Urwiler v. Deerfield Public Library Featured Case

Plaintiff: Sheila Urwiler
Defendant: Deerfield Public Library
Case Number: 1:2011cv03115
Filed: May 10, 2011
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Harry D. Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2011 10 MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Cause dismissed pursuant to the agreed stipulation to dismiss with prejudice.Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (wp, )
September 7, 2011 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Rodosky, Katherine)
July 19, 2011 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Deerfield Public Library(Rodosky, Katherine)
July 18, 2011 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Deerfield Public Library by Stephanie Ann Cantrell Amended (Cantrell, Stephanie)
July 15, 2011 6 NOTICE of Correction regarding attorney appearance 5 . Incorrect ARDC Number on document. The text of the entry has been edited. The document must be re-filed. File an amended appearance form. (smm)
July 14, 2011 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Deerfield Public Library by Stephanie Ann Cantrell (Cantrell, Stephanie)
July 14, 2011 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Deerfield Public Library by Katherine Ann Rodosky (Rodosky, Katherine)
May 10, 2011 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. (mh, )
May 10, 2011 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sheila Urwiler by Elisabeth E. Efird (Efird, Elisabeth)
May 10, 2011 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Efird, Elisabeth)
May 10, 2011 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sheila Urwiler; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-5987217.(Efird, Elisabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Urwiler v. Deerfield Public Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Urwiler
Represented By: Elisabeth E. Efird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deerfield Public Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?