Second Amendment Arms et al v. City of Chicago, et al
Plaintiff: R. Joseph Franzese, Icarry, Tony Kole, Shaun Kranish, Second Amendment Arms and Robert M. Zieman, Sr.
Defendant: City Of Chicago, Richard M. Daley, Rahm Emanuel, Mara Georges, Maria Georges, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza, Miguel del Valle, Jody P. Weis and Garry McCarthy
Case Number: 1:2010cv04257
Filed: July 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Referring Judge: Sheila M Finnegan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket4, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (docket1, )
March 10, 2020 Filing 278 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on March 10, 2020. Plaintiffs are firearms owners and retailers who seek lost profits from a business they could not open because of a City of Chicago ordinance, later declared unconstitutional, and who challenge the constitutionality of a separate ordinance that bans the sale or possession of laser sights within the city. Currently before the Court is Defendants' motion for summary judgment and to exclude the testimony of Robert Southwick #251 . The motion #251 is granted in part (as to the exclusion of Southwick's proposed testimony) and denied without prejudice in part (as to summary judgment on Counts I and III). As explained below, each side is directed to file a supplemental brief on two underdeveloped issues (nominal damages and the laser sight ban) by March 31, 2020 and a supplemental reply brief by April 21, 2020. Mailed notice(cdh, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 277 Exhibit List (Redacted) by R. Joseph Franzese, Tony Kole, Second Amendment Arms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Chicago Business License App Receipt, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of R. Joseph Franzese, #3 Exhibit 3 - Defs' Responses and Objections to Supp Ints, #4 Exhibit 4 - Correspondence from WMA to DGS 020817, #5 Exhibit 5 - E-mail from RK to JB 013111, #6 Exhibit 7 - Dep of Lajoy (excerpts), #7 Exhibit 8 - Dep of Tapkowski (excerpts), #8 Exhibit 9 - Dep of Kole (excerpts), #9 Exhibit 19 - Huff Model documentation)(Sigale, David)
October 11, 2019 Filing 276 RULE 56 (b)(3)(C) Statement by R. Joseph Franzese, Tony Kole, Second Amendment Arms regarding motion for summary judgment #251 (Statement of Additional SJ Facts) (Sigale, David)
October 11, 2019 Filing 275 RULE 56 L.R. 56(b)(3) Statement by R. Joseph Franzese, Tony Kole, Second Amendment Arms regarding motion for summary judgment #251 (Response to Dkt. #254) (Sigale, David)
October 11, 2019 Filing 274 RESPONSE by R. Joseph Franzese, Tony Kole, Second Amendment Arms to MOTION by Defendants Rahm Emanuel, Miguel del Valle, Richard M. Daley, City Of Chicago, Mara Georges, Maria Georges, Garry McCarthy, Jody P. Weis, Susana Mendoza for summary judgment and to exclude expert testimony #251 (Sigale, David)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER: Motion for leave to withdraw appearance for Justin Tresnowski as attorney for Defendants #271 is granted. Notice of motion date of 10/2/2019 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 9/27/2019. Mailed notice(pk, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 272 NOTICE of Motion by Justin Tresnowski for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney, #271 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 10/2/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Tresnowski, Justin)
September 27, 2019 Filing 271 MOTION by Attorney Justin Tresnowski to withdraw as attorney for City Of Chicago, Richard M. Daley, Rahm Emanuel, Mara Georges, Maria Georges, Garry McCarthy, Susana Mendoza, Miguel del Valle, Jody P. Weis. No party information provided (Tresnowski, Justin)
September 23, 2019 Filing 270 SEALED RESPONSE by City Of Chicago, Richard M. Daley, Rahm Emanuel, Mara Georges, Maria Georges, Garry McCarthy, Susana Mendoza, Miguel del Valle, Jody P. Weis to sealed document #261 Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Additional Undisputed Facts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Additional LaJoy Dep. Excerpts, #2 Exhibit B - Additional Tapkowski Dep. Excerpts)(Tresnowski, Justin)
September 23, 2019 Filing 269 SEALED REPLY by City Of Chicago, Richard M. Daley, Rahm Emanuel, Mara Georges, Maria Georges, Garry McCarthy, Susana Mendoza, Miguel del Valle, Jody P. Weis to MOTION by Defendants Rahm Emanuel, Miguel del Valle, Richard M. Daley, City Of Chicago, Mara Georges, Maria Georges, Garry McCarthy, Jody P. Weis, Susana Mendoza for summary judgment and to exclude expert testimony #251 (Tresnowski, Justin)
August 26, 2019 Filing 268 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion hearing held. Motion for extension of time #258 and motion for leave to file response #260 are granted. Defendant's reply is due 9/23/2019. Notice of motion date of 8/28/2019 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (cdh, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 267 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs R. Joseph Franzese, Tony Kole, Second Amendment Arms Exhibit to Pltfs' Amended SJ Response List of Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16 - 2011 Nat'l. Survey of Fishing, Hunting, and Wildlife-Associated Recreation (Pt. 2 of 2))(Sigale, David)
August 23, 2019 Filing 266 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs R. Joseph Franzese, Tony Kole, Second Amendment Arms Exhibit to Pltfs' Amended SJ Response List of Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16 - 2011 Nat'l. Survey of Fishing, Hunting, and Wildlife-Associated Recreation (Pt. 1 of 2))(Sigale, David)
August 23, 2019 Filing 265 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs R. Joseph Franzese, Tony Kole, Second Amendment Arms Exhibit to Pltfs' Amended SJ Response List of Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14 - NSSF 2018 Financial Benchmarking Report)(Sigale, David)
August 23, 2019 Filing 264 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs R. Joseph Franzese, Tony Kole, Second Amendment Arms Exhibits to Pltfs' Amended SJ Response List of Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6 - Dep of Franzese (excerpts), #2 Exhibit 10 - Dep of Southwick (excerpts), #3 Exhibit 11 - NSSF Segmentation Data, #4 Exhibit 12 - NSSF and SA Supp Protection Report, #5 Exhibit 13 - NSSF Target Shooting Report Table, #6 Exhibit 15 - Target Shooting in America (Wildlife Restoration - 2018 Ed.), #7 Exhibit 17 - Chicago Revenue Estimate, #8 Exhibit 18 - ESRI Methodology Statement - Market Potential Database, #9 Exhibit 20 - Chicago area consumer data, #10 Exhibit 21 - SA Approach No. 1 Firearm Retailer Estimates, #11 Exhibit 22 - SA Approach No. 2 Firearm Retailer Estimates, #12 Exhibit 23 - Retailer 40 mile Buffer Data, #13 Exhibit 24 - ESRI Methodology Statement - 2018 Business Locations and Business Summary Data)(Sigale, David)
August 23, 2019 Filing 263 Exhibit List - Amended - to Response to Motion for Summary and to Exclude (Dkt. # 251) by R. Joseph Franzese, Tony Kole, Second Amendment Arms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Chicago Business License App Receipt, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of R. Joseph Franzese, #3 Exhibit 3 - Defs' Responses and Objections to Supp Ints, #4 Exhibit 4 - Correspondence from WMA to DGS 020817, #5 Exhibit 5 - E-mail from RK to JB 013111, #6 Exhibit 7 - Dep of Lajoy (excerpts), #7 Exhibit 8 - Dep of Tapkowski (excerpts), #8 Exhibit 9 - Dep of Kole (excerpts), #9 Exhibit 19 - Huff Model documentation)(Sigale, David)
August 22, 2019 Filing 262 NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages,,,, motion to seal document,,,,,,, #260 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 8/28/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Sigale, David)
August 21, 2019 Filing 261 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs R. Joseph Franzese, Tony Kole, Second Amendment Arms (Attachments: #1 Response to Defs' SJ SUF, #2 Pltfs' SJ Add't'l SUF, #3 Pltfs' SJ List of Exhibits)(Sigale, David)
August 21, 2019 Filing 260 MOTION by Plaintiffs R. Joseph Franzese, Tony Kole, Second Amendment Arms for leave to file excess pages , MOTION by Plaintiffs R. Joseph Franzese, Tony Kole, Second Amendment Arms to seal document MOTION by Defendants Rahm Emanuel, Miguel del Valle, Richard M. Daley, City Of Chicago, Mara Georges, Maria Georges, Garry McCarthy, Jody P. Weis, Susana Mendoza for summary judgment and to exclude expert testimony #251 , MOTION by Plaintiffs R. Joseph Franzese, Tony Kole, Second Amendment Arms for leave to file (Attachments: #1 Response to SJ Motion (redacted), #2 Response to Defs' SJ SUF (redacted), #3 Pltfs' SJ Response SUF (redacted), #4 Pltfs' SJ List of Exhibits (redacted))(Sigale, David)
August 19, 2019 Filing 259 NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #258 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 8/26/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Sigale, David)
August 19, 2019 Filing 258 MOTION by Plaintiffs R. Joseph Franzese, Tony Kole for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for summary judgment #251 (Sigale, David)
July 17, 2019 Filing 257 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion for leave (1) to file a brief in excess of fifteen pages and (2) to file documents under seal #252 is granted. Notice of motion date of 7/18/2019 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (cdh, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 256 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants City Of Chicago, Richard M. Daley, Rahm Emanuel, Mara Georges, Maria Georges, Garry McCarthy, Susana Mendoza, Miguel del Valle, Jody P. Weis memorandum in support of motion for summary judgment and to exclude expert testimony (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Southwick Deposition, #2 Exhibit 2 - NSSF Report)(Tresnowski, Justin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 255 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants City Of Chicago, Richard M. Daley, Rahm Emanuel, Mara Georges, Maria Georges, Garry McCarthy, Susana Mendoza, Miguel del Valle, Jody P. Weis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Franzese Deposition, #2 Exhibit B - Response to Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit C - Kole Deposition, #4 Exhibit D - 2010 Ordinance, #5 Exhibit E - 2014 Ordinance, #6 Exhibit F - SAA Taxes, #7 Exhibit G - Business Plan, #8 Exhibit H - LaJoy Deposition, #9 Exhibit I - Tapkowski Deposition, #10 Exhibit J - Hall Report, #11 Exhibit K - Southwick Report, #12 Exhibit L - 1999 Article, #13 Exhibit M - 1999 Ordinance, #14 Exhibit N - 1996 Article, #15 Exhibit O - 2019 Report, #16 Exhibit P - 2018 Article, #17 Exhibit Q - 2009 Report, #18 Exhibit R - 2018 Article)(Tresnowski, Justin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 254 RULE 56 56.1(a)(3) Statement by City Of Chicago, Richard M. Daley, Rahm Emanuel, Mara Georges, Maria Georges, Garry McCarthy, Susana Mendoza, Miguel del Valle, Jody P. Weis regarding motion for summary judgment #251 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Franzese Deposition, #2 Exhibit B - Response to Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit C - Kole Deposition, #4 Exhibit D - 2010 Ordinance, #5 Exhibit E- 2014 Ordinance, #6 Exhibit F - SAA Taxes, #7 Exhibit G - Business Plan, #8 Exhibit H - LaJoy Deposition, #9 Exhibit I - Tapkowski Deposition, #10 Exhibit J - Hall Report, #11 Exhibit K - Southwick Report, #12 Exhibit L - 1999 Article, #13 Exhibit M - 1999 Ordinance, #14 Exhibit N - 1996 Ordinance, #15 Exhibit O - 2019 Report, #16 Exhibit P - 2018 Article, #17 Exhibit Q - 2009 Report, #18 Exhibit R - 2018 Article)(Tresnowski, Justin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 253 NOTICE of Motion by Justin Tresnowski for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #252 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 7/18/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Tresnowski, Justin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 252 MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for leave to file excess pages and to file documents under seal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum)(Tresnowski, Justin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 251 MOTION by Defendants Rahm Emanuel, Miguel del Valle, Richard M. Daley, City Of Chicago, Mara Georges, Maria Georges, Garry McCarthy, Jody P. Weis, Susana Mendoza for summary judgment and to exclude expert testimony (Tresnowski, Justin)
May 14, 2019 Filing 250 AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER Regarding Briefing on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment and Daubert Issues: Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 5/14/2019. Mailed notice. (bg, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 249 AGREED RIDER TO CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 5/2/2019. Mailed notice(pk, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 248 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held on 5/2/2019. Agreed schedule to be filed by 5/6/2019. Mailed notice (cdh, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 247 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held and continued to 5/2/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cdh, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 246 STATUS Report by City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Garry McCarthy, Susana Mendoza (Tresnowski, Justin)
February 22, 2019 Filing 245 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing date of 2/27/2019 is reset to 3/5/2019 at 9:00 a.m. to permit the Court to review the joint status report due on 2/28/2019 prior to meeting with counsel. Mailed notice (cdh, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 244 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Following up on the Court's minute entry dated 11/13/2018 #243 , the Court requests that the parties file no later than 2/28/2019 a joint report on the status of any further expert discovery and the parties' positions on reimbursement of expenses incurred by Defendant in connection with investigating Plaintiff's now-withdrawn expert. Mailed notice (cdh, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 243 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion hearing held. Plaintiffs' motion for extension of discovery schedule to disclose substitute damages expert #240 is granted. As explained on the record, this is a final extension. Plaintiff must tender a complete expert report within 30 days. Failure to do so will result in barring of any expert testimony for Plaintiff in this matter. After the deposition of any expert that Plaintiff designates is taken, the parties joint status report is to be filed with the Court, including a discussion of any further expert discovery and the parties' positions on reimbursement of expenses incurred by Defendant in connection with investigating Plaintiff's now-withdrawn expert. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 242 RESPONSE by City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Garry McCarthy, Susana Mendozain Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs R. Joseph Franzese, Tony Kole, Second Amendment Arms for extension of time to complete discovery #240 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Tresnowski, Justin)
November 5, 2018 Filing 241 NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery #240 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 11/13/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Sigale, David)
November 5, 2018 Filing 240 MOTION by Plaintiffs R. Joseph Franzese, Tony Kole, Second Amendment Arms for extension of time to complete discovery (Sigale, David)
September 13, 2018 Filing 239 AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 9/13/2018. Discovery of Plaintiffs' experts closes on November 21, 2018; Defendants' expert disclosures (if any) will be due by January 2, 2019; and Discovery of Defendants' experts closes on February 13, 2019. Status hearing is scheduled for February 27, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice(cdh, )
July 25, 2018 Filing 238 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion hearing held. Defendant's motion for leave to take Plaintiff Tony Kole's deposition #236 is granted as stated on the record. Mailed notice (cdh, )
July 20, 2018 Filing 237 NOTICE of Motion by Justin Tresnowski for presentment of motion to take deposition, #236 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 7/25/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Tresnowski, Justin)
July 20, 2018 Filing 236 MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago to take deposition of Tony Kole (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email Chain, #2 Exhibit Second Email Chain, #3 Exhibit Third Email Chain, #4 Exhibit Pls.' Answer to Defs.' Third Set of Interrogatories)(Tresnowski, Justin)
May 9, 2018 Filing 235 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Oral ruling on motion for extension of discovery schedule #228 held and the motion is granted as discussed on the record. This should be considered a final extension and there will be no further extensions of this deadline absent good cause shown. A further status hearing is set for 7/25/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (cdh, )
May 7, 2018 Filing 234 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Garry McCarthy, Susana Mendoza by Thomas P. McNulty (McNulty, Thomas)
May 7, 2018 Filing 233 NOTICE by City Of Chicago re response in opposition to motion #232 (Tresnowski, Justin)
May 7, 2018 Filing 232 RESPONSE by City Of Chicagoin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs R. Joseph Franzese, Tony Kole, Second Amendment Arms for extension of time to complete discovery #228 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Tresnowski, Justin)
May 4, 2018 Filing 231 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Garry McCarthy, Susana Mendoza by Justin Tresnowski (Tresnowski, Justin)
April 30, 2018 Filing 230 CORRECTED NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery #228 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 5/9/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Sigale, David)
April 30, 2018 Filing 229 NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery #228 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 4/9/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Sigale, David)
April 30, 2018 Filing 228 MOTION by Plaintiffs R. Joseph Franzese, Tony Kole, Second Amendment Arms for extension of time to complete discovery (Sigale, David)
December 6, 2017 Filing 227 AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 12/6/2017. Mailed notice (tt, )
November 14, 2017 Filing 226 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held and continued to 9/12/2018 at 9:00 a.m. The Court adopts the parties' proposed discovery schedule. Signed order to follow. Mailed notice (cdh, )
November 3, 2017 Filing 225 STATUS Report by City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel (Mclaughlin, Ellen)
October 25, 2017 Filing 224 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: The Clerk of Court has notified the Court that as of October 1, 2017, Walter Maksym had not renewed his membership in the Courts Trial Bar as required under Local Rule 83.11(i). Walter Maksym is given 14 days from the date of this order to renew his membership or be subject to removal as lead counsel from this matter. If Walter Maksym has renewed his membership since October 1, 2017, he need not take any further action in response to this order. Mailed notice (cdh, )
October 20, 2017 Filing 223 (agreed) NOTICE of Motion by Ellen Wight Mclaughlin for presentment of motion for extension of time to file #221 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 10/24/2017 at 09:15 AM. (Mclaughlin, Ellen)
October 20, 2017 Filing 222 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: At the request of counsel, the deadline for filing the joint status report is extended to 11/3/2017 and the status hearing set for 10/27/2017 is stricken and reset to 11/14/2017 at 09:00 a.m. Mailed notice (dl)
October 20, 2017 Filing 221 MOTION by Defendants City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel for extension of time to file joint status report (agreed) (Mclaughlin, Ellen)
September 28, 2017 Filing 220 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held on 9/28/17. Parties are to submit a Status Report on or before 10/20/2017. Status hearing is set for 10/27/2017 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (ym, )
August 29, 2017 Filing 219 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 8/29/2017. Before the Court is Defendants City of Chicago, Mayor Rahm Emanuel, Superintendent of Police Eddie Johnson, and City Clerk Anna Valencia's motion for summary judgment #204 . For the reasons set forth below, Defendants' motion #204 is denied. This case is set for further status on September 28, 2017, at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice(cdh, )
June 9, 2017 Filing 218 NOTICE by City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel re reply #216 , Response #217 (Aguiar, William)
June 9, 2017 Filing 217 RESPONSE by Defendants City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel to Plaintiffs' L.R. 56(b)(3)(C) Statement of Additional Undisputed Facts (Aguiar, William)
June 9, 2017 Filing 216 REPLY by Defendants City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment on Count I of Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint (Aguiar, William)
May 19, 2017 Filing 215 RESPONSE by R. Joseph Franzese, Tony Kole, Second Amendment Arms to MOTION by Defendants Rahm Emanuel, City Of Chicago, Garry McCarthy, Susana Mendoza for summary judgment on Count I of Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint #204 (Attachments: #1 Statement of Additional Undisputed Facts, #2 SJ Response - List of Exhibits, #3 Exh. A - Declaration of R. Joseph Franzese, #4 Exh. B - Photograph of 415 W. Armitage St., Chicago (9/9/2010), #5 Exh. C - E-mails between City and USDOJ, #6 Exh. D - E-mails between City and USDOJ, #7 Exh. E - E-mails between City and USDOJ, #8 Exh. F - City's Supp. Disc. Responses, #9 Exh. G - correspondence from WMA to DGS (2/8/2017), #10 Response to Defendants' SJ Statement of Undisputed Facts)(Sigale, David)
May 8, 2017 Filing 214 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Unopposed motion for extension of time to file response to motion for summary judgment as to Count I of the Plaintiffs' fourth amended complaint #212 is granted; response due 5/19/2017; reply due 6/9/2017. Notice of motion date of 5/9/2017 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (cdh, )
May 3, 2017 Filing 213 (Unopposed) NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief #212 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 5/9/2017 at 09:15 AM. (Sigale, David)
May 3, 2017 Filing 212 MOTION by Plaintiffs R. Joseph Franzese, Tony Kole, Second Amendment Arms for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for summary judgment, #204 (Unopposed) (Sigale, David)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 3/6/2017. Before the Court are the parties' supplemental status reports [208, 209], which the Court requested in lieu of a motion under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(d) in an effort to resolve what further discovery, if any, Plaintiffs should be entitled to before filing a response to Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment. After considering the written record as well as the arguments of counsel at the most recent status hearing [see 210], the Court sets out below the discovery that will be ordered at this time. The parties will have until April 7, 2017 to complete the discovery. Briefing on the motion for partial summary judgment will proceed as follows: Plaintiffs' response brief and accompanying materials due on May 5, 2017; Defendants' reply brief and accompanying materials due on May 19, 2017. The Court will issue a ruling by mail. For further details see the Statement below. Mailed notice(cdh, )
January 26, 2017 Filing 210 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held. Mailed notice (cdh, )
January 18, 2017 Filing 209 STATUS Report (Supplemental) by R. Joseph Franzese, Tony Kole, Second Amendment Arms (Sigale, David)
January 17, 2017 Filing 208 STATUS Report by City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Garry McCarthy, Susana Mendoza (Aguiar, William)
December 19, 2016 Filing 207 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: By agreement of the parties, the status hearing set for 1/20/2017 is cancelled and reset to 1/26/2017 at 9:30 a.m. No appearances are necessary on 1/20/2017. Mailed notice (cdh, )
December 6, 2016 Filing 206 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion hearing held. Defendants' motion for summary judgment on Count 1 of the Plaintiffs' fourth amended complaint #204 is entered and continued. No later than 1/17/2017, parties shall file a joint status report as outlined in open court. The current discovery schedule is suspended until further order of court. Mailed notice (cdh, )
November 29, 2016 Filing 205 NOTICE of Motion by David Michael Baron for presentment of motion for summary judgment, #204 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 12/6/2016 at 09:15 AM. (Baron, David)
November 29, 2016 Filing 204 MOTION by Defendants Rahm Emanuel, City Of Chicago, Garry McCarthy, Susana Mendoza for summary judgment on Count I of Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment on Count I of Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Defendants' Local Rule 56.1(a)(3) Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #3 Exhibit SOF Exhibits A-G)(Baron, David)
October 21, 2016 Filing 203 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: The referral is closed and the case is returned to the assigned judge. Honorable Sheila Finnegan no longer referred to the case.Mailed notice (sxw, )
October 12, 2016 Filing 202 AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 10/12/2016. Mailed notice(cdh, ) Modified on 10/13/2016 (cdh).
September 27, 2016 Filing 201 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Agreed motion for an extension of discovery schedule #199 is granted. Any outstanding responses to the Parties' written fact discovery requests will be due by October 11, 2016; oral fact discovery closes on January 10, 2017; Plaintiffs' expert disclosures (if any) will be due by February 10, 2017; discovery of Plaintiffs' experts closes on March 24, 2017; Defendants' expert disclosures (if any) will be due by April 25, 2017; and discovery of Defendants' experts closes on June 13, 2017. Status hearing set for 10/4/2016 is stricken and reset to 1/20/2017 at 9:00 a.m. Notice of motion date of 9/29/2016 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (cdh, )
September 23, 2016 Filing 200 (AGREED) NOTICE of Motion by Ellen Wight Mclaughlin for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery #199 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 9/29/2016 at 09:15 AM. (Mclaughlin, Ellen)
September 23, 2016 Filing 199 MOTION by Defendants City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Susana Mendoza for extension of time to complete discovery (AGREED) (Mclaughlin, Ellen)
September 19, 2016 Filing 198 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Agreed motion for entry of a confidentiality order #196 is granted. Signed order to follow. Notice of motion date of 9/20/2016 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date.Mailed notice (lxs, )
September 13, 2016 Filing 197 Agreed NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for protective order #196 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 9/20/2016 at 09:15 AM. (Sigale, David)
September 13, 2016 Filing 196 MOTION by Plaintiffs R. Joseph Franzese, Tony Kole, Second Amendment Arms for protective order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Confidentiality Order)(Sigale, David)
May 13, 2016 Filing 195 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: The Court adopts the deadlines set out in the parties' proposed scheduling order #194 . This case is set for further status hearing on 10/4/2016 at 9:00 am. Mailed notice (cdh, )
May 6, 2016 Filing 194 Proposed Agreed Scheduling Order by City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Garry McCarthy, Susana Mendoza (Aguiar, William)
April 27, 2016 Filing 193 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held 4/27/2016. Plaintiff's oral motion to dismiss named Plaintiff Robert M. Zieman, Sr. from the case as he has moved out of state is granted. As a consequence of the dismissal of Plaintiff Zieman, counsel agree that Count IV of the fourth amended complaint is moot and should be dismissed. The parties are given until 5/6/2016 to file an agreed discovery schedule on the Court's docket. This case is set for further status on 8/24/2016 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cdh, )
April 19, 2016 Filing 192 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Due to the Court's trial schedule, the status hearing set for 4/20/2016 at 9:30 a.m. is reset to 4/27/2016 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (cdh, )
January 15, 2016 Filing 191 NOTICE by City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Garry McCarthy, Susana Mendoza re answer to amended complaint #190 (Mclaughlin, Ellen)
January 15, 2016 Filing 190 ANSWER to amended complaint (Fourth) by City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Garry McCarthy, Susana Mendoza(Mclaughlin, Ellen)
December 23, 2015 Filing 189 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held and continued to 4/20/2016 at 9:30 a.m. City of Chicago shall file its answer by 1/15/2016. Written discovery to be completed by 4/15/2016. Mailed notice (cdh, )
December 22, 2015 Filing 188 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: A status hearing is set for 12/23/2015 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (cdh, )
December 11, 2015 Filing 187 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: At the request of the Parties, the status hearing set for 12/18/2015 is cancelled and reset to 12/23/2015 at 9:30 a.m. No appearances are necessary on 12/18/2015. Mailed notice (cdh, )
December 10, 2015 Filing 186 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: In light of the Court's trial schedule, the status hearing set for 12/11/2015 is stricken and reset to 12/18/2015 at 9:30 a.m. No appearances are necessary on 12/11/2015. Mailed notice (cdh, )
December 4, 2015 Filing 185 STATUS Report (Filed Jointly by the Parties) by City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Garry McCarthy, Susana Mendoza (Baron, David)
November 13, 2015 Filing 184 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held and continued to 12/11/2015 at 9:30 a.m. As discussed on the record, the parties shall file a status report by 12/4/2015. Mailed notice (cdh, )
October 22, 2015 Filing 183 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held. Plaintiffs' oral motion for leave to file an amended complaint is granted. A further status hearing is set for 11/13/2015 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cdh, )
September 28, 2015 Filing 182 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 9/28/2015. Plaintiffs are gun owners and retailers who challenge the current and former versions of the City of Chicago's ordinance governing the use, sale, and possession of firearms within the City, arguing that those ordinances violated, and continue to violate, their constitutional rights. Before the Court is Defendants' motion to dismiss #155 Plaintiffs' fourth amended complaint. For the reasons set forth below, Defendants' motion #155 is granted in part and denied in part. A status hearing is set for 10/22/2015 at 9:00 a.m. For further details see this 41-page Memorandum Opinion and Order. Mailed notice(cdh, )
June 16, 2015 Filing 181 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file response to citation to additional authority, instanter #178 is granted and no appearances are necessary on 6/17/2015. Mailed notice (cdh, )
June 15, 2015 Filing 180 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: On the Court's own motion, the Plaintiff's motion for leave to file response to citation to additional authority, instanter #178 set for 6/156/2015 is stricken and reset to 6/17/2015 at 9:15 a.m. and no appearances are necessary on 6/16/2015. Mailed notice (cdh, )
June 10, 2015 Filing 179 NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for leave to file #178 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 6/16/2015 at 09:15 AM. (Sigale, David)
June 10, 2015 Filing 178 MOTION by Plaintiffs R. Joseph Franzese, Tony Kole, Second Amendment Arms, Robert M. Zieman, Sr. for leave to file Response to Defendant's Citation to Additional Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Response)(Sigale, David)
May 18, 2015 Filing 177 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Defendants' motion for leave to cite additional authority #175 is granted; Plaintiffs may file a response by May 29, 2015; No appearances are necessary on May 20, 2015. Mailed notice (cdh, )
May 14, 2015 Filing 176 NOTICE of Motion by Ellen Wight Mclaughlin for presentment of motion for leave to file #175 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 5/20/2015 at 09:15 AM. (Mclaughlin, Ellen)
May 14, 2015 Filing 175 MOTION by Defendants City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Garry McCarthy, Susana Mendoza for leave to file citation to additional authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mclaughlin, Ellen)
April 6, 2015 Filing 174 NOTICE by City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Garry McCarthy, Susana Mendoza re reply to response to motion # 173 (Mclaughlin, Ellen)
April 6, 2015 Filing 173 REPLY by City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Garry McCarthy, Susana Mendoza to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Counts I-VI of Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint) # 155 (Mclaughlin, Ellen)
March 23, 2015 Filing 172 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Defendants' unopposed motion for an extension of time to and including 4/6/2015 to file their reply in support of their motion to dismiss # 170 is granted. No appearances are necessary on 3/24/2015. Mailed notice (cdh, )
March 19, 2015 Filing 171 NOTICE of Motion by David Michael Baron for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief,, # 170 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 3/24/2015 at 09:15 AM. (Baron, David)
March 19, 2015 Filing 170 MOTION by Defendants City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Garry McCarthy, Susana Mendoza for extension of time to file response/reply as to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim # 155 in Counts I-VI in Plaintiffs' Complaint (Unopposed) (Baron, David)
March 3, 2015 Filing 169 RESPONSE by R. Joseph Franzese, Tony Kole, Second Amendment Arms, Robert M. Zieman, Sr.in Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Counts I-VI of Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint) # 155 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Petition for Certiorari in Jackson v. San Francisco, # 2 Exhibit B - Amicus Brief of 25 Attorneys General in Support of Certiorari in Jackson v. San Francisco)(Sigale, David)
February 20, 2015 Filing 168 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: The Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for an extension of time to file a response to the motion to dismiss # 166 is granted. Plaintiffs' response will be due March 2, 2015 and the defendants may reply by March 23, 2015. No appearances are necessary on 2/25/2015. Mailed notice (cdh, )
February 19, 2015 Filing 167 NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief # 166 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 2/25/2015 at 09:15 AM. (Sigale, David)
February 19, 2015 Filing 166 MOTION by Plaintiffs R. Joseph Franzese, Tony Kole, Second Amendment Arms, Robert M. Zieman, Sr. for extension of time to file response/reply as to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim # 155 (Sigale, David)
February 9, 2015 Filing 165 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: The Plaintiff's unopposed motion for an extension of time to and including 2/19/2015 to file their response to Defendants' motion to dismiss fourth amended complaint # 163 is granted. Defendants' reply is due 3/12/2015. No appearance is required on 2/13/2015. Mailed notice (cdh, )
February 5, 2015 Filing 164 (Unopposed) NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief # 163 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 2/13/2015 at 09:15 AM. (Sigale, David)
February 5, 2015 Filing 163 MOTION by Plaintiffs R. Joseph Franzese, Tony Kole, Second Amendment Arms, Robert M. Zieman, Sr. for extension of time to file response/reply as to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim # 155 (Unopposed) (Sigale, David)
January 8, 2015 Filing 162 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion hearing held. The agreed motion of the City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Garry McCarthy, and Susana Mendoza for leave to file a memorandum in excess of fifteen pages in support of their motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint # 157 is granted; plaintiff may file a 17 page response by 2/5/2015; defendants' reply is due 2/24/2015; Court will rule by mail and set the case for further status hearing at that time. Mailed notice (cdh, )
January 8, 2015 Filing 161 NOTICE by City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Garry McCarthy, Susana Mendoza re memorandum in support of motion # 160 (Mclaughlin, Ellen)
January 8, 2015 Filing 160 MEMORANDUM by City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Garry McCarthy, Susana Mendoza in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim # 155 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Mclaughlin, Ellen)
January 5, 2015 Filing 159 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Garry McCarthy, Susana Mendoza by Ellen Wight Mclaughlin (Mclaughlin, Ellen)
January 2, 2015 Filing 158 NOTICE of Motion by William Macy Aguiar for presentment of motion for leave to file, # 157 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 1/8/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Aguiar, William)
January 2, 2015 Filing 157 MOTION by Defendants City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Garry McCarthy, Susana Mendoza for leave to file a memorandum in excess of fifteen pages in support of their motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Aguiar, William)
January 2, 2015 Filing 156 NOTICE of Motion by William Macy Aguiar for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim # 155 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 1/8/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Aguiar, William)
January 2, 2015 Filing 155 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Counts I-VI of Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint) (Aguiar, William)
December 17, 2014 Filing 154 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: MOTION by Defendants City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Garry McCarthy, Susana Mendoza for extension of time # 152 to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint is granted to and including 1/2/2015. Notice of Motion date of 12/23/2014 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (tbk, )
December 17, 2014 Filing 153 NOTICE of Motion by William Macy Aguiar for presentment of extension of time # 152 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 12/23/2014 at 09:15 AM. (Aguiar, William)
December 17, 2014 Filing 152 MOTION by Defendants City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Garry McCarthy, Susana Mendoza for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint (Aguiar, William)
December 1, 2014 Filing 151 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: By agreement of the parties, status hearing date of 1/7/2015 is stricken and Status hearing reset for 1/8/2015 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (tbk, )
December 1, 2014 Filing 150 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing date of 12/3/2014 is stricken and Status hearing reset for 1/7/2015 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (tbk, )
November 24, 2014 Filing 149 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: MOTION by Defendants City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Garry McCarthy, Susana Mendoza for extension of time # 147 to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint is granted. Defendants are given until 12/19/14 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' fourth amended complaint. The Notice of Motion date of 11/26/2014 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (tbk, )
November 21, 2014 Filing 148 NOTICE of Motion by William Macy Aguiar for presentment of extension of time # 147 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 11/26/2014 at 09:15 AM. (Aguiar, William)
November 21, 2014 Filing 147 MOTION by Defendants City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Garry McCarthy, Susana Mendoza for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint (Aguiar, William)
October 22, 2014 Filing 146 FOURTH AMENDED complaint by Robert M. Zieman, Sr., R. Joseph Franzese, Tony Kole, Second Amendment Arms against City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza and terminating Icarry (an unincorporated association) and Shaun Kranish (individually) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - July 2014 Ordinance)(Sigale, David)
October 22, 2014 Filing 145 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: MOTION by Plaintiffs for leave to file # 143 instanter Fourth Amended Complaint is granted. Defendants are given to and including 11/26/2014 to file responsive pleading to Fourth Amended Complaint. Further Status hearing set for 12/3/2014 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (tbk, )
October 17, 2014 Filing 144 NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion to file instanter # 143 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 10/22/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Sigale, David)
October 17, 2014 Filing 143 MOTION by Plaintiffs R. Joseph Franzese, Tony Kole, Second Amendment Arms, Robert M. Zieman, Sr. to file instanter Fourth Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Fourth Amended Complaint)(Sigale, David)
October 15, 2014 Filing 142 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing set for 10/22/2014 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (tbk, )
October 7, 2014 Filing 141 Status STATEMENT by R. Joseph Franzese, Icarry, Tony Kole, Shaun Kranish, Second Amendment Arms, Robert M. Zieman, Sr. (Sigale, David)
October 1, 2014 Filing 140 NOTICE by City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza re statement # 139 (Aguiar, William)
October 1, 2014 Filing 139 Response to Court Order Dated August 4, 2014 and Request for a Status Hearing STATEMENT by City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza (Aguiar, William)
August 20, 2014 Filing 138 NOTICE by David G. Sigale of Change of Address (Sigale, David)
August 4, 2014 Filing 137 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Plaintiffs' are given to and including 9/3/2014 in which to file a 4th Amended Complaint. Defendants are given to and including 10/1/2014 to respond to 4th Amended Complaint. Mailed notice (tbk, )
July 31, 2014 Filing 136 STATUS Report (Joint) by R. Joseph Franzese, Icarry, Tony Kole, Shaun Kranish, Second Amendment Arms, Robert M. Zieman, Sr. (Sigale, David)
July 15, 2014 Filing 135 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held on 7/15/2014. As discussed on the record, parties to file joint status report by 7/31/2014. Mailed notice (tbk, )
July 10, 2014 Filing 134 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing date of 7/11/2014 is stricken andreset to 7/15/2014 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (tbk, )
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER: Before the Court is Defendants' motion to dismiss counts IX, X, XII, and XV of Plaintiffs' third amended complaint # 123 . Because Plaintiffs concede that the statute of limitations has run on counts XII and XV as currently pleaded, see # 129 at 5, the Court grants Defendants' motion to dismiss as to those counts without prejudice. Status hearing set for 7/11/2014 at 09:30 AM. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 6/30/2014. Mailed notice(tbk, )
February 12, 2014 Filing 132 NOTICE by David Michael Baron of Change of Address. (vcf, )
January 27, 2014 Filing 131 NOTICE by City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza re reply to response to motion, # 130 (Baron, David)
January 27, 2014 Filing 130 REPLY by City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza to response in opposition to motion, # 129 in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Counts IX, X, XII, and XV of Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baron, David)
January 7, 2014 Filing 129 RESPONSE by R. Joseph Franzese, Icarry, Tony Kole, Shaun Kranish, Second Amendment Arms, Robert M. Zieman, Sr.in Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Counts IX, X, XII, and XV of Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint # 123 (Sigale, David)
November 26, 2013 Filing 128 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim # 123 is taken under advisement; response due by 1/6/2014; reply due by 1/27/2014; ruling will be by mail. Mailed notice (tbk, )
November 15, 2013 Filing 127 NOTICE by City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza re answer to amended complaint # 126 (Aguiar, William)
November 15, 2013 Filing 126 ANSWER to amended complaint and affirmative defenses by City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza(Aguiar, William)
November 15, 2013 Filing 125 NOTICE of Motion by David Michael Baron for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim # 123 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 11/26/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Baron, David)
November 15, 2013 Filing 124 MEMORANDUM by City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim # 123 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baron, David)
November 15, 2013 Filing 123 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Counts IX, X, XII, and XV of Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (Baron, David)
October 23, 2013 Filing 122 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Unopposed MOTION by Defendants City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza for extension of time # 119 to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint, to and including 11/15/2013, is granted. Notice of Motion date of 10/29/2013 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (tbk, )
October 23, 2013 Filing 121 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: PURSUANT TO PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT OF PARTIAL VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL # 118 , Counts III, IV, V,and VI from Third Amended Complaint, are voluntarily dismissed, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4l(a)(1)(A)(i). Mailed notice (tbk, )
October 22, 2013 Filing 120 NOTICE of Motion by William Macy Aguiar for presentment of extension of time # 119 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 10/29/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Aguiar, William)
October 22, 2013 Filing 119 MOTION by Defendants City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead (Unopposed) (Aguiar, William)
October 21, 2013 Filing 118 Voluntary Dismissal of Counts III, IV, V and VI ONLY STATEMENT by R. Joseph Franzese, Icarry, Tony Kole, Shaun Kranish, Second Amendment Arms, Robert M. Zieman, Sr. (Sigale, David)
October 21, 2013 Filing 117 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza by David Michael Baron (Baron, David)
September 19, 2013 Filing 116 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held on 9/19/2013. Plaintiff is given until 10/3/2013 to file statement regarding voluntary settlement as to certain defendants. Defendants are given to and including 10/31/2013 to file responsive pleading to Third Amended Complaint. Mailed notice (tbk, )
September 17, 2013 Filing 115 STATUS Report (Plaintiffs') by R. Joseph Franzese, Icarry, Tony Kole, Shaun Kranish, Second Amendment Arms, Robert M. Zieman, Sr. (Sigale, David)
September 17, 2013 Filing 114 NOTICE by City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza re status report # 113 (Aguiar, William)
September 17, 2013 Filing 113 STATUS Report by City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza (Aguiar, William)
August 1, 2013 Filing 112 THIRD AMENDED complaint by Shaun Kranish, Robert M. Zieman, Sr., R. Joseph Franzese, Tony Kole, Icarry, Second Amendment Arms against City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza and terminating Miguel del Valle, Jody P. Weis, Richard M. Daley and Mara Georges (kj, )
August 1, 2013 Filing 111 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held on 8/1/2013. MOTION by Plaintiffs R. Joseph Franzese, Icarry, Tony Kole, Shaun Kranish, Second Amendment Arms, Robert M. Zieman, Sr. for leave to file # 109 Third Amended Complaint is granted. Filing of responsive pleading to Third Amended Complaint is stayed until further notice. Joint status report to be filed by 9/17/2013. Further status hearing set for 9/19/2013 at 09:15 AM. Mailed notice (tbk, )
July 30, 2013 Filing 110 NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for leave to file # 109 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 8/1/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Sigale, David)
July 30, 2013 Filing 109 MOTION by Plaintiffs R. Joseph Franzese, Icarry, Tony Kole, Shaun Kranish, Second Amendment Arms, Robert M. Zieman, Sr. for leave to file Third Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Third Amended Complaint)(Sigale, David)
June 25, 2013 Filing 108 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held on 6/25/2013. Plaintiffs are given until 7/23/2013 to file a motion for leave to file a third amended complaint. As discussed on the record, previously set discovery dates are stricken. Status hearing set for 8/1/2013 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (tbk, )
June 20, 2013 Filing 107 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs R. Joseph Franzese, Icarry, Tony Kole, Shaun Kranish, Second Amendment Arms, Robert M. Zieman, Sr. by David G. Sigale (Sigale, David)
June 17, 2013 Filing 106 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: On the Court's own motion, Status hearing date of 6/20/2013 is stricken. Mailed notice. (is, )
June 7, 2013 Filing 105 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: On the Court's own motion, Status hearing date of 6/20/2013 is stricken and Status hearing reset for 6/25/2013 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (tbk, )
June 5, 2013 Filing 104 NOTICE by City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza re status report # 103 (Aguiar, William)
June 5, 2013 Filing 103 STATUS Report by City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza (Aguiar, William)
May 15, 2013 Filing 102 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held on 5/15/2013. Plaintiffs' counsel fails to appear at status. As discussed on the record, a joint status report to be filed by 6/5/2013. A further status hearing is set for 6/20/2013 at 09:30 AM. following status with Magistrate Finnegan. Mailed notice (tbk, )
April 8, 2013 Filing 101 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Magistrate Judge status hearing held on 4/8/2013 and continued to 6/20/2013 at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel did not appear and was not available when the courtroom deputy telephoned his office. Defense counsel reports on the status of discovery. Mailed notice. (is, )
February 6, 2013 Filing 100 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Magistrate Judge status hearing held on 2/6/2013 and continued to 4/8/2013 at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel participates by telephone. No party has served written discovery. Plaintiffs expect to file a motion with the district judge seeking leave to file an amended complaint and modify the discovery schedule due to counsel's medical issues. Mailed notice. (is, )
November 15, 2012 Filing 99 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Magistrate Judge status hearing held on 11/15/2012 and continued to 2/6/2013 at 9:30 a.m. Defense counsel reports on the status of discovery. If the parties have no issues to argue at the next status hearing, they may call the courtroom deputy to request a telephonic status hearing. Mailed notice. (is, )
October 26, 2012 Filing 98 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: For the reasons stated below, Plaintiffs motion for extension of time # 95 is stricken as moot. Mailed notice (tbk, )
October 23, 2012 Filing 97 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re attorney appearance # 96 , MOTION by Plaintiff Second Amendment Arms for extension of time to amend /to File Third Amended Complaint # 95 (Maksym, Walter)
October 23, 2012 Filing 96 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs R. Joseph Franzese, Icarry, Tony Kole, Shaun Kranish, Second Amendment Arms, Robert M. Zieman, Sr. by Walter Peter Maksym, Jr Amended Appearance (Maksym, Walter)
October 23, 2012 Filing 95 MOTION by Plaintiff Second Amendment Arms for extension of time to amend /to File Third Amended Complaint (Maksym, Walter)
October 23, 2012 Filing 94 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Magistrate Judge status hearing set for 11/15/2012 at 9:30 a.m. in courtroom 2214. Mailed notice. (is, )
October 19, 2012 Filing 93 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Signed by Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan on 10/18/2012. (jmp, )
October 18, 2012 Filing 92 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held on 10/18/2012. MOTION by Plaintiff Second Amendment Arms for extension of time # 89 to File Third Amended Complaint, to and including 12/17/2012, is granted. Defendants' response to Third Amended Complaint to be filed by 1/21/2013. Written fact discovery date of 2/17/2013 is extended to 5/1/2013. Oral fact discovery and Plaintiffs' disclosure of experts extended to 9/1/2013. Defendants' disclosure of experts extended to 10/1/2013. Expert discovery closes on 11/30/2012. All further discovery motions and discovery supervision being referred to Magistrate Judge Finnegan. Status hearing set for 5/15/2013 at 09:00 AM. Notice of Motion date of 10/31/2012 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (tbk, )
October 17, 2012 Filing 91 NOTICE of Motion by Walter Peter Maksym, Jr for presentment of motion for extension of time to amend # 89 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 10/31/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Maksym, Walter)
October 17, 2012 Filing 90 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re MOTION by Plaintiff Second Amendment Arms for extension of time to amend and File Third Amended Complaint # 89 (Maksym, Walter)
October 17, 2012 Filing 89 MOTION by Plaintiff Second Amendment Arms for extension of time to amend and File Third Amended Complaint (Maksym, Walter)
October 16, 2012 Filing 88 NOTICE by All Parties of Filing DISCOVERY PLAN JOINTLY SUBMITTED PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. PRO. 26(f) (Maksym, Walter)
October 16, 2012 Filing 87 DISCOVERY PLAN JOINTLY SUBMITTED PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. PRO. 26(f) by Second Amendment Arms (Maksym, Walter)
September 25, 2012 Filing 86 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 9/25/2012. Mailed notice(tbk, )
September 25, 2012 Filing 85 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Pursuant to Memorandum Opinion and Order, dated 9/25/2012, the Court grants in part and denies in part Defendants motion to dismiss # 58 . Although Plaintiffs already have had multiple opportunities to frame their claims, the Court will allow one additional opportunity to file an amended complaint within 21 days if Plaintiffs believe that they can cure any of the pleading deficiencies identified above. Whether or not Plaintiffs choose to replead, this case should move forward with discovery immediately. This case is set for further status on October 18, 2012 at 9:30 a.m. The parties are directed to meet and confer and to file a proposed discovery plan no later than October 16. Mailed notice (tbk, )
May 15, 2012 Filing 84 NOTICE by City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza re Response # 83 (Aguiar, William)
May 15, 2012 Filing 83 RESPONSE by Defendants City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza to Plaintiffs' Citation of Additional Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Aguiar, William)
April 26, 2012 Filing 82 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: MOTION by Plaintiff Second Amendment Arms to supplement - for Leave to Cite Additional Authorities # 79 is taken under advisement; Defendants' response due by 5/16/2012; Plaintiff's reply due by 5/23/2012; ruling will be by mail. Notice of Motion date of 5/3/2012 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (tbk, )
April 25, 2012 Filing 81 NOTICE of Motion by Walter Peter Maksym, Jr for presentment of motion to supplement # 79 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 5/3/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Maksym, Walter)
April 25, 2012 Filing 80 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Cite Additional New Authorities (Maksym, Walter)
April 25, 2012 Filing 79 MOTION by Plaintiff Second Amendment Arms to supplement - for Leave to Cite Additional Authorities (Maksym, Walter)
February 7, 2012 Filing 78 NOTICE by City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza re reply to response to motion # 77 (Aguiar, William)
February 7, 2012 Filing 77 REPLY by City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza to memorandum in opposition to motion # 69 to dismiss (Aguiar, William)
January 17, 2012 Filing 76 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Plaintiffs are given leave to file, instanter, response to defendants' motion to dismiss. MOTION by Defendants City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza to strike # 71 Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss # 58 is stricken as moot. Motion for Leave to File Tendered Memorandum, Instanter, # 75 is granted. Defendants are given to and including 2/7/2012 to file their reply brief in support of motion to dismiss. Mailed notice (tbk, )
January 17, 2012 Filing 75 MotionforLeavetoFileTenderedMemorandumInstanter NOTICE of Motion by Walter Peter Maksym, Jr for presentment of motion to strike # 71 , motion to dismiss # 58 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 1/17/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Maksym, Walter)
January 17, 2012 Filing 74 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re response to motion,, # 73 &MotionforLeavetoFileTenderedMemorandumInstanter; (Maksym, Walter)
January 17, 2012 Filing 73 RESPONSE by Second Amendment Arms to MOTION by Defendants City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza to strike Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss # 71 , MOTION by Defendants Rahm Emanuel, City Of Chicago, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza to dismiss Counts I, III, and VIII-XVIII of Second Amended Complaint # 58 ResponsetoMotiontoStrikeandMotionforLeavetoFileMemorandumInstanter (Attachments: # 1 MemoranduminOppositiontoMotiontoDismissSecondAmendedComplaint)(Maksym, Walter)
January 10, 2012 Filing 72 NOTICE of Motion by William Macy Aguiar for presentment of motion to strike # 71 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 1/17/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Aguiar, William)
January 10, 2012 Filing 71 MOTION by Defendants City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza to strike Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Aguiar, William)
December 28, 2011 Filing 70 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re response in opposition to motion # 68 , memorandum in opposition to motion # 69 of filing (Maksym, Walter)
December 28, 2011 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM by Second Amendment Arms in Opposition to motion to dismiss First Amended Complaint # 58 (Maksym, Walter) (Docket Text modified by Clerks' Office.)
December 28, 2011 Filing 68 RESPONSE by Second Amendment Armsin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Rahm Emanuel, City Of Chicago, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza to dismiss Counts I, III, and VIII-XVIII of Second Amended Complaint # 58 (Maksym, Walter)
December 16, 2011 Filing 67 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: MOTION by Plaintiff R. Joseph Franzese for extension of time # 64 to file response Re: Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, to and including 12/28/2011, is granted. Defendants' reply brief due by 1/18/2012.Notice of Motion date of 12/21/2011 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (tbk, )
December 14, 2011 Filing 66 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re MOTION by Plaintiff R. Joseph Franzese for extension of time to file response/reply Re: Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint # 64 , notice of motion # 65 (Maksym, Walter)
December 14, 2011 Filing 65 NOTICE of Motion by Walter Peter Maksym, Jr for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply # 64 , motion to dismiss # 58 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 12/21/2011 at 09:15 AM. (Maksym, Walter)
December 14, 2011 Filing 64 MOTION by Plaintiff R. Joseph Franzese for extension of time to file response/reply Re: Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (Maksym, Walter)
November 8, 2011 Filing 63 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: MOTION by Defendants Rahm Emanuel, City Of Chicago, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza to dismiss Counts I, III, and VIII-XVIII of Second Amended Complaint # 58 it taken under advisement; Plaintiffs' 24-page response due by 12/14/2011; Defendants' reply due by 1/4/2012; ruling will be by mail. Notice of Motion date of 11/10/2011 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (tbk, )
November 8, 2011 Filing 62 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: MOTION by Defendants City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza for leave to file excess pages # 60 in support of motion to dismiss Counts I, III, and VIII-XVIII of Second Amended Complaint is granted. Plaintiffs are allowed to file a response brief of 24 pages. Parties to notify the courtroom deputy with an agreed upon briefing schedule on the motion to dismiss. Notice of Motion date of 11/10/2011 is stricken. Mailed notice (tbk, )
November 4, 2011 Filing 61 NOTICE of Motion by William Macy Aguiar for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages, # 60 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 11/10/2011 at 09:15 AM. (Aguiar, William)
November 4, 2011 Filing 60 MOTION by Defendants City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza for leave to file excess pages in support of motion to dismiss Counts I, III, and VIII-XVIII of Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Aguiar, William)
November 4, 2011 Filing 59 NOTICE of Motion by William Macy Aguiar for presentment of motion to dismiss # 58 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 11/10/2011 at 09:15 AM. (Aguiar, William)
November 4, 2011 Filing 58 MOTION by Defendants Rahm Emanuel, City Of Chicago, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza to dismiss Counts I, III, and VIII-XVIII of Second Amended Complaint (Aguiar, William)
October 18, 2011 Filing 57 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: MOTION by Defendants City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza for extension of time # 55 to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiffs' Second Amended, to and including 11/4/2011, is granted. Notice of Motion date of 1/19/2011 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Notices Mailed by Judge's Staff (tbk, )
October 6, 2011 Filing 56 NOTICE of Motion by William Macy Aguiar for presentment of extension of time # 55 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 10/19/2011 at 09:15 AM. (Aguiar, William)
October 6, 2011 Filing 55 MOTION by Defendants City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Aguiar, William)
September 23, 2011 Filing 54 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: MOTION by Defendants City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza for extension of time # 52 to file answer or to otherwise plead, to and including 10/26/2011, is granted. Notice of Motion date of 9/27/2011 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Notices Mailed by Judge's Staff (tbk, )
September 20, 2011 Filing 53 NOTICE of Motion by William Macy Aguiar for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer # 52 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 9/27/2011 at 09:15 AM. (Aguiar, William)
September 20, 2011 Filing 52 MOTION by Defendants City Of Chicago, Rahm Emanuel, Gary McCarthy, Susana Mendoza for extension of time to file answer or to otherwise plead (unopposed) (Aguiar, William)
September 9, 2011 Filing 51 SECOND AMENDED complaint by Second Amendment Arms against City Of Chicago , RHAM EMANUEL, GARRY McCARTHY & SUSANA MENDOZA, (Maksym, Walter)
September 7, 2011 Filing 50 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Amended Notice of Filing Second Amended Complaint (Maksym, Walter)
September 7, 2011 Filing 49 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Filing of Second Amended Complaint (Maksym, Walter)
August 22, 2011 Filing 48 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: MOTION by Plaintiff Second Amendment Arms for extension of time # 45 to file Second Amended Complaint is granted to and including 9/7/2011. Defendants to file responsive pleading by 9/28/2011. Notice of Motion date of 8/24/2011 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Notices Mailed by Judge's Staff (tbk, )
August 18, 2011 Filing 47 NOTICE of Correction regarding MOTION by Plaintiff Second Amendment Arms for extension of time to file Second Amended Complaint # 43 ; Notice of motion # 44 . The incorrect document (PDF file) was linked to the entry (incomplete (PDF file)). The text of the entry has been edited. (jmp, )
August 17, 2011 Filing 46 NOTICE of Motion by Walter Peter Maksym, Jr for presentment of extension of time # 45 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 8/24/2011 at 09:15 AM. (Maksym, Walter)
August 17, 2011 Filing 45 MOTION by Plaintiff Second Amendment Arms for extension of time to file Second Amedned Complaint (Maksym, Walter)
August 17, 2011 Filing 44 THE incorrect document (PDF file) was linked to the entry (incomplete (PDF file)). The text of the entry has been edited. (Maksym, Walter) (Docket Text modified by Clerk's Office).
August 17, 2011 Filing 43 THE incorrect document (PDF file) was linked to the entry (incomplete (PDF file)). The text of the entry has been edited. (Maksym, Walter) (Docket Text modified by Clerk's Office). (jmp, ).
July 27, 2011 Filing 42 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Plaintiffs' oral motion for leave to file an amended complaint is granted. Notices Mailed by Judge's Staff (tbk, )
July 27, 2011 Filing 41 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held on 7/27/2011. As discussed on the record, Plaintiffs are given to and including 8/17/2011 to file an amended complaint. Defendants are given until 9/14/2011 to file responsive pleading to amended complaint. MOTION by Defendants to dismiss # 18 Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint is stricken as moot. Notices Mailed by Judge's Staff (tbk, )
July 12, 2011 Filing 40 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: The Court has before it Plaintiffs motion for leave to file and cite supplemental authority in opposition to Defendants motion to dismiss and for a finding of collateral estoppel # 37 . The Court is aware of the Ezell decision and thus grants the motion in part as to the filing and citation of supplemental authority. In regard to the other relief requested a finding of estoppel the Court enters and continues the motion to the next status hearing, which is set for 7/27/2011 at 10:30 a.m. At the status hearing, the Court would like the parties to be prepared to discuss, among other things, the first amended complaint, the pending motion to dismiss, the Ezell case, and the recent amendment to the Citys gun ordinance. The notice of motion date of 7/13/2011 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Notices Mailed by Judge's Staff (tbk, )
July 8, 2011 Filing 39 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re notice of motion # 38 , MOTION by Plaintiff Second Amendment Arms for leave to file Additional Authority and For Finding of Estoppel # 37 Notice of Filing (Maksym, Walter)
July 8, 2011 Filing 38 NOTICE of Motion by Walter Peter Maksym, Jr for presentment of motion for leave to file # 37 , motion to dismiss # 18 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 7/13/2011 at 09:15 AM. (Maksym, Walter)
July 8, 2011 Filing 37 MOTION by Plaintiff Second Amendment Arms for leave to file Additional Authority and For Finding of Estoppel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit"A" Ezell v. City of Chicago Slip Opinion)(Maksym, Walter)
June 16, 2011 Filing 36 NOTICE by City Of Chicago, Richard M. Daley, Mara Georges, Miguel del Valle, Jody P. Weis re Response # 35 (Aguiar, William)
June 16, 2011 Filing 35 RESPONSE by Defendants City Of Chicago, Richard M. Daley, Mara Georges, Miguel del Valle, Jody P. Weis to Plaintiffs' Citation of Additional Case Authority (Aguiar, William)
June 10, 2011 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: MOTION by Plaintiff Second Amendment Arms to supplement Memo in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss with additional case authority # 32 is granted. Defendants are given until 6/17/2011 to file a response to supplemental authority of no more than 4 pages. Notice of Motion date of 6/15/2011 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Notices Mailed by Judge's Staff (tbk, )
June 3, 2011 Filing 33 NOTICE of Motion by Walter Peter Maksym, Jr for presentment of motion to supplement # 32 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 6/15/2011 at 09:15 AM. (Maksym, Walter)
June 3, 2011 Filing 32 MOTION by Plaintiff Second Amendment Arms to supplement Memo in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss with additional case authority (Maksym, Walter)
March 4, 2011 Filing 31 NOTICE by City Of Chicago, Richard M. Daley, Mara Georges, Miguel del Valle, Jody P. Weis re reply to response to motion # 30 (Aguiar, William)
March 4, 2011 Filing 30 REPLY by City Of Chicago, Richard M. Daley, Mara Georges, Miguel del Valle, Jody P. Weis to memorandum in opposition to motion # 29 to dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Aguiar, William)
February 10, 2011 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM by Second Amendment Arms in Opposition to motion to dismiss # 18 filed on behalf of all Plaintiffs (Maksym, Walter)
February 9, 2011 Filing 28 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re response in opposition to motion, # 27 (Maksym, Walter)
February 9, 2011 Filing 27 RESPONSE by Second Amendment Armsin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Mara Georges, Jody P. Weis, Miguel del Valle, Richard M. Daley, City Of Chicago to dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint # 18 filed on behalf of all Plaintiffs (Maksym, Walter)
February 7, 2011 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: MOTION by Plaintiff Second Amendment Arms to file # 24 instanter Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is granted. Defendants' time to file reply brief is extended to 3/7/2011. Notice of Motion date of 2/9/2011 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed by Judge's Staff notice (tbk, )
February 4, 2011 Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion by Walter Peter Maksym, Jr for presentment of motion to file instanter # 24 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 2/9/2011 at 09:15 AM. (Maksym, Walter)
February 4, 2011 Filing 24 MOTION by Plaintiff Second Amendment Arms to file instanter Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Maksym, Walter)
December 8, 2010 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held on 12/8/2010. MOTION by Defendants Mara Georges, Jody P. Weis, Miguel del Valle, Richard M. Daley, City Of Chicago to dismiss # 18 Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint is taken under advisement; Plaintiffs' given leave to file a 20 page response to motion to dismiss by 1/21/2011; Defendants are given leave to file a 20 page reply by 2/16/2011; ruling on motion to dismiss will be by mail. Mailed notice (tbk, )
December 6, 2010 Filing 22 NOTICE by City Of Chicago, Richard M. Daley, Mara Georges, Miguel del Valle, Jody P. Weis re status report # 21 (Aguiar, William)
December 6, 2010 Filing 21 STATUS Report (Joint) by City Of Chicago, Richard M. Daley, Mara Georges, Miguel del Valle, Jody P. Weis (Aguiar, William)
November 24, 2010 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by William Macy Aguiar for presentment of motion to dismiss # 18 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 12/8/2010 at 09:00 AM. (Aguiar, William)
November 24, 2010 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM by City Of Chicago, Richard M. Daley, Mara Georges, Miguel del Valle, Jody P. Weis in support of motion to dismiss # 18 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Aguiar, William)
November 24, 2010 Filing 18 MOTION by Defendants Mara Georges, Jody P. Weis, Miguel del Valle, Richard M. Daley, City Of Chicago to dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Aguiar, William)
October 27, 2010 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Second Amendment Arms as to City Of Chicago on 10/6/2010, answer due 10/27/2010. (jmp, )
October 27, 2010 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Second Amendment Arms as to Mara Georges on 10/6/2010, answer due 10/27/2010. (jmp, )
October 27, 2010 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Second Amendment Arms as to Jody P. Weis on 10/6/2010, answer due 10/27/2010. (jmp, )
October 27, 2010 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by R. Joseph Franzese as to Richard M. Daley on 10/6/2010, answer due 10/27/2010. (jmp, )
October 27, 2010 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Second Amendment Arms as to Miguel del Valle on 10/6/2010, answer due 10/27/2010. (jmp, )
October 26, 2010 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: The Court has before it an initial status report # 7 filed by Plaintiffs and an unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead # 9 filed by Defendants, requesting an extension until 11/24/2010. In addition, as both documents [7, 9] report, there is a pending motion to reassign this case to Judge Guzman under Local Rule 40.4 as related to Benson v. City of Chicago, et al., No. 10-cv-4184. It appears from the docket sheet in that case that the motion to reassign will be fully briefed as of 11/29/2010 (see 10-cv-4184 # 50 ). In view of the foregoing, the motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to 11/24/2010 # 9 is granted, and the initial status hearing set for 10/27/2010 in this Court is stricken and reset to 12/8/2010 at 9:00 a.m. The notice of motion date of 10/28/2010 also is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (tbk, )
October 25, 2010 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants City Of Chicago, Richard M. Daley, Mara Georges, Maria Georges, Miguel del Valle, Jody P. Weis by Andrew W Worseck (Worseck, Andrew)
October 25, 2010 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by William Macy Aguiar for presentment of extension of time # 9 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 10/28/2010 at 09:15 AM. (Aguiar, William)
October 25, 2010 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendants City Of Chicago, Richard M. Daley, Mara Georges, Miguel del Valle, Jody P. Weis for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead (Aguiar, William)
October 25, 2010 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants City Of Chicago, Richard M. Daley, Mara Georges, Miguel del Valle, Jody P. Weis by William Macy Aguiar (Aguiar, William)
October 25, 2010 Filing 7 STATUS Report Intitial Status Report by Second Amendment Arms (Maksym, Walter)
October 1, 2010 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED complaint by Second Amendment Arms against All Plaintiffs byAllPlaintiffsAgainstAllDefendants (Maksym, Walter)
October 1, 2010 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Mara Georges. (ef, )
September 30, 2010 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants City Of Chicago, Richard M. Daley, Miguel del Valle, Jody P. Weis. (ef, )
September 21, 2010 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing date of 9/23/2010 is stricken and Status hearing reset for 10/27/2010 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (tbk, )
September 21, 2010 Filing 4 AMENDED complaint by Second Amendment Arms against Second Amendment Arms (Maksym, Walter)
September 10, 2010 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing set for 9/23/2010 at 09:00 AM. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Parties to prepare and submit a joint status report within two days prior to status. (See Judges web page for status report) Mailed notice (tbk, )
July 12, 2010 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. (emd, )
July 10, 2010 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Maksym, Walter)
July 9, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by SECOND AMENDMENT ARMS; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-4995638. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Maksym, Walter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Second Amendment Arms et al v. City of Chicago, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Joseph Franzese
Represented By: Walter Peter Maksym, Jr.
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Icarry
Represented By: Walter Peter Maksym, Jr.
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Kole
Represented By: Walter Peter Maksym, Jr.
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun Kranish
Represented By: Walter Peter Maksym, Jr.
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Second Amendment Arms
Represented By: Walter Peter Maksym, Jr.
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert M. Zieman, Sr.
Represented By: Walter Peter Maksym, Jr.
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Chicago
Represented By: William Macy Aguiar
Represented By: David Michael Baron
Represented By: Andrew W Worseck
Represented By: Ellen Wight Mclaughlin
Represented By: Justin Tresnowski
Represented By: Thomas P. McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard M. Daley
Represented By: Walter Peter Maksym, Jr.
Represented By: William Macy Aguiar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rahm Emanuel
Represented By: William Macy Aguiar
Represented By: David Michael Baron
Represented By: Ellen Wight Mclaughlin
Represented By: Justin Tresnowski
Represented By: Thomas P. McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mara Georges
Represented By: William Macy Aguiar
Represented By: Andrew W Worseck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Georges
Represented By: Andrew W Worseck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary McCarthy
Represented By: William Macy Aguiar
Represented By: David Michael Baron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susana Mendoza
Represented By: William Macy Aguiar
Represented By: David Michael Baron
Represented By: Ellen Wight Mclaughlin
Represented By: Justin Tresnowski
Represented By: Thomas P. McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel del Valle
Represented By: William Macy Aguiar
Represented By: Andrew W Worseck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody P. Weis
Represented By: William Macy Aguiar
Represented By: Andrew W Worseck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garry McCarthy
Represented By: William Macy Aguiar
Represented By: David Michael Baron
Represented By: Ellen Wight Mclaughlin
Represented By: Justin Tresnowski
Represented By: Thomas P. McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?