Super Pawn Jewelry & Loan v. Brewer, et al.
Plaintiff: Super Pawn Jewelry & Loan
Defendant: American Environmental Energy, Inc., Brent Brewer, John Montague, Steven Byle, Virginia Cha Walter O'Brien, William McManes, Christopher Wilson, Haglund & Paulsen, P.C., Randy Drew, Alan Sinderman, Quicksilver Stock Transfer, L.L.C., Weaver & Martin, L.L.C., Malone Bailey, L.L.P and TD Ameritrade, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv08894
Filed: December 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 289 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 4/16/2015. Mailed notice(cdh, )
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 266 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: the Court grants in part the Motions for Sanctions, filed by Defendant Weaver & Martin, LLC 210 and Defendants Brent Brewer, Steven Byle, Jon Montague, Christopher Wilson, and Wilson, Haglund & Paulsen, P.C. 215 . The Court directs Defendants to submit by 10/6/2014 requests for attorneys fees consistent with the Courts Opinion, along with appropriate supporting materials. Plaintiff and J. Kevin Benjamin may submit any objections to the fees submitted by Defendants by 10/20/2014. The Court will then determine the appropriate monetary sanction for the conduct at issue. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 9/9/2014. Mailed notice(tbk, )
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 3/29/2013. Mailed notice(tbk, )
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 10/10/2012: For the reasons stated below, the notice of motion and status hearing date of 10/11/2012 is stricken. The Court grants Plaintiff's motion for extension of time 100 and directs the parties as follows: Plaintiff will respond toall pending motions to dismiss no later than 10/16/2012; there will no extensions of that date absent extraordinary and unforseen circumstances; replies in support of the motions to dismiss w ill be due no later than 11/6/2012. In view of this schedule, Plaintiff's earlier motions for extension to time and/or to continue [74, 94] are stricken as moot. The motion of Defendants Quicksilver and Sinderman for extension of time to obtain counsel 92 is granted; Defendants Quicksilver and Sinderman are given until 10/16/2012 to obtain counsel and until 11/6/2012 to answer or otherwise plead. Defendant TD Ameritrade's motion for extension of time to respond to Plaintiffsamended complaint and to serve initial disclosures 97 is granted. Defendant Weaver & Martin's request for sanctions 89 is denied. Mailed notice(tbk, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Super Pawn Jewelry & Loan v. Brewer, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Super Pawn Jewelry & Loan
Represented By: J. Kevin Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Environmental Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Montague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Byle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Cha Walter O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William McManes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haglund & Paulsen, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Sinderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicksilver Stock Transfer, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weaver & Martin, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malone Bailey, L.L.P
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Ameritrade, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?