BA Jacobs Flight Services, LLC v. RutAir Limited et al
Plaintiff: |
BA Jacobs Flight Services, LLC |
Defendant: |
RutAir Limited and George Levy |
Counter_claimant: |
George Levy and RutAir Limited |
Counter_defendant: |
BA Jacobs Flight Services, LLC |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv02625 |
Filed: |
April 10, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois |
Office: |
Chicago Office |
County: |
Kane |
Presiding Judge: |
Joan B. Gottschall |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 12, 2017 |
Filing
123
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For all the reasons discussed in the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court awards Plaintiff BA Jacobs Flight Services, LLC $105,543.25 in prejudgment interest for breach of the Lease, $79,109 in prejudgment interest as to the Guaranty, and $97,088.21 in attorneys' fees and costs. As to Defendant RutAir Limited, judgment is entered in the amount of $505,788.25, plus $97,088.21 in attorneys' fees. As to Defendant Georg e Levy, judgment is entered in the amount of $379,109, plus $97,088.21 in attorneys' fees. This is a final and appealable order. See attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for further details. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert on 5/12/2017. Mailed notice (ber, )
|
January 20, 2017 |
Filing
116
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For all of the reasons discussed in the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court awards Plaintiff BA Jacobs Flight Services, LLC $400,245 in damages. BA Jacobs' Motion to Strike Exhibits from Def endants' Response to Plaintiff's Post-Trial Brief [ECF No. 110] is denied. This matter is set for status hearing on January 31, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. to discuss the entry of final judgment once the calculation of prejudgment interest is resolved. See attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for further details. Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert on 1/20/2017. Mailed notice(ber, )
|
December 8, 2015 |
Filing
88
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert on 12/8/2015. Mailed notice (ber, )
|
January 27, 2015 |
Filing
74
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For all of the reasons discussed in the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order, Plaintiff BA Jacobs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is granted [ECF 66]. This matter is set for status at 9:30 a.m. on March 2, 2015, to discuss a procedure by which BA Jacobs can prove up its damages. See attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for further details. Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert on 1/27/2015. Mailed notice (ber, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?