United States of America v. All funds on deposit with R.J. O'Brien & Associates, held in the name of Bridge Investment, S.L., bearing account numbers XXX-X3931 and XXX-X1784, maintained at Harris Bank account number XXX-171
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: All funds on deposit with R.J. O'Brien & Associates, held in the name of Bridge Investment, S.L., bearing account numbers XXX-X3931 and XXX-X1784, maintained at Harris Bank account number XXX-171
Claimant: OneBeacon Insurance Group, American Alternative Insurance Company, The Princeton Excess & Surplus Lines Insurance Company, and Great Lakes UK Insurance Company and Vigilant Insurance Company, Chubb Custom Insurance Company, Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Chubb Insurance Company New Jersey, Chubb Insurance Company of Canada, Pacific
Case Number: 1:2011cv04175
Filed: June 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/9/2014: For the reasons stated in the accompanying decision, the Court grants in part claimants' motion for attorney's fees and costs [docket no. 168]. Claimant s' modified requested fee and cost award request of $341,535.62 should be reduced as stated in the decision. Counsel are directed to confer promptly to quantify the reductions ordered by the Court and are to make a supplemental joint submission in that regard by no later than May 21, 2014. (mk)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order written by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/9/2013. For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants the claimant insurance companies' motions for summary judgment [docket no. 127 in Case No. 11 C 4175; docket no. 55 in Case No. 12 C 1346] and denies the government's motion for summary judgment [docket no. 134 in Case No. 11 C 4175]. The Clerk is directed to terminate both cases. Claimants are directed to provide a proposed form of judgment for each cas e by no later than October 31, 2013, after first providing a draft to the government's counsel. The Court notes, in this regard, that it is setting a longer-than-usual deadline due to the current government shutdown (though the government's attorney, who is generally assigned to the criminal side of the United States Attorney's Office, appears to still be on the job). The Court also notes in that regard that because no judgment or final orderhas yet been entered, the time to appeal has not yet begun to run. The case is set for a status hearing on November 5, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice.(pjg, )
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/25/12: For the reasons stated in this Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court denies the government's motion to quash [case no. 12 C 1346, docket no. 13] and grants the claimants' motion to amend [case no. 11 C 4175, docket no. 77]. The case is set for a status hearing on October 2, 2012 at 9:30 a.m. to set a schedule for further proceedings. (mk)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/27/12. (mk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. All funds on deposit with R.J. O'Brien & Associates, held in the name of Bridge Investment, S.L., bearing account numbers XXX-X3931 and XXX-X1784, maintained at Harris Bank account number XXX-171
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All funds on deposit with R.J. O'Brien & Associates, held in the name of Bridge Investment, S.L., bearing account numbers XXX-X3931 and XXX-X1784, maintained at Harris Bank account number XXX-171
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: OneBeacon Insurance Group
Represented By: James Irving Tarman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: American Alternative Insurance Company, The Princeton Excess & Surplus Lines Insurance Company, and Great Lakes UK Insurance Company
Represented By: James Irving Tarman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Vigilant Insurance Company, Chubb Custom Insurance Company, Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Chubb Insurance Company New Jersey, Chubb Insurance Company of Canada, Pacific
Represented By: James Irving Tarman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Joel M. Hammerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?