Ezell et al

Plaintiff: Rhonda Ezell, Joseph I. Brown, William Hespen, Action Target, Inc., Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. and Illinois State Rifle Association
Defendant: City Of Chicago
Case Number: 1:2010cv05135
Filed: August 16, 2010
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Virginia M. Kendall
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2014 280 Opinion or Order of the Court Enter MEMORANDUM, OPINION AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment 220 is granted in part and denied in part. Similarly, the Citys Motion for Summary Judgment 222 is granted in part and denied in part. The City's motion to dismiss claims as moot 269 is itself dismissed as moot pursuant to the parties' joint statement regarding remaining claims. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/29/2014.Mailed notice(tsa, )
February 22, 2013 204 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 2/22/2013.Mailed notice(tsa, )
September 28, 2011 122 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/28/2011.(tsa, )
April 8, 2011 109 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 4/8/2011:For the foregoing reasons, the Citys motion to stay (Doc. 85) is granted and its motion to dismiss (Doc. 67) is denied without prejudice. Entered by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 4/8/2011.Mailed notice(tsa, )
October 12, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 10/12/2010.(tsa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ezell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Ezell
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph I. Brown
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hespen
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Action Target, Inc.
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illinois State Rifle Association
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Chicago
Represented By: Andrew W Worseck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?