Flava Works, Inc. v. Gunter et al

Plaintiff: Flava Works, Inc.
Defendant: Marques Rondale Gunter, myVidster.com, SalsaIndy, LLC and John Does 1 through 26
Case Number: 1:2010cv06517
Filed: October 12, 2010
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John F. Grady
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2013 239 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by the Honorable John F. Grady on October 24, 2013. Mailed notice(cdh, )
September 3, 2013 234 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by the Honorable John F. Grady on September 3, 2013. Mailed notice(cdh, )
December 13, 2012 185 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by the Honorable John F. Grady on 12/13/2012. Mailed notice(meg, )
September 1, 2011 89 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by the Honorable John F. Grady on 9/1/2011. Mailed notice(cdh, )
July 27, 2011 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion Signed by the Honorable John F. Grady on 7/27/2011. Mailed notice(cdh, )
May 10, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion signed by the Honorable John F. Grady on 5/10/2011. Mailed notice(cdh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flava Works, Inc. v. Gunter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flava Works, Inc.
Represented By: Meanith Huon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marques Rondale Gunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: myVidster.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SalsaIndy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 through 26
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?