First Time Videos, LLC v. Does 1-76 Featured Case

An adult film company sues 76 'Does' for alleged copyright infringement by downloading, reproducing, and redistributing its FTV - Tiffany pornography video on the Web via Bit Torrent.

Among the the IP addresses listed by plaintiff are University of Chicago and University of Illinois at Chicago IPs.

Plaintiff: First Time Videos, LLC
Defendant: Does 1-76
Case Number: 1:2011cv03831
Filed: June 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Elaine E. Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2012 Filing 54 MINUTE entry before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo:Notice of voluntary dismissal of remaining Doe defendants filed. The case is terminated without prejudice. Mailed notice (ca, )
February 29, 2012 Filing 53 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by First Time Videos, LLC of Remaining Doe Defendants Without Prejudice (Duffy, Paul)
January 30, 2012 Filing 52 MINUTE entry before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Status hearing held on 1/30/2012. Status hearing set for 4/6/2012 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (ca, )
December 20, 2011 Filing 51 MINUTE entry before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Status hearing held on 12/20/2011. Pursuant to Notice of voluntary dismissal of certain Doe defendants, Defendants with IP addresses 98.213.127.57; 67.165.187.134; and 67.184.193.186 are dismissed without prejudice. Status hearing set for 1/30/2012 at 09:30 AM.Mailed notice (ca, )
November 21, 2011 Filing 50 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by First Time Videos, LLC of Certain Doe Defendants Without Prejudice (Duffy, Paul)
November 21, 2011 Filing 49 Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel by First Time Videos, LLC (Duffy, Paul)
November 21, 2011 Filing 48 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff First Time Videos, LLC by Paul A. Duffy (Duffy, Paul)
November 18, 2011 Filing 47 MINUTE entry before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo:Plaintiff's motion to substitute attorney 45 is granted. Accordingly, John Steele is allowed to withdraw his appearance and Paul Duffy is allowed to file his appearance as substitute counsel.Mailed notice (mpj, )
November 14, 2011 Filing 46 NOTICE of Motion by John Steele for presentment of motion to substitute attorney 45 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 11/21/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Steele, John)
November 11, 2011 Filing 45 MOTION by Plaintiff First Time Videos, LLC to substitute attorney (Steele, John)
November 9, 2011 Filing 44 MINUTE entry before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo:Status hearing held on 11/9/2011. Status hearing set for 12/20/2011 at 09:30 AM.Mailed notice (mpj, )
November 7, 2011 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo:Pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, Doe defendants 13-22 are dismissed. Mailed notice (mpj, )
October 6, 2011 Filing 42 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by First Time Videos, LLC of Certain Doe Defendants With Prejudice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Steele, John)
September 13, 2011 Filing 41 MINUTE entry before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo:Status hearing held on 9/13/2011. Status hearing set for 11/9/2011 at 09:30 AM.Mailed notice (mpj, )
August 22, 2011 Filing 40 NOTICE by John Steele of Change of Address (Steele, John)
August 17, 2011 Filing 39 MINUTE entry before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo:Status hearing held on 8/17/2011. Status hearing set for 9/13/2011 at 09:30 AM. at which time, plaintiff's counsel must be present or the case will be dismissed.Mailed notice (mpj, )
August 16, 2011 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 8/16/2011:Mailed notice(mpj, )
August 16, 2011 Filing 37 MINUTE entry before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: For the reasons explained in the Memorandum Opinion and Order, motions to quash 13 , 17 , 25 , and 26 are denied. In addition, defendant's motion for a protective order 16 , which is sought "to protect his identity from being disclosed to the Plaintiff and automatically subjecting himself to the jurisdiction of this court," is also denied.Mailed notice (mpj, )
August 15, 2011 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo:Pursuant to Notice of Dismissal, defendants Does 1-12 are dismissed.Mailed notice (mpj, )
August 11, 2011 Filing 35 REPLY by Does 1-76 to response in opposition to motion 29 , MOTION by Defendant Does 1-76 to quash on behalf of one of the Does 25 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Mirsafian, Masoud)
August 10, 2011 Filing 34 REPLY by Does 1-76 to response in opposition to motion, 22 , MOTION by Defendant Does 1-76 to quash and for other relief on behalf of Doe 24.15.217.102 20 , MOTION by Defendant Does 1-76 to quash and for other relief on behalf of Doe 71.239.21.116 13 (Hoffman, Jay)
August 10, 2011 Filing 33 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by First Time Videos, LLC of Certain Doe Defendants with Prejudice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Steele, John)
August 4, 2011 Filing 32 Submission of Copyright Application by First Time Videos, LLC & Date of First Publication (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Copyright Application)(Steele, John)
July 29, 2011 Filing 31 RESPONSE by First Time Videos, LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Does 1-76 to quash 26 (Steele, John)
July 28, 2011 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Various motions to quash heard on 7/28/11 and the motions are entered and continued. As responses have been filed, replies will be due by 8/11/11. Plaintiff shall provide defendants with a copy of the application, and the information regarding the date of first publication within one week. Status hearing set for 9/7/11 is reset for 8/17/2011 at 09:45 AM.Mailed notice (mpj, )
July 27, 2011 Filing 29 RESPONSE by First Time Videos, LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Does 1-76 to quash on behalf of one of the Does 25 (Steele, John)
July 27, 2011 Filing 28 RESPONSE by First Time Videos, LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Does 1-76 for protective order 16 , MOTION by Defendant Does 1-76 to quash 17 (Steele, John)
July 27, 2011 Filing 27 Amended NOTICE of Motion by Masoud Mirsafian for presentment of motion to quash 25 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 7/5/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Mirsafian, Masoud)
July 26, 2011 Filing 25 MOTION by Defendant Does 1-76 to quash on behalf of one of the Does (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Mirsafian, Masoud)
July 26, 2011 Filing 24 NOTICE of Motion by Defendant Does 1-76 to quash on behalf of one of the Does (Mirsafian, Masoud) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office.) (ber, ).
July 26, 2011 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Does 1-76 by Masoud Mirsafian one of the Does (Mirsafian, Masoud)
July 26, 2011 Filing 22 RESPONSE by First Time Videos, LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Does 1-76 to quash and for other relief on behalf of Doe 24.15.217.102 20 , MOTION by Defendant Does 1-76 to quash and for other relief on behalf of Doe 71.239.21.116 13 (Steele, John)
July 25, 2011 Filing 26 MOTION by Defendant Doe 71.239.83.151 to quash or modify subpoena. (ber, )
July 25, 2011 Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion by Jay R. Hoffman for presentment of motion to quash 20 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 8/2/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Hoffman, Jay)
July 25, 2011 Filing 20 MOTION by Defendant Does 1-76 to quash and for other relief on behalf of Doe 24.15.217.102 (Hoffman, Jay)
July 25, 2011 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Does 1-76 by Jay R. Hoffman On Behalf Of Doe 24.15.217.102 (Hoffman, Jay)
July 22, 2011 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by John Doe for presentment of motion for protective order 16 , motion to quash 17 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 7/28/2011 at 09:30 AM. (ber, )
July 22, 2011 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendant John Doe 67.184.193.186 to quash. (ber, )
July 22, 2011 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendant John Doe 67.184.193.186 for protective order. (ber, )
July 22, 2011 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Jay R. Hoffman for presentment of motion to quash 13 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 8/2/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Hoffman, Jay)
July 22, 2011 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Does 1-76 by Jay R. Hoffman As to Doe Associated With IP Address 71.239.21.116 (Hoffman, Jay)
July 22, 2011 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant Does 1-76 to quash and for other relief on behalf of Doe 71.239.21.116 (Hoffman, Jay)
June 17, 2011 Filing 11 LETTER from Plaintiff's counsel regarding Copyright information. (ber, )
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE DISCOVERY PRIOR TO THE RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 6/16/2011:Mailed notice(mpj, )
June 16, 2011 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo:Plaintiff's motion to expedite discovery 5 is granted. Status hearing held on 6/16/2011. Status hearing set for 9/7/2011 at 09:30 AM.Mailed notice (mpj, )
June 13, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by John Steele for presentment of motion to expedite 5 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 6/16/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Steele, John)
June 7, 2011 MAILED Patent Request Letter to Plaintiff's counsel. (ber, )
June 6, 2011 Filing 7 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/6/2011. (ber, )
June 6, 2011 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by John Steele for presentment of motion to expedite 5 before Honorable John F. Grady on 6/15/2011 at 11:00 AM. (Steele, John)
June 6, 2011 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff First Time Videos, LLC to expedite discovery (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to take Discovery, # 2 Declaration of Peter Hansmeier)(Steele, John)
June 6, 2011 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Grady. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Michael T. Mason. (daj, )
June 6, 2011 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Disclosure (Steele, John)
June 6, 2011 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff First Time Videos, LLC by John Steele (Steele, John)
June 6, 2011 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Steele, John)
June 6, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by First Time Videos, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-6069158. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Steele, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Time Videos, LLC v. Does 1-76
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Time Videos, LLC
Represented By: John Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-76
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?