Tobias v. Dart et al
Plaintiff: Garry L Tobias
Defendant: Tom Dart, Cook County Jail, Exective Staff and Medical Staff
Case Number: 1:2011cv05913
Filed: August 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Marvin E. Aspen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the reasons stated above, the Court grants Defendants' motion for summary judgment 42 and enters judgment in their favor. Tobias' claims are dismissed. This Case is closed. Tobias' "Motion of Filing" 55 is granted to the extent the Court has accepted it and considered it as part of his response to the summary judgment; this motion is denied as to any other relief it seeks. Case Terminated Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/11/2013:Mailed notice(srn, )
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 5/14/2012: Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") # 12 is stricken as unnecessary as Plaintiff's prior application # 5 is sufficient. The Co urt grants Plaintiff IFP status and calculates the initial partial filing fee based upon his prior application. The trust fund officer at Plaintiff's place of confinement is directed to make deductions from Plaintiff's account in accordan ce with this order. The clerk shall mail a copy of this order to the trust fund officer at the Cook County Jail. Plaintiff's amended complaint # 11 may proceed against Tom Dart and Superintendent Robert Lyles. The clerk shall issue summonses for service of the amended complaint on these Defendants. The other Defendants are dismissed. (For further details see written opinion.) Mailed notice (ma,)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 4/3/2012: Plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") 8 is denied as unnecessary. Plaintiff's previous IFP application 5 provides sufficient information to ma ke an IFP determination. The court grants Plaintiff's request to proceed IFP. The trust fund officer at Plaintiff's place of confinement is authorized to make deductions from Plaintiff's trust fund account in accordance with this ord er. Plaintiff is given 30 days from the date of this order to submit an amended complaint asserting claims not covered by the class in Parish v. Sheriff of Cook County, No. 07 C 4369 (Feinerman, J.) and naming as Defendants the parties responsible for those claims. The clerk shall forward an amended complaint form to Plaintiff. His failure to submit an amended complaint will result in the imposition of a stay of the current complaint until he can proceed in a suit separate from the Parish class action. (For further details see written opinion.) Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 4/3/2012. Mailed notice(ma,)
December 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 12/29/2011: Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis 5 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff has not informed the court whether he seeks to proceed as part of the class in Par ish v. Sheriff of Cook County, No. 07 C 4369 (Feinerman, J.), or whether he seeks to opt out of the class and proceed individually with this suit. Plaintiff is given 30 days from the date of this order to inform the court in writing which way he woul d like to proceed. If Plaintiff chooses to proceed with this case separate from the class, the court will reconsider his in forma pauperis application and stay this case for the reasons set out in this order. Plaintiff's failure to respond in wr iting to this order within 30 days may be construed as his desire to proceed as part of the class and will result in the dismissal of this case without prejudice to him proceeding with his claim as a member of the Parish class. (For further details see written opinion.) Mailed notice (ma,)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tobias v. Dart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Dart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exective Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garry L Tobias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?