Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Mutual Bank

Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Mutual Bank
Defendant: Steven Lakner, Ronald Tucek, Patrick McCarthy, Paul Pappageorge, Richard Barth, Thomas Pacocha, James Regas, Regas, Frezados & Dallas LLP, Amrish Mahajan, Arun Veluchamy and Anu Veluchamy
Case Number: 1:2011cv07590
Filed: October 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Virginia M. Kendall
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 29:1109
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 311 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 7/9/2014. (ma,)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Enter MEMORANDUM, OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons stated herein, FDICs Motion to reconsider or certify for interlocutory appeal is denied. Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 7/16/2013.Mailed notice(tsa, )
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 2/12/2013. Advised in open court notice(tsa, )
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 7/26/2012. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Mutual Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Lakner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Tucek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Pappageorge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Barth
Represented By: John M. George
Represented By: Nancy Anne Temple
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Tone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Pacocha
Represented By: Beth Anne Black
Represented By: Steven Marc Malina
Represented By: Shannon Tierney Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Regas
Represented By: Kimberly Elizabeth Blair
Represented By: John M. George
Represented By: Nancy Anne Temple
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Tone
Represented By: Michael P. Tone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regas, Frezados & Dallas LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amrish Mahajan
Represented By: Shannon Tierney Murphy
Represented By: Steven Marc Malina
Represented By: Beth Anne Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arun Veluchamy
Represented By: Randall Marc Lending
Represented By: Joshua David Nichols
Represented By: Chad Allen Schiefelbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anu Veluchamy
Represented By: Randall Marc Lending
Represented By: Joshua David Nichols
Represented By: Chad Allen Schiefelbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Mutual Bank
Represented By: Richard Henry Tilghman
Represented By: Tina B. Solis
Represented By: F. Thomas Hecht
Represented By: Dean J. Polales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?