Multi-Format, Inc. v. Apple, Inc. Featured Case

Multi-Format, Inc, a New Jersey company filed a patent infringement lawsuit against Apple, Inc. over the plaintiff's RE38,079 ('079 patent') patent called the "Multi-Format Audio/Video Production System." Multi-Format claims that downloadable movies and videos violate its '079 patent

Plaintiff: Multi-Format, Inc.
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv06007
Filed: September 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Ronald A. Guzman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2011 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: All matters in controversy having been settled, the above-entitled case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Any pending motions or schedules are stricken as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (cjg, )
December 14, 2010 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing reset to 1/7/2011 at 09:30 AM. on request of parties to complete settlement. Mailed notice (cjg, )
November 17, 2010 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing reset to 12/15/2010 at 09:30 AM. on request of parties to complete settlement negotiations. Mailed notice (cjg, )
September 22, 2010 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court orders the parties to appear for an initial status hearing. All parties shall refer to and comply with Judge Guzman's requirements for the initial appearance as outlined in Judge Guzman's case management procedures, which can be found at: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Status hearing set for 11/22/2010 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (cjg, )
September 21, 2010 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Multi-Format, Inc. by Paul Christopher Gibbons (Gibbons, Paul)
September 21, 2010 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Multi-Format, Inc. by Paul K Vickrey (Vickrey, Paul)
September 21, 2010 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Multi-Format, Inc. by Kara Leta Szpondowski (Szpondowski, Kara)
September 21, 2010 Filing 4 LOCAL RULE 3.4 NOTICE OF CLAIMS INVOLVING PATENT by Multi-Format, Inc. (Szpondowski, Kara)
September 21, 2010 Filing 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Multi-Format, Inc. (Szpondowski, Kara)
September 21, 2010 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. (daj, )
September 21, 2010 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Szpondowski, Kara)
September 21, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Multi-Format, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-5238691. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Szpondowski, Kara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Multi-Format, Inc. v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Multi-Format, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Christopher Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?