Wimo Labs LLC v. Sebert Featured Case
Plaintiff: Wimo Labs LLC
Defendant: Kesha Sebert
Case Number: 1:2011cv02978
Filed: May 4, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Edmond E. Chang
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2011 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang:By stipulation of the parties this action is dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees.Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (slb, )
June 14, 2011 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Saucier, Brian)
May 31, 2011 Filing 7 Response to Request for Additional Information by Wimo Labs LLC (Saucier, Brian)
May 19, 2011 MAILED Trademark request letter to counsel of record. (ph, )
May 5, 2011 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. (nsf, )
May 4, 2011 Filing 6 Notification by Wimo Labs LLC of Claim Involving Trademarks Pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 (Saucier, Brian)
May 4, 2011 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Wimo Labs LLC re complaint 4 (Saucier, Brian)
May 4, 2011 Filing 4 COMPLAINT filed by Wimo Labs LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-5969116. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Saucier, Brian)
May 4, 2011 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Wimo Labs LLC by Jennifer Rojas (Rojas, Jennifer)
May 4, 2011 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Wimo Labs LLC by Brian D. Saucier (Saucier, Brian)
May 4, 2011 Filing 1 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Saucier, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wimo Labs LLC v. Sebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wimo Labs LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Rojas
Represented By: Brian D. Saucier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kesha Sebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?