C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc. v. Auster Acquisitions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Veg-Pro, Inc., Kiko's Produce, Inc., C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc., Jack Tuchten Wholesale Produce, Inc., Providencia Produce, Inc., Georgia Vegetable Co., Inc., Dietz & Kolodenko Co. and Woody's Tomato Corporation
Defendant: Auster Acquisitions, LLC, Paul Duggin and Standard Bank and Trust Co.
Intervenor_plaintiff: AMC Direct, Inc., West Coast Tomato, LLC, Get Fresh Produce, Inc., Everyday Fresh Produce, Inc., Truong Enterprises, Inc., RPE, Inc., New York Apple Sales, Inc., J.L. Gonzalez Produce, Inc., Emerald Packing Company, LLC, Nico Mexi Foods, Inc., Scattaglia Growers and Shippers, LLC, T.J. Produce, Inc., Domex Superfresh Growers, LLC, Hughes Produce Sales, Inc., New Era Produce, LLC, Dayka & Hackett, LLC, Tom Lange Company, Inc., EJ's Produce Sales, Inc., Evergreen International, Inc., Produce Plus Inc, Keith Connell, Inc., Jack Brown Produce, Inc., Veg-Fresh, Inc., Durango's Products, Inc. dba Junior Produce, Ruby Robinson Co., Inc., Strube Celery and Vegetable Company, Quality Food Products, Inc., Michael J. Navilio & Son, Inc. and Mandolini Company, Inc.
Intervenor_defendant: The Estate of Dennis F. Nardoni, Auster Acquisitions, LLC, Thomas Bastounes, Paul J. Duggan, Michael D Hughes and Standard Bank and Trust Co.
Receiver: JAMES HUBBARD, solely in his capacity as receiver for AUSTER ACQUISITIONS, LLC
Claimant: Central Washington Marketing, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00105
Filed: January 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Charles P. Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Agricultural Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 778 WRITTEN Opinion signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 6/13/2013: Standard Bank's motion (Doc 739 ) for summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part. The motion is denied as moot with respect to the issue of supplemental ju risdiction. The motion is granted with respect to the applicability of Illinois law as it relates to § 284 in determining the breach of the PACA trust. Status hearing set for 6/26/2013 to stand. (For further details see minute order.)Mailed notice(sct, )
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 687 MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 9/11/2012.Mailed notice(sct, )
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 387 MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 10/11/2011.Mailed notice(sct, )
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 354 MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/26/2011.Mailed notice(sct, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc. v. Auster Acquisitions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veg-Pro, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Anthony Amendola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiko's Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Anthony Amendola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Anthony Amendola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Tuchten Wholesale Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory James Jordan
Represented By: Mark Anthony Amendola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Providencia Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Anthony Amendola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Vegetable Co., Inc.
Represented By: Mark Anthony Amendola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dietz & Kolodenko Co.
Represented By: Mark Anthony Amendola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Woody's Tomato Corporation
Represented By: Mark Anthony Amendola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: AMC Direct, Inc.
Represented By: John Francis Horvath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: West Coast Tomato, LLC
Represented By: Gretchen Wehrenberg Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Get Fresh Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Gretchen Wehrenberg Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Everyday Fresh Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Gretchen Wehrenberg Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Truong Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Gretchen Wehrenberg Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: RPE, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M DeFalco
Represented By: Katy Koestner Esquivel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: New York Apple Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M DeFalco
Represented By: Katy Koestner Esquivel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: J.L. Gonzalez Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M DeFalco
Represented By: Katy Koestner Esquivel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Emerald Packing Company, LLC
Represented By: Brian Lloyd Josias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Nico Mexi Foods, Inc.
Represented By: David Alan Adelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Scattaglia Growers and Shippers, LLC
Represented By: Michael Howard Erdman
Represented By: John L. Leonard
Represented By: R. Jason Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: T.J. Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Howard Erdman
Represented By: John L. Leonard
Represented By: R. Jason Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Domex Superfresh Growers, LLC
Represented By: Michael Howard Erdman
Represented By: John L. Leonard
Represented By: R. Jason Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Hughes Produce Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Howard Erdman
Represented By: John L. Leonard
Represented By: R. Jason Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: New Era Produce, LLC
Represented By: Michael Howard Erdman
Represented By: John L. Leonard
Represented By: R. Jason Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Dayka & Hackett, LLC
Represented By: R. Jason Read
Represented By: R. Jason Read
Represented By: Michael Howard Erdman
Represented By: John L. Leonard
Represented By: Michael Howard Erdman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Tom Lange Company, Inc.
Represented By: R. Jason Read
Represented By: John L. Leonard
Represented By: Michael Howard Erdman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: EJ's Produce Sales, Inc.
Represented By: R. Jason Read
Represented By: John L. Leonard
Represented By: Michael Howard Erdman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Evergreen International, Inc.
Represented By: David A Trais
Represented By: Katy Koestner Esquivel
Represented By: Steven M DeFalco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Produce Plus Inc
Represented By: David A Trais
Represented By: Katy Koestner Esquivel
Represented By: Steven M DeFalco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Keith Connell, Inc.
Represented By: David A Trais
Represented By: Katy Koestner Esquivel
Represented By: Steven M DeFalco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Jack Brown Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Ryan Klinowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Veg-Fresh, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Ryan Klinowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Durango's Products, Inc. dba Junior Produce
Represented By: Gregory James Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Ruby Robinson Co., Inc.
Represented By: Gregory James Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Strube Celery and Vegetable Company
Represented By: Gregory James Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Quality Food Products, Inc.
Represented By: George V. Kalantzis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Michael J. Navilio & Son, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Ordower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Mandolini Company, Inc.
Represented By: David Alan Adelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: The Estate of Dennis F. Nardoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Auster Acquisitions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Thomas Bastounes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Paul J. Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Michael D Hughes
Represented By: Carolina Yago Sales
Represented By: Kenneth A. Michaels, Jr.
Represented By: Lucas Jack Hinkle
Represented By: Paul Michael Bauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Standard Bank and Trust Co.
Represented By: Marc Scott Zaslavsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auster Acquisitions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Duggin
Represented By: Jennifer Michelle Ryder
Represented By: Richard J. Prendergast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Bank and Trust Co.
Represented By: Marc Scott Zaslavsky
Represented By: Thomas P. Yardley
Represented By: Paul Dunn Lynch, Jr.
Represented By: Barry A. Chatz
Represented By: George P. Apostolides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: JAMES HUBBARD, solely in his capacity as receiver for AUSTER ACQUISITIONS, LLC
Represented By: Karen Vivian Newbury
Represented By: Eugene J. Geekie, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Central Washington Marketing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?