Oracle America, Inc. v. Google Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Oracle America, Inc.
Defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv05320
Filed: August 5, 2011
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Samuel Der-Yeghiayan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2011 11 MINUTE entry before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Motion hearing held. Daniel Muino's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice for Plaintiff 9 is granted. As stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion to compel the deposition of Motorola 6 is stricken as moot. Mailed notice. (mr, )
August 10, 2011 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Oracle America, Inc. by Kenneth E. Kraus (Kraus, Kenneth)
August 6, 2011 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6258857. (Muino, Daniel)
August 5, 2011 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Oracle America, Inc. Motion to Compel Deposition of Motorola and supporting documents served on Motorola Mobility, Inc. on 08/05/2011 (Flaming, Todd)
August 5, 2011 7 NOTICE of Motion by Todd H. Flaming for presentment of motion to compel 6 before Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 8/11/2011 at 09:00 AM. (Flaming, Todd)
August 5, 2011 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. (daj, )
August 5, 2011 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Oracle America, Inc. to compel the Deposition of Motorola (Flaming, Todd)
August 5, 2011 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of Oracle's Motion to Compel the Deposition of Motorola (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Flaming, Todd)
August 5, 2011 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Oracle America, Inc. (Flaming, Todd)
August 5, 2011 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Flaming, Todd)
August 5, 2011 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Oracle America, Inc. by Todd H. Flaming (Flaming, Todd)
August 5, 2011 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE by Oracle America, Inc. Motion to Compel the Deposition of Motorola Filing fee $ 39, receipt number 0752-6256903. (Flaming, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oracle America, Inc. v. Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oracle America, Inc.
Represented By: Todd H. Flaming
Represented By: Kenneth E. Kraus
Represented By: Daniel P. Muino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?