Kramer et al v. American Bank and Trust Company et al
Plaintiff: Kiril Trajcevski, Marc Kramer and Matt Nyman
Defendant: Harry S. Coin, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Julie Klaus, Dale Dollenbacher, Sharon Wheeler and James Allen
Case Number: 1:2011cv08758
Filed: December 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 710 FINAL APPROVAL ORDER signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 10/31/2019. Mailed notice(ef, )
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 709 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Fairness hearing held.For the reasons stated on the record, the Court finds that the proposed class settlement is fair, reasonable, and adequate, and otherwise satisfies the requirements set forth in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(e). Enter Final Approval Order. Jury trial set for 2/10/2019 is stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ef, )
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 708 MEMORANDUM memorandum in support of motion #702 by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hartmann, Steven)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 707 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT, INCENTIVE AWARDS, AND ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND AUTHORIZING NOTICE signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/9/2019. Mailed notice(ef, )
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 706 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiffs' agreed motion for approval of settlement, incentive awards and attorneys' fees and costs #701 is granted. Enter Preliminary Approval Order. The Court finds that the proposed class settlement meets the requirements for preliminary approval set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(e) Fairness hearing set for 10/31/2019 at 11:00 AM. In light of the parties' settlement, Plaintiffs' motion to alter or amend a judgment #673 , Defendant's motion to alter or amend judgment #674 , and Plaintiffs' motion to compel Defendant American Bank to Seasonably Supplement Discovery Materials #688 are denied without prejudice. Mailed notice (ef, )
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 705 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Preliminary Approval hearing held. Pursuant to the discussion held in open court and for the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs' agreed motion approval of settlement, incentive awards and attorneys' fees and costs #701 is taken under advisement. Plaintiffs shall submit a Word version of the revised proposed order granting preliminary approval to the Court's Proposed Order e-mailbox at Proposed_Order_Wood@ilnd.uscourts.gov within 24 hours. Mailed notice (ef, )
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 704 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Michael Hartmann for presentment of motion for settlement #701 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 8/8/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Hartmann, Steven)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 703 AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski in Support of MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski for settlement Plaintiffs' Agreed Motion for Approval of Settlement, Incentive Awards and Attorneys' Fees and Costs #701 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hartmann, Steven)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 702 MEMORANDUM by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski in support of motion for settlement #701 (Hartmann, Steven)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 701 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski for settlement Plaintiffs' Agreed Motion for Approval of Settlement, Incentive Awards and Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hartmann, Steven)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 700 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: By request and agreement of the parties, the Preliminary Approval hearing set for 8/7/2019 is stricken and reset for 8/8/2019 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 699 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing held. Pursuant to the discussion held in open court, Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary approval shall be filed by 7/26/2019. Preliminary Approval hearing set for 8/7/2019 at 9:30 AM. NOTE DATE CHANGE. Mailed notice (ef, )
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 698 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Agreed Motion to modify expert disclosure schedule #696 is granted. Plaintiffs shall serve and file their expert disclosures regarding damages by 6/3/2019. The motion presentment date of 5/16/2019 is stricken; parties need not appear. Status hearing set for 5/30/2019 is stricken and reset for 7/16/2019 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 697 NOTICE of Motion by Timothy J. McCaffrey for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #696 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 5/16/2019 at 09:00 AM. (McCaffrey, Timothy)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 696 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevskito Modify Expert Disclosure Schedule (Agreed) (McCaffrey, Timothy)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 695 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: The parties informed the Court that the case is ready to be set for trial. Accordingly, jury trial set for 2/10/2020 at 9:00 AM. The parties are advised that Judge Wood's courtroom is equipped with an integrated electronic evidence presentation system. Parties will no longer be permitted to bring their own projection or audio-visual equipment to display evidence electronically during trial. Any party desiring to use the Court's electronic evidence presentation system must confirm by e-mailing Judge Wood's courtroom deputy that the person who will be operating the equipment either (1) has participated in a training session with the Systems Department, or (2) does not require training because they have used the system for a trial in this courthouse previously. Parties may arrange for training by contacting the Systems Department at (312) 435-5555. Mailed notice (ef, )
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 694 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 01/31/2019 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Order Number: 33567. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2019. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 693 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion and Status hearing held. By 3/20/2019, Defendant shall produce employment agreements, amounts paid, and commissions paid on a per loan basis for the remaining 64 class members. By 5/20/2019, Plaintiffs shall serve and file their expert disclosures regarding damages. The courtroom deputy will contact the parties to provide proposed trial dates. Status hearing set for 5/30/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 692 RESPONSE by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to compel DEFENDANT AMERICAN BANK TO SEASONABLY SUPPLEMENT DISCOVERY MATERIALS #688 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Davidson, Cameron)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 691 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: By request and agreement of the parties, the motion and status hearing set for 2/26/2019 are stricken and reset for 3/6/2019 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 690 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Michael Hartmann for presentment of motion to compel #688 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 2/26/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Hartmann, Steven)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 689 EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski Exhibit B regarding MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to compel DEFENDANT AMERICAN BANK TO SEASONABLY SUPPLEMENT DISCOVERY MATERIALS #688 (Hartmann, Steven)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 688 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to compel DEFENDANT AMERICAN BANK TO SEASONABLY SUPPLEMENT DISCOVERY MATERIALS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hartmann, Steven)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 687 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing held. As stated on the record, the Court's written ruling on the parties pending motions #673 #674 shall issue in short order. The courtroom deputy will contact the parties to provide proposed trial dates. Status hearing set for 2/28/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 686 NOTICE by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski re other #685 of Filing Opt Out Letter of Gene Weis (Hartmann, Steven)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 685 Opt Out Letter of Gene Weis by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski (Hartmann, Steven)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 684 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing set for 1/8/2019 is stricken and reset for 1/31/2019 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 683 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing set for 12/20/2018 is stricken and reset for 1/8/2019 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 682 REPLY by Defendant American Bank and Trust Company, N.A. to motion to alter judgment #674 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Davidson, Cameron)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 681 RESPONSE by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to alter judgment or Amend Judment #673 (Davidson, Cameron)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 680 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to other #677 Letter to Judge Wood by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A (Batista, Katharine)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 679 RESPONSE by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevskiin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant American Bank and Trust Company, N.A. to alter judgment or Amend Judgment #674 (Batista, Katharine)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 678 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing held. The Court sets the following briefing schedule on the parties' cross motions to alter judgment #673 #674 : responses shall be filed by 11/14/2018 and replies shall be filed by 11/21/2018. Pursuant to the discussion held in open court, Defendant shall provide to Plaintiffs' counsel, no later than 11/6/2018, a list of the names and last-known addresses of all current and former Loan Officers employed by Defendant from 12/9/2001 to the present. The list shall include the time frame during which such current or former Loan Officer was employed. By 11/20/2018, Plaintiffs, through their counsel, shall send the Notice to Potential Class Members to the individuals identified by Defendant using the addresses provided, via United States First Class Mail. The putative Plaintiffs' opt-out letters must be postmarked by 1/15/2019 and filed with this Court by 1/29/2019. Status hearing set for 12/20/2018 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 677 Letter to Judge Wood by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A. (Davidson, Cameron)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 676 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of motion to alter judgment #674 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 11/7/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 675 Memorandum by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A. Defendant's Memo in Support of Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment (Davidson, Cameron)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 674 MOTION by Defendant American Bank and Trust Company, N.A. to alter judgment or Amend Judgment (Davidson, Cameron)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 673 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to alter judgment or Amend Judment (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Batista, Katharine)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 672 NOTICE of Motion by Katharine Thomas Batista for presentment of before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 11/7/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Batista, Katharine)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 671 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 9/25/2018 before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Order Number: 32310. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colette M. Kuemmeth (312) 554-8931 colette_kuemmeth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 11/8/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/16/2019. (Kuemmeth, Colette)
September 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 670 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/30/2018. Mailed notice(ef, )
September 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 669 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment #583 and Defendants' motion for summary judgment #608 are both denied. Mailed notice (aw,)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 668 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing held. The parties shall proceed with class notice according to Plaintiffs proposed plan for class notice #666 as modified in open court. Defendant shall provide to Plaintiffs' counsel, no later than 10/12/2018, a list of the names and last-known addresses of all current and former Loan Officers employed by Defendant from 12/9/2001 to the present. Defendant will post the Notification to Potential Class Members on its employee bulletin boards by 10/1/2018. By 11/2/2018, Plaintiffs, through their counsel, shall send the Notice to Potential Class Members to the individuals identified by Defendant using the addresses provided, via United States First Class Mail. The putative Plaintiffs' opt-out letters must be postmarked by 12/28/2018 and filed with this Court by 1/11/2019. Status hearing set for 10/30/2018 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 667 Parties' Joint Submission Regarding Further Discovery by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hartmann, Steven)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 666 Plaintiffs' Proposed Plan for Class Notice by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hartmann, Steven)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 665 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Hartmann, Steven)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 664 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 8/24/2018. Status hearing set for 9/25/2018 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice(ef, )
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 663 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing set for 7/18/2018 is stricken. Mailed notice (aw,)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 662 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing set for 6/20/2018 is stricken and reset for 7/18/2018 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 661 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing set for 5/30/2018 is stricken and reset for 6/20/2018 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 660 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time #658 is granted. The parties shall have until 7 days after the issuance of the Court's forthcoming Memorandum Opinions regarding Defendant's motion to reconsider or vacate #600 and Defendant's motion for summary judgment #608 to file their joint motion for approval of class notice and joint submission setting forth their respective positions regarding allowing further discovery. Motion hearing set for 5/13/2018 is stricken; parties need not appear. Status hearing set for 5/16/2018 is stricken and reset for 5/30/2018 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 659 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of extension of time #658 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 5/15/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 658 MOTION by Defendant American Bank and Trust Company, N.A. for extension of time Unopposed (Davidson, Cameron)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 657 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing held. By 5/11/2018, the parties shall file a joint motion for approval of class notice. Also by 5/11/2018, the parties shall make a joint submission setting forth their respective positions regarding allowing further discovery. Status hearing set for 5/16/2018 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (ao,)
March 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 656 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: For the reasons stated in the Memorandum Opinion to follow, Defendant's motion to reconsider or vacate the memorandum opinion and order of Judge Lee and to stay the summary judgment proceedings #600 is granted in part and denied in part. The Court has undertaken an independent assessment of class certification and determined that the decisions granting Plaintiff's motion for class certification and denying Defendants' motion to decertify the collective action should stand. Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Class Notice and Appointment of Class Counsel #602 and Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Defendant American Bank to Produce Class Member Contact Information and Compensation Documents and to Set Expert Schedule #604 are denied without prejudice. As Defendants' opposition to those motions appears to have been based, in part, on their hope that the classes would be de-certified, the Court directs the parties to meet and confer regarding the issues of class notice, appointment of class counsel, and production of class member contact information and compensation documents to see if agreements may be reached. If not, Plaintiffs may renew their motions as appropriate. Mailed notice. (aw,)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 655 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing set for 3/20/2018 is stricken and reset for 4/24/2018 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 654 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing set for 2/22/2018 is stricken and reset for 3/20/2018 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 653 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing set for 1/18/2018 is stricken and reset for 2/22/2018 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (ef, )
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 652 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing set for 12/12/2017 is stricken and reset for 1/18/2018 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 651 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Attorney application to appear pro hac vice #650 is granted. Mailed notice (ef, )
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 650 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13793355. (Batista, Katharine)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 649 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing set for 11/7/2017 is stricken and reset for 12/12/2017 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 648 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing set for 10/18/2017 is stricken and reset for 11/7/2017 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 647 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing set for 9/27/2017 is stricken and reset for 10/18/2017 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 646 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: By request and agreement of the parties, the Status hearing set for 9/21/2017 is stricken and reset for 9/27/2017 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 645 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion by counsel to withdraw as attorney #642 is granted. Attorney Daniel K. Touhy is withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiffs. The motion presentment date of 8/3/2017 is stricken. Parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 644 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel K. Touhy for presentment of Motion to Withdraw as Attorney #642 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 8/3/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Touhy, Daniel) (Docket Text modified by Clerks Office) Modified on 7/31/2017 (ew, ).
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 643 SEALED REPLY by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A. to Rule 56 statement #631 (Davidson, Cameron)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 642 MOTION by Attorney Daniel K. Touhy to withdraw as attorney for Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski. No party information provided (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Touhy, Daniel)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 641 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendant's Motion for leave to file under seal #639 is granted. The motion presentment date of 7/25/2017 is stricken. Parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 640 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of motion for leave to file #639 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 7/25/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 639 MOTION by Defendant American Bank and Trust Company, N.A. for leave to file Under Seal (Davidson, Cameron)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 638 REPLY by Defendant American Bank and Trust Company, N.A. to Rule 56 statement #631 Plaintiffs' Supplemental Statement of Facts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits MM-OO)(Davidson, Cameron)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 637 REPLY by Defendant American Bank and Trust Company, N.A. to motion for summary judgment #608 Defendant American Bank's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment (Davidson, Cameron)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 636 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendant's Motion for extension of time to file response/reply #634 is granted. Defendants' combined reply in support of their cross motion shall be filed by 7/21/2017. The motion presentment date of 7/13/2017 is stricken. Parties need not appear. Status hearing set for 9/12/2017 is stricken and reset for 9/21/2017 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 635 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #634 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 7/13/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 634 MOTION by Defendant American Bank and Trust Company, N.A. for extension of time to file response/reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Davidson, Cameron)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 633 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion hearing held. Pursuant to the discussion held in open court, Plaintiffs' agreed motion to voluntarily dismiss claims against individual defendants #628 is granted subject to the parties' satisfaction of Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(e) requirements. Status hearing set for 9/12/2017 #599 remains firm. Mailed notice (ef, )
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 632 APPENDIX (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 41-59, #2 Exhibit 60-65)(Rancier, April)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 631 RULE 56 (a) Statement in Opposition to Defendants' Rule 56.1 Statement and in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (Rancier, April)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 630 MEMORANDUM by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski in Opposition to motion for summary judgment #583 , motion for summary judgment #608 Plaintiffs' Consolidated Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion and in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (Rancier, April)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 629 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Michael Hartmann for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #628 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 6/21/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Hartmann, Steven)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 628 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski Plaintiffs' Agreed Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Claims Against Individual Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hartmann, Steven)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 627 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiffs' Motion to file enlarged combined brief #625 is granted. The motion presentment date of 6/15/2017 is stricken. Parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 626 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Michael Hartmann for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #625 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 6/15/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Hartmann, Steven)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 625 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to File Enlarged Combined Brief (Hartmann, Steven)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 624 Joint Reassignment Report by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski (Hartmann, Steven)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 623 REPLY by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler to response in opposition to motion, #606 to Reconsider or Vacate the Memorandum Opinion and Order of Judge John Z. Lee (Davidson, Cameron)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 622 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler Exhibit K in Response to Plaintiff's Rule 56.1 Statement (Davidson, Cameron)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 621 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion hearing held. Defendants' reply to motion to vacate #600 shall be filed by 6/6/2017. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs' motion for approval of class #602 and motion to compel #604 are entered and continued to the next status hearing. Defendants' motion for leave to file exhibit under seal #619 is granted. The parties' joint reassignment status report shall be filed by 6/7/2017. Status hearing set for 9/12/2017 #599 remains firm. Mailed notice (ef, )
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 620 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of motion for leave to file #619 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 5/23/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 619 MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler for leave to file Exhibit Under Seal (Davidson, Cameron)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 618 APPENDIX Response #616 Exhibits A-LL to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Facts in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Res. Exhibits A-G, #2 Exhibit Res. Exhibits H-L, #3 Exhibit Res. Exhibits L-R, #4 Exhibit Resp. Exhibits S-Z, #5 Exhibit Resp. Exhibits AA-LL)(Davidson, Cameron)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 617 NOTICE by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler re Response #616 (Davidson, Cameron)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 616 RESPONSE by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler to statement in support #585 of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (Davidson, Cameron)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 615 APPENDIX statement #610 Exhibits EE-LL and Ind. Ex. A-V to Defendants' Statement of Facts in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EE, #2 Exhibit FF-LL, #3 Exhibit Ind. Ex. A-V)(Davidson, Cameron)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 614 APPENDIX statement #610 Exhibits A-DD to Defendants' Statement of Facts in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-O, #2 Exhibit P-DD)(Davidson, Cameron)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 613 NOTICE by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler re memorandum, #612 (Davidson, Cameron)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 612 MEMORANDUM by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment and Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (Davidson, Cameron)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 611 NOTICE by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler re statement #610 (Davidson, Cameron)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 610 Statement of Facts in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment STATEMENT by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler (Davidson, Cameron)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 609 NOTICE by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler re MOTION by Defendants Julie Klaus, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Sharon Wheeler, Dale Dollenbacher for summary judgment #608 (Davidson, Cameron)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 608 MOTION by Defendants Julie Klaus, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Sharon Wheeler, Dale Dollenbacher for summary judgment (Davidson, Cameron)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 607 NOTICE by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski re response in opposition to motion, #606 (Hartmann, Steven)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 606 RESPONSE by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevskiin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler to vacate Reconsider or Vacate Judge John Z. Lee Memorandum Opinion and Order and to Stay Summary Judgment Proceedings #600 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hartmann, Steven)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 605 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Michael Hartmann for presentment of motion to compel, #604 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 5/23/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Hartmann, Steven)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 604 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to compel Defendant American Bank to Produce Class Member Contact Information and Compensation Documents and to Set Expert Schedule (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hartmann, Steven)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 603 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Michael Hartmann for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #602 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 5/23/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Hartmann, Steven)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 602 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski for Approval of Class Notice and Appointment of Class Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hartmann, Steven)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 601 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of motion to vacate, #600 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 5/23/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 600 MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler to vacate Reconsider or Vacate Judge John Z. Lee Memorandum Opinion and Order and to Stay Summary Judgment Proceedings (Davidson, Cameron)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 599 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Notwithstanding the recent reassignment of this case to Judge Wood, the briefing schedule previously set for the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment (see Dkt. No. #593 ) shall remain in place. Status hearing set for 9/12/2017 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 598 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood for all further proceedings. Honorable John Z. Lee no longer assigned to the case pursuant to IOP 13(f)(2)(b). Signed by Executive Committee on 5/11/2017. (ph, )
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 597 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The notice of withdrawal as co-counsel for Defendants #595 is granted. Melissa Anne Siebert, Joel Griswold and John Conlaeth McIlwee are granted leave to withdraw as counsel. Mailed notice (ca, )
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 596 NOTICE of Motion by Melissa Anne Siebert for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney, #595 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 5/16/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Siebert, Melissa)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 595 MOTION by Attorney Melissa A. Siebert, Joel Griswold and John Conlaeth McIlwee to withdraw as attorney for James Allen, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler. No party information provided (Siebert, Melissa)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 594 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski Sealed Exhibits (Rancier, April)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 593 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The Court grants Plaintiffs' motion to file the confidential payroll records and emails exhibits to their summary judgment motion under seal #591 . The Court sets the following streamlined briefing schedule on the parties cross-motions for summary judgment. The Defendant Bank and Individual Defendants' summary judgment filings shall be combined. Defendants' combined brief, limited to 36 pages, in response to Plaintiffs' summary judgment motion and in support of Defendants' cross motion, is due on or before May 19, 2017. Defendants combined LR 56.1(a)(3) and LR 56.1(b)(3)(C) Statement is limited to 85 statements of fact. Plaintiffs' reply in support of their motion and response to Defendants' combined cross motion shall be due on or before June 16, 2017. Defendants' combined reply in support of their cross motion shall be due or before July 14, 2017. Because the Court has set this briefing schedule, no appearance on Plaintiffs' summary judgment motion #583 is necessary.Mailed notice (ca, )
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 592 NOTICE of Motion by April Michelle Rancier for presentment of motion to seal document, motion for relief #591 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 4/26/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Rancier, April)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 591 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to seal document appendix, #589 (Rancier, April)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 590 Letter by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski (Attachments: #1 Dep. Tr. of Dollenbacher Vol. 1, #2 Dep. Tr. of Dollenbacher Vol. 2, #3 Dep. Tr. of Boyles Part 1, #4 Dep. Tr. of Boyles Part 2, #5 Dep. Tr. of Kaye Part 1, #6 Dep. Tr. of Kaye Part 2, #7 Dep. Tr. of Stewart, #8 Dep. Tr. of Allen)(Rancier, April)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 589 APPENDIX statement in support #585 Exhibits to Plaintiffs' Rule 56.1 Statement of Undisputed Facts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10, #2 Exhibit 11-20, #3 Exhibit 21-30, #4 Exhibit 31-35, #5 Exhibit 36-40, #6 Exhibit 41)(Rancier, April)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 588 NOTICE by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski re memorandum in support of motion #587 (Hartmann, Steven)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 587 MEMORANDUM by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski in support of motion for summary judgment #583 (Hartmann, Steven)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 586 NOTICE by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski re statement in support #585 (Hartmann, Steven)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 585 STATEMENT by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevskiin Support of MOTION by Plaintiffs Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski, Marc Kramer for summary judgment #583 Of Undisputed Material Facts (Hartmann, Steven)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 584 NOTICE by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski re MOTION by Plaintiffs Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski, Marc Kramer for summary judgment #583 (Hartmann, Steven)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 583 MOTION by Plaintiffs Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski, Marc Kramer for summary judgment (Hartmann, Steven)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 582 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: In light of the issues addressed in the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order granting Plaintiffs' motion to certify classes under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(b)(3) and denying Defendants' motion to decertify the FLSA collective action, the Court strikes the parties' summary judgment motions #459 #497 #506 without prejudice so that the parties have an opportunity to amend the motions for summary judgment in light of the order. Plaintiffs' summary judgment motions as to Defendants are due April 21, 2017; Defendants' responses to Plaintiffs' motions and Defendants' cross-motions are due May 12, 2017; Plaintiffs' replies in support of their summary judgment motions and response to Defendants' cross-motions are due June 2, 2017; Defendants' replies in support of their cross-motions are due June 23, 2017. Mailed notice (ca, )
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 581 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 3/31/17. Mailed notice(ca, ).
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 580 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: For the reasons provided in the memorandum opinion and order, the Court grants Plaintiffs' motion for class certification pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(b)(3) regarding the state law claims #435 and denies Defendants' motion to decertify the conditionally certified FLSA collective action #445 . [For further details see memorandum opinion and order].Mailed notice (ca, )
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 579 NOTICE by Cameron A Davidson of Change of Address (Davidson, Cameron)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 578 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The hearing date scheduled for 2/14/17 is stricken. No appearance is required.Mailed notice (ca, )
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 577 ORDER : On March 30, 2016, this Court adopted in full Magistrate Judge Jeffrey Cole's Report and Recommendation (R&R) awarding Defendants attorneys' fees and costs as a sanction for Plaintiffs noncompliance with discovery requests. Magistrate Judge Susan Cox subsequently issued an R&R awarding Defendants $120,443.19 in attorneys' fees and $3,960.58 in costs. Plaintiffs object to the deadline for payment. Plaintiffs wish to defer payment of the sanction until the resolution of the case. Defendants oppose any deferral. For the reasons provided below, the Court adopts the R&R in full #528 , thereby granting Defendants motion for order #574 , granting Defendants petition for fees and costs #480 , and rejecting Plaintiffs' objections to the R&R #530 . Defendants are awarded $120,443.19 in attorneys' fees and $3,960.58 in costs to be payable within sixty days from the issuance of this order. Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 2/13/17. [For further details see order].Mailed notice(ca, )
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 576 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Defendants' motion requesting entry of order on Court ordered attorneys' fees and costs award #574 is entered and continued for 2/14/17 at 9:00 a.m. No appearance is required on 2/1/17.Mailed notice (ca, )
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 575 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of motion for order #574 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 2/1/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 574 MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler for order on Court Ordered Attorneys' Fees and Costs Award (Davidson, Cameron)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 573 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Susan E. Cox: All matters relating to the referral of this action are resolved; case returned to the assigned judge. Referral terminated. Mailed notice (np, )
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski by Steven Michael Hartmann (Hartmann, Steven)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 571 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiff's motion for leave to substitute counsel #569 is granted. Terrence Buehler is granted leave to withdraw as counsel. Substitute counsel Steven Hartmann and Timothy McCaffrey should file their appearances. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 570 NOTICE of Motion by Terrence Buehler for presentment of motion to substitute attorney #569 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 12/14/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Buehler, Terrence)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 569 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to substitute attorney (Buehler, Terrence)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 568 SEALED RESPONSE by Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler to Rule 56 statement #551 of Supplemental Facts (Davidson, Cameron)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 567 SEALED RESPONSE by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A. to Rule 56 statement #542 of Supplemental Facts (Davidson, Cameron)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 566 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Defendants' motion for leave to file under seal #562 is granted. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 565 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The motion hearing set for 11/1/16 is reset to 11/2/16 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 564 JOINT POSITION STATEMENT by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler (Davidson, Cameron)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 563 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of motion for leave to file #562 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 11/1/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 562 MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler for leave to file Documents Under Seal (Davidson, Cameron)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 561 RESPONSE by Defendants Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler to Rule 56 statement #551 of Supplemental Facts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit W-Z)(Davidson, Cameron)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 560 REPLY by Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler to response in opposition to motion #543 for Summary Judgment (Davidson, Cameron)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 559 RESPONSE by Defendant American Bank and Trust Company, N.A. to Rule 56 statement #542 of Supplemental Facts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MM-TT)(Davidson, Cameron)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 558 REPLY by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A. to response in opposition to motion, #541 for Summary Judgment (Davidson, Cameron)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 557 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The Court orders the parties to file a joint position statement by October 29, 2016, stating the following: (1) the number and names of individuals who have opted into the conditionally certified FLSA collective action, and (2) an estimate as to the number of absent putative class members in Illinois that are part of Plaintiffs' proposed Rule 23(b)(3) class. Mailed notice (ca, )
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 556 SEALED RESPONSE by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to Rule 56 statement #551 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6 - Sealed)(Pallozzi, Angela)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 555 SEALED RESPONSE by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to response in opposition to motion #543 (Pallozzi, Angela)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 554 SEALED RESPONSE by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to Rule 56 statement #542 (Pallozzi, Angela)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 553 SEALED RESPONSE by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to response in opposition to motion, #541 (Pallozzi, Angela)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 552 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiff's motion for extension of time to file plaintiffs' opposition to individual defendants' Rule 56.1 statement with exhibits #545 is granted. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal certain documents filed in support of Plaintiffs' opposition to individual defendants' motion for summary judgment #547 #549 are granted. Plaintiffs are given leave to file an unredacted reply brief and an unredacted LR 56.1 statement under seal and shall file redacted public versions as well. No appearance is necessary on the motions.Mailed notice (ca, )
October 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 551 RULE 56 (c) Statement Amended Opposition to Rule 56.1 Statement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5)(Pallozzi, Angela)
October 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 550 NOTICE of Motion by April Michelle Rancier for presentment of motion to seal #549 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 10/6/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Rancier, April)
October 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 549 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to seal certain portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Individual Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Rancier, April)
October 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 548 NOTICE of Motion by April Michelle Rancier for presentment of motion to seal #547 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 10/6/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Rancier, April)
October 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 547 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to seal certain portions of Plaintiffs' Consolidated Brief in Reply/Opposition to Defendant AB&T's Motion for Summary Judgment (Rancier, April)
October 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 546 NOTICE of Motion by Angela Davis Pallozzi for presentment of extension of time #545 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 10/6/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Pallozzi, Angela)
October 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 545 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski for extension of time (Pallozzi, Angela)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 544 RULE 56 (c) Statement Opposition to Defendants 56.1 (Pallozzi, Angela)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 543 RESPONSE by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevskiin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Julie Klaus, Harry S. Coin, Sharon Wheeler, Dale Dollenbacher for summary judgment #506 (Pallozzi, Angela)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 542 RULE 56 56.1(c) Statement in Opposition to Defendants 56.1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 41-59, #3 Exhibit 60-65)(Pallozzi, Angela)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 541 RESPONSE by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevskiin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Julie Klaus, Harry S. Coin, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Dale Dollenbacher, Sharon Wheeler for summary judgment and Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment #497 Consolidated Reply/Opposition MSJ (Pallozzi, Angela)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 540 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiffs have filed a motion for class certification under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23, and Defendant has filed a motion to decertify the FLSA collective action. Due to the issues raised in the motions, the Court will rule on the motion for class certification in conjunction with the motion to decertify. Mailed notice (ca, )
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 539 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiffs' consent motion for extension of time for summary judgment briefing #537 is granted. Plaintiff's brief is due by 9/30/16; Defendant's reply is due by 10/28/16; no further extensions will be granted. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 538 Plaintiffs' Consent NOTICE of Motion by April Michelle Rancier for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #537 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 9/15/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Rancier, April)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 537 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski for extension of time to file response/reply (Consent Motion) (Rancier, April)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 536 RESPONSE by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler to other #530 Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Report and Recommendation Dated July 25, 2016 (Davidson, Cameron)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 535 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time #531 is granted. Plaintiff's brief is due by 9/16/16; Defendant's reply is due by 10/14/16.Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time #533 is granted. Defendant's response to Plaintiff's objection is due by 8/26/16. No appearance is required on the motions.Mailed notice (ca, )
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 534 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of extension of time #533 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 8/25/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 533 MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler for extension of time Unopposed (Davidson, Cameron)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 532 Plaintiffs' Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by April Michelle Rancier for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #531 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 8/24/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Rancier, April)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 531 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski for extension of time to file response/reply (Rancier, April)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 530 Objections to Magistrate Judge Cox's Report and Recommendation by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski (Rancier, April)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 529 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion for extension of time for summary judgment briefing schedule #526 is granted. Plaintiffs reply in support of Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment and opposition to the individual defendants motion for summary judgment shall be due by 8/26/16; Defendants reply briefs are due by 9/23/16. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 528 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Presently before the Court is Defendants' Petition for Award of Court Ordered Attorneys' Fees and Costs [Dkt. #480 ]. For the reasons discussed more fully below, the Court recommends that Defendants' petition be granted and that an award of $120,443.19 in attorneys' fees and $3,960.58 in costs be entered. Within 14 days after being served with a copy of the recommended disposition, a party may serve and file specific written objections to the proposed findings and recommendations. A party may respond to another party's objections within 14 days after being served with a copy. Unless the district judge orders otherwise, the objecting party must promptly arrange for transcribing the record, or whatever portions of it the parties agree to or the magistrate judge considers sufficient. [For further details see order] - Signed by the Honorable Susan E. Cox on 7/25/2016. Mailed notice (np, )
July 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 527 NOTICE of Motion by Angela Davis Pallozzi for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief #526 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 8/2/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Pallozzi, Angela)
July 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 526 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for summary judgment #506 (Pallozzi, Angela)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 525 SEALED REPLY by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler to response in opposition to motion, #514 In Support of Court Ordered Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Davidson, Cameron)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 524 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Susan E. Cox: Defendant's motion for leave to file under seal documents in support of their fee petition #520 is granted. No appearance required on 7/12/2016 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (np, )
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 523 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The status hearing set for 7/12/16 is stricken, the Court will rule by mail on the pending motion for summary judgment.Mailed notice (ca, )
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 522 REPLY by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler to response in opposition to motion, #514 for Court Ordered Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Davidson, Cameron)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 521 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of motion for leave to file #520 before Honorable Susan E. Cox on 7/12/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 520 MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler for leave to file Under Seal (Davidson, Cameron)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 519 SEALED RESPONSE by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to MOTION by Defendants James Allen, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus for attorney fees Petition for Award of Court Ordered Attorneys' Fees and Costs #480 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pallozzi, Angela)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 518 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Susan E. Cox: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file un-redacted opposition and exhibit to Defendants' fee petition under seal #512 is granted. No appearance required on 6/22/2016 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (np, )
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 517 NOTICE by Wright David Jeffrey of Change of Address (Firm Name Change Only) (Jeffrey, Wright)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 516 NOTICE by Cameron A Davidson of Change of Address (Firm Name Change Only) (Davidson, Cameron)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 515 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants James Allen, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler (Siebert, Melissa)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 514 RESPONSE by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevskiin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants James Allen, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus for attorney fees Petition for Award of Court Ordered Attorneys' Fees and Costs #480 Redacted (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion to Seal Pending, #2 Exhibit B)(Pallozzi, Angela)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 513 NOTICE of Motion by Angela Davis Pallozzi for presentment of motion to seal document #512 before Honorable Susan E. Cox on 6/22/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Pallozzi, Angela)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 512 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to seal document (Pallozzi, Angela)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 511 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Susan E. Cox: Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Opposition and Defendants' Reply #509 is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. Plaintiff's brief is due 6/17/16. Defendants' brief is due 7/1/16. No further extensions will be granted. No appearance required on 6/21/2016 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (np, )
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 510 Notice of Plaintiffs' Agreed Motion NOTICE of Motion by April Michelle Rancier for presentment of motion for extension of time to file #509 before Honorable Susan E. Cox on 6/21/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Rancier, April)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 509 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski for extension of time to file Plaintiffs' Opposition and Defendants' Reply (agreed motion) (Rancier, April)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 508 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Individual Defendants' motion for extension of time to file motion for summary judgment #500 is granted. Defendant's motion for leave to file under seal documents in support of their response to plaintiff's Rule 56.1 Statement #504 is granted. No appearance is required on the motions. Mailed notice (ca, )
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 507 RULE 56 Statement by Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler regarding motion for summary judgment #506 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-V)(Davidson, Cameron)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 506 MOTION by Defendants Julie Klaus, Harry S. Coin, Sharon Wheeler, Dale Dollenbacher for summary judgment (Davidson, Cameron)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 505 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of motion to seal document #504 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 6/16/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 504 MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler to seal document Exhibit K in Support of Response to Plaintiffs' Rule 56.1 Statement (Davidson, Cameron)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 503 AMENDED statement #498 Amended Exhibits - Exhibit Y (Davidson, Cameron)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 502 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of motion for extension of time to file #500 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 6/16/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 501 APPENDIX Response, #499 Index of Exhibits to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Rule 56 Statement (Davidson, Cameron)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 500 MOTION by Defendants Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler for extension of time to file Motion for Summary Judgment (Davidson, Cameron)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 499 RESPONSE by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler to Rule 56 statement, #460 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G, #2 Exhibit H-K, #3 Exhibit L-R, #4 Exhibit S-Z, #5 Exhibit AA-LL)(Davidson, Cameron)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 498 Local Rule 56.1 Statement of Material Facts STATEMENT by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-O, #2 Exhibit P-DD, #3 Exhibit EE, #4 Exhibit FF-LL)(Davidson, Cameron)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 497 MOTION by Defendants Julie Klaus, Harry S. Coin, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Dale Dollenbacher, Sharon Wheeler for summary judgment and Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (Davidson, Cameron)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 496 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Susan E. Cox: Plaintiffs' uncontested motion for extension of time #492 is granted. The following amended briefing schedule is set for Defendant's petition #480 : Plaintiff's brief in opposition is due by 6/15/2016. Defendant's reply brief in support is due by 6/29/2016. No appearance necessary on 5/31/2016 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (np, )
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 495 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants James Allen, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 2)(Siebert, Melissa)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 494 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants James Allen, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 2)(Siebert, Melissa)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 493 Plaintiffs' Uncontested NOTICE of Motion by April Michelle Rancier for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief #492 before Honorable Susan E. Cox on 5/31/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Rancier, April)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 492 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for attorney fees, #480 (Rancier, April)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 491 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Susan E. Cox: Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Their Fee Petition #482 is granted. The following briefing schedule is set for Defendants' Petition for Award of Court Ordered Attorneys' Fees and Costs #480 : Plaintiff's brief in opposition is due 6/1/16. The Court cautions the Plaintiff to confine its argument to the appropriateness of the amount of the petition for fees and costs, and not to re-argue the merits of any motions or matters already decided. Defendants' reply brief in support is due 6/15/16. No appearance required on 5/25/2016 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (np, )
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 490 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Motion hearing held on 5/18/16. Defendants' corrected unopposed motion for leave to file summary judgment motions and for extension of time to respond to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment #486 is granted. Defendant American Bank and Trust's cross-motion for summary judgment and consolidated brief in opposition to Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment and in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment are due by 6/10/16; the brief is limited to 25 pages; Plaintiffs brief in reply in support of his motion for summary judgment and in opposition to Defendant AB&T's cross motion for summary judgment is due by 8/5/16 and is limited to 25 pages; AB&Ts in support of its motion for summary judgment is due by 9/2/16. The individual Defendant's consolidated motion for summary judgment is due by 6/10/16; Plaintiff's response is due by 8/5/16; Defendant's reply is due by 9/2/16. Defendants' motion for extension of time #484 is moot.Mailed notice (ca, )
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 489 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Susan E. Cox: This matter has been referred to Magistrate Judge Cox to conduct necessary proceedings and issue a report and recommendation regarding motions #480 and #482 . Motion Hearing set for 5/25/2016 at 09:30 AM. The parties are to review and comply with this Court's standing order on motion practice which is available through the Court's webpage, www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (np, )
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 488 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Signed by Executive Committee on 05/13/2016.(sr, )
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 487 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Defendants' petition for award of court ordered attorneys' fees and costs #480 and Defendants' motion for leave to file under seal documents in support of their fee petition #482 are referred to a Magistrate Judge, a Executive Order will follow. Mailed notice (ca, )
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 486 MOTION by Defendants James Allen, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler to amend/correct MOTION by Defendants James Allen, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler for extension of time Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Summary Judgment Motions and for Extension of Time to Resp #484 (Davidson, Cameron)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 485 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of extension of time, #484 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 5/18/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 484 MOTION by Defendants James Allen, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler for extension of time Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Summary Judgment Motions and for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (Davidson, Cameron)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 483 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of motion to seal #482 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 5/18/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 482 MOTION by Defendants James Allen, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler to seal documents in support of their fee petition (Davidson, Cameron)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 481 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of motion for attorney fees, #480 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 5/18/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 480 MOTION by Defendants James Allen, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Sharon Wheeler, Julie Klaus for attorney fees Petition for Award of Court Ordered Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix to Defendants' Petition for Award of Court Ordered Attorneys' Fees and Costs)(Davidson, Cameron) Docket text modified by Clerk's Office on 5/12/2016 (mmy, )
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 479 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The status hearing set for 5/12/16 is reset to 7/12/16 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 478 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Minute order #477 is amended: Plaintiff's reply is extended until 6/13/16. Mailed notice (ca, )
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 477 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Defendants' motion to strike is stricken as moot #471 because the Court, as a matter of course, in ruling on a summary judgment motion determines whether a statement of fact complies with the local rule, without prompting from any party. Defendants' shall therefore respond to Plaintiffs' statement of facts on the merits. Defendants' motion for extension of time #473 is granted in part and denied in part, with a final extension to and including May 20, 2016. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Mailed notice (ca, )
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 476 Corrected NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of extension of time #473 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 4/27/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 475 Corrected NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of motion to strike #471 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 4/27/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 474 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of (Davidson, Cameron)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 473 MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler for extension of time (Davidson, Cameron)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 472 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of (Davidson, Cameron)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 471 MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler to strike (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-M)(Davidson, Cameron)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 470 Exhibit by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler Exhibits WW-KKK in Support of Motion to Decertify Collective Action (Davidson, Cameron)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 469 REPLY by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler to Response, #456 , MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klausto Decertify Collective Action #445 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TT-VV)(Davidson, Cameron)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 468 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski Sealed Exhibits for Plaintiffs' Rule 56.1(a)(3) Statement regarding Summary Judgment (Pallozzi, Angela)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 467 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski Sealed Exhibits for Plaintiffs' Reply to Opposition to Motion to Certify under Rule 23 (Pallozzi, Angela)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 466 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski Sealed Exhibits for Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Decertify (Pallozzi, Angela)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER: After Plaintiffs were ordered to produce certain discovery materials and to supplement their disclosures relating to damages, it took them up to four months to do so. Defendants moved for sanctions, and the Court referred the motion to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey Cole. He recommended granting the motion to the extent that Defendants sought attorneys fees and costs. Before the Court is Plaintiffs' objection to that recommendation. For the reasons provided herein, the Court rejects Plaintiffs' objection and adopts the recommendation in full. Plaintiffs are ordered to pay the attorneys' fees and costs incurred by Defendants in their efforts to obtain the discovery in question. Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 3/30/16. [For further details see order.]Mailed notice(ca, )
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 464 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file certain exhibits under seal #454 #457 #462 are granted. Defendant's response to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment #459 is due by 4/28/16; reply due by 5/12/16; ruling will be by mail. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 463 NOTICE of Motion by Angela Davis Pallozzi for presentment of motion to seal document, motion for relief #462 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 4/5/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Pallozzi, Angela)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 462 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to seal document Rule 56 statement, #460 Motion for Leave to File Select Exhibits Under Seal (Pallozzi, Angela)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 461 NOTICE of Motion by Angela Davis Pallozzi for presentment of motion for summary judgment #459 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 4/5/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Pallozzi, Angela)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 460 RULE 56 56.1(a)(3) Statement by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski regarding motion for summary judgment #459 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1-10, #3 Exhibit 11-20, #4 Exhibit 21-30, #5 Exhibit 31-35, #6 Exhibit 36-40)(Pallozzi, Angela)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 459 MOTION by Plaintiffs Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski, Marc Kramer for summary judgment (Pallozzi, Angela)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 458 NOTICE of Motion by Angela Davis Pallozzi for presentment of motion to seal document, motion for relief #457 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 4/5/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Pallozzi, Angela)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 457 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to seal document Response, #456 Mo (Pallozzi, Angela)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 456 MEMORANDUM by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski of law in opposition to Defendants' Motion to decertify collective action #445 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1-10, #3 Exhibit 11-20, #4 Exhibit 21-30, #5 Exhibit 31-34, #6 Exhibit 35-40, #7 Exhibit 41-46) (Pallozzi, Angela) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 3/21/2016 (jh, ).
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 455 NOTICE of Motion by Angela Davis Pallozzi for presentment of motion to seal document, motion for relief #454 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 4/5/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Pallozzi, Angela)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 454 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to seal document reply to response to motion #453 Motion for Leave to File Select Exhibits Under Seal (Pallozzi, Angela)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 453 REPLY by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to response in opposition to motion, #441 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-20)(Pallozzi, Angela)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 452 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: In light of the pending motions, the status hearing set for 2/25/16 is reset to 5/12/16 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 451 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiffs' agreed motion for extension of time and leave to file brief in excess of 15 pages #449 is granted. Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Decertify Plaintiffs FLSA Class and Plaintiffs Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Class is due by March 18, 2016; Defendants Reply Brief in Support of Defendants Motion to Decertify Plaintiffs FLSA Class is due by April 8, 2016. The request for the excess pages is granted. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 450 NOTICE of Motion by April Michelle Rancier for presentment of extension of time #449 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 2/17/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Rancier, April)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 449 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski for extension of time and Leave to File Brief in Excess of 15 Pages (Rancier, April)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 448 EXHIBITS by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klausto (Davidson, Cameron) (Docket Text Modified by the Clerk's Office on 1/25/2016). (sxn, ).
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 447 EXHIBITS by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus (Davidson, Cameron) (Docket Text Modified by the Clerk's Office on 1/25/2016) (sxn, ). Modified on 1/25/2016 (sxn, ).
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 446 EXHIBITS by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus (Davidson, Cameron) (Docket Text Modified by the Clerk's Office on 1/25/2016) (sxn, ).
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 445 MEMORANDUM in support of motion to decertify collective action by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klausto (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-M)(Davidson, Cameron) (Docket Text Modified by the Clerk's Office on 1/25/2016) (sxn, ).
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 444 RESPONSE by James Allen, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klausin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to certify class #435 Exhibit AA (Davidson, Cameron)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 443 RESPONSE by James Allen, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klausin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to certify class #435 EXHIBITS Y THROUGH Z (Davidson, Cameron)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 442 RESPONSE by James Allen, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klausin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to certify class #435 EXHIBITS P TO X (Davidson, Cameron)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 441 RESPONSE by James Allen, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klausin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to certify class #435 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to O)(Davidson, Cameron)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 440 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The Court grants in part and denies in part Defendants' motion for extension of time and leave to file brief in excess of 15 pages #438 . The motion is granted to the extent that Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' motion for class certification and Defendants' motion for decertification on the FLSA collective action, each limited to 22 pages, are now due on or before 1/22/16; Plaintiff's reply in support of the motion for class certification and response to Defendants' motion for decertification are now due on or before 2/19/16; and Defendants' reply in support of decertification is now due on or before 3/4/16. In all other respects, the motion is denied. No appearance on the motion is necessary.Mailed notice (ca, )
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 439 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of extension of time #438 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/7/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 438 MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler for extension of time and Leave to File Brief in Excess of 15 Pages (Davidson, Cameron)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 437 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The notice of motion #436 for the motion to certify class is stricken. A briefing schedule was previously entered on the motion, and therefore there is no need to appear on the motion. Mailed notice (air, )
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 436 NOTICE of Motion by April Michelle Rancier for presentment of motion to certify class, #435 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 11/18/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Rancier, April)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 435 MOTION by Plaintiffs Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to certify class Responses due by 1/8/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Rancier, April)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 434 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Status hearing held on 11/3/15. Plaintiff's motion for class certification is due by 11/13/15; response due by 1/8/16; reply due by 2/5/16. Defendant's motion for decertification on the FLSA collective action is due by 1/8/16; response due by 2/5/16; reply due by 2/19/16. Status hearing set for 2/25/16 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 433 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Upon receiving the parties' respective submissions in advance of the settlement conference scheduled for 10/14/15, it was immediately apparent that the parties' respective views of the case -- and especially their views about the amounts they might be willing to give and take in order to settle the case -- were so dramatically far apart that a serious question was raised as to whether a settlement conference would have any remote prospect of success. And if it did not, it ought not take place. Not only would that needlessly take counsel's time, but it would needlessly occupy the time of the court. And every hour needlessly spent on a case is an hour that is taken away from other litigants who require the court's attention. See Chicago Observer, Inc. v. City of Chicago, 929 F.2d 325, 329 (7th Cir.1991) (Litigation is costly not only for the litigants but also for parties in other cases waiting in the queue for judicial attention.). Accordingly, I held a telephone conference with counsel in which I asked them to confer and see whether there was any flexibility in their respective positions. With commendable candor, counsel called me this morning to report that despite what I am confident were their genuine efforts to bridge what is plainly an insurmountable chasm, they were unable to make any progress and that they had concluded that a settlement conference would be utterly unproductive. Of course, parties cannot and ought not be pressured into settlements that they believe are not warranted. Goss Graphics Sys., Inc. v. Dev Indus., Inc., 267 F.3d 624, 627 (7th Cir. 2001); Tsironis v.Bismarck Hotel, 1996 WL 15830, at *2 (7th Cir. 1996);. Strandell v. Jackson County, Illinois, 838 F.2d 884,887 (7th Cir. 1988). Since discovery is closed, the referral is closed and the case returned to Judge Lee. Judge Honorable Jeffrey Cole no longer referred to the case.Mailed notice (jms, )
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 432 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiff's motion to seal Exhibit K #431 is granted. Counsel is reminded that all motions should be noticed up for presentment. Mailed notice (ca, )
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 431 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to seal document exhibit,, #425 Motion to Seal Exhibit K to Docket Entry 425 (Pallozzi, Angela)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 430 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on August 18, 2015 before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Court Reporter Contact Information: Ms. Joene Hanhardt, Official Court Reporter, 219 S. Dearborn St., Suite 1744-A, Chicago, Illinois 60604, 312-435-6874. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/15/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/26/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2015. (Hanhardt, Joene)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 429 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 8/26/2015 before the Honorable John Z. Lee. Court Reporter Contact Information: ALEXANDRA ROTH, alexandra_roth@ilnd.uscourts.gov (312) 408-5038. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/13/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/22/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2015. (Roth, Alexandra)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 428 RESPONSE by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler to report and recommendations #421 , other #424 Response to Plaintiffs' Objections (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)(Siebert, Melissa)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 427 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Settlement Conference is set for 10/14/2015 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1003. The parties shall comply with this court's Standing Order for Settlement Conference, which appears on the court's website and which counsel must review. Plaintiff's counsel shall submit copies of both plaintiff's settlement demand letter as well as defendant's response letter to chambers, room 1010 by 10/7/2015. The parties are reminded that compliance with Local Rule 5.2 (d) and (f) is required and the parties' respective submissions must have exhibits separated by protruding tabs as required by Local Rule 5.2. Mailed notice (jms, )
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 426 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: On 8/18/2015, an order was entered directing the parties to call chambers by 8/26/2015 if they believed a settlement conference would be productive. As of 3:44pm today no call has been received. If the parties do not call by 12:00 pm on 9/4/2015, the referral will be closed and the case returned to Judge Lee.Mailed notice (jms, )
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 425 EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski EXHIBITS TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO THE AUGUST 17, 2015 REPORT AND REOMMENDATION OF MAGISRATE JUDGE COLE regarding other #424 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M)(Pallozzi, Angela)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 424 Objection to Magistrate Report and Recommendation by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski (Rancier, April)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 423 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Status hearing held on 8/26/15. The parties' motion to stay this case in order to pursue settlement with the assistance of Judge Cole is granted; this case is stayed until 10/30/15 with the exception of (1) the completion of one remaining deposition, and (2) any briefing with respect to Judge Cole's report and recommendation. Plaintiff's motion to certify class #375 is stricken without prejudice. Status hearing set for 11/3/15 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 422 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Status hearing held. Discovery is closed. The parties are given to 8/26/2015 to call chambers at 312-435-5601 to set a settlement conference date or advise the court that they do not wish to proceed with a settlement conference. Mailed notice (jms, )
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 421 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Objections to R&R due by 8/31/2015 Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 8/17/2015:Mailed notice(jms, )
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 420 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole:It is respectfully recommended that defendants' motion for various sanctions #399 should be granted in part and denied in part. It is recommended that it be denied to the extent it seeks entry of judgment against the plaintiffs and/or an order precluding the admission of evidence pertaining to damages. It is recommended, however, that it be granted to the extent it seeks reasonable attorneys' fees in connection with attempts to secure the information discussed in the current motion. The amount, of course, will have to be determined after a submission of an appropriately supported fee petition by the defendants, following consultation with the plaintiffs demanded by the Local Rules. Enter Report and Recommendation.Mailed notice (jms, )
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 419 REPLY by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler to motion for discovery, #399 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J, #2 Exhibit K, #3 Exhibit L, #4 Exhibit M, #5 Exhibit N, #6 Exhibit O, #7 Exhibit P, #8 Exhibit Q)(Siebert, Melissa)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 418 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 8/3/15 before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Court Reporter Contact Information: k. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/3/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/14/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/12/2015. (Fennell, Kathleen)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 417 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Motion hearing held. Defendants' motion to compel #409 is granted includingthe drafts of counsels' spreadsheets and the work leading up to the spreadsheets shall be produced this morning with the understanding that a good deal of the information has been provided. Finally, a review of a representative sampling of the documents for which plaintiff is claiming work product and/or attorney client privilege compels the conclusion that the documents are neither privileged nor protected.Mailed notice (jms, )
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 416 RESPONSE by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevskiin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler to compel #409 (Rancier, April)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 415 MEMORANDUM by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski in Opposition to motion for discovery, #399 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Rancier, April)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 414 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: The minute entry of 7/31/2015 #413 is corrected as follows: Plaintiffs' revised motion for an extension of time to 7/31/2015 to file a response to defendant's motion for sanctions 411 is granted. Reply is to be filed by 8/14/2015.Mailed notice (jms, )
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 413 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Plaintiffs' revised motion for an extension of time to 7/30/2015 to file a response to defendant's motion for sanctions #411 is granted. Reply is to be filed by 8/14/2015.Mailed notice (jms, )
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 412 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Plaintiffs' motion for an extension of time to 7/30/2015 to file a response to defendant's motion for sanctions #407 is granted.Mailed notice (jms, )
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 411 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for discovery, #399 Revised (Agreed) Motion for Docket No. 407 (Rancier, April)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 410 NOTICE of Motion by Melissa Anne Siebert for presentment of motion to compel, #409 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 8/3/2015 at 08:30 AM. (Siebert, Melissa)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 409 MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler to compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Siebert, Melissa)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 408 NOTICE of Motion by April Michelle Rancier for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief #407 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 8/3/2015 at 08:30 AM. (Rancier, April)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 407 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for discovery, #399 (Rancier, April)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 406 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Defendants' motion for discovery sanctions under RUle 37(b)(2) #399 is taken under advisement. Response is to be filed by 7/28/2015. Reply is to be filed by 8/11/2015.Mailed notice (jms, )
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 405 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Jeffrey Cole for the purpose of holding proceedings related for: A report and recommendation on Defendants' motion for discovery sanctions #399 .(ca, )Mailed notice.
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 404 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Status and motion hearing held on 7/2/15. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendant's motion to dismiss opt-in plaintiffs with prejudice #393 is granted. In light of Magistrate Judge Cole's extensive supervision of discovery in this case, Defendants' motion for discovery sanctions #399 is referred to him for a report and recommendation. Status hearing set for 8/26/15 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 403 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole:The agreed motion for extension of time to 8/14/2015 to complete damages discovery and to reset the status hearing #397 is granted. Status hearing date of 7/7/2015 is reset for 8/18/2015 at 08:30 AM.Mailed notice (jms, )
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 402 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on May 27, 2015, before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura LaCien, 312-408-5032, laura_lacien@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 7/22/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/3/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2015. (Lacien, Laura)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 401 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The parties motions will be heard on 7/2/15 at 9:15 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 400 NOTICE of Motion by Melissa Anne Siebert for presentment of motion for discovery, #399 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 7/2/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Siebert, Melissa)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 399 MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler for discovery Sanctions Under Rule 37(b)(2) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Siebert, Melissa)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 398 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery #397 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 7/2/2015 at 08:30 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 397 MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler for extension of time to complete discovery Agreed Motion to Extend Damages Discovery Deadline (Davidson, Cameron)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 396 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: By agreement of the parties, the status and motion hearing #393 set for 6/24/15 is reset to 7/2/15 at 9:15 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 395 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The status and motion hearing #393 set for 6/18/15 is reset to 6/24/15 at 10:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 394 NOTICE of Motion by Melissa Anne Siebert for presentment of motion to dismiss, #393 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 6/18/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Siebert, Melissa)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 393 MOTION by Defendants Julie Klaus, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Sharon Wheeler, Dale Dollenbacher to dismiss Opt-In Plaintiffs With Prejudice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Siebert, Melissa)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 392 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Status hearing held and continued to 7/7/2015 at 08:30 AM. Motion hearing held. Plaintiffs' motion to modify the order of 5/5/2015 to confine production of social media to the time period of her employment #378 is denied. Plaintiffs are directed to immediately turn over the social media under attorney eyes only as directed in open court. Plaintiffs' motion to quash deposition of plaintiffs' counsel or, in the alternative, for a protective order, #390 is denied. Plaintiffs shall name, within 24 hours, the names of all those who participated in the calculations of damages for plaintiffs. Defendants may take 8 depositions of the people that participated in the calculations of damages, and those depositions shall not last more than 3 hours. Damages discovery is extended to 6/29/2015. The parties are urged to call chambers at 312-435-5601 if any issues arise during depositions.Mailed notice (jms, )
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 391 NOTICE of Motion by Angela Davis Pallozzi for presentment of motion to quash #390 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 5/27/2015 at 08:30 AM. (Pallozzi, Angela)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 390 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to quash May 28, 2015 Deposition of Plaintiffs' Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Pallozzi, Angela)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 389 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Withdrawal (Rancier, April)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 388 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Sua sponte, status hearing date and hearing on plaintiff's motion to modify the order of 5/5/2015 are reset to 5/27/2015 at 08:30 AM. Mailed notice (jms, )
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 387 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Status and motion hearing held on 5/14/15. Oral motion to stay the briefing on the motion for class certification is granted. For the reasons stated on the record, the motion for class certification #375 is entered and continued. Status hearing set for 6/18/15 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 386 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: The minute entry of 5/13/2015 #385 is corrected as follows: Due to a medical emergency involving a close relative of counsel for plaintiff, she has has telephonically asked that the status hearing date of 5/12/2015 and hearing on plaintiff's motion to modify the order of 5/5/2015 be reset to 5/21/2015 at 8:00 am. That motion is granted.Mailed notice (jms, )
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 385 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Due to a medical emergency involving a close relative of counsel for plaintiff, she has has telephonically asked that the status hearing date of 5/12/2015 and hearing on plaintiff's motion to modify the order of 5/5/2015 be reset to 5/20/2015 at 8:00 am. That motion is granted. Mailed notice (jms, )
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 384 NOTICE of Correction regarding #382 . (sxw)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 383 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on April 2, 2015 before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Court Reporter Contact Information: Kelly M. Fitzgerald, 312-818-6626, kelly_fitzgerald@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/11/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2015. (Fitzgerald, Kelly)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ENTERED In Error - Modified by Clerk's Office on 5/11/2015) (sxw).
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 381 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Abrams Withdrawal (Pallozzi, Angela)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 380 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: The plaintiffs have written me a letter dated May 5, 2015 taking issue with certain matters in the minute order. #371 . Give the nature of the letter, which seeks modification and/or clarification of the order, it is inappropriate to resolve the issues in this informal way. While it is true that I told the lawyers that if they had an issue with the order they should contact me, I did not have in mind the kind of extensive issues raised in the May 5th letter. Accordingly, the plaintiffs must file an appropriate motion which shall be noticed in accord with our Local Rules.Mailed notice (jms, )
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 379 NOTICE of Motion by April Michelle Rancier for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #378 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 5/12/2015 at 10:30 AM. (Rancier, April)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 378 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril TrajcevskiModify Order (Rancier, April)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 377 NOTICE of Motion by April Michelle Rancier for presentment of motion to certify class, #375 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 5/14/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Rancier, April)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 376 NOTICE of Motion by April Michelle Rancier for presentment of motion to certify class, #375 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 5/14/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Rancier, April) (Incorrect pdf document linked - Docket Text Modified by Clerks Office.) Modified on 5/7/2015 (mmy, ).
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 375 MOTION by Plaintiffs Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to certify class pursuant to FRCP Rule 23 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Rancier, April)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 374 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Voluntary Withdrawal of Sitko and Gupte (Pallozzi, Angela)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 373 Letter by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski regarding Minute Entry (ECF No. 371) (Rancier, April)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 372 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The status hearing set for 5/5/15 is reset to 5/14/15 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 371 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Status hearing held and continued to 5/12/2015 at 10:30 AM. Parties report that Anthony Berry and Gerardo Botello have not complied with orders requiring production of tax returns. Plaintiffs Berry and Botello are given to 5/19/2015 to do so. That production will require 1099s and W2s. Defendants shall submit a draft order regarding the time frame for completing depositions of plaintiffs Berry and Botello by 5/22/2015, if possible. All plaintiffs who have not done so shall turn over the W2s or 1099s immediately. Kenneth Abrams and Ms. Gupta have not supplemented discovery pursuant to this court's order of 4/23/2015. If they do not fully comply with outstanding discovery by 5/11/2015, this court will recommend they be dismissed as plaintiffs to the district judge. All plaintiffs against whom discovery has been issued are to provide a declaration or affidavit, under the penalties of perjury, as to the existance or non-existance of social media for the relevant period by 5/19/15. Plaintiffs shall submit comprehensive damage calculations and answers to the outstanding damage interrogatories for each plaintiff by 5/12/2015. Plaintiffs Reiss-Sitko, and DeMarco are directed to appear for their depositions on at the office of defendants, 191 N. Wacker Dr.,Chicago, IL on 5/11/2015 at 9:00 am for their depositions. Any unexcused failure to attend their deposition will result in a recommendation that their cases be dismissed with prejudice. Gavin Male has a Linkedin account but has failed to produce any social media discovery. All Facebook and social media discovery shall be turned over unredacted by 5/19/2015. The material shall be treated as confidential under the protective order. The parties report that plaintiffs' motion to compel document production and interrogatory responses #361 has been resolved and is therefore moot. Those plaintiff who have unconditionally and adamantly refused through their counsel today to sit for their depositions and/or produce previously required discovery should voluntarily dismiss their cases rather than force the defendants to file a motion for entry of a default judgment against them. There is no legitimate basis for the conduct of these plaintiffs. No person has the right to conducts himself in litigation as these plaintiffs are.Mailed notice (jms, )
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 370 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Motion hearing held. Plaintiffs' motions to compel #338 is granted in part and denied in part as outlined in open court. Plaintiffs' motion to extend time to to complete discovery #354 is granted in part. All discovery shall be completed by 5/15/2015. The parties are advised this is a final extension. Plaintiffs' motion to compel document production and interrogatory responses #361 is taken under advisementpending outcome of the parties addition Rule 37 conference. Defendants' motion to dismiss non-compliant plaintiffs' #368 is denied. Plaintiffs shall submit supplemental answers as outlined in open court by 4/30/2015.Plaintiffs Norris, Reiss-Sitko, Male, and DeMarco are directed to appear for their depositions on All plaintiffs shall turn over tax returns, that shall be deemed confidential, and all social media shall be turned over by 4/30/2015. Status hearing is set for 5/5/2015 at 9:30 am after Judge Lee's call. Mailed notice (jms, ) .
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 369 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of motion to dismiss,, #368 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 4/27/2015 at 08:30 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 368 MOTION by Defendants Julie Klaus, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Sharon Wheeler, Dale Dollenbacher to dismiss Non-Compliant Plaintffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT E, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT F, #7 Exhibit EXHIBIT G, #8 Exhibit EXHIBIT H, #9 Exhibit EXHIBIT I, #10 Exhibit EXHIBIT J, #11 Exhibit EXHIBIT K, #12 Exhibit EXHIBIT L, #13 Exhibit EXHIBIT M)(Davidson, Cameron)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 367 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler (Davidson, Cameron)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 366 MEMORANDUM by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A. in Opposition to motion for extension of time to complete discovery #354 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(Siebert, Melissa)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 365 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery #354 and Plaintiff's Motion to Compel #338 are rescheduled from 4/20/15 to 4/23/15 at 9:00 a.m. (rbf, )
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 364 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Plaintiff's Motion to Compel #361 is rescheduled from 4/20/15 to 4/23/15 at 9:00 a.m. (rbf, )
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 363 RESPONSE by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheelerin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to compel #338 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Siebert, Melissa)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 362 NOTICE of Motion by April Michelle Rancier for presentment of motion to compel, #361 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 4/20/2015 at 08:30 AM. (Rancier, April)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 361 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to compel Document Production and Interrogatory Responses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Rancier, April)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 360 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Hearing on plaintiff's motion for extension of time to complete discovery #354 is reset for 4/20/2015 at 08:30 AM.Mailed notice (jms, )
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 359 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Hearing on plaintiffs' motion for extension of time to complete discovery #354 is set for 4/14/2015 at 08:30 AM.Mailed notice (jms, )
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 358 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Jeffrey Cole for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: Plaintiff's motion for extension of time to complete discovery #354 .(ca, )Mailed notice.
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 357 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Jeffrey Cole for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: general discovery supervision.(ca, )Mailed notice.
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 356 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Motion hearing held on 4/9/15. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion to extend discovery deadline #354 is referred to Magistrate Judge Cole. This matter also is referred to Judge Cole for general discovery supervision. Judge Cole may modify discovery deadlines if he deems it necessary and appropriate. Mailed notice (ca, )
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 355 NOTICE of Motion by April Michelle Rancier for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery #354 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 4/9/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Rancier, April)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 354 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski for extension of time to complete discovery (Rancier, April)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 353 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: The court having ruled on defendants' motion to compel #320 in open court on 4/2/2015; defendants do not need to submit the courtesy copy of their motion nor do plaintiffs need to submit their response.Mailed notice (jms, )
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 352 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Motion hearing held. Status hearing held. As discussed in open court,if the defendant can show relevance, it is entitled to social mediainformation and tax returns. The plaintiffs must respondappropriately to interrogatories 5,6,and 9, interrogatories 17,19,21,23,and plaintiffs shall provide individualized damage calculations.Plaintiffs' motion to compel #338 is taken under advisement. Response is to be filed by 4/16/2015. No reply is necessary. Status hearing and ruling on the motion is set for 4/20/2015 at 8:30am.The defendant shall immediately provide courtesy copies of docket #320as shall the plaintiff's upon their responsive filing. Mailed notice (jms, )
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 351 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Theodorou Voluntary Withdrawal (Pallozzi, Angela)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 350 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The Court grants Jeffrey D. Wright's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #348 . Mailed notice (np, )
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 349 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: The parties, by telephone, have requested that the hearing on the Plaintiff's Motion to Compel #338 be continued from 3/30/15 to 4/2/15 at 8:00 a.m. That request is granted. Mailed notice (tlm)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 348 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10477972. (Jeffrey, Wright)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 347 NOTICE OF CORRECTION regarding minute entry dated 3/25/2015 - Docket entry no. #346 (lxs, )
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 3/25/2015. (See Order For Details). Mailed notice(lxs, ) (Main Document 346 replaced on 3/25/2015) (lxs, ).
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 345 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: The defendant has moved telephonically to withdraw the motion to compel the continued deposition of Marc Kramer #330 since the issue has been resolved. That motion is granted and the motion hearing scheduled for 3/26/15 is canceled.Mailed notice (lxs, )
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 344 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to the Honorable Jeffrey Cole pursuant to Local Rule 72.1 for Plaintiffs Motion to Compel #338 . Signed by Executive Committee on 03/24/2015. (sxw)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 343 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole:The defendants have moved to compel the continued deposition of Marc Kramer #330 . The motion cites a non-binding opinion by Judge Moran from 1987 and a 1989 non-binding opinion by Judge Holderman. The plaintiff (and the defendants) should be prepared at the hearing on the motion on 3/26/15 to address the following more recent -- and more importantly -- binding cases from the Seventh Circuit: (1) Redwood v. Dobson, 476 F.3d 462, 468 (7th Cir. 2007)( Easterbrook, J.):"Webber gave no reason beyond his declaration that the questions were designed to harass rather than obtain information-which may well have been their point, but Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(d) specifies how harassment is to be handled. Counsel for the witness may halt the deposition and apply for a protective order, see Rule 30(d)(4), but must not instruct the witness to remain silent. 'Any objection during a deposition must be stated concisely and in a non-argumentative and non-suggestive manner. A person may instruct a deponent not to answer only when necessary to preserve a privilege, to enforce a limitation directed by the court, or to present a motion under Rule 30(d)(4).' Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(d)(1). Webber violated this rule repeatedly by telling Gerstein not to answer yet never presenting a motion for a protective order. The provocation was clear, but so was Webber's violation." See also Rule 30(c)(2), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (2014)(specifying the exceedingly limited circumstance in which a lawyer may instruct a witness not to answer). (2) Rickels v. City of South Bend, Indiana, 33 F.3d 785, 786-87 (7th Cir. 1994): 'The great operative principle of Rule 37(a)(4) is that the loser pays.' Charles Alan Wright & Arthur R. Miller, 8 Federal Practice and Procedure 2288 at 787 (1970). Fee shifting when the judge must rule on discovery disputes encourages their voluntary resolution and curtails the ability of litigants to use legal processes to heap detriments on adversaries (or third parties) without regard to the merits of the claims." (Parenthesis in original). See also United States Freight Co. v. Penn Cent. Transp. Co., 716 F.2d 954, 955 (2nd Cir.1983)(General deterrence, rather than mere remediation of the particular parties' conduct, is a goal under Rule 37; unconditional impositions of sanctions are necessary to deter other parties to other lawsuits from flouting other discovery orders of other district courts. ). See also Sambrano v. Mabus 663 F.3d 879, 881-882 (7th Cir. 2011)(Sanctions such as orders to pay the other side's attorneys' fees may redress injuries done to put-upon adversaries....). See Rule 30(d)(3)(C), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure ("Rule 37(a)(5) applies to the award of expenses.") (2014).Mailed notice (lxs, )
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 342 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: At the request of the parties, hearing on the defendant's Motion to Compel #330 is rescheduled from 3/24/15 to 3/26/15 at 8:30 p.m.Mailed notice (lxs, )
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 341 AMENDED RE- NOTICE of Motion by Terrence Buehler for presentment of motion to compel #338 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 3/31/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Buehler, Terrence)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 340 RE- NOTICE of Motion by Terrence Buehler for presentment of motion to compel #338 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 3/26/2015 at 08:30 AM. (Buehler, Terrence)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 339 NOTICE of Motion by Terrence Buehler for presentment of motion to compel #338 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 3/31/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Buehler, Terrence)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 338 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Buehler, Terrence)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 337 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: The defendant's motion to compel continued deposition of Marc Kramer #330 has been referred here by Judge Lee. Hearing on the motion will be on Tuesday, 3/24/15 at 8:30 a.m. in room 1003.Mailed notice (lxs, )
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 336 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Jeffrey Cole for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: motion to compel, #330 .(ca, )Mailed notice.
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 335 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Defendants' motion to compel continued deposition of Marc Kramer #330 is referred to Magistrate Judge Cole. No appearance is required on 3/31/15. Mailed notice (ca, )
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 334 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 1/8/2015 before the Honorable John Z. Lee. Court Reporter Contact Information: ALEXANDRA ROTH, alexandra_roth@ilnd.uscourts.gov, (312) 408-5038. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/16/2015. (Roth, Alexandra)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 333 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Motion hearing held on 3/18/15. Defendants' motion to dismiss non-complaint plaintiffs #325 is granted. Patrick Boehler, Saul Gavina, Anthony Jarzembowski, Philip Lekousis, Christi Murphy, Jason Nobles, and Jill Killen are dismissed with prejudice. Defendants' motion to compel continued deposition of Marc Kramer #330 is entered and continued for 3/31/15 at 9:15 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 332 STIPULATION (Buehler, Terrence)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 331 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of motion to compel, #330 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 3/31/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 330 MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler to compel Continued Deposition of Marc Kramer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Davidson, Cameron)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 329 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The hearing date on Defendants' motion to dismiss non-compliant plaintiffs #325 noticed up for presentment on 3/18/15 at 9:00 a.m. will stand. The status hearing set for 3/24/15 is reset to 5/5/15 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 328 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Defendants' motion to compel #320 is taken under advisement. Response is to be filed by 4/3/2015. Reply is to be filed by 4/17/2015. Court will rule by mail.Mailed notice (jms, )
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 327 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of motion to dismiss #325 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 3/18/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 326 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of motion to dismiss #325 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 3/19/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 325 MOTION by Defendants Julie Klaus, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Sharon Wheeler, Dale Dollenbacher to dismiss Non-Compliant Plaintiffs (Davidson, Cameron)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 324 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Jeffrey Cole for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: Defendants' motion to compel #320 .(ca, )Mailed notice.
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 323 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Defendants' motion to compel #320 is referred to Magistrate Judge Cole. No appearance is required on 3/11/15. Mailed notice (ca, )
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 322 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of motion to compel, #321 , motion to compel #320 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 3/11/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 321 MEMORANDUM In Support of MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler to compel discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Davidson, Cameron) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 3/9/2015) (sxw).
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 320 MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler to compel discovery (Davidson, Cameron)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 2/24/2015.Mailed notice(air, )
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 318 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Defendants' motion to dismiss #308 is denied. The status hearing has been reset for 3/24/15 at 9:00 a.m. No appearance required on 2/25/15. ENTER ORDER. Mailed notice (air, )
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 317 EXHIBIT by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler regarding reply to response to motion, #316 (Davidson, Cameron)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 316 REPLY by James Allen, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler to response in opposition to motion,, #315 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Davidson, Cameron)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 315 RESPONSE by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevskiin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Julie Klaus, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Sharon Wheeler, Dale Dollenbacher to dismiss Non-Compliant Opt-In Plaintiffs #308 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Non-Compliant Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Buehler, Terrence)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 314 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Agreed motion to extend deadline for defendants to select opt-in plaintiffs for deposition #313 is granted. The date for the selection of the opt-in Plaintiffs for depositions is March 6, 2015. No appearance is required on the motion. Mailed notice (ca, )
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 313 MOTION by Defendant American Bank and Trust Company, N.A. for extension of time for Defendants to Select Opt-in Plaintiffs for Deposition (Davidson, Cameron)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 312 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of before Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/22/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 311 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Status hearing held on 1/8/15. Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' motion to dismiss non-compliant plaintiffs #308 is due by 1/23/15; reply due by 1/30/15; ruling will be by mail. The status hearing set for 2/11/15 is reset to 2/25/15 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 310 NOTICE of Motion by Melissa Anne Siebert for presentment of motion to dismiss #308 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/8/2015 at 09:00 AM. (Siebert, Melissa)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 309 MEMORANDUM by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler in support of motion to dismiss #308 Non-Compliant Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Siebert, Melissa)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 308 MOTION by Defendants Julie Klaus, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Sharon Wheeler, Dale Dollenbacher to dismiss Non-Compliant Opt-In Plaintiffs (Siebert, Melissa)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 307 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice by April Rancier #306 is granted.Mailed notice (ca, )
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 306 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10123310. (Rancier, April)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 305 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice by Angela Pallozzi #304 is granted.Mailed notice (ca, )
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 304 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10098876. (Pallozzi, Angela)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 303 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Agreed motion to set and extend discovery deadlines #300 is granted. Fact discovery is extended until 4/15/15. A status hearing is set for 2/11/15 at 9:00 a.m. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 302 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Agreed motion to set and extend discovery deadlines #300 is granted. Fact discovery is extended until 4/15/15. A status hearing is set for 2/11/15 at 9:00 a.m. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice(ca, )
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 301 NOTICE of Motion by Melissa Anne Siebert for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery #300 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 12/2/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Siebert, Melissa)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 300 MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler for extension of time to complete discovery Agreed Motion to Set and Extend Discovery Deadlines (Siebert, Melissa)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 299 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Status hearing held on 11/18/14. The parties' joint motion for extension of time to complete discovery is due by 11/25/14 and should be noticed up for presentment. Out-of-town counsel may appear by telephone with local counsel present and should contact the courtroom deputy the day before with a call-in number. Mailed notice (ca, )
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 298 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Status hearing set for 11/18/14 at 9:15 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 297 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 7/30/2014 before the Honorable John Z. Lee. Court Reporter Contact Information: ALEXANDRA ROTH, alexandra_roth@ilnd.uscourts.gov, (312) 408-5038. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/24/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/3/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/1/2015. (Roth, Alexandra)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ANSWER to amended complaint by Sharon Wheeler(Davidson, Cameron)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ANSWER to amended complaint by Julie Klaus(Davidson, Cameron)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ANSWER to amended complaint by Dale Dollenbacher(Davidson, Cameron)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ANSWER to amended complaint by Harry S. Coin(Davidson, Cameron)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ANSWER to amended complaint by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A.(Davidson, Cameron)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 291 Second AMENDED complaint by Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski, Marc Kramer against All Defendants (Buehler, Terrence)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 290 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Status and motion hearing held on 7/30/14. After considering the joint motion for entry of discovery plan and scheduling order #283 , the Court rules as follows. Defendants may serve a combined set of written fact discovery upon all of the remaining opt-in plaintiffs. Each set of interrogatories will be limited to 30 in number. Defendants may depose up to a total of 15 opt-in plaintiffs. Defendants should also supplement their discovery responses and document production to the extent necessary in light of the new opt-in plaintiffs. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court will not order supplementation of ESI discovery at this time. Fact discovery shall close on 1/31/15. Plaintiff's amended pleading is due by 8/7/14; Defendants' answers or responsive pleadings are due by 8/21/14. Mailed notice (ca, )
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 289 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: By agreement of the parties, the status and motion hearing set for 7/29/14 is reset to 7/30/14 at 10:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 288 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 7/23/14Mailed notice(ca, ).
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 287 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The Court denies Defendant Wheeler's motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' amended complaint for failure to state a claim #271 . The Court grants in part and denies in part Defendant Klaus, Coin, Dollenbacher, and the Bank's motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim #228 . The Court dismisses Plaintiffs claims against Klaus, Coin, Dollenbacher, and the Bank for fraud without prejudice and with leave to amend to cure the deficiencies outlined herein within fifteen days of the entry of this Memorandum Opinion and Order. In all other respects, Defendants motion to dismiss is denied. The Court also denies Defendants' motion to strike from Plaintiffs' amended complaint Plaintiffs' jury demand with respect to Counts II, III, and IV. [For further details see memorandum opinion and order.] Mailed notice (ca, )
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 286 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The status and motion hearing #283 set for 7/16/14 is reset to 7/29/14 at 9:15 a.m. No appearance is required on 7/16/14. Mailed notice (ca, )
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 285 NOTICE of Motion by Terrence Buehler for presentment of motion for discovery #283 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 7/16/2014 at 09:15 AM. (Buehler, Terrence)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 284 NOTICE of Motion by Terrence Buehler for presentment of motion for discovery #283 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 7/15/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Buehler, Terrence)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 283 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski for discovery Joint Motion for Entry of Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order (Buehler, Terrence)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 282 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The status hearing set for 7/11/14 is reset to 7/16/14 at 9:15 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 281 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Status hearing held on 6/17/14. The parties are to meet and confer regarding the scope of any remaining fact discovery and submit a joint discovery plan by 7/7/14. Status hearing set for 7/11/14 at 9:30 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 280 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join - Gerrity (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Gerrity Consent to Join)(Todman, Stanley)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 279 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Gavina Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Gavina Consent to Join)(Todman, Stanley)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 278 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join Sitko and Piazza (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sitko Consent to Join, #2 Exhibit Piazza Consent to Join)(Todman, Stanley)
May 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 277 REPLY by Sharon Wheeler to memorandum in opposition to motion #276 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Davidson, Cameron)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 276 MEMORANDUM by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #271 (Buehler, Terrence)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 275 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join - B. Sanchez, Botello, J. Sanchez, Pieczynski (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing B. Sanchez Consent to Join, #2 Notice of Filing Botello Consent to Join, #3 Notice of Filing J. Sanchez Consent to Join, #4 Notice of Filing Pieczynski Consent to Join)(Todman, Stanley)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 274 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join - Sitko, Baker, Cabrera (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Sitko Consent to Join, #2 Notice of Filing Baker Consent to Join, #3 Notice of Filing Cabrera Consent to Join)(Todman, Stanley)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 273 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiffs' response to defendant Sharon Wheeler's motion to dismiss counts II-VI of plaintiffs' amended complaint #271 is due by 5/5/14; reply due 5/12/14; ruling will be by mail. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 272 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #271 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 4/24/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 271 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Davidson, Cameron)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 270 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join - Murphy, D. Male, G. Male, Gupte (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Christi Murphy Consent to Join, #2 Notice of Filing Dane Male Consent to Join, #3 Notice of Filing Gavin Male Consent to Join, #4 Notice of Filing Janine Gupte Consent to Join)(Todman, Stanley)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ANSWER to amended complaint by Sharon Wheeler(Davidson, Cameron)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 268 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 7/12/13 before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Court Reporter Contact Information: Michael P Snyder (312) 435-5563 michael_snyder@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/30/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/12/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/8/2014. (Snyder, Michael)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 267 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join - Demarco, Tripp and Watkins (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Consent to Join Demarco, #2 Notice of Filing Consent to Join Tripp, #3 Notice of Filing Consent to Join Watkins)(Todman, Stanley)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 266 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join - Carcerano, Gorsuch, Lekousis, Marguerite, Nobles (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Carcerano Consent to Join, #2 Notice of Filing Gorsuch Consent to Join, #3 Notice of Filing Lekousis Consent to Join, #4 Notice of Filing Marguerite Consent to Join, #5 Notice of Filing Nobles Consent to Join)(Todman, Stanley)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 265 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join - Abrams, Berry, Boehler, Norris, Theodorou (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Abrams Consent to Join, #2 Notice of Filing Berry Consent to Join, #3 Notice of Filing Boehler Consent to Join, #4 Notice of Filing Norris Consent to Join, #5 Notice of Filing Theodorou Consent to Join)(Todman, Stanley)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 264 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The Court denies Defendant Sharon Wheeler's motion to dismiss for untimely service #242 because Plaintiffs have shown that they made a good faith attempt to locate Wheeler but could not find a valid address for her after her employment with American Bank ceased. Even if that were not the case, the Court would exercises its discretion to extend the time for service to the date on which Plaintiffs served Wheeler because Wheeler has not shown any actual harm to her ability to defend the suit as a consequence of the delay in service. Mailed notice (ca, )
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 263 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consent to Join - Datoil, Furio, Houdek, Killen, Hill, Wicklander (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Datoli, #2 Notice of Filing Furio, #3 Notice of Filing Houdek, #4 Notice of Filing Killen, #5 Notice of Filing Hill, #6 Notice of Filing Wicklander)(Todman, Stanley)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 262 RESPONSE by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevskiin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Sharon Wheeler to dismiss #242 and Request for Extension of Time to Serve Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Buehler, Terrence)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 261 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Status hearing set for 6/17/14 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 260 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: For the reasons stated on the record during the hearing on 3/12/14, the Court finds that the attached Notice is appropriate for issuance to potential opt-in plaintiffs pursuant to the Fair Labor Standards Act. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 FLSA Notice) (ca, )
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 259 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Status and motion hearing held on 3/12/14. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendant withdraws the motion to dismiss #253 and motion to stay proceedings #256 . Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file response to defendants' renewed objections to plaintiffs' proposed notice instanter #250 is granted. The Court also stated its rulings as to the FLSA notice. Defendant should submit a draft of their proposed notice in Microsoft Word format to the Court. Mailed notice (ca, )
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 258 NOTICE of Motion by Melissa Anne Siebert for presentment of motion to stay #256 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 3/13/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Siebert, Melissa)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 257 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of motion to stay #256 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 3/12/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 256 MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus to stay (Davidson, Cameron)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 255 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of motion to dismiss #253 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 3/12/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 254 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Dismiss by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Davidson, Cameron)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 253 MOTION by Defendants Julie Klaus, Harry S. Coin, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Dale Dollenbacher to dismiss (Davidson, Cameron)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 252 NOTICE of Motion by Terrence Buehler for presentment of motion for leave to file #250 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 3/13/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Buehler, Terrence)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 251 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski To Defs. Renewed Objections to Pltfs. Proposed Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Buehler, Terrence)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski for leave to file Response to Defs. renewed objections to Pltfs. proposed notice instanter (Buehler, Terrence)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 249 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2/12/2014 before the Honorable John Z. Lee. Court Reporter Contact Information: ALEXANDRA ROTH, alexandra_roth@ilnd.uscourts.gov, (312) 408-5038. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 3/27/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/7/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/4/2014. (Roth, Alexandra)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Plaintiffs' response to defendant Sharon Wheeler's motion to dismiss #242 is due by 3/21/14; reply due by 4/4/14. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 247 OBJECTIONS To Plaintiffs' Proposed Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Proposed Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Transcript of Proceedings Feb 12, 2014, #3 Exhibit C - Unreported Authorities, #4 Exhibit D - Plaintiffs' Proposed Notice)(Siebert, Melissa)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sharon Wheeler by John Conlaeth McIlwee (McIlwee, John)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sharon Wheeler by Melissa Anne Siebert (Siebert, Melissa)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ANSWER to amended complaint by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus(Davidson, Cameron)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 243 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of motion to dismiss #242 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 3/12/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 242 MOTION by Defendant Sharon Wheeler to dismiss (Davidson, Cameron)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sharon Wheeler by Cameron A Davidson (Davidson, Cameron)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 240 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Status and motion hearing held on 2/12/14. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court rules as follows. Plaintiffs' second motion to toll the statute of limitations #229 is denied. Defendants renewed motion to dismiss amended complaint and strike certain jury demands #228 is denied as to the FLSA claims; the remainder of the motion will be taken under advisement. Plaintiffs' motion for certification pursuant to section 216(b) and request for court notification to potential class members of opt-in rights and deadline #107 is granted. Renewed objections to the FLSA notice are due by 2/26/14; response due 3/5/14. Counsel should provide Plaintiffs' counsel with a list of the identities and last known addresses of the putative FLSA plaintiffs, including emails to the extent that email addresses are available in the employment file. Status hearing set for 3/12/14 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Plaintiffs' second motion to toll the statute of limitations #229 is entered and continued to 2/12/14 at 9:15 a.m. The status hearing set for 1/30/14 is reset to 2/12/14 at 9:15 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 238 STATUS Report Joint by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski (Todman, Stanley)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 237 REPLY by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril TrajcevskiSecond Motion to Toll Statute of Limitations #229 , response in opposition to motion, #232 Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Second Motion to Toll the Statute of Limitations (Buehler, Terrence)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 236 REPLY by Defendants James Allen, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus to reply #234 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Davidson, Cameron)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 235 REPLY by Defendants James Allen, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus to memorandum in opposition to motion, #233 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(Davidson, Cameron)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 234 REPLY by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to objections #227 Opposition to Defendants' Objections (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Buehler, Terrence)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MEMORANDUM by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, motion to strike, motion for relief,,, #228 Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint in its Entirety and to Strike Certain Jury Demands (Buehler, Terrence)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 232 RESPONSE by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klausin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril TrajcevskiSecond Motion to Toll Statute of Limitations #229 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Davidson, Cameron)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 231 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' second motion to toll the statute of limitations is due by 12/23/13. No appearance is necessary on 12/17/13. The status hearing previously set for 1/30/14 shall stand. Mailed notice (ca, )
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 230 NOTICE of Motion by Terrence Buehler for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #229 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 12/17/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Buehler, Terrence)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 229 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril TrajcevskiSecond Motion to Toll Statute of Limitations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Buehler, Terrence)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 228 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus to strike amended complaint #84 of Certain Jury Demands (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Unreported Cases)(McIlwee, John)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 227 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Pre-Certification Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Ex-Parte Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Unreported Cases)(McIlwee, John)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Motion for leave to supplement defendants' opposition to plaintiff's motion for certification and request for court notification instanter #174 is granted.Mailed notice (ca, )
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 225 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Status and motion hearing held on 11/26/13. Motion to lift the stay of proceedings #223 is granted. Motion to dismiss is due by 12/6/13; response due 1/11/14; reply due 1/18/14. Objections to the notice are due by 12/6/13; response due 1/11/14; reply due 1/18/14. The parties are to meet and confer and file a joint motion with a discovery schedule. Status hearing set for 1/30/14 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 224 NOTICE of Motion by Stanley Todman for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #223 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 11/26/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Todman, Stanley)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril TrajcevskiLift Stay of Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Todman, Stanley)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: All matters relating to the referral of this case having been completed, the case is returned to the district judge. Judge Honorable Jeffrey Cole no longer referred to the case.Mailed notice (jms, )
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 221 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Defendants' motion to withdraw the appearance of Abbey Furlong as attorney #219 is granted. Mailed notice (jms, )
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 220 NOTICE of Motion by Abbey Chun Furlong for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #219 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 11/21/2013 at 08:30 AM. (Furlong, Abbey)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MOTION by counsel for Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus to withdraw as attorney (Furlong, Abbey)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 218 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 11/5/2013:Mailed notice(jms, )
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: The defendants motion to disqualify counsel [#141] is DENIED. Enter Memorandum Opinion and Order.Mailed notice (jms, )
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Defendants' motion to withdraw as attorney #213 is stricken for failure to comply with Local Rule 5.2(f) and Local Rule 5.3.Mailed notice (jms, )
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MEMORANDUM Bank Defendants' Amended Post-Hearing Memorandum (Siebert, Melissa)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 214 NOTICE of Motion by Abbey Chun Furlong for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #213 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 11/4/2013 at 08:30 AM. (Furlong, Abbey)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MOTION by counsel for Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus to withdraw as attorney (Furlong, Abbey)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Defendants' motion for leave to file an amended post hearing reply memorandum #210 is granted. Mailed notice (jms, )
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 211 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of motion to amend/correct, motion for relief #210 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 11/1/2013 at 08:30 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus to amend/correct reply to response to motion #209 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Davidson, Cameron)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 209 REPLY by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus to memorandum in opposition to motion #208 (Davidson, Cameron)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 208 MEMORANDUM by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski in Opposition to motion to disqualify counsel #141 (Buehler, Terrence)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee: In light of the pending motion for disqualification before Judge Cole, the status hearing previously scheduled for 9/26/13 is reset to 11/26/13 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 206 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Of Filing Opt-In Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Buehler, Terrence)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Non-Movant's Evidentiary Hearing Exhibits by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus (Davidson, Cameron)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Post-Hearing Memorandum by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Davidson, Cameron)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 203 NOTICE by Cameron A Davidson of Change of Address (Davidson, Cameron)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 202 NOTICE by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski OF CONSENT TO JOIN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Todman, Stanley)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 201 Change of Address by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A. (Davidson, Cameron)
August 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 200 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 4/1/13 before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Court Reporter Contact Information: TRACEY D. McCULLOUGH, 312-435-5570, Tracey_McCullough@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/26/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/4/2013. (Mccullough, Tracey)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee: As to all aspects of the case other than the motion to disqualify, this case is hereby stayed until the ruling on the motion to disqualify is issued. Mailed notice (ca, )
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 198 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee: Due to Defendants' motion for disqualification pending before Magistrate Judge Cole, the Court strikes without prejudice the motion to dismiss [doc. no. 98], the motion to strike certain jury demands (omitted relief from motion #98 ), the motion to toll statute of limitations [doc. no. 103], and the motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim and to strike amended complaint's jury demands on Counts II, III, and IV [doc. no. 112]. The Court strikes the status hearing set for 8/14/13 and resets it to 9/26/13 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee: Order number 196 is corrected as follows: The parties' joint motion to extend briefing schedule #193 is granted. Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' motion for leave to supplement should be filed by 8/9/13; Defendants' reply brief should be filed by 8/23/13. No appearance is necessary on 7/31/13. Mailed notice (ca, )
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 196 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee: The parties' joint motion to extend briefing schedule #193 is granted. Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' motion for leave to supplement should be filed by 7/31/13; Defendants' reply brief should be filed by 8/7/13. No appearance is necessary on 7/31/13. Mailed notice (ca, )
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 195 STATUS Report Joint by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus (Siebert, Melissa)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 194 NOTICE of Motion by Melissa Anne Siebert for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #193 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 7/31/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Siebert, Melissa) (Duplicate filing of entry no. 192) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 7/29/2013) (np, ).
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus for extension of time to file response/reply Joint (Siebert, Melissa)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 192 NOTICE of motion by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus (Siebert, Melissa) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 7/29/2013) (np, ).
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Further evidentiary hearing held on defendant's motion to disqualify #141 . The American Bank & Trust Co. shall file its post-hearing submission 30 days after receipt of the transcript of the two-day hearing. The plaintiff's brief shall be due 30 days thereafter, with the reply brief to be filed 15 days thereafter.Mailed notice (jms, )
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 189 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski, Marc Kramer as to Sharon Wheeler on 7/12/2013, answer due 8/2/2013. (Buehler, Terrence)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Evidentiary hearing held and continued to 7/24/2013 at 9:30 am on defendant's motion to disqualify counsel #141. Defendant's motions in limine #1 to exclude the allegedly privileged and confidential communications made by Sharon Wheeler to attorney Ari Karen #180 is granted subject to further review on the question of waiver as adverted to during the hearing. Defendant's motion in limine #2 is withdrawn without prejudice. Defendant's oral motion to bar Ms. Klaus' deposition testimony is denied.Mailed notice (jms, )
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 188 PARTIES' Joint Stipulation and order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 7/12/2013. (np, )
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee: Enter Stipulation and order regarding topics outside the scope of the evidentiary hearing. [For further detail see separate order.] Mailed notice (np, )
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 186 RESPONSE by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevskiin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacherin limine #181 (Buehler, Terrence)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 185 RESPONSE by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevskiin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klausin limine #180 (Buehler, Terrence)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 184 NOTICE of Motion by Melissa Anne Siebert for presentment of motion in limine #181 , motion in limine #180 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 7/12/2013 at 10:00 AM. (Siebert, Melissa)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 183 NOTICE of Motion by Melissa Anne Siebert for presentment of motion in limine #181 , motion in limine #180 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 7/12/2013 at 10:00 AM. (Siebert, Melissa)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 182 NOTICE of Motion by Melissa Anne Siebert for presentment of motion in limine #181 , motion in limine #180 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 7/12/2013 at 10:00 AM. (Siebert, Melissa)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacherin limine (Siebert, Melissa)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klausin limine (Siebert, Melissa)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 179 EXHIBIT by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus regarding memorandum #178 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit 4a, #5 Exhibit 4b, #6 Exhibit 4c, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit 8a, #11 Exhibit 8b, #12 Exhibit 8c, #13 Exhibit 8d, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit)(Siebert, Melissa)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MEMORANDUM by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus Bank Defendants' Pre-Hearing Memorandum (Siebert, Melissa)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion hearing held on 7/3/13. Plaintiff's response to defendants' motion for leave to supplement defendants' opposition to plaintiffs motion for certification and request for Court notification instanter #174 is due by 7/31/13; reply due 8/7/13. The parties should file a joint status report outlining any outstanding issues and propose any new deadlines by 7/26/13. Status hearing set for 7/16/13 is reset for 8/14/13 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MEMORANDUM by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski in Opposition to motion to disqualify counsel #141 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit 8)(Buehler, Terrence)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Sharon Wheeler. (daj, )
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 175 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of motion to supplement #174 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 7/3/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus to supplement (Davidson, Cameron)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 173 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of before Honorable John Z. Lee on 7/3/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 172 SUPPLEMENT to motion to certify class #107 , response in opposition to motion,,, #119 (Davidson, Cameron)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Magistrate Judge Status hearing held. Evidentiary hearing on defendant's motion to disqualify counsel #141 is set for 7/12/2013 at 10:00 am. Ms. Klaus' deposition is limited to 2 hours and the scope is limited to the conversation underlying the motion to disqualify and shall be completed by 6/17/2013. The deposition shall be by phone. The parties are to file their prehearing briefs by 7/3/2013. Mailed notice (jms, )
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiffs' agreed motion to extend discovery deadlines #163 is granted. Fact discovery deadline is reset to 9/3/13. This shall be the final extension of fact discovery. Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures should be exchanged by 10/8/13. Expert discovery shall close on 11/10/13. The status hearing set for 7/16/13 shall stand. Mailed notice (ca, )
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Having been entered in error, the minute entry of 5/31/2013 #168 is stricken. Having reviewed the surreply, the court finds it is not an appropriate surreply. Accordingly, the motion for leave to file a surreply #165 is denied. Mailed notice (ma,)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a surreply #165 is stricken for failure to comply with Local Rule 5.2(f). No courtesy copy of the motion or the proposed sur-reply has ever been provided to the court.Mailed notice (jms, )
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: After reviewing the briefs related to the defendant's motion to disqualify counsel, it is apparent that the protagonists, Ms. Wheeler and Mr. Karen, have very different ideas about the nature of their encounter; an encounter which is central to this matter. Resolution of this issue, then, turns on the credibility of the two. Accordingly, the matter cannot be resolved on the papers and an evidentiary hearing will be required. Cf. Tellabs Operations, Inc. v. Fujitsu Ltd., 882 F.Supp.2d 1053, 1056 (N.D.Ill. 2012). The case is set for status on 6/3/13 at 8:30 a.m. to set a hearing date convenient to the parties and the court.Mailed notice (jms, )
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 166 NOTICE of Motion by Terrence Buehler for presentment of motion for leave to file #165 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 6/3/2013 at 08:30 AM. (Buehler, Terrence)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski for leave to file Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File SurReply to Defendant's Motion for Disqualification (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Buehler, Terrence)
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 164 NOTICE of Motion by Stanley Todman for presentment of extension of time, motion for extension of time to complete discovery #163 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 6/4/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Todman, Stanley)
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski for extension of time , MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski for extension of time to complete discovery (Todman, Stanley)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee:The status hearing set for 5/14/13 is reset for 7/16/13 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 161 REPLY by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Disqualification (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Siebert, Melissa)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee: Defendants' motion for leave to file supplemental authority instanter #157 is granted. No appearance is required on 4/30/13. Mailed notice (ca, )
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 159 RESPONSE by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevskiin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants James Allen, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler to disqualify counsel #141 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Disqualify (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Buehler, Terrence)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE of Motion by Melissa Anne Siebert for presentment of before Honorable John Z. Lee on 4/30/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Siebert, Melissa)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus to file instanter Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority Instanter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Siebert, Melissa)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: The plaintiffs have filed a motion for leave to exceed L.R. 7.1 #154 which limits page numbers of briefs to 15 pages without leave of court. The plaintiffs "estimate that they will need at least 21 pages for their Opposition," to the motion, but they do not state how many more pages they will need. The motion concludes by asking the court for permission to file a brief "that exceeds the 15 page limit." In effect the motion seeks open-ended permission to file a brief of however number of pages the plaintiff thinks appropriate. The request comes in the face of a 13 page brief by the defendants. Given the length of the defendants' brief, the defendants' open ended request is denied as submitted. Nonetheless, the defendants may file a brief not to exceed 20 pages and which conforms to the requirements of Local Rule 5.2(c) and (d) regarding the format of briefs. No appearance is necessary on 4/16/13.Mailed notice (jms, )
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 155 NOTICE of Motion by Terrence Buehler for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #154 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 4/16/2013 at 08:30 AM. (Buehler, Terrence)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski for leave to file excess pages Motion for Leave to Exceed Local Rule 7.1 (Buehler, Terrence)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee: Agreed motion for extension of expert discovery deadlines #150 is granted. Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures are to be exchanged by 7/8/13; expert discovery to close on 9/10/13. No appearance is required on 4/10/13. Mailed notice (ca, )
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: On 4/1/13 Judge Lee referred the defendants' motion to disqualify counsel #141 . The plaintiff shall have until April 26, 2013 to file a response. The reply brief shall be due on May 10, 2013. The defendants are instructed to provide a courtesy copy with protruding numbered tabs to chambers at their earliest convenience and tabbed courtesy copies of further briefs must also be delivered as required to Local Rule 5.2.Mailed notice (jms, )
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 151 NOTICE of Motion by Melissa Anne Siebert for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery #150 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 4/10/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Siebert, Melissa)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus for extension of time to complete discovery Extension of Expert Discovery Deadlines (Siebert, Melissa)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 149 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to the Honorable Jeffrey Cole pursuant to Local Rule 72.1. Conduct hearings and enter appropriate orders on the following pretrial motion/matter: -Perform such additional duties as are not inconsistent with the Constitution and laws of the United States, as specifically set forth below. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/1/2013. (ph, )
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion to compel #138 is granted in part and denied in part as discussed in court.Interrogatory #2 is denied; document production requests #10 and 25, are granted except for privileged information supported by a promptly filed privilege log. request #8 is granted to the extent that the additional opt ins must be included.request #15 is deniedrequests to admit #1,2,4,8,19,20,21, and 23 are denied and request to admit #3, 5 are granted as discussed in court. The defendant participated at the hearing today over objection because of its concern that the plaintiff might argue that it constituted a waiver of its pending motion to disqualify plaintiff. I denied that objection and ordered that the hearing proceed. Obviously, the defendants' participation shall not constitute a waiver of the motion to disqualify. With commendable candor, plaintiff's counsel acknowledged that they will make no contention that that participation has any effect on the pending motion to disqualify. The Plaintiff's motion on page 5 alludes to the defendants' claimed failure to "produce electronic discovery" and to schedule depositions. Beyond this generalized assertion, which it is alleged is pursuant to a "self-imposed stay on discovery" designed "to delay this case in hopes that the potential class will dissipate," (Motion at 5-6), there is no amplification of the argument and none of the 11 exhibits supports the claim. Consequently, the argument will not be considered under the familiar principle that skeletal and unsupported arguments are waived. Puffer v. Allstate Ins. Co., 675 F.3d 709, 718 (7th Cir. 2012); Kyles v. J.K. Guardian Sec. Services, 236 F.R.D. 400, 401 (N.D.Ill. 2006)(collecting cases). Any further requests for a judicial ruling on these issues must be preceded by a comprehensive L.R. 37.2 conference. All matters relating to the referral of this case having been resolved, the case is returned to the district judge. Nothing in this order shall, be constituted as expressing any opinion on pre-class certification discovery. Judge Honorable Jeffrey Cole no longer referred to the case.Mailed notice (jms, )
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee: Defendants' motion for disqualification #141 is referred to Magistrate Judge Cole. No appearance is required on 4/2/13.Mailed notice (ca, )
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: The plaintiff has filed a Motion to Compel Responses to Discovery Requests and Depositions #138 . Judge Lee referred the matter here on 3/22/13. The courtesy copy provided to Judge Lee is totally noncompliant with Local Rule 5.2. The Motion has 11 exhibits but there are no protruding tabs as required by Local Rule 5.2(d). Even more significant is the fact that the submission, which in total consists of 130 pages, was submitted unbound in any way, with all the pages simply loosely put in an envelope. The plaintiff is instructed to immediately deliver to chambers a bound courtesy copy of the motion with protruding tabs and that in all other aspects complies fully with Local Rule 5.2. The parties should be aware that if they cannot agree on dates for depositions, the court will set those dates. The parties are further reminded that: discovery, like all matters of procedure, has ultimate and necessary boundaries. Hickman v. Taylor, 329 U.S. 495, 507 (1947). The discovery rules are not an excursion ticket to an unlimited, never-ending exploration of every conceivable matter that captures an attorney's interest. Parties are entitled to a reasonable opportunity to investigate the facts-and no more. Vakharia v. Swedish Covenant Hosp., 1994 WL 75055 at *2 (N.D.Ill.1994)(Moran,J.). See Robinson v. Stanley, 2010 WL 1005736, 5 (N.D.Ill.,2010). The parties are further reminded that boilerplate objections do not count and will result in a waiver. United Auto. Ins. v. Veluchamy, 2010 WL 749980, 5 (N.D.Ill. 2010)(collecting cases). Finally, while the concept of relevancy under Rule 26 is broad, it is not limitless and that the Supreme Court has cautioned judges that the requirement of Rule 26(b)(1) that the materials sought in discovery be relevant should be firmly applied. Herbert v. Lando, 441 U.S. 153 (1979). Failure to exercise that control results in enormous costs to the litigants and to the due administration of justice. Cf. Bell Atlantic Corp. v. Twombly, 550 U.S. 544 (2007); Frank Easterbrook, Discovery as Abuse, 69 B.U.L.Rev. 635 (1989). None of this should be taken as an indication of the court's view of the merits of the motion Judge Lee has sent here. Mailed notice (ma,)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 145 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Motion to compel #138 referred to the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Signed by Executive Committee on 03/22/13. (ef, )
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: The District Court has referred plaintiffs' motion to compel responses to discovery requests and depositions #138 to this court for resolution. Plaintiff's motion #138 will be heard on 4/1/13 at 08:30 a.m. in courtroom 1003. Counsel for all parties directed to appear.Mailed notice (rbf, )
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of motion to disqualify counsel #141 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 4/2/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Davidson, Cameron)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MOTION by Defendants James Allen, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler to disqualify counsel (Davidson, Cameron)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee: Plaintiffs' motion to compel responses to discovery requests and depositions #138 is referred to Magistrate Judge Cole. Mailed notice (ca, )
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 139 NOTICE of Motion by Stanley Todman for presentment of motion to compel, #138 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 4/2/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Todman, Stanley)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Todman, Stanley)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski Consent to Join Paloumpis (Attachments: #1 Consent to Join)(Todman, Stanley)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee: The Court grants plaintiffs' motion for leave to file excess pages (five pages) #133 , but reminds plaintiffs that any such motion in the future shall be filed prior to the filing of any brief. No appearance is necessary on the motion. Mailed notice (ca, )
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee: Motion hearing held on 3/5/13. Motion to extend discovery deadlines #126 is granted in part and denied in part. Fact discovery shall close on 6/3/13. Status hearing set for 5/14/13 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 NOTICE of Motion by Terrence Buehler for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #133 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 3/12/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Buehler, Terrence)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski for leave to file excess pages For leave to Exceed Local Rule 7.1 (Buehler, Terrence)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 132 RESPONSE by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevskiin Support of MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to certify class Pursuant to Section 216(b) #107 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A, #2 Exhibit Ex B, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Todman, Stanley)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 RESPONSE by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevskiin Support of MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to certify class Pursuant to Section 216(b) #107 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 4, #2 Exhibit Ex 5, #3 Exhibit Ex 6, #4 Exhibit Ex 7, #5 Exhibit Ex 8, #6 Exhibit Ex 9)(Todman, Stanley)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 NOTICE of Motion by Terrence Buehler for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery #126 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 3/5/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Buehler, Terrence)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 REPLY by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #98 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, motion to strike, motion for relief #112 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unreported Cases)(McIlwee, John)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 RESPONSE by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevskiin Support of MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril TrajcevskiToll Statute of Limitations #103 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Todman, Stanley)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE of Motion by Stanley Todman for presentment of (Todman, Stanley)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski for extension of time to complete discovery (Todman, Stanley)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 125 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 10/25/2012 before the Honorable John Z. Lee. Court Reporter Contact Information: ALEXANDRA ROTH (312) 408-5038, alexandra_roth@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 3/15/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/25/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/23/2013. (Roth, Alexandra)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 RESPONSE by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevskiin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIMMOTION by Defendant Dale Dollenbacher to strike amended complaint #84 's Jury Demands on Counts II, III & IV #112 (Todman, Stanley)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee: The Court grants defendants' motion for leave to file instanter unpublished authority cited in defendants' response in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for conditional certification of collective action #121 . No appearance on the motion is necessary. Mailed notice (ca, )
February 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE of Motion by John Conlaeth McIlwee for presentment of motion for leave to file, #121 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 2/26/2013 at 09:00 AM. (McIlwee, John)
February 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus for leave to file Unpublished Authority Cited in Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification of Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit A-4, #5 Exhibit A-5, #6 Exhibit A-6)(McIlwee, John)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 RESPONSE by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus to Plaintiffs' Proposed Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Siebert, Melissa)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 RESPONSE by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klausin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to certify class Pursuant to Section 216(b) #107 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Andrea Ryckeghem, #2 Exhibit 8-A, #3 Exhibit 8-B, #4 Exhibit 8-C, #5 Exhibit 8-D, #6 Exhibit 8-E, #7 Exhibit 8-F, #8 Exhibit 8-G, #9 Exhibit 8-H, #10 Exhibit 8-I, #11 Exhibit 8-J, #12 Exhibit 8-K, #13 Exhibit 8-L, #14 Exhibit 8-M, #15 Exhibit 8-N, #16 Exhibit 8-O, #17 Exhibit 8-P, #18 Exhibit M. Nyman Excerpts, #19 Exhibit M. Kramer Excerpts, #20 Exhibit Declaration of Eugene Weis, #21 Exhibit Declaration of Daniel Sievers)(McIlwee, John)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 NOTICE by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski Consents to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jarzembowski Consent to Join, #2 Exhibit Sommese Consent to Join, #3 Exhibit Tripp Consent to Join, #4 Exhibit Lesher Consent to Join)(Todman, Stanley)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 117 RESPONSE by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klausin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril TrajcevskiToll Statute of Limitations #103 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Part 1 of 3, #2 Exhibit A Part 2 of 3, #3 Exhibit A Part 3 of 3)(Siebert, Melissa)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MEMORANDUM by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski in Opposition to motion to strike, motion for relief, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #98 (Todman, Stanley)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee: Plaintiff's response to defendants' motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim #112 is due by 2/27/2013; defendants will have until 3/13/13 to file a reply. No appearance is required on the motion hearing set for 2/14/13. Mailed notice (ca, )
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Dale Dollenbacher by Melissa Anne Siebert (Siebert, Melissa)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE of Motion by John Conlaeth McIlwee for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, motion to strike, motion for relief #112 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 2/14/2013 at 09:00 AM. (McIlwee, John)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION by Defendant Dale Dollenbacher to strike amended complaint #84 's Jury Demands on Counts II, III & IV (McIlwee, John)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Dale Dollenbacher by John Conlaeth McIlwee (McIlwee, John)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee: Plaintiffs' motion for conditional class certification #107 is taken under advisement, and after it is fully briefed, the motion for conditional class certification will be addressed at the next status hearing. No appearance is necessary on 1/29/13 at 9 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 NOTICE of Motion by Terrence Buehler for presentment of motion to certify class #107 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/29/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Buehler, Terrence)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski in support of motion to certify class #107 Pursuant to Section 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Buehler, Terrence)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to certify class Pursuant to Section 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Buehler, Terrence)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee: Briefing on the motion to strike certain jury demands #98 should be incorporated in the briefing on the motion to dismiss #98 . Mailed notice (ca, )
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee: Motion hearing held on 1/22/13. Agreed motion to set discovery deadlines #94 is granted. Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures are to be exchanged by 4/8/13; expert discovery to close on 6/10/13; dispositive motion deadline is 7/22/13. Plaintiffs' response to Defendant's motion to dismiss is due by 2/12/13; reply due 2/26/13. Ruling will be by mail. No appearance is required on 1/24/13. Plaintiffs' motion for clarification of order or, in the alternative, to reinstate motion for certification pursuant to section 216 #101 is denied for the reasons stated on the record. Plaintiff is directed to file a motion for conditional certification based upon the amended complaint by 1/25/13; Defendant to respond by 2/15/13; Plaintiff to reply due 3/1/13. Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' motion to toll the statute of limitations #103 is due by 2/12/13; reply due 2/26/13. Status hearing set for 4/23/13 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
January 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski by Daniel K. Touhy (Touhy, Daniel)
January 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to Toll Statute of Limitations (Buehler, Terrence)
January 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE of Motion by Terrence Buehler for presentment of motion to clarify #101 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/29/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Buehler, Terrence)
January 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to clarify Order of December 7, 2012 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Buehler, Terrence)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order MOTION to strike certain jury demands. (Omitted Relief from motion #98 .) (ph, )
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE of Motion by John Conlaeth McIlwee for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #98 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/24/2013 at 09:00 AM. (McIlwee, John)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Julie Klaus in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #98 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Legal Authorities)(McIlwee, John)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND TO STRIKE CERTAIN JURY DEMANDS (McIlwee, John)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski, Marc Kramer as to Dale Dollenbacher on 1/15/2013, answer due 2/5/2013. (Buehler, Terrence)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE of Motion by John Conlaeth McIlwee for presentment of motion for discovery #94 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/22/2013 at 09:00 AM. (McIlwee, John)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron A Davidson for presentment of motion for discovery #94 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/22/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Davidson, Cameron)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MOTION by Defendants James Allen, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Dale Dollenbacher, Julie Klaus for discovery Agreed Motion to Set Discovery Deadlines (Davidson, Cameron)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Stipulation of Extension (Todman, Stanley)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION of Extension (Todman, Stanley)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Julie Klaus re stipulation #90 Notice of Filing of Agreed Stipulation (Siebert, Melissa)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATION Agreed Stipulation of Extension of Defendants' Deadline to Answer Second Discovery Requests (Siebert, Melissa)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee: By agreement of the parties, the status hearing set for 12/18/12 is reset for 1/22/13 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Dale Dollenbacher, Sharon Wheeler (jh, )
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Julie Klaus re stipulation #87 (McIlwee, John)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION TO EXTENSION OF PARTIES' DEADLINE TO RESPOND/OBJECT TO DISCOVERY (McIlwee, John)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE by John Conlaeth McIlwee of Change of Address (McIlwee, John)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee: Because the Court granted plaintiff's unopposed motion for leave to file an amended complaint, it strikes without prejudice the pending motions as to the original complaint [doc. nos. 4, 25, 27]. Defendant may refile or amend these motions as needed. Mailed notice (ca, )
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 AMENDED complaint by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski against American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Julie Klaus, Sharon Wheeler, Dale Dollenbacher. (lw, )
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee: Motion hearing held on 12/6/12. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file amended complaint #79 is granted without objection. Defendant's oral motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead is granted; answer or responsive pleading is due by 1/18/13. Mailed notice (ca, )
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Julie Klaus by John Conlaeth McIlwee (McIlwee, John)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Stipulation of Extension of Parties Deadline to Answer Discovery by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Julie Klaus (Davidson, Cameron)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE of Motion by Terrence Buehler for presentment of motion for leave to file #79 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 12/6/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Buehler, Terrence)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski for leave to file Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Buehler, Terrence)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 AGREED Protective Order Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 11/28/2012Mailed notice(ca, ).
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee: Enter agreed protective order. Mailed notice (ca, )
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE by All Defendants Filing Stipulation of Extension Deadline to Answer Discovery (Davidson, Cameron)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee:Defendant's motion to withdraw as attorney #73 is granted, Attorney Robert R. Brown terminated. No appearance is required on 11/27/12 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE of Motion by Robert R. Brown for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #73 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 11/27/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Brown, Robert)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MOTION by counsel for Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Julie Klaus to withdraw as attorney (Brown, Robert)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE by Melissa Anne Siebert of Change of Address (Siebert, Melissa)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee:Status hearing held on 10/25/2012. The parties' oral motion for a three month extension of discovery is granted. Fact discovery to close by 3/3/13. Status hearing set for 12/18/12 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee: Status hearing held on 8/29/2012. Parties report they had a settlement conference before Magistrate Judge Cole but were unable to reach a settlement. Status hearing set for 10/25/12 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Correspondence to the Court by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski (Todman, Stanley)
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Settlement conference held. The parties report that the case is not settleable. All matters relating to the referral of this case having been completed, the case is returned to the district judge. Judge Honorable Jeffrey Cole no longer referred to the case.Mailed notice (jms, )
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: A settlement conference is scheduled for 8/15/2012. On Aug 13, 2012, plaintiff lawyer wrote a letter with 3 untabbed exhibits [in violation of our Local Rule 5.2(d)] seeking to cancel the settlement conference because, in his view, the defendants actions "reflect they have no intention of engaging in meaningful settlement discussions" that motion is denied. The order setting the conference [#61] could not be clearer. It requires a "written motion" in the event any party seeks to cancel the conference or vary any of the procedures in my standing order for settlement conferences. Perhaps the conference will be unsuccessful, many are. But it is worth the effort to proceed. Mailed notice (jms, )
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee: The status hearing scheduled for 8/15/12 at 9:15 a.m. is reset for 8/29/12 at 9:15 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee: The Court grants Timothy Lynch's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #64 . Mailed notice (ca, )
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7345712. (Lynch, Timothy)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 REPLY by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to Response, #50 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Todman, Stanley)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 REPLY by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to response in opposition to motion,, #49 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Todman, Stanley)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole:Magistrate Judge Status hearing held. Settlement Conference set for 8/15/2012 at 01:30 PM. All parties are directed to refer to and must review my "Instructions and Procedures for Settlement Conferences," available at "www.ilnd.uscourts.gov" and to comply with its directives before appearing at the settlement conference. Parties with FULL AUTHORITY to settle must be personally present at the conference. A member of either parties in-house legal department shall not qualify as a person with full authority. Participation by telephone will not be permitted as explained in my Instructions and Procedures for Settlement Conferences. Failure to comply with this requirement may result in a substantial monetary sanction and may necessitate the cancellation and resetting of the conference with the attendant additional costs associated with the rescheduled conference not only those of the non-compliant party, but also those incurred by the compliant party. As provided in the instructions, plaintiff's counsel shall deliver copies of the required settlement letters to chambers from both plaintiff and defendant by no later than (4) calendar days before the conference. All settlement documents must have protruding tabs separating exhibits or attachments, pursuant to Local Rule 5.2(e). Non-compliance with the 4-day Rule makes it difficult and often impossible for the conference to proceed effectively. Failure to comply with the 4-day Rule may necessitate cancellation of the conference. Parties cannot unilaterally agree to cancel a scheduled settlement conference. Permission not to proceed must be obtained from the court pursuant to written motion, and any party wishing to vary any of the procedures set forth in the standing order must make an appropriate request by written motion prior to the exchange of settlement letters described above. A settlement demand that is equal to what the plaintiff thinks is recoverable at trial is not a good faith settlement demand, and a defendants response must contain a counter offer, unless of course, the defendant does not intend to pay any amount, which is his/her right.Mailed notice (jms, )
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee: Minute Order dated 6/20/12 #57 is amended as follows: As stated in open court, plaintiffs' voluntary dismiss defendant James Allen with prejudice. Mailed notice (ca, )
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE entry before Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Status hearing is set for 7/2/2012 at 08:30 AM to set a settlement conference date.Mailed notice (jms, )
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Jeffrey Cole for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: Settlement conference.(ca, ). Mailed notice.
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee: The court grants plaintiffs' motion for extension of time to file their reply in support of the motion to certify class and request for court notification to potential class members to and including July 3, 2012 #54 . Parties need not appear at the motion hearing. Mailed notice (ca, )
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Motion by Stanley Todman for presentment of (Todman, Stanley)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski for extension of time to file response/reply as to Response, #50 , response in opposition to motion,, #49 (Todman, Stanley)
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee: Status hearing held on 6/20/12. Motion for partial summary judgment #47 is denied without prejudice. At the parties' request, this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey Cole for settlement conference. Status hearing set for 8/15/2012 at 9:15 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE of Motion by Terrence Buehler for presentment of motion for partial summary judgment, #47 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 6/21/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Buehler, Terrence)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 RULE 56 56.1(a)(3) Statement by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski regarding motion for partial summary judgment, #47 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F)(Buehler, Terrence)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STATUS Report (Initial Reassignment Joint Status Report) by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Julie Klaus (Siebert, Melissa)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 RESPONSE by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Julie Klaus to motion to certify class #4 Response to Plaintiffs' Proposed Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Davidson, Cameron)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 RESPONSE by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Julie Klausin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to certify class Pursuant to Section 216(b) and Request for Court Notification to Potential Class Members #4 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Davidson, Cameron)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Julie Klaus (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Stipulation of Dismissal)(Davidson, Cameron)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski for partial summary judgment (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum In Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Todman, Stanley)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE entry before Honorable John Z. Lee: This case having been reassigned to Judge Lee's calendar, the initial reassignment status hearing is set for June 20 at 11:00 a.m. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Parties shall prepare and file an Initial Reassignment Joint Status Report on or before Friday, June 15, 2012, and provide a courtesy copy to the Courtroom Deputy by 4:00 p.m. on that date. The requirements for an Initial Reassignment Joint Status Report can be found at Judge Lee's website. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the court's action herein. Mailed notice (ca, )
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman:Status hearing set for 6/13/12 is stricken as case is being reassigned to Judge Lee. Mailed notice (cjg, )
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that, pursuant to the Executive Committee Order entered on May 18, 2012, the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable John Z. Lee, therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED That the attached list of 323 cases be reassigned to the Honorable John Z. Lee IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this order shall become effective on Tuesday, June 5, 2012. Case reassigned to the Honorable John Z. Lee for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/1/2012. Mailed Notice (td, )
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Notice of motion set for 5/29/12 is stricken. Agreed motion by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Julie Klaus for extension of time #41 is granted. Reset deadlines as to motion to certify class #4 : Responses due by 6/12/2012. Replies due by 6/26/2012. Ruling to be by mail. Mailed notice (cjg, )
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Motion by Melissa Anne Siebert for presentment of extension of time #41 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 5/29/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Siebert, Melissa)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Julie Klaus for extension of time (Agreed Motion) (Siebert, Melissa)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 REPLY by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #27 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Siebert, Melissa)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 REPLY by Defendant Julie Klaus to memorandum in support of motion #26 , motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #25 (Siebert, Melissa)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Correction regarding document number 37. (jdh)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing held on 4/13/2012. Set deadlines as to motion by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to certify class Pursuant to Section 216(b) and Request for Court Notification to Potential Class Members #4 : Responses due by 5/29/2012. Replies due by 6/12/2012. Ruling to be by mail. Status hearing set for 6/13/2012 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Main Document 37 replaced on 4/16/2012) (jdh, ).
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Notice of Consent to Join by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski (Attachments: #1 Supplement Consent to Join)(Todman, Stanley)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski in Opposition to motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #25 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AB&T Locations, #2 Affidavit Leyden Affidavit, #3 Affidavit Gennarelli Affidavit)(Todman, Stanley)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #27 (Todman, Stanley)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing reset to 4/13/2012 at 09:30 AM. on Court's own motion.Mailed notice (cjg, )
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STATUS Report Joint Discovery Plan by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski (Todman, Stanley)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Notice of Consent to Join by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski (Attachments: #1 Declaration Consent to Join Nicholas Benhart)(Todman, Stanley)
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Notices of motions set for 3/15/12 are stricken. Set deadlines as to motion by Defendant Julie Klaus to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction [l12(b)(2)] #25 , Motion TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Counts I, II, and III) #27 : Responses due by 4/3/2012. Replies due by 4/17/2012. Status hearing reset to 3/28/2012 at 09:30 AM. on Court's own motion. Mailed notice (cjg, )
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin(Davidson, Cameron)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Motion by Joel Christopher Griswold for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #25 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #27 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 3/15/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Griswold, Joel)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Counts I, II, and III) (Griswold, Joel)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM by Julie Klaus in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #25 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Julie Klaus Declaration))(Griswold, Joel)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION by Defendant Julie Klaus to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction [l12(b)(2)] (Griswold, Joel)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Harry S. Coin by Joel Christopher Griswold (Griswold, Joel)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Julie Klaus by Abbey Chun Furlong (Furlong, Abbey)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Harry S. Coin by Melissa Anne Siebert (Siebert, Melissa)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Harry S. Coin by Robert R. Brown (Brown, Robert)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 APPEARANCE by Harry S. Coin (Davidson, Cameron)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Julie Klaus by Joel Christopher Griswold (Griswold, Joel)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Julie Klaus by Robert R. Brown (Brown, Robert)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Julie Klaus by Melissa Anne Siebert (Siebert, Melissa)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Julie Klaus have filed a motion, but have not provided a notice of motion as required. The Court will overlook this deficiency this time, but advises to comply in the future. Motion by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Julie Klaus for extension of time #14 is granted to and including 3/12/12. Status hearing reset to 3/21/2012 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (cjg, )
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6719988. (Karen, Ari) #7 is granted. Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6720028. (Todman, Stanley) #8 is granted. Mailed notice (cjg, )
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION by Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Julie Klaus for extension of time (Davidson, Cameron)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Julie Klaus by Cameron A Davidson (Davidson, Cameron)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski as to Julie Klaus on 1/19/2012, answer due 2/9/2012. (Buehler, Terrence)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski as to Harry S. Coin on 1/19/2012, answer due 2/9/2012. (Buehler, Terrence)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski as to James Allen on 1/19/2012, answer due 2/9/2012. (Buehler, Terrence)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski as to American Bank and Trust Company, N.A. on 1/19/2011, answer due 2/9/2011. (Buehler, Terrence)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants James Allen, American Bank and Trust Company, N.A., Harry S. Coin, Julie Klaus (nsf, )
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6720028. (Todman, Stanley)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6719988. (Karen, Ari)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court orders the parties to appear for an initial status hearing. All parties shall refer to and comply with Judge Guzman's requirements for the initial appearance as outlined in Judge Guzman's case management procedures, which can be found at: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Status hearing set for 2/10/2012 at 09:30 AM.Mailed notice (cjg, )
December 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski in support of motion to certify class #4 Pursuant to Section 216(b) and Request for Court Notification to Potential Class Members (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Buehler, Terrence)
December 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski to certify class Pursuant to Section 216(b) and Request for Court Notification to Potential Class Members (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Buehler, Terrence)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski by Terrence Buehler (Buehler, Terrence)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Buehler, Terrence)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Marc Kramer, Matt Nyman, Kiril Trajcevski; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-6644509.(Buehler, Terrence)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. (nsf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kramer et al v. American Bank and Trust Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry S. Coin
Represented By: Joel Griswold
Represented By: Abbey Chun Furlong
Represented By: Melissa Anne Siebert
Represented By: Jeffrey David Wright
Represented By: John Conlaeth McIlwee
Represented By: Robert R. Brown
Represented By: Cameron A Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Bank and Trust Company, N.A.
Represented By: Joel Griswold
Represented By: Abbey Chun Furlong
Represented By: Melissa Anne Siebert
Represented By: Jeffrey David Wright
Represented By: John Conlaeth McIlwee
Represented By: Robert R. Brown
Represented By: Cameron A Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Klaus
Represented By: Joel Griswold
Represented By: Abbey Chun Furlong
Represented By: Melissa Anne Siebert
Represented By: Jeffrey David Wright
Represented By: John Conlaeth McIlwee
Represented By: Robert R. Brown
Represented By: Cameron A Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Dollenbacher
Represented By: Melissa Anne Siebert
Represented By: Jeffrey David Wright
Represented By: John Conlaeth McIlwee
Represented By: Cameron A Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Wheeler
Represented By: Melissa Anne Siebert
Represented By: Jeffrey David Wright
Represented By: John Conlaeth McIlwee
Represented By: Cameron A Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiril Trajcevski
Represented By: Katharine Thomas Batista
Represented By: Stanley Todman
Represented By: Daniel K. Touhy
Represented By: April Michelle Rancier
Represented By: Timothy Cronin Lynch
Represented By: Angela Davis Pallozzi
Represented By: Ari Karen
Represented By: Terrence Buehler
Represented By: Steven Michael Hartmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Kramer
Represented By: Katharine Thomas Batista
Represented By: Stanley Todman
Represented By: Daniel K. Touhy
Represented By: April Michelle Rancier
Represented By: Timothy J. McCaffrey
Represented By: Timothy Cronin Lynch
Represented By: Angela Davis Pallozzi
Represented By: Ari Karen
Represented By: Terrence Buehler
Represented By: Steven Michael Hartmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Nyman
Represented By: Katharine Thomas Batista
Represented By: Stanley Todman
Represented By: Daniel K. Touhy
Represented By: April Michelle Rancier
Represented By: Timothy Cronin Lynch
Represented By: Angela Davis Pallozzi
Represented By: Ari Karen
Represented By: Terrence Buehler
Represented By: Steven Michael Hartmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?