar, Inc. for Leave to File Under Seal Declaration of John W. Toothman Regarding Legal Fees & Expenses Claimed by Plaintiffs #1050 is taken under advisement for ruling. The motion presentment date of 8/9/2016 is stricken. Parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
July 29, 2016 Filing 1055 NOTICE by Caterpillar, Inc. re sealed document #1052 Notice of Filing of Declaration of John W. Toothman Regarding Legal Fees & Expenses Claimed by Plainitffs (Baker, Gregory)
July 29, 2016 Filing 1054 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibits I and J to the Declaration of John W. Toothman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J)(Baker, Gregory)
July 29, 2016 Filing 1053 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibits D, E, F, G01-G24, and H1-H2 to the Declaration of John W. Toothman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G01-G24, #4 Exhibit H1-H2)(Baker, Gregory)
July 29, 2016 Filing 1052 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Declaration of John W. Toothman Regarding Legal Fees & Expenses Claimed by Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B1-B5, #3 Exhibit C)(Baker, Gregory)
July 29, 2016 Filing 1051 Notice of Presentment by Caterpillar, Inc. of Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Declaration of John W. Toothman Regarding Legal Fees & Expenses by Plaintiffs before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 8/9/2016 at 9:00 AM (Baker, Gregory)
July 29, 2016 Filing 1050 Unopposed Motion by Caterpillar, Inc. for Leave to File Under Seal Declaration of John W. Toothman Regarding Legal Fees & Expenses Claimed by Plaintiffs (Baker, Gregory)
July 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1049 ORDER EXTENDING FEE PETITION DEADLINES AND SETTING BRIEFING DEADLINES signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 7/24/2016. Mailed notice(ef, )
July 24, 2016 Filing 1048 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Fee Petition Deadlines and to Set Briefing Deadlines #1046 is granted. Enter order. The motion presentment date of 7/26/2016 is stricken. Parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
July 21, 2016 Filing 1047 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of extension of time #1046 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 7/26/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
July 21, 2016 Filing 1046 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for extension of time Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Fee Petition Deadlines, and to Set Briefing Deadlines (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Baker, Gregory)
July 8, 2016 Filing 1045 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Agreed Motion for an Extension of Fee Petition Deadline #1043 is granted. Parties shall complete preparation of a joint statement by 7/26/2016; and fee motions must be filed with the Court by 8/15/2016. The motion presentment date of 7/12/2016 is stricken. Parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
July 7, 2016 Filing 1044 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion for extension of time to file #1043 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 7/12/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
July 7, 2016 Filing 1043 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for extension of time to file Agreed Motion for an Extension of Fee Petition Deadlines (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Gregory)
June 27, 2016 Filing 1042 REPLY by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to response in opposition to motion, #1037 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Oslan, Reed)
June 24, 2016 Filing 1041 REPLY by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. IN SUPPORT OF ITS RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL (Baker, Gregory)
June 20, 2016 Filing 1040 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Pursuant to the parties' agreement #1039 , the Agreed Order Regarding Fee Petition #1031 is modified as follows: Parties shall conference regarding fee data by 6/27/2016; Parties shall complete preparation of a joint statement by 7/12/2016; and fee motions must be filed with the Court by 8/1/2016. Mailed notice (ef, )
June 17, 2016 Filing 1039 Parties agreed one-week extension on the three remaining deadlines by Caterpillar, Inc. (Baker, Gregory)
June 10, 2016 Filing 1038 DECLARATION of Ronald Keith Miller regarding order #1018 (Oslan, Reed)
June 6, 2016 Filing 1037 RESPONSE by Caterpillar, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for directed verdict MILLER UK LTD. AND MILLER INTERNATIONAL LTD.S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW #1034 (Baker, Gregory)
June 3, 2016 Filing 1036 RESPONSE by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for directed verdict Caterpillar Inc.'s Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, in the Alternative, Motion for a New Trial #1032 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Oslan, Reed)
May 9, 2016 Filing 1035 MEMORANDUM by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. in support of motion for directed verdict #1034 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(Oslan, Reed)
May 9, 2016 Filing 1034 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for directed verdict MILLER UK LTD. AND MILLER INTERNATIONAL LTD.S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW (Oslan, Reed)
May 6, 2016 Filing 1033 MEMORANDUM by Caterpillar, Inc. in support of motion for directed verdict #1032 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Baker, Gregory)
May 6, 2016 Filing 1032 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for directed verdict Caterpillar Inc.'s Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, in the Alternative, Motion for a New Trial (Baker, Gregory)
May 2, 2016 Filing 1031 AGREED ORDER REGARDING FEE PETITION DEADLINES signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 5/2/2016.Mailed notice(ef, )
May 2, 2016 Filing 1030 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiff's Motion for proposed agreed order #1028 is granted. Enter order. The motion presentment date of 5/5/2016 is stricken. Parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
April 29, 2016 Filing 1029 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1028 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 5/5/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
April 29, 2016 Filing 1028 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. FOR PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING FEE PETITION DEADLINES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Oslan, Reed)
April 25, 2016 Filing 1027 NOTICE by Gregory J. Commins, Jr of Change of Address (Commins, Gregory)
April 25, 2016 Filing 1025 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Joint Motion for stipulated order #1023 is granted. Enter order. The motion presentment date of 4/26/2016 is stricken. Parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
April 24, 2016 Filing 1026 STIPULATED ORDER Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 4/24/2016. Mailed notice(ef, )
April 20, 2016 Filing 1024 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #1023 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 4/26/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
April 20, 2016 Filing 1023 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc.JOINT MOTION FOR STIPULATED ORDER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baker, Gregory)
April 14, 2016 Filing 1022 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1015 sent to Gregory J. Commins returned as undeliverable, return to sender. Attorney contacted and directed to file a Notification of Change of Address with the Clerk's Office. Re-mailed to BakerHostetler LLP, 1050 Connecticut Ave., NW, Suite 1100, Washington, DC 20036. (ph, )
April 11, 2016 Filing 1018 JUDGMENT ORDER Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 4/11/2016. Mailed notice(ef, )
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1017 ORDER: Plaintiff Miller U.K., Ltd.'s motion for prejudgment and post-judgment interest #977 is denied as to prejudgment interest and granted as to post-judgment interest. For details, see the accompanying Statement. Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 4/8/2016. Mailed notice (ao,)
April 7, 2016 Filing 1016 MAIL RETURNED, for document #1012 sent to Gregory J. Commins returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (ph, )
March 31, 2016 Filing 1015 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing set for 4/1/2016 stricken. The Court's ruling on the matter of prejudgment interest and entry of final judgment to follow shortly. Mailed notice (ao,)
March 30, 2016 Filing 1014 NOTICE by Bridget S. McCabe of Change of Address (McCabe, Bridget)
March 18, 2016 Filing 1013 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: For docket management purposes, this order memorializes the Court's rulings during trial on certain motions. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a surreply and three expert affidavits #757 was granted. Defendant's motion for permission to perform a live portable coordinate measurement machine demonstration #932 was denied for reasons stated on the record. Defendant's motion for leave to file under seal its proffer regarding quality, delivery, and performance evidence #934 was granted. Plaintiff's motion for judgment as a matter of law #937 was granted in part and denied in part, as stated on the record. Defendant's motion to preclude examination regarding engineering ethics #948 was denied without prejudice for reasons stated on the record. Plaintiff's motion to limit the testimony of Alexander Glew #952 was granted in part and denied in part for reasons stated on the record. Plaintiff's motion for judgment as a matter of law #961 was denied for reasons stated on the record. Mailed notice (ef, )
March 15, 2016 Filing 1012 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing held. Pursuant to the discussion held in open court, the parties shall file any post-trial motions 28 days after final judgment is entered. Response briefs shall be filed within 28 days of post-trial motions. Reply briefs shall be filed within 21 days of responses. Defendant's oral motion for leave to file briefs in excess of 15 pages is granted. The parties are granted leave to file initial and response briefs up to 60 pages in length, while reply briefs shall be limited to 30 pages. Status hearing set for 4/1/2016 at 10:15 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
March 15, 2016 Filing 1011 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/18/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2016. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 15, 2016 Filing 1010 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/17/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2016. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 15, 2016 Filing 1009 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/16/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2016. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 15, 2016 Filing 1008 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/15/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2016. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 15, 2016 Filing 1007 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/14/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2016. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 15, 2016 Filing 1006 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/11/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2016. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 15, 2016 Filing 1005 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/09/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2016. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 15, 2016 Filing 1004 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/08/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2016. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 15, 2016 Filing 1003 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/07/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2016. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 15, 2016 Filing 1002 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/03/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2016. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 15, 2016 Filing 1001 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/02/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2016. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 15, 2016 Filing 1000 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/01/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2016. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 15, 2016 Filing 999 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/30/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2016. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 15, 2016 Filing 998 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/24/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2016. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 15, 2016 Filing 997 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/23/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2016. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 15, 2016 Filing 996 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/20/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2016. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 15, 2016 Filing 995 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/19/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2016. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 15, 2016 Filing 994 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/18/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2016. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 15, 2016 Filing 993 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/16/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2016. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 15, 2016 Filing 992 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/13/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2016. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 15, 2016 Filing 991 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/12/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2016. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 15, 2016 Filing 990 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/09/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2016. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 15, 2016 Filing 989 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/05/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2016. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 15, 2016 Filing 988 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/04/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2016. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 15, 2016 Filing 987 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/03/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2016. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 15, 2016 Filing 986 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/02/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2016. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 15, 2016 Filing 985 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 10/29/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2016. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 15, 2016 Filing 984 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 10/28/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2016. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 15, 2016 Filing 983 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 10/27/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2016. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 15, 2016 Filing 982 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 10/26/2015 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2016. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 14, 2016 Filing 981 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion by counsel to withdraw as attorney #979 is granted. Attorney Emerald P. Greywoode is withdrawn as counsel of record for Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Mailed notice (ef, )
February 11, 2016 Filing 980 REPLY by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to other #978 MILLER UK LTD. AND MILLER INTERNATIONAL LTD.S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT AND POST JUDGMENT INTEREST (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Oslan, Reed)
February 5, 2016 Filing 979 MOTION by Attorney Emerald P. Greywoode to withdraw as attorney for Caterpillar, Inc.. No party information provided (Baker, Gregory)
February 4, 2016 Filing 978 Opposition to Miller UK Ltd.'s Motion for Prejudgment and Post-Judgment Interest by Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Baker, Gregory)
January 21, 2016 Filing 977 MOTION by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd.(a United Kingdom private limited company ) For Prejudgment and Post-Judgment Interest (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Oslan, Reed)
January 21, 2016 Filing 976 ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Claimant Caterpillar, Inc., Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. by Paul E. Veith (Veith, Paul)
January 20, 2016 Filing 975 Letter to Judge Wood with Proposed Order by Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Gregory)
January 7, 2016 Filing 974 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing held. The Court sets the following schedule for post-trial briefs regarding the equitable remedies of prejudgment of interest and injunctive relief: opening briefs are due by 1/21/2016; response briefs shall be filed by 2/4/2016; and reply briefs shall be filed by 2/11/2016. Final judgment will be entered upon the Court's ruling on equitable remedies. Post-trial motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 50 and 59 will be due 28 days after the entry of final judgment. Status hearing set for 3/15/2016 at 2:00 p.m. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
December 30, 2015 Filing 973 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 08/22/12 before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Court Reporter Contact Information: Patrick Mullen, (312) 435-5565, patrick_mullen@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 1/20/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/1/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/29/2016. (Mullen, Patrick)
December 18, 2015 Filing 1021 JURY Notes (ks, )
December 18, 2015 Filing 1020 JURY Instructions (ks, )
December 18, 2015 Filing 1019 JURY Verdict entered (RESTRICTED) (ks, )
December 18, 2015 Filing 972 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Deliberations concluded. Jury trial ends. The jury returned a verdict in favor of Plaintiff Miller U.K. on Count One of its Second Amended Complaint for breach of contract, and Count Two of its Second Amended Complaint for trade secret misappropriation pursuant to the Illinois Trade Secrets Act. The jury awarded Miller UK $24.9 million in compensatory damages and $49.7 million in exemplary damages. The jury returned a verdict in favor of Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Caterpillar, Inc. on Counterclaim II under the Deceptive Trade Practice Act and Counterclaim IV for common law defamation. The jury awarded Caterpillar $1 million in compensatory damages. Judgment will be entered on the verdict. Status hearing set for 1/7/2016 at 10:30 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
December 17, 2015 Filing 971 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Jury trial held. Deliberation began. Jury trial continued to 12/18/2015 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
December 16, 2015 Filing 970 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: In court hearing held. Jury trial held and continued to 12/17/2015 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
December 16, 2015 Filing 969 RESPONSE by Caterpillar, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for directed verdict #961 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Baker, Gregory)
December 15, 2015 Filing 968 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Jury trial held and continued to 12/16/2015 at 09:15 AM. In Court hearing set for 12/16/2015 at 08:30 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
December 14, 2015 Filing 967 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: In court hearing held. Mailed notice (ef, )
December 14, 2015 Filing 966 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Jury trial held and continued to 12/15/2015 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
December 14, 2015 Filing 964 RESPONSE by Caterpillar, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for directed verdict #961 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Baker, Gregory)
December 11, 2015 Filing 965 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: In court hearing held and continued to 12/14/2015 at 4:30 PM. Jury Trial set for 12/14/2015 at 9:30 AM is stricken and reset for 12/14/2015 at 09:00 AM. TIME CHANGE ONLY. Mailed notice (ef, )
December 11, 2015 Filing 963 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to sealed document, #959 MILLER UK LTD. AND MILLER INTERNATIONAL LTD.S RESPONSE TO CATERPILLARS INC.S MOTION TO STRIKE ALL TESTIMONY REGARDING THE AUGUST 1998 ORAL AGREEMENT (Oslan, Reed)
December 11, 2015 Filing 962 MEMORANDUM by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. in support of motion for directed verdict #961 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25)(Oslan, Reed)
December 11, 2015 Filing 961 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for directed verdict (Oslan, Reed)
December 9, 2015 Filing 960 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Jury trial held and continued to 12/14/2015 at 09:30 AM. Plaintiff's unopposed motion for leave to file under seal #950 is granted. The motion presentment date of 12/10/2015 is stricken. Parties need not appear. In Court hearing set for 12/11/2015 at 01:00 PM. Mailed notice (ef, )
December 8, 2015 Filing 959 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Motion of Caterpillar Inc. to Strike All Testimony Regarding The Alleged "Gentlemen's Agreement" (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Baker, Gregory)
December 8, 2015 Filing 958 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal The Motion of Caterpillar Inc. to Strike All Testimony Regarding The Alleged "Gentlemen's Agreement" by Caterpillar, Inc. (Baker, Gregory)
December 7, 2015 Filing 957 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Jury trial held and continued to 12/9/2015 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
December 7, 2015 Filing 956 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Jury trial held and continued to 12/8/2015 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
December 7, 2015 Filing 955 RESPONSE by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for directed verdict #937 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Errata 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)(Oslan, Reed)
December 7, 2015 Filing 954 SUPPLEMENT to proposed jury instructions #898 (Baker, Gregory)
December 6, 2015 Filing 953 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. regarding MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd.TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY OF ALEXANDER GLEW TO OPINIONS AND BASES DISCLOSED IN GLEWS EXPERT REPORT #952 (Oslan, Reed)
December 6, 2015 Filing 952 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd.TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY OF ALEXANDER GLEW TO OPINIONS AND BASES DISCLOSED IN GLEWS EXPERT REPORT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Oslan, Reed)
December 6, 2015 Filing 951 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion to seal #950 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 12/10/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
December 6, 2015 Filing 950 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to seal UNOPPOSED MOTION OF MILLER FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL (Oslan, Reed)
December 3, 2015 Filing 949 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Jury trial held and continued to 12/7/2015 at 09:15 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
December 2, 2015 Filing 948 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc.Motion of Caterpillar Inc. to Preclude Examination Regarding Engineering Ethics (Baker, Gregory)
December 2, 2015 Filing 947 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Jury trial held and continued to 12/3/2015 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
December 2, 2015 Filing 946 ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Claimants Caterpillar, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc., Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. by David Michael Friebus (Friebus, David)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 945 ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS FOR WILLIAM RAINE Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 12/2/2015. Mailed notice(aw,)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 944 ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS FOR HOWARD REAY Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 12/2/2015. Mailed notice(aw,)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 943 ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS FOR PAOLO FELLIN Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 12/1/2015. Mailed notice(aw,)
December 1, 2015 Filing 942 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Jury Trial set for 12/2/2015 at 9:30 AM is stricken and reset for 12/2/2015 at 9:15 AM. TIME CHANGE ONLY. Mailed notice (ef, )
December 1, 2015 Filing 941 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Jury trial held and continued to 12/2/2015 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 940 ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS FOR MICHAEL FLANNERY AND BRIAN SWEENEY Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 12/1/2015. Mailed notice(aw,)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 939 ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS FOR RANDY JONES AND JEFF LARSON Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 12/1/2015. Mailed notice (aw,)
November 30, 2015 Filing 938 MEMORANDUM by Caterpillar, Inc. in support of motion for directed verdict #937 (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 1, #3 2, #4 3, #5 4, #6 5, #7 6, #8 7, #9 8, #10 9, #11 10, #12 11, #13 12, #14 13, #15 14, #16 15, #17 16, #18 17, #19 18, #20 19, #21 20, #22 21, #23 22, #24 23, #25 24, #26 25, #27 26, #28 27, #29 28, #30 29, #31 30, #32 31, #33 32, #34 33, #35 34, #36 35, #37 36, #38 37, #39 38, #40 39, #41 40)(Baker, Gregory)
November 30, 2015 Filing 937 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for directed verdict (Baker, Gregory)
November 30, 2015 Filing 936 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Jury trial held and continued to 12/01/2015 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (lcw, )
November 29, 2015 Filing 935 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Proffer of Caterpillar Inc. Regarding Quality, Delivery and Performance Evidence Relevant to Millers Breach of Contract Claim, Millers Demand for Exemplary Damages, and Caterpillars Counterclaims (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Baker, Gregory)
November 29, 2015 Filing 934 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to seal Proffer of Caterpillar Inc. Regarding Quality, Delivery and Performance Evidence Relevant to Millers Breach of Contract Claim, Millers Demand for Exemplary Damages, and Caterpillars Counterclaims (Baker, Gregory)
November 29, 2015 Filing 933 RESPONSE by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc.Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Permission to Perform a Live Portable Coordinate Measurement Machine Demonstration #932 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Oslan, Reed)
November 27, 2015 Filing 932 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc.Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Permission to Perform a Live Portable Coordinate Measurement Machine Demonstration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Baker, Gregory)
November 24, 2015 Filing 931 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Jury trial held and continued to 11/30/2015 at 09:15 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 930 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 11/23/2015. Mailed notice (Wood, Andrea)
November 23, 2015 Filing 929 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Jury trial held and continued to 11/24/2015 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
November 20, 2015 Filing 928 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Jury trial held and continued to 11/23/2015 at 09:15 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
November 20, 2015 Filing 927 MEMORANDUM Opinion signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 11/20/2015. Mailed notice(ef, ) (Docket Text Modified by Judicial Staff) (ef, ).
November 19, 2015 Filing 926 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Jury trial held and continued to 11/20/2015 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
November 18, 2015 Filing 925 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Jury trial held and continued to 11/19/2015 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
November 16, 2015 Filing 924 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Jury trial held and continued to 11/18/2015 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
November 13, 2015 Filing 923 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Jury trial held and continued to 11/16/2015 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (lcw, )
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 922 ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 11/13/2015.(lcw, )
November 12, 2015 Filing 921 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Jury trial held and continued to 11/13/2015 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
November 10, 2015 Filing 920 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Jury trial held and continued to 11/12/2015 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
November 10, 2015 Filing 919 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiffs' Motion to seal #910 and #914 are granted. Plaintiffs' Motion for leave to file excess pages #912 and #916 are granted. The motion presentment date of 11/12/2015 is stricken. Mailed notice (ef, )
November 9, 2015 Filing 918 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Jury trial held and continued to 11/10/2015 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
November 8, 2015 Filing 917 SEALED RESPONSE by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to other #906 MILLER UK LTD. AND MILLER INTERNATIONAL LTD.S RESPONSE TO CATERPILLAR INC.S SUBMISSION REGARDING QUALITY AND PERFORMANCE ISSUES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Oslan, Reed)
November 8, 2015 Filing 916 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for leave to file excess pages (Oslan, Reed)
November 8, 2015 Filing 915 NOTICE by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. re MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to seal UNOPPOSED MOTION OF MILLER FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL #914 (Oslan, Reed)
November 8, 2015 Filing 914 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to seal UNOPPOSED MOTION OF MILLER FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL (Oslan, Reed)
November 8, 2015 Filing 913 SEALED RESPONSE by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to sealed document, #909 MILLER UK LTD. AND MILLER INTERNATIONAL LTD.S RESPONSE TO MOTION OF CATERPILLAR INC. TO PRECLUDE USE OF THE SUPERSEDED APRIL 4, 2013 RULE 30(B)(6) DEPOSITION OF CATERPILLAR INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Oslan, Reed)
November 8, 2015 Filing 912 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for leave to file excess pages (Oslan, Reed)
November 8, 2015 Filing 911 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion to seal #910 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 11/12/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
November 8, 2015 Filing 910 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to seal UNOPPOSED MOTION OF MILLER FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL (Oslan, Reed)
November 7, 2015 Filing 909 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Motion of Caterpillar Inc. to Preclude Use of the Superseded April 4, 2013 Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition of Caterpillar Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Baker, Gregory)
November 6, 2015 Filing 908 Response of Caterpillar Inc. to Plaintiffs' Proposed Instruction [Dkt. 903 and Dkt. 905] by Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Baker, Gregory)
November 5, 2015 Filing 907 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Jury trial held and continued to 11/9/2015 at 09:15 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
November 5, 2015 Filing 906 Submission of Caterpillar Inc. Regarding Plaintiffs' Statements Opening the Door to Quality and Performance Issues by Caterpillar, Inc. (Baker, Gregory)
November 5, 2015 Filing 905 Supplement to Proposed Curative Instruction by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Oslan, Reed)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 904 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 11/5/2015. Mailed notice(ef, )
November 4, 2015 Filing 903 Proposed Curative Instruction by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. (Oslan, Reed)
November 4, 2015 Filing 902 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Jury trial held and continued to 11/5/2015 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 901 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 11/4/2015. Mailed notice(ef, )
November 3, 2015 Filing 900 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Jury trial held on 11/3/2015. Jury Trial set for 11/4/2015 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (rth, )
November 2, 2015 Filing 899 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Jury trial held and continued to 11/3/2015 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
November 2, 2015 Filing 898 PROPOSED Jury Instructions by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. (Oslan, Reed)
November 1, 2015 Filing 897 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 11/1/2015. Mailed notice(ef, )
November 1, 2015 Filing 896 Letter by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. (Oslan, Reed)
October 30, 2015 Filing 895 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. by Casey James Mcgushin (Mcgushin, Casey)
October 29, 2015 Filing 894 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Jury trial held and continued to 11/2/2015 at 09:15 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
October 29, 2015 Filing 893 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Attorney Evan Mannering's application to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant Caterpillar Inc. #861 is granted. Mailed notice (ef, )
October 28, 2015 Filing 892 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: For the reasons stated in open court, Defendant's motions to preclude testimony regarding Plaintffs' agreements with JB Sales #881 and RCID #883 are denied. Specifically, under Rule 1004(a) of the Federal Rules of Evidence, an original is not required and other evidence of the content of a writing is admissible if all of the originals of the document are lost or destroyed as the result of causes other than the bad faith of the proponent. Evidence that a document was searched for diligently and not located is an accepted means of establishing that a document is lost. Urban v. United States, No. 03 C 6630, 2005 WL 1819954, at *2-3 (N.D. Ill. June 9, 2005). Plaintiffs have provided evidence of their unsuccessful searches for each of the agreements at issue, and the record is devoid of any indication that the absence of the documents was the result of bad faith. The Court therefore finds that Plaintiffs' other evidence of the existence and content of the contracts is admissible. Under Rule 1008 of the Federal Rules of Evidence, it is the province of the jury to determine whether Plainitffs' evidence establishes that the agreements did in fact exist and that their terms were as Plaintiffs claim. Mailed notice (ef, )
October 28, 2015 Filing 891 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Jury trial held. Voir Dire concluded. Jury Trial continued to 10/29/2015 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
October 28, 2015 Filing 888 Submission of Caterpillar Inc. Regarding Proposal to Add Jurors by Caterpillar, Inc. (Baker, Gregory)
October 28, 2015 Filing 887 MEMORANDUM by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. Regarding the Size of the Jury (Oslan, Reed)
October 27, 2015 Filing 890 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Jury trial held. Voir Dire held and continued. Jury Trial continued to 10/28/2015 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
October 27, 2015 Filing 886 SEALED RESPONSE by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to sealed document, #881 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Oslan, Reed)
October 27, 2015 Filing 885 SEALED RESPONSE by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to sealed document, #882 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Oslan, Reed)
October 27, 2015 Filing 884 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion to seal #883 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 11/4/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
October 27, 2015 Filing 883 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to seal (Oslan, Reed)
October 26, 2015 Filing 889 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Jury trial begins. Voir Dire began and continued. Jury trial continued to 10/27/2015 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
October 25, 2015 Filing 882 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Submission to Preclude Testimony and Documents Regarding a Purported "Confidentiality" or "Intellectual Property" Agreement With RCID (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Baker, Gregory)
October 25, 2015 Filing 881 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Submission of Caterpillar Inc. to Preclude Unsupported Testimony and Documents Regarding a Purported "Settlement" With JB Sales International (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Baker, Gregory)
October 25, 2015 Filing 880 Reply in Support of Motion for a Short Continuance of Opening Statements by Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Baker, Gregory)
October 25, 2015 Filing 879 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to other #878 MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE TO CATERPILLAR INC.s MOTION MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE TO CATERPILLAR INC.s MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE (Oslan, Reed)
October 24, 2015 Filing 878 Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for a Short Continuance of Opening Statements by Caterpillar, Inc. (Baker, Gregory)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 877 ORDER REGARDING NON-EXPERT MOTIONS IN LIMINE Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 10/23/2015. Mailed notice(ef, )
October 23, 2015 Filing 876 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to other, #875 SUBMISSION OF CATERPILLAR INC. REGARDING LIVE TESTIMONY OF CERTAIN CATERPILLAR WILL CALL WITNESSES IN PLAINTIFFS CASE (Oslan, Reed)
October 22, 2015 Filing 875 Submission of Caterpillar Inc. Regarding Live Testimony of Certain Caterpillar "Will Call" Witnesses in Plaintiffs' Case by Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Baker, Gregory)
October 22, 2015 Filing 874 Submission of Caterpillar Inc. To Admit Video Exhibits That Depict Use of a "Romer" Digital Mapping Tool by Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Baker, Gregory)
October 21, 2015 Filing 873 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood:Final pretrial conference held on 10/21/2015. The parties shall submit three copies of their final witness lists to chambers or by e-mail to the Court's proposed order mailbox by 12:00 noon on 10/23/2015. By the same time and means, the parties may submit lists of technical terms they anticipate using during the first week of trial. The lists will be provided to the court reporter to assist with transcript preparation. By 5:00 p.m. on 10/23/2015, the parties shall deliver to chambers one set of binders - tabbed and numbered to correspond to the parties' exhibit lists - containing hard copies of all trial exhibits. This requirement differs from the direction in court that the parties deliver two sets. The second set of trial exhibits, which will be used with witnesses, shall be brought to the courtroom on the morning of 10/26/2015. In addition, the parties also shall deliver a thumb drive containing electronic images of all exhibits and electronic versions of all depositions transcripts that may be used for impeachment purposes. With respect to the latter, the Court requires copies of the entire transcripts (either minuscripts or full size are acceptable), not just the pages containing passages that the parties intend to use. The Defendant may submit by 5:00 p.m. on 10/23/2015 a brief of no more than 5 pages in support of its position that it should be the first to examine witnesses under its control who are called as part of Plaintiffs' case. The date for the parties to submit their proposed jury instructions, special interrogatories, and verdict forms to the Court is extended until 11/02/2015. Other rulings on trial procedures shall stand as stated in open court. Jury trial remains set for 10/26/2015 at 9:00 am. Mailed notice (wp, )
October 21, 2015 Filing 872 Caterpillar's Objection to Plaintiffs' October 19 Trial Exhibit List by Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Baker, Gregory)
October 21, 2015 Filing 871 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 10/21/2015. Mailed notice(ef, )
October 21, 2015 Filing 870 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: For the reasons set forth in the separate Memorandum Opinion and Order to follow, Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment #666 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED as to Count I of Defendant's Counterclaim and Counts V and VII of Defendants Supplemental Counterclaim. Plaintiffs' motion is DENIED as to the remaining counts of Defendant's Supplemental Counterclaim and as to Count I of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. Defendant's motion for summary judgment #688 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants' motion is GRANTED as to certain of Plaintiffs' claims in Counts I and II of the Second Amended Complaint, GRANTED as to Count III and Count IV of the Second Amended Complaint, and otherwise DENIED. Mailed notice (ef, )
October 21, 2015 Filing 869 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: For the reasons set forth in the separate Memorandum Opinion and Order to follow, the Court rules on the parties' various motions to exclude expert testimony as follows. The motion by Defendant Caterpillar Inc. to exclude certain opinions of Nicholas Patrikalakis #783 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Court GRANTS the motion to exclude Patrikalakis's opinions regarding whether or not Caterpillar followed "clean room" procedures and DENIES the remainder of the motion. The motion by Caterpillar Inc. to preclude Plaintiffs from offering expert testimony from Keith Moody #785 is DENIED. The motions by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd. and Miller UK Ltd. to exclude the expert opinions of Edward Smith #788 , Daniel M. McGavock #793 , and Alexander Glew #797 are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Court GRANTS the motions to exclude Glew's opinions regarding whether Caterpillar was justified in terminating Miller and Miller's disclosure of its trade secrets to third parties, McGavock's opinions on the legitimacy of Caterpillar's decision to terminate the supply contract, and Smith's opinion that "[u]p to ten percent of Caterpillar sales can be attributed to its brand reputation," and DENIES the remainder of the motions. The motion by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd. and Miller UK Ltd. to exclude the expert opinions of Frank Fronczak #801 is DENIED. Mailed notice (ef, )
October 15, 2015 Filing 867 Letter to Court by Caterpillar, Inc. (Baker, Gregory)
October 14, 2015 Filing 866 Letter by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. (Oslan, Reed)
October 13, 2015 Filing 868 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Pretrial Conference proceedings held. By 12 noon on 10/19/2015, the parties shall revise and resubmit to the Court their respective "Top 200" lists so that the lists clearly indicate for which exhibits the opposing party has raised on objection based on foundation or authentication. The revised lists shall be e-mailed to the Court's proposed order e-mailbox in a searchable native format, preferably Word or Excel. Also by 12 noon on 10/19/2015, to the extent not already provided, the parties shall also deliver to chambers a thumb drive containing copies of the "Top 200" exhibits. Final pretrial conference set for 10/21/2015 at 1:30 PM stricken and reset for 1:00 PM. TIME CHANGE ONLY. Mailed notice (ef, )
October 9, 2015 Filing 865 Joint Submission Regarding Objected-To Trial Exhibits by Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1, #2 Exhibit A2, #3 Exhibit A3)(Baker, Gregory)
October 6, 2015 Filing 864 LETTER by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Voir Dire, #2 Witness Time Estimates for Miller Direct Examinations)(Oslan, Reed)
October 6, 2015 Filing 863 PROPOSED Time Limit for Opening Statements, Time Estimates for Direct Examination of Trial Witnesses, and Proposed Voir Dire by Caterpillar, Inc. (Baker, Gregory) (Docket Text modified by Clerks Office) (sr, ).
October 6, 2015 Filing 862 AGREED Juror Questionnaire by Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baker, Gregory) (Docket Text modified by Clerks Office) (sr, ).
October 6, 2015 Filing 861 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-11158171. (Mannering, Evan)
October 5, 2015 Filing 860 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. by Carey S Busen (Busen, Carey)
September 30, 2015 Filing 859 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. by Gregory J. Commins, Jr (Commins, Gregory)
September 30, 2015 Filing 858 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. by Terry L Sullivan (Sullivan, Terry)
September 30, 2015 Filing 857 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. by Emerald P. Greywoode (Greywoode, Emerald)
September 29, 2015 Filing 856 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. by Katherine Wheaton Warner (Warner, Katherine)
September 25, 2015 Filing 855 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Pretrial Conference proceedings held. By 10/06/2015, each party shall submit to the Court an updated list of the witnesses it anticipates calling (live or via deposition) with an estimate of the number of hours (in half hour increments) that the party will require to complete its direct examination. For any witness expected to be called by both parties, each party shall estimate the duration of its own direct examination. The parties shall also submit a proposed time limit for opening arguments. Also by 10/06/2015, the parties shall submit their proposed voir dire questions and juror questionnaire. By the close of business on 10/09/2015, the parties shall submit to the Court a joint list of exhibits whose admissibility is disputed. For each such exhibit, its proponent shall identify the asserted basis for its admission and the opposing party shall specify the nature of its objection. The parties shall also deliver to chambers copies of any proposed exhibits to which a party has raised an objection. Given the volume of exhibits, the parties may submit the contested exhibits on a flash drive rather than paper copies. By 10/21/2015, the parties shall submit to the Court their proposed jury instructions, special interrogatories, and verdict forms. Pretrial conference set for 10/13/2015 at 1:00 PM #748 remains firm. Final pretrial conference set for 10/21/2015 at 1:30 PM. Mailed notice (ef, )
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 854 ORDER: Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. appeals a Magistrate Judge order #610 overruling its privilege-based objections to the production of four documents sought in discovery by Plaintiffs Miller UK Ltd. and Miller International Ltd. #611 For the reasons detailed in the accompanying Statement, Caterpillar's objections to the order are sustained and it will not be required to produce the documents identified as Log Nos. 544, 630, 642, and 717. Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/24/2015. (For further details see order.) Mailed notice(ef, )
September 24, 2015 Filing 853 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for leave to file under seal #834 and #850 are granted. Defendant Caterpillar, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for leave to file under seal #837 is granted. The motion presentment dates of 9/25/2015, 9/29/2015, and 9/30/2015 are stricken. Parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
September 23, 2015 Filing 852 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. MILLER UK LTD. AND MILLER INTERNATIONAL LTD.s REPLIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Oslan, Reed)
September 23, 2015 Filing 851 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion to seal #850 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/30/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
September 23, 2015 Filing 850 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to seal UNOPPOSED MOTION OF MILLER FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL (Oslan, Reed)
September 22, 2015 Filing 849 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Caterpillar Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion In Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument regarding Aspirational Values (Baker, Gregory)
September 22, 2015 Filing 848 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Reply in Support of Motion In Limine of Caterpillar Inc. to Preclude Plaintiffs from Calling Caterpillar In-House Counsel Keith Roberson as a Witness at Trial (Baker, Gregory)
September 22, 2015 Filing 847 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Reply Memorandum in Support of Caterpillar's Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Nicholas Patrikalakis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14, #2 Exhibit 15, #3 Exhibit 16)(Baker, Gregory)
September 22, 2015 Filing 846 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Reply in Support of Motion In Limine and Memorandum of Law of Caterpillar Inc. to Preclude Plaintiffs from Offering Expert Testimony from Keith Moody (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5)(Baker, Gregory)
September 22, 2015 Filing 845 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Reply in Support of Motion In Limine of Caterpillar Inc. to Exclude Evidence regarding Caterpillar's Supposed Failure to Tell Plaintiffs about the Center-Lock Coupler Prior to June 2008 (Baker, Gregory)
September 22, 2015 Filing 844 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Reply in Support of Motion In Limine of Caterpillar Inc. to Preclude Plaintiffs from Introducing at Trial Extrinsic Evidence to Modify or Amend the Supply Agreement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7)(Baker, Gregory)
September 22, 2015 Filing 843 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Reply in Support of Motion In Limine of Caterpillar Inc. to Preclude Evidence or Argument regarding Plaintiffs' Now Abandoned Recessed-Pin Bucket Claims (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Baker, Gregory)
September 22, 2015 Filing 842 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Reply is Support of Rule 16(C) Motion of Caterpillar Inc. to Preclude Plaintiffs From Raising Certain Defenses and Arguments Related to Defamation Counterclaims (Baker, Gregory)
September 22, 2015 Filing 841 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MILLER UK LTD. AND MILLER INTERNATIONAL LTD.S MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT OPINIONS OF MR. DANIEL M. MCGAVOCK (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Oslan, Reed)
September 22, 2015 Filing 840 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MILLER UK LTD. AND MILLER INTERNATIONAL LTD.S MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT OPINIONS OF MR. EDWARD SMITH (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Oslan, Reed)
September 22, 2015 Filing 839 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion to seal #837 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/25/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
September 22, 2015 Filing 838 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. REPLY BY MILLER UK LTD. AND MILLER INTERNATIONAL LTD. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT OPINIONS OF DR. FRANK FRONCZAK (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Oslan, Reed)
September 22, 2015 Filing 837 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to seal Unopposed Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Leave to File Under Seal Replies in Support of Motions In Limine (Baker, Gregory)
September 22, 2015 Filing 836 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. REPLY OF MILLER UK LTD. AND MILLER INTERNATIONAL, LTD. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT OPINIONS OF DR. ALEXANDER GLEW (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Oslan, Reed)
September 22, 2015 Filing 835 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion to seal #834 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/29/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
September 22, 2015 Filing 834 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to seal UNOPPOSED MOTION OF MILLER FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL (Oslan, Reed)
September 17, 2015 Filing 833 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Unopposed Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition Motion to Plaintiffs' "Omnibus" Motion In Limine #830 is granted. The motion presentment date of 9/25/2015 is stricken. Parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
September 16, 2015 Filing 832 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion to seal #830 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/25/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
September 16, 2015 Filing 831 SEALED RESPONSE by Caterpillar, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. Miller UK Ltd. and Miller International Ltd.'s Motions in Limine #807 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53)(Baker, Gregory)
September 16, 2015 Filing 830 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to seal Unopposed Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition Motion to Plaintiffs' "Omnibus" Motion In Limine (Baker, Gregory)
September 16, 2015 Filing 829 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiffs' Miller International Ltd.and Miller UK Ltd. Unopposed Motion of Miller for Leave to File Under Seal #813 is granted. Defendant Caterpillar, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition Motions to Plaintiffs' Motions to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Alexander Glew, Frank Fronczak, Daniel McGavock, and Edward Smith #823 is granted. The motion presentment dates of 9/22/2015 and 9/25/2015 are stricken. Parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
September 15, 2015 Filing 828 SEALED RESPONSE by Caterpillar, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd.to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Mr. Edward Smith #788 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Baker, Gregory)
September 15, 2015 Filing 827 SEALED RESPONSE by Caterpillar, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd.Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Mr. Daniel M. McGavock #793 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Baker, Gregory)
September 15, 2015 Filing 826 SEALED RESPONSE by Caterpillar, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd.To Exclude the Expert Opinions of Dr. Alexander Glew #797 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Baker, Gregory)
September 15, 2015 Filing 825 SEALED RESPONSE by Caterpillar, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd.Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Dr. Frank Fronczak #801 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Baker, Gregory)
September 15, 2015 Filing 824 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion to seal, #823 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/25/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
September 15, 2015 Filing 823 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to seal Unoppsed Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Leave to File Under Seal Opposition Motions to Plaintiffs' Motions to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Alexander Glew, Frank Fronczak, Daniel McGavock, and Edward Smith (Baker, Gregory)
September 15, 2015 Filing 822 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. MILLER UK LTD. AND MILLER INTERNATIONAL, LTD.S RESPONSE TO MOTION IN LIMINE OF CATERPILLAR INC. TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN OPINIONS OF NICHOLAS PATRIKALAKIS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Oslan, Reed)
September 15, 2015 Filing 821 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. MILLER UK LTD. AND MILLER INTERNATIONAL, LTD.S RESPONSE TO MOTION IN LIMINE OF CATERPILLAR INC. TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS FROM CALLING CATERPILLAR IN-HOUSE COUNSEL KEITH ROBERSON AS A WITNESS AT TRIAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Oslan, Reed)
September 15, 2015 Filing 820 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. OPPOSITION OF MILLER UK LTD. AND MILLER INTERNATIONAL LTD. TO MOTION IN LIMINE OF CATERPILLAR INC. TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING CATERPILLARS SUPPOSED FAILURE TO TELL PLAINTIFFS ABOUT THE CENTER-LOCK COUPLER PRIOR TO JUNE 2008 (Oslan, Reed)
September 15, 2015 Filing 819 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. OPPOSITION OF MILLER UK LTD. AND MILLER INTERNATIONAL LTD. TO RULE 16(C) MOTION OF CATERPILLAR INC. TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS FROM RAISING CERTAIN DEFENSES AND ARGUMENTS RELATED TO DEFAMATION COUNTERCLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Oslan, Reed)
September 15, 2015 Filing 818 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. MILLER UK LTD. AND MILLER INTERNATIONAL LTD.S OPPOSITION TO CATERPILLAR INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS FROM OFFERING EXPERT TESTIMONY FROM KEITH MOODY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Oslan, Reed)
September 15, 2015 Filing 817 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. MILLER UK LTD. AND MILLER INTERNATIONAL LTD.S OPPOSITION TO CATERPILLAR INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING PLAINTIFFS RECESSED PIN BUCKET CLAIMS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Oslan, Reed)
September 15, 2015 Filing 816 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. OPPOSITION OF MILLER UK LTD. AND MILLER INTERNATIONAL LTD. TO MOTION IN LIMINE OF CATERPILLAR INC. TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING ASPIRATIONAL VALUES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Oslan, Reed)
September 15, 2015 Filing 815 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to sealed document, #786 OPPOSITION OF MILLER UK LTD. AND MILLER INTERNATIONAL LTD. TO MOTION IN LIMINE OF CATERPILLAR INC. TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS FROM INTRODUCING AT TRIAL EXTRINSIC EVIDENCE TO MODIFY OR AMEND THE SUPPLY AGREEMENT (Oslan, Reed)
September 15, 2015 Filing 814 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion to seal #813 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/22/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
September 15, 2015 Filing 813 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to seal Unopposed Motion of Miller for Leave to File Under Seal (Oslan, Reed)
September 14, 2015 Filing 812 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: The unopposed motions by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. #778 and Plaintiffs Miller UK Ltd. and Miller International Ltd. #787 , #792 , #796 , #800 , #805 for leave to file their motions in limine under seal are granted. Plaintiffs' motion #808 for leave to file their motions in limine in a single oversized pleading is granted. Defendant shall file a response of no more than 40 pages, exclusive of tables and exhibits, by 9/16/2015. Plaintiffs shall file a reply of no more than 20 pages, exclusive of tables and exhibits, by 9/23/2015. The 9/15/2015 presentment date for the aforementioned motions is stricken. Parties need not appear. (ef, )
September 10, 2015 Filing 811 REPLY by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to response in opposition to motion, #810 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Oslan, Reed)
September 10, 2015 Filing 810 RESPONSE by Caterpillar, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for leave to file Motion for Permission to File Motions in Limine in a Single Document in Excess of 15 Pages #808 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Baker, Gregory)
September 9, 2015 Filing 809 Notice of Presentment of Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Miller UK Ltd. and Miller International Ltd.'s Motions in Limine NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion for leave to file #805 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/15/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
September 9, 2015 Filing 808 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for leave to file Motion for Permission to File Motions in Limine in a Single Document in Excess of 15 Pages (Oslan, Reed)
September 9, 2015 Filing 807 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. Miller UK Ltd. and Miller International Ltd.'s Motions in Limine (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47)(Oslan, Reed)
September 9, 2015 Filing 806 Notice of Presentment of Miller UK Ltd. and Miller International Ltd.'s Motion for Permission to File Motions in Limine in a Single Document in Excess of 15 Pages NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion for leave to file #805 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/15/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
September 9, 2015 Filing 805 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for leave to file Unopposed Motion of Miller for Leave to File Under Seal Miller UK Ltd. and Miller International Ltd.'s Motions in Limine (Oslan, Reed)
September 9, 2015 Filing 804 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. Memorandum of Law in Support of Miller UK Ltd. and Miller International Ltd.'s Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Dr. Frank Fronczak (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Oslan, Reed) Modified on 10/21/2015 (ks, ).
September 9, 2015 Filing 803 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion to seal #778 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/15/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
September 9, 2015 Filing 802 Notice of Presentment of Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Miller UK Ltd. and Miller International Ltd.'s Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Dr. Frank Fronczak NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion for leave to file, #800 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/15/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
September 9, 2015 Filing 801 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd.Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Dr. Frank Fronczak (Oslan, Reed)
September 9, 2015 Filing 800 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for leave to file Unopposed Motion of Miller for Leave to File Under Seal Miller UK Ltd. and Miller International Ltd.'s Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Dr. Frank Fronczak (Oslan, Reed)
September 8, 2015 Filing 799 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. Memorandum of Law in Support of Miller UK Ltd. and Miller International Ltd.'s Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Dr. Alexander Glew (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Oslan, Reed) Modified on 10/21/2015 (ks, ).
September 8, 2015 Filing 798 Notice of Presentment of Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Miller UK Ltd. and Miller International Ltd.'s Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Dr. Alexander Glew NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion for leave to file, #796 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/15/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
September 8, 2015 Filing 797 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd.To Exclude the Expert Opinions of Dr. Alexander Glew (Oslan, Reed)
September 8, 2015 Filing 796 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for leave to file Unopposed Motion of Miller for Leave to File Under Seal Miller UK Ltd. and Miller International Ltd's Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Dr. Alexander Glew (Oslan, Reed)
September 8, 2015 Filing 795 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. Memorandum of Law in Support of Miller UK Ltd. and Miller International Ltd.'s Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Mr. Daniel McGavock (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Oslan, Reed) Modified on 10/21/2015 (ks, ).
September 8, 2015 Filing 794 Notice of Presentment of Unopposed Motion of Miller UK Ltd. and Miller International Ltd. for Leave to File Under Seal Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Mr. Daniel McGavock NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion for leave to file, #792 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/15/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
September 8, 2015 Filing 793 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd.Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Mr. Daniel M. McGavock (Oslan, Reed)
September 8, 2015 Filing 792 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for leave to file Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Miller UK Ltd. and Miller International Ltd.'s Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Mr. Daniel McGavock (Oslan, Reed)
September 8, 2015 Filing 791 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. Memorandum of Law in Support of Miller UK Ltd. and Miller International Ltd.'s Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Mr. Edward Smith (Oslan, Reed) Modified on 10/21/2015 (ks, ).
September 8, 2015 Filing 790 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to seal document Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Mr. Edward Smith (Oslan, Reed) Docket modified by the clerks' office; sealed motion. Corrected motion sealed on #791 (jl) Modified on 9/9/2015 (jl, ).
September 8, 2015 Filing 789 Notice of Presentment of Unopposed Motion of Miller for Leave to File Under Seal Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Mr. Edward Smith NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion for leave to file, #787 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/15/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
September 8, 2015 Filing 788 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd.to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Mr. Edward Smith (Oslan, Reed)
September 8, 2015 Filing 787 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd., Counter Defendants Miller International Ltd., Miller International Ltd., Miller International Ltd., Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd., Miller UK Ltd., Miller UK Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for leave to file Unopposed Motion of Miller for Leave to File Under Seal Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Mr. Edward Smith (Oslan, Reed)
September 8, 2015 Filing 786 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Motion In Limine of Caterpillar Inc. to Preclude Plaintiffs From Introducing at Trial Extrinsic Evidence to Modify or Amend the Supply Agreement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Baker, Gregory )
September 8, 2015 Filing 785 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Motion In Limine and Memorandum of Law of Caterpillar Inc. to Preclude Plaintiffs From Offering Expert Testimony from Keith Moody (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Baker, Gregory)
September 8, 2015 Filing 784 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Motion In Limine of Caterpillar Inc. to Preclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Plaintiffs' Now Abandoned Recessed-Pin Bucket Claims (Baker, Gregory)
September 8, 2015 Filing 783 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Motion In Limine of Caterpillar Inc. to Exclude Certain Opinions of Nicholas Patrikalakis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Baker, Gregory)
September 8, 2015 Filing 782 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Motion In Limine of Caterpillar Inc. to Exclude Evidence Regarding Caterpillar's Supposed Failure to Tell Plaintiffs About the Center-Lock Coupler Prior to June 2008 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Baker, Gregory)
September 8, 2015 Filing 781 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Motion In Limine of Caterpillar Inc. to Preclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Aspirational Values (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Baker, Gregory)
September 8, 2015 Filing 780 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Rule 16(C) Motion of Caterpillar Inc. to Preclude Plaintiffs From Raising Certain Defenses and Arguments Related to Defamation Counterclaim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21)(Baker, Gregory)
September 8, 2015 Filing 779 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc.in limine Motion In Limine of Caterpillar Inc. to Preclude Plaintiffs From Calling Caterpillar In-House Counsel Keith Roberson as a Witness at Trial (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit B-2)(Baker, Gregory)
September 8, 2015 Filing 778 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to seal Unopposed Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Leave to File Under Seal Motions In Limine (Baker, Gregory)
September 8, 2015 Filing 777 PROPOSED Pretrial Order (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2A, #4 Exhibit 2B, #5 Exhibit 3A, #6 Exhibit 3B, #7 Exhibit 4A, #8 Exhibit 4B, #9 Exhibit 5A, #10 Exhibit 5B)(Baker, Gregory)
September 4, 2015 Filing 776 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Attorney Emerald Greywoode's application to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant #772 is granted. Attorney Gregory Commins application to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant #773 is granted. Mailed notice (ef, )
September 2, 2015 Filing 773 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-11042941. (Commins, Gregory)
September 2, 2015 Filing 772 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-11042745. (Greywoode, Emerald)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 775 ORDER: ORDER DIRECTING THAT A SEPARATE JURY PANEL BE SUMMONED. Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 9/1/2015. Mailed notice(ks, )
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 774 ORDER: REQUEST FOR A SEPARATE JURY PANEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 47.1(b).Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/1/2015. Mailed notice(ks, )
August 27, 2015 Filing 771 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing held. The Court addressed trial procedures and scheduling with the parties. Status and Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2015 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
August 27, 2015 Filing 770 Response to Question Asked by Court Today by Caterpillar, Inc. (Baker, Gregory)
August 26, 2015 Filing 769 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: With respect to the scheduled status hearing on 8/27/2015, the parties are advised that in addition to other matters to be discussed they should be prepared to answer questions from the Court regarding Caterpillar's appeal of the magistrate judge's review of certain privilege log documents #611 . Note that the Court will not hold oral argument but rather may have a small number of specific questions for the parties. Mailed notice (ef, )
August 19, 2015 Filing 768 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: The Court's order of August 19, 2015 #767 is amended and corrected as follows: The parties shall submit their proposed voir dire to the Court by 10/6/2015. The parties shall submit their proposed jury instructions, special interrogatories, and verdict forms to the Court by 10/13/2015. Mailed notice (ef, )
August 19, 2015 Filing 767 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiff Miller International Ltd. and Miller UK Ltd.'s Unopposed Motion to move deadlines #765 is granted. The Parties shall submit their proposed juryinstructions, special interrogatories, and verdict forms to the Court by 10/6/2015. The motion presentment date of 8/20/2015 is stricken. Parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
August 17, 2015 Filing 766 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #765 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 8/20/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
August 17, 2015 Filing 765 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to Move the Deadlines to Submit Jury Instructions, Special Interrogatories, Verdict Forms, and Proposed Voir Dire (Oslan, Reed)
August 10, 2015 Filing 764 Notice of Withdrawal of Opposition by Caterpillar, Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Opposition of Caterpillar Inc. to Miller UK Ltd. and Miller International Ltd.'s Motion for Leave to File a Surreply and Three Expert Affidavits in Opposition to Caterpillar Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment (Baker, Gregory)
August 10, 2015 Filing 763 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendant Caterpillar's unopposed motion for leave to file under seal its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and supporting documents #749 and Plaintiff Miller's unopposed motion for leave to file under seal attachment A to Miller's motion for leave to file a surreply and three expert affidavits #755 are granted. Plaintiff Miller's motion for leave to file a surreply #757 is taken under advisement without further briefing. The Court will rule on the latter motion by separate order. The motion presentment dates of 8/11/2015 and 8/12/2015 are stricken. Parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
August 9, 2015 Filing 762 RESPONSE by Caterpillar, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for leave to file SURREPLY AND THREE EXPERT AFFIDAVITS IN OPPOSITION TO CATERPILLAR INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #757 (Baker, Gregory)
August 7, 2015 Filing 761 Redacted Version of Reply of Caterpillar Inc. in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment [Docket No. 751] by Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Response of Caterpillar Inc. to Statement of Additional Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Opposition of Miller UK Ltd. and Miller International Ltd. to Caterpillar Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit 224-243, #3 Exhibit 244, #4 Exhibit 245, #5 Exhibit 246-315)(Baker, Gregory)
August 6, 2015 Filing 760 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. by Michael P. Foradas (Foradas, Michael)
August 6, 2015 Filing 759 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion for leave to file, #757 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 8/11/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
August 6, 2015 Filing 758 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. regarding MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for leave to file SURREPLY AND THREE EXPERT AFFIDAVITS IN OPPOSITION TO CATERPILLAR INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #757 (Oslan, Reed)
August 6, 2015 Filing 757 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for leave to file SURREPLY AND THREE EXPERT AFFIDAVITS IN OPPOSITION TO CATERPILLAR INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Attachment C, #4 Attachment D)(Oslan, Reed)
August 6, 2015 Filing 756 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion to seal, #755 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 8/11/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
August 6, 2015 Filing 755 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to seal ATTACHMENT A TO MILLER UK LTD. AND MILLER INTERNATIONAL LTD.s MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SURREPLY AND THREE EXPERT AFFIDAVITS IN OPPOSITION TO CATERPILLAR INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Oslan, Reed)
July 31, 2015 Filing 754 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 261 (Attachments: #1 262, #2 263, #3 264, #4 265, #5 266, #6 267, #7 268, #8 269, #9 270, #10 271, #11 272, #12 273, #13 274, #14 275, #15 276, #16 277, #17 278, #18 279, #19 280, #20 281, #21 282, #22 283, #23 284, #24 285, #25 286, #26 287, #27 288, #28 289, #29 290, #30 291, #31 292, #32 293, #33 294, #34 295, #35 296, #36 297, #37 298, #38 299, #39 300, #40 301, #41 302, #42 303, #43 304, #44 305, #45 306, #46 307, #47 308, #48 309, #49 310, #50 311, #51 312, #52 313, #53 314, #54 315)(Baker, Gregory)
July 31, 2015 Filing 753 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 235 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 236, #2 Exhibit 237, #3 Exhibit 238, #4 Exhibit 239, #5 Exhibit 240, #6 Exhibit 241, #7 Exhibit 242, #8 Exhibit 243, #9 Exhibit 244, #10 Exhibit 245, #11 Exhibit 246, #12 Exhibit 247, #13 Exhibit 248, #14 Exhibit 249, #15 Exhibit 250, #16 Exhibit 251, #17 Exhibit 252, #18 Exhibit 253, #19 Exhibit 254, #20 Exhibit 255, #21 Exhibit 256, #22 Exhibit 257, #23 Exhibit 258, #24 Exhibit 259, #25 Exhibit 260)(Baker, Gregory)
July 31, 2015 Filing 752 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 224 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 225, #2 Exhibit 226, #3 Exhibit 227, #4 Exhibit 228, #5 Exhibit 229, #6 Exhibit 230, #7 Exhibit 231, #8 Exhibit 232, #9 Exhibit 233, #10 Exhibit 234)(Baker, Gregory)
July 31, 2015 Filing 751 SEALED REPLY by Caterpillar, Inc. to MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment #688 Reply of Caterpillar Inc. in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Response of Caterpillar Inc. to Statement of Additional Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Opposition of Miller UK Ltd. and Miller International Ltd. to Caterpillar Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration Declaration of Carey S. Busen in Support of the Reply of Caterpillar Inc. in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment)(Baker, Gregory)
July 31, 2015 Filing 750 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion to seal #749 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 8/12/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
July 31, 2015 Filing 749 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to seal Unopposed Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Leave to File Under Seal the Reply of Caterpillar Inc. in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Papers (Baker, Gregory)
July 15, 2015 Filing 748 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs' motion to seal #739 is granted. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file supplemental statements of undisputed material facts #741 is denied. The Clerk is direct to strike from the docket the Supplement Supplemental Statements of Undisputed Facts attached as Attachment 1 to Plaintiff's sealed reply #742 . No further filings in support or in opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment will be permitted at this time. Pursuant to the discussion held in open court, the proposed final pretrial order and motions in limine shall be filed by 9/8/2015. Responses to motions in limine shall be filed by 9/15/2015. Replies in support of motions in limine shall be filed by 9/22/2015. Final pretrial conference set for 10/13/2015 at 1:00 PM. Contemporaneously with the filing of the final pretrial order, the parties shall submit a Word version of their proposed jury instructions and verdict form to the Court's Proposed Order e-mailbox at Proposed_Order_Wood@ilnd.uscourts.gov. The parties should consult the Court's Standing Order Regarding Final Pretrial Orders on the Court's website for additional requirements. The status hearing set for 8/27/2015 at 9:00 a.m. remains firm. Mailed notice (ef, )
July 15, 2015 Filing 747 REPLY by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. in Support of Summary Judgment REDACTED (Oslan, Reed)
July 15, 2015 Filing 746 RESPONSE by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment #688 REDACTED (Oslan, Reed)
July 14, 2015 Filing 745 RESPONSE by Caterpillar, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for leave to file supplemental statements of undisputed material facts #741 (Baker, Gregory)
July 11, 2015 Filing 744 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. 's Response to Caterpillar Inc.'s Statement of Additional Facts (Oslan, Reed)
July 11, 2015 Filing 743 SEALED RESPONSE OPPOSITION OF MILLER UK AND MILLER INTERNATIONAL LTD. TO CATERPILLAR INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Response to Caterpiller Inc.'s Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #2 Statement of Additional Undisputed Material Facts)(Oslan, Reed)
July 11, 2015 Filing 742 SEALED REPLY by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to response in opposition to motion #33 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Supplemental Statements of Undisputed Facts, #2 Affidavit of Inbal Hasbani, #3 Exhibit 1-144)(Oslan, Reed) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/16/2015) (ks, ).
July 10, 2015 Filing 741 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for leave to file supplemental statements of undisputed material facts (Oslan, Reed)
July 10, 2015 Filing 740 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 7/15/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
July 10, 2015 Filing 739 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to seal document notice of motion #738 (Oslan, Reed)
July 10, 2015 Filing 738 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 7/15/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
June 29, 2015 Filing 737 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Caterpillar Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for leave to file under seal #715 is granted. The motion presentment date of 6/30/2015 is stricken. Parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
June 26, 2015 Filing 736 Redacted Version of Opposition of Caterpillar Inc. to Plaintiffs Miller UK Ltd. and Miller International Ltd.s Motion for Summary Judgment [Docket No. 717] by Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Combined Response of Caterpillar Inc. to Plaintiffs Statement of Undisputed Facts and Statement of Additional Facts that Require Denial of Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit 1-136, #3 Exhibit 137, #4 Exhibit 138-240)(Baker, Gregory)
June 19, 2015 Filing 735 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 143 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 144, #2 Exhibit 145, #3 Exhibit 146, #4 Exhibit 147, #5 Exhibit 148, #6 Exhibit 149, #7 Exhibit 150, #8 Exhibit 151, #9 Exhibit 152, #10 Exhibit 153, #11 Exhibit 154, #12 Exhibit 155, #13 Exhibit 156, #14 Exhibit 157, #15 Exhibit 158, #16 Exhibit 159, #17 Exhibit 160, #18 Exhibit 161, #19 Exhibit 162, #20 Exhibit 163, #21 Exhibit 164, #22 Exhibit 165, #23 Exhibit 166, #24 Exhibit 167, #25 Exhibit 168)(Baker, Gregory)
June 19, 2015 Filing 734 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 122 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 123, #2 Exhibit 124, #3 Exhibit 125, #4 Exhibit 126, #5 Exhibit 127, #6 Exhibit 128, #7 Exhibit 129, #8 Exhibit 130, #9 Exhibit 131, #10 Exhibit 132, #11 Exhibit 133, #12 Exhibit 134, #13 Exhibit 135, #14 Exhibit 136, #15 Exhibit 137, #16 Exhibit 138, #17 Exhibit 139, #18 Exhibit 140, #19 Exhibit 141, #20 Exhibit 142)(Sullivan, Terry)
June 19, 2015 Filing 733 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 111 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 112, #2 Exhibit 113, #3 Exhibit 114, #4 Exhibit 115, #5 Exhibit 116, #6 Exhibit 117, #7 Exhibit 118, #8 Exhibit 119, #9 Exhibit 120, #10 Exhibit 121)(Sullivan, Terry)
June 19, 2015 Filing 732 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 101 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 102, #2 Exhibit 103, #3 Exhibit 104, #4 Exhibit 105 Part 1 of 2, #5 Exhibit 105 Part 2 of 2, #6 Exhibit 106, #7 Exhibit 107, #8 Exhibit 108, #9 Exhibit 109, #10 Exhibit 110)(Sullivan, Terry)
June 19, 2015 Filing 731 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 190 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 191, #2 Exhibit 192, #3 Exhibit 193, #4 Exhibit 194, #5 Exhibit 195, #6 Exhibit 196, #7 Exhibit 197, #8 Exhibit 198, #9 Exhibit 199, #10 Exhibit 200, #11 Exhibit 201, #12 Exhibit 202, #13 Exhibit 203, #14 Exhibit 204, #15 Exhibit 205, #16 Exhibit 206, #17 Exhibit 207, #18 Exhibit 208, #19 Exhibit 209, #20 Exhibit 210, #21 Exhibit 211, #22 Exhibit 212, #23 Exhibit 213, #24 Exhibit 214, #25 Exhibit 215, #26 Exhibit 216, #27 Exhibit 217, #28 Exhibit 218, #29 Exhibit 219, #30 Exhibit 220, #31 Exhibit 221, #32 Exhibit 222, #33 Exhibit 223, #34 Exhibit 224, #35 Exhibit 225, #36 Exhibit 226, #37 Exhibit 227, #38 Exhibit 228, #39 Exhibit 229, #40 Exhibit 230, #41 Exhibit 231, #42 Exhibit 232, #43 Exhibit 233, #44 Exhibit 234, #45 Exhibit 235, #46 Exhibit 236, #47 Exhibit 237, #48 Exhibit 238, #49 Exhibit 239, #50 Exhibit 240)(Baker, Gregory)
June 19, 2015 Filing 730 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 96 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 97, #2 Exhibit 98, #3 Exhibit 99, #4 Exhibit 100)(Sullivan, Terry)
June 19, 2015 Filing 729 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 169 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 170, #2 Exhibit 171, #3 Exhibit 172, #4 Exhibit 173, #5 Exhibit 174, #6 Exhibit 175, #7 Exhibit 176, #8 Exhibit 177, #9 Exhibit 178, #10 Exhibit 179, #11 Exhibit 180, #12 Exhibit 181, #13 Exhibit 182, #14 Exhibit 183, #15 Exhibit 184, #16 Exhibit 185, #17 Exhibit 186, #18 Exhibit 187, #19 Exhibit 188, #20 Exhibit 189)(Baker, Gregory)
June 19, 2015 Filing 728 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 93 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 94, #2 Exhibit 95)(Sullivan, Terry)
June 19, 2015 Filing 727 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 82 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 83, #2 Exhibit 84, #3 Exhibit 85, #4 Exhibit 86, #5 Exhibit 87, #6 Exhibit 88, #7 Exhibit 89, #8 Exhibit 90, #9 Exhibit 91, #10 Exhibit 92)(Sullivan, Terry)
June 19, 2015 Filing 726 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 71 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 72, #2 Exhibit 73, #3 Exhibit 74, #4 Exhibit 75, #5 Exhibit 76, #6 Exhibit 77, #7 Exhibit 78, #8 Exhibit 79, #9 Exhibit 80, #10 Exhibit 81)(Sullivan, Terry)
June 19, 2015 Filing 725 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 66 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 67, #2 Exhibit 68, #3 Exhibit 69, #4 Exhibit 70)(Sullivan, Terry)
June 19, 2015 Filing 724 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 55 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 56, #2 Exhibit 57, #3 Exhibit 58, #4 Exhibit 59, #5 Exhibit 60, #6 Exhibit 61, #7 Exhibit 62, #8 Exhibit 63, #9 Exhibit 64, #10 Exhibit 65)(Sullivan, Terry)
June 19, 2015 Filing 723 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 44 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 45, #2 Exhibit 46, #3 Exhibit 47, #4 Exhibit 48, #5 Exhibit 49, #6 Exhibit 50, #7 Exhibit 51, #8 Exhibit 52, #9 Exhibit 53, #10 Exhibit 54)(Sullivan, Terry)
June 19, 2015 Filing 722 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 32 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 33, #2 Exhibit 34, #3 Exhibit 35, #4 Exhibit 36, #5 Exhibit 37, #6 Exhibit 38, #7 Exhibit 39, #8 Exhibit 40, #9 Exhibit 41, #10 Exhibit 42, #11 Exhibit 43)(Sullivan, Terry)
June 19, 2015 Filing 721 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 21 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 22, #2 Exhibit 23, #3 Exhibit 24, #4 Exhibit 25, #5 Exhibit 26, #6 Exhibit 27, #7 Exhibit 28, #8 Exhibit 29, #9 Exhibit 30, #10 Exhibit 31)(Sullivan, Terry)
June 19, 2015 Filing 720 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 14, #4 Exhibit 15, #5 Exhibit 16, #6 Exhibit 17, #7 Exhibit 18, #8 Exhibit 19, #9 Exhibit 20)(Sullivan, Terry)
June 19, 2015 Filing 719 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit 9, #5 Exhibit 10)(Sullivan, Terry)
June 19, 2015 Filing 718 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4)(Sullivan, Terry)
June 19, 2015 Filing 717 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Opposition of Caterpillar Inc. to Plaintiffs Miller UK Ltd. and Miller International Ltd.s Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Combined Response of Caterpillar Inc. to Plaintiffs Statement of Undisputed Facts and Statement of Additional Facts that Require Denial of Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration Declaration of Bridget S. McCabe in Support of Opposition of Caterpillar Inc. to Plaintiffs Miller UK Ltd. and Miller International Ltd.s Motion for Summary Judgment)(Baker, Gregory)
June 19, 2015 Filing 716 Notice of Presentment of Unopposed Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Leave to File Under Seal The Opposition of Caterpillar Inc. to Plaintiffs Miller UK Ltd. and Miller International Ltd.s Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Documents NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #715 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 6/30/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
June 19, 2015 Filing 715 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc.Unopposed Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Leave to File Under Seal The Opposition of Caterpillar Inc. to Plaintiffs Miller UK Ltd. and Miller International Ltd.s Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Documents (Baker, Gregory)
June 11, 2015 Filing 714 Redacted Version of Exhibits 176 [Docket No. 689] by Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 177-184, #2 Exhibit 185, #3 Exhibit 186, #4 Exhibit 187, #5 Exhibit 188, #6 Exhibit 189, #7 Exhibit 190, #8 Exhibit 191-193, #9 Exhibit 194, #10 Exhibit 195-223)(Baker, Gregory)
June 11, 2015 Filing 713 Redacted Version of Exhibits 151 [Docket No. 689] by Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 152-153, #2 154, #3 155-160, #4 161, #5 162, #6 163, #7 164, #8 165, #9 166-169, #10 170, #11 171, #12 172, #13 173, #14 174-175)(Baker, Gregory)
June 11, 2015 Filing 712 Redacted Version of Exhibits 136 [Docket No. 689] by Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 137, #2 Exhibit 138, #3 Exhibit 139, #4 Exhibit 140, #5 Exhibit 141, #6 Exhibit 142, #7 Exhibit 143, #8 Exhibit 144, #9 Exhibit 145, #10 Exhibit 146, #11 Exhibit 147-148, #12 Exhibit 149, #13 Exhibit 150)(Baker, Gregory)
June 11, 2015 Filing 711 Redacted Version of Exhibits 121 [Docket No. 689] by Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 122, #2 Exhibit 123, #3 Exhibit 124, #4 Exhibit 125, #5 Exhibit 126, #6 Exhibit 127, #7 Exhibit 128, #8 Exhibit 129, #9 Exhibit 130, #10 Exhibit 131, #11 Exhibit 132, #12 Exhibit 133, #13 Exhibit 134, #14 Exhibit 135)(Baker, Gregory)
June 11, 2015 Filing 710 Redacted Version of Exhibits 104 [Docket No. 689] by Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 105, #2 Exhibit 106, #3 Exhibit 107, #4 Exhibit 108, #5 Exhibit 109, #6 Exhibit 110-112, #7 Exhibit 113, #8 Exhibit 114-116, #9 Exhibit 117, #10 Exhibit 118, #11 Exhibit 119, #12 Exhibit 120)(Baker, Gregory)
June 11, 2015 Filing 709 Redacted Version of Exhibits 1-10 [Docket No. 689] by Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11, #2 Exhibit 12, #3 Exhibit 13-89, #4 Exhibit 90, #5 Exhibit 91, #6 Exhibit 92, #7 Exhibit 93, #8 Exhibit 94-96, #9 Exhibit 97, #10 Exhibit 98-103)(Baker, Gregory)
June 11, 2015 Filing 708 Redacted Version of Memorandum in Support of Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment [Docket No. 689] by Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment)(Baker, Gregory)
June 10, 2015 Filing 707 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Documents Supporting Motion for Summary Judgment #686 is granted. Motion by counsel for Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants to withdraw as attorney #705 is granted. Attorney Eric Lansing White is withdrawn as counsel of record. The motion presentment dates of 6/11/2015 and 6/16/2015 are stricken. Parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
June 9, 2015 Filing 706 NOTICE of Motion by Eric Lansing White for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney, #705 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 6/16/2015 at 09:00 AM. (White, Eric)
June 9, 2015 Filing 705 MOTION by counsel for Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd., Counter Defendants Miller International Ltd., Miller International Ltd., Miller International Ltd., Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd., Miller UK Ltd., Miller UK Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to withdraw as attorney (White, Eric)
June 5, 2015 Filing 704 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 211 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment #688 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 212, #2 Exhibit 213, #3 Exhibit 214, #4 Exhibit 215, #5 Exhibit 216, #6 Exhibit 217, #7 Exhibit 218, #8 Exhibit 219, #9 Exhibit 220, #10 Exhibit 221, #11 Exhibit 222, #12 Exhibit 223)(Baker, Gregory)
June 5, 2015 Filing 703 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 196 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment #688 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 197, #2 Exhibit 198, #3 Exhibit 199, #4 Exhibit 200, #5 Exhibit 201, #6 Exhibit 202, #7 Exhibit 203, #8 Exhibit 204, #9 Exhibit 205, #10 Exhibit 206, #11 Exhibit 207, #12 Exhibit 208, #13 Exhibit 209, #14 Exhibit 210)(Baker, Gregory)
June 5, 2015 Filing 702 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 181 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment #688 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 182, #2 Exhibit 183, #3 Exhibit 184, #4 Exhibit 185, #5 Exhibit 186, #6 Exhibit 187, #7 Exhibit 188, #8 Exhibit 189, #9 Exhibit 190, #10 Exhibit 191, #11 Exhibit 192, #12 Exhibit 193, #13 Exhibit 194, #14 Exhibit 195)(Baker, Gregory)
June 5, 2015 Filing 701 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 166 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment #688 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 167, #2 Exhibit 168, #3 Exhibit 169, #4 Exhibit 170, #5 Exhibit 171, #6 Exhibit 172, #7 Exhibit 173, #8 Exhibit 174, #9 Exhibit 175, #10 Exhibit 176, #11 Exhibit 177, #12 Exhibit 178, #13 Exhibit 179, #14 Exhibit 180)(Baker, Gregory)
June 5, 2015 Filing 700 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 151 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment #688 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 152, #2 Exhibit 153, #3 Exhibit 154, #4 Exhibit 155, #5 Exhibit 156, #6 Exhibit 157, #7 Exhibit 158, #8 Exhibit 159, #9 Exhibit 160, #10 Exhibit 161, #11 Exhibit 162, #12 Exhibit 163, #13 Exhibit 164, #14 Exhibit 165)(Baker, Gregory)
June 5, 2015 Filing 699 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 136 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment #688 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 137, #2 Exhibit 138, #3 Exhibit 139, #4 Exhibit 140, #5 Exhibit 141, #6 Exhibit 142, #7 Exhibit 143, #8 Exhibit 144, #9 Exhibit 145, #10 Exhibit 146, #11 Exhibit 147, #12 Exhibit 148, #13 Exhibit 149, #14 Exhibit 150)(Baker, Gregory)
June 5, 2015 Filing 698 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 121 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment #688 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 122, #2 Exhibit 123, #3 Exhibit 124, #4 Exhibit 125, #5 Exhibit 126, #6 Exhibit 127, #7 Exhibit 128, #8 Exhibit 129, #9 Exhibit 130, #10 Exhibit 131, #11 Exhibit 132, #12 Exhibit 133, #13 Exhibit 134, #14 Exhibit 135)(Baker, Gregory)
June 5, 2015 Filing 697 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 106 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment #688 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 107, #2 Exhibit 108, #3 Exhibit 109, #4 Exhibit 110, #5 Exhibit 111, #6 Exhibit 112, #7 Exhibit 113, #8 Exhibit 114, #9 Exhibit 115, #10 Exhibit 116, #11 Exhibit 117, #12 Exhibit 118, #13 Exhibit 119, #14 Exhibit 120)(Baker, Gregory)
June 5, 2015 Filing 696 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 91 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment #688 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 92, #2 Exhibit 93, #3 Exhibit 94, #4 Exhibit 95, #5 Exhibit 96, #6 Exhibit 97, #7 Exhibit 98, #8 Exhibit 99, #9 Exhibit 100, #10 Exhibit 101, #11 Exhibit 102, #12 Exhibit 103, #13 Exhibit 104, #14 Exhibit 105)(Baker, Gregory)
June 5, 2015 Filing 695 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 76 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment #688 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 77, #2 Exhibit 78, #3 Exhibit 79, #4 Exhibit 80, #5 Exhibit 81, #6 Exhibit 82, #7 Exhibit 83, #8 Exhibit 84, #9 Exhibit 85, #10 Exhibit 86, #11 Exhibit 87, #12 Exhibit 88, #13 Exhibit 89, #14 Exhibit 90)(Baker, Gregory)
June 5, 2015 Filing 694 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 61 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment #688 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 62, #2 Exhibit 63, #3 Exhibit 64, #4 Exhibit 65, #5 Exhibit 66, #6 Exhibit 67, #7 Exhibit 68, #8 Exhibit 69, #9 Exhibit 70, #10 Exhibit 71, #11 Exhibit 72, #12 Exhibit 73, #13 Exhibit 74, #14 Exhibit 75)(Baker, Gregory)
June 5, 2015 Filing 693 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 46 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment #688 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 47, #2 Exhibit 48, #3 Exhibit 49, #4 Exhibit 50, #5 Exhibit 51, #6 Exhibit 52, #7 Exhibit 53, #8 Exhibit 54, #9 Exhibit 55, #10 Exhibit 56, #11 Exhibit 57, #12 Exhibit 58, #13 Exhibit 59, #14 Exhibit 60)(Baker, Gregory)
June 5, 2015 Filing 692 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment #688 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 32, #2 Exhibit 33, #3 Exhibit 34, #4 Exhibit 35, #5 Exhibit 36, #6 Exhibit 37, #7 Exhibit 38, #8 Exhibit 39, #9 Exhibit 40, #10 Exhibit 41, #11 Exhibit 42, #12 Exhibit 43, #13 Exhibit 44, #14 Exhibit 45)(Baker, Gregory)
June 5, 2015 Filing 691 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 16 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment #688 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17, #2 Exhibit 18, #3 Exhibit 19, #4 Exhibit 20, #5 Exhibit 21, #6 Exhibit 22, #7 Exhibit 23, #8 Exhibit 24, #9 Exhibit 25, #10 Exhibit 26, #11 Exhibit 27, #12 Exhibit 28, #13 Exhibit 29, #14 Exhibit 30)(Baker, Gregory)
June 5, 2015 Filing 690 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 1 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment #688 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 15)(Baker, Gregory)
June 5, 2015 Filing 689 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration)(Baker, Gregory)
June 5, 2015 Filing 688 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment (Baker, Gregory)
June 5, 2015 Filing 687 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion to seal document #686 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 6/11/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
June 5, 2015 Filing 686 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to seal document Unopposed Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Leave to File Under Seal Documents Supporting Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment (Baker, Gregory)
June 1, 2015 Filing 685 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendant Caterpillar Inc.'s unopposed motion for leave to file under seal #677 is granted. Defendant Caterpillar Inc.'s motion for permission to file 65 pages of briefing in support of its motion(s) for summary judgment #679 is also granted. Caterpillar shall be permitted up to 65 pages in support of its motion(s) for summary judgment and Plaintiffs Miller UK and Miller International Ltd. shall be permitted up to 65 pages in support of their response. Caterpillar remains limited to 25 pages in reply. The motion presentment date of 6/2/2015 is stricken. Parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
May 28, 2015 Filing 684 RESPONSE by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for leave to file excess pages Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Permission to File 65 pages of Briefing In Support of Its Motion(s) for Summary Judgment #679 (Oslan, Reed)
May 28, 2015 Filing 683 MEMORANDUM by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. in support of motion for summary judgment #666 (Attachments: #1 Statements of Undisputed Facts, #2 Affidavit of Inbal Hasbani, #3 Exhibit 1-4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6-28, #6 Exhibit 29, #7 Exhibit 30)(Oslan, Reed)
May 27, 2015 Filing 682 MEMORANDUM by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. in support of motion for summary judgment #666 (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Affidavit of Inbal Hasbani, #3 Exhibit 1-4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6-28, #6 Exhibit 29, #7 Exhibit 30)(Oslan, Reed)
May 27, 2015 Filing 681 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 2 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for leave to file excess pages Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Permission to File 65 pages of Briefing In Support of Its Motion(s) for Summary Judgment #679 (Baker, Gregory)
May 27, 2015 Filing 680 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages, #679 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 6/2/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
May 27, 2015 Filing 679 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for leave to file excess pages Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Permission to File 65 pages of Briefing In Support of Its Motion(s) for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Baker, Gregory)
May 27, 2015 Filing 678 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion to seal, #677 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 6/2/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
May 27, 2015 Filing 677 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to seal Unopposed Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Leave to File Under Seal Documents Supporting Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Permission to File 65 pages of Briefing In Support of Its Motion(s) for Summary Judgment (Baker, Gregory)
May 21, 2015 Filing 676 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion hearing held. Plaintiffs Miller UK Ltd. and Miller International Ltd.'s motion for permission to file a memorandum of law in support of their motion for summary judgment in excess of 15 pages #664 is granted. The schedule for responding and replying with respect to Miller's brief will stand as previously set before the Court. Caterpillar's response shall be filed by 6/19/2015 and may consist of up to 41 pages. Miller's reply shall be field by 7/10/2015 and may consist of up to 25 pages. Plaintiffs Miller UK Ltd. and Miller International Ltd.'s motion to strike Caterpillar's multiple motions for summary judgment, memorandum of law in support, statements of undisputed material facts, and exhibits #668 is granted. Caterpillar shall refile its motion(s) for summary judgment by 6/5/2015, with its supporting memoranda of law subject to an aggregate page limit of 50 pages. Miller's response(s) shall be filed by 7/10/2015, with supporting memoranda of law subject to an aggregate page limit of 50 pages. Caterpillar's reply(ies) shall be filed by 7/31/2015, with supporting memoranda of law subject to an aggregate page limit of 25 pages. Caterpillar may file L.R. 56.1(a)(3) statement(s) of facts with an aggregate paragraph limit of 250 paragraphs. Miller may file L.R. 56.1(b)(3)(C) statement(s) of additional facts with an aggregate paragraph limit of 175 paragraphs. Unopposed motion by Caterpillar Inc. for leave to file under seal documents supporting motions of Caterpillar Inc. for summary judgment #625 and unopposed motion by Miller for leave to file under seal documents supporting motion for summary judgment #663 are granted. Status hearing set for 7/16/2015 is stricken and reset to 8/27/2015 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
May 20, 2015 Filing 675 Redacted Version of Memorandum of Caterpillar Inc. In Support of Its Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Count Three and for Summary Judgment on Count Four of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint [Docket 626] by Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3-12, #5 Exhibit 13, #6 Exhibit 14, #7 Exhibit 15, #8 Exhibit 16, #9 Exhibit 17, #10 Exhibit 18, #11 Exhibit 19-24)(Baker, Gregory)
May 20, 2015 Filing 674 Redacted Version of Memorandum of Caterpillar Inc. In Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment on Count Three (Fraudulent Inducement) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint [Docket 628] by Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #2 Exhibit 1-27, #3 Exhibit 28, #4 Exhibit 29)(Baker, Gregory)
May 20, 2015 Filing 673 Redacted Version of Memorandum In Support of Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims Based on Alleged Oral Agreements Regarding Scoop Buckets [Docket 631] by Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3-4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6-30)(Baker, Gregory)
May 20, 2015 Filing 672 Redacted Version of Memorandum of Caterpillar Inc. In Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims for Exemplary and Punitive Damages [Docket 633] by Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #2 Exhibit 1-18, #3 Exhibit 19, #4 Exhibit 20-21)(Baker, Gregory)
May 20, 2015 Filing 671 Redacted Version of Memorandum In Support of Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Count One (Breach of Contract) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint [Docket 635] by Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #2 Exhibit 1-34, #3 Exhibit 35, #4 Exhibit 36-39, #5 Exhibit 40, #6 Exhibit 41, #7 Exhibit 42, #8 Exhibit 43-75, #9 Exhibit 76, #10 Exhibit 77, #11 Exhibit 78, #12 Exhibit 79, #13 Exhibit 80-81, #14 Exhibit 82, #15 Exhibit 83-88, #16 Exhibit 89, #17 Exhibit 90, #18 Exhibit 91, #19 Exhibit 92, #20 Exhibit 93, #21 Exhibit 94-97, #22 Exhibit 98, #23 Exhibit 99-100, #24 Exhibit 101, #25 Exhibit 102, #26 Exhibit 103, #27 Exhibit 104, #28 Exhibit 105, #29 Exhibit 106, #30 Exhibit 107, #31 Exhibit 108, #32 Exhibit 109, #33 Exhibit 110, #34 Exhibit 111, #35 Exhibit 112, #36 Exhibit 113, #37 Exhibit 114, #38 Exhibit 115, #39 Exhibit 116, #40 Exhibit 117, #41 Exhibit 118, #42 Exhibit 119, #43 Exhibit 120, #44 Exhibit 121, #45 Exhibit 122, #46 Exhibit 123, #47 Exhibit 124-125, #48 Exhibit 126, #49 Exhibit 127, #50 Exhibit 128, #51 Exhibit 129-130, #52 Exhibit 131, #53 Exhibit 132-137, #54 Exhibit 138, #55 Exhibit 139, #56 Exhibit 140, #57 Exhibit 141, #58 Exhibit 142, #59 Exhibit 143, #60 Exhibit 144-146, #61 Exhibit 147, #62 Exhibit 148, #63 Exhibit 149, #64 Exhibit 150, #65 Exhibit 151-152, #66 Exhibit 153, #67 Exhibit 154-164, #68 Exhibit 165, #69 Exhibit 166-167, #70 Exhibit 168, #71 Exhibit 169, #72 Exhibit 170, #73 Exhibit 171)(Baker, Gregory)
May 20, 2015 Filing 670 Redacted Version of Memorandum In Support of Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Count Two (Misappropriation of Trade Secrets) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint [Docket 637] by Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #2 Exhibit 1-60, #3 Exhibit 61, #4 Exhibit 62, #5 Exhibit 63, #6 Exhibit 64, #7 Exhibit 65, #8 Exhibit 66-69, #9 Exhibit 70, #10 Exhibit 71-72, #11 Exhibit 73, #12 Exhibit 74, #13 Exhibit 75, #14 Exhibit 76, #15 Exhibit 77, #16 Exhibit 78, #17 Exhibit 79-80, #18 Exhibit 81, #19 Exhibit 82, #20 Exhibit 83, #21 Exhibit 84, #22 Exhibit 85, #23 Exhibit 86, #24 Exhibit 87, #25 Exhibit 88, #26 Exhibit 89, #27 Exhibit 90, #28 Exhibit 91, #29 Exhibit 92, #30 Exhibit 93, #31 Exhibit 94, #32 Exhibit 95, #33 Exhibit 96, #34 Exhibit 97, #35 Exhibit 98, #36 Exhibit 99, #37 Exhibit 100, #38 Exhibit 101, #39 Exhibit 102, #40 Exhibit 103, #41 Exhibit 104-105, #42 Exhibit 106, #43 Exhibit 107, #44 Exhibit 108, #45 Exhibit 109-110, #46 Exhibit 111, #47 Exhibit 112-117, #48 Exhibit 118, #49 Exhibit 119, #50 Exhibit 120, #51 Exhibit 121, #52 Exhibit 122, #53 Exhibit 123-126, #54 Exhibit 127, #55 Exhibit 128, #56 Exhibit 129, #57 Exhibit 130, #58 Exhibit 131-133, #59 Exhibit 134, #60 Exhibit 135-137)(Baker, Gregory)
May 20, 2015 Filing 669 NOTICE by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. re MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to strike sealed document, #636 , exhibit, #642 , exhibit, #640 , sealed document,,, #627 , exhibit, #643 , exhibit,, #658 , exhibit,, #649 , exhibit,, #659 , exhibit, #639 , sea #668 (Oslan, Reed)
May 20, 2015 Filing 668 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to strike sealed document, #636 , exhibit, #642 , exhibit, #640 , sealed document,,, #627 , exhibit, #643 , exhibit,, #658 , exhibit,, #649 , exhibit,, #659 , exhibit, #639 , sealed document, #634 , MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Renewed Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Partial Summary Judgment on Count Three and for Summary Judgment on Count Four of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #626 , MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Count One (Breach of Contract) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #635 , exhibit,, #650 , exhibit,, #655 , exhibit,, #646 , exhibit,, #653 , MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Count Three (Fraudulent Inducement) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #628 , exhibit, #648 , exhibit,, #652 , MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims for Exemplary and Punitive Damages #633 , exhibit,,, #647 , exhibit,, #656 , exhibit,, #645 , exhibit,, #662 , sealed document, #629 , MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Count Two (Misappropriation of Trade Secrets) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #637 , MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims Based on Alleged Oral Agreements Regarding Scoop Buckets #631 , sealed document, #638 , exhibit, #641 , exhibit,, #651 , exhibit,, #657 , exhibit,, #654 , exhibit,, #630 , exhibit,, #661 , exhibit,, #660 , sealed document, #632 , exhibit,, #644 (Oslan, Reed)
May 18, 2015 Filing 667 SEALED DOCUMENTS by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit OF INBAL HASBANI, #2 STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30)(Oslan, Reed) Modified on 10/21/2015 (ks, ).
May 18, 2015 Filing 666 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for summary judgment (Oslan, Reed)
May 18, 2015 Filing 665 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #664 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 5/21/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
May 18, 2015 Filing 664 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for leave to file excess pages (Oslan, Reed)
May 18, 2015 Filing 663 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to seal (Oslan, Reed)
May 18, 2015 Filing 662 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 121 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Count Two (Misappropriation of Trade Secrets) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #637 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 122, #2 Exhibit 123, #3 Exhibit 124, #4 Exhibit 125, #5 Exhibit 126, #6 Exhibit 127, #7 Exhibit 128, #8 Exhibit 129, #9 Exhibit 130, #10 Exhibit 131, #11 Exhibit 132, #12 Exhibit 133, #13 Exhibit 134, #14 Exhibit 135, #15 Exhibit 136, #16 Exhibit 137)(Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 661 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 106 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Count Two (Misappropriation of Trade Secrets) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #637 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 107, #2 Exhibit 108, #3 Exhibit 109, #4 Exhibit 110, #5 Exhibit 111, #6 Exhibit 112, #7 Exhibit 113, #8 Exhibit 114, #9 Exhibit 115, #10 Exhibit 116, #11 Exhibit 117, #12 Exhibit 118, #13 Exhibit 119, #14 Exhibit 120)(Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 660 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 91 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Count Two (Misappropriation of Trade Secrets) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #637 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 92, #2 Exhibit 93, #3 Exhibit 94, #4 Exhibit 95, #5 Exhibit 96, #6 Exhibit 97, #7 Exhibit 98, #8 Exhibit 99, #9 Exhibit 100, #10 Exhibit 101, #11 Exhibit 102, #12 Exhibit 103, #13 Exhibit 104, #14 Exhibit 105)(Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 659 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 76 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Count Two (Misappropriation of Trade Secrets) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #637 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 77, #2 Exhibit 78, #3 Exhibit 79, #4 Exhibit 80, #5 Exhibit 81, #6 Exhibit 82, #7 Exhibit 83, #8 Exhibit 84, #9 Exhibit 85, #10 Exhibit 86, #11 Exhibit 87, #12 Exhibit 88, #13 Exhibit 89, #14 Exhibit 90)(Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 658 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 61 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Count Two (Misappropriation of Trade Secrets) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #637 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 62, #2 Exhibit 63, #3 Exhibit 64, #4 Exhibit 65, #5 Exhibit 66, #6 Exhibit 67, #7 Exhibit 68, #8 Exhibit 69, #9 Exhibit 70, #10 Exhibit 71, #11 Exhibit 72, #12 Exhibit 73, #13 Exhibit 74, #14 Exhibit 75)(Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 657 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 46 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Count Two (Misappropriation of Trade Secrets) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #637 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 47, #2 Exhibit 48, #3 Exhibit 49, #4 Exhibit 50, #5 Exhibit 51, #6 Exhibit 52, #7 Exhibit 53, #8 Exhibit 54, #9 Exhibit 55, #10 Exhibit 56, #11 Exhibit 57, #12 Exhibit 58, #13 Exhibit 59, #14 Exhibit 60)(Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 656 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 31 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Count Two (Misappropriation of Trade Secrets) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #637 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 32, #2 Exhibit 33, #3 Exhibit 34, #4 Exhibit 35, #5 Exhibit 36, #6 Exhibit 37, #7 Exhibit 38, #8 Exhibit 39, #9 Exhibit 40, #10 Exhibit 41, #11 Exhibit 42, #12 Exhibit 43, #13 Exhibit 44, #14 Exhibit 45)(Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 655 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 16 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Count Two (Misappropriation of Trade Secrets) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #637 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17, #2 Exhibit 18, #3 Exhibit 19, #4 Exhibit 20, #5 Exhibit 21, #6 Exhibit 22, #7 Exhibit 23, #8 Exhibit 24, #9 Exhibit 25, #10 Exhibit 26, #11 Exhibit 27, #12 Exhibit 28, #13 Exhibit 29, #14 Exhibit 30)(Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 654 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 1 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Count Two (Misappropriation of Trade Secrets) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #637 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 15)(Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 653 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 156 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Count One (Breach of Contract) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #635 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 157, #2 Exhibit 158, #3 Exhibit 159, #4 Exhibit 160, #5 Exhibit 161, #6 Exhibit 162, #7 Exhibit 163, #8 Exhibit 164, #9 Exhibit 165, #10 Exhibit 166, #11 Exhibit 167, #12 Exhibit 168, #13 Exhibit 169, #14 Exhibit 170, #15 Exhibit 171)(Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 652 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 141 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Count One (Breach of Contract) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #635 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 142, #2 Exhibit 143, #3 Exhibit 144, #4 Exhibit 145, #5 Exhibit 146, #6 Exhibit 147, #7 Exhibit 148, #8 Exhibit 149, #9 Exhibit 150, #10 Exhibit 151, #11 Exhibit 152, #12 Exhibit 153, #13 Exhibit 154, #14 Exhibit 155)(Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 651 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 121 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Count One (Breach of Contract) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #635 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 122, #2 Exhibit 123, #3 Exhibit 124, #4 Exhibit 125, #5 Exhibit 126, #6 Exhibit 127, #7 Exhibit 128, #8 Exhibit 129, #9 Exhibit 130, #10 Exhibit 131, #11 Exhibit 132, #12 Exhibit 133, #13 Exhibit 134, #14 Exhibit 135, #15 Exhibit 136, #16 Exhibit 137, #17 Exhibit 138, #18 Exhibit 139, #19 Exhibit 140)(Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 650 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 101 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Count One (Breach of Contract) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #635 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 102, #2 Exhibit 103, #3 Exhibit 104, #4 Exhibit 105, #5 Exhibit 106, #6 Exhibit 107, #7 Exhibit 108, #8 Exhibit 109, #9 Exhibit 110, #10 Exhibit 111, #11 Exhibit 112, #12 Exhibit 113, #13 Exhibit 114, #14 Exhibit 115, #15 Exhibit 116, #16 Exhibit 117, #17 Exhibit 118, #18 Exhibit 119, #19 Exhibit 120)(Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 649 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 86 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Count One (Breach of Contract) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #635 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 87, #2 Exhibit 88, #3 Exhibit 89, #4 Exhibit 90, #5 Exhibit 91, #6 Exhibit 92, #7 Exhibit 93, #8 Exhibit 94, #9 Exhibit 95, #10 Exhibit 96, #11 Exhibit 97, #12 Exhibit 98, #13 Exhibit 99, #14 Exhibit 100)(Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 648 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 76 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Count One (Breach of Contract) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #635 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 77, #2 Exhibit 78, #3 Exhibit 79, #4 Exhibit 80, #5 Exhibit 81, #6 Exhibit 82, #7 Exhibit 83, #8 Exhibit 84, #9 Exhibit 85)(Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 647 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 51 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Count One (Breach of Contract) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #635 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 52, #2 Exhibit 53, #3 Exhibit 54, #4 Exhibit 55, #5 Exhibit 56, #6 Exhibit 57, #7 Exhibit 58, #8 Exhibit 59, #9 Exhibit 60, #10 Exhibit 61, #11 Exhibit 62, #12 Exhibit 63, #13 Exhibit 64, #14 Exhibit 65, #15 Exhibit 66, #16 Exhibit 67, #17 Exhibit 68, #18 Exhibit 69, #19 Exhibit 70, #20 Exhibit 71, #21 Exhibit 72, #22 Exhibit 73, #23 Exhibit 74, #24 Exhibit 75)(Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 646 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 31 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Count One (Breach of Contract) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #635 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 32, #2 Exhibit 33, #3 Exhibit 34, #4 Exhibit 35, #5 Exhibit 36, #6 Exhibit 37, #7 Exhibit 38, #8 Exhibit 39, #9 Exhibit 40, #10 Exhibit 41, #11 Exhibit 42, #12 Exhibit 43, #13 Exhibit 44, #14 Exhibit 45, #15 Exhibit 46, #16 Exhibit 47, #17 Exhibit 48, #18 Exhibit 49, #19 Exhibit 50)(Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 645 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 16 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Count One (Breach of Contract) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #635 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17, #2 Exhibit 18, #3 Exhibit 19, #4 Exhibit 20, #5 Exhibit 21, #6 Exhibit 22, #7 Exhibit 23, #8 Exhibit 24, #9 Exhibit 25, #10 Exhibit 26, #11 Exhibit 27, #12 Exhibit 28, #13 Exhibit 29, #14 Exhibit 30)(Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 644 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 1 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Count One (Breach of Contract) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #635 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 15)(Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 643 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 11 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims for Exemplary and Punitive Damages #633 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 14, #4 Exhibit 15, #5 Exhibit 16, #6 Exhibit 17, #7 Exhibit 18, #8 Exhibit 19, #9 Exhibit 20, #10 Exhibit 21)(Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 642 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 1 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims for Exemplary and Punitive Damages #633 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10)(Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 641 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 21 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims Based on Alleged Oral Agreements Regarding Scoop Buckets #631 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 22, #2 Exhibit 23, #3 Exhibit 24, #4 Exhibit 25, #5 Exhibit 26, #6 Exhibit 27, #7 Exhibit 28, #8 Exhibit 29, #9 Exhibit 30)(Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 640 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 11 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims Based on Alleged Oral Agreements Regarding Scoop Buckets #631 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 14, #4 Exhibit 15, #5 Exhibit 16, #6 Exhibit 17, #7 Exhibit 18, #8 Exhibit 19, #9 Exhibit 20)(Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 639 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 1 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims Based on Alleged Oral Agreements Regarding Scoop Buckets #631 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10)(Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 638 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Count Two (Misappropriation of Trade Secrets) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts)(Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 637 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Count Two (Misappropriation of Trade Secrets) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 636 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Count One (Breach of Contract) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts)(Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 635 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Count One (Breach of Contract) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 634 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Memorandum of Caterpillar Inc. in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims for Exemplary and Punitive Damages (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts)(Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 633 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims for Exemplary and Punitive Damages (Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 632 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims Based on Alleged Oral Agreements Regarding Scoop Buckets (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts)(Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 631 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims Based on Alleged Oral Agreements Regarding Scoop Buckets (Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 630 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit 11 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Count Three (Fraudulent Inducement) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #628 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 14, #4 Exhibit 15, #5 Exhibit 16, #6 Exhibit 17, #7 Exhibit 18, #8 Exhibit 19, #9 Exhibit 20, #10 Exhibit 21, #11 Exhibit 22, #12 Exhibit 23, #13 Exhibit 24, #14 Exhibit 25, #15 Exhibit 26, #16 Exhibit 27, #17 Exhibit 28, #18 Exhibit 29)(Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 629 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Memorandum of Caterpillar Inc. in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment on Count Three (Fraudulent Inducement) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10)(Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 628 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Summary Judgment on Count Three (Fraudulent Inducement) of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 627 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Memorandum of Caterpillar Inc.In Support of Its Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Count Three and for Summary Judgment on Count Four of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24)(Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 626 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment Renewed Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Partial Summary Judgment on Count Three and for Summary Judgment on Count Four of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Baker, Gregory)
May 18, 2015 Filing 625 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to seal (Baker, Gregory)
May 14, 2015 Filing 624 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. by Stacy L Pepper (Pepper, Stacy)
April 27, 2015 Filing 623 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: All matters relating to the referral of this case having been completed, the case is returned to Judge Wood. Judge Honorable Jeffrey Cole no longer referred to the case.Mailed notice (jms, )
April 15, 2015 Filing 622 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing held. The Court will rule on Defendant Caterpillar Inc.'s appeal of the magistrate judge's review of certain privilege log documents #611 in short order. Pursuant to the Courts order of 10/8/2014 #593 , dispositive motions shall be filed by 5/18/2015, responses to dispositive motions shall be filed by 6/19/2015, and replies shall be filed by 7/10/2015. The notice of presentment requirement for the dispositive motions is waived. Status hearing set for 7/16/2015 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, ) (Docket Text Modified by Judicial Staff.) (ef, ).
March 20, 2015 Filing 621 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: By the request and agreement of the parties, the status hearing set for 4/16/2015 is stricken and reset for 4/15/2015 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
March 18, 2015 Filing 620 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Status hearing held. Parties report they have agreed to an expert deposition schedule. The oral motion to extend expert discovery to 4/24/2015 to complete expert discovery is granted. The parties are urged to call chambers at 312-435-5601 if any issues arise during depositions. The parties again report that there appears to be no possibility of resolution of this case by way of settlement. Accordingly, the referral will be closed on April 24th absent some pending motion before me.Mailed notice (jms, )
March 11, 2015 Filing 619 REPLY by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to appeal of magistrate judge decision to district court #611 (Baker, Gregory)
March 9, 2015 Filing 618 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiffs Miller UK Ltd. and Miller International Ltd.'s motion for leave to file documents under seal #616 is granted. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file under seal (1) Exhibits A, B, C, D, E, F, G, H, I, J, K, L, and M in support of their Response to Appeal of Caterpillar Inc. of Magistrate Judge's Review of Certain Privilege Log Documents; and (2) their Response to Appeal of Caterpillar Inc. of Magistrate Judge's Review of Certain Privilege Log Documents. The Clerk of Court shall maintain these documents under seal until further order of the Court. Counsel for the parties and Court staff shall have access to the sealed documents. The motion presentment date of 3/10/2015 is stricken. Parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
March 4, 2015 Filing 617 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion for leave to file #616 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 3/10/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
March 4, 2015 Filing 616 MOTION by Plaintiff Miller UK Ltd. for leave to file Under Seal Documents Regarding Miller's Response to Appeal of Caterpillar Inc. of Magistrate Judge's Review of Certain Privilege Log Documents (Oslan, Reed)
March 4, 2015 Filing 615 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Miller UK Ltd. TO APPEAL OF CATERPILLAR INC. OF MAGISTRATE JUDGES REVIEW OF CERTAIN PRIVILEGE LOG DOCUMENTS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - M)(Oslan, Reed)
March 4, 2015 Filing 614 SEALED RESPONSE TO APPEAL OF CATERPILLAR INC. OF MAGISTRATE JUDGES REVIEW OF CERTAIN PRIVILEGE LOG DOCUMENTS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Oslan, Reed)
February 27, 2015 Filing 613 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: By agreement of the parties, Plaintiff Miller UK Ltd. shall respond to Defendant Caterpillar Inc.'s appeal of the magistrate judge's review of certain privilege log documents #611 by 3/4/2015. Defendant Caterpillar Inc. shall reply by 3/11/2015. The motion presentment hearing set for 3/3/2015 is stricken. Parties need not appear. The status hearing set for 4/16/2015 at 9:00 a.m. #602 shall remain in place. Mailed notice (ef, )
February 18, 2015 Filing 612 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 3/3/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
February 18, 2015 Filing 611 APPEAL by Caterpillar, Inc. from magistrate order #610 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baker, Gregory)
February 11, 2015 Filing 610 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order in response to Caterpillar's motion to reverse certain of the Special Master's rulings on privilege. Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 2/11/2015:Mailed notice(jms, )
January 25, 2015 Filing 609 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 7-31-12 before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Court Reporter Contact Information: Pamela S. Warren, https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/Transcript-Order-Form.aspx.

< Redaction Request due 2/16/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/25/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2015. (Warren, Pamela)
January 25, 2015 Filing 608 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 7-9-12 before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Court Reporter Contact Information: Pamela S. Warren, https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/Transcript-Order-Form.aspx.

< Redaction Request due 2/16/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/25/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2015. (Warren, Pamela)
January 25, 2015 Filing 607 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5-14-12 before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Court Reporter Contact Information: Pamela S. Warren, https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/Transcript-Order-Form.aspx.

< Redaction Request due 2/16/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/25/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2015. (Warren, Pamela)
January 25, 2015 Filing 606 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5-8-12 before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Court Reporter Contact Information: Pamela S. Warren, https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/Transcript-Order-Form.aspx.

< Redaction Request due 2/16/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/25/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2015. (Warren, Pamela)
January 25, 2015 Filing 605 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2-21-12 before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Court Reporter Contact Information: Pamela S. Warren, https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/Transcript-Order-Form.aspx.

< Redaction Request due 2/16/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/25/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2015. (Warren, Pamela)
January 25, 2015 Filing 604 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 1-24-12 before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Court Reporter Contact Information: Pamela S. Warren, https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/Transcript-Order-Form.aspx.

< Redaction Request due 2/16/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/25/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2015. (Warren, Pamela)
January 20, 2015 Filing 603 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: At the parties' oral motion, the status set for 1/21/15 is reset to 3/18/15 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (jms, )
January 15, 2015 Filing 602 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing held; continued to 4/16/2015 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ac, ) (Document Modified by Judicial Staff.) (ef, ).
December 8, 2014 Filing 601 Appeal of Caterpillar Inc. of Special Master's Review of Certain Supplemental Privilgeg Log Documents (REDACTED VERSION OF DOCKET NO. 600) by Caterpillar, Inc. (Baker, Gregory)
December 8, 2014 Filing 600 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Appeal of Caterpillar Inc. of Special Master's Review of Certain Supplemental Privilgeg Log Documents (Baker, Gregory)
December 1, 2014 Filing 599 SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT OF THE SPECIAL MASTER pursuant to Judge Wood's order of July 2, 2014 and Magistrate Judge Cole's order of August 7, 2014 (jms, )
November 25, 2014 Filing 598 NOTICE by Bridget S. Merritt of Change of Address or Name (Merritt, Bridget)
November 6, 2014 Filing 597 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: ORDER AMENDING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER IN RESPONSE TOCATERPILLARS NOTICE OF PENDING MOTIONS. Earlier today I issued a Memorandum Opinion in response to Caterpillar's Notice of Pending Motions. [Dkt. 596]. At the time the Memorandum Opinion was prepared, I did not have in mind a letter of April 3, 2014 from Miller's counsel to which was attached Miller's Fourth Amended Response to Caterpillar's First Set of Interrogatories. The letter asserts that as of the date it was written, Miller "believes it has provided as much information as it possibly can to identify its trade secrets and evidence showing Caterpillar's misappropriation." The letter goes on to say that Caterpillar's insistence on continued supplementation with additional information, "which Miller is still collecting as discovery unfolds," is "simply meant to burden Miller with needless discovery." A review of the attached previous responses to Caterpillar's interrogatories, reveals an enormous amount of technical information and references to hundreds of documents produced in discovery according to their Bates numbers. To the extent that there is information produced in discovery supposedly "confirming" Caterpillar's misappropriation of Miller's trade secrets, but not previously provided in the Miller responses to interrogatories accompanying the April 3rd letter or in a later dated supplementation by Miller that information must be produced by Miller as required in Dkt. 596. While Caterpillar has consistently taken the position that Miller's responses to its interrogatories have been woefully inadequate and that even today, it really has no idea of what it is that Miller contends it stole, it must be said that those assertions are exaggerated. The inescapable fact remains that "there was enough discovery here to choke a horse...." Walker v. Sheahan,526 F.3d 973, 978(7th Cir. 2008). Beyond what is compelled by Dkt. 596, "enough is enough." Id. at 981. Mailed notice (cdh, )
November 6, 2014 Filing 596 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order in Response to Caterpillar's Notice of Pending Motions Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 11/6/2014. Mailed notice(cdh, )
November 5, 2014 Filing 595 Caterpillar Inc.'s LOCAL RULE 78.5 Notice to the Court of Pending Motions by Caterpillar, Inc. (Baker, Gregory)
October 21, 2014 Filing 594 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole:In light of the discovery completion schedule set on 9/23/2014 #584 , status hearing date of 11/6/2014 is reset for 1/21/2015 at 09:30 AM.Mailed notice (jms, )
October 8, 2014 Filing 593 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing held; continued to 1/15/2015 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff's motion to set a trial date #586 is granted. This matter is set for a jury trial on 10/26/2015 at 9:00 a.m. Pursuant to the discussion held in open court, dispositive motions shall be filed by 5/18/2015; responses to dispositive motions shall be filed by 6/19/2014; and replies in support of dispositive motions shall be filed by 7/10/2014. Mailed notice (ac, )
October 3, 2014 Filing 592 APPEAL by Caterpillar, Inc. of Special Master Review of Certain Privilege Log Documents [REDACTED] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Baker, Gregory)
October 3, 2014 Filing 591 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Appeal of Caterpillar Inc. of Special Master Review of Certain Privilege Log Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Baker, Gregory)
September 30, 2014 Filing 590 Second Amended NOTICE of Presentment of Plaintiffs Miller UK Ltd. and Miller International Ltd. Motion to Set a Trial Date by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #586 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 10/8/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed) Modified by Clerk's Office on 10/1/2014).
September 29, 2014 Filing 589 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #586 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/8/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
September 26, 2014 Filing 588 AGREED ORDER Regarding Appeal of Special Master Review of Privilege Log Documents. Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 9/26/2014. (ao,)
September 25, 2014 Filing 587 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #586 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 10/1/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
September 25, 2014 Filing 586 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd.TO SET TRIAL DATE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Oslan, Reed)
September 23, 2014 Filing 585 AGREED ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 9/23/2014:Mailed notice(jms, )
September 23, 2014 Filing 584 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Telephone conference set for 11:00 am today is stricken. The court adopts the parties' discovery schedule. All fact discovery shall be completed by November 14, 2014. Miller and Caterpillar shall comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) on their respective claims no later than November 26, 2014. Response expert reports are to be submitted by February 2, 2015. Reply expert reports are to be submitted by March 6, 2015.All expert discovery shall be completed by April 17, 2015.Mailed notice (jms, )
September 19, 2014 Filing 583 SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT (jms, )
September 19, 2014 Filing 582 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Enter Report of Special Master, Hon. Michael J. Mahoney (Ret.).Mailed notice (jms, )
September 17, 2014 Filing 581 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Motion hearing held. Defendant's motion for protective order limiting scope of plaintiff's subpoenas to Cascade Corporation & Andy Anderson and to partially quash subpoenas #572 is granted in part and denied in part. As to paragraphs 1-5 of plaintiff's subpoenas for documents to Cascade and Anderson: #1 is unobjected to. The time period for request #2 is 2006 to 2008; The time period for request #3 is 2010 through September 1, 2014; The time period for request #4 is 2006 to September 1, 2014; The time period for request #5 is unobjected to. As to plaintiff's deposition subpoena to Cascade, there is no dispute to topic #1; the period to be covered by topic #2 is 2006-2008; the time period covered by topic #3 is 2010 to September 1, 2014; the time period for topic #4 is 2006-2008 and the parties agree on topic #5.Paragraphs 2,3,4, on page 3 of Caterpillar's motion are not appropriate for discovery under Judge Wood's extension of discovery for the claim made in the amended complaint. They are, however, relevant for the ongoing discovery as it relates to the other claims. And on those, as counsel noted, discovery is ongoing. Defendant's motion to compel & enforce court orders for plaintiff's overseas witnesses to appear for deposition in United States #574 is granted. Conference telephone status hearing is set for 9/23/2014 at 11:00 am to discuss setting a date for the close of discovery. The parties are to submit a proposed discovery schedule for the remainder of the case, including all expert discovery. Hopefully, that can be done by 9/20/14. The report and deposition schedule in time for review for the 9/23/22014 telephone conference.Status hearing date of 9/18/2014 is reset to 11/6/2014 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (jms, ) Modified on 9/18/2014 (ea, ).
September 12, 2014 Filing 580 RESPONSE by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to compel and Enforce Court Orders Requiring Plaintiffs' Overseas Witnesses to Appear for Deposition in the United States #574 (Oslan, Reed)
September 12, 2014 Filing 579 RESPONSE by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for protective order Limiting the Scope of Plaintiffs' Subpoenas to Cascade Corporation and Andy Anderson, or, in the Alternative, to Partially Quash Said Subpoenas #572 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Oslan, Reed)
September 9, 2014 Filing 578 SUPPLEMENT to motion for protective order, #572 SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF CATERPILLAR INC. FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER LIMITING THE SCOPE OF PLAINTIFFS' SUBPOENAS TO CASCADE CORPORATION AND ANDY ANDERSON, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO PARTIALLY QUASH SAID SUBPOENAS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Baker, Gregory)
September 4, 2014 Filing 577 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole:The parties' telephonic request to reset the hearing on defendant's motion to compel, #574 and motion for protective order, #572 is granted. Hearing on the motions is reset for 9/17/2014 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (jms, )
September 3, 2014 Filing 576 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Sua sponte, hearing on defendant's motions to compel, #574 and for protective order, #572 are reset for 9/16/2014 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (jms, )
September 3, 2014 Filing 575 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion to compel, #574 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 9/9/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
September 3, 2014 Filing 574 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to compel and Enforce Court Orders Requiring Plaintiffs' Overseas Witnesses to Appear for Deposition in the United States (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Baker, Gregory)
September 3, 2014 Filing 573 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion for protective order, #572 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 9/9/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
September 3, 2014 Filing 572 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for protective order Limiting the Scope of Plaintiffs' Subpoenas to Cascade Corporation and Andy Anderson, or, in the Alternative, to Partially Quash Said Subpoenas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Baker, Gregory)
August 27, 2014 Filing 571 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood:Pursuant to the agreement of the parties, status hearing set for 8/28/2014 is stricken. Status hearing set for 10/8/2014 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ac, )
August 18, 2014 Filing 570 AFFIDAVIT of Michael Mahoney (as, )
August 14, 2014 Filing 569 ANSWER to amended complaint , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Caterpillar, Inc. against Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. . by Caterpillar, Inc.(Baker, Gregory)
August 14, 2014 Filing 568 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Status hearing date of 9/16/2014 is stricken. Status hearing date of 9/18/2014 at 9:30 am in Courtroom 1003 shall stand.Mailed notice (jms, )
August 14, 2014 Filing 567 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Telephone status conference held with the parties and Special Master, Magistrate Judge Michael Mahoney (Ret). The parties will submit the relevant documents to Judge Mahoney in accordance with the agreements reached during the phone conference. The materials submitted by Caterpillar will be returned to Caterpillar via Caterpillar's messenger service at the conclusion of Judge Mahoney's review. The materials provided by Miller will be shredded through arrangements made by Judge Mahoney with Miller to bear any costs associated with that destruction. The case is set for further status on 9/18/14 at 9:30 a.m. in courtroom 1003. Mr. Baker may attend by phone. Mailed notice (jms, )
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ORDER appointing Retired Magistrate Judge Michael Mahoney as Special Master Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 8/7/2014:Mailed notice(jms, )
August 7, 2014 Filing 565 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Telephone conference with counsel regarding appointment of a Special Master pursuant to Judge Wood's Agreed Order of 7/2/14 #549 and Rule 53, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The case is set for further status on 8/14/14 at 10:30 a.m. During the conversation with counsel, I informed them that absent a timely and appropriate objection, I was going to appoint Retired Magistrate Judge Michael Mahoney to serve as Special Master to resolve the current dispute the parties have over issues of attorney/client privilege, work-product, or any other asserted privilege in connection with the several thousand documents identified on privilege logs. The parties estimate that the disputed documents may exceed 4,000. Given the exigencies of the situation, this is a pretrial task that cannot be effectively and timely addressed by an available judicial officer in this District. See Rule 53(a)(1)(C). Mailed notice (jms, )
July 31, 2014 Filing 564 Second AMENDED complaint by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Oslan, Reed)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 563 ORDER signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 7/24/2014. Mailed notice (ac, )
July 22, 2014 Filing 562 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Status hearing held and continued to 9/16/2014 at 08:30 AM. Motion hearing held. Defendant's motion to resume the deposition of John Walker in Peoria is granted. The deposition shall be at the same place as Mr. Walker's previous deposition, or in Chicago, if Mr. Walker prefers, on a date to be agreed upon by the parties. Mr. Baker shall have 2.5 hours to complete the deposition. for an additional 2.5 hours #555 is granted as outlined in open court. The Sweeney deposition shall go forward as agreed upon in August. Mailed notice (jms, )
July 22, 2014 Filing 561 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #560 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 7/24/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
July 22, 2014 Filing 560 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd.Emergency Motion to Modify Agreed Order regarding Expert Discovery to Allow for Supplementation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Oslan, Reed)
July 21, 2014 Filing 559 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to motion for miscellaneous relief, #555 to resume the Deposition of John Walker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Oslan, Reed)
July 18, 2014 Filing 558 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent John Walker by Micah Eric Marcus (Marcus, Micah)
July 17, 2014 Filing 557 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Defendant's motion to file documents under seal #552 is denied.The motion gives no explanation of why these documents should be filed outside the public record and court review of the exhibits specified in the motion did not reveal anything to warrant the under seal treatment. The motion of defendant Caterpillar to resume the deposition of John Walker [#555] will be heard on 7/22/2014 as noticed. Mailed notice (jms, )
July 16, 2014 Filing 556 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #555 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 7/22/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
July 16, 2014 Filing 555 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc.Resume the Deposition of John Walker Motion of Caterpillar Inc. to Resume the Deposition of John Walker [Partially Redacted Version of Docket Entry 554] (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Baker, Gregory)
July 16, 2014 Filing 554 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Motion of Caterpillar Inc. to Resume the Deposition of John Walker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Baker, Gregory)
July 16, 2014 Filing 553 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion for leave to file under seal document #552 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 7/22/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
July 16, 2014 Filing 552 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for Leave to File Under Seal Documents Regarding Motion of Caterpillar Inc. to Resume the Deposition of John Walker (Baker, Gregory)
July 10, 2014 Filing 551 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Status hearing date of 7/14/2014 is reset for 7/22/2014 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (jms, )
July 10, 2014 Filing 550 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Defendant's motion for leave to file to file its reply to the motion to compel answers to its 3rd set of interrogatories #542 is granted.Mailed notice (jms, )
July 2, 2014 Filing 549 AGREED ORDER REGARDING SPECIAL MASTER REVIEW OF PRIVILEGE LOG DOCUMENT signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 7/2/2014. Mailed notice (ac, )
July 1, 2014 Filing 548 AGREED ORDER REGARDING EXPERT DISCOVERY AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 7/1/2014. Mailed notice (ac, )
June 24, 2014 Filing 547 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood:Status hearing held; continued to 8/28/2014 at 9:00 a.m. Fact discovery has been completed. The parties reported that they have agreed to modify the expert discovery schedule as follows: the parties' initial expert reports shall be exchanged by 7/30/2014; the parties responsive expert reports shall be exchanged by 9/10/2014; the parties rebuttal expert reports shall be exchanged by 10/13/2014; and expert depositions shall be completed by 11/25/2014. The parties shall submit an agreed order regarding the expert discovery schedule in Word format to the Courts proposed order e-mailbox for entry by the Court. The parties also have agreed to request a special master to assist with certain discovery matters. The parties shall submit an agreed order regarding the appointment of a special master to the Court's e-mailbox for the Court's consideration. Plaintiffs oral motion for the Court to set a trial date is denied as premature. The Court will revisit the matter of setting a date in the future. The Court will rule on Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint #488 by mail. Mailed notice (ac, )
June 24, 2014 Filing 546 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Sua sponte, Status hearing date of 7/8/2014 is reset for 7/14/2014 at 09:30 AM. Hearing on defendants' motion for leave to file documents under seal #542 is reset for 7/14/2014 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (jms, )
June 20, 2014 Filing 545 REPLY by Caterpillar, Inc. to MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to compel Motion of Caterpillar Inc. to Compel Answers to Its Third set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Miller International, Ltd. #519 [Partially Redacted Version] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baker, Gregory)
June 20, 2014 Filing 544 SEALED REPLY by Caterpillar, Inc. to MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to compel Motion of Caterpillar Inc. to Compel Answers to Its Third set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Miller International, Ltd. #519 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baker, Gregory)
June 20, 2014 Filing 543 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion for leave to file, #542 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 6/25/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
June 20, 2014 Filing 542 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for leave to file Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Leave to File Under Seal Documents Regarding Reply in Support of Motion of Caterpillar Inc. to Compel Answers to Its Third Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Miller International, LTD. (Baker, Gregory)
June 12, 2014 Filing 541 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion to file certain documents under seal #532 is granted. Defendant's motion for a protective order to reschedule the deposition of John Walker #537 is granted. Mr. Walker's deposition shall proceed no later than 6/25/2014 and plaintiff shall pay the costs for Mr. Walker to appear in Chicago for his deposition, if he is willing to come to Chicago. Mr. Baker was willing to have the deposition proceed on Sunday, June 22, 2014 but counsel for the plaintiff was unavailable that date.Mailed notice (jms, )
June 9, 2014 Filing 540 MEMORANDUM by Caterpillar, Inc. in support of motion for protective order #537 Memorandum in Support of Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for a Protective Order Requiring Plaintiffs to Reschedule the Continuation of the Deposition of John Walker [Partially Redacted Version] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Baker, Gregory)
June 9, 2014 Filing 539 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion for protective order #537 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 6/12/2014 at 10:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
June 9, 2014 Filing 538 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for a Protective Order Requiring Plaintiffs to Reschedule the Continuation of the Deposition of John Walker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Baker, Gregory)
June 9, 2014 Filing 537 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for protective order Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for a Protective Order Requiring Plaintiffs to Reschedule the Continuation of the Deposition of John Walker (Baker, Gregory)
June 9, 2014 Filing 536 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion to seal document, #535 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 6/12/2014 at 10:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
June 9, 2014 Filing 535 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to seal document Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Leave to File Under Seal Documents Regarding Motion for a Protective Order Requiring Plaintiffs to Reschedule the Continuation of the Deposition of John Walker (Baker, Gregory)
June 6, 2014 Filing 534 SEALED RESPONSE by Miller International Ltd. to MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to compel Motion of Caterpillar Inc. to Compel Answers to Its Third set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Miller International, Ltd. #519 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Oslan, Reed)
June 6, 2014 Filing 533 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion for leave to file, #532 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 6/11/2014 at 08:30 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
June 6, 2014 Filing 532 MOTION by Plaintiff Miller International Ltd., Counter Defendant Miller International Ltd. for leave to file Under Seal Exhibits B, F, H, I, and J to Miller's Opposition to Caterpillar's Motion to Compel Answers to its Third Set of Interrogatories (Oslan, Reed)
June 6, 2014 Filing 531 RESPONSE by Miller International Ltd.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to compel Motion of Caterpillar Inc. to Compel Answers to Its Third set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Miller International, Ltd. #519 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Oslan, Reed)
May 29, 2014 Filing 530 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole:At the mutual request of the parties, status hearing date of 6/3/2014 is reset to 7/8/2014 at 9:30 am. Mailed notice (jms, )
May 26, 2014 Filing 529 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5-6-14 before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Court Reporter Contact Information: Pamela S. Warren, https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/Transcript-Order-Form.aspx.

< Redaction Request due 6/16/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/25/2014. (Warren, Pamela)
May 26, 2014 Filing 528 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 1-9-14 before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Court Reporter Contact Information: Pamela S. Warren, https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/Transcript-Order-Form.aspx.

< Redaction Request due 6/16/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/25/2014. (Warren, Pamela)
May 19, 2014 Filing 527 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. regarding Notice of Deposition served on Chris Langvardt on May 7, 2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Oslan, Reed)
May 19, 2014 Filing 526 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. regarding Amended Notice of Deposition served on James Owens on May 9, 2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Oslan, Reed)
May 16, 2014 Filing 525 AGREED ORDER Regarding Miller's Motion to Compel Caterpillar To Produce Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Fourth and Fifth Sets of Request for the Production of Documents and Things. Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 5/16/2014. (ao,)
May 6, 2014 Filing 522 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Status hearing held. Motion hearing held. All Miller 30(b)(6) witness depositions will be done at Caterpillar's office either in Peoria or Kansas and all depositions will run consecutively from day to day until they are finished. The parties are advised that letter correspondence with the court should be avoided whenever possible and that motions or supplemental filings should be used instead. Discovery as to the Laidler Certification shall remain open both here and in the United Kingdom. Jackie Miller's continued deposition will remain open and she can be deposed in person in connection with the Laidler discovery but limited to issues that Mr.Barker mistakenly thought were out of bounds when he ordered her not to answer questions on a certain topic. The Esco discovery shall also remain open as to the outstanding subpoena. Plaintiffs' motion to compel defendant to produce documents responsive to plaintiffs' fourth and fifth set of requests for the production of documents and things #502 is granted for the reasons discussed on the record. The parties shall submit a draft order within 7 days specifying the scope of the permissible discovery as discussed in court. Defendant's motion to compel answers to its third set of interrogatories filed yesterday is taken under advisement. Response is to be filed by 6/6/2014. Reply is to be filed by 6/20/2014. Court will rule by mail. Mailed notice (jms, )
May 5, 2014 Filing 524 LETTER from Miller UK Ltd., and Miller International Ltd. dated May 5, 2014. (Exhibit) (ao,)
May 5, 2014 Filing 523 LETTER from Caterpillar, Inc. dated 4/16/14. (Exhibit) (ao,)
May 5, 2014 Filing 521 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion to compel #519 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 5/13/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
May 5, 2014 Filing 520 MEMORANDUM by Caterpillar, Inc. in support of motion to compel #519 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit E)(Baker, Gregory)
May 5, 2014 Filing 519 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to compel Motion of Caterpillar Inc. to Compel Answers to Its Third set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Miller International, Ltd. (Baker, Gregory)
May 5, 2014 Filing 518 Combined RULE 37.2 Report Prescribed by the Court's February 7, 2013 Order [Dkt. No. #337 ] to Accompany Caterpillar's Motion to Compel Answers to Its Third Set of Interrogatories by Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Baker, Gregory)
May 2, 2014 Filing 517 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole:The parties' telephonic request to set a status hearing is granted. Status hearing is set for 5/6/2012 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (jms, )
April 22, 2014 Filing 516 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file Exhibit B under seal #512 is granted. Mailed notice (jms, )
April 18, 2014 Filing 515 SEALED REPLY by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to compel to Produce Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Fourth and Fifth Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things #502 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Oslan, Reed)
April 18, 2014 Filing 514 RESPONSE by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd.in Support of MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to compel to Produce Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Fourth and Fifth Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things #502 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Oslan, Reed)
April 18, 2014 Filing 513 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion for leave to file, #512 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 4/24/2014 at 08:30 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
April 18, 2014 Filing 512 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for leave to file under Seal Exhibit B to Miller's Reply Brief in Support of Motion of Miller to Compel Caterpillar to Produce Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Fourth and Fifth Sets of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Oslan, Reed)
April 17, 2014 Filing 511 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 3/20/14 before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Court Reporter Contact Information: Kathy Fennell, Kathleen_Fennell@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/8/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/19/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/16/2014. (Fennell, Kathleen)
April 17, 2014 Filing 510 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 8/8/13 before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Court Reporter Contact Information: Kathy Fennell, Kathleen_Fennell@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/8/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/19/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/16/2014. (Fennell, Kathleen)
April 14, 2014 Filing 509 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Motion hearing held and oral argument held. Status hearing held and continued to 6/3/2014 at 09:00 AM. Ruling will be by mail.Mailed notice (jms, )
April 11, 2014 Filing 508 RESPONSE by Caterpillar, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to compel to Produce Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Fourth and Fifth Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things #502 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Baker, Gregory)
April 11, 2014 Filing 507 RESPONSE by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to Plaintiffs' April 3, 2014 Letter Submission to the Court in Connection with Caterpillar's Pending Motion for Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baker, Gregory)
April 8, 2014 Filing 506 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole:The parties' telephonic request to enter an agreed briefing schedule on plaintiff's motion to compel #502 is granted. Defendant's response shall be filed by 4/11/2014. Reply shall be filed by 4/18/2014. Court will rule by mail.Mailed notice (jms, )
April 4, 2014 Filing 504 MEMORANDUM by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. in support of motion to compel #502 Produce Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Fourth and Fifth Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Oslan, Reed)
April 4, 2014 Filing 503 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion to compel #502 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 4/9/2014 at 08:30 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
April 4, 2014 Filing 502 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to compel to Produce Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Fourth and Fifth Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Oslan, Reed)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER:Status hearing held; continued to 6/24/2014 at 9:00 a.m. Defendant's oral motion for leave to file a surreply in opposition to Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint is granted. Defendant's motion for leave to file under seal documents regarding their surreply to Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint #498 is granted as stated on the record. The Clerk is directed to seal Defendant's surreply to Plaintiff's motion for leave to file, a second amended complaint #500 until further order of the Court. Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant, and chambers staff are granted permission to access the sealed documents. Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 4/2/2014. Mailed notice (ao,)
March 28, 2014 Filing 501 SUR-REPLY by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to motion for leave to file #488 Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended and Supplemental Complaint [Partially Redacted Version] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Baker, Gregory)
March 28, 2014 Filing 500 SEALED RESPONSE by Caterpillar, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for leave to file Second Amended Complaint #488 Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended and Supplemental Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Baker, Gregory)
March 28, 2014 Filing 499 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion for leave to file, #498 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 4/2/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
March 28, 2014 Filing 498 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for leave to file Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Leave to File Under Seal Documents Regarding Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended and Supplemental Complaint (Baker, Gregory)
March 25, 2014 Filing 497 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/09/13 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/15/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/23/2014. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 25, 2014 Filing 496 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 01/30/2014 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/15/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/23/2014. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 25, 2014 Filing 495 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 9/23/2013 before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/15/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/23/2014. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 20, 2014 Filing 494 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Telephonic Magistrate Judge Status hearing held. Status hearing is set for 4/14/2014 at 09:00 AM to discuss the supplementation of the interrogatories that are subject of document #418 . The parties report that they are considering hiring a special master to review privilege log documents and whether his decisions will be deemed binding. Plaintiff is given to 4/3/2014 to fully supplement the interrogatories that are the subject of defendant's motion #418 . Defendant's oral motion to have letters of request reissued is granted. Mailed notice (jms, )
March 14, 2014 Filing 493 REPLY by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. in Support of Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Oslan, Reed)
March 7, 2014 Filing 492 RESPONSE by Caterpillar, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for leave to file Second Amended Complaint #488 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Baker, Gregory)
February 18, 2014 Filing 491 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendant shall respond to Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file Second Amended Complaint #488 by 3/7/2014. Plaintiffs' reply shall be filed by 3/14/2014. The motion presentment date of 2/20/2014 is stricken. Parties need not appear. Status hearing set for 3/11/2014 is stricken. Status hearing reset for 4/2/2014 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ac, )
February 14, 2014 Filing 490 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: In light of the progress made by the defendants in discovery it appears that further weekly status conferences are unnecessary. Accordingly, the parties will no longer be required - at least for now - to appear every Friday for a status hearing. Status hearing is set for 3/20/2014 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (jms, )
February 13, 2014 Filing 489 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion for leave to file #488 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 2/20/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
February 13, 2014 Filing 488 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for leave to file Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint)(Oslan, Reed)
February 3, 2014 Filing 487 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 1/17/2014 before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Court Reporter Contact Information: ALEXANDRA ROTH, (312) 408-5038, alexandra_roth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/24/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/6/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/5/2014. (Roth, Alexandra)
January 30, 2014 Filing 486 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood:Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion to set a trial date #477 is denied without prejudice. As discussed on the record, the Court declines to set a firm trial date at this time but expects the case to be ready for trial in late April 2015. Dispositive motions, if any, shall be filed by 12/10/2014.Mailed notice (jms, )
January 29, 2014 Filing 485 RESPONSE by Caterpillar, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd.To Set a Trial Date #477 (Baker, Gregory)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 1/23/2014. (ao,)
January 23, 2014 MAILED via FedEx Unopposed Motion of Caterpillar Inc., to Issue an Amended Letter of Request to Senior Manager, Attn: Foreign Process Section Royal Courts of Justice to London, England. 8020 5768 4378. (lw, ) Modified on 1/23/2014 (lw, ).
January 23, 2014 Filing 483 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Magistrate Judge Status hearing held and continued to 2/14/2014 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice (jms, )
January 23, 2014 Filing 481 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Defendant's unopposed motion to to issue an amended letter of request #480 is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to transmit the revised Letter of Request for Judicial Assistance pursuant to the Hague Convention upon delivery of an envelope and postage by defendant. Mailed notice (jms, )
January 23, 2014 Filing 480 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to amend/correct Unopposed Motion of Caterpillar Inc. to Issue an Amended Letter of Request (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baker, Gregory)
January 21, 2014 Filing 479 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #477 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 1/30/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
January 17, 2014 Filing 482 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Magistrate Judge Status hearing held and continued to 1/24/2014 at 10:00 AM.Mailed notice (jms, )
January 15, 2014 Filing 478 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #477 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 1/21/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
January 15, 2014 Filing 477 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd.To Set a Trial Date (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Oslan, Reed)
January 9, 2014 Filing 476 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Magistrate Judge Status hearing held and continued to 1/17/2014 and every Friday subsequent at 10:00 am in order to monitor discovery and to assure that the discovery cutoff date will be met to enable Judge Wood to set a trial date at her convenience following the close of discovery. Mr. Baker may participate by telephone at these weekly sessions if he chooses. The parties shall file an agreed upon facility inspection schedule. Defendant's motion to extend the discovery schedule is granted in part and denied in part. All fact discovery shall be completed by 5/30/2014. The parties shall simultaneously comply with FRCP 26(a)(2) by 6/30/2014. Opposition/response reports are to be submitted by 8/11/2014. Reply reports are to be submitted by 9/12/2014. All expert discovery shall be completed by 10/31/2014. The parties are advised that all dates are FINAL. The parties are directed to agree on a deposition schedule for the unnamed deponents. Miller is to immediately provide each production release version or custom release version of fabricated or cast couplers for hydraulic excavators produced by or for Miller UK or Miller Intl (top level assemblies).Mailed notice (jms, )
January 7, 2014 Filing 474 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole:The parties' telephonic request to reset the hearing on plaintiff's motionto set final discovery schedule #462 and defendants' motion for an extension of time to complete discovery #464 is granted. Hearing on the motions is reset for 1/9/2014 at 10:00 AM.Mailed notice (jms, )
January 6, 2014 Filing 475 LETTER from Inbal Hasbani dated 1/3/14. (ao,)
January 6, 2014 Filing 472 RESPONSE by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for extension of time to complete discovery Motion of Caterpillar Inc. to Extend Discovery Deadlines #464 (Oslan, Reed)
January 6, 2014 Filing 471 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: On January 2, 2014, I received a letter from Caterpillars counsel objecting quite strenuously to prior letters from Millers counsel to me on December 31 (on which he was copied) and to a conversation that he had with my courtroom deputy following a joint conversation I had with both counsel on December 30, 2013, which followed on the heels of an email I composed and my courtroom deputy sent at my request to Millers counsel with a copy to Caterpillars counsel: The Judge has asked me to contact you to ask if you will immediately be provided an unredacted version, to him, in camera of Exhibits D and F to defendant's memorandum in support of its motion to compel [#364] as well as any other redacted documents in the in camera submission that shows the chances of success for or estimates damages. Also, the judge would like to know if you provide him with the total number of pages comprising the in camera 5 volume submission. Finally, are all of the documents in the privilege log attached as Exhibit G to Miller's memorandum in the in camera submission? If not, please provide the documents that involve the plaintiff and John Burley or any actual or prospective third party funder and please be certain that the number on the privilege log is on the documents. If you could deliver those documents by messenger to Room 1010 this morning, he would be most grateful.Thank you for you for your help.Thereafter, it appears that counsel for Miller had a conversation with my courtroom deputy. On January 3, 2014, I received Mr. Bakers letter objecting to that call and to the fact that Miller had revised the privilege log attached as Exhibit G to Caterpillars Memorandum in support of its Motion to Compel [# 366]. Mr. Bakers email accuses Millers counsel of an impermissible attempt to reopen the record and confuse the issues. Miller responded with its own letter dated January 3, 2014, which makes eminently good sense and is a sufficient answer, it seems to me, to Caterpillar's letter.. The more immediate question is whether the amended privilege log alters the result of the Opinion of January 6, 2014. I very much doubt it. That will be an issue for another day. Mailed notice (jms, )
January 6, 2014 Filing 470 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 1/6/2014:Mailed notice(jms, ) .
January 6, 2014 Filing 469 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Pursuant to Memorandum Opinion entered this day, defendant's motion to compel litigation funding documents #364 is granted in part and denied in part.Mailed notice (jms, )
January 3, 2014 Filing 468 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: I have received correspondence from the parties re: the motion to compel [#364]. The Clerk of Court is directed to make the correspondence part of the record.Mailed notice (jms, )
January 2, 2014 Filing 473 LETTER from Gregory L. Baker dated 1/2/2014. (tg, )
January 2, 2014 Filing 467 RESPONSE by Caterpillar, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for order to Set Final Discovery Schedule #462 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baker, Gregory)
December 20, 2013 Filing 466 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery #464 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 1/8/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
December 20, 2013 Filing 465 MEMORANDUM by Caterpillar, Inc. in support of motion for extension of time to complete discovery #464 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y)(Baker, Gregory)
December 20, 2013 Filing 464 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for extension of time to complete discovery Motion of Caterpillar Inc. to Extend Discovery Deadlines (Baker, Gregory)
December 17, 2013 Filing 463 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion for order #462 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 1/8/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
December 17, 2013 Filing 462 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for order to Set Final Discovery Schedule (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Draft Order)(Oslan, Reed)
December 16, 2013 Filing 461 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Defendant's motion for discovery for Letter of Request for International Judicial Assistance pursuant to the Hague Convention #457 is granted without objection. Mailed notice (jms, )
December 9, 2013 Filing 460 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing held; continued to 3/11/2014 at 9:00 a.m. The referral to the magistrate judge is expanded to include Defendant's Motion for Letter of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Convention #457 . Pursuant to the discussion held in open court, the parties shall meet and confer regarding a proposed extension of the discovery schedule and submit the proposed schedule for approval by the magistrate judge. Any additional requests to extend the date by which discovery will be completed must be made to the district court judge, as discussed on the record. Mailed notice (ac, )
December 5, 2013 Filing 459 STATUS Report Joint Reassignment Status Report Submitted Pursuant to the Court's November 21, 2013 Order by Caterpillar, Inc. (Baker, Gregory)
December 4, 2013 Filing 458 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion for discovery #457 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 12/9/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
December 4, 2013 Filing 457 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for discovery for Letter of Request for International Judicial Assistance pursuant to the Hague Convention (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter of Request)(Baker, Gregory)
November 25, 2013 Filing 456 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea Wood: Status hearing set for 12/09/2013 at 9:00 a.m in courtroom 1725. Parties may notice motions for presentment at that time. Written notice of the intent to present a motion must be filed and served on all parties at least three business days in advance of the hearing. Mailed notice (ac, ) Modified on 6/23/2014 (ac, ).
November 21, 2013 Filing 455 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood:This case has been reassigned to the calendar of District Judge Andrea R. Wood. All previously set status dates and motion hearing dates are hereby stricken. The Court will set a date for a reassignment status conference by separate order. The parties are directed not to notice any motions for presentment prior to the reassignment status conference without first contacting chambers. Inquiries should be directed to the courtroom deputy before the motion is filed. Unless otherwise ordered by this Court, all other hearing dates, deadlines and schedules in effect as of the date of this Order remain in effect. To help the Court learn about the case, counsel for the parties shall confer and then prepare and file a joint Reassignment Status Report, not to exceed five pages, within 14 days of the entry of this Order. If defendants counsel has not yet filed an appearance, the Reassignment Status Report should be prepared by plaintiffs counsel. A template for the Reassignment Status Report, setting forth the information required, is attached to this Order and can be found on the Courts website at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood. (For further details, see attachment.)Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Reassignment Status Report) (gel, )
November 18, 2013 Filing 454 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that, pursuant to the Executive Committee Order entered on November 5, 2013, the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Andrea R. Wood, therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 300 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this order shall become effective on Tuesday, November 19, 2013. Case reassigned to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/18/2013. (ef, )
November 6, 2013 Filing 453 MINUTE entry before Honorable Milton I. Shadur: On the parties' oral motion, status hearing set for 11/7/2013 is stricken and reset to 1/31/2014 at 9:00 A.M. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
October 21, 2013 Filing 452 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 7/8/13 before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Court Reporter Contact Information: TRACEY D. McCULLOUGH, 312-435-5570, Tracey_Mccullough@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 11/12/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/20/2014. (Mccullough, Tracey)
October 7, 2013 Filing 451 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Telephonic discovery conference held regarding the upcoming Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of Caterpillar. Mailed notice (tlp, )
October 2, 2013 Filing 450 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 09-12-13 before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Court Reporter Contact Information: Krista Burgeson, krista_burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/23/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/4/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/31/2013. (Burgeson, Krista)
September 24, 2013 Filing 449 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: The minute entry of 9/23/2013 #448 is corrected as follows: The court and the parties will have a conference call on 10/7/2013 at 12:00 PM to discuss the further Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of an additional Caterpillar witness. The order shall stand in all other respects.Mailed notice (jms, )
September 23, 2013 Filing 448 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion to produce adequately prepared Rule 30(B)(6) witness #389 is granted in part and denied in part as discussed in court. As explained on the record, both parties have made plausible arguments in support of their respective position. Thus, it seems that it is an appropriate exercise of the court's discretion to order a second Rule 30(b)(6) deposition. The defendant has agreed to designate as the 30(b)(6) witness the individual discussed in court today. The parties should actively work together to fashion the Rule 30(b)(6) notice for this deposition that will permit appropriate inquiries regarding the core issue in this case as discussed in court, namely whether Caterpillar utilized material, data, information, drawings, etc. provided over the years by the plaintiff in the design of the product that is in issue. The question of the permissibility of the usage, if any, by Caterpillar of information provided by Miller, is a separate question to be resolved at trial or through summary judgment. Any claim by Caterpillar that it was authorized to use some or all of the information provided by Miller is, for purposes of discovery, analytically unrelated to the question of whether Caterpillar was entitled to use the information. The court and the parties will have a conference call on 11/7/2013 at 12:00 pm to discuss the further Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of an additional Caterpillar witness. Miller's Motion for Sanctions #418 is denied.Mailed notice (jms, )
September 12, 2013 Filing 447 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Motion hearing held. Defendant's motion to compel responses to its 3rdrd set of interrogatories #381 is granted in part and denied in part as discussed on the record. The parties may, if they choose, submit a joint order reflecting the rulings today. Otherwise, the transcript shall stand as the order. During the course of the extended argument, Caterpillar's counsel expressed concern about the phrase, "including the following" or other equivalent phrases using the word "including" in itemizing specific documents, events, parties, etc. In legal parlance, the word "include" or "including" does not signify an exclusive listing but merely those items that are part of a broader but related set of items. Phrased differently, the use of the word include can signal that the list that follows is meant to be illustrative rather than exhaustive. See 2A N. Singer & J. Singer, Sutherland "Statutory Construction" 47.7, p. 305 (7th ed.2007); Samantar v. Yousuf, 130 S.Ct. 2278, 2287 -2288(2010). If other significant or specific instances or idenitifications beyond those listed in answers to interrogatories discussed today will be utilized at trial, the plaintiff must supplement its answers to those interrogatories discussed today in order for the answers to be complete. See Rule 26(e).Mailed notice (jms, )
August 27, 2013 Filing 446 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: The parties are directed to submit their briefs and exhibits to the pending motions on a thumb drive or cd to Room 1010 forthwith.Mailed notice (jms, )
August 23, 2013 Filing 444 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 8/23/2013:Mailed notice(jms, )
August 23, 2013 Filing 443 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Treating Caterpillars letter of October 12, 2013 as a motion for reconsideration of the August 8, 2013 ruling, the motion is denied. Caterpillars two-page letter of August 12, 2013 and Millers two-page letter of August 12, 2013 and Caterpillars letter of August 14, 2013 and Millers letter of August 15, 2013 all of which total 7 single-spaced pages shall be filed immediately with the Clerk of the Court so that they will be included on the docket. ENTER MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER.Mailed notice (jms, )
August 22, 2013 Filing 445 AGREED Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 8/22/2013. Mailed notice(vcf, )
August 22, 2013 Filing 442 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole:The parties' agreed motion to appoint D4Discovery as independent expert #440 is granted. Mailed notice (jms, )
August 21, 2013 Filing 441 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion to appoint expert #440 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 8/26/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
August 21, 2013 Filing 440 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to appoint expert Agreed Motion to Appoint D4 Discovery as New Independent Citrix System Expert (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Baker, Gregory)
August 20, 2013 Filing 439 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion to compel #389 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 9/23/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
August 19, 2013 Filing 433 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion to compel #381 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 9/12/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
August 16, 2013 Filing 438 LETTER from Gregory L Baker attorney for Plaintiff's Miller UK Ltd., Miller International Ltd dated August 12, 2013. (ao,)
August 16, 2013 Filing 437 LETTER from Inbal Hasbani attorney for Plaintiff's Miller UK Ltd., Miller International Ltd. dated August 15, 2013. (ao,)
August 16, 2013 Filing 436 LETTER from Gregory L Baker attorney for Plaintiff's Miller UK Ltd., Miller International Ltd dated August 14, 2013. (ao,)
August 16, 2013 Filing 435 LETTER from Inbal Hasbani, attorney for Plaintiff's Miller UK Ltd., Miller International Ltd. dated August 13, 2013. (ao,)
August 16, 2013 Filing 434 EXHIBITS K and L by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. (ao,)
August 15, 2013 Filing 432 LETTER by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. in Reference to Docket No. #431 (Oslan, Reed)
August 14, 2013 Filing 431 LETTER by Caterpillar, Inc. in Reference to Docket Number #430 (Baker, Gregory)
August 13, 2013 Filing 430 LETTER by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. in Reference to Docket Number #429 (Oslan, Reed)
August 12, 2013 Filing 429 LETTER by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. in reference to docket no. #364 . (Baker, Gregory) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office.) (ao, ).
August 9, 2013 Filing 428 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Exhibit K, Exhibit L regarding memorandum, #366 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L)(Baker, Gregory)
August 8, 2013 Filing 427 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Hearing on defendant's motion to compel litigation funding documents #364 held. The plaintiff shall submit in camera the documents discussed in court, by 8/16/2013. Mailed notice (jms, )
July 31, 2013 Filing 426 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Defendant's motion for leave to file a corrected Exhibit 3 to its motion for sanctions for discovery misconduct #410 is withdrawn. The defendant's notice of motion for Room 1838 is incorrect. The court was relocated to Courtroom 1003 on October 1, 2012. In order to avoid confusion in the future, counsel is requested to make the appropriate changes to notices of motion.Mailed notice (jms, )
July 29, 2013 Filing 425 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Sealed Exhibit 7 regarding reply to response to motion, #424 (Baker, Gregory)
July 29, 2013 Filing 424 REPLY by Caterpillar, Inc. to MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for sanctions Caterpillar's Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs for Discovery Misconduct, Including Failing to Comply with the Court-Ordered Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition #418 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8, #2 Exhibit 9)(Baker, Gregory)
July 29, 2013 Filing 423 EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Partially Redacted Version of Exhibit 1 regarding exhibit, #419 (Baker, Gregory)
July 29, 2013 Filing 422 REPLY by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to motion to compel #389 Caterpillar to Produce an Adequately-Prepared 30(b)(6) Deponent and for Reasonable Expenses and Attorneys' Fees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Oslan, Reed)
July 29, 2013 Filing 421 RESPONSE by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for sanctions Caterpillar's Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs for Discovery Misconduct, Including Failing to Comply with the Court-Ordered Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition #418 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Oslan, Reed)
July 29, 2013 Filing 420 REPLY by Caterpillar, Inc. to MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to compel MOTION OF CATERPILLAR INC.TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO ITS THIRD SET OF INTERROGATORIES #381 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Baker, Gregory)
July 29, 2013 Filing 419 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Seal Exhibit 1 regarding MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for sanctions Caterpillar's Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs for Discovery Misconduct, Including Failing to Comply with the Court-Ordered Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition #418 (Baker, Gregory)
July 29, 2013 Filing 418 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for sanctions Caterpillar's Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs for Discovery Misconduct, Including Failing to Comply with the Court-Ordered Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6)(Baker, Gregory)
July 29, 2013 Filing 417 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole:The court has reviewed Mr. Baker's email (sent on behalf of the parties) regarding which documents and portions thereof can be unsealed. Unfortunately, the clerk's office does not have a mechanism to unseal (or conversely to seal) portions of documents. Therefore, the defendant's current motion for sanctions will be deemed withdrawn without prejudice to its refiling, as will the plaintiffs' response brief and Caterpillar's reply brief. The parties shall re-file the motion and successive, related filings as follows: Caterpillar's appropriately redacted motion and supporting memorandum, consistent with the court's and the parties' discussions about the scope of redactions, will be refiled, along with the unredacted/sealed versions of those documents. Miller's appropriately redacted response brief will be refiled along with the unredacted/sealed version. This will be followed by Caterpillar's appropriately redacted reply and unredacted/sealed reply brief. The parties may not substantively change their briefs.Mailed notice (jms, )
July 29, 2013 Filing 416 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion for leave to file, #410 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 8/1/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
July 29, 2013 Filing 415 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Hearing on defendant's motion for leave to file a motion to file corrected Exhibit 3 to Caterpillar's motion for sanctions against plaintiffs for discovery misconduct is stricken for failure to comply with Local Rule 5.2(f).Mailed notice (jms, )
July 26, 2013 Filing 414 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 07/02/2013 before the Honorable Milton I. Shadur. Court Reporter Contact Information: Rosemary Scarpelli, (312_435-5815, Rosemary_Scarpelli@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/16/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/26/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2013. (Scarpelli, Rosemary)
July 26, 2013 Filing 413 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion for leave to file, #410 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 7/30/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
July 25, 2013 Filing 412 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: The minute entry of 7/25/2013 409 is withdrawn.Mailed notice (jms, )
July 25, 2013 Filing 411 NOTICE by Caterpillar, Inc. re MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for leave to file Motion for Leave to File Corrected Exhibit 3 to Caterpillar's Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs for Discovery Misconduct, Including Failing to Comply with the Court-Ordered Rule 30(B) #410 (Baker, Gregory)
July 25, 2013 Filing 410 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for leave to file Motion for Leave to File Corrected Exhibit 3 to Caterpillar's Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs for Discovery Misconduct, Including Failing to Comply with the Court-Ordered Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition [Related to Docket No. 308] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Ex. 3)(Baker, Gregory)
July 25, 2013 Filing 409 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Magistrate Judge Status hearing held. A further status date will be on 8/8/13 when the parties are here on the pending discovery issue of the discoverability of litigation funding documents. By agreement of the parties, the briefs relating to the motions for sanctions for discovery misconduct and to compel Miller to produce an adequately prepared Rule 30(b)(6) witness are to be unsealed. The order of The court notes that this was done by both sides with each other. The Clerk of Court is directed to unseal docket numbers #292 , #293 , #307 , #314 , #321 , #379 , #387 , #391 , and #392 . At the hearing today, Caterpillar's counsel expressed concern that the order of 7/17/13 403 -- which noted "an excessive and unwarranted use of redactions of material that would not seem by any stretch of the imagination to qualify for Under Seal filing" -- appeared to relate solely to Caterpillar when in fact Miller had done exactly the same thing. Fairly read, the order did not focus on Caterpillar and applied equally to Miller. For example, the order required "the parties" to appear on 7/25/13 at 8:30 a.m. to show cause why the briefs that have been filed under seal should not be unsealed. Indeed, the order, itself, spoke to the "successive filings," following Caterpillar's motions for sanctions and, as noted above, was addressed "to the parties," both of whom were ordered to show cause why their filings should not be unsealed. In short, the order was not directed only to redactions by Caterpillar but was intended to apply equally to Miller. Mailed notice (jms, )
July 22, 2013 Filing 408 REPLY by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to motion to compel #364 , sealed document, #365 Reply Brief In Support Of Motion Of Caterpillar Inc. To Compel Litigation Funding Documents Responsive To Its Sixth Set Of Document Requests (Baker, Gregory)
July 19, 2013 Filing 407 RESPONSE by Caterpillar, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to compel Caterpillar to Produce an Adequately-Prepared 30(b)(6) Deponent and for Reasonable Expenses and Attorney Fees #389 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Baker, Gregory)
July 19, 2013 Filing 406 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. Exhibits B, C, H, I, K to Miller's Opposition to Caterpillar's Motion to Compel Answers to its Third Set of Interrogatories (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit H, #3 Exhibit I, #4 Exhibit K)(Oslan, Reed)
July 19, 2013 Filing 405 MEMORANDUM by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. in Opposition to motion to compel #381 Answers to Its Third Set of Interrogatories (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Oslan, Reed)
July 19, 2013 Filing 404 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: The parties' request to reset the hearing on defendant's motion to compel litigation funding documents #364 is granted. Hearing on defendant's motion to compel litigation funding documents is reset for 8/8/2013 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (jms, )
July 17, 2013 Filing 403 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: There is presently pending before the court Caterpillar's Motion for Sanctions against plaintiff for discovery misconduct. #309 . That motion and successive filings were filed under seal with a redacted copy filed as part of the public record as required by Seventh Circuit precedents. Parenthetically, it may be noted that Miller did not file a response to the motion, itself, in unredacted form, but only under seal. See #314 . See the discussion in United Auto. Ins. Co. v. Veluchamy, 2010 WL 889980, 2 -3 (N.D.Ill. 2010). A review of the documents, however, reveals an excessive and unwarranted use of redactions of material that would not seem by any stretch of the imagination to qualify for Under Seal filing. The same issue was discussed at the last status conference in connection with another of Caterpillar's filings. That the plaintiff may have acquiesced in these filings does not, of course, make them proper. Nor does the court's prior order granting motion to file under seal preclude sua sponte review. All judges make mistakes. Fujisawa Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. v. Kapoor, 115 F.3d 1332 (1997). But once realized, the mistakes ought to be promptly corrected. Accordingly, the parties shall appear on 7/25/13 at 8:30 a.m. to show cause why the briefs that have been filed under seal should not be unsealed.Mailed notice(jms, )
July 10, 2013 Filing 402 RESPONSE by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to compel Motion of Caterpillar Inc. to Compel Litigation Funding Documents Responsive to Its Sixt Set of Document Requests #364 (Oslan, Reed)
July 9, 2013 Filing 401 MEMORANDUM by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. in Support of its Motion to Compel Caterpillar to Produce an Adequately-Prepared 30(b)(6) Deponent and for Reasonable Expenses and Attorneys' Fees [Redactions Corrected pursuant to Docket Entry 400] (Oslan, Reed)
July 8, 2013 Filing 400 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion to permanently seal Exhibit I in support of plaintiff's motion to compel and the memorandum in support #393 is denied except as to the chart at the top of page 11 and up to the sentence beginning with "document containing..."Mailed notice (jms, )
July 2, 2013 Filing 399 NOTICE of Motion by Justin A Barker for presentment of motion to seal document #393 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 7/8/2013 at 08:30 AM. (Barker, Justin)
July 2, 2013 Filing 398 MINUTE entry before Honorable Milton I. Shadur: Status hearing held on 7/2/2013 and continued to 11/7/2013 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
July 2, 2013 Filing 397 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Status hearing date of 7/2/2013 is stricken. All other previously set dates shall stand.Mailed notice (jms, )
July 1, 2013 Filing 396 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: The parties' motions to file documents under seal [ #377 & #385 ] are granted. Plaintiff's motion to compel defendant to produce an adequately prepared 30(B)(6) deponent and for reasonable fees and expenses #389 and defendant's motion to compel answers to its third set of interrogatories are taken under advisement. Responses are to be filed by 7/19/2013. Replies are to be filed by 7/29/2013. Mailed notice (jms, )
July 1, 2013 Filing 395 CORRECTED MEMORANDUM AND EXHIBIT by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. in Support of its Motion to Compel Caterpillar to Produce an Adequately-Prepared 30(b)(6) Deponent and for Reasonable Expenses and Attorneys' Fees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(Barker, Justin)
July 1, 2013 Filing 394 NOTICE OF MOTION by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to Permanently Seal Certain Documents Filed in Connection with Docket No. #392 [See Motion at Docket No. #393 ] (Barker, Justin)
July 1, 2013 Filing 393 MOTION by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to Permanently Seal Certain Documents Filed in Connection with Docket No. #392 . (Barker, Justin) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office.)
June 28, 2013 Filing 392 MEMORANDUM by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. in Support of Motion to Compel Caterpillar to Produce an Adequately-Prepared 30(b)(6) Deponent and for Reasonable Expenses and Attorneys' Fees [Partially Redacted Version of Docket Entry 391] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Barker, Justin)
June 28, 2013 Filing 391 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Caterpillar to Produce an Adequately-Prepared 30(b)(6) Deponent and for Reasonable Expenses and Attorneys' Fees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Errata E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Barker, Justin)
June 28, 2013 Filing 390 NOTICE of Motion by Justin A Barker for presentment of motion to compel #389 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 7/3/2013 at 08:30 AM. (Barker, Justin)
June 28, 2013 Filing 389 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to compel Caterpillar to Produce an Adequately-Prepared 30(b)(6) Deponent and for Reasonable Expenses and Attorney Fees (Barker, Justin)
June 28, 2013 Filing 388 Combined Rule 37.2 Report Prescribed by the Court's 2.7.2013 Order [Dkt. #337] to Accompany Miller's Motion to Compel Discovery of an Adequately Prepared Witness by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. [Partially Redacted Version of Docket Entry 387] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Barker, Justin)
June 28, 2013 Filing 387 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. re Combined Rule 37.2 Report Prescribed by the Court's 2.7.2013 Order [Dkt# 337] to Accompany Miller's Motion to Compel Discovery of an Adequately Prepared Witness (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Barker, Justin)
June 28, 2013 Filing 386 NOTICE of Motion by Justin A Barker for presentment of motion for leave to file, #385 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 7/3/2013 at 08:30 AM. (Barker, Justin)
June 28, 2013 Filing 385 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for leave to file Under Seal Documents regarding Motion of Miller to Compel Caterpillar to Produce an Adequately-Prepared 30(b)(6) Deponent and for Reasonable Expenses and Attorneys' Fees (Barker, Justin)
June 28, 2013 Filing 384 NOTICE by Caterpillar, Inc. re MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to compel MOTION OF CATERPILLAR INC.TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO ITS THIRD SET OF INTERROGATORIES #381 NOTICE OF PRESENTMENT OF MOTION OF CATERPILLAR INC. TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO ITS THIRD SET OF INTERROGATORIES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Gregory)
June 28, 2013 Filing 383 MEMORANDUM motion to compel #381 by Caterpillar, Inc. MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF CATERPILLAR INC. TO COMPELANSWERS TO ITS THIRD SET OF INTERROGATORIES [Partially Redacted Version of Docket Entry 382] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Baker, Gregory)
June 28, 2013 Filing 382 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF CATERPILLAR INC. TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO ITS THIRD SET OF INTERROGATORIES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Baker, Gregory)
June 28, 2013 Filing 381 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to compel MOTION OF CATERPILLAR INC.TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO ITS THIRD SET OF INTERROGATORIES (Baker, Gregory)
June 28, 2013 Filing 380 COMBINED RULE 37.2 REPORT PRESCRIBED BYTHE COURTS FEBRUARY 7, 2013 ORDER [DKT. NO. 337] TO ACCOMPANY CATERPILLARS MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO ITS THIRD SET OF INTERROGATORIES [Partially Redacted Version of Docket Entry 379] by Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Baker, Gregory)
June 28, 2013 Filing 379 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. COMBINED RULE 37.2 REPORT PRESCRIBED BY THE COURTS FEBRUARY 7, 2013 ORDER [DKT. NO. 337] TO ACCOMPANY CATERPILLARS MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO ITS THIRD SET OF INTERROGATORIES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Baker, Gregory)
June 28, 2013 Filing 378 NOTICE by Caterpillar, Inc. re MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to seal MOTION OF CATERPILLAR INC. FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEALDOCUMENTS REGARDING MOTION OF CATERPILLAR INC. TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO ITS THIRD SET OF INTERROGATORIES #377 (Baker, Gregory)
June 28, 2013 Filing 377 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to seal MOTION OF CATERPILLAR INC. FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEALDOCUMENTS REGARDING MOTION OF CATERPILLAR INC. TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO ITS THIRD SET OF INTERROGATORIES (Baker, Gregory)
June 25, 2013 Filing 376 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 7/31/2012 before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Court Reporter Contact Information: Pamela S. Warren https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/Transcript-Order-Form.aspx.

< Redaction Request due 7/16/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/26/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2013. (Warren, Pamela)
June 25, 2013 Filing 375 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 7/9/2012 before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Court Reporter Contact Information: Pamela S. Warren https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/Transcript-Order-Form.aspx.

< Redaction Request due 7/16/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/26/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2013. (Warren, Pamela)
June 25, 2013 Filing 374 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/14/2012 before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Court Reporter Contact Information: Pamela S. Warren https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/Transcript-Order-Form.aspx.

< Redaction Request due 7/16/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/26/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2013. (Warren, Pamela)
June 25, 2013 Filing 373 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5/14/2012 before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Court Reporter Contact Information: Pamela S. Warren https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/Transcript-Order-Form.aspx.

< Redaction Request due 7/16/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/26/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2013. (Warren, Pamela)
June 25, 2013 Filing 372 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5/8/2012 before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Court Reporter Contact Information: Pamela S. Warren https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/Transcript-Order-Form.aspx.

< Redaction Request due 7/16/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/26/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2013. (Warren, Pamela)
June 25, 2013 Filing 371 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2/21/2012 before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Court Reporter Contact Information: Pamela S. Warren https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/Transcript-Order-Form.aspx.

< Redaction Request due 7/16/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/26/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2013. (Warren, Pamela)
June 25, 2013 Filing 370 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 1/24/2012 before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Court Reporter Contact Information: Pamela S. Warren https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/Transcript-Order-Form.aspx.

< Redaction Request due 7/16/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/26/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2013. (Warren, Pamela)
June 23, 2013 Filing 369 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 01/14/2013 before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Court Reporter Contact Information: Pamela S. Warren https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/Transcript-Order-Form.aspx.

< Redaction Request due 7/15/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/24/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2013. (Warren, Pamela)
June 21, 2013 Filing 368 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: The court adopts the parties' briefing and hearing schedule.Defendant's motion to compel litigation funding documents #364 is taken under advisement. Response is to be filed by 7/10/2013. Reply is to be filed by 7/22/2013. Hearing on defendant's motion to compel litigation funding documents #364 is set for 7/29/2013 at 09:30 AM.Mailed notice (jms, ) Modified on 6/25/2013 (jms, ).
June 20, 2013 Filing 367 NOTICE by Caterpillar, Inc. re MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to compel Motion of Caterpillar Inc. to Compel Litigation Funding Documents Responsive to Its Sixt Set of Document Requests #364 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Gregory)
June 20, 2013 Filing 366 MEMORANDUM motion to compel #364 by Caterpillar, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Motion of Caterpillar Inc. to Compel Litigation Funding Documents Responsive to Its Sixth Set of Document Requests [Partially Redacted Version of Docket Entry 365] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Baker, Gregory)
June 20, 2013 Filing 365 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Motion of Caterpillar Inc. to Compel Litigation Funding Documents Responsive to Its Sixth Set of Document Requests (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit H, #7 Exhibit I, #8 Exhibit J)(Baker, Gregory)
June 20, 2013 Filing 364 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to compel Motion of Caterpillar Inc. to Compel Litigation Funding Documents Responsive to Its Sixt Set of Document Requests (Baker, Gregory)
June 20, 2013 Filing 363 RULE 37.2 Combined Report Prescribed by the Court's February 7, 2013 Order [Dkt. No. #337 ] to Accompany Caterpillar's Motion to Compel Litigation Funding Documents Responsive to Its Sixth Set of Document Requests by Caterpillar, Inc. [Partially Redacted Version of Docket Entry 362] (Baker, Gregory) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office.) (lp, ).
June 20, 2013 Filing 362 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Combined Rule 37.2 Report Prescribed by the Court's February 7, 2013 Order [Dkt. No. 337] to Accompany Caterpillar's Motion to Compel Litigation Funding Documents Responsive to Its Sixth Set of Document Requests (Baker, Gregory)
June 20, 2013 Filing 361 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Defendant's motion for leave to file under seal additional documents regarding motion to compel litigation funding documents responive to its sixth set of document requests #359 is granted. Mailed notice (jms, )
June 19, 2013 Filing 360 NOTICE by Caterpillar, Inc. re MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to seal document Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Leave to File Under Seal Additional Documents regarding Motion to Compel Litigation Funding Documents Responsive to Its Sixth Set of Document Requests #359 (Baker, Gregory)
June 19, 2013 Filing 359 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to seal document Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Leave to File Under Seal Additional Documents regarding Motion to Compel Litigation Funding Documents Responsive to Its Sixth Set of Document Requests (Baker, Gregory)
June 18, 2013 Filing 358 NOTICE by Caterpillar, Inc. re MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to seal document Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Leave to File Under Seal Documents Regarding Motion to Compel Litigation Funding Documents Responsive to Its Sixth Set of Document Requests #357 (Baker, Gregory)
June 18, 2013 Filing 357 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to seal document Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Leave to File Under Seal Documents Regarding Motion to Compel Litigation Funding Documents Responsive to Its Sixth Set of Document Requests (Baker, Gregory)
June 11, 2013 Filing 356 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Status hearing date of 6/11/2013 is reset for 7/2/2013 at 09:30 AM after Judge Shadur's call. Mr. Baker may appear by telephone by calling 312-777-3816.Mailed notice (jms, )
April 29, 2013 Filing 354 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Enter agreed order regarding defendant's motion for reconsideration. [For further detail see separate order(s).] Mailed notice (lp, )
April 29, 2013 Filing 353 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Magistrate Judge Status hearing held and continued to 6/11/2013 at 10:00 AM. Mr. Baker may appear by telephone and if he desires to do so, he should call 312-777-3816. If more than one attorney wishes to appear by telephone, counsel will need to make a conference call to the number listed in this order. Mailed notice (jms, )
April 28, 2013 Filing 355 AGREED Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 4/29/2013: (lp, )
April 26, 2013 Filing 352 MINUTE entry before Honorable Milton I. Shadur: Status hearing set for 7/2/2013 at 9:00 A.M. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
April 17, 2013 Filing 351 MINUTE entry before Honorable Milton I. Shadur: Terry L. Sullivan's Motion to appear pro hac vice #345 is granted. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
April 8, 2013 Filing 350 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Motion hearing held. Defendant's motion reconsideration as applied to request #18 is granted in part and denied in part as discussed in court. The parties shall provide a draft order setting forth the specific rulings made in court today. Status hearing date of 4/17/2013 is reset 4/29/2013 at 10:00 am for report on where parties stand on the narrow issue. Mailed notice (jms, )
March 19, 2013 Filing 349 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration and/or Clarification is set for oral argument #342 on 4/8/13 at 10:45 a.m.Mailed notice (yp, )
March 18, 2013 Filing 348 REPLY by Caterpillar, Inc. to MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for reconsideration Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Reconsideration and/or Clarification of Sections A, F, & G of the Court's February 7, 2013 Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' Mo #342 (Baker, Gregory)
March 12, 2013 Filing 347 Notice of Cancellation of Presentment by Caterpillar, Inc. (Baker, Gregory)
March 11, 2013 Filing 346 RESPONSE by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for reconsideration Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Reconsideration and/or Clarification of Sections A, F, & G of the Court's February 7, 2013 Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' Mo #342 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Oslan, Reed)
February 28, 2013 Filing 345 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-8096461. (Sullivan, Terry)
February 27, 2013 Filing 344 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. by Eric Lansing White (White, Eric)
February 21, 2013 Filing 343 NOTICE by Caterpillar, Inc. re MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for reconsideration Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Reconsideration and/or Clarification of Sections A, F, & G of the Court's February 7, 2013 Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' Mo #342 (Baker, Gregory)
February 21, 2013 Filing 342 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for reconsideration Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Reconsideration and/or Clarification of Sections A, F, & G of the Court's February 7, 2013 Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents, and for Confirmation of the Temporal Scope of Certain Requests (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Baker, Gregory)
February 14, 2013 Filing 341 JOINT Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 2/14/2013:(lp, )
February 14, 2013 Filing 340 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: The court adopts the parties' expert discovery schedule. The parties shall comply with FRCP 26(a)(2) by March 14, 2014. All expert discovery shall be completed by August 15, 2014. [For further detail see separate order(s).] Mailed notice (lp, )
February 14, 2013 Filing 339 Caterpillar's Submission Regarding Possible Court-Appointed Expert Pursuant to Opinion and Order Dated February 7, 2013 by Caterpillar, Inc. (Baker, Gregory)
February 8, 2013 Filing 338 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: This will amend the memorandum opinion of 2/7/2013 #337 : The costs to be incurred for an independent expert will initially be shared equally by the parties. Should the experts assessment suffice to show the representations made in Caterpillars undue burden objections were inaccurate, Miller may then make application to have Caterpillar to reimburse it for it's share of the costs. Of course, the parties are free to work out whatever accommodation they wish regarding production of the outstanding documents requests to which an undue burden objection has been raised.Mailed notice (jms, )
February 7, 2013 Filing 337 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 2/7/2013:Mailed notice(jms, )
February 7, 2013 Filing 336 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: The plaintiffs motion to compel [#267] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. ENTER MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Mailed notice (jms, )
January 29, 2013 Filing 335 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Magistrate Judge Status hearing held and continued to 4/17/2013 at 09:00 AM. Plaintiff's oral motion to extend discovery schedule set on 1/24/2012 [#172,#173] is granted. All fact discovery shall be completed by 1/31/2014. Plaintiff shall comply with FRCP 26(a)(2) by 3/14/2014. Defendant shall comply with FRCP 26(a)(2) by 5/15/2014. The parties should not hesitate to call chambers at 312-435-5601 if any issues arise during depositions. The parties are given to 2/12/2013 to file a schedule for expert depositions. Mailed notice (jms, ) Modified on 2/1/2013 (jms, ).
January 22, 2013 Filing 334 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Sua sponte, status hearing date of 1/22/2013 is reset for 1/29/2013 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (jms, )
January 14, 2013 Filing 333 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Magistrate Judge status hearing held and continued to 1/22/2013 at 8:30 a.m. Parties are to appear in person at the next status hearing. If the parties have not agreed on search terms, the court will appoint an outside expert to do so, In re High Fructose Corn Syrup Antitrust Litigation 295 F.3d 651, 665 (7th Cir. 2002), with the parties to bear the costs equally. Each of the parties are within the next seven days to submit to chambers the names of two experts who have the kind of engineering expertise involved in this case and sufficient computer expertise to make informed assessment about the issues that have thus far not been able to be resolved by the parties. Mailed notice (tlp, )
January 10, 2013 Filing 332 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Unopposed Motion of Caterpillar to Unseal Portions of August 22, 2012 Hearing Transcript is #328 granted. Mailed notice (tlp, ) Modified on 1/10/2013 (Main Document 332 replaced on 1/10/2013) (tlp, ).
January 8, 2013 Filing 329 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion to unseal document #328 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 1/14/2013 at 10:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
January 8, 2013 Filing 328 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to unseal document Unopposed Motion of Caterpillar Inc. to Unseal Portions of August 22, 2012 Hearing Transcript (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Baker, Gregory)
January 7, 2013 Filing 331 LETTER from Justin A. Barker dated 12/20/2012. (Exhibit) (lp, )
January 4, 2013 Filing 327 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole:The parties telephonic request to reset the telephone status hearing date of 1/7/2013 to 1/14/2013 at 10:00 AM.Mailed notice (jms, )
December 28, 2012 Filing 330 LETTER from Gregory L. Baker dated 12/21/2012. (Exhibit) (lp, )
December 21, 2012 Filing 326 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Telephonic magistrate Judge Status hearing held and continued to 1/7/2013 at 10:30 AM.Mailed notice (jms, )
December 21, 2012 Filing 325 RESPONSE by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for sanctions Caterpillar's Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs for Discovery Misconduct, Including Failing to Comply with the Court-Ordered Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition [Partially Redacted Version of Docke #308 Supplemental Filing in Opposition (Oslan, Reed)
December 20, 2012 Filing 324 SUPPLEMENT to Sealed motion, #307 , motion for sanctions, #308 (Baker, Gregory)
December 17, 2012 Filing 323 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Oral argument held on defendant's motion regarding the recent Rule 30(B)(6) deposition of Miller #307 . With regard to the plaintiff's motion to compel Caterpillar to produce documents #267 -- which was fully briefed at the end of September -- some preliminary comments prior to a formal ruling are in order. First, discovery, the bane of modern litigation, Rossetto v. Pabst Brewing Co., Inc., 217 F.3d 539, 542 (7th Cir. 2000)(Posner, J.), has ultimate and necessary boundaries. Hickman v. Taylor, 329 U.S. 495, 507 (1947). The discovery rules are not an excursion ticket to an unlimited, never-ending exploration of every conceivable matter that captures an attorney's interest. Parties are entitled to a reasonable opportunity to investigate the facts-and no more. Vakharia v. Swedish Covenant Hosp., 1994 WL 75055 at *2 (N.D.Ill.1994)(Moran,J.). See also Sommerfield v. City of Chicago, 613 F.Supp.2d 1004, 1020 (N.D.Ill.2009). Whether or not the plaintiff's requests for production are excessive, irrelevant, and unduly burdensome as the defendant contends will be decided in due course, consistent with the demands of other cases. But what is clear is Caterpillar, while objecting to the requests, has agreed to produce some of the materials sought by Miller. It would also appear that the documents that Caterpillar is willing to produce are significant and will go far towards either supporting or undercutting Miller's claim of trade secret misappropriation. What is not clear is whether production of those documents Caterpillar has agreed to produce (as explained in its opposition to the motion to compel #291 ) has proceeded. If it has not, Caterpillar is ordered to begin production immediately on a rolling basis of those materials. Neither the production by Caterpillar nor the receipt of these documents by Miller will constitute a waiver by Caterpillar of the balance of the objections or a waiver by Miller through accepting at this point less than the total of what it has demanded. Finally, while the scope of relevancy under Rule 26 is broad, Jackson v. N'Genuity Enterprises Co. 2010 WL 4928912, 1 (N.D.Ill.,2010), the Supreme Court has cautioned that the requirement of Rule 26(b)(1) that the material sought in discovery be relevant should be firmly applied, and the district courts should not neglect their power to restrict discovery where justice requires [protection for] a party or person from annoyance, embarrassment, oppression, or undue burden or expense.... Rule 26(c). With this authority at hand, judges should not hesitate to exercise appropriate control over the discovery process. Herbert v. Lando, 441 U.S. 153 (1979). Failure to exercise that control results in enormous costs to the litigants and to the due administration of justice. Cf. Bell Atlantic Corp. v. Twombly, 550 U.S. 544 (2007); Frank Easterbrook, Discovery as Abuse, 69 B.U.L.Rev. 635 (1989).Mailed notice (jms, )
December 13, 2012 Filing 322 REPLY by Caterpillar, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Caterpillar's Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs for Discovery Misconduct, Including Failing to Comply with the Court-Ordered Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition #307 , MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for sanctions Caterpillar's Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs for Discovery Misconduct, Including Failing to Comply with the Court-Ordered Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition [Partially Redacted Version of Docke #308 [Partially Redacted Version of Docket Entry 321] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit 8, #3 Exhibit 9)(Baker, Gregory)
December 13, 2012 Filing 321 SEALED REPLY by Caterpillar, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Caterpillar's Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs for Discovery Misconduct, Including Failing to Comply with the Court-Ordered Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition #307 , MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for sanctions Caterpillar's Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs for Discovery Misconduct, Including Failing to Comply with the Court-Ordered Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition [Partially Redacted Version of Docke #308 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7)(Baker, Gregory)
December 11, 2012 Filing 320 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Defendant's motion to file its reply to the motion for sanctions under seal #318 is granted.Mailed notice (jms, )
December 7, 2012 Filing 319 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion to seal document, #318 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 12/12/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
December 7, 2012 Filing 318 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to seal document Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Leave to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs for Failing to Comply with Court-Ordered Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition (Baker, Gregory)
December 6, 2012 Filing 317 EXHIBIT E by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to Response to Caterpillar's Motion for Sanctions against Plaintiffs for Discovery Misconduct, Including Failing to Comply with the Court-Ordered Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition (314) (Oslan, Reed) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office.) (lp, ).
December 6, 2012 Filing 316 EXHIBIT B by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to Response to Caterpillar's Motion for Sanctions against Plaintiffs for Discovery Misconduct, Including Failing to Comply with the Court-Ordered Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition (314) (Oslan, Reed) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office.) (lp, ).
December 6, 2012 Filing 315 EXHIBIT A by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to Response to Caterpillar's Motion for Sanctions against Plaintiffs for Discovery Misconduct, Including Failing to Comply with the Court-Ordered Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition (314) (Oslan, Reed) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office.) (lp, ).
December 6, 2012 Filing 314 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. Response to Caterpillar's Motion for Sanctions against Plaintiffs for Discovery Misconduct, Including Failing to Comply with the Court-Ordered Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D)(Oslan, Reed)
December 5, 2012 Filing 313 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal documents regarding resposne to Caterpillar's motion for sanctions against plaintiff for discovery misconduct #311 is granted.Mailed notice (jms, )
December 3, 2012 Filing 312 NOTICE of Motion by Justin A Barker for presentment of (Barker, Justin)
December 3, 2012 Filing 311 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for leave to file Under Seal Documents regarding Resposne to Caterpillar's Motion for Sanctions against Plaintiff for Discovery Misconduct (Barker, Justin)
November 27, 2012 Filing 310 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 6/11/12 before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312)554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 12/18/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/28/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/25/2013. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
November 15, 2012 Filing 309 NOTICE by Caterpillar, Inc. re SEALED MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Caterpillar's Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs for Discovery Misconduct, Including Failing to Comply with the Court-Ordered Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition #307 , MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for sanctions Caterpillar's Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs for Discovery Misconduct, Including Failing to Comply with the Court-Ordered Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition [Partially Redacted Version of Docke #308 (Baker, Gregory)
November 15, 2012 Filing 308 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for sanctions Caterpillar's Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs for Discovery Misconduct, Including Failing to Comply with the Court-Ordered Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition [Partially Redacted Version of Docket Entry 307] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Baker, Gregory)
November 15, 2012 Filing 307 SEALED MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Caterpillar's Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs for Discovery Misconduct, Including Failing to Comply with the Court-Ordered Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Baker, Gregory)
November 14, 2012 Filing 306 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Motion hearing held. Defendant's motion regarding the recent Rule 30(B)(6) deposition of Miller is to be filed by 11/15/12. Response is to be filed by 12/6/2012. Reply is to be filed by 12/13/2012. Magistrate Judge Status hearing held and continued to 12/17/2012 at 9:00 am am at which time the court will hear oral argument on the 30(b)(6) motion. Mailed notice (jms, )
November 13, 2012 Filing 305 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Defendant's motion for leave to file unders eal documents regarding motion for sanctions against plaintiffs for failing to comply with court-ordered Rule 30(B)(6) depositions #303 is granted. The parties, however, are reminded to Local Rule 26.2 (amended October 2, 2012 regarding the need for parallel filings. See also United Auto Insurance Company v. Veluchamy 2010 West Law 889980,2-3 Northern District of IL.Mailed notice (jms, )
November 8, 2012 Filing 304 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion to seal document, #303 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 11/13/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
November 8, 2012 Filing 303 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to seal document Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Leave to File Under Seal Documents Regarding Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs for Failing to Comply with Court-Ordered Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition (Baker, Gregory)
November 2, 2012 Filing 302 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. by Kurt J. Keller (Keller, Kurt J.)
November 1, 2012 Filing 301 MINUTE entry before Honorable Milton I. Shadur: Kurt J. Keller is granted leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Caterpillar, Inc. ( #300 -1) Mailed notice (lp, )
October 30, 2012 Filing 300 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7704596. (Keller, Kurt J.)
October 29, 2012 Filing 299 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Telephonic conference held regarding the objections by the defendant to the responses being made by Miller's 30(b)(6) designated witness. Mailed notice (jms, )
October 18, 2012 Filing 298 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. by Bridget S. Merritt (Merritt, Bridget)
October 1, 2012 Filing 297 JOINT Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 10/1/2012: (lp, )
October 1, 2012 Filing 296 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Enter Joint Order. In accordance with the parties' request, the Court hereby appoints Project Leadership Associates as independent expert. Project Leadership Associates shall abide by the terms of the Order and carry out the duties prescribed therein. Project Leadership Associates shall provide its invoices for payment to Gregory L. Baker, counsel of record for Caterpillar, and submit a copy to the attention of the undersigned. [For further detail see separate order(s).] Mailed notice (lp, )
September 26, 2012 Filing 295 RESPONSE by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd.in Support of MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to compel Caterpillar to Produce Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Fourth Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things #267 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Oslan, Reed)
September 21, 2012 Filing 294 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Motion hearing held. Defendant's motion to compel court ordered Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of plaintiff #280 is granted. Mr. Moody's deposition shall be taken in Chicago. The parties are directed to contact chambers at 312-435-5601 if any issues arise during that (or any other) deposition.Mailed notice (jms, )
September 19, 2012 Filing 293 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Sealed Exhibit 15 regarding memorandum in opposition to motion, #291 (Baker, Gregory)
September 19, 2012 Filing 292 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. Sealed Exhibit 13 regarding memorandum in opposition to motion, #291 (Baker, Gregory)
September 19, 2012 Filing 291 MEMORANDUM by Caterpillar, Inc. in Opposition to motion to compel #267 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 16, #15 Exhibit 17, #16 Exhibit 18, #17 Exhibit 19)(Baker, Gregory)
September 18, 2012 Filing 290 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Defendant's motion for leave to file under seal document regarding opposition to motion to compel defendant to produce documents responsive to plaintiffs' fourth set of requests for the production of documents and things #287 is granted.Mailed notice (jms, )
September 17, 2012 Filing 289 RESPONSE by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to compel Motion of Caterpillar Inc. to Compel Court-Ordered Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition of Plaintiffs #280 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Oslan, Reed)
September 17, 2012 Filing 288 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion to seal document, #287 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 9/19/2012 at 10:00 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
September 17, 2012 Filing 287 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to seal document Unopposed Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Leave to File Under Seal Documents Regarding Opposition to Motion to Compel Caterpillar to Produce Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Fourth Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Baker, Gregory)
September 12, 2012 Filing 286 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Defendant's motion for extension of time to 9/19/2012 to file a response to plaintiffs' motion to compel production of documents to plaintiffs' 4th set of requests for the production of documents and things #283 is granted. Reply is to be filed by 9/26/2012.Mailed notice (jms, )
September 11, 2012 Filing 285 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Defendant's motion to compel court ordered Rule 30(b)(6) deposition #280 is taken under advisement. The court adopts the parties' briefing schedule request. Response is to be filed by 9/17/2012. Hearing on defendant's motion to compel court ordered Rule 30(b)(6) deposition is set for 9/21/2012 at 10:00 AM.Mailed notice (jms, )
September 10, 2012 Filing 284 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of extension of time, #283 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 9/13/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
September 10, 2012 Filing 283 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for extension of time Unopposed Motion of Caterpillar for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Caterpillar to Produce Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Fourth Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Baker, Gregory)
September 7, 2012 Filing 282 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion to compel #280 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 9/12/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
September 7, 2012 Filing 281 MEMORANDUM by Caterpillar, Inc. in support of motion to compel #280 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Baker, Gregory)
September 7, 2012 Filing 280 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to compel Motion of Caterpillar Inc. to Compel Court-Ordered Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition of Plaintiffs (Baker, Gregory)
September 7, 2012 Filing 279 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Defendant's motion for leave to file a 25 page brief #277 is granted.Mailed notice (jms, )
September 6, 2012 Filing 278 NOTICE of Motion by Gregory L Baker for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #277 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 9/11/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Baker, Gregory)
September 6, 2012 Filing 277 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for leave to file excess pages Unopposed Motion of Caterpillar Inc. for Additional Pages to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (Baker, Gregory)
August 31, 2012 Filing 276 MINUTE entry before Honorable Milton I. Shadur: Bridget Merritt is granted leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Caterpillar. ( #275 -1).Mailed notice (lp, )
August 31, 2012 Filing 275 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7507021. (Merritt, Bridget)
August 30, 2012 Filing 274 MINUTE entry before Honorable Milton I. Shadur:Motion to withdraw as attorney #271 is granted. Attorney Joshua Paul Deford terminated.Mailed notice (srn, )
August 29, 2012 Filing 273 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole:The parties telephonic request to brief the motion to compel #267 is granted. Response is to be filed by 9/14/2012. Reply is to be filed by 9/21/2012. Ruling is set for 11/14/2012 at 09:00 AM. Status hearing date of 10/23/2012 is reset for 11/14/2012 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (jms, )
August 29, 2012 Filing 272 NOTICE of Motion by Joshua Paul Deford for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #271 before Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 8/31/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Deford, Joshua)
August 29, 2012 Filing 271 MOTION by counsel for Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to withdraw as attorney (Deford, Joshua)
August 28, 2012 Filing 270 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Caterpillar to Produce Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Fourth Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit J, #3 Exhibit K, #4 Exhibit L, #5 Exhibit N, #6 Exhibit O)(Oslan, Reed)
August 28, 2012 Filing 269 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion to compel #267 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 8/31/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
August 28, 2012 Filing 268 MEMORANDUM by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. in support of motion to compel #267 Caterpillar to Produce Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Fourth Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Oslan, Reed)
August 28, 2012 Filing 267 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. to compel Caterpillar to Produce Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Fourth Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Oslan, Reed)
August 28, 2012 Filing 266 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: The transcript of the 8/22/12 hearing is hereby ordered sealed except that counsel for the parties may have access to it without further order of court.Mailed notice (jms, )
August 28, 2012 Filing 265 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under Seal documents regarding plaintiffs' motion to compel Caterpillar to produce documents responsive to plaintiffs' fourth set of requests for production of documents and things #263 is granted. Mailed notice (jms, )
August 23, 2012 Filing 264 NOTICE of Motion by Reed S. Oslan for presentment of motion for leave to file, #263 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 8/28/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Oslan, Reed)
August 23, 2012 Filing 263 MOTION by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. for leave to file under Seal Documents regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Caterpillar to Produce Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs' Fourth Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Oslan, Reed)
August 23, 2012 Filing 262 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. by Inbal Hasbani (Hasbani, Inbal)
August 22, 2012 Filing 261 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. regarding Ex. A to 8/15/2012 letter (Oslan, Reed)
August 22, 2012 Filing 260 LETTERS by Miller International Ltd., Miller UK Ltd. dated 8/15/2012 and 8/16/2012 (Oslan, Reed)
August 22, 2012 Filing 259 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Magistrate Judge Status and motion hearing held on 8/22/12. Plaintiff is directed to file the 8/16/12 letter from Kirkland and Ellis LLP to Baker & Hosteler. The attached letter dated 8/15/12 shall be filed, but with the exhibits to be filed under seal. Oral argument heard in open Court in regards to Defendant's motion to Estop Plaintiffs From Recanting Their Unqualified Avowal That Everything Is A Misappropriated Trade Sec