Apple, Inc. v. Motorola, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Apple, Inc. and Next Software, Inc.
Defendant: Motorola, Inc. and Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Apple, Inc. and Next Software, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Apple, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. and Next Software, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv08540
Filed: December 1, 2011
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Richard A. Posner
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2012 1054 NOTICE of DOCKETING from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit. (nf, )
August 2, 2012 1053 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 6/20/12 before the Honorable Richard A. Posner. Court Reporter Contact Information: Joseph Rickhoff, 312-435-5562, joseph_rickhoff@ilnd.uscourts.gov. <P>IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings.</P> Redaction Request due 8/23/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2012. (Rickhoff, Joseph)
August 2, 2012 1052 Joint Certification of Ordered Transcripts by Motorola Mobility, Inc. and Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Williamson, Amanda)
August 2, 2012 1051 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 03/12/12 before the Honorable Richard A. Posner. Continued Markman Hearing. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colleen Conway@312.435.5594 or colleen_conway@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/23/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2012. (Conway, Colleen)
August 2, 2012 1050 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 05/16/12 before the Honorable Richard A. Posner. Court Reporter Contact Information: Parick Mullen, (312) 435-5565, patrick_mullen@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/23/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2012. (Mullen, Patrick)
August 2, 2012 1049 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on June 7, 2012 before the Honorable Richard A. Posner. Court Reporter Contact Information: Carolyn Cox, 312-435-5639, Carolyn_Cox@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/23/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2012. (Cox, Carolyn)
August 2, 2012 1048 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on May 24, 2012 before the Honorable Richard A. Posner. Court Reporter Contact Information: Carolyn Cox, 312-435-5639, Carolyn_Cox@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/23/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2012. (Cox, Carolyn)
July 23, 2012 1047 TRANSMITTED to the Federal Circuit the short record on notice of appeal, 1045 . Notified counsel (gel, )
July 23, 2012 1046 TRANSMITTED to the Federal Circuit the short record on notice of appeal 1044 . Notified counsel (gel, )
July 20, 2012 1045 NOTICE of appeal by Motorola Mobility, Inc. regarding orders 767 , 980 , 751 , 176 , 900 , 691 , 1038 , 1039 , 747 , 556 , 771 , 826 , 956 , 803 , 66 , 958 , 671 , 1005 , 830 , 526 Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0752-7372323. (Williamson, Amanda)
July 20, 2012 1044 NOTICE of appeal by Apple, Inc. regarding orders 1039 Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0752-7370071. (Ferguson, Brian)
June 26, 2012 1043 Order of June 26, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 6/26/2012: Mailed notice (am)
June 26, 2012 1042 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF JUNE 26, 2012. Mailed notice (am)
June 26, 2012 1041 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 1/23/12 before the Honorable Richard A. Posner. Court Reporter Contact Information: Kathleen_Fennell@ilnd.uscourts.gov; www.Kathyfennell.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 7/17/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/27/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/24/2012. (Fennell, Kathleen)
June 26, 2012 1040 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 1/11/12 before the Honorable Richard A. Posner. Court Reporter Contact Information: Kathleen Fennell, Kathleen_Fennell@ilnd.uscourts.gov; www.Kathyfennell.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 7/17/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/27/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/24/2012. (Fennell, Kathleen)
June 22, 2012 1039 ENTERED JUDGMENT.Signed by the Clerk on 6/22/2012: Mailed notice (am)
June 22, 2012 1038 Opinion and Order of June 22, 2012.Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 6/22/2012: Mailed notice (am)
June 22, 2012 1037 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER OPINION AND ORDER OF JUNE 22, 2012: This case is dismissed with prejudice. Mailed notice (am)
June 21, 2012 1036 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Notice of Filing Corrected Exhibit (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Exhibit 42)(Fram, Robert)
June 20, 2012 1035 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner:In court hearing held on 6/20/2012Judicial staff maled notice (gl, )
June 19, 2012 1034 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: Injunction hearing is set for Wednesday, June 20, 2012 at 10:00 AM in courtroom 1725. Mailed notice (am)
June 18, 2012 1033 SEALED RESPONSE Apples Brief in Opposition to Motorolas Request for Injunctive Relief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Appendix of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1-23, # 3 Exhibit 24-26, # 4 Exhibit 27-32, # 5 Exhibit 33-34, # 6 Exhibit 35-36, # 7 Exhibit 37-40, # 8 Exhibit 41-44, # 9 Exhibit 45-47, # 10 Exhibit 48-51)(Fram, Robert)
June 18, 2012 1032 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Brief Pursuant to the Court's June 13, 2012 Order Regarding Injunctive or Other Equitable Relief (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Group Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8)(Swedlow, Stephen)
June 18, 2012 1031 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple's Brief in Support of Injunctive Relief Pursuant to Court Order Dated June 13, 2012 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7 (1 of 2), # 9 Exhibit 7 (2 of 2), # 10 Exhibit 8 (1 of 2), # 11 Exhibit 8 (2 of 2), # 12 Exhibit 9 (1 of 2), # 13 Exhibit 9 (2 of 2), # 14 Exhibit 10, # 15 Exhibit 11, # 16 Exhibit 12, # 17 Exhibit 13, # 18 Exhibit 14, # 19 Exhibit 15, # 20 Exhibit 16, # 21 Exhibit 17 (1 of 2), # 22 Exhibit 17 (2 of 2), # 23 Exhibit 18, # 24 Exhibit 19, # 25 Exhibit 20, # 26 Exhibit 21, # 27 Exhibit 22, # 28 Exhibit 23, # 29 Exhibit 24, # 30 Exhibit 25, # 31 Exhibit 26, # 32 Exhibit 27 (1 of 2), # 33 Exhibit 27 (2 of 2), # 34 Exhibit 28, # 35 Exhibit 29, # 36 Exhibit 30, # 37 Exhibit 31, # 38 Exhibit 32, # 39 Exhibit 33, # 40 Exhibit 34, # 41 Exhibit 35, # 42 Exhibit 36, # 43 Exhibit 37, # 44 Exhibit 38, # 45 Exhibit 39, # 46 Exhibit 40, # 47 Exhibit 41, # 48 Exhibit 42, # 49 Exhibit 43, # 50 Exhibit 44, # 51 Exhibit 45, # 52 Exhibit 46, # 53 Exhibit 47, # 54 Exhibit 48, # 55 Exhibit 49 (1 of 2), # 56 Exhibit 49 (2 of 2), # 57 Exhibit 50, # 58 Exhibit 51, # 59 Exhibit 52, # 60 Exhibit 53, # 61 Exhibit 54, # 62 Exhibit 55, # 63 Exhibit 56, # 64 Exhibit 57, # 65 Exhibit 58)(Weiswasser, Elizabeth)
June 13, 2012 1030 Order Of June 13, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 6/13/2012: Mailed notice (am)
June 13, 2012 1029 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF JUNE 13, 2012: Apple's request for hearing is granted. Injunction hearing set for Wednesday, June 20, 2012 at 10:00 AM in a courtroom, to be announced. Mailed notice (am)
June 7, 2012 1028 Featured Case ORDER of June 7, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 6/7/2012:Judicial staff mailed notice(gl, )
June 7, 2012 1027 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: Enter Order of 6/7/12. On the basis of the motions filed by the parties regarding damages, injunctive and declaratoryrelief, and mootness, and the parties filings this morning addressed to these matters and the hearing held this afternoon, I have tentatively decided that the case should be dismissed with prejudice because neither party can establish a right to relief. The trial scheduled to begin this coming Monday, 6/11/12, is therefore canceled. But I will delay entry of judgment until I have prepared a full opinion, because in the course of that preparation I may change my mind. I will merely sketch the grounds for my tentative view very briefly in this order. (For further details, see Order in separate docket entry). Judicial staff maield notice (gl, )
June 7, 2012 1026 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner:Final pretrial conference held on 6/7/2012.Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
June 7, 2012 1025 PROPOSED Jury Instructions by Apple, Inc. (Haslam, Robert)
June 7, 2012 1024 PROPOSED Jury Instructions by Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. (Ferguson, Brian)
June 7, 2012 1023 RESPONSE by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to other 1015 Motorola's Response to Apples Submission Pursuant to the Court's June 3, 2012 Order Regarding Declaratory Relief Jurisdiction (Swedlow, Stephen)
June 7, 2012 1022 Motorola's Objections to the Courts Proposed Jury Instructions and Verdict Forms by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Swedlow, Stephen)
June 7, 2012 1021 SEALED REPLY by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to sealed response,,, 1010 Motorola's Reply to Apple's Opposition to its Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages for the Apple Asserted Patents (Swedlow, Stephen)
June 7, 2012 1020 REPLY by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to sealed response, 1014 Motorola's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment of No Injunctive Relief (Swedlow, Stephen)
June 7, 2012 1019 SEALED REPLY by Apple, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Motion For Summary Judgment Regarding Damages 984 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibits A-I)(Fram, Robert)
June 7, 2012 1018 REPLY by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apple's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment Dismissing Motorola's Claim for Injunctive Relief (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1)(Fram, Robert)
June 7, 2012 1017 REPLY by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apple's Reply to Motorola Regarding Declaratory Relief Jurisdiction (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Ex. 1, # 3 Ex. 2)(Fram, Robert)
June 6, 2012 1016 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment Dismissing Motorola's Claim for Injunctive Relief 993 (Attachments: # 1 Responses to Apple's Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4)(Swedlow, Stephen)
June 6, 2012 1015 RESPONSE to the Court's Order of June 3, 2012 Regarding Declaratory Relief Jurisdiction by Apple, Inc. (Fram, Robert)
June 6, 2012 1014 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. to MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment MOTOROLA'S MOTION AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INJUNCTIVE RELIEF 974 Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Injunctive Relief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Weiswasser, Elizabeth)
June 6, 2012 1013 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Motion For Summary Judgment Regarding Damages 984 Motorola's Responses to Apple's Proposed Findings of Fact (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11)(Swedlow, Stephen)
June 6, 2012 1012 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Motion For Summary Judgment Regarding Damages 984 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17)(Swedlow, Stephen)
June 6, 2012 1011 Motorola's Submission Pursuant to the Court's June 3, 2012 Order by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Swedlow, Stephen)
June 6, 2012 1010 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. to MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment Motorolas Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages for the Apple Asserted Patents 982 Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages for the Apple Asserted Patents (Attachments: # 1 Responses to Moto's Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P)(Weiswasser, Elizabeth)
June 5, 2012 1009 Featured Case ORDER of June 5, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 6/5/2012:Judicial staff mailed notice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(gl, )
June 5, 2012 1008 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: Enter ORder of June 5, 2012. (FOr further details, see Order in separate docket entry). Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
June 5, 2012 1007 PROPOSED Pretrial Order (Erwine, Richard)
June 5, 2012 1006 PROPOSED Pretrial Order (Ferguson, Brian)
June 5, 2012 1005 Featured Case ORDER of June 5, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 6/5/2012:Judicial staff mailed notice(gl, )
June 5, 2012 1004 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: Enter Order of June 5, 2012. The following motions for summary judgment are denied: Sealed motion 965 is denied; Sealed motion 966 is denied; Sealed motion 969 is denied; Sealed motion 970 is denied; Sealed motion 971 is denied; Sealed motion 972 is denied; Sealed motion 973 is denied; Sealed motion 975 is denied; Sealed motion 976 is denied; Sealed motion 977 is denied; Sealed motion 978 is denied; (For further details, see Order of June 5, 2012 in separate docket entry). Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
June 5, 2012 1003 Featured Case ORDER of June 5, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 6/5/2012:Judicial staff mailed notice(gl, )
June 5, 2012 1002 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: Enter Order of June 5, 2012. Sealed motion 882 is dismissed as moot; Sealed motion 888 is dismissed as moot; Sealed motion 890 is dismissed as moot; Sealed motion 891 is dismissed as moot; Sealed motion 893 is dismissed as moot; Sealed motion 897 is dismissed as moot; Sealed motion 964 is granted; (For further details, see Order in separate docket entry). Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
June 4, 2012 1001 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT REGARDING U.S. PATENT NO. 7,479,949 978 Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of U.S. Patent Number 7,479,949 (Attachments: # 1 Response to Proposed Finding of Fact, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H)(Ferguson, Brian)
June 4, 2012 1000 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Obviousness of U.S. Patent No. 6,359,898 966 Motorolas Opposition to Apples Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Obviousness of U.S. Patent No. 6,359,898 (Attachments: # 1 Opposition to Apple's Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12)(Swedlow, Stephen)
June 4, 2012 999 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 7,479,949 973 APPLE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,479,949 (Attachments: # 1 Response to Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4)(Ferguson, Brian)
June 4, 2012 998 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of Claim 5 of U.S. Patent No. 6,175,559 964 Motorolas Opposition to Apples Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Claim 5 of U.S. Patent No. 6,175,599 (Attachments: # 1 Opposition to Apple's Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3)(Swedlow, Stephen)
June 4, 2012 997 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 5,946,647 972 APPLE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,946,647 (Attachments: # 1 Response to Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Declaration Declaration of T. Mowry, # 3 Appendix, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit 14, # 18 Exhibit 15)(Ferguson, Brian)
June 4, 2012 996 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Motion for Summary Judgment that Motorola Cannot Legally Prove its Invalidity Allegations Against U.S. Patent No. 6,493,002 in View of Apple's Powerbook Computers and the Associated Product Manual 976 Motorola's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment That Motorola Cannot Legally Prove its Invalidity Allegations Against U.S. Patent No. 6,493,002 in View of Apple's PowerBook Computers and the Associated Product Manual (Attachments: # 1 Opposition to Apple's Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7)(Swedlow, Stephen)
June 4, 2012 995 RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.in Opposition to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment that Sidekick Does Not Invalidate Claims 1 and 8 of Apple's U.S. Patent No. 5,946,647 975 Motorola's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment that Sidekick Does Not Invalidate Claims 1 and 8 of Apple's U.S. Patent No. 5,946,647 (Erwine, Richard)
June 4, 2012 994 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. for summary judgment Motion for Summary Judgment that Perspective Does not Invalidate Claims 1 and 8 of Apple's U.S. Patent No. 5,946,647 963 Motorola's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment that Perspective Does Not Invalidate Claims 1 and 8 of Apple's U.S. Patent No. 5,946,647 (Attachments: # 1 Opposition to Apple's Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7)(Erwine, Richard)
June 4, 2012 993 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment Dismissing Motorola's Claim for Injunctive Relief (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Appendix of Exhibits, # 3 Exhibits 1-14)(Fram, Robert)
June 4, 2012 992 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 6,343,263 971 APPLE'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 6,343,263 (Attachments: # 1 Response to Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Declaration Declaration of N. Polish, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Appendix, # 6 Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit 3)(Ferguson, Brian)
June 4, 2012 991 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY OF ASSERTED CLAIMS 1 AND 2 OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 6,343,263 970 APPLE'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY OF ASSERTED CLAIMS 1 AND 2 OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 6,343,263 (Attachments: # 1 Response to Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Declaration Declaration of N. Polish, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Appendix, # 7 Exhibit 1, # 8 Exhibit 2, # 9 Exhibit 3, # 10 Exhibit 4, # 11 Exhibit 5)(Ferguson, Brian)
June 4, 2012 990 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY DUE TO INDEFINITENESS OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,479,949 977 APPLE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY DUE TO INDEFINITENESS OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,479,949 (Attachments: # 1 Response to Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4)(Ferguson, Brian)
June 4, 2012 989 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 6,493,002 969 (Attachments: # 1 Response to Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6)(Ferguson, Brian)
June 4, 2012 988 Notice of Withdrawl of Exhibits by Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Apple's Exhibit List)(Ferguson, Brian)
June 3, 2012 987 Featured Case ORDER of June 3, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 6/3/2012:Judicial staff mailed notice(gl, )
June 3, 2012 986 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: Enter Order of June 3, 2012. (For further details, see Order in separate docket entry). Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
June 1, 2012 985 Motorola's Specific Objections to Apple's Proposed Jury Instructions by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Swedlow, Stephen)
June 1, 2012 984 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Motion For Summary Judgment Regarding Damages (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Appendix of Exhibits, # 3 Ex. 1, # 4 Ex. 2, # 5 Ex. 3, # 6 Ex. 4, # 7 Ex. 5, # 8 Ex. 6, # 9 Ex. 7, # 10 Ex. 8, # 11 Ex. 9, # 12 Ex. 10, # 13 Ex. 11, # 14 Ex. 12, # 15 Ex. 13, # 16 Ex. 14, # 17 Ex. 15 part 1, # 18 Ex. 15 part 2, # 19 Ex. 16 part 1, # 20 Ex. 16 part 2, # 21 Ex. 17, # 22 Ex. 18, # 23 Ex. 19, # 24 Ex. 20, # 25 Ex. 21, # 26 Ex. 22, # 27 Ex. 23, # 28 Ex. 24, # 29 Ex. 25, # 30 Ex. 26, # 31 Ex. 27, # 32 Ex. 28, # 33 Ex. 29, # 34 Ex. 30)(Fram, Robert)
June 1, 2012 983 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Proposed Findings of Fact regarding MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment Motorolas Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages for the Apple Asserted Patents 982 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Swedlow, Stephen)
June 1, 2012 982 MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment Motorolas Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages for the Apple Asserted Patents (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Swedlow, Stephen)
June 1, 2012 981 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 6/7/2012 at 12:30 PM., in Courtroom 2325.Judicial staff maield notice (gl, )
May 31, 2012 980 Featured Case ORDER of May 31, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 5/31/2012:Judicial staff mailed notice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(gl, )
May 31, 2012 979 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: Enter Order of May 31, 2012. Sealed motion 866 is granted in part and denied in part ; Motion in limine 867 is granted in part and denied in part; Motion in limine 868 is denied; Motion in limine 869 is granted in part and denied in part; Sealed motion 870 is granted; Motion in limine 871 is granted; Sealed motion 872 is granted in part and denied in part; Motion in limine 874 is denied; Sealed motion 876 is granted in part and denied in part ; Sealed motion 877 is denied; Sealed motion 878 is granted; Sealed motion 879 is granted; Sealed motion 880 is denied; Sealed motion 881 is denied; (For further details, see Order of May 31, 2012 in separate docket entry). Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
May 30, 2012 978 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT REGARDING U.S. PATENT NO. 7,479,949 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Findings of Fact, # 3 Appendix, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6)(Erwine, Richard)
May 30, 2012 977 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY DUE TO INDEFINITENESS OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,479,949 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Findings of Fact, # 3 Appendix, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3)(Erwine, Richard)
May 30, 2012 976 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Motion for Summary Judgment that Motorola Cannot Legally Prove its Invalidity Allegations Against U.S. Patent No. 6,493,002 in View of Apple's Powerbook Computers and the Associated Product Manual (Attachments: # 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF DR. ALEX C. SNOEREN, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, # 3 STATEMENT OF PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT, # 4 Appendix APPENDIX, # 5 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1, # 6 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2, # 7 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3, # 8 Exhibit EXHIBIT 4, # 9 Exhibit EXHIBIT 5, # 10 Exhibit EXHIBIT 6, # 11 Exhibit EXHIBIT 7)(Ferguson, Brian)
May 30, 2012 975 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment that Sidekick Does Not Invalidate Claims 1 and 8 of Apple's U.S. Patent No. 5,946,647 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment that Sidekick Does Not Invalidate Claims 1 and 8 of Apple's U.S. Patent No. 5,946,647, # 2 Statement of Proposed Findings of Fact in Support of Apple's U.S. Patent No. 5,946,647, # 3 Appendix Appendix to Motion for Summary Judgment That Sidekick Does Not Invalidate Claims 1 and 8 of Apple's U.S. Patent No. 5,946,647, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 9)(Ferguson, Brian)
May 30, 2012 974 MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment MOTOROLA'S MOTION AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Swedlow, Stephen)
May 30, 2012 973 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 7,479,949 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Findings of Fact, # 3 Appendix, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5)(Erwine, Richard)
May 30, 2012 972 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 5,946,647 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Findings of Fact, # 3 Appendix, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3)(Erwine, Richard)
May 30, 2012 971 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 6,343,263 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Findings of Fact, # 3 Appendix, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6)(Erwine, Richard)
May 30, 2012 970 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY OF ASSERTED CLAIMS 1 AND 2 OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 6,343,263 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Findings of Fact, # 3 Appendix, # 4 Exhibit 1, Part One, # 5 Exhibit 1, Part Two, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8)(Erwine, Richard)
May 30, 2012 969 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 6,493,002 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Findings of Fact, # 3 Appendix, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6)(Erwine, Richard)
May 30, 2012 968 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Appendix to Motion for Summary Judgment that Perspective Does Not Invalidate Claims 1 and 8 of Apple's U.S. Patent No. 5,946,647 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9)(Ferguson, Brian)
May 30, 2012 967 MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. for summary judgment Proposed Findings of Fact in Support of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment that Perspective Does Not Invalidate Claims 1 and 8 of Apple's U.S. Patent No. 5,946,647 (Ferguson, Brian)
May 30, 2012 966 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Obviousness of U.S. Patent No. 6,359,898 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Appendix of Exhibits, # 3 Exhibits A-E, # 4 Exhibits F-N, # 5 Exhibits O-T)(Haslam, Robert)
May 30, 2012 965 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment that Perspective Does Not Invalidate Claims 1 and 8 of Apple's U.S. Patent No. 5,946,647 (Ferguson, Brian)
May 30, 2012 964 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of Claim 5 of U.S. Patent No. 6,175,559 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Appendix of Exhibits, # 3 Exhibits 1-5)(Haslam, Robert)
May 30, 2012 963 MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. for summary judgment Motion for Summary Judgment that Perspective Does not Invalidate Claims 1 and 8 of Apple's U.S. Patent No. 5,946,647 (Ferguson, Brian)
May 29, 2012 962 Featured Case ORDER of May 29, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 5/29/2012:Judicial staff mailed notice(gl, )
May 29, 2012 961 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: Order of May 29, 2012. (For further details, see Order in separate docket entry). Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
May 25, 2012 960 Featured Case ORDER of May 25, 2012 Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 5/25/2012. (nf, )
May 25, 2012 959 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF MAY 25, 2012. Mailed notice (For further detail see separate order) (nf, )
May 24, 2012 958 Featured Case ORDER of May 24, 2012 Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 5/24/2012. (nf, )
May 24, 2012 957 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF MAY 24, 2012: Plaintiffs' unopposed motion to amend its witness list 904 is granted. Defendants' motion to compel Apple's carrier agreements with AT&T and to supplement its expert report on damages motion 906 is dismissed as moot. Defendants' motion for leave to issue a subpoena to Amazon regarding the '949 patent and the court's ruling of April 27, 2012 908 is denied. Defendants' motion to correct misstatements regarding the '263 patent made by Apple's expert Brian Napper and counsel for Apple at the Daubert Hearing on May 16, 2012 909 is dismissed as moot. Defendants motion to correct misstatements regarding the '647 patent made by counsel for Apple at the Daubert hearing on May 16, 2012 911 is dismissed. Mailed notice (For further detail see separate order) (nf, )
May 24, 2012 954 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apple Inc.'s 19th Motion In Limine to Exclude Argument Or Testimony that the Term "Multiplying" in Claim 5 of U.S. Patent No. 6,175,559 Is Limited to a Particular Type of Chip-By-Chip Multiplicat 893 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Erwine, Richard)
May 24, 2012 953 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apple's 13th Motion in Limine to Exclude Argument or Testimony Not Disclosed in Motorola's Expert Reports (Applies to Motorola Patents Trial) 889 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Declaration of Tim A. Williams, Ph.D.)(Erwine, Richard)
May 24, 2012 952 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apple's 14th Motion in Limine to Exclude Argument or Testimony That The Success of Standards Is Evidence of Non-Obviousness of Motorola's Patents (Applies to Motorola Patents Trial) 892 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Erwine, Richard)
May 24, 2012 951 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc.in limine Apples 22nd Motion In Limine To Exclude Hearsay, Irrelevant Information, And Information That Lacks Authentication Or A Proper Foundation (Applies To Motorola Patents Trial) 895 (Erwine, Richard)
May 24, 2012 950 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apple's 21st Motion in Limine to Exclude Argument or Testimony That Claim 5 of the '559 Patent Requires Transmitting A "Preamble Sequence" In a Separate "Packet" or "Frame&quo 891 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Erwine, Richard)
May 24, 2012 949 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorolas Motion in Limine to Preclude Dr. Heegard from Testifying Regarding Dates of Publication of Certain Alleged Prior Art Documents (Motorola Patents Trial) 882 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix with Exhibits A-C)(Haslam, Robert)
May 24, 2012 948 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apple's 20th Motion in Limine to Exclude Argument or Testimony That Apple's Accused Products Multiply the Accused Inner Code of Claim 5 By The Accused Outer Code of Claim 5 (Apples to Motorola Patents 888 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Erwine, Richard)
May 24, 2012 947 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Motion in Limine to Preclude Dr. Cimini from Testifying Regarding Whether AT&T Base Stations Use Countdown Values (Motorola Patents Trial) 883 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix with Exhibits A-C)(Haslam, Robert)
May 24, 2012 946 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apple's 18th Motion in Limine to Exclude Argument or Testimony That U.S. Provisional Application No. 60/138,713 Must Enable the Issued Claims of U.S. Patent No. 7,173,919 in Order to Qualify as An "Ap 887 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Erwine, Richard)
May 24, 2012 945 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Motion in Limine to Preclude Apple from Asserting that U.S. Patent No. 7,173,919 is Alleged Prior Art to U.S. Patent No. 6,175,559 Under any Section Other than 35 U. 890 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix with Exhibits 1-2)(Haslam, Robert)
May 24, 2012 944 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apples 17th Motion In Limine To Exclude Tyler Brown E-Mails, Matlab Files, And Reliance On The June 2, 1999 Date In The Purported Invention Disclosure (Applies To Motorola Patents Trial) 897 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Erwine, Richard)
May 24, 2012 943 RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc.in limine Apple's 16th Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Apple's Counsel's Retention of Dr. Williams 894 (Erwine, Richard)
May 24, 2012 942 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apple's 15th Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Apple's Attempt to Substitute Experts (Applies to Motorola Patents Trial) 886 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Erwine, Richard)
May 24, 2012 941 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apples 12th Motion In Limine To Exclude Argument Or Testimony That Apples Accused Products Infringe Under The Doctrine Of Equivalents (Applies To Motorola Patents Trial) 896 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Erwine, Richard)
May 24, 2012 940 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Motion in Limine to Preclude Apple and its Expert from Presenting "Nokia's Submission to 3GPP" at Trial as a Single Prior Art Reference (Motorola Pate 884 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix with Exhibits A-G)(Haslam, Robert)
May 24, 2012 939 RESPONSE by Apple, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.in limine Motorolas Motion in Limine to Strike Hearsay Portions of the Declaration of Paula Phillips 885 (Haslam, Robert)
May 22, 2012 956 Opinion and Order Of May 22, 2012.Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 5/22/2012: Mailed notice (am)
May 22, 2012 955 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER OPINION AND ORDER OF MAY 22, 2012: Plaintiffs' motion to exclude certain testimony of Motorola's damages expert Michael J. Wagner regarding Apple's claims for damages 816 is granted. Plaintiff's motion to exclude testimony of Charles Donohoe that a license on a single patent in a portfolio might command a royalty of up to 40-50% of the overall portfolio rate 818 is granted. Plaintiff's motion to exclude the testimony of Richard J. Holleman 819 is granted. Defendants' motion to strike the opinions of plaintiff's economic expert Brian W. Napper regarding Motorola's damages 821 is granted. Plaintiff's motion to preclude testimony of Carla Mulhern regarding Motorola's claims for damages 823 is granted. Defendants' motion to strike the opinions of plaintiff's economic expert Brian W. Napper from his original and supplemental reports filed March 20, 2012 and April 20, 2012 824 is granted. Mailed notice (am)
May 21, 2012 938 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc.in limine Apple's Motion in Limine No. 11 to Preclude Motorola from Referring to Irrelevant Matters During Trial (Applies to Apple Patents Trial) 874 (Swedlow, Stephen)
May 21, 2012 937 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple's Motion in Limine No. 10 to Exclude Testimony and Evidence on the Next-Item Heuristic (Applies to Apple Patents Trial) 873 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Swedlow, Stephen)
May 21, 2012 936 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple's Motion in Limine No. 9 to Exclude Hearsay or Evidence That Cannot be Authenticated (Applies to Apple Patents Trial) 872 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Swedlow, Stephen)
May 21, 2012 935 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc.in limine Apple's Motion in Limine No. 8 to Exclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Third-Party Applications Not Preinstalled on the Accused Products (Applies to Apple Patents Trial) 871 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Swedlow, Stephen)
May 21, 2012 934 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple's Motion in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Evidence Concerning Any Alleged Ability, Cost and Effort to Design Around Apple's Asserted Patents (Applies to Apple Patents Trial) 880 (Swedlow, Stephen)
May 21, 2012 933 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple's Motion in Limine No. 6 to Exclude Evidence of the Recruitment of Jefferson Han (Applies to Apple Patents Trial) 870 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Swedlow, Stephen)
May 21, 2012 932 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple's Motion in Limine No. 5 to Exclude All Evidence Concerning Jefferson Han and the Han Demonstration (Applies to Apple Patents Trial) 881 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Swedlow, Stephen)
May 21, 2012 931 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc.in limine Apple's Motion in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Certain Declarations as Hearsay or Improper Expert Testimony (Applies to Apple Patents Trial) 869 (Swedlow, Stephen)
May 21, 2012 930 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc.in limine Apple's Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Certain Documents Not Disclosed in Motorola's Notice of Prior Art (Applies to Apple Patents Trial) 868 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Swedlow, Stephen)
May 21, 2012 929 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc.in limine Apple's Motion in Limine No. 2 Concerning Motorola's Incorrect Analysis of the Law of Obviousness Under 35 U.S.C. § 103 (Applies to Apple Patents Trial) 867 (Swedlow, Stephen)
May 21, 2012 928 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Preclude Argument or Evidence Not Included in Motorola's Expert Reports or Interrogatory Responses (Applies to Apple Patents Trial) 866 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16)(Swedlow, Stephen)
May 21, 2012 927 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Alleged Secondary Considerations and/or Copying (Apple Patents Trial) 878 Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Alleged Secondary Considerations and/or Copying (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Ferguson, Brian)
May 21, 2012 926 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorolas Motion in Limine to Preclude Apples 002 Expert from Supplementing His Infringement Positions by Relying on Opinions Given Only in Motorola's Expert's Rebuttal Re 879 Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion in Limine to Preclude Apple's '002 Expert from Supplementing His Infringement Positions by Relying on Opinions Given in Motorola's Expert's Rebuttal Reports (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Ferguson, Brian)
May 21, 2012 925 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Omnibus Motion in Limine (Apple Patents Trial) 876 Apple's Response to Motorola's Omnibus Motion in Limine (Ferguson, Brian)
May 21, 2012 924 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Motion in Limine to Preclude Apple's '263 Expert from Testifying About Alleged Functionality in Motorola's Accused Products Not Contained in His Exper 877 Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion in Limine to Preclude Apple's '263 Expert From Testifying About Alleged Functionality in Motorola's Accused Products Not Contained in His Expert Reports (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Ferguson, Brian)
May 21, 2012 923 RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple's Motion to Amend Its Witness List 904 (Erwine, Richard)
May 21, 2012 922 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple's Motion to Compel Motorola To Make Full Production of Its Carrier Agreements 905 (Williamson, Amanda)
May 21, 2012 921 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MOTOROLA'S MOTION TO CORRECT MISSTATEMENTS REGARDING THE '647 PATENT MADE BY COUNSEL FOR APPLE AT THE DAUBERT HEARING ON MAY 16, 2012 911 Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion to Correct Misstatements Regarding the '647 Patent Made by Counsel For Apple at the Daubert Hearing on May 16, 2012 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Weiswasser, Elizabeth)
May 21, 2012 920 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MOTOROLA'S MOTION TO CORRECT MISSTATEMENTS REGARDING THE '263 PATENT MADE BY APPLE'S EXPERT BRIAN NAPPER AND COUNSEL FOR APPLE AT THE DAUBERT HEARING ON MAY 16, 2012< 909 Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion to Correct Alleged Misstatements Regarding the '263 Patent Made by Apple's Expert Brian Napper and Counsel for Apple at the Daubert Hearing (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Weiswasser, Elizabeth)
May 21, 2012 919 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. to Sealed motion 908 Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion For Leave to Issue a Subpoena to Amazon Regarding the '949 Patent and the Court's ruling of April 27, 2012 (Weiswasser, Elizabeth)
May 21, 2012 918 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorolas Motion to Compel Apple's Carrier Agreements with AT&T and to Supplement its Expert Report on Damages 906 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix and Exhibits 1-8)(Fram, Robert)
May 18, 2012 917 PROPOSED Pretrial Order (PROPOSED) FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER - MOTOROLA PATENTS TRIAL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D1, # 5 Exhibit D2, # 6 Exhibit D3, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H1, # 11 Exhibit H2, # 12 Exhibit H3, # 13 Exhibit I)(Swedlow, Stephen)
May 18, 2012 916 PROPOSED Pretrial Order (PROPOSED) FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER - APPLE PATENTS TRIAL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Uncontested Facts, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Parties' List of Issues to be Tried, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Parties' Proposed Case Statements, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D1 - Apple's Exhibit List, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D2 - Motorola's Exhibit List, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit D3 - Apple's Rebuttal Exhibit List, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit D4 - Motorola's Rebuttal Exhibit List, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit E - Parties' Witness Lists, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit F - Parties' Statements of Witness Qualifications, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit G - Parties' Deposition Designations, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit H1 - Parties' Proposed Jury Instructions, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit H2 - Parties' Proposed Verdict Forms, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit H3 - Parties' Voir Dire, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit I - Parties' Summary of Motions in Limine)(Ferguson, Brian)
May 18, 2012 915 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MOTOROLA MOBILITYS CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF ON CLAIM 5 OF U.S.PATENT NO. 6,175,559 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12)(Swedlow, Stephen)
May 18, 2012 914 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apple Inc.'s Claim Construction Brief re "Forming" (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1, # 2 Ex. 2)(Haslam, Robert)
May 18, 2012 913 Apple's Request for Judicial Notice by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C part 1, # 4 Ex. C part 2, # 5 Ex. C part 3, # 6 Ex. C part 4)(Fram, Robert)
May 18, 2012 912 Apple's List of Contested Claim Limitations in Accused Products by Apple, Inc. (Haslam, Robert)
May 18, 2012 911 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MOTOROLA'S MOTION TO CORRECT MISSTATEMENTS REGARDING THE '647 PATENT MADE BY COUNSEL FOR APPLE AT THE DAUBERT HEARING ON MAY 16, 2012 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Swedlow, Stephen)
May 18, 2012 910 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Statement of Contested Limitations in Prior Art Identified by Motorola (Ferguson, Brian)
May 18, 2012 909 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MOTOROLA'S MOTION TO CORRECT MISSTATEMENTS REGARDING THE '263 PATENT MADE BY APPLE'S EXPERT BRIAN NAPPER AND COUNSEL FOR APPLE AT THE DAUBERT HEARING ON MAY 16, 2012 (Swedlow, Stephen)
May 18, 2012 908 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO ISSUE A SUBPOENA TO AMAZON REGARDING THE '949 PATENT AND THE COURT'S RULING OF APRIL 27, 2012 (Swedlow, Stephen)
May 18, 2012 907 Motorola's Contested Limitations by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Swedlow, Stephen)
May 18, 2012 906 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorolas Motion to Compel Apple's Carrier Agreements with AT&T and to Supplement its Expert Report on Damages (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Swedlow, Stephen)
May 18, 2012 905 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple's Motion to Compel Motorola To Make Full Production of Its Carrier Agreements (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Weiswasser, Elizabeth)
May 18, 2012 904 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple's Motion to Amend Its Witness List (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ferguson, Brian)
May 16, 2012 903 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: In court Daubert hearing held on 5/16/2012.Mailed notice (drw, )
May 16, 2012 902 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by David Mitchell Desrosier (Desrosier, David)
May 16, 2012 901 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7156047. (Vlasis, Robert)
May 16, 2012 898 Joint Motion for Summary Judgment by Apple, Inc. as to Claims 2, 9 and 10 of Apple's 949 Patent (Ferguson, Brian)
May 15, 2012 897 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apples 17th Motion In Limine To Exclude Tyler Brown E-Mails, Matlab Files, And Reliance On The June 2, 1999 Date In The Purported Invention Disclosure (Applies To Motorola Patents Trial) (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A)(Haslam, Robert)
May 15, 2012 896 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apples 12th Motion In Limine To Exclude Argument Or Testimony That Apples Accused Products Infringe Under The Doctrine Of Equivalents (Applies To Motorola Patents Trial) (Haslam, Robert)
May 15, 2012 895 MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc.in limine Apples 22nd Motion In Limine To Exclude Hearsay, Irrelevant Information, And Information That Lacks Authentication Or A Proper Foundation (Applies To Motorola Patents Trial) (Haslam, Robert)
May 15, 2012 894 MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc.in limine Apple's 16th Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Apple's Counsel's Retention of Dr. Williams (Haslam, Robert)
May 15, 2012 893 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apple Inc.'s 19th Motion In Limine to Exclude Argument Or Testimony that the Term "Multiplying" in Claim 5 of U.S. Patent No. 6,175,559 Is Limited to a Particular Type of Chip-By-Chip Multiplication (Applies to Motorola Patents Trial) (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1)(Haslam, Robert)
May 15, 2012 892 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apple's 14th Motion in Limine to Exclude Argument or Testimony That The Success of Standards Is Evidence of Non-Obviousness of Motorola's Patents (Applies to Motorola Patents Trial) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix with Exhibits A-F)(Haslam, Robert)
May 15, 2012 891 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apple's 21st Motion in Limine to Exclude Argument or Testimony That Claim 5 of the '559 Patent Requires Transmitting A "Preamble Sequence" In a Separate "Packet" or "Frame" From Other Transmissions (Applies to Motorola Patent Trial) (Haslam, Robert)
May 15, 2012 890 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Motion in Limine to Preclude Apple from Asserting that U.S. Patent No. 7,173,919 is Alleged Prior Art to U.S. Patent No. 6,175,559 Under any Section Other than 35 U.S.C. Section 102(e) (Motorola Patents Trial) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6)(Swedlow, Stephen)
May 15, 2012 889 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apple's 13th Motion in Limine to Exclude Argument or Testimony Not Disclosed in Motorola's Expert Reports (Applies to Motorola Patents Trial) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Ex. A, # 3 Ex. B, # 4 Ex. C)(Haslam, Robert)
May 15, 2012 888 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apple's 20th Motion in Limine to Exclude Argument or Testimony That Apple's Accused Products Multiply the Accused Inner Code of Claim 5 By The Accused Outer Code of Claim 5 (Apples to Motorola Patents Trial) (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B)(Haslam, Robert)
May 15, 2012 887 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apple's 18th Motion in Limine to Exclude Argument or Testimony That U.S. Provisional Application No. 60/138,713 Must Enable the Issued Claims of U.S. Patent No. 7,173,919 in Order to Qualify as An "Application for Patent" for Purposes of 35 USC 102(e) (Applies to Motorola Patents Trial) (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1)(Haslam, Robert)
May 15, 2012 886 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apple's 15th Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Apple's Attempt to Substitute Experts (Applies to Motorola Patents Trial) (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A)(Haslam, Robert)
May 15, 2012 885 MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.in limine Motorolas Motion in Limine to Strike Hearsay Portions of the Declaration of Paula Phillips (Swedlow, Stephen)
May 15, 2012 884 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Motion in Limine to Preclude Apple and its Expert from Presenting "Nokia's Submission to 3GPP" at Trial as a Single Prior Art Reference (Motorola Patents Trial) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8)(Swedlow, Stephen)
May 15, 2012 883 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Motion in Limine to Preclude Dr. Cimini from Testifying Regarding Whether AT&T Base Stations Use Countdown Values (Motorola Patents Trial) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Swedlow, Stephen)
May 15, 2012 882 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorolas Motion in Limine to Preclude Dr. Heegard from Testifying Regarding Dates of Publication of Certain Alleged Prior Art Documents (Motorola Patents Trial) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7)(Swedlow, Stephen)
May 15, 2012 881 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple's Motion in Limine No. 5 to Exclude All Evidence Concerning Jefferson Han and the Han Demonstration (Applies to Apple Patents Trial) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit A)(Ferguson, Brian)
May 15, 2012 880 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple's Motion in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Evidence Concerning Any Alleged Ability, Cost and Effort to Design Around Apple's Asserted Patents (Applies to Apple Patents Trial) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit A)(Ferguson, Brian)
May 15, 2012 879 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorolas Motion in Limine to Preclude Apples 002 Expert from Supplementing His Infringement Positions by Relying on Opinions Given Only in Motorola's Expert's Rebuttal Reports (Apple Patents Trial) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Swedlow, Stephen)
May 15, 2012 878 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Alleged Secondary Considerations and/or Copying (Apple Patents Trial) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8)(Swedlow, Stephen)
May 15, 2012 877 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Motion in Limine to Preclude Apple's '263 Expert from Testifying About Alleged Functionality in Motorola's Accused Products Not Contained in His Expert Reports (Apple Patents Trial) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Swedlow, Stephen)
May 15, 2012 876 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Omnibus Motion in Limine (Apple Patents Trial) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Swedlow, Stephen)
May 15, 2012 875 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Christopher Thomas Marando (Marando, Christopher)
May 15, 2012 874 MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc.in limine Apple's Motion in Limine No. 11 to Preclude Motorola from Referring to Irrelevant Matters During Trial (Applies to Apple Patents Trial) (Ferguson, Brian)
May 15, 2012 873 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple's Motion in Limine No. 10 to Exclude Testimony and Evidence on the Next-Item Heuristic (Applies to Apple Patents Trial) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Ferguson, Brian)
May 15, 2012 872 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple's Motion in Limine No. 9 to Exclude Hearsay or Evidence That Cannot be Authenticated (Applies to Apple Patents Trial) (Ferguson, Brian)
May 15, 2012 871 MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc.in limine Apple's Motion in Limine No. 8 to Exclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Third-Party Applications Not Preinstalled on the Accused Products (Applies to Apple Patents Trial) (Ferguson, Brian)
May 15, 2012 870 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple's Motion in Limine No. 6 to Exclude Evidence of the Recruitment of Jefferson Han (Applies to Apple Patents Trial) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Ferguson, Brian)
May 15, 2012 869 MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc.in limine Apple's Motion in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Certain Declarations as Hearsay or Improper Expert Testimony (Applies to Apple Patents Trial) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit A)(Ferguson, Brian)
May 15, 2012 868 MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc.in limine Apple's Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Certain Documents Not Disclosed in Motorola's Notice of Prior Art (Applies to Apple Patents Trial) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Ferguson, Brian)
May 15, 2012 867 MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc.in limine Apple's Motion in Limine No. 2 Concerning Motorola's Incorrect Analysis of the Law of Obviousness Under 35 U.S.C. § 103 (Applies to Apple Patents Trial) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Ferguson, Brian)
May 15, 2012 866 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Preclude Argument or Evidence Not Included in Motorola's Expert Reports or Interrogatory Responses (Applies to Apple Patents Trial) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Ferguson, Brian)
May 15, 2012 865 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Edward S Jou (Jou, Edward)
May 14, 2012 900 Featured Case ORDER of May 14, 2012 Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 5/14/2012. (nf, )
May 14, 2012 899 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF MAY 14, 2012: Defendant Motorola Mobility's motion for leave to update Michael Wagners damages report with respect to the '949 patent to reflect this court's ruling of April 27, 2012 850 is denied. Plaintiff's motion to strike Declaration of Tim A. Williams, Ph.D, exhibit 6 to Motorola's response to Apple's motion to preclude testimony of Carla Mulhern 854 is granted. Mailed notice (For further detail see separate order) (nf, )
May 14, 2012 863 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: Enter Order of May 13, 2012. Mailed Notice (For further detail see separate order 864 ) (nf, ) .
May 14, 2012 862 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: Daubert hearing set for 5/16/2012 at 1:00 PM. Mailed notice (am)
May 14, 2012 861 RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.in Opposition to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple Inc.'s Motion to Enforce April 16, 2012 Order re Representative Accused Products 852 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Erwine, Richard)
May 14, 2012 860 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. to strike Apple's Motion to Strike "Declaration of Tim A. Williams, Ph.D.," Exhibit 6 to Motorola's Response to Apple's Motion to Preclude Testimony of Carla Mulhern 854 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Swedlow, Stephen)
May 14, 2012 859 RESPONSE by Apple, Inc. to MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.for Further Instruction Motorola's Motion Regarding Neutral Expert Dr. McLaughlin's Opinions on the '263 and '647 Patents 851 (Ferguson, Brian)
May 14, 2012 858 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. to MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to supplement Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Update the Michael Wagner Damages Report with Respect to the '949 Patent to Reflect this Court's Ruling of April 850 Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion for Leave to Update Michael Wagner's Damages Report with Respect to the '949 Patent to Reflect This Court's Ruling of April 27, 2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Ferguson, Brian)
May 14, 2012 857 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Motion Regarding Neutral Expert Dr. McLaughlin's Opinion on the '559 Patent 855 (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1)(Haslam, Robert)
May 13, 2012 864 Featured Case ORDER Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 5/13/2012. (nf, )
May 11, 2012 856 Notice of Prior Art Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Section 282 by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Erwine, Richard)
May 11, 2012 855 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Motion Regarding Neutral Expert Dr. McLaughlin's Opinion on the '559 Patent (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Swedlow, Stephen)
May 11, 2012 854 MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. to strike Apple's Motion to Strike "Declaration of Tim A. Williams, Ph.D.," Exhibit 6 to Motorola's Response to Apple's Motion to Preclude Testimony of Carla Mulhern (Fram, Robert)
May 11, 2012 853 Notice of Prior Art Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Section 282 by Apple, Inc. (Haskett, Christine saunders)
May 11, 2012 852 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple Inc.'s Motion to Enforce April 16, 2012 Order re Representative Accused Products (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Ferguson, Brian)
May 11, 2012 851 MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.for Further Instruction Motorola's Motion Regarding Neutral Expert Dr. McLaughlin's Opinions on the '263 and '647 Patents (Swedlow, Stephen)
May 11, 2012 850 MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to supplement Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Update the Michael Wagner Damages Report with Respect to the '949 Patent to Reflect this Court's Ruling of April 27, 2012 (Swedlow, Stephen)
May 10, 2012 849 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: Attorney Edward Jou's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of the plaintiffs 846 is granted. Mailed notice (am)
May 9, 2012 848 Order Of May 9, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 5/9/2012: Mailed notice (am)
May 9, 2012 847 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF MAY 9, 2012: Apple's motion for leave to supplement the expert report of Dr. Anne Layne-Farrar 833 is denied. Apple's motion to strike exhibit 10, "Declaration of Mike Wagner" to Motorola's Daubert motion on Mr. Napper's damage report 832 is granted. Motorola's motion to compel production of Apple's and its counsel's communication with Chi Mei Computer Systems and to compel the deposition of Justin Huang 831 is denied as untimely. Mailed notice (am)
May 9, 2012 846 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7133319. (Jou, Edward)
May 8, 2012 845 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to sealed response, 839 , SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Gregory Leonard Regarding Motorola's FRAND Obligations 822 Exhibit 5 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6)(Cannon, Brian)
May 7, 2012 844 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. to Preclude Testimony of Carla Mulhern Regarding Motorola's Claims for Damages 823 Motorola's Response to Apple's Motion to Preclude Testimony of Carla Mulhern Regarding Motorola's Damages (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6)(Swedlow, Stephen)
May 7, 2012 843 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. to Exclude Testimony of Charles Donohoe That a License on a Single Patent in a Portfolio Might Command a Royalty of Up To 40-50% of the Overall Portfolio Rate 818 Motorola's Opposition Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendants Motion to Exclude Testimony of Charles Donohoe that a License on a Single Patent in a Portfolio Might Command a Royalty of up to 40-50% of the Overall Portfolio Rate (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, Part One, # 5 Exhibit 3, Part Two, # 6 Exhibit 4)(Swedlow, Stephen)
May 7, 2012 842 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. to Exclude Certain Testimony of Motorola's Damages Expert Michael J. Wagner Regarding Apple's Claims for Damages 816 Motorola's Opposition to Apples Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Motorola's Damages Expert Michael J. Wagner Regarding Apple's Claims for Damages (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Swedlow, Stephen)
May 7, 2012 841 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. to Exclude the Testimony of Richard J. Holleman 819 Motorola's Response to Apple's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Richard Holleman (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Cannon, Brian)
May 7, 2012 840 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc. and Next Software, Inc. Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion to Strike the Opinions of Plaintiffs' Economic Expert Brian W. Napper From His Original And Supplemental Reports Filed March 20, 2012 and April 20, 2012 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, Part 1, # 14 Exhibit L, Part 2, # 15 Exhibit L, Part 3, # 16 Exhibit M, # 17 Exhibit N, # 18 Exhibit O, # 19 Exhibit P, # 20 Exhibit Q, # 21 Exhibit R, # 22 Exhibit S, # 23 Exhibit T, # 24 Exhibit U, # 25 Exhibit V, # 26 Exhibit W, # 27 Exhibit X, # 28 Exhibit Y, # 29 Exhibit Z)(Ferguson, Brian) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office on 5/8/2012) (rp, ).
May 7, 2012 839 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Gregory Leonard Regarding Motorola's FRAND Obligations 822 Motorola's Response to Apple's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Gregory Leonard Regarding Motorola's FRAND Obligations (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Cannon, Brian)
May 7, 2012 838 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Motion to Strike the Opinions of Plaintiff's Economic Expert Brian W. Napper Regarding Motorola's Damages 821 Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion to Strike the Opinions of Plaintiffs' Economic Expert Brian W. Napper Regarding Motorola's Damages (Attachments: # 1 Appendix with Exhibits 1-10)(Fram, Robert)
May 7, 2012 837 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Motion to Strike the Opinions of Plaintiff's FRAND Expert Brian W. Napper 820 Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion to Strike Brian W. Napper's Testimony Regarding Maximum Royalty Rates Calculated in His March 1, 2012 Supplemental Report (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Ex. 1, # 3 Ex. 2, # 4 Ex. 3, # 5 Ex. 4, # 6 Ex. 5, # 7 Ex, 6, # 8 Ex. 7 part 1, # 9 Ex. 7 part 2, # 10 Ex. 7 part 3, # 11 Ex. 7 part 4, # 12 Ex. 7 part 5, # 13 Ex. 7 part 6, # 14 Ex. 7 part 7, # 15 Ex. 7 part 8, # 16 Ex. 7 part 9, # 17 Ex. 7 part 10, # 18 Ex. 8, # 19 Ex. 9, # 20 Ex. 10, # 21 Ex. 11, # 22 Ex. 12, # 23 Ex. 13, # 24 Ex. 14, # 25 Ex. 15, # 26 Ex. 16, # 27 Ex. 17)(Fram, Robert)
May 7, 2012 836 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple's Motion to Strike Exhibit 10, "Declaration of Mike Wagner," to Motorola's Daubert Motion on Mr. Napper's Damages Report 832 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Swedlow, Stephen)
May 7, 2012 835 RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.in Opposition to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. For Leave to Supplement the Expert Report of Dr. Anne Layne-Farrar 833 (Swedlow, Stephen)
May 7, 2012 834 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Motion to Compel Production of Apples and Its Counsels Communications with Chi Mei Computer Systems and to Compel the Deposition of Justin Huang 831 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Fram, Robert)
May 4, 2012 833 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. For Leave to Supplement the Expert Report of Dr. Anne Layne-Farrar (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C, # 4 Ex. D)(Fram, Robert)
May 4, 2012 832 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple's Motion to Strike Exhibit 10, "Declaration of Mike Wagner," to Motorola's Daubert Motion on Mr. Napper's Damages Report (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ferguson, Brian)
May 4, 2012 831 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Motion to Compel Production of Apples and Its Counsels Communications with Chi Mei Computer Systems and to Compel the Deposition of Justin Huang (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Cannon, Brian)
May 1, 2012 830 Order Of May 1. 2012.Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 5/1/2012: Mailed notice (am)
May 1, 2012 829 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF MAY 1, 2012: Defendants Motorola's motion to strike portions of Brian W. Napper's supplemental report submitted on April 20, 2012 805 is denied. Defendants Motorola's motion to strike Apple's updated expert report summaries 807 is dismissed as moot. Defendants Motorola's motion to compel Apple to produce its AT & T and Verizon Carrier Agreements 806 is granted. Mailed notice (am)
May 1, 2012 828 Order Of May 1, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 5/1/2012: Mailed notice (am)
May 1, 2012 827 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF MAY 1, 2012 Re Pretrial Schedule For Damages And Frand Trials. Mailed notice (am)
April 30, 2012 824 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Motion to Strike the Opinions of Plaintiff's Economic Expert Brian W. Napper from his Original and Supplemental Reports Filed March 20, 2012 and April 20, 2012 Respectively (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, Part 1, # 8 Exhibit 5, Part 2, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10)(Swedlow, Stephen)
April 30, 2012 823 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. to Preclude Testimony of Carla Mulhern Regarding Motorola's Claims for Damages (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Ex. 1, # 3 Ex. 2, # 4 Ex. 3, # 5 Ex. 4, # 6 Ex. 5, # 7 Ex. 6, # 8 Ex. 7, # 9 Ex. 8, # 10 Ex. 9, # 11 Ex. 10 part 1, # 12 Ex. 10 part 2, # 13 Ex. 11 part 1, # 14 Ex. 11 part 2, # 15 Ex. 12, # 16 Ex. 13, # 17 Ex. 14, # 18 Ex. 15)(Fram, Robert)
April 30, 2012 822 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Gregory Leonard Regarding Motorola's FRAND Obligations (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Ex. 1, # 3 Ex. 2, # 4 Ex. 3, # 5 Ex. 4, # 6 Ex. 5, # 7 Ex. 6, # 8 Ex. 7, # 9 Ex. 8 part 1, # 10 Ex. 8 part 2, # 11 Ex. 8 part 3, # 12 Ex. 9, # 13 Ex. 10, # 14 Ex. 11, # 15 Ex. 12)(Fram, Robert)
April 30, 2012 821 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Motion to Strike the Opinions of Plaintiff's Economic Expert Brian W. Napper Regarding Motorola's Damages (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7)(Swedlow, Stephen)
April 30, 2012 820 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Motion to Strike the Opinions of Plaintiff's FRAND Expert Brian W. Napper (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3)(Cannon, Brian)
April 30, 2012 819 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. to Exclude the Testimony of Richard J. Holleman (Attachments: # 1 Appendix and Exhibits 1-5)(Fram, Robert)
April 30, 2012 818 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. to Exclude Testimony of Charles Donohoe That a License on a Single Patent in a Portfolio Might Command a Royalty of Up To 40-50% of the Overall Portfolio Rate (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Ex. 1, # 3 Ex. 2)(Fram, Robert)
April 30, 2012 817 NOTICE of Prior Art References for Trial Pursuant to the Court's February 21, 2012 Order by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Erwine, Richard)
April 30, 2012 816 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. to Exclude Certain Testimony of Motorola's Damages Expert Michael J. Wagner Regarding Apple's Claims for Damages (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Ferguson, Brian)
April 30, 2012 815 Apple Inc.'s Narrowed List of Prior Art References by Apple, Inc. (Haskett, Christine saunders)
April 30, 2012 814 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple's Motion for Leave to Respond to Motorola's Supplement to Its Motion to Strike Portions of Brian W. Napper's Supplemental Report Submitted on April 20, 2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ferguson, Brian)
April 30, 2012 813 SEALED RESPONSE Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion to Strike Portions of Brian W. Napper's Supplemental Report Submitted on April 20, 2012 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Ferguson, Brian)
April 30, 2012 812 RESPONSE by Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to strike sealed document 804 Motorola's Motion to Strike Apple's Updated Expert Report Summaries 807 Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion to Strike Apple's Updated Expert Report Summaries (Ferguson, Brian)
April 30, 2012 809 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorolas Supplement to its Motion To Strike Portions of Brian W. Napper's Supplemental Report Submitted on April 20 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williamson, Amanda)
April 30, 2012 808 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola Mobility, Inc.s Memorandum and Motion to Compel Apple to Produce its AT&T and Verizon Carrier Agreements 806 Opposition to Motion to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Exhibits, # 2 Ex. 1, # 3 Ex. 2)(Haslam, Robert)
April 27, 2012 826 Order Of April 27, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 4/27/2012: Mailed notice (am)
April 27, 2012 825 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF APRIL 27, 2012: Defendants Motorolas' renewed motion for summary judgment of non-infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,479,949 776 is granted in part. Mailed notice (am)
April 27, 2012 807 MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to strike sealed document 804 Motorola's Motion to Strike Apple's Updated Expert Report Summaries (Erwine, Richard)
April 27, 2012 806 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola Mobility, Inc.s Memorandum and Motion to Compel Apple to Produce its AT&T and Verizon Carrier Agreements (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Cannon, Brian)
April 27, 2012 805 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to strike Motorola's Motion to Strike Portions of Brian W. Napper's Supplemental Report Submitted on April 20, 2012 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17)(Williamson, Amanda) Docket text modified by the Clerk's Office on 4/27/2012 (psm, ).
April 26, 2012 811 Order Of April 26, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 4/26/2012: Mailed notice (am)
April 26, 2012 810 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF APRIL 26, 2012: Apple Inc.'s motion to substitute expert witness and conditional motion for protective order 801 is denied. Mailed notice (am)
April 26, 2012 804 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple's Submission of Updated Expert Report Summaries (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Ferguson, Brian)
April 25, 2012 803 Order Of April 25, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 4/25/2012: Mailed notice (am)
April 25, 2012 802 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF APRIL 25, 2012: Apple's motion to strike improper supplementation of opinions regarding validity of U.S. Patent No. 6,175,559 797 is granted. Mailed notice (am) (Main Document 802 replaced on 5/1/2012) (am, ).
April 25, 2012 801 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apple Inc.'s Motion to Substitute Expert Witness and Conditional Motion for Protective Order (Haslam, Robert)
April 25, 2012 800 REPLY by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. to response in opposition to motion 799 , motion to strike 797 Reply in Support of Apple's Motion to Strike Improper Supplementation of Opinions Regarding Validity of U.S. Patent No. 6,175,559 (Haslam, Robert)
April 25, 2012 799 RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. to strike IMPROPER SUPPLEMENTATION OF OPINIONS REGARDING VALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,175,559 797 (Swedlow, Stephen)
April 24, 2012 798 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Apple, Inc. by Joseph J. Mueller (Mueller, Joseph)
April 24, 2012 797 MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. to strike IMPROPER SUPPLEMENTATION OF OPINIONS REGARDING VALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,175,559 (Haslam, Robert)
April 23, 2012 796 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: Attorney Matthew A. Traupman's motion to appear pro hac vice 782 is granted. Attorney Joseph J. Mueller's motion to appear pro hac vice 789 is granted. Mailed notice (am)
April 23, 2012 795 Order Of April 23, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 4/23/2012: Mailed notice (am)
April 23, 2012 794 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF APRIL 23, 2012: Motorola's unopposed motion to request submission of the parties' papers on French law 785 is granted. Motorola Mobility Inc.'s motion to compel plaintiffs to produce Dr. Leonard J. Cimini for deposition 786 is granted. Mailed notice (am)
April 23, 2012 793 Order Of April 21, 2012.Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 4/21/2012: Mailed notice (am)
April 23, 2012 792 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner:ENTER ORDER OF APRIL 21, 2012. Mailed notice (am)
April 23, 2012 791 RESPONSE by Apple, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to compel Motorola Mobility, Inc.s Memorandum and Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Produce Dr. Leonard J. Cimini for Deposition 786 (Haskett, Christine saunders)
April 23, 2012 790 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. to motion for leave to file 785 Response to Motorola's Motion to Request Submission of the Parties' Papers on French Law (Fram, Robert)
April 21, 2012 789 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7073017. (Mueller, Joseph)
April 20, 2012 788 SEALED RESPONSE Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,479,949 (Attachments: # 1 Apple Responses to Moto PFFs, # 2 Exhibit A (1/6), # 3 Exhibit A (2/6), # 4 Exhibit A (3/6), # 5 Exhibit A (4/6), # 6 Exhibit A (5/6), # 7 Exhibit A (6/6/), # 8 Exhibit B, # 9 Exhibit C, # 10 Exhibit D, # 11 Exhibit E, # 12 Exhibit F)(Ferguson, Brian)
April 20, 2012 787 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Sealed Appendix regarding MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to compel Motorola Mobility, Inc.s Memorandum and Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Produce Dr. Leonard J. Cimini for Deposition 786 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2)(Swedlow, Stephen)
April 20, 2012 786 MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to compel Motorola Mobility, Inc.s Memorandum and Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Produce Dr. Leonard J. Cimini for Deposition (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, Filed Under Seal, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Swedlow, Stephen)
April 20, 2012 785 MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. for leave to file Motorola's Motion to Request Submission of the Parties' Papers on French Law (Swedlow, Stephen)
April 20, 2012 784 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Supplemental Expert Report of Brian W. Napper (Ferguson, Brian)
April 19, 2012 783 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Monica Mucchetti Eno (Eno, Monica)
April 19, 2012 782 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7067580. (Traupman, Matthew)
April 19, 2012 781 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Jonathan Bloom (Bloom, Jonathan)
April 19, 2012 780 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Next Software, Inc. by Monica Mucchetti Eno (Eno, Monica)
April 18, 2012 779 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Counter Defendants Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Samuel F. Ernst (Ernst, Samuel)
April 18, 2012 778 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Stefani C. Smith (Smith, Stefani)
April 18, 2012 777 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Proposed Findings of Fact for Motorolas Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,479,949 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7)(Cannon, Brian)
April 18, 2012 776 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorolas Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,479,949 (Attachments: # 1 Motorola's Memorandum in Support of Motorolas Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,479,949)(Cannon, Brian)
April 17, 2012 775 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: Attorney Samuel F. Ernst's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice 772 is granted. Mailed notice (am)
April 17, 2012 772 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7058967. (Ernst, Samuel)
April 16, 2012 774 Order Of April 16, 2012.Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 4/16/2012: Mailed notice (am)
April 16, 2012 773 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF APRIL 16, 2012 regarding issues pertaining to the liability trials.Mailed notice (am)
April 16, 2012 771 Order of April 16, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 4/16/2012: Mailed notice (am)
April 16, 2012 770 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF APRIL 16, 2012: Motorola's motion for leave to supplement its expert reports concerning Apple's U.S. Patent Nos. 6,493,002, 6,343,263, and 5,946,647 757 is denied.. Apple's unopposed motion for leave to supplement its expert reports to address new information produced after the reports concerning (1) damages ; (2) Motorola's '559 patent [756 ] is granted. Apple's unopposed motion for leave to supplement its expert reports to address new information produced after the reports concerning (3) Motorola's '898 patent 756 is denied. Mailed notice (am, )
April 16, 2012 769 Order of April 15, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 4/15/2012: Mailed notice (am)
April 16, 2012 768 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF APRIL 15, 2012: Pretrial schedule for liability trials. Mailed notice (am)
April 15, 2012 763 MEMORANDUM by Apple, Inc. in Opposition to motion to supplement, 757 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Ferguson, Brian)
April 15, 2012 762 RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.in Opposition to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. to Supplement Its Expert Reports to Address New Information Produced After the Reports Concerning (1) Damages; (2) Motorola's 559 Patent; and (3) Motorola's 898 Patent 756 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Swedlow, Stephen)
April 13, 2012 767 Order of April 13, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 4/13/2012: Mailed notice (am)
April 13, 2012 766 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF APRIL 13, 2012: Motorola's motion for summary judgment of non-infringement of U.S. Patent Number 6,493,002 375 is denied. Mailed notice (am)
April 13, 2012 765 Order of April 13, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 4/13/2012: Mailed notice (am)
April 13, 2012 764 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF APRIL 13, 2012: Motorola's motion to request additional time to respond to Apple's new infringement contentions with Apple's supplemental expert declaration regarding Apple's '949 patent 759 is granted. Mailed notice (am)
April 13, 2012 761 WITNESS List by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Williamson, Amanda)
April 13, 2012 760 WITNESS List by Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. (Haslam, Robert)
April 13, 2012 759 MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. for extension of time to file response/reply as to order 749 Motorola's Motion to Request Additional Time to Respond to Apple's New Infringement Contentions with Apple's Supplemental Expert Declaration Regarding Apple's '949 Patent (Swedlow, Stephen)
April 13, 2012 758 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to order 751 Motorola's Brief in Response to the Court's Order of April 9, 2012 Regarding Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Number 6,493,002 (Erwine, Richard)
April 13, 2012 757 MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to supplement Motorola's Motion for Leave to Supplement its Expert Reports Concerning Apple's U.S. Patent Nos. 6,493,002, 6,343,263, and 5,946,647 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Erwine, Richard)
April 13, 2012 756 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. to Supplement Its Expert Reports to Address New Information Produced After the Reports Concerning (1) Damages; (2) Motorola's 559 Patent; and (3) Motorola's 898 Patent (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Ferguson, Brian)
April 13, 2012 755 RESPONSE by Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc.in Opposition to SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Number 6,493,002 708 Apple's Supplemental Brief in Response to the Court's April 9, 2012 Order, and in Further Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,493,002 (Ferguson, Brian)
April 11, 2012 754 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: Attorney Charles P. Emanuel's motion to appear pro hac vice on behalf of defendants 743 is granted. Attorney Stefani C. Smith's motion to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiffs 745 is granted. Mailed notice (am)
April 10, 2012 753 Order of April 10, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 4/10/2012: Mailed notice (am)
April 10, 2012 752 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF APRIL 10, 2012: Apple, Inc. et al's motion to compel defendants to designate witnesses to testify regarding Apple's fourth 30(b)(6) notice and to make noticed individuals available tor deposition 729 is granted, limited to deposition topics 1,2,4,5 and 8 of Apple's fourth 30(b)(6) notice. Defendants' motion for ruling on January 9, 2012 motion for summary judgment on Apple's estoppel/unclean hands defense 732 is denied. Mailed notice (am)
April 10, 2012 745 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7035909. (Smith, Stefani)
April 9, 2012 751 Order of April 9, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 4/9/2012: Mailed notice (am)
April 9, 2012 750 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF APRIL 9, 2012: Defendants' motion for summary judgment of non-infringement of U.S. Patent Number 6,343,263 707 is denied. Apple Inc. et al's motion for summary judgment of non-infringement and invalidity of claims 4 and 5 of U.S. Patent No. 6,175,559 711 is granted as to claim 4 and denied as to claim 5. Defendants' motion for summary judgment of non-infringement of U.S. Patent Number 5,946,647 709 is denied. Mailed notice (am)
April 9, 2012 749 Order of April 9, 2012, Regarding Apple's Patent '949. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 4/9/2012: Mailed notice (am)
April 9, 2012 748 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF APRIL 9, 2012, REGARDING APPLE'S PATENT '949. Mailed notice (am)
April 9, 2012 747 Order of April 7, 2012, Regarding Apple's Patent '949. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 4/7/2012:Mailed notice (am)
April 9, 2012 746 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF APRIL 7, 2012, REGARDING APPLE'S PATENT '949: Motorola's motion for summary judgment of non-infringement of U.S. Patent Number 7,479,949 710 is denied. Apple's motion to supplement its expert reports concerning Apple's U.S. Patent No. 7,479,949 725 is granted. Mailed notice (am)
April 9, 2012 744 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Updated Summary of Dr. Cimini's Expert Reports Regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,359,898 (Haslam, Robert)
April 9, 2012 743 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7029661. (Emanuel, Charles)
April 9, 2012 740 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to sealed document, 735 Motorolas Response to Apple's Objections to Evidence Cited in Motorola's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Invalidity of Claims 4 and 5 of U.S. Patent No. 6,17,5,559 (Swedlow, Stephen)
April 9, 2012 739 RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. to compel Defendants Motorola Inc. and Motorola Mobility, Inc. to Designate Witnesses to Testify Regarding Apple's Fourth 30(b)(6) Notice and to Make Noticed Individuals Available for Deposi 729 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Williamson, Amanda)
April 9, 2012 738 MEMORANDUM by Apple, Inc. in Opposition to motion to strike 733 Infringement Contentions and Evidence re 949 Patent (Ferguson, Brian)
April 9, 2012 737 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion for Ruling on Motorola's Jan. 9, 2012 Motion for Summary Judgment on Apple's Estoppel/Unclean Hands Defense (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1, # 2 Ex. 2, # 3 Ex. 3, # 4 Ex. 4, # 5 Ex. 5, # 6 Ex. 6)(Fram, Robert)
April 9, 2012 736 RESPONSE by Apple, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. for order Motorola's Motion for Ruling on Motorola's January 9, 2012 Motion for Summary Judgment on Apple's Estoppel/Unlcean Hands Defense 732 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Exhibits, # 2 Ex. 7)(Fram, Robert)
April 6, 2012 735 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apple's Objections to Evidence Cited by Motorola in Its Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement and Invalidity of Claims 4 and 5 of U.S. Patent No. 6,175,559 (Haslam, Robert)
April 6, 2012 734 SEALED REPLY by Apple, Inc. to sealed response,,, 722 Reply In Support of Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement and Invalidity of Claims 4 and 5 of U.S. Patent No. 6,175,559 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Reply Proposed Findings of Fact)(Haslam, Robert)
April 6, 2012 733 MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to strike Motorola's Motion to Strike Apple's New Infringement Contentions and Supplemental Expert Declarations (Swedlow, Stephen)
April 6, 2012 732 MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. for order Motorola's Motion for Ruling on Motorola's January 9, 2012 Motion for Summary Judgment on Apple's Estoppel/Unlcean Hands Defense (Swedlow, Stephen)
April 6, 2012 731 OBJECTIONS by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to sealed response, 719 Motorolas Objections to Evidence Cited by Apple in Apples Opposition to Motorolas Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,479,949 (Erwine, Richard)
April 6, 2012 730 SEALED REPLY by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to sealed response, 719 , SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Number 7,479,949 710 Reply in Support of Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Number 7,479,949 (Erwine, Richard)
April 6, 2012 729 MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. to compel Defendants Motorola Inc. and Motorola Mobility, Inc. to Designate Witnesses to Testify Regarding Apple's Fourth 30(b)(6) Notice and to Make Noticed Individuals Available for Deposition (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20)(Ferguson, Brian)
April 6, 2012 728 SEALED REPLY by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to sealed response, 720 , SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Number 5,946,647 709 Reply in Support of Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Number 5,946,647 (Erwine, Richard)
April 6, 2012 727 SEALED REPLY by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Number 6,343,263 707 , sealed response, 718 Reply in Support of Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Number 6,343,263 (Attachments: # 1 Motorola's Responses to Apple's Proposed Findings of Fact)(Erwine, Richard)
April 6, 2012 726 SEALED REPLY by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Number 6,493,002 708 , sealed response, 717 Reply in Support of Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Number 6,493,002 (Attachments: # 1 Motorola's Proposed Findings of Fact)(Erwine, Richard)
April 6, 2012 725 MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. to supplement expert reports as to U.S. Patent No. 7,479,949 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Ferguson, Brian)
April 5, 2012 742 Order of April 5, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 4/5/2012: Mailed notice (am)
April 5, 2012 741 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF APRIL 5, 2012: Defendants' motion to supplement motion for leave to conduct fact deposition after the close of discovery 699 is granted. Mailed notice (am)
April 5, 2012 724 Featured Case ORDER of April 5, 2012 Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 4/5/2012. (nf, )
April 5, 2012 723 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF APRIL 5, 2012: Parties' joint motion regarding U.S. Patent No. 5,556,337 714 is granted. Summary judgment of non-infringement is entered and Motorola's counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice. Mailed notice (For further detail see separate order) (nf, )
April 5, 2012 722 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Counter Claimants Apple, Inc., Apple, Inc., Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Counter Defendants Apple, Inc., Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringem 711 Motorolas Opposition to Apple Inc.S Second Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement and Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 6,175,559 (Attachments: # 1 Motorola's Responses to Apple's Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Declaration of J. Stevenson Kenney, # 3 Declaration of David Elihu, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit 14, # 18 Exhibit 15, # 19 Exhibit 16, # 20 Exhibit 17, # 21 Exhibit 18, # 22 Exhibit 19)(Swedlow, Stephen)
April 5, 2012 721 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: Attorney Christopher T. Marando's application to appear pro hac vice 688 is granted. Attorney David Mitchell DesrRosier's application to appear pro hac vice 715 is granted. Mailed notice (am)
April 5, 2012 720 SEALED RESPONSE Apple's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,946,647 (Attachments: # 1 Apple's Responses to Motorola's PFFs, # 2 Declaration of Brian E. Ferguson, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2 (1 of 3), # 5 Exhibit 2 (2 of 3), # 6 Exhibit 2 (3 of 3), # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Declaration of Todd Mowry, # 10 Exhibit A, # 11 Exhibit B)(Ferguson, Brian)
April 5, 2012 719 SEALED RESPONSE Apple's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,479,949 (Attachments: # 1 Apple's Responses to Motorola's PFFs, # 2 Declaration of Brian E. Ferguson, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Declaration of Steven Feiner, # 10 Declaration of Stan Ng)(Ferguson, Brian)
April 5, 2012 718 SEALED RESPONSE Apple's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,343,263 (Attachments: # 1 Apple's Responses to Motorola's PFFs, # 2 Declaration of Brian E. Ferguson, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Declaration of Dr. Nathaniel Polish, # 7 Exhibit A, # 8 Exhibit B, # 9 Exhibit C)(Ferguson, Brian)
April 5, 2012 717 SEALED RESPONSE Apple's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,493,002 (Attachments: # 1 Apple's Responses to Motorola's PFF, # 2 Declaration of Alex. C. Snoeren, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C)(Ferguson, Brian)
April 5, 2012 716 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. by Thomas William Cushing (Cushing, Thomas)
April 5, 2012 715 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7021090. (Desrosier, David)
April 4, 2012 714 STIPULATION of Dismissal Regarding U.S. Patent No. 5,566,337 (Ferguson, Brian)
April 3, 2012 713 Featured Case ORDER of April 3, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 4/3/2012: Mailed notice (am)
April 3, 2012 712 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF APRIL 3, 2012: There will be a pretrial conference on Monday, April 16, 2012 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (am)
April 2, 2012 711 SEALED MOTION by Counter Claimants Apple, Inc., Apple, Inc., Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Counter Defendants Apple, Inc., Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement and Invalidity of Claims 4 & 5 of U.S. Patent No. 6,175,559 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Chris Heegard, Ph.D., in Support of Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement and Invalidity of Claims 4 & 5 of U.S. Patent No. 6,175,559, # 2 Declaration of Winslow B. Taub in Support of Plaintiffs' Second Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement and Invalidity of Claims 4 & 5 of U.S. Patent No. 6,175,559, # 3 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Winslow B. Taub, # 4 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Winslow B. Taub, # 5 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Winslow B. Taub, # 6 Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Winslow B. Taub, # 7 Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Winslow B. Taub, # 8 Exhibit 6 to the Declaration of Winslow B. Taub, # 9 Exhibit 7 to the Declaration of Winslow B. Taub, # 10 Exhibit 8 to the Declaration of Winslow B. Taub, # 11 Exhibit 9 to the Declaration of Winslow B. Taub, # 12 Exhibit 10 to the Declaration of Winslow B. Taub, # 13 Apple Inc.'s Proposed Findings of Fact Regarding its Second Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement and Invalidity of Claims 4 & 5 of U.S. Patent No. 6,175,559)(Haslam, Robert)
April 2, 2012 710 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Number 7,479,949 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Findings of Fact, # 3 Appendix, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7)(Erwine, Richard)
April 2, 2012 709 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Number 5,946,647 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Findings of Fact, # 3 Appendix, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6)(Erwine, Richard)
April 2, 2012 708 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Number 6,493,002 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Findings of Fact, # 3 Appendix, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6)(Erwine, Richard)
April 2, 2012 707 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Number 6,343,263 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Findings of Fact, # 3 Appendix Appendix, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, Part One, # 6 Exhibit 2, Part Two, # 7 Exhibit 3, Part One, # 8 Exhibit 3, Part Two, # 9 Exhibit 3, Part Three, # 10 Exhibit 4, Part One, # 11 Exhibit 4, Part Two, # 12 Exhibit 4, Part Three, # 13 Exhibit 4, Part Four, # 14 Exhibit 4, Part Five, # 15 Exhibit 5, # 16 Exhibit 6, # 17 Exhibit 7, # 18 Exhibit 8)(Erwine, Richard)
April 2, 2012 702 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Updated Summary of Dr. Williams's Opinions Concerning Infringement and Validity of U.S. Patent No. 6,359,898 (Swedlow, Stephen)
April 2, 2012 701 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Updated Summary of Dr. J. Stevenson Kenney's Opinions Concerning Infringement and Validity of U.S. Patent No. 6.175,559 (Swedlow, Stephen)
April 2, 2012 700 SEALED RESPONSE Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion to Compel Production of Apple's and Its Counsel's Communications with Jefferson Y. Han and to Preclude Apple from Relying on Redirect Testimony of Jefferson Y. Han (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steven Cherensky, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Declaration of Matthew I. Kreeger, # 4 Exhibit A)(Ferguson, Brian)
March 30, 2012 706 Order of March 30, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 3/30/2012: Mailed notice (am)
March 30, 2012 705 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF MARCH 30, 2012: Apple's motion for limited reconsideration of the court's construction of the "next item" heuristics term in Apple's 949 patent 695 is denied. Mailed notice (am) (Main Document 705 replaced on 4/2/2012) (am, ).
March 30, 2012 704 Order of March 30, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 3/30/2012: Mailed notice (am)
March 30, 2012 703 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF MARCH 30, 2012: Apple's petition for leave to file a motion seeking leave to file a motion for summary judgment 685 is denied. Mailed notice (am)
March 30, 2012 699 MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to supplement Motion for Leave to Conduct a Fact Deposition After the Close of Discovery (Erwine, Richard)
March 30, 2012 698 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Motion to Compel Production of Apples and its Counsels Communications With Jefferson Y. Han and to Preclude Apple From Relying on Redirect Testimony of Jefferson Y. Han (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Cannon, Brian)
March 30, 2012 697 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's List of Witnesses for Trial (Swedlow, Stephen)
March 30, 2012 696 WITNESS List by Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. (Haslam, Robert)
March 30, 2012 695 MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. for reconsideration Apple's Motion for Limited Reconsideration of the Court's Construction of the "Next Item" Heuristics Term in Apple's 949 Patent (Ferguson, Brian)
March 30, 2012 694 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Motion for Leave to Conduct a Fact Deposition After the Close of Discovery (Erwine, Richard)
March 29, 2012 693 Featured Case ORDER of March 29, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 3/29/2012:Judicial staff mailed notice (Attachments: # 1 Instructions.(gl, )
March 29, 2012 692 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: John Golden, the parties nominee to serve as a court-appointed expert witness on damages pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 706(b), has accepted the position. The attached instructions are hereby issued to Prof. Golden. (For details, see Order in separate docket entry).Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
March 29, 2012 691 Featured Case ORDER of March 29, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 3/29/2012:Judicial staff mailed notice(gl, )
March 29, 2012 690 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: Enter Order of March 29, 2012. (For further details, see Order in separate docket entry). Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
March 29, 2012 688 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6996402. (Marando, Christopher)
March 29, 2012 686 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner:Application of Jonathan Bloom to appear pro hac vice 677 for plaintiffs is granted. Jonathan Bloom added. Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
March 29, 2012 685 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apple's Petition for Leave to File a Motion Seeking Leave to File a Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Apple's Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,311,516)(Haslam, Robert)
March 28, 2012 678 NOTICE by Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Notice of Attorney Name Change (Ho, Jill)
March 28, 2012 677 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6990651. (Bloom, Jonathan)
March 27, 2012 689 Featured Case ORDER of March 27, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 3/27/2012:Judicial staff mailed notice(gl, )
March 27, 2012 687 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: Enter Order of March 27, 2012 setting timetable to Daubert challenges (if any) to the parties' liability experts. (For further details, see Order in separate docket entry). Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
March 27, 2012 684 Featured Case ORDER of March 27, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 3/27/2012:Judicial staff mailed notice(gl, )
March 27, 2012 683 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: On February 23, the court accepted the parties' proposal to exchange the reports of each side's damages experts by March 20. To facilitate the court-appointed damages expert's preparation, the parties are ordered to submit the reports of their damages experts to the court by Monday, April 2. The parties may submit the reports by email or by mailingfour hard drives to the court's chambers address, as was done with the liability expert reports and materials. (For further details, see Order in separate docket entry).Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
March 27, 2012 682 Featured Case ORDER of March 27, 2012 Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 3/27/2012. (nf, )
March 27, 2012 681 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF MARCH 27, 2012 re Daubert challenges (if any). Mailed notice (For further detail see separate order) (nf, )
March 27, 2012 680 Featured Case ORDER of March 27, 2012 Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 3/27/2012.(nf, )
March 27, 2012 679 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF MARCH 27, 2012 re damages experts' reports. Mailed notice (For further detail see separate order) (nf, )
March 27, 2012 676 Motorola's Notice of Supplemental Authority with Respect to Claim Construction for Apple's '949 Patent by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Ergo Licensing)(Cannon, Brian)
March 26, 2012 675 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Claim Construction Brief Concerning the "Heuristics" Means-Plus-Function Limitations for United States Patent No. 7,479,949 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Erwine, Richard)
March 26, 2012 674 SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple's Supplemental Claim Construction Brief Addressing The "Heuristics" Terms in Apple's 949 Patent (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5 (1 of 2), # 7 Exhibit 5 (2 of 2))(Ferguson, Brian)
March 22, 2012 673 Featured Case ORDER of March 22, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 3/22/2012: Mailed notice (am)
March 22, 2012 672 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF MARCH 22, 2012: The parties' joint request for further summary judgment motions is granted. Briefs will be due 4/13/2012; responses due by 4/20/2012. Replies, if any due by 4/23/2012. Hearing on summary judgment will be 4/26/2012. Mailed notice (am)
March 19, 2012 671 Featured Case ORDER of March 19, 2012 regarding claim construction. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 3/19/2012: Mailed notice (am)
March 19, 2012 670 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF MARCH 19, 2012 regarding claims construction. Mailed notice (am)
March 19, 2012 669 Featured Case ORDER of March 19, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 3/19/2012: Mailed notice (am)
March 19, 2012 668 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF MARCH 19, 2012: Plaintiffs' motion to compel Motorola to comply with the Court's March 5, 2012 Order, compelling discovery of Google's acquisition of Android, Inc. its development of the Android Operating System, and its acquisition of Motorola 666 is denied. Mailed notice (am)
March 19, 2012 667 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. to compel Motorola to Comply with the Court's March 5, 2012 Order, Compelling Discovery of Google's Acquisition of Android Inc., Its Development of the Android Operating System, and Its 666 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Williamson, Amanda)
March 16, 2012 666 MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. to compel Motorola to Comply with the Court's March 5, 2012 Order, Compelling Discovery of Google's Acquisition of Android Inc., Its Development of the Android Operating System, and Its Acquisition of Motorola (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Ferguson, Brian)
March 14, 2012 665 Featured Case ORDER Of March 14, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 3/14/2012: Mailed notice (am)
March 14, 2012 664 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF MARCH 14, 2012: Plaintiffs' motion to compel defendants to produce certain license agreements 651 is granted. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file supplemental reports regarding its equitable estoppel and unclean hands defenses 650 is granted. Mailed notice (am)
March 12, 2012 663 Order of March 10, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 3/10/2012: Mailed notice (am)
March 12, 2012 662 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF MARCH 10, 2012.Mailed notice (am)
March 12, 2012 661 Order Of March 11, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 3/11/2012: Mailed notice (am)
March 12, 2012 660 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF MARCH 11, 2012. Mailed notice (am)
March 12, 2012 659 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apple's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Reports Regarding Its Equitable Estoppel and Unclean Hands Defenses 650 (Cannon, Brian)
March 12, 2012 658 RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc.in Opposition to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Motion to Compel Defendants Motorola, Inc. and Motorola Mobility, Inc. to Produce Certain License Agreements 651 (Williamson, Amanda)
March 10, 2012 657 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Stacie Rachel Hartman (Hartman, Stacie)
March 9, 2012 656 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Claim Construction Brief Addressing Motorola's Asserted Patents (Erwine, Richard)
March 9, 2012 655 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Claim Construction Brief Addressing Apple's Asserted Patents (Erwine, Richard)
March 9, 2012 654 Apple's Memorandum re Claim Construction of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,359,898 and 6,175,559 by Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Exhibits, # 2 Ex. A, # 3 Ex. B, # 4 Ex. C)(Haslam, Robert)
March 9, 2012 653 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Appendix to Motorola's Claim Construction Brief Addressing Motorola's Asserted Patents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Erwine, Richard)
March 9, 2012 652 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Appendix to Motorola's Claim Construction Brief Addressing Apple's Asserted Patents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, Part One, # 4 Exhibit 3, Part Two, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, Part One, # 8 Exhibit 6, Part Two, # 9 Exhibit 7, Part One, # 10 Exhibit 7, Part Two, # 11 Exhibit 7, Part Three, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9, # 14 Exhibit 10, Part One, # 15 Exhibit 10, Part Two, # 16 Exhibit 10, Part Three, # 17 Exhibit 11, Part One, # 18 Exhibit 11, Part Two, # 19 Exhibit 12, Part One, # 20 Exhibit 12, Part Two, # 21 Exhibit 12, Part Three, # 22 Exhibit 12, Part Four, # 23 Exhibit 12, Part Five, # 24 Exhibit 13, # 25 Exhibit 14, Part One, # 26 Exhibit 14, Part Two, # 27 Exhibit 14, Part Three, # 28 Exhibit 15, # 29 Exhibit 16, # 30 Exhibit 17, # 31 Exhibit 18, Part One, # 32 Exhibit 18, Part Two, # 33 Exhibit 19, # 34 Exhibit 20, # 35 Exhibit 21, # 36 Exhibit 22, # 37 Exhibit 23, # 38 Exhibit 24, # 39 Exhibit 25, # 40 Exhibit 26, # 41 Exhibit 27, # 42 Exhibit 28, Part One, # 43 Exhibit 28, Part Two, # 44 Exhibit 29, # 45 Exhibit 30, # 46 Exhibit 31, # 47 Exhibit 32, # 48 Exhibit 33, # 49 Exhibit 34, # 50 Exhibit 35, # 51 Exhibit 36, Part One, # 52 Exhibit 36, Part Two, # 53 Exhibit 36, Part Three, # 54 Exhibit 36, Part Four, # 55 Exhibit 37, # 56 Exhibit 38, # 57 Exhibit 39, # 58 Exhibit 40, # 59 Exhibit 41, # 60 Exhibit 42, # 61 Exhibit 43, # 62 Exhibit 44, # 63 Exhibit 45)(Erwine, Richard)
March 9, 2012 651 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Motion to Compel Defendants Motorola, Inc. and Motorola Mobility, Inc. to Produce Certain License Agreements (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6)(Ferguson, Brian)
March 9, 2012 650 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apple's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Reports Regarding Its Equitable Estoppel and Unclean Hands Defenses (Attachments: # 1 Appendix with Exhibits 1-8)(Fram, Robert)
March 9, 2012 649 Claim Construction Brief by Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple's Claim Construction Brief Addressing the Terms in the Apple Patents (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3 (1 of 4), # 5 Exhibit 3 (2 of 4), # 6 Exhibit 3 (3 of 4), # 7 Exhibit 3 (4 of 4), # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9, # 14 Exhibit 10, # 15 Exhibit 11, # 16 Exhibit 12, # 17 Exhibit 13, # 18 Exhibit 14, # 19 Exhibit 15, # 20 Exhibit 16, # 21 Exhibit 17, # 22 Exhibit 18 (1 of 2), # 23 Exhibit 18 (2 of 2))(Ferguson, Brian)
March 9, 2012 648 Order Of March 9, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 3/9/2012: Mailed notice (am)
March 9, 2012 647 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF MARCH 9, 2012: Plaintiff Apple, Inc.'s motion to compel production of materials relating to the invention of the claims of the 559 patent 608 is granted in part. Mailed notice (am)
March 9, 2012 646 Order of March 9, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 3/9/2012: Mailed notice (am)
March 9, 2012 645 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF MARCH 9, 2012. Mailed notice (am)
March 8, 2012 644 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Summary of Dr. Williams's Opinions Concerning Infringement And Validity of U.S. Patent No. 6,359,898 (Erwine, Richard)
March 8, 2012 643 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Summary of Dr. J. Stevenson Kenney's Opinions Concerning Infringement and Validity of U.S. Patent No. 6.175,559 (Erwine, Richard)
March 8, 2012 642 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Summary of Dr. Jeffay's Opinions Concerning Non-Infringement and Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,519,867 (Erwine, Richard)
March 8, 2012 641 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorolas Summary of Robert Dezmelyks Opinions Concerning Non-Infringement and Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 7,479,949 (Erwine, Richard)
March 8, 2012 640 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Summary of Dr. Cooper's Opinions Concerning Non-Infringement and Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 6,493,002 (Erwine, Richard)
March 8, 2012 639 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Summary of Dr. Clark's Opinions Concerning Non-Infringement and Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 6,343,263 (Erwine, Richard)
March 8, 2012 638 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Summary of Dr. Clark's Opinions Concerning Non-Infringement and Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,946,647 (Erwine, Richard)
March 8, 2012 637 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Summary of Dr. Chase's Opinions Concerning Non-Infringement and Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,566,337 (Erwine, Richard)
March 8, 2012 636 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Summary of Dr. Almeroth's Opinions Concerning Infringement and Validity of U.S. Patent No. 5,311,516 (Erwine, Richard)
March 8, 2012 635 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apples Summary of Expert Reports Regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,175,559 (Haslam, Robert)
March 8, 2012 634 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apples Summary of Expert Reports of Chris Heegard, Ph.D., Regarding the Invalidity and Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,311,516 (Haslam, Robert)
March 8, 2012 633 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apples Summary of Expert Reports Regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,359,898 (Haslam, Robert)
March 8, 2012 632 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Summary of Apple Expert Steven Feiner, Ph.D.'s Reports Regarding U.S. Patent No. 7,479,949 (Ferguson, Brian)
March 8, 2012 631 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple's Summary of the Expert Reports of Dr. Jonathan Aldrich Regarding Infringement and Validity of U.S. Patent Number 5,519,867 (Ferguson, Brian)
March 8, 2012 630 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple's Summary of the Expert Reports of Todd C. Mowry Regarding Infringement and Validity of U.S. Patent Number 5,946,647 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ferguson, Brian)
March 8, 2012 629 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple's Summary of the Expert Reports of Dr. Jonathan Aldrich Regarding Infringement and Validity of U.S. Patent Number 5,566,337 (Ferguson, Brian)
March 8, 2012 628 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple's Summary of the Expert Reports of Alex Snoeren Regarding Infringement and Validity of U.S. Patent Number 6,493,002 (Ferguson, Brian)
March 8, 2012 627 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple's Summary of the Expert Reports of Dr. Nathaniel Polish Regarding Infringement and Validity of U.S. Patent Number 6,343,263 (Ferguson, Brian)
March 7, 2012 626 Order of March 7, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 3/7/2012: Mailed notice(am)
March 7, 2012 625 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF MARCH 7, 2012: Plaintiffs Apple Inc. and Next Software Inc.'s motion to strike new prior art asserted in Motorola's supplemental reports 622 is denied. Plaintiff Apple Inc.'s motion for reconsideration of the Court's order striking Apples supplemental reports regarding its equitable estoppel and unclean hands defense 623 is denied. Mailed notice (am)
March 7, 2012 624 MEMORANDUM by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. in Opposition to motion to strike 622 (Williamson, Amanda)
March 6, 2012 623 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Striking Apple's Supplemental Reports Regarding Its Equitable Estoppel and Unclean Hands Defenses (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Exhibits with Exhibits 1-11)(Fram, Robert)
March 6, 2012 622 MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. to strike New Prior Art Defenses Identified in Motorola's Supplemental Liability Expert Reports (Ferguson, Brian)
March 5, 2012 621 Featured Case ORDER Of Marcb 5, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 3/5/2012: Mailed notice (am)
March 5, 2012 620 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF MARCH 5, 2012: Plaintiffs' motion to compel Motorola and Google to provide discovery concerning Google's acquisition of Android Inc., its development of the Android Operating System and its acquisition of Motorola 607 is granted. Defendants' motion to preclude Apple from relying of testimony of Boris Teksler on frand issues 609 is denied. Defendants' motion to strike Apple's new frand reports 614 is granted. Mailed notice (am)
March 5, 2012 619 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: Attorney Mark G. Davis' application to appear pro hac vice on behalf of the plaintiffs 606 is granted. Mailed notice (am)
March 5, 2012 618 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Motion to Compel Production of Materials Relating to the Invention of the Claims of the '559 Patent 608 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit A)(Williamson, Amanda)
March 5, 2012 617 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. regarding MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. to compel Motorola and Google to Provide Discovery Concerning Google's Acquisition of Android Inc., Its Development of the Android Operating System, and Its Acquisition of Motorola 607 , response in opposition to motion, 616 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Williamson, Amanda)
March 5, 2012 616 RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. to compel Motorola and Google to Provide Discovery Concerning Google's Acquisition of Android Inc., Its Development of the Android Operating System, and Its Acquisition of Motorola 607 (Williamson, Amanda)
March 4, 2012 615 REPLY by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. to sealed response 610 Apples Reply Brief re the Transfer of Case No. 11-cv-178 from the Western District of Wisconsin (Fram, Robert)
March 4, 2012 614 MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to strike MOTOROLA'S MOTION TO STRIKE APPLE'S NEW FRAND REPORTS (Cannon, Brian)
March 4, 2012 613 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. TO PRECLUDE APPLE FROM RELYING ON TESTIMONY OF BORIS TEKSLER ON FRAND ISSUES 609 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix and Exhibits 1-4)(Fram, Robert)
March 2, 2012 612 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. EXHIBIT 1 TO APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S RESPONSE TO APPLES PROPOSAL RE: CASE NO. 3:11-cv-178 FROM THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF WISCONSIN regarding exhibit, 611 , sealed document 603 , sealed response 610 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cannon, Brian)
March 2, 2012 611 EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S RESPONSE TO APPLES PROPOSAL RE: CASE NO. 3:11-cv-178 FROM THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF WISCONSIN regarding sealed document 603 , sealed response 610 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Filed Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Cannon, Brian)
March 2, 2012 610 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to sealed document 603 MOTOROLA'S RESPONSE TO APPLES PROPOSAL RE: CASE NO. 3:11-cv-178 FROM THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF WISCONSIN (Cannon, Brian)
March 2, 2012 609 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. TO PRECLUDE APPLE FROM RELYING ON TESTIMONY OF BORIS TEKSLER ON FRAND ISSUES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Filed Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit 2, Filed Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit 3, Filed Under Seal, # 4 Exhibit 4, Filed Under Seal, # 5 Exhibit 5, Filed Under Seal)(Cannon, Brian)
March 2, 2012 608 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Motion to Compel Production of Materials Relating to the Invention of the Claims of the '559 Patent (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Exhibits and Exhibits 1-4)(Haslam, Robert)
March 2, 2012 607 MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. to compel Motorola and Google to Provide Discovery Concerning Google's Acquisition of Android Inc., Its Development of the Android Operating System, and Its Acquisition of Motorola (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10)(Ferguson, Brian)
March 2, 2012 606 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6898154. (Davis, Mark)
February 29, 2012 605 Order Of February 29, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 2/29/2012: Mailed notice (am)
February 29, 2012 604 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF FEBRUARY 29, 2012.Mailed notice (am)
February 28, 2012 603 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple's Proposal Regarding Case no. 3:11-cv-178 from the Western District of Wisconsin (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Exhibits, # 2 Ex. 1, # 3 Ex. 2)(Fram, Robert)
February 28, 2012 ISSUED original and 2 copies of Letters Rogatory issued as to Country of Taiwan. (am)
February 27, 2012 602 Order Of February 27, 2012.Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 2/27/2012: Mailed notice (am) (Main Document 602 replaced on 2/27/2012) (am, ).
February 27, 2012 601 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF FEBRUARY 27, 2012: Plaintiff Apple, Inc.'s motion for issuance of request for International Judicial Assistance - Letter Rogatory 594 is granted. Motorola's motion to compel plaintiffs to designate and provide witnesses for defendants' 30(b)(6) topics 84-100 597 is granted. Motorola's motion to compel plaintiffs to produce documents responsive to defendants' request for production no. 100 and to designate and provide witnesses for defendants' 30(b)(6) topic 121 598 is dismissed as moot. Mailed notice
February 27, 2012 600 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc. to MOTION by Counter Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Counter Claimants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Motorola, Inc., 597 Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Motorola's Motion to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Winslow Taub in Support of Opposition, # 2 Exhibits 1-9)(Haslam, Robert)
February 27, 2012 599 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc. to MOTION by Counter Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Counter Claimants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Motorola, Inc., 598 Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Motorola's Motion to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Elena DiMuzio in Support of Opposition, # 2 Ex. A)(Haslam, Robert)
February 24, 2012 598 MOTION by Counter Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Counter Claimants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to compel (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 8)(Williamson, Amanda)
February 24, 2012 597 MOTION by Counter Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Counter Claimants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to compel (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(Williamson, Amanda)
February 24, 2012 596 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: Plaintiff Apple Inc.'s emergency motion for leave to file under seal Apple's application for issuance of request for international judicial assistance (letter rogatory) 595 is granted. Mailed notice (am)
February 22, 2012 595 MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. to seal document MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. for issuance of letters rogatory Apple's Application for Issuance of Request for International Judicial Assistance - Letter Rogatory 594 Apple Inc.'s Emergency Motion to Seal (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Danielle)
February 22, 2012 594 MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. for issuance of letters rogatory Apple's Application for Issuance of Request for International Judicial Assistance - Letter Rogatory (Attachments: # 1 Request for International Judicial Assistance to Obtain Documents and Testimony, # 2 Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Danielle)
February 22, 2012 593 Order of February 22, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 2/22/2012: Mailed notice (am)
February 22, 2012 592 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF FEBRUARY 22, 2012. Mailed notice (am)
February 21, 2012 591 Featured Case ORDER of February 21, 2012.Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 2/21/2012: Mailed notice (am)
February 21, 2012 590 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF FEBRUARY 21, 2012: Markman hearing will be held on March 12, 2012 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (am)
February 21, 2012 589 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Christopher Keith Eppich (Eppich, Christopher)
February 17, 2012 588 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Dimuzio Elena (Elena, Dimuzio)
February 17, 2012 587 OBJECTION by Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Plaintiffs' Objections to the Appointment of Neutral Damages Expert Gregory Sidak (Attachments: # 1 Sidak Article 1, # 2 Sidak Article 2, # 3 Sidak Article 3, # 4 Sidak Article 4)(Fram, Robert)
February 13, 2012 586 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: Attorney Phillip D. Price's application to appear pro hac vice 575 is granted. Attorney Christopher K. Eppich's application to appear pro hac vice 577 is granted. Attorney Elena M. DiMuzio's application to appear pro hac vice 579 is granted. Mailed notice (am)
February 13, 2012 585 MEMORANDUM order 551 by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MOTOROLA'S BRIEF ADDRESSING THE PROPER STANDARD FOR THE DETERMINATION OF DAMAGES FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT (Swedlow, Stephen)
February 13, 2012 584 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Brief Setting Forth the Proper Standard For the Determination of Damages for Patent Infringement (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher Eppich in Support, # 2 Ex. 1, # 3 Ex. 2, # 4 Ex. 3, # 5 Ex. 4)(Haslam, Robert)
February 13, 2012 583 Notice of Withdrawal of Mobility's Motion to Compel by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Williamson, Amanda)
February 13, 2012 582 RESPONSE by Apple, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to compel MOTOROLA MOBILITY, INC.S MEMORANDUM AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS TO DESIGNATE AND PROVIDE WITNESSES ON DEFENDANTS' 30(B)(6) TOPICSMOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to compel MOTOROLA MOBILITY, INC.S MEMORANDUM AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS TO DESIGNATE AND PROVIDE WITNESSES ON DEFENDANTS' 30(B)(6) TOPICS 580 (Ferguson, Brian)
February 12, 2012 581 SUPPLEMENT to motion to compel, 580 (Williamson, Amanda)
February 10, 2012 580 MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to compel MOTOROLA MOBILITY, INC.S MEMORANDUM AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS TO DESIGNATE AND PROVIDE WITNESSES ON DEFENDANTS' 30(B)(6) TOPICS (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6)(Williamson, Amanda)
February 9, 2012 579 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6823496. (Elena, Dimuzio)
February 8, 2012 578 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. by Michael Louis Brody (Brody, Michael)
February 8, 2012 577 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6820099. (Eppich, Christopher)
February 7, 2012 576 Submission of Apple Inc. Narrowing Its Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims for Trial by Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. (Haslam, Robert)
February 7, 2012 575 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6813275. (Price, Phillip)
February 6, 2012 574 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner:Attorney Graham M. Pechenik's application to appear pro hac vice 559 is granted. Attorney Mitchell S. Feller's application to appear pro hac vice 560 is granted. Attorney Alexander Rudis' application to appear pro hac vice 564 is granted. Attorney peter J. Chassman's application to appear pro hac vice 569 is granted. Mailed notice (am)
February 6, 2012 573 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apple's Brief Setting Forth the Proper Remedies in Light of Motorola's FRAND Violations and Untimely Disclosure of Essential Patents (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Samuel Ernst in Support, # 2 Ernst Exhibits 1-5)(Haslam, Robert)
February 6, 2012 572 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Apple's Brief Regarding ETSI Policy and Third Party Testimony (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew Hawkinson in Support, # 2 Hawkinson Exhibits 1-11)(Haslam, Robert)
February 6, 2012 571 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. SEALED EXHIBIT 4 TO APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S BRIEF ADDRESSING EQUITABLE REMEDIES RELATING TO APPLE'S "FRAND" DEFENSE regarding memorandum, 570 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4)(Cannon, Brian)
February 6, 2012 570 MEMORANDUM order 551 by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MOTOROLA'S BRIEF ADDRESSING EQUITABLE REMEDIES RELATING TO APPLE'S "FRAND" DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Appendix APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S BRIEF ADDRESSING EQUITABLE REMEDIES RELATING TO APPLE'S "FRAND" DEFENSE, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, Filed Under Seal, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6)(Cannon, Brian)
February 3, 2012 569 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6804772. for Motorola, Inc. and Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Chassman, Peter)
February 3, 2012 568 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. by James F. Hurst (Hurst, James)
February 3, 2012 567 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. by Jonathan E. Retsky (Retsky, Jonathan)
February 2, 2012 564 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6797805. (Rudis, Alexander)
February 1, 2012 566 Featured Case ORDER Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 2/1/2012.(nf, )
February 1, 2012 565 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER: Motorola's unopposed motion for a supplemental protective order 561 is granted in its entirety.. Mailed notice (For further detail see separate order) (nf, )
February 1, 2012 561 MOTION by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. for protective order Defendants' and Non-Party Intel Corp.'s Agreed [PROPOSED] Supplemental Protective Order (Swedlow, Stephen)
January 31, 2012 563 Order Of January 31, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 1/31/2012: Mailed notice (am)
January 31, 2012 562 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF JANUARY 31, 2012: Proposed neutral experts to be identified by 2/7/2012. Expert reports to be submitted by 3/1/2012; rebuttal to expert reports due by 4/15/2012. Order fact discovery close 4/15/2012. Order expert discovery close 4/23/2012. Daubert motions due by 4/30/2012; replies due by 5/7/2012. Daubert hearing for damages experts set for May 15, 2012. Mailed notice (am)
January 31, 2012 560 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6792190. (Feller, Mitchell)
January 27, 2012 559 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6779181. (Pechenik, Graham)
January 26, 2012 558 CORRECTION. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 1/26/2012: Mailed notice (am)
January 26, 2012 557 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER CORRECTION. Mailed notice (am)
January 25, 2012 556 Featured Case ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 1/25/2012: Mailed notice (am)
January 25, 2012 555 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER: Motorola's motion for summary judgment of non-infringement of U.S. Patent Numbers RE39,486 and 5,929,852 399 is granted. Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment 369 is dismissed as moot. Mailed notice (am)
January 24, 2012 554 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Matthew James Hawkinson (Hawkinson, Matthew)
January 24, 2012 553 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Danielle Luce Goldstein (Goldstein, Danielle)
January 24, 2012 552 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Richard A. Lopez (Lopez, Richard)
January 24, 2012 551 Order Of January 24, 2012. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 1/24/2012: Mailed notice (am)
January 24, 2012 550 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER OF JANUARY 24, 2012. Mailed notice (am)
January 23, 2012 549 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: Attorney Charles K. Verhoeven's application to appear pro hac vice 343 is granted. Attorney Matthew D. Robson's application to appear pro hac vice 344 is granted. Attorney Meghan Bordonaro's application to appear pro hac vice 355 is granted. Attorney Danielle L. Goldstein's application to appear pro hac vice 519 is granted. Attorney R. Anthony Lopez' application to appear pro hac vice 520 is granted. Attorney Matthew J. Hawkinson's application to appear pro hac vice 536 is granted. Mailed notice (am)
January 23, 2012 548 Addendum To Agenda For January 12, 2012 Hearing. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 1/23/2012: Mailed notice (am)
January 23, 2012 547 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ADDENDUM TO AGENDA FOR JANUARY 23, 2012 HEARING signed by Judge Richard A. Posner on January 22, 2012. Mailed notice (am)
January 23, 2012 546 Agenda for January 23, 2012 Hearing. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 1/23/2012: Mailed notice (am)
January 23, 2012 545 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER AGENDA FOR JANUARY 23, 2012 HEARING signed by Judge Richard A. Posner on January 21, 2012. Mailed notice (am)
January 23, 2012 544 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Sealed Exhibits to Appendix to Motorola's Claim Construction Brief Concerning the Term Realtime Application Program Interface (API) for U.S. Patent No. 6,343,263 regarding appendix, 543 , sealed document 542 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3)(Erwine, Richard)
January 23, 2012 543 APPENDIX sealed document 542 Appendix to Motorola's Claim Construction Brief Concerning the Term Realtime Application Program Interface (API) for U.S. Patent No. 6,343,263 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Part One, # 2 Exhibit 1, Part Two, # 3 Exhibit 2, Filed Under Seal, # 4 Exhibit 3, Filed Under Seal, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Erwine, Richard)
January 23, 2012 542 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Claim Construction Brief Concerning the Term Realtime Application Program Interface (API) for U.S. Patent No. 6,343,263 (Erwine, Richard)
January 23, 2012 541 DECLARATION of Dr. Nathaniel Polish regarding other 539 (Ferguson, Brian)
January 23, 2012 540 DECLARATION of Brian E. Ferguson regarding other 539 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Ferguson, Brian)
January 23, 2012 539 Claim Construction Brief by Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Apple's Claim Construction Brief Regarding the Term "Realtime Application Program Interface" In Claim 1 of Apple's U.S. Patent No. 6,343,263 (Ferguson, Brian)
January 23, 2012 538 RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. for order to Preclude Supplemental Expert Testimony on Issues of Liability 533 MOTOROLA'S OPPOSITION TO APPLE INC. AND NEXT SOFTWARE, INC.'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT TESTIMONY ON ISSUES OF LIABILITY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Swedlow, Stephen)
January 23, 2012 537 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. to petition 531 Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Petition to Prevent Disclosure of Confidential Information to Michael Walker (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew Hawkinson in Support, # 2 Hawkinson Exs. 1-23)(Haslam, Robert)
January 20, 2012 536 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6760008. (Hawkinson, Matthew)
January 20, 2012 535 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Counter Defendants Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Matthew James Hawkinson (Hawkinson, Matthew)
January 20, 2012 534 NOTICE of Motion by Robert T Haslam for presentment of motion for order 533 before Honorable Richard A. Posner on 1/24/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Haslam, Robert)
January 20, 2012 533 MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. for order to Preclude Supplemental Expert Testimony on Issues of Liability (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Winslow Taub in Support, # 2 Ex. A, # 3 Ex. B)(Haslam, Robert)
January 20, 2012 532 MOTOROLA'S PETITION TO PREVENT DISCLOSURE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION TO MICHAEL WALKER NOTICE of Motion by Brian Cannon for presentment of (Cannon, Brian)
January 20, 2012 531 PETITION MOTOROLA'S PETITION TO PREVENT DISCLOSURE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION TO MICHAEL WALKER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Benn Declaration)(Cannon, Brian)
January 19, 2012 530 ENTER ORDER Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 1/19/2012. Mailed notice.(srb,)
January 17, 2012 529 ENTER ORDER Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 1/17/2012 regarding order 528 . Mailed notice. (srb,)
January 17, 2012 528 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: I've received an inquiry from one of the lawyers concerning the status of the summary judgment motions that were not argued orally last week and resolved in the orders I issued yesterday. I am prepared to hear oral argument on those motions on Monday, 1/23/2012 at 2:00 P.M. (For further details see order). Mailed notice. (srb,)
January 17, 2012 527 ENTER ORDER Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 1/17/2012. Motorola's motion to file a reply brief in support of its motion for summary judgment regarding the '131 patent is denied. Mailed notice.(srb,)
January 17, 2012 526 ENTER ORDER regarding order 525 Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 1/16/2012. Mailed notice.(srb,)
January 17, 2012 525 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: Before the court are motions for summary judgment regarding nine patents. Apple's summary judgment motion regarding U.S. Patent No. 5,319,712 360 is granted; Apple's motion for summary judgment regarding U.S. Patent No. 5,572,193 357 is granted; Motorola's motion for summary judgment regarding U.S. Patent No. 7,479,949 435 is denied; Motorola's motion for summary judgment regarding U.S. Patent No. 5,455,599 414 is granted and Apple's motion for summary judgment regarding the same patent 370 is denied; Apple's motion for summary judgment regarding U.S. Patent No. 5,311,516 358 is denied; Apple's motion for summary judgment regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,359,898 361 is denied; Motorola's motion for summary judgment regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,343,263 390 is dismissed as premature; Motorola's motion for summary judgment on U.S. Patent No. 5,566,337 395 is denied; Apple's motion for summary judgment regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,175,559 359 is denied in part and deferred in part; (For further detail see order). Mailed notice. (srb,)
January 17, 2012 524 ENTER ORDER regarding motion hearing, 522 Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 1/15/2012. Mailed notice.(srb,)
January 17, 2012 523 ENTER ORDER regarding motion hearing 522 Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 1/15/2012. Mailed notice.(srb,)
January 17, 2012 522 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: On January 11, 2012, the court heard argument on motions for summary judgment on claims involving eight patents, and on related motions. Rulings on these motions will be issued on January 16, 2012. (For further detail see order). Mailed notice. (srb,)
January 15, 2012 521 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. to sealed document, 518 Apple's Response to Motorola's Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,915,131 (Ferguson, Brian)
January 13, 2012 520 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6740149. (Lopez, Richard)
January 13, 2012 519 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6740145. (Goldstein, Danielle)
January 11, 2012 518 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorolas Motion For Leave To File Reply In Support of Motorolas Motion For Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Number 5,915,131 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Erwine, Richard)
January 11, 2012 517 Notice of Presentment Motion For Leave To File Reply In Support of Motorolas Motion For Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Number 5,915,131 NOTICE of Motion by Richard W Erwine for presentment of (Erwine, Richard)
January 11, 2012 516 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. SEALED EXHIBIT 5 TO APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA MOBILITYS RESPONSE TO MOTION BY APPLE AND NEXT SOFTWARE, INC TO STRIKE MOTOROLA MOBILITYS SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY RESPONSES regarding response in opposition to motion, 514 , SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Motion to Strike Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Supplemental Discovery Responses 511 , appendix, 515 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5)(Erwine, Richard)
January 11, 2012 515 APPENDIX response in opposition to motion, 514 , Sealed motion, 511 APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA MOBILITYS RESPONSE TO MOTION BY APPLE AND NEXT SOFTWARE, INC TO STRIKE MOTOROLA MOBILITYS SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY RESPONSES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, Filed Under Seal)(Erwine, Richard)
January 11, 2012 514 RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.in Opposition to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Motion to Strike Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Supplemental Discovery Responses 511 MOTOROLA MOBILITYS RESPONSE TO MOTION BY APPLE AND NEXT SOFTWARE, INC TO STRIKE MOTOROLA MOBILITYS SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY RESPONSES (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 513 Plaintiff and Counterclaim-Defendants Apple Inc. and NeXT Software, Inc.s Glossaries of Terms Relevant to Apple and Motorola Patents and Summary Judgment Motions and Oppositions by Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Glossary of Terms re '193 Patent, # 2 Glossary of Terms re '516 Patent, # 3 Glossary of Terms re '559 Patent, # 4 Glossary of Terms re '712 Patent, # 5 Glossary of Terms re '898 Patent, # 6 Glossary of Terms re FRAND Issues, # 7 Glossary of Terms re '002 Patent, # 8 Glossary of Terms re '131 Patent, # 9 Glossary of Terms re '263 Patent, # 10 Glossary of Terms re '337 Patent (Opening MSJ), # 11 Glossary of Terms re '337 (Opposition MSJ), # 12 Glossary of Terms re '486 and '852 Patents, # 13 Glossary of Terms re '599 Patent (Opening MSJ), # 14 Glossary of Terms re '599 Patent (Opposition MSJ), # 15 Glossary of Terms re '721 Patent (Opening MSJ), # 16 Glossary of Terms re '721 (Oppositino MSJ), # 17 Glossary of Terms re '867 Patent (Opening MSJ), # 18 Glossary of Terms re '867 Patent (Opposition MSJ), # 19 Glossary of Terms re '949 Patent (Opening MSJ), # 20 Glossary of Terms re '949 Patent (Opposition MSJ), # 21 Glossary of Terms re '983 Patent (Opening MSJ), # 22 Glossary of Terms re '983 Patent (Opposition MSJ))(Haslam, Robert)
January 9, 2012 512 Notice of Apple's Motion to Strike NOTICE of Motion by Robert T Haslam for presentment of Sealed motion, 511 before Honorable Richard A. Posner on 1/11/2012 at 02:00 PM. (Haslam, Robert)
January 9, 2012 511 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Motion to Strike Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Supplemental Discovery Responses (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike, # 2 Declaration of Chris Heegard in Support, # 3 Heegard Exs. A-F, # 4 Declaration of Robert Williams in Support, # 5 Williams Exs. 1-7)(Haslam, Robert)
January 9, 2012 510 SEALED RESPONSE Memorandum in Opposition to Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,481,721 (Attachments: # 1 Apple's Responses to Motorolas Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Apples Supplemental Findings of Fact, # 3 Declaration of Goodin in Support, # 4 Goodin Ex. A, # 5 Goodin Ex. B, # 6 Goodin Ex. C, # 7 Declaration of Brian Ferguson in Support, # 8 Ferguson Ex. 73, # 9 Ferguson Ex. 74 part 1, # 10 Ferguson Ex. 74 part 2, # 11 Ferguson Ex. 75, # 12 Ferguson Ex. 76 part 1, # 13 Ferguson Ex. 76 part 1, # 14 Ferguson Ex. 77, # 15 Ferguson Ex. 78, # 16 Ferguson Ex. 79 part 1, # 17 Ferguson Ex. 79 part 2, # 18 Ferguson Ex. 80 part 1, # 19 Ferguson Ex. 80 part 2, # 20 Ferguson Ex. 80 part 3, # 21 Ferguson Ex. 80 part 4, # 22 Ferguson Ex. 81, # 23 Ferguson Exs. 82-86)(Haslam, Robert)
January 9, 2012 509 SUPPLEMENT to sealed response, 474 , sealed document 426 , sealed document 396 , sealed document 452 , sealed document, 441 , sealed response, 444 , sealed document 421 , sealed response, 484 , sealed document 386 , sealed response, 447 , sealed response, 440 , sealed document, 436 , Response, 505 , sealed response, 459 , sealed document 381 , sealed document 391 , sealed response, 477 , sealed response, 496 , sealed document 376 , sealed document 431 , sealed document 400 , sealed document, 405 , sealed document, 410 , sealed document 415 , sealed response, 467 , sealed response, 463 GLOSSARY OF TERMS CITED IN MOTOROLA'S SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFS (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 508 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Appendix to Motorolas Memorandum In Opposition to Plaintiff and Counterclaim-Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,572,193 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, Part One, # 11 Exhibit 10, Part Two, # 12 Exhibit 10, Part Three, # 13 Exhibit 10, Part Four, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit 14, # 18 Exhibit 15, # 19 Exhibit 16, # 20 Exhibit 17, # 21 Exhibit 18, # 22 Exhibit 19, Part One, # 23 Exhibit 19, Part Two, # 24 Exhibit 19, Part Three, # 25 Exhibit 19, Part Four, # 26 Exhibit 19, Part Five, # 27 Exhibit 19, Part Six, # 28 Exhibit 19, Part Seven, # 29 Exhibit 19, Part Eight, # 30 Exhibit 19, Part Nine, # 31 Exhibit 19, Part Ten, # 32 Exhibit 19, Part Eleven, # 33 Exhibit 19, Part Twelve, # 34 Exhibit 19, Part Thirteen, # 35 Exhibit 19, Part Fourteen, # 36 Exhibit 19, Part Fifteen)(Williamson, Amanda)
January 9, 2012 507 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. SEALED EXHIBITS TO APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON APPLES ESTOPPEL/UNCLEAN HANDS DEFENSE regarding MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON APPLES ESTOPPEL/UNCLEAN HANDS DEFENSE 498 , sealed document 501 , appendix,,,,,,,, 504 , sealed document 499 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5, # 2 Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit 7, # 4 Exhibit 8, # 5 Exhibit 9, # 6 Exhibit 10, Part One, # 7 Exhibit 10, Part Two, # 8 Exhibit 11, # 9 Exhibit 12, # 10 Exhibit 13, # 11 Exhibit 14, # 12 Exhibit 15, # 13 Exhibit 16, # 14 Exhibit 17, # 15 Exhibit 18, # 16 Exhibit 19, # 17 Exhibit 20, Part One, # 18 Exhibit 20, Part Two, # 19 Exhibit 20, Part Three, # 20 Exhibit 20, Part Four, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, Part One, # 28 Exhibit 27, Part Two, # 29 Exhibit 27, Part Three, # 30 Exhibit 27, Part Four, # 31 Exhibit 27, Part Five, # 32 Exhibit 27, Part Six, # 33 Exhibit 28, # 34 Exhibit 29, # 35 Exhibit 30, # 36 Exhibit 31, # 37 Exhibit 32, # 38 Exhibit 33, Part One, # 39 Exhibit 33, Part Two, # 40 Exhibit 34, Part One, # 41 Exhibit 34, Part Two, # 42 Exhibit 35, Part One, # 43 Exhibit 35, Part Two, # 44 Exhibit 36, Part One, # 45 Exhibit 36, Part Two, # 46 Exhibit 37, Part One, # 47 Exhibit 37, Part Two, # 48 Exhibit 38, Part One, # 49 Exhibit 38, Part Two, # 50 Exhibit 39, # 51 Exhibit 40, Part One, # 52 Exhibit 40, Part Two, # 53 Exhibit 41, Part One, # 54 Exhibit 41, Part Two, # 55 Exhibit 42, # 56 Exhibit 43, # 57 Exhibit 44, # 58 Exhibit 45, # 59 Exhibit 46, # 60 Exhibit 47, # 61 Exhibit 48, # 62 Exhibit 49, # 63 Exhibit 50, # 64 Exhibit 56, # 65 Exhibit 57)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 506 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motorola's Statement of Additional Proposed Findings of Fact And Responses To Plaintiff And Counterclaim-Defendant Apple Inc.s Proposed Findings of Fact Regarding the '193 Patent (Williamson, Amanda)
January 9, 2012 505 RESPONSE by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to Sealed motion,,, 357 Memorandum in Opposition To Plaintiff and Counterclaim-Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement U.S. Patent No. 5,572,193 (Williamson, Amanda)
January 9, 2012 504 APPENDIX motion for summary judgment 498 , sealed document 501 , sealed document 499 APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON APPLES ESTOPPEL/UNCLEAN HANDS DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, Part One, # 3 Exhibit 2, Part Two, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, Filed Under Seal, # 7 Exhibit 6, Filed Under Seal, # 8 Exhibit 7, Filed Under Seal, # 9 Exhibit 8, Filed Under Seal, # 10 Exhibit 9, Filed Under Seal, # 11 Exhibit 10, Filed Under Seal, # 12 Exhibit 11, Filed Under Seal, # 13 Exhibit 12, Filed Under Seal, # 14 Exhibit 13, Filed Under Seal, # 15 Exhibit 14, Filed Under Seal, # 16 Exhibit 15, Filed Under Seal, # 17 Exhibit 16, Filed Under Seal, # 18 Exhibit 17, Filed Under Seal, # 19 Exhibit 18, Filed Under Seal, # 20 Exhibit 19, Filed Under Seal, # 21 Exhibit 20, Filed Under Seal, # 22 Exhibit 21, Filed Under Seal, # 23 Exhibit 22, Filed Under Seal, # 24 Exhibit 23, Filed Under Seal, # 25 Exhibit 24, Filed Under Seal, # 26 Exhibit 25, Filed Under Seal, # 27 Exhibit 26, Filed Under Seal, # 28 Exhibit 27, Filed Under Seal, # 29 Exhibit 28, Filed Under Seal, # 30 Exhibit 29, Filed Under Seal, # 31 Exhibit 30, Filed Under Seal, # 32 Exhibit 31, Filed Under Seal, # 33 Exhibit 32, Filed Under Seal, # 34 Exhibit 33, Filed Under Seal, # 35 Exhibit 34, Filed Under Seal, # 36 Exhibit 35, Filed Under Seal, # 37 Exhibit 36, Filed Under Seal, # 38 Exhibit 37, Filed Under Seal, # 39 Exhibit 38, Filed Under Seal, # 40 Exhibit 39, Filed Under Seal, # 41 Exhibit 40, Filed Under Seal, # 42 Exhibit 41, Filed Under Seal, # 43 Exhibit 42, Filed Under Seal, # 44 Exhibit 43, Filed Under Seal, # 45 Exhibit 44, Filed Under Seal, # 46 Exhibit 45, Filed Under Seal, # 47 Exhibit 46, Filed Under Seal, # 48 Exhibit 47, Filed Under Seal, # 49 Exhibit 48, Filed Under Seal, # 50 Exhibit 49, Filed Under Seal, # 51 Exhibit 50, Filed Under Seal, # 52 Exhibit 51, # 53 Exhibit 52, # 54 Exhibit 53, # 55 Exhibit 54, # 56 Exhibit 55, # 57 Exhibit 56, Filed Under Seal, # 58 Exhibit 57, Filed Under Seal)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 503 SEALED RESPONSE Memorandum in Opposition to Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,275,983 (Attachments: # 1 Apple's Responses to Motorolas Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Apples Supplemental Findings of Fact, # 3 Declaration of Aldrich in Support, # 4 Alrich Ex. A, # 5 Declaration of Brian Ferguson in Support, # 6 Ferguson Ex. 70, # 7 Ferguson Ex. 71)(Haslam, Robert)
January 9, 2012 502 SEALED RESPONSE Memorandum in Opposition to Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity, or in the Alternative, Non-infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,479,949 (Attachments: # 1 Apple's Responses to Motorolas Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Declaration of Feiner in Support, # 3 Feiner Ex. A, # 4 Feiner Ex. B, # 5 Declaration of Brian Ferguson in Support, # 6 Ferguson Exs. 120-128)(Haslam, Robert)
January 9, 2012 501 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT REGARDING MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON APPLES ESTOPPEL/UNCLEAN HANDS DEFENSE (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 500 SEALED RESPONSE Memorandum in Opposition to Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment of (Attachments: # 1 Apple's Responses to Motorolas Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Apples Supplemental Findings of Fact, # 3 Declaration of Aldrich in Support, # 4 Aldrich Ex. A, # 5 Declaration of Brian Ferguson in Support, # 6 Ferguson Exs. 67-69)(Haslam, Robert)
January 9, 2012 499 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON APPLES ESTOPPEL/UNCLEAN HANDS DEFENSE (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 498 MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON APPLES ESTOPPEL/UNCLEAN HANDS DEFENSE (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 497 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. RESPONSES AND ADDITIONAL PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT REGARDING MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NOS. RE39,486 AND 5,929,852 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 496 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of U.S. Patent Nos. RE 39,486 and 5,929,852 369 MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NOS. RE39,486 AND 5,929,852 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 495 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. for summary judgment that Motorola May Not Use Apple's Sales To Establish Damages for Direct Infringement of Method Claims by Apple 356 MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLE'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT MOTOROLA MAY NOT USE APPLES SALES TO ESTABLISH DAMAGES FOR DIRECT INFRINGEMENT OF METHOD CLAIMS BY APPLE (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 494 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. RESPONSES AND ADDITIONAL PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT REGARDING MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF 6,275,983 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 493 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Rule 56(d) Affidavit (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25)(Williamson, Amanda)
January 9, 2012 492 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgmetn of U.S. Patent No. 6,275,983 374 MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF 6,275,983 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 491 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. SEALED EXHIBITS TO APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF 7,479,949 regarding SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of U.S. Patent No. 7,479,949 373 , appendix, 490 , sealed response, 488 , sealed document, 489 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 4, # 3 Exhibit 5, # 4 Exhibit 6, # 5 Exhibit 7)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 490 APPENDIX Sealed motion, 373 , sealed response, 488 , sealed document, 489 APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF 7,479,949 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Filed Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, Filed Under Seal, # 5 Exhibit 5, Filed Under Seal, # 6 Exhibit 6, Filed Under Seal, # 7 Exhibit 7, Filed Under Seal, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 489 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. RESPONSES AND ADDITIONAL PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT REGARDING MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF 7,479,949 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 488 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of U.S. Patent No. 7,479,949 373 MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF 7,479,749 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 487 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. SEALED EXHIBITS TO APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF 6,359,898 regarding SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,359,898 361 , sealed response, 484 , sealed document, 485 , sealed document, 486 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 486 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF 6,359,898 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Filed Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit 2, Filed Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit 3, Filed Under Seal, # 4 Exhibit 4, Filed Under Seal, # 5 Exhibit 5, Filed Under Seal)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 485 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. RESPONSES AND ADDITIONAL PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT REGARDING MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF 6,359,898 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 484 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,359,898 361 MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF 6,359,898 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 483 SEALED RESPONSE Memorandum in Opposition to Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,455,599 (Attachments: # 1 Apple's Responses to Motorolas Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Declaration of Egbert in Support, # 3 Egbert Ex. A)(Haslam, Robert)
January 9, 2012 482 SEALED RESPONSE Memorandum in Opposition to Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. RE 39,486 and 5,929,852 (Attachments: # 1 Apple's Responses to Motorolas Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Apples Supplemental Findings of Fact, # 3 Declaration of Goodin in Support, # 4 Goodin Ex. A, # 5 Goodin Ex. B, # 6 Declaration of Brian Ferguson in Support, # 7 Ferguson Exs. 110-113)(Haslam, Robert)
January 9, 2012 481 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. SEALED EXHIBITS TO APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,519,867 regarding sealed document, 479 , sealed response, 477 , SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of U.S. Patent No. 5,519,867 372 , appendix, 480 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 480 APPENDIX sealed document, 479 , sealed response, 477 , Sealed motion, 372 APPENDX TO MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,519,867 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Filed Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit 2, Filed Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit 3, Filed Under Seal, # 4 Exhibit 4, Filed Under Seal)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 479 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. RESPONSES AND ADDITIONAL PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT REGARDING MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,519,867 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 478 SEALED RESPONSE Memorandum in Opposition to Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,493,002 (Attachments: # 1 Apple's Responses to Motorolas Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Apples Supplemental Findings of Fact, # 3 Declaration of Snoeren in Support, # 4 Snoeren Ex. A, # 5 Declaration of Brian Ferguson in Support, # 6 Ferguson Exs. 93-106, # 7 Ferguson Ex. 107 part 1a, # 8 Ferguson Ex. 107 part 1b, # 9 Ferguson Ex. 107 part 2, # 10 Ferguson Ex. 107 part 3, # 11 Ferguson Ex. 107 part 4a, # 12 Ferguson Ex. 107 part 4b, # 13 Ferguson Ex. 107 part 5, # 14 Ferguson Exs. 108-109)(Haslam, Robert)
January 9, 2012 477 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of U.S. Patent No. 5,519,867 372 MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,519,867 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 476 APPENDIX sealed response, 474 , sealed document, 475 , Sealed motion, 371 APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,481,721 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 475 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. RESPONSES AND ADDITIONAL PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT REGARDING MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,481,721 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 474 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Memoradum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of U.S. Patent No. 5,481,721 371 MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,481,721 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 473 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. SEALED EXHIBITS TO APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S OPPOSITION TO APPLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,319,712 regarding sealed document, 468 , sealed response, 467 , SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,319,712 360 , appendix,,,, 470 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, Part One, # 11 Exhibit 10, Part Two, # 12 Exhibit 10, Part Three, # 13 Exhibit 10, Part Four, # 14 Exhibit 10, Part Five, # 15 Exhibit 10, Part Six, # 16 Exhibit 10, Part Seven, # 17 Exhibit 10, Part Eight, # 18 Exhibit 10, Part Nine, # 19 Exhibit 10, Part Ten, # 20 Exhibit 10, Part Eleven, # 21 Exhibit 10, Part Twelve, # 22 Exhibit 10, Part Thirteen, # 23 Exhibit 10, Part Fourteen, # 24 Exhibit 10, Part Fifteen, # 25 Exhibit 10, Part Sixteen, # 26 Exhibit 11, # 27 Exhibit 12, # 28 Exhibit 13, # 29 Exhibit 14, # 30 Exhibit 15, # 31 Exhibit 16, # 32 Exhibit 17, Part One, # 33 Exhibit 17, Part Two, # 34 Exhibit 17, Part Three, # 35 Exhibit 17, Part Four, # 36 Exhibit 17, Part Five, # 37 Exhibit 17, Part Six, # 38 Exhibit 17, Part Seven, # 39 Exhibit 18, # 40 Exhibit 19, Part One, # 41 Exhibit 19. Part Two, # 42 Exhibit 19, Part Three, # 43 Exhibit 20, # 44 Exhibit 21, # 45 Exhibit 22)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 472 SEALED RESPONSE Memorandum in Opposition to Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,566,337 (Attachments: # 1 Apple's Responses to Motorolas Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Apples Supplemental Findings of Fact, # 3 Declaration of Brian Ferguson in Support, # 4 Ferguson Ex. 72, # 5 Aldrich Declaration in Support, # 6 Aldrich Ex. A)(Haslam, Robert)
January 9, 2012 471 SEALED RESPONSE Memorandum in Opposition to Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,343,263 (Attachments: # 1 Apple's Responses to Motorolas Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Apples Supplemental Findings of Fact, # 3 Declaration of Polish in Support, # 4 Polish Ex. A, # 5 Polish Ex. B, # 6 Declaration of Brian Ferguson in Support, # 7 Ferguson Exs. 114-116, # 8 Ferguson Ex. 117 part 1, # 9 Ferguson Ex. 117 part 2, # 10 Ferguson Ex. 117 part 3, # 11 Ferguson Ex. 117 part 4, # 12 Ferguson Ex. 118, # 13 Ferguson Ex. 119)(Haslam, Robert)
January 9, 2012 470 APPENDIX sealed document, 468 , sealed response, 467 , Sealed motion,, 360 APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S OPPOSITION TO APPLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,319,712 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Filed Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit 2, Filed Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit 3, Filed Under Seal, # 4 Exhibit 4, Filed Under Seal, # 5 Exhibit 5, Filed Under Seal, # 6 Exhibit 6, Filed Under Seal, # 7 Exhibit 7, Filed Under Seal, # 8 Exhibit 8, Filed Under Seal, # 9 Exhibit 9, Filed Under Seal, # 10 Exhibit 10, Filed Under Seal, # 11 Exhibit 11, Filed Under Seal, # 12 Exhibit 12, Filed Under Seal, # 13 Exhibit 13, Filed Under Seal, # 14 Exhibit 14, Filed Under Seal, # 15 Exhibit 15, Filed Under Seal, # 16 Exhibit 16, Filed Under Seal, # 17 Exhibit 17, Filed Under Seal, # 18 Exhibit 18, Filed Under Seal, # 19 Exhibit 19, Filed Under Seal, # 20 Exhibit 20, Filed Under Seal, # 21 Exhibit 21, Filed Under Seal, # 22 Exhibit 22, Filed Under Seal)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 469 SEALED RESPONSE Memorandum in Opposition to Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5, 915,131 (Attachments: # 1 Apple's Responses to Motorolas Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Apples Supplemental Findings of Fact, # 3 Declaration of Richard Goodin in Support, # 4 Goodin Ex. A, # 5 Goodin Ex. B, # 6 Declaration of Brian Ferguson in Support, # 7 Ferguson Ex. 87, # 8 Ferguson Ex. 88, # 9 Ferguson Ex. 89, # 10 Ferguson Ex. 90, # 11 Ferguson Ex. 91, # 12 Ferguson Ex. 92)(Haslam, Robert)
January 9, 2012 468 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. RESPONSES AND ADDITIONAL PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT REGARDING MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,319,712 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 467 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,319,712 360 MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,319,712 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 466 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. SEALED EXHIBITS TO APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,455,599 regarding SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Memoradum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of U.S. Patent No. 5,455,599 370 , sealed document, 464 , appendix, 465 , sealed response, 463 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 465 APPENDIX Sealed motion, 370 , sealed document, 464 , sealed response, 463 APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,455,599 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Filed Under Seal)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 464 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. RESPONSES AND ADDITIONAL PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT REGARDING MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,455,599 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 463 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Memoradum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of U.S. Patent No. 5,455,599 370 MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,455,599 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 462 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. SEALED EXHIBITS TO APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,175,559 regarding sealed response, 459 , appendix,, 461 , sealed document, 460 , SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 6,175,559 359 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibit 6, # 6 Exhibit 15, # 7 Exhibit 16, # 8 Exhibit 17, Part One, # 9 Exhibit 17, Part Two, # 10 Exhibit 17, Part Three, # 11 Exhibit 17, Part Four, # 12 Exhibit 17, Part Five, # 13 Exhibit 17, Part Six, # 14 Exhibit 17, Part Seven, # 15 Exhibit 18)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 461 APPENDIX sealed response, 459 , sealed document, 460 , Sealed motion,,, 359 APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,175,559 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, Filed Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit 3, Filed Under Seal, # 4 Exhibit 4, Filed Under Seal, # 5 Exhibit 5, Filed Under Seal, # 6 Exhibit 6, Filed Under Seal, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, Filed Under Seal, # 17 Exhibit 17, Filed Under Seal, # 18 Exhibit 18, Filed Under Seal)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 460 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. RESPONSE AND ADDITIONAL PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT REGARDING MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,175,559 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 459 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 6,175,559 359 MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,175,559 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 458 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. SEALED EXHIBITS TO APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA MOBILITY, INC. AND MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) regarding appendix,,,, 457 , sealed document 456 , MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTOROLA MOBILITY, INC. AND MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) 455 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, Part One, # 8 Exhibit 7, Part Two, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 21, # 17 Exhibit 22, # 18 Exhibit 23, # 19 Exhibit 24)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 457 APPENDIX sealed document 456 , motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction 455 APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA MOBILITY, INC. AND MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Filed Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit 2, Filed Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit 3, Filed Under Seal, # 4 Exhibit 4, Filed Under Seal, # 5 Exhibit 5, Filed Under Seal, # 6 Exhibit 6, Filed Under Seal, # 7 Exhibit 7, Filed Under Seal, # 8 Exhibit 8, Filed Under Seal, # 9 Exhibit 9, Filed Under Seal, # 10 Exhibit 10, Filed Under Seal, # 11 Exhibit 11, Filed Under Seal, # 12 Exhibit 12, Filed Under Seal, # 13 Exhibit 13, File DUnder Seal, # 14 Exhibit 14, Filed Undre Seal, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, Filed Under Seal, # 22 Exhibit 22, Filed Under Seal, # 23 Exhibit 23, Filed Under Seal, # 24 Exhibit 24, Filed Under Seal)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 456 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTOROLA MOBILITY, INC. AND MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 455 MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTOROLA MOBILITY, INC. AND MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 454 APPENDIX motion for summary judgment 451 , sealed document 452 , sealed document 453 SEALED EXHIBITS TO APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 6,275,983 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, Part One, # 4 Exhibit 3, Part Two, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, Filed Under Seal, # 8 Exhibit 7, Filed Under Seal)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 453 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT REGARDING MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 6,275,983 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 452 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 6,275,983 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 451 MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 6,275,983 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 450 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. SEALED EXHIBITS TO APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,311,516 regarding SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment for Invalidity and Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,311,516 358 , appendix,,, 449 , sealed document, 448 , sealed response, 447 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibit 7, # 6 Exhibit 8, # 7 Exhibit 9, # 8 Exhibit 12, # 9 Exhibit 14, # 10 Exhibit 15, # 11 Exhibit 16, Part One, # 12 Exhibit 16, Part Two, # 13 Exhibit 16, Part Three, # 14 Exhibit 17, # 15 Errata 18, # 16 Exhibit 19, # 17 Exhibit 20)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 449 APPENDIX Sealed motion,,, 358 , sealed document, 448 , sealed response, 447 APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,311,516 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, Filed Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit 3, Filed Under Seal, # 4 Exhibit 4, Filed Under Seal, # 5 Exhibit 5, Filed Under Seal, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, Filed Under Seal, # 8 Exhibit 8, Filed Under Seal, # 9 Exhibit 9, Filed Under Seal, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, Filed Under Seal, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, Filed Under Seal, # 15 Exhibit 15, Filed Under Seal, # 16 Exhibit 16, Filed Under Seal, # 17 Exhibit 17, Filed Under Seal, # 18 Exhibit 18, Filed Under Seal, # 19 Exhibit 19, Filed Under Seal, # 20 Exhibit 20, Filed Under Seal)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 448 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. RESPONSES AND ADDITIONAL PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT REGARDING MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,311,516 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 447 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment for Invalidity and Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,311,516 358 MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,311,516 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 446 APPENDIX sealed response, 444 , Sealed motion, 368 , sealed document, 445 APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,424,354 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 445 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. RESPONSE AND ADDITIONAL PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT REGARDING MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,424,354 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 444 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment re U.S. Patent No. 6,424,354 368 MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,424,354 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 443 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. SEALED EXHIBITS TO APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,566,337 regarding appendix, 442 , sealed document, 441 , sealed response, 440 , SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of U.S. Patent No. 5,566,337 367 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 4, # 3 Exhibit 5)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 442 APPENDIX sealed document, 441 , sealed response, 440 , Sealed motion, 367 APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,566,337 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Filed Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, Filed Under Seal, # 5 Exhibit 5, Filed Under Seal)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 441 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. RESPONSES AND ADDITIONAL PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT REGARDING MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,566,337 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 440 SEALED RESPONSE by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of U.S. Patent No. 5,566,337 367 MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO APPLES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,566,337 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 439 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. SEALED EXHIBITS TO APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 7,479,949 regarding appendix,,, 438 , sealed document, 436 , MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 7,479,949 435 , sealed document, 437 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 5, # 3 Exhibit 6, # 4 Exhibit 7, # 5 Exhibit 8, # 6 Exhibit 9, # 7 Exhibit 10, # 8 Exhibit 11, # 9 Exhibit 12, # 10 Exhibit 13, # 11 Exhibit 16)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 438 APPENDIX sealed document, 436 , sealed document, 437 APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 7,479,949 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Part One, # 2 Exhibit 1, Part Two, # 3 Exhibit 1, Part Three, # 4 Exhibit 1, Part Four, # 5 Exhibit 1, Part Five, # 6 Exhibit 1, Part Six, # 7 Exhibit 2, Filed Under Seal, # 8 Exhibit 3, Part One, # 9 Exhibit 3, Part Two, # 10 Exhibit 4, # 11 Exhibit 5, Filed Under Seal, # 12 Exhibit 6, Filed Under Seal, # 13 Exhibit 7, Filed Under Seal, # 14 Exhibit 8, Filed Under Seal, # 15 Exhibit 9, Filed Under Seal, # 16 Exhibit 10, Filed Under Seal, # 17 Exhibit 11, Filed Under Seal, # 18 Exhibit 12, Filed Under Seal, # 19 Exhibit 13, Filed Under Seal, # 20 Exhibit 14, # 21 Exhibit 15, # 22 Exhibit 16, Filed Under Seal, # 23 17)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 437 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT REGARDING MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 7,479,949 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 436 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 7,479,949 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 435 MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 7,479,949 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 434 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. SEALED EXHIBITS TO APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,359,898 FOR INDEFINITENESS regarding sealed document 432 , MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,359,898 FOR INDEFINITENESS 430 , appendix, 433 , sealed document 431 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 433 APPENDIX sealed document 432 , motion for summary judgment 430 , sealed document 431 APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,359,898 FOR INDEFINITENESS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, Filed Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 432 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT REGARDING MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,359,898 FOR INDEFINITENESS (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 431 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,359,898 FOR INDEFINITENESS (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 430 MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,359,898 FOR INDEFINITENESS (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 429 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. SEALED EXHIBITS TO APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 5,519,867 regarding sealed document 426 , MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 5,519,867 425 , appendix, 428 , sealed document 427 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3, # 2 Exhibit 5)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 428 APPENDIX sealed document 426 , motion for summary judgment 425 , sealed document 427 APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 5,519,867 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, Filed Under Seal, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, Filed Under Seal)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 427 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT REGARDING MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 5,519,867 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 426 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 5,519,867 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 425 MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 5,519,867 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 424 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. SEALED EXHIBITS TO APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 5,481,721 regarding sealed document 422 , sealed document 421 , MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 5,481,721 420 , appendix, 423 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 423 APPENDIX sealed document 422 , sealed document 421 , motion for summary judgment 420 APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 5,481,721 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Part One, # 2 Exhibit 1, Part Two, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, Filed Under Seal, # 7 Exhibit 6)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 422 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT REGARDING MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 5,481,721 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 421 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 5,481,721 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 420 MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 5,481,721 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 419 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. SEALED EXHIBITS TO APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,455,599 regarding sealed document 416 , MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,455,599 414 , appendix, 417 , sealed document 415 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, Part One, # 3 Exhibit 2, Part Two)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 418 SEALED RESPONSE Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian E. Ferguson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I)(Ferguson, Brian)
January 9, 2012 417 APPENDIX sealed document 416 , motion for summary judgment 414 , sealed document 415 APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,455,599 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Filed Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit 2, Filed Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 416 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT REGARDING MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,455,599 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 415 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,455,599 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 414 MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,455,599 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 413 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. SEALED EXHIBITS TO APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,175,559 FOR INDEFINITENESS OR FAILURE TO CLAIM PATENTABLE SUBJECT MATTER regarding MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,175,559 FOR INDEFINITENESS OR FAILURE TO CLAIM PATENTABLE SUBJECT MATTER 409 , appendix, 412 , sealed document, 411 , sealed document, 410 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, Part One, # 3 Exhibit 2, Part Two)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 412 APPENDIX motion for summary judgment, 409 , sealed document, 411 , sealed document, 410 APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,175,559 FOR INDEFINITENESS OR FAILURE TO CLAIM PATENTABLE SUBJECT MATTER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Filed Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit 2, Filed Under Seal)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 411 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT REGARDING MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,175,559 FOR INDEFINITENESS OR FAILURE TO CLAIM PATENTABLE SUBJECT MATTER (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 410 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,175,559 FOR INDEFINITENESS OR FAILURE TO CLAIM PATENTABLE SUBJECT MATTER (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 409 MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,175,559 FOR INDEFINITENESS OR FAILURE TO CLAIM PATENTABLE SUBJECT MATTER (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 408 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. SEALED EXHIBITS TO APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,319,712 FOR LACK OF ADEQUATE WRITTEN DESCRIPTION regarding appendix, 407 , MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,319,712 FOR LACK OF ADEQUATE WRITTEN DESCRIPTION 404 , sealed document, 406 , sealed document, 405 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 407 APPENDIX motion for summary judgment 404 , sealed document, 406 , sealed document, 405 APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,319,712 FOR LACK OF ADEQUATE WRITTEN DESCRIPTION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Filed Under Seal)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 406 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT REGARDING MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,319,712 FOR LACK OF ADEQUATE WRITTEN DESCRIPTION (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 405 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,319,712 FOR LACK OF ADEQUATE WRITTEN DESCRIPTION (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 404 MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,319,712 FOR LACK OF ADEQUATE WRITTEN DESCRIPTION (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 403 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. SEALED EXHIBITS TO APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBERS RE39,486 AND 5,929,852 regarding sealed document 401 , MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBERS RE39,486 AND 5,929,852 399 , sealed document 400 , appendix, 402 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3, # 2 Exhibit 7, # 3 Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibit 9)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 402 APPENDIX sealed document 401 , motion for summary judgment 399 , sealed document 400 APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBERS RE39,486 AND 5,929,852 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, Filed Under Seal, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, Filed Under Seal, # 8 Exhibit 8, Filed Under Seal, # 9 Exhibit 9, Filed Under Seal)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 401 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT REGARDING MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBERS RE39,486 AND 5,929,852 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 400 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBERS RE39,486 AND 5,929,852 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 399 MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBERS RE39,486 AND 5,929,852 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 398 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. SEALED EXHIBITS TO APPDENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,566,337 regarding sealed document 397 , sealed document 396 , MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,566,337 395 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 397 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT REGARDING MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,566,337 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 396 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,566,337 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 395 MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,566,337 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 394 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. SEALED EXHIBIT 2 TO APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 6,343,263 regarding MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 6,343,263 390 , sealed document, 393 , sealed document 391 , sealed document 392 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 393 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 6,343,263 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, Filed Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit 3, Part One, # 4 Exhibit 3, Part Two)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 392 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT REGARDING MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 6,343,263 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 391 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 6,343,263 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 390 MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 6,343,263 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 389 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. SEALED EXHIBITS TO THE APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 5,915,131 regarding MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 5,915,131 385 , sealed document 386 , appendix, 388 , sealed document 387 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3, # 2 Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit 7)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 388 APPENDIX motion for summary judgment 385 , sealed document 386 , sealed document 387 APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 5,915,131 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, Filed Under Seal, # 4 Exhibit 4, Part One, # 5 Exhibit 4, Part Two, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, Filed Under Seal, # 8 Exhibit 7, Filed Under Seal)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 387 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT REGARDING MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 5,915,131 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 386 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 5,915,131 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 385 MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 5,915,131 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 384 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. EXHIBIT 1 TO THE APPENDIX OF MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTOROLAS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,572,193 FOR LACK OF ADEQUATE WRITTEN DESCRIPTION regarding appendix, 383 , sealed document 381 , sealed document, 382 , MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment of NO INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,572,193 FOR LACK OF ADEQUATE WRITTEN DESCRIPTION 380 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 383 APPENDIX sealed document 381 , sealed document, 382 , motion for summary judgment 380 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTOROLAS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,572,193 FOR LACK OF ADEQUATE WRITTEN DESCRIPTION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Filed under seal.)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 382 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MOTOROLA'S STATEMENT OF PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT IN SUPPORT OF MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,572,193 FOR LACK OF ADEQUATE WRITTEN DESCRIPTION (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 381 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of NO INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,572,193 FOR LACK OF ADEQUATE WRITTEN DESCRIPTION (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 380 MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment of NO INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,572,193 FOR LACK OF ADEQUATE WRITTEN DESCRIPTION (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 379 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. EXHIBIT 2 TO THE APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 6,493,002 regarding MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 6,493,002 375 , sealed document, 377 , appendix, 378 , sealed document 376 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 378 APPENDIX motion for summary judgment 375 , sealed document, 377 , sealed document 376 APPENDIX TO MOTOROLA'S MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 6,493,002 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2 Filed seperately under seal, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 377 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. MOTOROLA'S STATEMENT OF PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT IN SUPPORT OF MOTOROLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 6,493,002 SUBMITTED PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 56.1 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 376 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Number 6,493,002 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 375 MOTION by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. for summary judgment OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NUMBER 6,493,002 (Erwine, Richard)
January 9, 2012 374 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgmetn of U.S. Patent No. 6,275,983 (Attachments: # 1 Apple's Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Declaration of Brian Ferguson in Support, # 3 Ferguson Ex. 58, # 4 Ferguson Ex. 59, # 5 Ferguson Ex. 62)(Haslam, Robert)
January 9, 2012 373 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of U.S. Patent No. 7,479,949 (Attachments: # 1 Apple's Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Declaration of Brian Ferguson in Support, # 3 Ferguson Ex. 58, # 4 Ferguson Ex. 59, # 5 Ferguson Ex. 63)(Haslam, Robert)
January 9, 2012 372 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of U.S. Patent No. 5,519,867 (Attachments: # 1 Apple's Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Declaration of Brian Ferguson in Support, # 3 Ferguson Ex. 58, # 4 Ferguson Ex. 59, # 5 Ferguson Ex. 62)(Haslam, Robert)
January 9, 2012 371 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Memoradum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of U.S. Patent No. 5,481,721 (Attachments: # 1 Apple's Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Declaration of Brian Ferguson in Support, # 3 Ferguson Ex. 59, # 4 Ferguson Ex. 60, # 5 Ferguson Ex. 65)(Haslam, Robert)
January 9, 2012 370 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Memoradum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of U.S. Patent No. 5,455,599 (Attachments: # 1 Apple's Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Declaration of Brian Ferguson in Support, # 3 Ferguson Ex. 64)(Haslam, Robert)
January 9, 2012 369 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of U.S. Patent Nos. RE 39,486 and 5,929,852 (Attachments: # 1 Apple's Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Declaration of Brian Ferguson in Support, # 3 Ferguson Ex. 58, # 4 Ferguson Ex. 59)(Haslam, Robert)
January 9, 2012 368 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment re U.S. Patent No. 6,424,354 (Attachments: # 1 Apple's Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Declaration of Brian Ferguson in Support, # 3 Ferguson Ex. 58, # 4 Ferguson Ex. 59)(Haslam, Robert)
January 9, 2012 367 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of U.S. Patent No. 5,566,337 (Attachments: # 1 Apple's Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Declaration of Brian Ferguson in Support, # 3 Ferguson Ex. 61, # 4 Ferguson Ex. 66)(Haslam, Robert)
January 9, 2012 366 SEALED RESPONSE Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Equitable Estoppel or Unclean Hands (Attachments: # 1 Apple's Response to Motorola's Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Apple's Supplemental Proposed Findings of Fact, # 3 Declaration of Richard Lutton in Support, # 4 Lutton Ex. A, # 5 Declaration of Michael Walker in Support, # 6 Walker Exs. A-J, # 7 Declaration of Christine Saunders Haskett in Support, # 8 Haskett Exs. 200-213, # 9 Haskett Exs. 214-221, # 10 Haskett Ex. 222 part 1, # 11 Haskett Ex. 222 part 2, # 12 Haskett Exs. 223-230, # 13 Haskett Exs. 231-232, # 14 Haskett Exs. 233-245, # 15 Haskett Ex. 246, # 16 Haskett Ex. 247, # 17 Haskett Exs. 248-257, # 18 Haskett Exs. 258-262, # 19 Haskett Ex. 263, # 20 Haskett Ex. 264, # 21 Haskett Exs. 265-272, # 22 Haskett Exs. 273-278, # 23 Haskett Exs. 279-280)(Haslam, Robert)
January 9, 2012 365 SEALED RESPONSE Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding the Indefiniteness Of U.S. Patent No. 6,359,898 (Attachments: # 1 Apple's Response to Motorola's Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Apple's Supplemental Proposed Findings of Fact, # 3 Declaration of Christine Saunders Haskett in Support, # 4 Haskett Exs. 281-282)(Haslam, Robert)
January 9, 2012 364 SEALED RESPONSE Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motions for Summary Judgment Regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,175,559 (Attachments: # 1 Apple's Response to Motorola's Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Apple's Supplemental Proposed Findings of Fact, # 3 Declaration of Chris Heegard in Support, # 4 Declaration of Christine Saunders Haskett in Support, # 5 Haskett Exs. 284-285)(Haslam, Robert)
January 9, 2012 363 SEALED RESPONSE Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Apple's Written Description Defense as to U.S. Patent No. 5,572,193 (Attachments: # 1 Apple's Response to Motorola's Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Apple's Supplemental Findings of Fact, # 3 Declaration of Christine Saunders Haskett in Support, # 4 Haskett Ex. 283)(Haslam, Robert)
January 9, 2012 362 SEALED RESPONSE Apple's Opposition to Motorola's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Apple's Written Description Defense as to U.S. Patent No. 5,319,712 (Attachments: # 1 Response to Motorola's Proposed Findings of Fact)(Haslam, Robert)
January 9, 2012 361 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,359,898 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Declaration of Leonard Cimini in Support, # 3 Cimini Ex. 1, # 4 Declaration of Christine Saunders Haskett in Support, # 5 Haskett Ex. 17, # 6 Haskett Ex. 18, # 7 Haskett Ex. 20, # 8 Haskett Ex. 36 part 1, # 9 Haskett Ex. 36 part 2, # 10 Haskett Ex. 37 part 1, # 11 Haskett Ex. 37 part 2, # 12 Haskett Ex. 38, # 13 Haskett Ex. 39, # 14 Haskett Ex. 40, # 15 Haskett Ex. 41, # 16 Haskett Ex. 42, # 17 Haskett Ex. 43, # 18 Haskett Ex. 44, # 19 Haskett Ex. 45, # 20 Haskett Ex. 47)(Haslam, Robert)
January 9, 2012 360 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,319,712 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Declaration of Trent Jaeger in Support, # 3 Declaration of Christine Saunders Haskett in Support, # 4 Haskett Ex. 1, # 5 Haskett Ex. 2, # 6 Haskett Ex. 4, # 7 Haskett Ex. 5, # 8 Haskett Ex. 19, # 9 Haskett Ex. 27, # 10 Haskett Ex. 28, # 11 Haskett Ex. 29, # 12 Haskett Ex. 30, # 13 Haskett Ex. 31, # 14 Haskett Ex. 32, # 15 Haskett Ex. 34)(Haslam, Robert)
January 9, 2012 359 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 6,175,559 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Declaration of Chris Heegard in Support, # 3 Declaration of Jochen Vaihinger in Support, # 4 Declaration of Christine Saunders Haskett in Support, # 5 Haskett Ex. 4, # 6 Haskett Ex. 9, # 7 Haskett Ex. 10, # 8 Haskett Ex. 11, # 9 Haskett Ex. 12, # 10 Haskett Ex. 13, # 11 Haskett Ex. 14, # 12 Haskett Ex. 15, # 13 Haskett Ex. 16, # 14 Haskett Ex. 19, # 15 Haskett Ex. 20, # 16 Haskett Ex. 21, # 17 Haskett Ex. 22, # 18 Haskett Ex. 23, # 19 Haskett Ex. 25, # 20 Haskett Ex. 26, # 21 Haskett Ex. 28, # 22 Haskett Ex. 57)(Haslam, Robert)
January 9, 2012 358 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment for Invalidity and Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,311,516 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Declaration of George Kondylis in Support, # 3 Declaration of Chris Heegard in Support, # 4 Declaration of Ken Ho in Support, # 5 Declaration of Martin Lefkowitz in Support, # 6 Declaration of Paul Rekieta in Support, # 7 Stipulation of Qualcomm-Atheros in Support, # 8 Declaration of Robert Newberry in Support, # 9 Declaration of Tito Thomas in Support, # 10 Declaration of Christine Saunders Haskett in Support, # 11 Haskett Ex. 1, # 12 Haskett Ex. 2, # 13 Haskett Ex. 3, # 14 Haskett Ex. 4, # 15 Haskett Ex. 5, # 16 Haskett Ex. 6, # 17 Haskett Ex. 7, # 18 Haskett Ex. 8 part 1, # 19 Haskett Ex. 8 part 2, # 20 Haskett Ex. 56)(Haslam, Robert)
January 8, 2012 357 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 5,572,193 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Findings of Fact, # 2 Declaration of Trent Jaeger in Support, # 3 Declaration of Joan Gervino, # 4 Gervino Ex. 1, # 5 Haskett Decl. in Support, # 6 Haskett Ex. 1, # 7 Haskett Ex. 2, # 8 Haskett Ex. 3, # 9 Haskett Ex. 4, # 10 Haskett Ex. 5, # 11 Haskett Ex. 21, # 12 Haskett Ex. 28, # 13 Haskett Ex. 35 part 1, # 14 Haskett Ex. 35 part 2, # 15 Haskett Ex. 48, # 16 Haskett Ex. 50 part 1, # 17 Haskett Ex. 50 part 2, # 18 Haskett Ex. 51, # 19 Haskett Ex. 52, # 20 Haskett Ex. 53 part 1, # 21 Hasektt Ex. 53 part 2)(Haslam, Robert)
January 8, 2012 356 MOTION by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. for summary judgment that Motorola May Not Use Apple's Sales To Establish Damages for Direct Infringement of Method Claims by Apple (Haslam, Robert)
January 6, 2012 355 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6717623. (Bordonaro, Meghan)
January 6, 2012 354 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Azra Hadzimehmedovic (Hadzimehmedovic, Azra)
January 6, 2012 353 NOTICE by Azra Hadzimehmedovic of Change of Address (Hadzimehmedovic, Azra)
January 6, 2012 352 NOTICE by Paul T. Ehrlich of Change of Address (Ehrlich, Paul)
January 6, 2012 351 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Paul T. Ehrlich (Ehrlich, Paul)
January 6, 2012 350 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Steven S. Cherensky (Cherensky, Steven)
January 6, 2012 349 NOTICE by Steven S. Cherensky of Change of Address (Cherensky, Steven)
January 6, 2012 348 NOTICE by Matthew Douglas Powers of Change of Address (Powers, Matthew)
January 6, 2012 347 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Matthew Douglas Powers (Powers, Matthew)
January 5, 2012 346 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Counter Defendants Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Stephen Shahida (Shahida, Stephen)
January 5, 2012 345 MOTION by Counter Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Counter Claimants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. for leave to appear as General (Perlson, David)
January 5, 2012 344 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6712986. (Robson, Matthew)
January 5, 2012 343 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6711845. (Verhoeven, Charles)
January 5, 2012 342 Featured Case ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 12/26/2011: Mailed notice (am)
January 5, 2012 341 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER (dated 12/26/11): Counsel motions for leave to appear pro hac vice [282, 284, 285, 286, 287, 288, 289, 291, 292, 293, 294, 295, 296, 297, 298, 299, 300, 301, 302, 303, 305, 308, 310, 311, 312, 313, 314, 322, 326, 338 339 and 340] are granted. The motion for extension of time for filing damages expert reports and discovery is also granted. Lawyers for the parties shall meet with me in my office (Dirksen Federal Courthouse, Suite 2788) on Monday, Jan. 9, 2012, at 10 a.m., to discuss scheduling, to fix a trial date, and to discuss other administrative issues leading up to a final pretrial conference and order. Oral argument on the summary judgment motion is set for Wednesday, January 11, 2012 at 2:00 PM. Mailed notice (am)
January 5, 2012 340 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6711574. (Defranco, Edward)
January 5, 2012 339 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6710491. (Shaul, David)
January 5, 2012 338 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6710274. (Yeh, Johnny)
January 4, 2012 337 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Counter Defendants Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Jill J. Ho (Ho, Jill)
January 4, 2012 336 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Counter Defendants Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Kevin Sean Kudlac (Kudlac, Kevin)
January 4, 2012 335 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Counter Defendants Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Elizabeth Stotland Weiswasser (Weiswasser, Elizabeth)
January 4, 2012 334 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Counter Defendants Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Robert P Watkins, Iii (Watkins, Robert)
January 4, 2012 333 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Counter Defendants Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Danielle Shira Rosenthal (Rosenthal, Danielle)
January 4, 2012 332 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Counter Defendants Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Julian Moore (Moore, Julian)
January 4, 2012 331 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Counter Defendants Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Rodney R. Miller (Miller, Rodney)
January 4, 2012 330 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Counter Defendants Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Justin Constant (Constant, Justin)
January 4, 2012 329 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Counter Defendants Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Brian Chih-kaung Chang (Chang, Brian)
January 4, 2012 328 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Counter Defendants Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Anne M Cappella (Cappella, Anne)
January 4, 2012 327 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Counter Defendants Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Brian E. Ferguson (Ferguson, Brian)
January 4, 2012 326 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6708456. (Rodriguez, Carlos)
January 4, 2012 325 Order To Show Cause Why The Court Should Not Appoint An Expert. Signed by the Honorable Richard A. Posner on 1/4/2012: Mailed notice (am)
January 4, 2012 324 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: ENTER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT APPOINT AN EXPERT. Mailed notice (am)
January 4, 2012 323 MINUTE entry before Honorable Richard A. Posner: Oral argument on cross motions for summary judgment is set for 1/11/2012 at 2:00 PM. Mailed notice (am)
January 4, 2012 322 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6704881. (Shahida, Stephen)
January 3, 2012 321 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. by Raymond N. Nimrod Updated (Nimrod, Raymond)
January 3, 2012 320 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. by Raymond N. Nimrod (Nimrod, Raymond)
December 31, 2011 319 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Counter Defendants Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Ranganath Sudarshan (Sudarshan, Ranganath)
December 31, 2011 318 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Counter Defendants Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Winslow Blodgett Taub (Taub, Winslow)
December 31, 2011 317 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Counter Defendants Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Anupam Sharma (Sharma, Anupam)
December 31, 2011 316 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Counter Defendants Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Christine saunders Haskett (Haskett, Christine saunders)
December 31, 2011 315 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Counter Defendants Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Robert D. Fram (Fram, Robert)
December 30, 2011 314 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6699268. (Cannon, Brian)
December 29, 2011 313 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6697305. (Cappella, Anne)
December 21, 2011 312 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6680912. (Eiseman, David)
December 19, 2011 311 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6671506. (Chang, Brian)
December 15, 2011 310 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6661282. (Berry, Cheryl)
December 15, 2011 309 NOTICE by David Andrew Perlson of Change of Address (Perlson, David)
December 15, 2011 308 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6659447. (Erwine, Richard)
December 14, 2011 307 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Deadlines For the Exchange of Damages Expert Reports and Discovery (Haslam, Robert)
December 14, 2011 306 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER:It appearing that 11 C 8540, Apple, Inc. v. Motorola, Inc., et al., is currently pending before the Hon John W. Darrah; and It further appearing that the United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit has designated the Hon. Richard A. Posner to preside over this case; therefore It is hereby ordered that the Clerk of Court is to reassign 11 C 8540, Apple, Inc. v. Motorola, Inc., et al. to the Hon. Richard A. Posner. Case reassigned to the Honorable Richard A. Posner for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/14/11. (ef, )
December 9, 2011 305 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6644692. (Sudarshan, Ranganath)
December 9, 2011 304 NOTICE by Michael T Pieja of Change of Address (Pieja, Michael)
December 9, 2011 303 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6643678. (Pieja, Michael)
December 9, 2011 302 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6643548. (Lien, Lawrence)
December 8, 2011 301 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6637753. (Elihu, David)
December 8, 2011 300 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6638069. (Watkins, Robert)
December 7, 2011 299 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6635766. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - List of Court Admissions)(Kudlac, Kevin)
December 7, 2011 298 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6635624. (Miller, Rodney)
December 7, 2011 297 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6635531. (Constant, Justin)
December 7, 2011 296 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6635388. (Weiswasser, Elizabeth)
December 7, 2011 295 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6635307. (Moore, Julian)
December 7, 2011 294 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6635126. (Ho, Jill)
December 7, 2011 293 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6634982. On behalf of Apple Inc. and NeXT Software, Inc. (Danielle, Rosenthal)
December 7, 2011 292 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6634943. (Ehrlich, Paul)
December 7, 2011 291 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6634915. (Hadzimehmedovic, Azra)
December 7, 2011 290 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. by Stephen A. Swedlow (Swedlow, Stephen)
December 6, 2011 289 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6633107. (Cherensky, Steven)
December 6, 2011 288 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6633105. (Powers, Matthew)
December 6, 2011 287 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6633099. (Taub, Winslow)
December 6, 2011 286 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6633093. (Sharma, Anupam)
December 6, 2011 285 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6633092. (Haskett, Christine saunders)
December 6, 2011 284 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6633091. (Fram, Robert)
December 6, 2011 283 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Counter Defendants Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. by Robert T Haslam (Haslam, Robert)
December 6, 2011 282 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6628749. On behalf of Apple Inc. and NeXT Software, Inc. (Ferguson, Brian)
December 2, 2011 281 Joint Notice Regarding Summary Judgment Briefing Deadlines by Apple, Inc. (Haslam, Robert)
December 1, 2011 280 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. by Stephen A. Swedlow (Swedlow, Stephen)
December 1, 2011 279 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. by Stephen A. Swedlow (Swedlow, Stephen)
December 1, 2011 278 ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Claimants Apple, Inc., Apple, Inc., Apple, Inc., Plaintiff Apple, Inc., Counter Defendants Apple, Inc., Apple, Inc. by James A Shimota (Shimota, James)
December 1, 2011 MAILED Rule 83 transfer in letter to all counsel of record. (lcw, )
December 1, 2011 277 RECEIVED from Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:10-cv-00662. (lcw)
December 1, 2011 276 Featured Case ORDER transferring case to Norther District of Illinois. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/30/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 30, 2011 275 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting 274 Stipulation for Documentary Evidence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/29/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 28, 2011 274 Stipulation for Documentary Evidence by Plaintiff Apple, Inc.. (Haskett, Christine) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 28, 2011 273 Notice of Appearance filed by Raymond N. Nimrod for Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Nimrod, Raymond) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 23, 2011 272 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 271 Motion for Extension of Time. Brief in Opposition due 12/2/2011. Brief in Reply due 12/20/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/23/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 22, 2011 271 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond and Reply to Summary Judgment Papers by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 11/29/2011. (Stathas, Lynn) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 18, 2011 270 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 267 Motion to Admit Michael T. Pieja Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/18/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 18, 2011 269 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 268 Motion to Admit Lawrence Lien Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/18/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 17, 2011 268 Motion to Admit Lawrence Lien Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 50 receipt number 0758-882171.) by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Lien, Lawrence) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 17, 2011 267 Motion to Admit Michael T Pieja Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 50 receipt number 0758-882169.) by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Pieja, Michael) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 16, 2011 266 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond and Reply to Summary Judgment Papers by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 11/23/2011. (Stathas, Lynn) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 16, 2011 265 Notice by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re 258 Letter responding to Court's letter regarding Trial Judge/Location. (Stathas, Lynn) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 16, 2011 264 Notice by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. re 258 Letter responding to Court's letter re trial location. (Ferguson, Brian) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 16, 2011 263 Corrected MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Brief in Opposition due 12/7/2011. Brief in Reply due 12/19/2011. (Hansen, Scott) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 16, 2011 262 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 259 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/16/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 15, 2011 261 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 260 Motion to Admit Cheryl Berry Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/14/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 14, 2011 260 Motion to Admit Cheryl Berry Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 50 receipt number 0758-879083.) by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Berry, Cheryl) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 14, 2011 259 Motion for Leave to File Corrected Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Corrected Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Corrected Motion for Summary Judgment (Redlined version)) (Hansen, Scott) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 10, 2011 258 Letter from the court re: Trial Judge/Location. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 9, 2011 257 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 256 Motion to Admit Brian E. Ferguson Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/9/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 9, 2011 256 Motion to Admit Brian E. Ferguson Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 50 receipt number 0758-876410.) by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Ferguson, Brian) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 8, 2011 255 Exhibit to 236 Declaration filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 28 - Prosecution History for Patent No. 5,915,131, # 2 Exhibit 34 - Prosecution History for Patent No. 6,275,983, # 3 Exhibit 61 - IEEE-SA Standards Board Operations Manual) (Burrows, James) Modified on 11/9/2011 (mmo). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 8, 2011 254 Declaration of Qualcomm-Atheros filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Stipulation of Qualcomm Atheros re: 213 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 8, 2011 253 Exhibit to 236 Declaration filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 112- Part 1 - Heegard Expert Report re '559 Patent, # 2 Exhibit 112- Part 2 - Heegard Expert Report re '559 Patent) (Burrows, James) Modified exhibit descriptions on 11/8/2011 (mmo). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 7, 2011 252 Disregard - refiled as entry 253 ; Modified on 11/8/2011; unable to open the document. (mmo). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 7, 2011 251 Deposition of Deborah Coutant taken on July 14, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Burrows, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 7, 2011 250 Deposition of Boris Teksler taken on July 7, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Burrows, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 7, 2011 249 Deposition of Thomas Cronan taken on July 6, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Burrows, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 5, 2011 248 Exhibit to 236 Declaration,,,, filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 70 - February 19, 2002 Motorola ETSI IPR Licensing Decl., # 2 Exhibit 71 - April 8, 2003 Corr from Motorola to ETSI, # 3 Exhibit 72 - December 17, 2010 Corr from Motorola to ETSI (MOTO-APPLE-0007144810), # 4 Exhibit 73 - December 17, 2010 Corr from Motorola to ETSI (MOTO-APPLE-0007144718), # 5 Exhibit 74 - January 26, 1998 Corr from Motorola to ETSI, # 6 Exhibit 75 - September 21, 2009 Motorola ETSI IPR Licensing Decl., # 7 Exhibit 76 - December 20, 2002 Corr from Motorola to ETSI, # 8 Exhibit 77 - September 24, 2009 Motorola ETSI IPR Licensing Decl., # 9 Exhibit 78 - June 9, 2000 Corr from Motorola to ETSI, # 10 Exhibit 79 - December 17, 2010 Corr from Motorola to ETSI (MOTO-APPLE-0007144372)) (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 5, 2011 247 Exhibit to 236 Declaration,,,, filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 84 - Dialey to Rosenbrock, dated January 26, 1998, # 2 Exhibit 85 - McCormack to Rosebrock, dated December 20, 2002, # 3 Exhibit 110 - Civil Docket, Case No. 3:11-cv-00178-bbc (W.D. Wis.), # 4 Exhibit 111 - Apple's Amended Invalidity Contentions, # 5 Exhibit 115 - Order Denying Apple's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Case No. 3:11-cv-00178-bbc (W.D. Wis.), # 6 Exhibit 117 - Hearing Transcript regarding Apple's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Case No. 3:11-cv-00178-bbc (W.D. Wis.), # 7 Exhibit 118 - Prosecution History for Patent No. 6,493,002, # 8 Exhibit 119 - Order Denying Apple's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Case No. 3:11-cv-00178-bbc (W.D. Wis.), # 9 Exhibit 120 - Patent No. 5,319,712, # 10 Exhibit 122 - Patent No. 5,572,193, # 11 Exhibit 121 - Patent No. 6,175,559, # 12 Exhibit 123 - Patent No. 6,359,898, # 13 Exhibit 125 - Elihu to Haskett, dated August 22, 2011, # 14 Exhibit 126 - Apple's Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Motorola's Answer and Counterclaims to Apple's Amended Complaint, # 15 Exhibit 127 - Motorola's First Set of Interrogatories to Apple) (Burrows, James) Modified on 11/7/2011; correct #120 patent number (mmo). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 5, 2011 246 Exhibit to 236 Declaration,,,, filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 45 - Prosecution history for Patent No. 7,479,949, # 2 Exhibit 46 - Correspondence regarding trial witnesses, # 3 Exhibit 56 - Oxford Dictionary definition of "heuristic", # 4 Exhibit 57 - Webster's definition of "heuristic", # 5 Exhibit 59 - Droid X User Guide, # 6 Exhibit 60 - IEEE Standards Bylaws, Section 6, # 7 Exhibit 62 - ETSI's IP Rights Policy, # 8 Exhibit 63 - ETSI's Guide on IP Rights) (Burrows, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 5, 2011 245 Exhibit to 236 Declaration filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 91 - March 19, 1993 Licensing Agreement, # 2 Exhibit 92 - May 17, 2000 Licensing Agreement, # 3 Exhibit 93 - July 15, 2010 Licensing Agreement, # 4 Exhibit 94 - September 30, 2000 License Agreement, # 5 Exhibit 95 - July 1, 2005 License Agreement, # 6 Exhibit 96 - December 23, 2003 License Agreement, # 7 Exhibit 97 - January 1, 2003 License Agreement, # 8 Exhibit 98 - March 28, 2003 License Agreement, # 9 Exhibit 99 - June 1, 2010 License Agreement, # 10 Exhibit 100 - April 2, 2002 License Agreement, # 11 Exhibit 101 - October 1, 2005 License Agreement, # 12 Exhibit 102 - Excerpts from Deposition of Richard Lutton (April 1, 2011), # 13 Exhibit 103 - Apple's Response to Motorola's First RFAs, # 14 Exhibit 104 - Apple's 4th Supp Obj and Resp to Motorola's 1st ROGs, # 15 Exhibit 105 - Excerpts from Deposition of Richard Lutton (July 8, 2011), # 16 Exhibit 106 - Excerpts from Deposition of Tom Mavrakakis, # 17 Exhibit 107 - August 6, 2007 Corr from Motorola to Apple, # 18 Exhibit 108 - Excerpts from Deposition of Kirk Dailey, # 19 Exhibit 109 - Excerpts from Deposition of Brian Blasius, # 20 Exhibit 112 - Heegard Expert Report re: '559 Patent - See entry 253 , # 21 Exhibit 113 - Cimini Expert Report re: '898 Patent, # 22 Exhibit 114 - Jeager Expert Report re: '712 and '193 Patents, # 23 Exhibit 116 - Royalty History, # 24 Exhibit 124 - Apple's 3d Supp Obj and Resp to Motorola's 1st ROGs) (Kass, Lisa) Modified on 11/7/2011; cannot open exhibit #112. Requested attorney refile. (mmo). Modified on 11/8/2011; see entry 253 for Exhibit #112. (mmo). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 5, 2011 244 Exhibit to 236 Declaration,,,, filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 39-1 - PVPlayer SDK Developer's Guide, # 2 Exhibit 39-2 - PVPlayer SDK Developer's Guide, # 3 Exhibit 39-3 - PVPlayer SDK Developer's Guide, # 4 Exhibit 39-4 - PVPlayer SDK Developer's Guide, # 5 Exhibit 39-5 - PVPlayer SDK Developer's Guide, # 6 Exhibit 43-2 - Patent No. 7,479,949, # 7 Exhibit 43-3 - Patent No. 7,479,949, # 8 Exhibit 43-1 - Patent No. 7,479,949) (Burrows, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 5, 2011 243 Exhibit to 236 Declaration,,,, filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 82 - Excerpts from Deposition of Dominic Tolli, # 2 Exhibit 83 - Excerpts from Deposition of Tyler Brown, # 3 Exhibit 86-1 - Dailey Decl. re: Opp. to Apple's Mot. for Prelim. Inj., # 4 Exhibit 86-2 - Dailey Decl. re: Opp. to Apple's Mot. for Prelim. Inj., # 5 Exhibit 86-3 - Dailey Decl. re: Opp. to Apple's Mot. for Prelim. Inj., # 6 Exhibit 86-4 - Dailey Decl. re: Opp. to Apple's Mot. for Prelim. Inj., # 7 Exhibit 86-5 - Dailey Decl. re: Opp. to Apple's Mot. for Prelim. Inj., # 8 Exhibit 87 - January 24, 1992 Licensing Agreement, # 9 Exhibit 88 - October 29, 2010 Release and Amendment, # 10 Exhibit 89 - January 1, 1996 Licensing Agreement, # 11 Exhibit 90 - May 12, 2005 License Agreemnent) (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 5, 2011 242 Exhibit to 236 Declaration,,,, filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 31 - Developer.android.com Printout, # 2 Exhibit 33 - Patent No. 5,915,131, # 3 Exhibit 34 - Disregard; wrong document filed, see replaced version entry 255 , # 4 Exhibit 35 - Apple's Supplemental Infringement Contentions for Patent No. 6,275,983, # 5 Exhibit 37 - Patent No. 6,343,263, # 6 Exhibit 40 - Patent No. 6,493,002, # 7 Exhibit 42 - Developer.android.com Layout Params Printout) (Burrows, James) Modified on 11/8/2011 (llj). Modified Exhibit 34 with replaced version entry on 11/9/2011 (mmo). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 5, 2011 241 Exhibit to 236 Declaration,,,, filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 22 - Apple's 2d Supp Obj and Resp to Motorola's 1st ROGs, # 2 Exhibit 36-1 - Spielman Expert Report, # 3 Exhibit 36-2 - Spielman Expert Report, # 4 Exhibit 36-3 - Spielman Expert Report) (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 5, 2011 240 Exhibit to 236 Declaration,,,, filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 15 - Excerpt from April 25, 2011 ITC Hearing, Inv. No. 337-TA-710, # 2 Exhibit 17 - Patent No. 5,519,867, # 3 Exhibit 18 - Patent No. 6,275,983, # 4 Exhibit 20 - Prosecution History for Patent No. 5,519,867, # 5 Exhibit 21 - Patent No. 5,566,337, # 6 Exhibit 23 - Apple's Infringment Contentions regarding Patent No. 5,566,337, # 7 Exhibit 25 - Email, dated June 3, 2011, # 8 Exhibit 26 - Motorola's Preliminary Proposed Claim Constructions, # 9 Exhibit 27 - Email, dated June 6, 2011, # 10 Exhibit 28 - Disregard; wrong document filed, see entry 255 for replaced version # 11 Exhibit 30 - Anatomy and Physiology of an Android) (Burrows, James) Modified on 11/8/2011 (llj). Modified Exhibit #28 with replaced version entry on 11/9/2011 (mmo). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 5, 2011 239 Exhibit to 236 Declaration,,,, filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Patent No. RE39,486, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Patent No. 5,929,852, # 3 Exhibit 4 - Apple's Infringement Contentions Chart for RE '486 Patent, # 4 Exhibit 5 - Apple's Infringement Contentions Chart for '852 Patent, # 5 Exhibit 6 - Excerpts from '575 File History, # 6 Exhibit 9 - Patent No. 5,455,599, # 7 Exhibit 10 - July 30, 2010 ITC Order No. 18, Inv. No. 337-TA-704, # 8 Exhibit 12.1 - July 15, 2011 ITC Initial Determination, Inv. No. 337-TA-710, # 9 Exhibit 12.2 - July 15, 2011 ITC Initial Determination, Inv. No. 337-TA-710, # 10 Exhibit 13 - Patent No. 5,481,721, # 11 Exhibit 14 - Excerpts from '721 File History) (Burrows, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 5, 2011 238 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. re: 213 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 5, 2011 237 Exhibit to 236 Declaration,,,, filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 50 - Excerpts from Deposition of Nitin Ganatra, # 2 Exhibit 51 - Excerpts from Deposition of Scott Herz, # 3 Exhibit 52 - Excerpts from Deposition of Paul Marcos, # 4 Exhibit 53 - Excerpts from Deposition of Bas Ording, # 5 Exhibit 54 - Excerpts from Deposition of Wayne Westerman, # 6 Exhibit 55 - Excerpts from Deposition of Richard Williamson, # 7 Exhibit 58 - Feiner Rebuttal Expert Report re: '949 Patent, # 8 Exhibit 64 - Motorola's Responses to Apple's 1st RFAs, Inv. No. 337-TA-745, # 9 Exhibit 65 - Excerpts from Deposition of Latonia Gordon, # 10 Exhibit 66 - Excerpts from Deposition of Neill Taylor, # 11 Exhibit 67 - Excerpts from Deposition of David Andrus, # 12 Exhibit 68 - Excerpts from Deposition of David Singer, # 13 Exhibit 69 - Cannon Declaration Opp. Mot. for Prelim. Inj., # 14 Exhibit 80 - Excerpts from Deposition of Mark Cudak, # 15 Exhibit 81 - Excerpts from Deposition of Jeffrey Smolinske) (Kass, Lisa) Modified exhibit numbers on 11/7/2011 (mmo). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 5, 2011 236 Declaration of David M. Elihu filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 208 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts from Deposition of Stephen Fisher, # 2 Exhibit 7- Excerpts from Deposition of Michael Cleron, # 3 Exhibit 8 - Goodin Expert Report re: '486 and '852 Patents, # 4 Exhibit 11 - Egbert Expert Report re: '599 Patent, # 5 Exhibit 16 - Goodin Expert Report re: '721 Patent, # 6 Exhibit 19 - Aldrich Expert Report re: '867 Patent, # 7 Exhibit 24 - Aldrich Expert Report re: '337 Patent, # 8 Exhibit 29 - Goodin Expert Report re: '131 Patent, # 9 Exhibit 32 - Aldrich Expert Report re: '983 Patent, # 10 Exhibit 38 - Polish Expert Report re: '263 Patent, # 11 Exhibit 41 - Snoeren Expert Report re: '002 and '315 Patents, # 12 Exhibit 44 - Feiner Expert Report re: '949 Patent, # 13 Exhibit 47 - Excerpts from Deposition of Chris Blumenberg, # 14 Exhibit 48 - Excerpts from Deposition of Andre Boule, # 15 Exhibit 49 - Excerpts from Deposition of Imran Chaudhri) (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 5, 2011 235 Exhibit to 231 Declaration filed by Apple, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 45 English translation of the complaint filed in Germany, dated April 1, 2011, # 2 Ex. 46 e-mail from Richard Erwine, # 3 Ex. 47 Motorolas Infringement Contentions regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,349,898, # 4 Ex. 48 letter from Motorola to Donald Rosenberg at Apple, # 5 Ex. 49 Patent No. 5,239,294, # 6 Ex. 50 Patent No. 5,091,942, # 7 Ex. 51 American National Standard, Financial Institution Retail Message Authentication, X9.19, # 8 Ex. 52 Supplemental Information Disclosure Statement filed with the USPTO, # 9 Ex. 53 File History for U.S. Patent No. 5,572,193, # 10 Ex. 54 (not used), # 11 Ex. 55 interrogatory responses, # 12 Ex. 56 excerpts that highlight testing done for Section 5.2.4 and Section 5.2.13, # 13 Ex. 57 Motorola's Preliminary Proposed Claim Constructions, # 14 Ex. 58 interrogatory responses, # 15 Ex. 59 excerpts from Motorola invalidity contentions, # 16 Ex. 60 excerpts from Chase invalidity report re '721, # 17 Ex. 61 excerpts from Chase report re invalidity of '337, # 18 Ex. 62 excerpts of Jaffay report, # 19 Ex. 63 excerpts of Dezmelyk report, # 20 Ex. 64 excerpts of Conte report, # 21 Ex. 65 excerpts from '721 file history, # 22 Ex. 66 excerpts from '337 file history) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 5, 2011 234 Exhibit to 231 Declaration filed by Apple, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 24 Infringement Contentions, # 2 Ex. 25 Infringement Contentions Chart, # 3 Ex. 26 3GPP Technical Specification, # 4 Ex. 27 WiFi Alliance ASD 544 Test Plan, 2010,, # 5 Ex. 28 WiFi Alliance 802.11n Draft 2.0 System Interoperability Test Plan, # 6 Ex. 29 WiFi Alliance Press Release, # 7 Ex. 30 Linksys webpage, # 8 Ex. 31 paper titled Practical attacks against WEP and WPA, # 9 Ex. 32 iOS webpage titled iOS: Recommended settings for Wi-Fi routers and access points, # 10 Ex. 33 webpage AirPort Utility 5.1 Help, Setting wireless options for your network, # 11 Ex. 34 excerpts of an Excel file entitled 802.11mb Issues Listv12, Jan. 20, 2009,, # 12 Ex. 35 EIA/TIA Interim Standard, IS-54, # 13 Ex. 36 GSM Technical Specification, # 14 Ex. 37 Nortel ETSI SMG2/3/GPRS, # 15 Ex. 38 excerpts from the Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Tim A. Williams, # 16 Ex. 39 excerpts of the Initial Expert Report of Tim A. Williams, # 17 Ex. 40 dictionary definition of Quotient from The New Shorter Oxford English Dictionary, # 18 Ex. 41 dictionary definition of Divide from The New Shorter Oxford English Dictionary, # 19 Ex. 42 excerpts of 3GPP TS 44.060 v4.1.0 Technical Report, # 20 Ex. 43 excerpts of 3GPP TS 44.060 v4.1.0 Technical Report, # 21 Ex. 44 excerpts of 3GPP TS 44.060 v4.1.0 Technical Report) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 5, 2011 233 Exhibit to 231 Declaration filed by Apple, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1 IEEE Standard excerpts, # 2 Ex. 2 Almeroth report excerpts, # 3 Ex. 3 Almeroth report excerpts, # 4 Ex. 4 Interrogatory responses, # 5 Ex. 5 Interrogatory responses, # 6 Ex. 6 Patent No. 4,908,828, # 7 Ex. 7 Patent No. 4,975,952, # 8 Ex. 8 Linksys E3000 User Guide, # 9 Ex. 9 Patent No. 7,173,919, # 10 Ex. 10 '713 Provisional Appl., # 11 Ex. 11 3GPP Technical Specification, # 12 Ex. 12 Kenney report excerpts, # 13 Ex. 13 Kenney report excerpts, # 14 Ex. 14 Nokia Proposal TSGR1-598/99., # 15 Ex. 15 Nokia Proposal TSGR1-599/99, # 16 Ex. 16 Product Specs, # 17 Ex. 17 TS 44.060 excerpts, # 18 Ex. 18 TS 44.060 excerpts, # 19 Ex. 19 Interrogatory responses, # 20 Ex. 20 Interrogatory responses, # 21 Ex. 21 Interrogatory responses, # 22 Ex. 22 June 29, 1999 Memo, # 23 Ex. 23 3GPP/TSGR1#6(99)893) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 5, 2011 232 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 208 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Erwine, Richard) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 5, 2011 231 Declaration of Christine Saunders Haskett filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. re: 213 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 230 Brief in Support of 208 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Erwine, Richard) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 229 Declaration of David M. Elihu filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 215 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended and Restated Certificate of Incorporation of Taligent, # 2 Exhibit - Excerpts of Thomas Cronin6, 2011 deposition, taken July 6, 2011, Inv. No. 337-TA-750, # 3 Exhibit Stock Purchase and Stockholder Agreement, # 4 Exhibit Stock Purchase Agreement between Taligent and Hewlett-Packard, # 5 Exhibit 1994-95 Correspondence between HP and Taligent, # 6 Exhibit Agreement between HP and Taligent, # 7 Exhibit Restructing among Taligent and IBM Corporation, # 8 Exhibit Certificate of Incorporation of Object Technology Licensing Corporation, # 9 Exhibit Stock Sale Agreement between IBM and Taligent, # 10 Exhibit Stock Sale Agreement between Apple and Taligent, # 11 Exhibit Bates range HP-Apple0000089 to HP-Apple0000091, # 12 Exhibit Sept. 30, 1991 Agreement between IBM and Motorola, # 13 Exhibit Stock Purchase Agreement between Apple and IBM, dated March 31, 2006, # 14 Exhibit Assignment, Bates range 750-Apple0023917 to 750-Apple0023960, # 15 Exhibit Assignment, Bates range 750-Apple0022886 to Apple0022899, # 16 Exhibit Patent Assignment, recorded on April 11, 1996, # 17 Exhibit Assignment history resulting in U.S. Patent No. 6,684,261, # 18 Exhibit Assignment history resulting in U.S. Patent No. 6,259,446, # 19 Exhibit Assignment history resulting in U.S. Patent No. 5,519,867, # 20 Exhibit Assignment history resulting in U.S. Patent No. 5,455,599, # 21 Exhibit - Excerpts of Deborah Coutant deposition, taken July 14, 2011, Inv. No. 337-TA-750, # 22 Exhibit - Excerpts of Boris Teksler deposition, taken July 7, 2011, Inv. No. 337-TA-750, # 23 Exhibit W. Christopher Bakewell's Rebuttal Expert Report, served October 25, 2011, # 24 Exhibit Amendment to Research and Experimentation Agreement) (Burrows, James) Modified on 11/7/2011; requested full depos. to be filed separately for Cronin, Coutant and Teksler. (mmo). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 228 Brief in Support of 213 Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 227 Declaration of Tito Thomas filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. re: 213 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 226 Declaration of Robert Newberry filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. re: 213 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 225 Declaration of Paul Rekieta filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. re: 213 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 224 Declaration of Jochen Vaihinger filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. re: 213 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 223 Declaration of Martin Lefkowitz filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. re: 213 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 222 Declaration of Ken Ho filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. re: 213 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 221 Declaration of Trent Jaeger, Ph.D. filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. re: 213 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 220 Declaration of Dr. Chris Heegard filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. re '559 Patent re: 213 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 219 Declaration of Chris Heegard, Ph.D. filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. re '516 re: 213 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 218 Declaration of Joan Gervino filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. re: 213 Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Gervino Ex. 1 - American National Standard) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 217 Brief in Support of 215 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Burrows, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 216 Declaration of George Kondylis filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. re: 213 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 215 MOTION TO DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Brief in Opposition due 11/25/2011. Brief in Reply due 12/5/2011. (Burrows, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 214 Declaration of Dr. Leonard J. Cimini filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. re: 213 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1 - Cimini CV) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 213 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Plaintiff Apple, Inc.. Brief in Opposition due 11/25/2011. Brief in Reply due 12/5/2011. (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 212 Declaration of David Sparks filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 208 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Burrows, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 211 Declaration of Dianne Hackborn filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 208 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Burrows, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 210 Declaration of Jeffrey S. Chase filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 208 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Burrows, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 209 Declaration of Dan Bornstein filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 208 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Burrows, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 208 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Brief in Opposition due 11/25/2011. Brief in Reply due 12/5/2011. (Hansen, Scott) Modified on 11/17/2011; see entry 263 for corrected Motion for S/J. (mmo). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 207 Deposition of Wayne Westerman taken on October 11, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 206 Deposition of Tom Mavrakakis taken on July 19, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 205 Deposition of Stephen Fisher taken on August 25, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 204 Deposition of David Singer taken on May 13, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 203 Deposition of Scott Herz taken on August 19, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 202 Deposition of Richard Williamson taken on September 15, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 201 Deposition of Richard Lutton taken on July 8, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 200 Deposition of Richard Lutton taken on April 1, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 199 Deposition of Paul Marcos taken on August 31, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 198 Deposition of Nitin Ganatra taken on September 23, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 197 Deposition of Neill Taylor taken on June 8, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 196 Deposition of Michael Cleron taken on September 23, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 195 Deposition of Latonia Gordon taken on July 13, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 194 Deposition of Kirk W. Dailey taken on April 12, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 193 Deposition of Jeffrey Smolinske taken on August 19, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 192 Deposition of Imran Chaudhri taken on July 29, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 191 Deposition of Dominic Tolli taken on August 9, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 190 Deposition of Chris Blumenberg taken on September 8, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 189 Deposition of Brian Blasius taken on June 3, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 188 Deposition of Bas Ording taken on August 3, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 187 Deposition of David Andrus taken on May 6, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 186 Deposition of Andre Boule taken on October 5, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 4, 2011 185 Deposition of Mark Cudak taken on September 13, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 3, 2011 184 Deposition of Jason Shi taken on May 13, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 3, 2011 183 Deposition of Anand Dabak taken on September 30, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 3, 2011 182 Deposition of Louis Finkelstein taken on August 17, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 3, 2011 181 Deposition of Costen Burch taken on September 8, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 3, 2011 180 Deposition of Tyler Brown, Ph.D. taken on June 28, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 3, 2011 179 Notice of Appearance of James M. Burrows filed by James M. Burrows for Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Burrows, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
October 19, 2011 178 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 177 Motion to Admit Jonathan M. Sobel Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/19/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
October 18, 2011 177 Motion to Admit Jonathan M. Sobel Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 50 receipt number 0758-862097.) by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Sobel, Jonathan) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
October 13, 2011 176 Featured Case ORDER granting 113 Motion for Leave to File supplemental claim construction evidence. The parties' request for claims construction is denied. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/13/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
October 11, 2011 175 Notice of Appearance filed by Mitchell Feller for Counter Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Claimants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Feller, Mitchell) Modified docket text on 10/12/2011 (mmo).[Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
October 3, 2011 174 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 152 Motion to Admit Amanda Williamson Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/3/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
October 3, 2011 173 Featured Case ORDER denying 154 Motion to Stay Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 19 by Plaintiffs Apple and Granting 166 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority by Defendants. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/3/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
September 30, 2011 172 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 165 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/29/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
September 29, 2011 171 Declaration of Xie Guanbin filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. in Support of Reply re: 154 Motion to Stay (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1, AML, # 2 Ex. 2, extract from Proxy Statement, # 3 Ex. 3, Notif. of Concentrations, # 4 Ex. 4, press conference report, # 5 Ex. 5, MOFCOM press conference report, # 6 Ex. 6, MOFCOM announcement, # 7 Ex. 7, FTC decision, # 8 Ex. 8, joint press release, # 9 Ex. 9, Nokia 2010 press release, # 10 Ex. 10, Nokia 2011 press release, # 11 Ex. 11, FT report, # 12 Ex. 12, Caterpillar press release, # 13 Ex. 13, Caterpillar press release, # 14 Ex. 14, HP Press release, # 15 Ex. 15, HP early termination) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
September 29, 2011 170 Declaration of Alexander Viktorovich Viktorov filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. in Support of Reply re: 154 Motion to Stay (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1, Russian Fed. Law excerpts, # 2 Ex. 2, Proxy Statement, # 3 Ex. 3, materials from FAS website) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
September 29, 2011 169 Declaration of James McGill Aitken filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. in Support of Reply re: 154 Motion to Stay (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1, EU Merger Regulation, # 2 Ex. 2, Motorola Proxy Statement, # 3 Ex. 3, Best Practices Guidelines, # 4 Ex. 4, Oracle 8-K, # 5 Ex. 5, DOJ press release, # 6 Ex. 6, EU Sun Oracle decision, # 7 Ex. 7, TomTom Fed. Register, # 8 Ex. 8, TomTom EU decision, # 9 Ex. 9, Nokia Fed. Register, # 10 Ex. 10, Navteq EU decision, # 11 Ex. 11, DOJ GE Honeywell Press Release, # 12 Ex. 12, EU Decision re GE Honeywell) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
September 29, 2011 168 Declaration of Samuel F. Ernst filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. in Support of Reply re: 154 Motion to Stay (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1, Dist. Court Order, # 2 Ex. 2, Motorolas 9/28/2011 Form 8-K, # 3 Ex. 3, Sirius 4/12/2007 Form 8-K, # 4 Ex. 4, DOJ 2008 Press Release, # 5 Ex. 5, Sirius 8/1/2008 Form 8-K, # 6 Ex. 6, Silver Declaration - Dist. of Columbia case, # 7 Ex. 7, DOJ 2002 Press Release) (Haslam, Robert) Modified exhibit description on 9/30/2011 (mmo). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
September 29, 2011 167 Brief in Reply by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. in Support of 154 Motion to Stay (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
September 29, 2011 166 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Motion for Stay, # 2 Exhibit Order on Motion to Stay) (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
September 29, 2011 165 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Rebuttal Expert Witness Reports and Summary Judgment Motion Papers by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 10/6/2011. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
September 27, 2011 164 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 163 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Bryan J Cahill and James Donald Peterson terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/27/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
September 26, 2011 163 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel by Godfrey & Kahn, S.C. by Counter Claimants Apple, Inc., Apple, Inc., Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Counter Defendants Apple, Inc., Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc.. Response due 10/3/2011. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
September 21, 2011 162 Declaration of Amanda S. Williamson filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 154 Motion to Stay (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2 - Merger Agreement) (Hansen, Scott) Modified exhibit number on 9/22/2011 (mmo). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
September 21, 2011 161 Brief in Opposition by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 154 Motion to Stay filed by Next Software, Inc., Apple, Inc. (Hansen, Scott) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
September 19, 2011 160 Notice of Appearance filed by Catherine Cetrangolo for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. (Cetrangolo, Catherine) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
September 13, 2011 159 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 158 Motion for Extension of Time. Brief in Opposition due 9/21/2011. Brief in Reply due 9/29/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/13/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
September 12, 2011 158 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 9/19/2011. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
September 12, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 154 Motion to Stay Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 19 by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc.and Next Software, Inc. Brief in Opposition due 9/16/2011. Brief in Reply due 9/21/2011. (voc/sp) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
September 12, 2011 157 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 149 Motion to Admit David Elihu Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/12/2011. (arw) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
September 9, 2011 156 Declaration of Samuel F. Ernst filed by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. re: 154 Motion to Stay (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1, Part 1 - Agreement and Plan of Merger, # 2 Ex. 1, Part 2 - Agreement and Plan of Merger, # 3 Ex. 1, Part 3 - Agreement and Plan of Merger, # 4 Ex. 1, Part 4 - Agreement and Plan of Merger, # 5 Ex. 1, Part 5 - Agreement and Plan of Merger, # 6 Ex. 2, Supercharging Article, # 7 Ex. 3, M&A Call transcript, # 8 Ex. 4, Letter to Counsel, # 9 Ex. 5, Letter to Counsel, # 10 Ex. 6, Google's Motion to Dismiss, # 11 Ex. 7, Email to Counsel, # 12 Ex. 8, Email to Counsel) (Ernst, Samuel) (Main Document 156 replaced on 9/27/2011. Document originally filed had incorrect caption. Replaced with corrected caption.) (rep). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
September 9, 2011 155 Brief in Support of 154 Motion to Stay Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 19 by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. (Ernst, Samuel) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
September 9, 2011 154 Motion to Stay Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 19 by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc.. Response due 9/16/2011. (Ernst, Samuel) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
September 8, 2011 152 Motion to Admit Amanda Williamson Pro Hac Vice by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
September 7, 2011 151 Notice by Counter Claimants Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Counter Defendants Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. re 148 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Response To Motorolas Notice of Supplemental Authority Concerning Claim Construction. (Peterson, James) Modified party text on 9/8/2011 (mmo). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
September 1, 2011 150 Declaration of David Elihu filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 149 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ECF Registration Form) (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
September 1, 2011 149 Motion to Admit David Elihu Pro Hac Vice by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
August 26, 2011 148 Notice by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. of Supplemental Authority Concerning Claim Construction. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 1 of 2 - Initial Determination published on August 24, 2011 by the ITC in Investigation No. 337-TA-710, # 2 Exhibit Part 2 of 2 - Initial Determination published on August 24, 2011 by the ITC in Investigation No. 337-TA-710) (Stathas, Lynn) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
August 26, 2011 147 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The jointly proposed addendum to the protective order 146 is accepted and entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/26/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
August 25, 2011 146 Joint Motion for Protective Order Apple Inc.'s and Non-Party Google Inc.'s Joint [Proposed] Addendum to the Protective Order by Plaintiff Apple, Inc.. (Ho, Jill) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
August 25, 2011 145 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** ORDER granting 140 Motion to Admit Kevin S. Kudlac, Justin Constant and Rodney R. Miller Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/25/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
August 25, 2011 144 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 138 Motion to Admit Jeffrey Boozell Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/25/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
August 23, 2011 143 Declaration of Rodney R. Miller filed by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. re: 140 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice, (Cahill, Bryan) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
August 23, 2011 142 Declaration of Justin Constant filed by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. re: 140 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice, (Cahill, Bryan) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
August 23, 2011 141 Declaration of Kevin S. Kudlac filed by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. re: 140 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice, (Cahill, Bryan) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
August 23, 2011 140 Motion to Admit Kevin S. Kudlac, Justin Constant and Rodney R. Miller Pro Hac Vice by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: # 1 CMECF Form - Kudlac, # 2 CMECF Form - Constant, # 3 CMECF Form - Miller) (Cahill, Bryan) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
August 23, 2011 139 Declaration of Jeffrey Boozell filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 138 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ECF Registration Form) (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
August 23, 2011 138 Motion to Admit Jeffrey Boozell Pro Hac Vice by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
August 22, 2011 137 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 133 Motion to Admit Anupam Sharma and Ranganath Sudarshan Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/19/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
August 19, 2011 136 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 131 Motion to Admit Amy L. Signaigo Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/19/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
August 18, 2011 135 Declaration of Ranganath Sudarshan filed by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. re: 133 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice, (Cahill, Bryan) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
August 18, 2011 134 Declaration of Anupam Sharma filed by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. re: 133 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice, (Cahill, Bryan) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
August 18, 2011 133 Motion to Admit Anupam Sharma and Ranganath Sudarshan Pro Hac Vice by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: # 1 CM ECF Regsitration Form - Sharma, # 2 CM ECF Registration Form - Sudarshan) (Cahill, Bryan) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
August 18, 2011 132 Declaration of Amy L. Signaigo filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 131 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ECF Registration Form) (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
August 18, 2011 131 Motion to Admit Amy L. Signaigo Pro Hac Vice by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
August 18, 2011 130 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 125 Motion to Admit David A. Perlson Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/18/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
August 17, 2011 129 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 127 Motion to Admit Robert R. Cleary Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/17/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
August 16, 2011 128 Declaration of Robert R. Cleary filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 127 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ECF Registration Form) (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
August 16, 2011 127 Motion to Admit Robert R. Cleary Pro Hac Vice by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
August 16, 2011 126 Declaration of David A. Perlson filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 125 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ECF Registratio Form) (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
August 16, 2011 125 Motion to Admit David A. Perlson Pro Hac Vice by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
August 16, 2011 124 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 122 Motion to Admit Kevin A. Smith Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/15/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
August 15, 2011 123 Declaration of Kevin A. Smith filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 122 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice (Smith, Kevin) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
August 15, 2011 122 Motion to Admit Kevin A. Smith Pro Hac Vice by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Smith, Kevin) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
August 4, 2011 121 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 119 Motion to Admit David C. Radulescu Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/4/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
August 2, 2011 120 Declaration of David C. Radulescu filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 119 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
August 2, 2011 119 Motion to Admit David C. Radulescu Pro Hac Vice by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Radulescu CM/ECF Registration) (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
July 28, 2011 118 Transcript of Claims Construction Hearing, held 7/22/2011 before Judge Barbara B. Crabb. Court Reporter: LS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see Electronic Transcript Instructions and Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (arw) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
July 26, 2011 117 Deposition of Leonard Cimini, Ph.D. taken on July 13, 2011 (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
July 22, 2011 Motions for Claims Construction. (Dummy Motion/llj) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
July 22, 2011 116 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Barbara B. Crabb: Claims Construction Hearing held on 7/22/2011; presentations made by all parties; matters taken under advisement. [3:15] (Court Reporter LS.) (llj) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
July 19, 2011 115 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 112 Joint Motion for Approval of Additional Presentation Equipment During Claims Construction Hearing.. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/19/2011. (llj) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
July 19, 2011 114 Supplemental Declaration of Winslow B. Taub filed by Plaintiffs/Counter Claimants Apple, Inc., NeXT Software, Inc. re: 113 Motion for Leave to File, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpt from Certified Translation of JP Prosecution History, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpt from Certified Translation of JP Prosecution History, Claim 9) (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
July 19, 2011 113 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Claims Construction Evidence by Plaintiffs/Counter Claimants Apple, Inc., NeXT Software, Inc. (Peterson, James) Modified on 7/20/2011 (llj). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
July 18, 2011 112 Joint Motion for Approval of Additional Presentation Equipment During Claims Construction Hearing by Counter Claimants Apple, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Counter Defendants Apple, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Response due 7/25/2011. (Peterson, James) Modified on 7/19/2011 (mmo). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
July 15, 2011 111 Declaration of J. Stevenson Kenney filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 95 Motion Requesting Claims Construction by Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Kenney CV) (Hansen, Scott) Modified on 7/18/2011 (llj). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
July 15, 2011 110 Exhibit to 109 Declaration of Carlos A. Rodriguez,, filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. Exhibit 3 (Excerpts from November 16, 2010 Deposition of Betrand Serlet, USITC Inv. No. 337-TA-710) (Sealed Document) (Hansen, Scott) Modified on 7/18/2011 (llj). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
July 15, 2011 109 Declaration of Carlos A. Rodriguez filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 95 Motion Requesting Claims Construction by Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts from Patent No. 6,275,983 Prosecution History, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts from Patent No. 6,212,575 Prosecution History, # 3 Exhibit 4 - July 4, 1011 Correspondence from Erwine to Haskett, # 4 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts from Patent No. 6,175,559 Prosecution History, # 5 Exhibit 6 - Excerpts from July 13, 2011 Deposition of Leonard Cimini, Ph.D., # 6 Exhibit 7 - Excerpts from American Heritage College Dictionary) (Hansen, Scott) Modified on 7/18/2011 (llj). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
July 15, 2011 108 Claims Construction Response Brief re: 95 Motion Requesting Claims Construction by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Hansen, Scott) Modified event on 7/18/2011 (llj). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
July 15, 2011 107 Declaration of Winslow B. Taub filed by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Softward, Inc. re: 90 Motion Requesting Claims Construction by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, '486 Inf. Chart, # 2 Ex. B, '354 file history excerpt, # 3 Ex. C, '354 file history excerpt, # 4 Ex. D, Spielman report excerpts, # 5 Ex. E, '983 file history excerpts, # 6 Ex. F, '983 file history excerpts, # 7 Ex. G, '337 Inf. Chart, # 8 Ex. H, '002 Inf. Chart, # 9 Ex. I, '002 file history excerpt, # 10 Ex. J, '002 file history excerpt, # 11 Ex. K, '002 file history excerpt, # 12 Ex. L, dictionary definitions, # 13 Ex. N, JPS63-167588 cert. trans., # 14 Ex. O, appl. 08/050952 file history excerpt, # 15 Ex. P, invalidity conten. excerpt, # 16 Ex. Q, 6,371,977, # 17 Ex. R, 5,474,831) (Haslam, Robert) Modified on 7/18/2011 (llj). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
July 15, 2011 106 Claims Construction Response Brief re: 90 Motion Requesting Claims Construction by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Winslow Taub - See also entry 107 , # 2 Taub Ex. M - Excerpts of Tyler Brown Deposition) (Haslam, Robert) Modified on 7/18/2011 (mmo) Modified event on 7/18/2011 (llj). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
July 15, 2011 105 Claims Construction Submission re: 90 Motion Requesting Claims Construction by Plaintiff Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. - Apple Inc. Technical Tutorial CD. (Filed in Clerk's Office Exhibit Room.) (llj) Modified on 7/18/2011 (llj). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
July 15, 2011 104 Claims Construction Submission re: 95 Motion Requesting Claims Construction by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. - Motorola Technical Tutorial CDs. (Filed in Clerk's Office Exhibit Room.) (llj) Modified on 7/18/2011 (llj). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
July 8, 2011 103 Notice by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. of Change of Address as to Attorneys Matthew D. Powers and Steven S. Cherensky. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
July 1, 2011 102 Notice of Appearance filed by David G. Hanson for Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Hanson, David) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
June 29, 2011 101 Featured Case ORDER granting 99 Motion regarding technical tutorial. Each side may submit a technical tutorial regarding the technology relevant to its claim construction disputes by 7/15/2011. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/28/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
June 24, 2011 100 Featured Case ORDER granting 90 Motion Requesting Claims Construction by plaintiffs and granting 95 Motion Requesting Claims Construction be defendants. Claims Construction Hearing set for 7/22/2011 at 9:00 AM. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/24/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
June 23, 2011 99 Joint Motion for Regarding the Need for Technical Tutorial by Plaintiff Apple, Inc.. Response due 6/30/2011. (Haskett, Christine) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
June 20, 2011 98 Declaration of Leonard J. Cimini filed by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. in Support of re: 90 Motion Requesting Claims Construction, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, CV) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
June 17, 2011 97 Declaration of Carlos A. Rodriguez filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 96 Claims Construction Initial Brief, 95 Motion Requesting Claims Construction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Patent No. 6,275,983, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Patent No. 5,969,705, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Patent No. 5,566,337, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Patent No. 5,455,599, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Patent No. 6,424,354, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Reissued Patent No. RE 39,486, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Patent No. 5,929,852, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Patent No. 5,946,647, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Patent No. 5,481,721, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Patent No. 6,493,002, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Patent No. 6,175,559, # 12 Exhibit 12 - Patent No. 5,490,230, # 13 Exhibit 13 - Patent No. 5,319,712, # 14 Exhibit 14 - Patent No. 5,572,193, # 15 Exhibit 15 - Excerpts from '983 Patent Prosecution History, # 16 Exhibit 16 - Excerpts from '354 Patent Prosecution History, # 17 Exhibit 17 - Excerpts from '486 Patent Prosecution History, # 18 Exhibit 18 - Excerpts from '230 Patent Prosecution History, # 19 Exhibit 19 - Apple's Infringement Contentions Claim Chart for '983 Patent, # 20 Exhibit 20 - Apple's Infringement Contentions Claim Chart for '705 Patent, # 21 Exhibit 21 - Apple's Infringement Contentions Claim Chart for '337 Patent, # 22 Exhibit 22 - Apple's Infringement Contentions Claim Chart for '599 Patent, # 23 Exhibit 23 - Apple's Infringement Contentions Claim Chart for '354 Patent, # 24 Exhibit 24 - Apple's Infringement Contentions Claim Chart for '486 Patent, # 25 Exhibit 25 - Apple's Infringement Contentions Claim Chart for '852 Patent, # 26 Exhibit 26 - Apple's Infringement Contentions Claim Chart for '647 Patent, # 27 Exhibit 27 - Apple's Infringement Contentions Claim Chart for '721 Patent, # 28 Exhibit 28 - Apple's Infringement Contentions Claim Chart for '002 Patent, # 29 Exhibit 29 - Excerpts from NeXTSTEP Object-Oriented Programming and the Objective C Language, # 30 Exhibit 30 - July 30, 2010 ITC Order Construing Terms of Asserted Claims in Inv. No. 337-TA-704, # 31 Exhibit 31 - April 4, 2011 Joint Motion to Amend Filed in ITC Inv. No. 337-TA-710, # 32 Exhibit 32 - Excerpts from '002 Patent Prosecution History, # 33 Exhibit 33 - Patent No. 5,588,105, # 34 Exhibit 34 - Patent No. 5,659,693, # 35 Exhibit 35 - Henderson & Card Article, # 36 Exhibit 36 - Patent No. 5,202,961, # 37 Exhibit 37 - Patent App. No. 08/316,237) (Hansen, Scott) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
June 17, 2011 96 Claims Construction Initial Brief re: 95 Motion Requesting Claims Construction and Claim Construction Hearing by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Hansen, Scott) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
June 17, 2011 95 Motion Requesting Claims Construction and Claim Construction Hearing by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Hansen, Scott) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
June 17, 2011 94 Declaration of Christine Saunders Haskett filed by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. re: 90 Motion Requesting Claims Construction (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 12 Finkelstein Deposition Excerpts) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
June 17, 2011 93 Declaration of Christine Saunders Haskett filed by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. re: 90 Motion Requesting Claims Construction (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 21 IEEE Dictionary, # 2 Ex. 22 '575 file history, # 3 Ex. 23 '486 file history, # 4 Ex. 24 Order No. 18, # 5 Ex. 25 '705 file history, # 6 Ex. 26 '647 file history, # 7 Ex. 27 Brad Cox, # 8 Ex. 28 Microsoft Press Dictionary, # 9 Ex. 29 '002 file history, # 10 Ex. 30 Dictionary of Computer Words, # 11 Ex. 31 Computer Dictionary, # 12 Ex. 32 Academic Press Dictionary, # 13 Ex. 33 IBM Dictionary, # 14 Ex. 34 Black's Law Dictionary, # 15 Ex. 35 About 3GPP, # 16 Ex. 36 '919 patent, # 17 Ex. 37 '713 provisional application) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
June 17, 2011 92 Declaration of Christine Saunders Haskett filed by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. re: 90 Motion Requesting Claims Construction (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1 Moto Infring. Cont. Ex. A, # 2 Ex. 2 '157 patent, # 3 Ex. 3 '179 patent, # 4 Ex. 4 '329 patent, # 5 Ex. 5 '230 file history, # 6 Ex. 6 Oxford dictionary definition, # 7 Ex. 7 '559 file history, # 8 Ex. 8 The OSI Model, # 9 Ex. 9 ISO Standard, # 10 Ex. 10 Japanese file history, # 11 Ex. 11 Japanese prosecution appeal, # 12 Ex. 13 Moto Infring. Cont. Ex. E, # 13 Ex. 14 IEEE Standard, # 14 Ex. 15 '333 patent, # 15 Ex. 16 '721 file history, # 16 Ex. 17 '193 file history, # 17 Ex. 18 Moto Infring. Cont. Ex. F, # 18 Ex. 19 Merriam Webster Dictionary, # 19 Ex. 20 Webster's Dictionary) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
June 17, 2011 91 Claims Construction Initial Brief re: 90 Motion Requesting Claims Construction and Claim Construction Hearing by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
June 17, 2011 90 Motion Requesting Claims Construction and Claim Construction Hearing by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. ** Disregard Declaration of Leonard Cimini, to be refiled as a separate document** # 2 Ex. A to Cimini Declaration) (Haslam, Robert) Modified on 6/20/2011 (voc). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
June 17, 2011 89 Notice of Appearance of Elizabeth Weiswasser filed by James Donald Peterson for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
May 9, 2011 88 Reply to Counterclaim by Counter Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. (Hansen, Scott) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
May 2, 2011 87 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 84 Motion to Admit Robert W. Stone Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/2/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
April 25, 2011 86 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Granting Motion to admit Linda L. Brewer pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/25/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
April 22, 2011 85 Declaration of Robert W. Stone filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 84 Motion to Admit Robert W. Stone Pro Hac Vice (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
April 22, 2011 84 Motion to Admit Robert W. Stone Pro Hac Vice by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: # 1 CM/ECF Registration Form, # 2 Certificate of Service) (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
April 18, 2011 83 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 71 Motion to Admit Thomas R. Watson, Brian C. Cannon, Richard W. Erwine, Carlos A. Rodriguez, Meghan Bordonaro and Davis L. Shaul Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/18/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
April 15, 2011 82 Plaintiffs' Reply to Counterclaim, COUNTERCLAIM Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Motorola, Inc. and Motorola Mobility, Inc.s Answer and Counterclaims to Apple Inc.s Amended Complaint against Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc. and NeXT Software, Inc. (Haskett, Christine) Modified docket text on 4/18/2011 (mmo). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
April 11, 2011 Action Requested: Attorneys Thomas R. Watson, Brian Cannon, Richard Erwine, Linda Brewer, Carlos Rodriguez, Meghan Bordonaro, David Shaul and Melissa Chan must be registered for CM/EC before the motion for pro hac vice is granted. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
April 8, 2011 81 Notice by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. of Agreement Regarding Email Discovery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Agreement Regarding Email Discovery) (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
April 8, 2011 80 Notice by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. of Cross-Use Agreement for Discovery Materials. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Cross-Use Agreement) (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
April 8, 2011 79 Declaration of Thomas R. Watson filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 71 Motion to Admit Thomas R. Watson, Brian C. Cannon, Richard W. Erwine, Linda J. Brewer, Carlos A. Rodriguez, Meghan E. Bordonaro, David L. Shaul, and Melissa N. Chan Pro Hac Vice (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
April 8, 2011 78 Declaration of David L. Shaul filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 71 Motion to Admit Thomas R. Watson, Brian C. Cannon, Richard W. Erwine, Linda J. Brewer, Carlos A. Rodriguez, Meghan E. Bordonaro, David L. Shaul, and Melissa N. Chan Pro Hac Vice (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
April 8, 2011 77 Declaration of Carlos A. Rodriguez filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 71 Motion to Admit Thomas R. Watson, Brian C. Cannon, Richard W. Erwine, Linda J. Brewer, Carlos A. Rodriguez, Meghan E. Bordonaro, David L. Shaul, and Melissa N. Chan Pro Hac Vice (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
April 8, 2011 76 Declaration of Richard W. Erwine filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 71 Motion to Admit Thomas R. Watson, Brian C. Cannon, Richard W. Erwine, Linda J. Brewer, Carlos A. Rodriguez, Meghan E. Bordonaro, David L. Shaul, and Melissa N. Chan Pro Hac Vice (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
April 8, 2011 75 Declaration of Melissa N. Chan filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 71 Motion to Admit Thomas R. Watson, Brian C. Cannon, Richard W. Erwine, Linda J. Brewer, Carlos A. Rodriguez, Meghan E. Bordonaro, David L. Shaul, and Melissa N. Chan Pro Hac Vice (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
April 8, 2011 74 Declaration of Brian C. Cannon filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 71 Motion to Admit Thomas R. Watson, Brian C. Cannon, Richard W. Erwine, Linda J. Brewer, Carlos A. Rodriguez, Meghan E. Bordonaro, David L. Shaul, and Melissa N. Chan Pro Hac Vice (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
April 8, 2011 73 Declaration of Linda J. Brewer filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 71 Motion to Admit Thomas R. Watson, Brian C. Cannon, Richard W. Erwine, Linda J. Brewer, Carlos A. Rodriguez, Meghan E. Bordonaro, David L. Shaul, and Melissa N. Chan Pro Hac Vice (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
April 8, 2011 72 Declaration of Meghan E. Bordonaro filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 71 Motion to Admit Thomas R. Watson, Brian C. Cannon, Richard W. Erwine, Linda J. Brewer, Carlos A. Rodriguez, Meghan E. Bordonaro, David L. Shaul, and Melissa N. Chan Pro Hac Vice (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
April 8, 2011 71 Motion to Admit Thomas R. Watson, Brian C. Cannon, Richard W. Erwine, Linda J. Brewer, Carlos A. Rodriguez, Meghan E. Bordonaro, David L. Shaul, and Melissa N. Chan Pro Hac Vice by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
March 22, 2011 70 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. against Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Patent No. 5,311,516, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Patent No. 5,319,712, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Patent No. 5,490,230, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Patent No. 5,572,193, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Patent No. 6,175,559, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Patent No. 6,359,898, # 7 Certificate of Service) (Hansen, Scott) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
March 15, 2011 69 Notice by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Softward, Inc. re 68 Text Order - Apple's Notice that Parties have Reached Agreement Concerning Cost Shifting. (Peterson, James) Modified docket text on 3/16/2011 (mmo). Modified on 3/23/2011 (llj/c). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
March 8, 2011 68 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER denying 59 Motion to Stay. In light of this court's order today denying defendants' motion to dismiss or transfer certain counts 66 , defendants' motion to stay certain discovery 59 is denied without a hearing because it is moot. Because the court intended to deny defendants' discovery motion on its merits (since it would be illogical and inefficient to stay discovery when the information sought would have been relevant in either this court or in Delaware), because defendants' motion violated this court's admonition in the second paragraph of the December 20, 2011 preliminary pretrial conference order 27 , and because defendants' required a response and counter-motion from plaintiffs, costs are shifted in favor of plaintiffs pursuant to Rule 37(a)(5)(B). Plaintiffs have until March 15, 2011 to provide an itemized list of its reasonable expenses incurred in opposing defendant's motion, with defendant's response due not later than March 22, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/8/2011. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
March 8, 2011 67 Notice of Appearance filed by Lisa Nester Kass for Counter Claimants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Counter Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Kass, Lisa) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
March 8, 2011 66 Featured Case ORDER denying 28 Motion to dismiss or sever and transfer by defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc. and Motorola, Inc. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/8/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
March 7, 2011 Reset Deadlines as to 63 Motion to Compel Discovery Regarding Certain Asserted Patents. Brief in Opposition due 3/8/2011. **Counsel be advised that this motion also will be considered & decided at the March 9, 2011 Motion Hearing. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
March 4, 2011 65 Declaration of Steven S. Cherensky filed by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. re: 63 Motion to Compel Discovery Regarding Certain Asserted Patents (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Responses to First Set of Interrogatories, # 2 Exhibit B - Motorola Solutions, Inc.'s Responses to First Set of Interrogatories, # 3 Exhibit C -Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Responses to First Set of Requests for Production, # 4 Exhibit D - Motorola Solutions, Inc.'s Responses to First Set of Requests for Production) (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
March 4, 2011 64 Brief in Support of 63 Motion to Compel and Brief in Opposition to Motorola's Motion to Stay Certain Discovery Pending Resolution of Their Motion to Dismiss or Sever and Transfer 59 by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. (Peterson, James) Modified docket text on 3/7/2011 (mmo/t). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
March 4, 2011 63 Motion to Compel Discovery Regarding Certain Asserted Patents by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 3/11/2011. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
March 3, 2011 Reset Deadlines as to 59 Motion to Stay Certain Discovery. Brief in Opposition due 3/8/2011. Telephone Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2011 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Defendants responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
March 2, 2011 62 Certificate of Service by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
March 2, 2011 61 Declaration of Rebecca F. Kennedy re: 59 Motion to Stay Certain Discovery filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit February 11, 2011 Letter) (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) Modified docketing text on 3/3/2011 (mmo/c). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
March 2, 2011 60 Brief in Support of 59 Motion to Stay by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
March 2, 2011 59 Motion to Stay Certain Discovery by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Response due 3/9/2011. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
February 28, 2011 58 Notice of Appearance of Covington & Burling, LLP filed by James Donald Peterson for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
February 28, 2011 57 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert T. Haslam for Counter Claimants Apple, Inc., Apple, Inc., Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC., Counter Defendant Apple, Inc. (Haslam, Robert) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
February 25, 2011 56 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 55 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Patricia Young terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/25/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
February 18, 2011 55 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC.. Response due 2/25/2011. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
February 11, 2011 54 Certificate of Service by Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
February 11, 2011 53 Answer and Reply to 50 Amended Counterclaims by Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) Modified event/docket text on 2/14/2011 (mmo). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
February 1, 2011 52 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 51 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/1/2011. (voc) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
January 28, 2011 51 Motion for Protective Order - Joint Proposed Protective Order by Counter Claimants Apple, Inc., Apple, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC., Counter Defendants Apple, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Acknowledgement and Agreement To Be Bound by Joint Proposed Protective Order) (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
January 28, 2011 50 Apple, Inc's Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Motorola, Inc. and Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Joint Counterclaims and Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Counterclaims - - Reply to Counterclaim, COUNTERCLAIM against Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. by Counter Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
January 24, 2011 49 Certificate of Service by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
January 24, 2011 48 Declaration of Rebecca F. Kennedy filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 28 MOTION TO DISMISS OR SEVER AND TRANSFER filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (13) - Apple Ans. S.D. Fla., # 2 Exhibit (14) - Order Denying HTC Transfer, # 3 Exhibit (15) Order Granting Apple Transfer Motion, # 4 Exhibit (16) HTC Unopposed Motion to Stay, # 5 Exhibit (17) - Notice of Related Case) (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
January 24, 2011 47 Brief in Reply in Support re: 28 MOTION TO DISMISS OR SEVER AND TRANSFER filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
January 14, 2011 46 Notice of Appearance of Rachelle H. Thompson filed by Rachelle Harley Thompson for Plaintiff Apple, Inc., Counter Defendant Apple, Inc., Counter Claimant Apple, Inc. (Thompson, Rachelle) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
January 13, 2011 45 Declaration of Steven S. Cherensky filed by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. re: 28 MOTION TO DISMISS OR SEVER AND TRANSFER filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Complaint filed by Motorola ND IL 10-CV-06381, # 2 Exhibit B - Complaint filed by Motorola ND IL 10-CV-06385, # 3 Exhibit C - Complaint filed by Motorola SD FL 10-CV-23580, # 4 Exhibit D - Complaint filed by Motorola with USITC, # 5 Exhibit E - Complaint filed by Apple with USITC, # 6 Exhibit F - Voluntary dismissal by Motorola ND IL 10-cv-06381, # 7 Exhibit G - Voluntary dismissal by Motorola ND IL 10-cv-06385, # 8 Exhibit H - Complaint filed by Motorola against Microsoft WD WI 10-cv-00699, # 9 Exhibit I - Complaint filed by Motorola against Microsoft WD WI 10-cv-00700, # 10 Exhibit J - Complaint filed by Motorola against Microsoft WD WI 10-cv-00826, # 11 Exhibit K - Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue DE 10-cv-00867, # 12 Exhibit L - Opening Brief DE 10-cv-00867, # 13 Exhibit M - Email to E. DeFranco from S. Cherensky dated Dec 28, 2010, # 14 Exhibit N - Joint planning schedule SD FL 10-cv-023580, # 15 Exhibit O - Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue SD FL 10-cv-23580, # 16 Exhibit P - Motorola's Brief in Opposition DE 10-cv-00867, # 17 Exhibit Q - Reply Brief DE 10-cv-00867, # 18 Exhibit R - Article) (Peterson, James) Modified exhibit description on 1/14/2011 (mmo). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
January 13, 2011 44 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. re: 28 MOTION TO DISMISS OR SEVER AND TRANSFER filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
January 10, 2011 43 Notice of Appearance of Brian C. Chang filed by Brian Chang for Plaintiff Apple, Inc. (Chang, Brian) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
January 10, 2011 42 Notice of Appearance of Nathan A. Greenblatt filed by Nathan A. Greenblatt for Plaintiff Apple, Inc., Counter Defendant Apple, Inc., Counter Claimant Apple, Inc. (Greenblatt, Nathan) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
January 10, 2011 41 Notice of Appearance filed by Julian Moore for Plaintiff Apple, Inc., Counter Defendant Apple, Inc., Counter Claimant Apple, Inc. (Moore, Julian) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
January 10, 2011 40 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 15 Motion to Admit Jennifer Bauer Pro Hac Vice. Jennifer A Bauer for Motorola Mobility, Inc. Jennifer A Bauer for Motorola, Inc. admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/10/2011. (vob) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
December 30, 2010 39 Certificate of Service by Counter Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Hansen, Scott) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
December 30, 2010 38 Reply to Counterclaim by Counter Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. (Hansen, Scott) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
December 29, 2010 37 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Order granting 15 Motion to admit Edward DeFranco Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/29/2010. (vob) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
December 29, 2010 36 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Order granting 15 Motion to admit Kevin Johnson Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/29/2010. (vob) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
December 27, 2010 35 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Order granting 15 Motion to admit Alexander Rudis Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/27/2010. (vob) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
December 27, 2010 34 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Order granting 15 Motion to admit David Nelson Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/27/2010. (vob) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
December 23, 2010 33 Certificate of Service by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
December 23, 2010 32 Declaration of Rebecca F. Kennedy filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 28 MOTION TO DISMISS OR SEVER AND TRANSFER filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Copy of Joint Motion to Stay, # 2 Exhibit 2-Copy of Memo in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, # 3 Exhibit 3-Copy of redacted version of Apple Inc. and NeXT Software Opposition to Defts. Motion to Transfer Venue, # 4 Exhibit 4-Copy of Motorola Declaration of mailing, #10-867-GMS, # 5 Exhibit 5-Copy of Motorola complaint, #10-867-GMS, # 6 Exhibit 6-Copy of Apple and NeXT Software Complaint,#10-cv-00166-UNA # 7 Exhibit 7-Copy of Apple Complaint,#10-cv-00167-RK, # 8 Exhibit 8-Copy of Apple Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims, #09-1002-GMS, # 9 Exhibit 9-Copy of Apple Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims, #09-791-GMS, # 10 Exhibit 10-Copy of Order in #09-10020GMS, # 11 Exhibit 11-Copy of 12/6/10 Order in #10-cv-166-UNA,10-cv-167-RK,09-791-GMS,09-1002-GMS, # 12 Exhibit 12-Copy of Apple Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims, #10-cv-249.) (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) Modified on 12/27/2010; added exhibit descriptions. (mmo). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
December 23, 2010 31 Declaration of Michael Romie filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 28 MOTION TO DISMISS OR SEVER AND TRANSFER filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
December 23, 2010 30 Declaration of William P. Alberth Jr. filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 28 MOTION TO DISMISS OR SEVER AND TRANSFER filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
December 23, 2010 29 Brief in Support by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 28 MOTION TO DISMISS OR SEVER AND TRANSFER filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
December 23, 2010 28 MOTION TO DISMISS OR SEVER AND TRANSFER by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Brief in Opposition due 1/13/2011. Brief in Reply due 1/24/2011. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
December 21, 2010 27 Pretrial Conference Order - Amendments to Pleadings due 1/28/2011. Motions Requesting Claims Construction due 6/17/2011. Claims Construction Response Brief due 7/15/2011. Claims Construction Hearing set for 7/22/2011 at 09:00 AM. Dispositive Motions due 10/21/2011. Settlement Letters due 3/16/2012. Motions in Limine due 3/16/2012. Response to Motion due 4/2/2012. Final Pretrial Submissions due 4/5/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/12/2012 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 4/30/2012 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/20/2010. (vob) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
December 20, 2010 26 Featured Case ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time. Answer due 12/23/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/20/10. (rep) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
December 20, 2010 25 Certificate of Service by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
December 20, 2010 24 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker.Response due 12/27/2010. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
December 17, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 12/17/2010 [:30] (cak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
December 15, 2010 Action Requested: Attorneys Charles K. Verhoeven, David A. Nelson, Edward J. DeFranco, Jennifer A. Bauer and Alexander Rudis must be registered for CM/ECF before the Motion for Pro Hac Vice is granted. (vob) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
December 14, 2010 23 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC., Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Ho, Jill) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
December 14, 2010 22 Certificate of Service by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re 15 Motion to Admit Verhoeven, Nelson, Johnson, DeFranco, Bauer and Rudis Pro Hac Vice, 20 Declaration, 17 Declaration, 16 Declaration, 18 Declaration, 21 Declaration, 19 Declaration (Hansen, Scott) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
December 14, 2010 21 Declaration of Alexander Rudis filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 15 Motion to Admit Verhoeven, Nelson, Johnson, DeFranco, Bauer and Rudis Pro Hac Vice filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Hansen, Scott) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
December 14, 2010 20 Declaration of Jennifer Bauer filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 15 Motion to Admit Verhoeven, Nelson, Johnson, DeFranco, Bauer and Rudis Pro Hac Vice filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Hansen, Scott)[Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
December 14, 2010 19 Declaration of David Nelson filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 15 Motion to Admit Verhoeven, Nelson, Johnson, DeFranco, Bauer and Rudis Pro Hac Vice filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Hansen, Scott) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
December 14, 2010 18 Declaration of Edward DeFranco filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 15 Motion to Admit Verhoeven, Nelson, Johnson, DeFranco, Bauer and Rudis Pro Hac Vice filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Hansen, Scott) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
December 14, 2010 17 Declaration of Kevin Johnson filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 15 Motion to Admit Verhoeven, Nelson, Johnson, DeFranco, Bauer and Rudis Pro Hac Vice filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Hansen, Scott) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
December 14, 2010 16 Declaration of Charles K. Verhoeven filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 15 Motion to Admit Verhoeven, Nelson, Johnson, DeFranco, Bauer and Rudis Pro Hac Vice filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Hansen, Scott) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
December 14, 2010 15 Motion to Admit Verhoeven, Nelson, Johnson, DeFranco, Bauer and Rudis Pro Hac Vice by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Hansen, Scott) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
December 14, 2010 14 Notice of Appearance Rebecca Frihart Kennedy filed by Rebecca Frihart Kennedy for Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
December 3, 2010 13 Reply to Counterclaim, COUNTERCLAIM against Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. by Counter Claimants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
December 2, 2010 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - '949 patent, # 2 Exhibit B - '002 patent, # 3 Exhibit C - '315 patent, # 4 Exhibit D - RE '486 patent, # 5 Exhibit E - '354 patent, # 6 Exhibit F - '263 patent, # 7 Exhibit G - '983 patent, # 8 Exhibit H - '705 patent, # 9 Exhibit I - '647 patent, # 10 Exhibit J - '852 patent, # 11 Exhibit K - '131 patent, # 12 Exhibit L - '337 patent, # 13 Exhibit M - '867 patent, # 14 Exhibit N - '721 patent, # 15 Exhibit O - '599 patent) (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 29, 2010 Case randomly reassigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 12, 2010 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Jacqueline Tatjana Harlow for Plaintiff Apple, Inc., Counter Defendant Apple, Inc. (Harlow, Jacqueline) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 12, 2010 10 Summons Returned Executed by Plainitiff Apple, Inc. Motorola, Inc. served on 11/2/2010, answer due 11/23/2010. (Peterson, James) Modified on 11/12/2010 from defendant to plaintiff as the filer. (vob). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 12, 2010 9 Summons Returned Executed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Motorola Mobility, Inc. served on 11/2/2010, answer due 11/23/2010. (Peterson, James) Modified on 11/12/2010 (vob) from defendant to plaintiff as the filer. [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 12, 2010 Telephone Pretrial Conference rescheduled from 12/10/2010 to 12/17/2010 at 09:30 AM to accommodate the court's calendar. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (vob) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 10, 2010 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 12/10/2010 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (vob) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 9, 2010 8 Certificate of Service by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Hansen, Scott) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 9, 2010 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Hansen, Scott) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 9, 2010 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Counter Claimant Motorola, Inc., Defendant Motorola, Inc. (Hansen, Scott) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 9, 2010 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Apple, Inc. by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Plaintiff Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Patent No. 5,311,516, # 2 Exhibit Patent No. 5,319,712, # 3 Exhibit Patent No. 5,490,230, # 4 Exhibit Patent No. 5,572,193, # 5 Exhibit Patent No. 6,175,559, # 6 Exhibit Patent No. 6,359,898) (Hansen, Scott) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 1, 2010 4 Summons Issued as to Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Motorola Mobility) (vob) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 1, 2010 3 Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (vob) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 1, 2010 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: Briefing Guidelines, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Order Regarding Assignment of Civil Cases, Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, Order on Dispositive Motions. (vob) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
November 1, 2010 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (vob) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
October 29, 2010 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]
October 29, 2010 1 PATENT COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 34690009112.) PATENTS AT ISSUE: Patent # 7,479,949, issued 01/20/2009, held by Apple Inc. ; Patent # 6,493,002, issued 12/10/2002, held by Apple Inc. ; Patent # 5,838,315, issued 11/17/1998, held by Apple Inc. ;, filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1 - US Patent 7,479,949, # 2 Exhibit A - Part 2 - US Patent 7,479,949, # 3 Exhibit B - US Patent 6,493,002, # 4 Exhibit C - US Patent 5,838,315, # 5 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action, # 6 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons - Motorola, Inc., # 8 Summons - Motorola Mobility, Inc.) (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 12/1/2011.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apple, Inc. v. Motorola, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine Cetrangolo
Represented By: Brian Chang
Represented By: Steven S. Cherensky
Represented By: Justin Constant
Represented By: Mark G. Davis
Represented By: Paul T. Ehrlich
Represented By: David M. Elihu
Represented By: Samuel F. Ernst
Represented By: Brian E. Ferguson
Represented By: Robert D. Fram
Represented By: Nathan A Greenblatt
Represented By: Azra Hadzimehmedovic
Represented By: Jacqueline T. Harlow
Represented By: Christine Saunders Haskett
Represented By: Robert T Haslam
Represented By: Jill J. Ho
Represented By: Kevin Sean Kudlac
Represented By: Lawrence Lien
Represented By: Rodney R. Miller
Represented By: Julian Moore
Represented By: Michael T Pieja
Represented By: Matthew Douglas Powers
Represented By: Danielle Shira Rosenthal
Represented By: Anupam Sharma
Represented By: James A Shimota
Represented By: Ranganath Sudarshan
Represented By: Winslow Blodgett Taub
Represented By: Rachelle Harley Thompson
Represented By: Robert P Watkins, Iii
Represented By: Elizabeth Stotland Weiswasser
Search News [