Bryant v. Cummens et al
Plaintiff: |
Eliga Bryant |
Defendant: |
Police Officer Cummens and Police Officer Hurman |
Case Number: |
1:2011cv01345 |
Filed: |
February 25, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois |
Office: |
Chicago Office |
County: |
Cook |
Presiding Judge: |
Sharon Johnson Coleman |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 16, 2018 |
Filing
237
AMENDED MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: The Court enters the attached Amended Memorandum Opinion and Order to correct a misspelling on page 3 and typographical error on page 6. The Court corrects its statement on page 6 that "Defendants propos e an hourly rate of $350 for Mr. Dreyfus." See [ECF No. 236], at 6. That is not correct. Defendants propose an hourly rate of $300 for Mr. Dreyfus. See [ECF No. 224], at 8. The Court agreed that $300 is the appropriate hourly rate for Mr. Dreyfus, and later in the Opinion, the Court calculated Mr. Dreyfus's lodestar using a rate of $300/hour. See [ECF No. 236], at 10. The Amended Memorandum Opinion and Order is unchanged in all other respects. Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert on 10/16/2018. Mailed notice (ber, )
|
October 9, 2018 |
Filing
236
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the reasons set forth in the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order, Plaintiff's petition for attorneys' fees under 42 U.S.C. § 1988 [ECF No. 212] is granted in part and denied i n part. The Court awards Plaintiff's attorneys, Mr. Zinger and Mr. Dreyfus, a total of $292,474 in fees allocated between them as discussed in the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order. See attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for further details. Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert on 10/9/2018. Mailed notice (ber, )
|
January 30, 2017 |
Filing
124
ORDER: Plaintiff's Motions in Limine 114 are granted in part, denied in part, and remain under advisement in part. Defendants' Motions in Limine 113 are granted in part, denied in part, and remain under advisement in part. See attached Statement for further details. Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert on 1/30/2017. Mailed notice (ber, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?