Erwin v. U.S. Department of State

Defendant: U.S. Department of State
Plaintiff: John Erwin
Case Number: 1:2011cv06513
Filed: September 16, 2011
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 1/22/2014:Mailed notice.(jlj)
March 6, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 3/6/2013.Mailed notice.(jlj)
December 9, 2013 98 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 12/9/2013.Mailed notice.(jlj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erwin v. U.S. Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of State
Represented By: AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Erwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.