Cosentino et al v. Transcend Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sandra L. Zier-Teitler, Margaret E. Mackey, Denese Dugay, Debra Seuell, Christie Patzer, Elizabeth A. Sennett, Marie A. Plum, Ruth Lynn Neely, Julia Faye Worrell, April G. Marx, Joanne Rathmann, Betty M. Patton, Susan Silver, Donna Thomas, Mary Miller, Cheryl L. McAnich, Maureen Hicks, Linda Rutkowski, Judy M. Lindquist, Pamela McCord, Melissa Poole, Debora Tolles, Tina Coelho, Nancy M Corcoran, Debra Silviano, Nancy Caldwell, Tangela Tyran, Joanne Lane, Mary Christine Bryant, Brenda Bain, DeEnna L. Matthews, Cherie S. Price-Palmer, Ronda Campbell, Sheryl Wise, Michael J. Todd, Kristi Stanford, Kristine E. Genrich, Keula Francis Kilgore, Sherry L. Wilson, Eileen Roff, Julie A. Jones, Jacqueline St. Georges, Karla Ockerby, Linda Brewer, Joy A Sharpe, Jacqueline Becker, Helen Ring, Tyesha Mustin, Wendy Fisher, Paige Singleton, Patricia Tilton, Janet A. Henkel, Brenda Pryczynski, Jan P. Surprise, Carol Failla, Denise Williams, Tracey Forsythe, Christian V Ramos, Diane Burgbacher, Kim Claeys, Tina Brush, Dawn T. O'Connor, Cheryl Sullivan, Sheila R. Ford, Teresa Slater Clark, Lecia Ropp, Carey L. Miller, Cynthia Swaim, Constance A. Duncan, Renee T. Long, Deanna L. Robinson, Jennifer Chandler, Kimberly Crocker-Hendrickson, Leslie Robertson, Jennifer L. Dick, Julianne Patton, Cynthia S. Holley, Jessica Eik, Virginia Gomez, Debra L. Burns, Paula Ferguson, Suzanne M. Bailey, Bonnie Ryden, Alane M Barnes Garvik, Rita A. Defino, Roberta Bianchini, Virginia Storm, Peggy M. Hopper, Cheryl Williams, Carole J. Boom, Bonnie Scaia, Marcela C. DeBano, Linda Mathias, Kimberly Ceplenski, Donna J. Alexander, Tracie Stutzman, Connie S. Smith, Melinda J. Stec, Amanda Solorza, Jennifer Ballentine, Patricia A. Dickerson, Laurie Gianquinto, Margaret Anne Thorpe, Joni Joyner, Janis B. Smith, Rise Fritz, Joyce Ratajczak, Debra G. Still, Carol Montgomery, Regina Wilson, Sharon Dutton, Ann Wagner, Kimberly V. Tallitsch, Lynda D. Romanek, Robin Reid Wooten Simpson, Theresa Clubb, Deborah L. Spittle, Kellie L. Campbell, Barbara A. Stark, Rebecca S. Cameron, Kim Gersie-Scott, Kathleen P. Irwin, Cathy S. Lefils, Nicole Elizabeth Smith, Shannon Barnes, Jean M. Shang, Jeanne A. Pedersen, Eileen Rollins, Veronica Vitari, Annette D. Pruett, Samantha Tipton, Cheryl Simmons, Kelli Fisher, Tanya Mixon-White, Kathleen C. Burke, Ellen K. Buffy, Susan L. Frederick, Karyn B. Scrivener, Dorothy L. Ancona, Cheryl J. WIlliams, Elizabeth Ann Bowman, Karen S. Colburn, Sherry L. Schwartz, Lisa M. Hoefgen, Lorraine L. Henderson, Kimberly Freda, Evelyn R. Maynard, Velma Renee Quartullo, Kimberly K. Gibson, Judith A. Mannarini, Sherma Donnelly, Sandra Porter, Leslie Brueckner, Margaret M. Burchard, Gail Hudson, Susan J. Jones, Gwen Cashion, Linda Carucci, Kay A. Bone, Darla J. Anderson, Michelle Bardo, Susan C. Becker, Karen McNeilan, Susan Haworth, Kristen Votzakis Gauthier, Mary Teresa Schanz, Debra R. Friess, Lorna Reinhart, Kelly Parsons, Susan E. Turley, Melissa A. Love, Julie Wright, Cynthia C. Gibson, Kimberly Moore, Dawn Pence, Brenda Lee Plessinger, Sherry Martin, Maureen O'Kelly, Deborah Bauer, Nina McFarlane, Linda B. Ray, Tisha Anderson, Janice A. Baldwin, Elizabeth J. Maddox, Gail A. Riley, Rosemary Harrison, Diana Jordan, Vanessa A. Turner, Tacara Norwood, Nancy Haupt, Marsha Merrell, Jean M. Sizemore, Melinda Warnecke, Linda R. Dittmer, Sharon Kendrick, Connie G. Darling, Jane A. Hanson, Transcend Services, Inc., Judy Fallon, Debra H. Sills, Lori A. Favinger, Christina Anne Parman, Kimberly Mauger, Vicki Heinecke, Mary Ciesicki, Brenda Newberg, Linda Reid, Tanya Acquaire, Deborah Bartelo, Ann Moore, Gwendolyn Eartha Lee Bienvenu, Donna Farrell, Francine Gorskie, Candace Kinsora, Deborah H. Williams, Susan Travis, Joanne Frances Cimo, Mary Kleppin, Jodi Kabalin, Marcia A. Hahn, Deborah K. Schneider, Shannon Jones, Alice Elaine Gillespie, Beverly M. Cundiff, Debra L. Myers, Barbara Keenan, Fayetta L. Hay, Sandra E. Williams, Parrish Ritchie, Coreen M. Larson, Karen Goodrich, Elizabeth Altgilbers, Bonnie M. Jakmauh, Barbara Ciulla, Leanne M. Tierney, Amy A. Bruce, Rachel Sweeney, Robin Davies, Theresa K. Segady, Arlene Bonnie Crafton, Wendy H. Reisenauer, Patricia J. Stefanik, Shana Diekhoff, Deidre Myers, Mary M. McLaughlin, Patricia James, Patsy D. Hayes, Cathy J. Rowe, Margo McNeil, Judith A. Sanders, Susan Westlund, Traci M. Muchler, Bobbi McMillin, Debbie M. Campbell, Trinka D. McClure (f/k/a Pettyjohn), Dee A. Woodward, Carol S. Miller, Lynn E. Rogers, Harriet Sue Clarke, Janet K. Mitchell, Theresa Cosentino, Pamela H. McCullough, Deborah Pepsak, Rebecca A. Stanley, Cecilia Gaynor, Jolene Cartwright, Diane Perryman, Elizabeth M. Carithers, Konnie Marquis, Melinda Scott, Rosemary Cinquanti, Gail Hoskins, Angela E. Hall, Mindy Faieta, Margaret Bardwell, Patricia Ann Rapp, Julene Logue, Patricia Lawson, Lisa Hering, Diane Spencer, Karl E. Constantino, Melissa J. Adelson, Helen I. Bell, Benjamin Roy Scott, Alice Lovingood, Judith Gay, Angela Matias, Karen Amelung, Dawn Hill, Lisa Edwards, Diane Hernandez, Steven Rodriquez, Catherine M. Estep (f/k/a Foster), Mary Hall, Elaine Leach, Martha J. Sweitzer, Lois D. Cores, Jeannette M. Chipka, Deloris P. Hamilton, Jamie Smith, Deborah Watts, Diane Martin, Linda Armstrong, April E. Colleen, Julie M. Farmer, Emily Oates, Susan Lynne Damasco, Patricia J. Shilling, Thelma S. Durgin, Theresa D. Fox, Holly Banner, Ana Derakshaw, Laurel Jo Feiker, Jayden Nicole Lyons, Karen Berezoski, Cynthia M. Harp, Rhonda Reeves, Sharon Cook, Anna C. Pomeroy, Deborah Waldman, Lori M. Smith, Katherine Murphy, Dale Johnson (Medina), Cheryl Kahl, Linda Studley, Jean Jouskey, Debra Jane Jones, Katherine Tate, Melinda Griffus, Gail Black, Kristen A. Crowe, Diane H. Birrer, Cheryl J. Blake, Beverly McCoy, Karen Gland, Judith Joyce Gerber, Susan Lell, Lisa Sinkler, Darcy Wingler, Mary Swanson, Joanna Hardin, Carol A. Nigsarian, Teresa Bischof, Pamela D. Harper, Deanne L. Becker, Deborah Guffey, Patricia C. Solari, Lorraine Jackson, Stacy S. Lee, Angela Aldridge, Mary Ann Hren, Sherry D. Hess, Beverly Merkel, Elizabeth Baker, Vicki L. Kenobbie, Wendy Alkire, Janet Hook, Rosemarie Dean, Sheryl Hazelrigg, Brian Varner, Kim N. Dent, Kathleen Moelter, Tonya Michelle McKnight, Tara A. Cummings, Catherine Probst, Gina Rogers, Jewel A. Mazur, Karen Humensky, Trudy Davenport, Janet Lee, Robin L York, Anne C. Brinzea, Robin L. Bowers, Mary D. Kane, Jessica Fulghum, JoAnn Davey, Penny Trammel-MacKenzie, Lynn Galenza, Joyce Baena, Sherri M. Armuth, Nancy M. Greene, Saundra Feighner, Katherin Barrow, Andrea Walton, Lisa Smith, Valerie B. Sawyer, Debra L. Johns, Jenette M. Kelly, Sonia T. Gonzalez, Kathleen M. Simons, Jennifer Crutcher, Juliene A. Munoz, Christine G. Lockwood, Debra J. Barry, Angela W. Myers, Joanne Price, Donna L. Jackson, Dawn Shaffer, Tanya M. Troutman, Cathi R. Moore, Terian Edwards, Diane Gibas, Jo Ellen Carnes, Robin L. Watkins, Brenda Shelton, Treby C. Hood, Jamie Tullock, Virginia M. Mize, Rhonda Whitely, Paula B. Hightower, Karen Milan, Theresa L. Mashburn, Anna Feroe, Rae J. Messick, Judith Bean, Sharron K. Miles, Terri Ballard, Cathleen Wojtaszek, Teresa D. Smiljanic, Debra H. Parent, Carol Lindemon, Beverly S. Richardson, Susan H. Arthur, Wendi Ortiz, Nickie White, Laurie M. Boren, Cindy I. Holland, Edith M. Hinkle, Marie Ricksgers, Deborah A. Calendine, Joy L. Anderson, Joy Lutz, Kimberly Coleman (f/k/a Lauffer), Marilyn Wilson, Karen Velasquez, Wendi J. Pierson, Michelle Barbes, E. Brucette Zirn, Susan K. Janzen, Patricia Townsend, Tammy L Williams, Carla Ingraham-Gaughan, Wendy J. Buckheit, Kathleen M. Schuster, Rosemary Elmore, Janet M. Newsome, Yvonne Lawrence, Penelope C. Neal, Janet Moore, Amy L. Ford, Laura Frederiksen, Diana LeVan, Lesa Logan, Jane L. Rose, Linda F. Morton, Michell McComas, Darcie J. Cunningham, Laura Hammersley, Carole Zmuda, Debra A. Petralia, B. Jeannie Purcell, Alicia Reese, Jacqueline Ratliff, Sheryl J. Bell, Darlene C. Hanson, Paige D. Owens (Hundley), Michael Mosteller II, Denise D. Shelby, Melissa Howe, Marjorie Hess, Angela R. Booth, Linda M. Kalbac, Connie Horton, Cleo Diane Joyner, Brenda L. Osborne, Randi Gray, Laurie Lynch, Carol Brake, Karen Hobbs, M. Susan Cunningham, Jessalynn Myers, Sarena Marques, Marie Willis, Daphne M. Leibowitz, Kimberly A. Williams, Joy Bargerstock, Vicki Bunch, Stephanie R. Brammer, Connee A. Williams, Barbara Vaughn, Annette P. Hayes, Kristall Lopez, LeAnn M. Cramer, Carla Weiss, Tina Preston, Jodi B. Walsh, Naomi I. Joslin, Cathy Haines, Tamra Crowley, Rebecca L. Zentz, Melissa Fain, Pamela J. Gugliotta, Patricia Clunk, Deanna Garcia, Shannon Harbinson, Angela McDonough, Eva L. Carlson, Cheryl Beauchamp, Claudia M. Franklin, Vicki E. Collier, Lisa Allarde, Marita Patricia Joseph, Stephanie DeWitt, Angela B. Dortch, Kelli Tiffee, Kimberly Keevy, Wanda L. Olson, Marcie Cooper, Holly Dyer, Carolyn Cumings, Janeen S. DeBoard, Jennette Bastion (Horner), Leslea Souvigney, Jennie Eisenstein, Briget Rischawy, Judith A. Buckingham, Elaine L. Ballance, Kenneth E. Grassman, Hope Brown, Rosalie Hicks, Joy Christine Atwell, Heather Greenslade, Joanne G. Miller, Cheryl Shaw Briggs, Debra K. Resimont, Susan Wilson, Teri Massengale, Kathleen Hussey, John English, Deborah J. Land, Shannon Schroeder, Barbara Magliochetti, Sharon Kenno, Debra Ann Molitaris, Margaret Staffer, Shelly Buschman, Derek Ware, Sharon A. Flemmings, Lynne D. Hackaday, Carli L. Emerson, Dawn R. Jordan, Cheri Kline, Kathleen J. Jandreau, Dorothy A. Weise, Peggy H. Tumlin, Jennifer Murrell, Joanna Karneeb, Jennifer M. Synak, Myrtis A. Whitely, Deborah Schneider, Lou Ann Cleary, Michelle Hughes, Elizabeth A. Zaayer, Tammy Isham, Tammy Martinez, Amy L. Long, Steven Martin, Cindy A. Baker-Spriggs, Lilia M. Cooper, Valerie Dininni, Lynn M. Winebaugh, Denise Foell, April Prior, Joan M. Davis, Teresa A. DeSchryver, Yvonne R. Valdez, Jeanette Rydell, Rosemary Wood Langella, Ann Marie Armstrong-Deitch, Denise M. Zafuto, Teri L Eriksen, Diana Iseminger, Catherine R. Johnson-Berger, Leona R. Payne, Janet Statzer, Patricia A. Schmutz, Judith Lugo, Penny E. Zimmerman, Lauren Gato, Leida Stewart, Teresa Pemerton, Tina Mehler, Laura Denio, Toiee Angela Rushing, Margaret Cary, Donna McKenna, Cindy Conwell, Mary Anne Novello, Sandra J. Bruce, Joy McLemore, Mark E. Dorn, Jacqueline A. Spires-Purdy, Linda Gray, Kathy S. Sanders, Claudia Stella Cantelmi, Donna Falco, Wendolyn Smith, Mary Lou Rusbarsky, Julie A. Plourde, Krissy Reynolds, Darlene M. Archie, Patricia E. Taylor, Susan Brown, Cecilia Bradford, Renee Demmery, Laura Key, Tracy L. Harrod, Roberta L. Jonas, Terri Wheeler, Mary Kitra Cox, Connie Watson, Janet E. Harper, Vicki J. LaPlante, Jenalyn Scheib, Constance D. Salvia, Rhea D. Safire, Elaina Marie Rande, Denise Melchior, Susan E. Powell, Margaret Diane Carter, Nikki R. Gilbert, Ronda Hebenstreit, Marilyn M. Bower, Mari J. Floyd, Rebecca J. Nagy, Kay L. Miller, Susanne Simonson, Christy S. Jones, Pamela Morrow, Dawn J. O'Connor, Les Rinehart, JoAnne A. Benson, Kelly A. Ustinovich, Jason Hoffman, Sherry A. Doratio, Christy L. Scott, Robin Feltner, Jan E Sandoval, Rosie Scott, Sheila Reeser, June A. Greenwood, Theresa M Crane, Lillian L. Miller, Sarah M. Hatch, Bobbi E. Pollak, Renee A. Nichols, Vickie Astudillo, Deborah K Norton, Lynn Horn, Veronica Nicholas, Jennifer L. Foreman, Lucy Viola, Shara Howard, Carlotta Ingle, Elizabeth Warfield, Theresa Ann O'Connor, Delois F. Easterling, Claire McKinnon, Jacqueline M. Linville, Patricia A. Morgan, Kevin P. Cartwright, Tamikka R. Nelson, Carolyn White, Tonna G. Cornett, Rebecca L. Loew, Lynsi Henson, Cathryn Sibert, Cheryl Ayers, Kathryn L. Kelly, Suzanne Mascola, Patricia C. Barragan, Karen L. Pirok, Denise Marie Byrne, Theresa R. Thomsen, Cheryl B. Rieper, Julie Purdy (f/k/a Ramson), Pamela J. Denny, Ellen D. Tyler, Jenny S. Rink, Jessica Edwards, Elaine Shortall, Ian Connors, Yvonne Meyerhofer, Mary McClelland, Kimberly A. Glotfelty, Ann W. Myers, Charlene Palmer, Kathy M. Lucas, Mary Lynn Walker, Marilyn Mitchell, Kathryn E. Lacey, Julie M. Wickersham, Daniel Foster, Kandace Chancey, David D. Sluder and Wanda J. Taylor
Case Number: 1:2012cv03627
Filed: May 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2016 Filing 335 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing held on 4/19/2016. First amended joint motion for approval of settlement agreement and release #334 is granted. This action is dismissed with prejudice. Any pending motions or schedules in this case are stricken as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (is, )
April 15, 2016 Filing 334 MOTION by Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino for settlement Approval (Amended) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Settlement Agreement)(Dolley, Kevin)
April 13, 2016 Filing 333 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing and Motion hearing held on 4/13/2016. Joint motion for approval of settlement agreement and release #331 is entered and continued to 4/19/2016. Status hearing set for 4/19/2016 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice (is, )
April 12, 2016 Filing 332 NOTICE of Motion by Kevin J. Dolley for presentment of motion for settlement #331 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 4/13/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Dolley, Kevin)
April 11, 2016 Filing 331 MOTION by Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino for settlement approval (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement and General Release, #2 Exhibit 2 - Attorneys' Fees Invoice)(Dolley, Kevin)
March 30, 2016 Filing 330 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing held on 3/30/2016. Jury trial stricken. Status hearing set for 4/13/2016 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (cjg, )
March 28, 2016 Filing 329 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Filing of Final Pretrial Order hearing set for 3/30/2016 is stricken. Status hearing set for 3/30/2016 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice (cjg, )
March 25, 2016 Filing 328 NOTICE by Theresa Cosentino Notice of Settlement (Dolley, Kevin)
October 1, 2015 Filing 327 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Motion by counsel for Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. to withdraw Marilyn G. Moran, Tiffany L. Cummins, Tracey L. Ellerson and Patrick M. Muldowney as attorneys for defendant Transcend #313 is granted. Motion by Attorney Samuel W. Moore to withdraw as attorney for Theresa Cosentino #325 is granted. Motion by Attorney Russell C. Riggan to withdraw as attorney for Theresa Cosentino #326 is granted. Mailed notice (cjg, )
August 25, 2015 Filing 326 MOTION by Attorney Russell C. Riggan to withdraw as attorney for Theresa Cosentino. No party information provided (Riggan, Russell)
August 25, 2015 Filing 325 MOTION by Attorney Samuel W. Moore to withdraw as attorney for Theresa Cosentino. No party information provided (Moore, Samuel)
August 19, 2015 Filing 324 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing held on 8/19/2015. Jury Trial set for 4/18/2016 at 09:00 AM. Filing of Final Pretrial Order hearing set for 3/30/2016 at 10:00 AM. Judge Guzman's standing order regarding the filing of a Final Pretrial Order is posted on the Court's website: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cjg, )
July 22, 2015 Filing 323 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing set for 8/4/2015 is stricken and reset to 8/19/2015 at 09:30 AM. on request of parties. Mailed notice (cjg, )
July 20, 2015 Filing 322 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing set for 7/22/2015 is stricken and reset to 8/4/2015 at 09:30 AM. on Court's own motion. Mailed notice (cjg, )
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 7/8/2015: For the reasons stated below, Transcend's motion for summary judgment is denied. The parties are directed to appear for a status on July 22, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. in order to set a trial date. Mailed notice (cjg, )
May 6, 2015 Filing 320 RESPONSE by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. to statement #317 of Additional and Controverted Facts in Support of Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment (Hines, Erin)
May 6, 2015 Filing 319 REPLY by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. to motion for summary judgment #308 (Hines, Erin)
April 22, 2015 Filing 318 MEMORANDUM by Theresa Cosentino in Opposition to motion for summary judgment #308 (Dolley, Kevin)
April 22, 2015 Filing 317 Statement of Additional and Controverted Material Facts in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment STATEMENT by Theresa Cosentino (Dolley, Kevin)
April 22, 2015 Filing 316 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino to Rule 56 statement #311 (Dolley, Kevin)
April 22, 2015 Filing 315 Exhibit List in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment by Theresa Cosentino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
April 16, 2015 Filing 314 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino by Kendra Larissa Kutko (Kutko, Kendra)
April 15, 2015 Filing 313 MOTION by counsel for Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. to withdraw as attorney for Marilyn G. Moran, Tiffany L. Cummins, Tracey L. Ellerson and Patrick M. Muldowney (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
April 1, 2015 Filing 312 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Notice of motion set for 4/2/2015 is stricken and no appearance is required. Set deadlines g as to motion by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. for summary judgment On All Claims By Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino #308 : Response due by 4/22/201. Reply due by 5/6/2015. Ruling by mail. Mailed notice (cjg, )
March 27, 2015 Filing 311 RULE 56 Statement by Transcend Services, Inc. regarding motion for summary judgment #308 (Hines, Erin)
March 27, 2015 Filing 310 MEMORANDUM by Transcend Services, Inc. in support of motion for summary judgment #308 On All Claims By Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hines, Erin)
March 27, 2015 Filing 309 NOTICE of Motion by Erin Bolan Hines for presentment of motion for summary judgment #308 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 4/2/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Hines, Erin)
March 27, 2015 Filing 308 MOTION by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. for summary judgment On All Claims By Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino (Hines, Erin)
March 19, 2015 Filing 307 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Any dispositive motions to be filed on or before 3/27/2015. Status hearing set for 3/24/2015 is stricken. Mailed notice (cjg, )
March 19, 2015 Filing 306 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing set for 3/24/2015 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (cjg, )
March 9, 2015 Filing 305 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted as to Transcend Services, Inc. (mr, )
February 23, 2015 Filing 304 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Pursuant to the order of February 18, 2015 (Dkt. # 303), the only remaining plaintiff in the instant case is Theresa Cosentino. The other nine named plaintiffs' (Linda Armstrong, Joy Bargerstock, Patricia Clunk, Lisa Edwards, Judith Lugo, Linda Mathias, Dawn Pence, Debra Tolles, and Deborah Waldman) claims are severed and the remaining putative opt-in class members, who were erroneously added as named plaintiffs, are ordered stricken and removed as plaintiffs. Mailed notice (cjg, )
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER: For the reasons stated below, Transcend's motion for a finding of misjoinder and severance #293 is granted. The Clerk is directed to assign new case numbers to the severed plaintiffs' claims with each case to proceed separately. Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 2/18/2015. Mailed notice (mmy, )
January 12, 2015 Filing 302 REPLY by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. to motion to sever #293 and dismiss for misjoinder (Hines, Erin)
December 22, 2014 Filing 301 MEMORANDUM by Theresa Cosentino in Opposition to motion to sever #293 (Dolley, Kevin)
December 12, 2014 Filing 300 LETTER from Corporation Service Company dated 12/4/2014. (mr, )
December 1, 2014 Filing 299 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Notice of motion hearing set for 12/2/2014 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Set deadlines as to motion by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. to sever And Dismiss For Misjoinder #293 : Response due by 12/22/2014. Reply due by 1/12/2015. Ruling by mail. Motion by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. for summary judgment #296 is stricken without prejudice to renew after a ruling on Defendant's motion to sever and dismiss. Mailed notice (cjg, )
November 21, 2014 Filing 298 RULE 56 (c) Statement by Transcend Services, Inc. regarding motion for summary judgment #296 (Hines, Erin)
November 21, 2014 Filing 297 MEMORANDUM by Transcend Services, Inc. in support of motion for summary judgment #296 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hines, Erin)
November 21, 2014 Filing 296 MOTION by Defendants Transcend Services, Inc., Transcend Services, Inc. for summary judgment On All Claims By Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino (Hines, Erin)
November 21, 2014 Filing 295 MEMORANDUM by Transcend Services, Inc. in support of motion to sever #293 And Dismiss For Misjoinder (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Hines, Erin)
November 21, 2014 Filing 294 NOTICE of Motion by Erin Bolan Hines for presentment of motion to sever #293 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 12/2/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Hines, Erin)
November 21, 2014 Filing 293 MOTION by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. to sever And Dismiss For Misjoinder (Hines, Erin)
November 17, 2014 Filing 292 LETTER from Corporation Service Company dated 11/11/2014. (mr, )
November 7, 2014 Filing 291 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing held on 11/7/2014. Motion by Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino to stay FLSA Decertification Decision Or Toll FLSA Statute Of Limitations For Dismissed Opt-in Plaintiffs For A Period Of Three (3) Months #287 is granted. Defendant's initial filing of cross motions for summary judgment to be filed on or before 11/21/2014. Judge Guzman's standing order regarding cross motions for summary judgment is posted on the Court's website: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Ruling to be by mail. Mailed notice (cjg, )
November 6, 2014 Filing 290 RESPONSE by Transcend Services, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino to stay FLSA Decertification Decision Or Toll FLSA Statute Of Limitations For Dismissed Opt-in Plaintiffs For A Period Of Three (3) Months #287 (Hines, Erin)
November 5, 2014 Filing 289 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland:All matters relating to the referral of this action having been concluded, the referral is closed and the case is returned to the assigned Judge. Judge Honorable Mary M. Rowland no longer referred to the case.Mailed notice (gel, )
November 5, 2014 Filing 288 NOTICE of Motion by Kevin J. Dolley for presentment of motion to stay #287 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 11/7/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Dolley, Kevin)
November 4, 2014 Filing 287 MOTION by Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino to stay FLSA Decertification Decision Or Toll FLSA Statute Of Limitations For Dismissed Opt-in Plaintiffs For A Period Of Three (3) Months (Dolley, Kevin)
November 4, 2014 Filing 286 NOTICE by Theresa Cosentino (Dolley, Kevin)
October 21, 2014 Filing 285 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing set for 11/7/2014 at 09:30 AM.Mailed notice (cjg, )
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 9/25/2014: For the reasons stated below, Transcend's motion for decertification #264 is granted. Mailed notice (cjg, )
May 20, 2014 Filing 283 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Tanya Acquaire, Melissa J. Adelson, Angela Aldridge, Donna J. Alexander, Wendy Alkire, Lisa Allarde, Elizabeth Altgilbers, Karen Amelung, Dorothy L. Ancona, Darla J. Anderson, Joy L. Anderson, Tisha Anderson, Darlene M. Archie, Linda Armstrong, Ann Marie Armstrong-Deitch, Sherri M. Armuth, Susan H. Arthur, Vickie Astudillo, Joy Christine Atwell, Cheryl Ayers, Joyce Baena, Suzanne M. Bailey, Brenda Bain, Elizabeth Baker, Cindy A. Baker-Spriggs, Janice A. Baldwin, Elaine L. Ballance, Terri Ballard, Jennifer Ballentine, Holly Banner, Michelle Barbes, Michelle Bardo, Margaret Bardwell, Joy Bargerstock, Shannon Barnes, Alane M Barnes Garvik, Patricia C. Barragan, Katherin Barrow, Debra J. Barry, Deborah Bartelo, Jennette Bastion (Horner), Deborah Bauer, Judith Bean, Cheryl Beauchamp, Deanne L. Becker, Jacqueline Becker, Susan C. Becker, Helen I. Bell, Sheryl J. Bell, JoAnne A. Benson, Karen Berezoski, Roberta Bianchini, Gwendolyn Eartha Lee Bienvenu, Diane H. Birrer, Teresa Bischof, Gail Black, Cheryl J. Blake, Kay A. Bone, Carole J. Boom, Angela R. Booth, Laurie M. Boren, Marilyn M. Bower, Robin L. Bowers, Elizabeth Ann Bowman, Cecilia Bradford, Carol Brake, Stephanie R. Brammer, Linda Brewer, Cheryl Shaw Briggs, Anne C. Brinzea, Hope Brown, Susan Brown, Amy A. Bruce, Sandra J. Bruce, Leslie Brueckner, Tina Brush, Mary Christine Bryant, Wendy J. Buckheit, Judith A. Buckingham, Ellen K. Buffy, Vicki Bunch, Margaret M. Burchard, Diane Burgbacher, Kathleen C. Burke, Debra L. Burns, Shelly Buschman, Nancy Caldwell, Deborah A. Calendine, Rebecca S. Cameron, Debbie M. Campbell, Kellie L. Campbell, Ronda Campbell, Claudia Stella Cantelmi, Elizabeth M. Carithers, Eva L. Carlson, Jo Ellen Carnes, Margaret Diane Carter, Jolene Cartwright, Kevin P. Cartwright, Linda Carucci, Margaret Cary, Gwen Cashion, Kimberly Ceplenski, Kandace Chancey, Jennifer Chandler, Jeannette M. Chipka, Mary Ciesicki, Joanne Frances Cimo, Rosemary Cinquanti, Barbara Ciulla, Kim Claeys, Teresa Slater Clark, Harriet Sue Clarke, Lou Ann Cleary, Theresa Clubb, Patricia Clunk, Tina Coelho, Karen S. Colburn, Kimberly Coleman (f/k/a Lauffer), April E. Colleen, Vicki E. Collier, Ian Connors, Karl E. Constantino, Cindy Conwell, Sharon Cook, Lilia M. Cooper, Marcie Cooper, Nancy M Corcoran, Lois D. Cores, Tonna G. Cornett, Theresa Cosentino, Mary Kitra Cox, Arlene Bonnie Crafton, LeAnn M. Cramer, Theresa M Crane, Kimberly Crocker-Hendrickson, Kristen A. Crowe, Tamra Crowley, Jennifer Crutcher, Carolyn Cumings, Tara A. Cummings, Beverly M. Cundiff, Darcie J. Cunningham, M. Susan Cunningham, Susan Lynne Damasco, Connie G. Darling, Trudy Davenport, JoAnn Davey, Robin Davies, Joan M. Davis, Marcela C. DeBano, Janeen S. DeBoard, Teresa A. DeSchryver, Stephanie DeWitt, Rosemarie Dean, Rita A. Defino, Renee Demmery, Laura Denio, Pamela J. Denny, Kim N. Dent, Ana Derakshaw, Jennifer L. Dick, Patricia A. Dickerson, Shana Diekhoff, Valerie Dininni, Linda R. Dittmer, Sherma Donnelly, Sherry A. Doratio, Mark E. Dorn, Angela B. Dortch, Denese Dugay, Constance A. Duncan, Thelma S. Durgin, Sharon Dutton, Holly Dyer, Delois F. Easterling, Jessica Edwards, Lisa Edwards, Terian Edwards, Jessica Eik, Jennie Eisenstein, Rosemary Elmore, Carli L. Emerson, John English, Teri L Eriksen, Catherine M. Estep (f/k/a Foster), Mindy Faieta, Carol Failla, Melissa Fain, Donna Falco, Judy Fallon, Julie M. Farmer, Donna Farrell, Lori A. Favinger, Saundra Feighner, Laurel Jo Feiker, Robin Feltner, Paula Ferguson, Anna Feroe, Kelli Fisher, Wendy Fisher, Sharon A. Flemmings, Mari J. Floyd, Denise Foell, Amy L. Ford, Sheila R. Ford, Jennifer L. Foreman, Tracey Forsythe, Daniel Foster, Theresa D. Fox, Claudia M. Franklin, Kimberly Freda, Susan L. Frederick, Laura Frederiksen, Debra R. Friess, Rise Fritz, Jessica Fulghum, Lynn Galenza, Deanna Garcia, Lauren Gato, Kristen Votzakis Gauthier, Judith Gay, Cecilia Gaynor, Kristine E. Genrich, Judith Joyce Gerber, Kim Gersie-Scott, Laurie Gianquinto, Diane Gibas, Cynthia C. Gibson, Kimberly K. Gibson, Nikki R. Gilbert, Alice Elaine Gillespie, Karen Gland, Kimberly A. Glotfelty, Virginia Gomez, Sonia T. Gonzalez, Karen Goodrich, Francine Gorskie, Kenneth E. Grassman, Linda Gray, Randi Gray, Nancy M. Greene, Heather Greenslade, June A. Greenwood, Melinda Griffus, Deborah Guffey, Pamela J. Gugliotta, Lynne D. Hackaday, Marcia A. Hahn, Cathy Haines, Angela E. Hall, Mary Hall, Deloris P. Hamilton, Laura Hammersley, Darlene C. Hanson, Jane A. Hanson, Shannon Harbinson, Joanna Hardin, Cynthia M. Harp, Janet E. Harper, Pamela D. Harper, Rosemary Harrison, Tracy L. Harrod, Sarah M. Hatch, Nancy Haupt, Susan Haworth, Fayetta L. Hay, Annette P. Hayes, Patsy D. Hayes, Sheryl Hazelrigg, Ronda Hebenstreit, Vicki Heinecke, Lorraine L. Henderson, Janet A. Henkel, Lynsi Henson, Lisa Hering, Diane Hernandez, Marjorie Hess, Sherry D. Hess, Maureen Hicks, Rosalie Hicks, Paula B. Hightower, Dawn Hill, Edith M. Hinkle, Karen Hobbs, Lisa M. Hoefgen, Jason Hoffman, Cindy I. Holland, Cynthia S. Holley, Treby C. Hood, Janet Hook, Peggy M. Hopper, Lynn Horn, Connie Horton, Gail Hoskins, Shara Howard, Melissa Howe, Mary Ann Hren, Gail Hudson, Michelle Hughes, Karen Humensky, Kathleen Hussey, Carlotta Ingle, Carla Ingraham-Gaughan, Kathleen P. Irwin, Diana Iseminger, Tammy Isham, Donna L. Jackson, Lorraine Jackson, Bonnie M. Jakmauh, Patricia James, Kathleen J. Jandreau, Susan K. Janzen, Debra L. Johns, Dale Johnson (Medina), Catherine R. Johnson-Berger, Roberta L. Jonas, Christy S. Jones, Debra Jane Jones, Julie A. Jones, Shannon Jones, Susan J. Jones, Dawn R. Jordan, Diana Jordan, Marita Patricia Joseph, Naomi I. Joslin, Jean Jouskey, Cleo Diane Joyner, Joni Joyner, Jodi Kabalin, Cheryl Kahl, Linda M. Kalbac, Mary D. Kane, Joanna Karneeb, Barbara Keenan, Kimberly Keevy, Jenette M. Kelly, Kathryn L. Kelly, Sharon Kendrick, Sharon Kenno, Vicki L. Kenobbie, Laura Key, Keula Francis Kilgore, Candace Kinsora, Mary Kleppin, Cheri Kline, Vicki J. LaPlante, Kathryn E. Lacey, Deborah J. Land, Joanne Lane, Rosemary Wood Langella, Coreen M. Larson, Yvonne Lawrence, Patricia Lawson, Diana LeVan, Elaine Leach, Janet Lee, Stacy S. Lee, Cathy S. Lefils, Daphne M. Leibowitz, Susan Lell, Carol Lindemon, Judy M. Lindquist, Jacqueline M. Linville, Christine G. Lockwood, Rebecca L. Loew, Lesa Logan, Julene Logue, Amy L. Long, Renee T. Long, Kristall Lopez, Melissa A. Love, Alice Lovingood, Kathy M. Lucas, Judith Lugo, Joy Lutz, Laurie Lynch, Jayden Nicole Lyons, Margaret E. Mackey, Elizabeth J. Maddox, Barbara Magliochetti, Judith A. Mannarini, Denise Marie Byrne, Sarena Marques, Konnie Marquis, Diane Martin, Sherry Martin, Steven Martin, Tammy Martinez, April G. Marx, Suzanne Mascola, Theresa L. Mashburn, Teri Massengale, Linda Mathias, Angela Matias, DeEnna L. Matthews, Kimberly Mauger, Evelyn R. Maynard, Jewel A. Mazur, Cheryl L. McAnich, Mary McClelland, Trinka D. McClure (f/k/a Pettyjohn), Michell McComas, Pamela McCord, Beverly McCoy, Pamela H. McCullough, Angela McDonough, Nina McFarlane, Donna McKenna, Claire McKinnon, Tonya Michelle McKnight, Mary M. McLaughlin, Joy McLemore, Bobbi McMillin, Margo McNeil, Karen McNeilan, Tina Mehler, Denise Melchior, Beverly Merkel, Marsha Merrell, Rae J. Messick, Yvonne Meyerhofer, Karen Milan, Sharron K. Miles, Carey L. Miller, Carol S. Miller, Joanne G. Miller, Kay L. Miller, Lillian L. Miller, Mary Miller, Janet K. Mitchell, Marilyn Mitchell, Tanya Mixon-White, Virginia M. Mize, Kathleen Moelter, Debra Ann Molitaris, Carol Montgomery, Ann Moore, Cathi R. Moore, Janet Moore, Kimberly Moore, Patricia A. Morgan, Pamela Morrow, Linda F. Morton, Michael Mosteller II, Traci M. Muchler, Juliene A. Munoz, Katherine Murphy, Jennifer Murrell, Tyesha Mustin, Angela W. Myers, Ann W. Myers, Debra L. Myers, Deidre Myers, Jessalynn Myers, Rebecca J. Nagy, Penelope C. Neal, Ruth Lynn Neely, Tamikka R. Nelson, Brenda Newberg, Janet M. Newsome, Veronica Nicholas, Renee A. Nichols, Carol A. Nigsarian, Deborah K Norton, Tacara Norwood, Mary Anne Novello, Dawn J. O'Connor, Dawn T. O'Connor, Theresa Ann O'Connor, Maureen O'Kelly, Emily Oates, Karla Ockerby, Wanda L. Olson, Wendi Ortiz, Brenda L. Osborne, Paige D. Owens (Hundley), Charlene Palmer, Debra H. Parent, Christina Anne Parman, Kelly Parsons, Betty M. Patton, Julianne Patton, Christie Patzer, Leona R. Payne, Jeanne A. Pedersen, Teresa Pemerton, Dawn Pence, Deborah Pepsak, Diane Perryman, Debra A. Petralia, Wendi J. Pierson, Karen L. Pirok, Brenda Lee Plessinger, Julie A. Plourde, Marie A. Plum, Bobbi E. Pollak, Anna C. Pomeroy, Melissa Poole, Sandra Porter, Susan E. Powell, Tina Preston, Joanne Price, Cherie S. Price-Palmer, April Prior, Catherine Probst, Annette D. Pruett, Brenda Pryczynski, B. Jeannie Purcell, Julie Purdy (f/k/a Ramson), Velma Renee Quartullo, Christian V Ramos, Elaina Marie Rande, Patricia Ann Rapp, Joyce Ratajczak, Joanne Rathmann, Jacqueline Ratliff, Linda B. Ray, Alicia Reese, Sheila Reeser, Rhonda Reeves, Linda Reid, Lorna Reinhart, Wendy H. Reisenauer, Debra K. Resimont, Krissy Reynolds, Beverly S. Richardson, Marie Ricksgers, Cheryl B. Rieper, Gail A. Riley, Les Rinehart, Helen Ring, Jenny S. Rink, Briget Rischawy, Parrish Ritchie, Leslie Robertson, Deanna L. Robinson, Steven Rodriquez, Eileen Roff, Gina Rogers, Lynn E. Rogers, Eileen Rollins, Lynda D. Romanek, Lecia Ropp, Jane L. Rose, Cathy J. Rowe, Mary Lou Rusbarsky, Toiee Angela Rushing, Linda Rutkowski, Jeanette Rydell, Bonnie Ryden, Rhea D. Safire, Constance D. Salvia, Judith A. Sanders, Kathy S. Sanders, Jan E Sandoval, Valerie B. Sawyer, Bonnie Scaia, Mary Teresa Schanz, Jenalyn Scheib, Patricia A. Schmutz, Deborah Schneider, Deborah K. Schneider, Shannon Schroeder, Kathleen M. Schuster, Sherry L. Schwartz, Benjamin Roy Scott, Christy L. Scott, Melinda Scott, Rosie Scott, Karyn B. Scrivener, Theresa K. Segady, Elizabeth A. Sennett, Debra Seuell, Dawn Shaffer, Jean M. Shang, Joy A Sharpe, Denise D. Shelby, Brenda Shelton, Patricia J. Shilling, Elaine Shortall, Cathryn Sibert, Debra H. Sills, Susan Silver, Debra Silviano, Cheryl Simmons, Kathleen M. Simons, Susanne Simonson, Robin Reid Wooten Simpson, Paige Singleton, Lisa Sinkler, Je
May 19, 2014 Filing 282 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman:Notice of motion hearing set for 5/22/2014 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Motion by Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino to substitute attorney #280 is granted. Kathleen Sedey is allowed to file her appearance on behalf of Plaintiffs and Anthony M. Sciara is allowed to withdraw appearance on behalf of Plaintiffs. Mailed notice (cjg, )
May 13, 2014 Filing 281 NOTICE of Motion by Anthony M. Sciara for presentment of motion to substitute attorney #280 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 5/22/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Sciara, Anthony)
May 13, 2014 Filing 280 MOTION by Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino to substitute attorney (and all other Plaintiffs) (Sciara, Anthony)
May 6, 2014 Filing 279 NOTICE by Kevin J. Dolley of Change of Address (Dolley, Kevin)
April 17, 2014 Filing 278 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman:Motion by attorney Mark A. Koupal for Plaintiffs for leave to withdraw #277 is granted. Mailed notice (cjg, )
April 16, 2014 Filing 277 MOTION by counsel for Plaintiffs Tanya Acquaire, Melissa J. Adelson, Angela Aldridge, Donna J. Alexander, Wendy Alkire, Lisa Allarde, Elizabeth Altgilbers, Karen Amelung, Dorothy L. Ancona, Darla J. Anderson, Joy L. Anderson, Tisha Anderson, Darlene M. Archie, Linda Armstrong, Ann Marie Armstrong-Deitch, Sherri M. Armuth, Susan H. Arthur, Vickie Astudillo, Joy Christine Atwell, Cheryl Ayers, Joyce Baena, Suzanne M. Bailey, Brenda Bain, Elizabeth Baker, Cindy A. Baker-Spriggs, Janice A. Baldwin, Elaine L. Ballance, Terri Ballard, Jennifer Ballentine, Holly Banner, Michelle Barbes, Michelle Bardo, Margaret Bardwell, Joy Bargerstock, Shannon Barnes, Alane M Barnes Garvik, Patricia C. Barragan, Katherin Barrow, Debra J. Barry, Deborah Bartelo, Jennette Bastion (Horner), Deborah Bauer, Judith Bean, Cheryl Beauchamp, Deanne L. Becker, Jacqueline Becker, Susan C. Becker, Helen I. Bell, Sheryl J. Bell, JoAnne A. Benson, Karen Berezoski, Roberta Bianchini, Gwendolyn Eartha Lee Bienvenu, Diane H. Birrer, Teresa Bischof, Gail Black, Cheryl J. Blake, Kay A. Bone, Carole J. Boom, Angela R. Booth, Laurie M. Boren, Marilyn M. Bower, Robin L. Bowers, Elizabeth Ann Bowman, Cecilia Bradford, Carol Brake, Stephanie R. Brammer, Linda Brewer, Cheryl Shaw Briggs, Anne C. Brinzea, Hope Brown, Susan Brown, Amy A. Bruce, Sandra J. Bruce, Leslie Brueckner, Tina Brush, Mary Christine Bryant, Wendy J. Buckheit, Judith A. Buckingham, Ellen K. Buffy, Vicki Bunch, Margaret M. Burchard, Diane Burgbacher, Kathleen C. Burke, Debra L. Burns, Shelly Buschman, Nancy Caldwell, Deborah A. Calendine, Rebecca S. Cameron, Debbie M. Campbell, Kellie L. Campbell, Ronda Campbell, Claudia Stella Cantelmi, Elizabeth M. Carithers, Eva L. Carlson, Jo Ellen Carnes, Margaret Diane Carter, Jolene Cartwright, Kevin P. Cartwright, Linda Carucci, Margaret Cary, Gwen Cashion, Kimberly Ceplenski, Kandace Chancey, Jennifer Chandler, Jeannette M. Chipka, Mary Ciesicki, Joanne Frances Cimo, Rosemary Cinquanti, Barbara Ciulla, Kim Claeys, Teresa Slater Clark, Harriet Sue Clarke, Lou Ann Cleary, Theresa Clubb, Patricia Clunk, Tina Coelho, Karen S. Colburn, Kimberly Coleman (f/k/a Lauffer), April E. Colleen, Vicki E. Collier, Ian Connors, Karl E. Constantino, Cindy Conwell, Sharon Cook, Lilia M. Cooper, Marcie Cooper, Nancy M Corcoran, Lois D. Cores, Tonna G. Cornett, Theresa Cosentino, Mary Kitra Cox, Arlene Bonnie Crafton, LeAnn M. Cramer, Theresa M Crane, Kimberly Crocker-Hendrickson, Kristen A. Crowe, Tamra Crowley, Jennifer Crutcher, Carolyn Cumings, Tara A. Cummings, Beverly M. Cundiff, Darcie J. Cunningham, M. Susan Cunningham, Susan Lynne Damasco, Connie G. Darling, Trudy Davenport, JoAnn Davey, Robin Davies, Joan M. Davis, Marcela C. DeBano, Janeen S. DeBoard, Teresa A. DeSchryver, Stephanie DeWitt, Rosemarie Dean, Rita A. Defino, Renee Demmery, Laura Denio, Pamela J. Denny, Kim N. Dent, Ana Derakshaw, Jennifer L. Dick, Patricia A. Dickerson, Shana Diekhoff, Valerie Dininni, Linda R. Dittmer, Sherma Donnelly, Sherry A. Doratio, Mark E. Dorn, Angela B. Dortch, Denese Dugay, Constance A. Duncan, Thelma S. Durgin, Sharon Dutton, Holly Dyer, Delois F. Easterling, Jessica Edwards, Lisa Edwards, Terian Edwards, Jessica Eik, Jennie Eisenstein, Rosemary Elmore, Carli L. Emerson, John English, Teri L Eriksen, Catherine M. Estep (f/k/a Foster), Mindy Faieta, Carol Failla, Melissa Fain, Donna Falco, Judy Fallon, Julie M. Farmer, Donna Farrell, Lori A. Favinger, Saundra Feighner, Laurel Jo Feiker, Robin Feltner, Paula Ferguson, Anna Feroe, Kelli Fisher, Wendy Fisher, Sharon A. Flemmings, Mari J. Floyd, Denise Foell, Amy L. Ford, Sheila R. Ford, Jennifer L. Foreman, Tracey Forsythe, Daniel Foster, Theresa D. Fox, Claudia M. Franklin, Kimberly Freda, Susan L. Frederick, Laura Frederiksen, Debra R. Friess, Rise Fritz, Jessica Fulghum, Lynn Galenza, Deanna Garcia, Lauren Gato, Kristen Votzakis Gauthier, Judith Gay, Cecilia Gaynor, Kristine E. Genrich, Judith Joyce Gerber, Kim Gersie-Scott, Laurie Gianquinto, Diane Gibas, Cynthia C. Gibson, Kimberly K. Gibson, Nikki R. Gilbert, Alice Elaine Gillespie, Karen Gland, Kimberly A. Glotfelty, Virginia Gomez, Sonia T. Gonzalez, Karen Goodrich, Francine Gorskie, Kenneth E. Grassman, Linda Gray, Randi Gray, Nancy M. Greene, Heather Greenslade, June A. Greenwood, Melinda Griffus, Deborah Guffey, Pamela J. Gugliotta, Lynne D. Hackaday, Marcia A. Hahn, Cathy Haines, Angela E. Hall, Mary Hall, Deloris P. Hamilton, Laura Hammersley, Darlene C. Hanson, Jane A. Hanson, Shannon Harbinson, Joanna Hardin, Cynthia M. Harp, Janet E. Harper, Pamela D. Harper, Rosemary Harrison, Tracy L. Harrod, Sarah M. Hatch, Nancy Haupt, Susan Haworth, Fayetta L. Hay, Annette P. Hayes, Patsy D. Hayes, Sheryl Hazelrigg, Ronda Hebenstreit, Vicki Heinecke, Lorraine L. Henderson, Janet A. Henkel, Lynsi Henson, Lisa Hering, Diane Hernandez, Marjorie Hess, Sherry D. Hess, Maureen Hicks, Rosalie Hicks, Paula B. Hightower, Dawn Hill, Edith M. Hinkle, Karen Hobbs, Lisa M. Hoefgen, Jason Hoffman, Cindy I. Holland, Cynthia S. Holley, Treby C. Hood, Janet Hook, Peggy M. Hopper, Lynn Horn, Connie Horton, Gail Hoskins, Shara Howard, Melissa Howe, Mary Ann Hren, Gail Hudson, Michelle Hughes, Karen Humensky, Kathleen Hussey, Carlotta Ingle, Carla Ingraham-Gaughan, Kathleen P. Irwin, Diana Iseminger, Tammy Isham, Donna L. Jackson, Lorraine Jackson, Bonnie M. Jakmauh, Patricia James, Kathleen J. Jandreau, Susan K. Janzen, Debra L. Johns, Dale Johnson (Medina), Catherine R. Johnson-Berger, Roberta L. Jonas, Christy S. Jones, Debra Jane Jones, Julie A. Jones, Shannon Jones, Susan J. Jones, Dawn R. Jordan, Diana Jordan, Marita Patricia Joseph, Naomi I. Joslin, Jean Jouskey, Cleo Diane Joyner, Joni Joyner, Jodi Kabalin, Cheryl Kahl, Linda M. Kalbac, Mary D. Kane, Joanna Karneeb, Barbara Keenan, Kimberly Keevy, Jenette M. Kelly, Kathryn L. Kelly, Sharon Kendrick, Sharon Kenno, Vicki L. Kenobbie, Laura Key, Keula Francis Kilgore, Candace Kinsora, Mary Kleppin, Cheri Kline, Vicki J. LaPlante, Kathryn E. Lacey, Deborah J. Land, Joanne Lane, Rosemary Wood Langella, Coreen M. Larson, Yvonne Lawrence, Patricia Lawson, Diana LeVan, Elaine Leach, Janet Lee, Stacy S. Lee, Cathy S. Lefils, Daphne M. Leibowitz, Susan Lell, Carol Lindemon, Judy M. Lindquist, Jacqueline M. Linville, Christine G. Lockwood, Rebecca L. Loew, Lesa Logan, Julene Logue, Amy L. Long, Renee T. Long, Kristall Lopez, Melissa A. Love, Alice Lovingood, Kathy M. Lucas, Judith Lugo, Joy Lutz, Laurie Lynch, Jayden Nicole Lyons, Margaret E. Mackey, Elizabeth J. Maddox, Barbara Magliochetti, Judith A. Mannarini, Denise Marie Byrne, Sarena Marques, Konnie Marquis, Diane Martin, Sherry Martin, Steven Martin, Tammy Martinez, April G. Marx, Suzanne Mascola, Theresa L. Mashburn, Teri Massengale, Linda Mathias, Angela Matias, DeEnna L. Matthews, Kimberly Mauger, Evelyn R. Maynard, Jewel A. Mazur, Cheryl L. McAnich, Mary McClelland, Trinka D. McClure (f/k/a Pettyjohn), Michell McComas, Pamela McCord, Beverly McCoy, Pamela H. McCullough, Angela McDonough, Nina McFarlane, Donna McKenna, Claire McKinnon, Tonya Michelle McKnight, Mary M. McLaughlin, Joy McLemore, Bobbi McMillin, Margo McNeil, Karen McNeilan, Tina Mehler, Denise Melchior, Beverly Merkel, Marsha Merrell, Rae J. Messick, Yvonne Meyerhofer, Karen Milan, Sharron K. Miles, Carey L. Miller, Carol S. Miller, Joanne G. Miller, Kay L. Miller, Lillian L. Miller, Mary Miller, Janet K. Mitchell, Marilyn Mitchell, Tanya Mixon-White, Virginia M. Mize, Kathleen Moelter, Debra Ann Molitaris, Carol Montgomery, Ann Moore, Cathi R. Moore, Janet Moore, Kimberly Moore, Patricia A. Morgan, Pamela Morrow, Linda F. Morton, Michael Mosteller II, Traci M. Muchler, Juliene A. Munoz, Katherine Murphy, Jennifer Murrell, Tyesha Mustin, Angela W. Myers, Ann W. Myers, Debra L. Myers, Deidre Myers, Jessalynn Myers, Rebecca J. Nagy, Penelope C. Neal, Ruth Lynn Neely, Tamikka R. Nelson, Brenda Newberg, Janet M. Newsome, Veronica Nicholas, Renee A. Nichols, Carol A. Nigsarian, Deborah K Norton, Tacara Norwood, Mary Anne Novello, Dawn J. O'Connor, Dawn T. O'Connor, Theresa Ann O'Connor, Maureen O'Kelly, Emily Oates, Karla Ockerby, Wanda L. Olson, Wendi Ortiz, Brenda L. Osborne, Paige D. Owens (Hundley), Charlene Palmer, Debra H. Parent, Christina Anne Parman, Kelly Parsons, Betty M. Patton, Julianne Patton, Christie Patzer, Leona R. Payne, Jeanne A. Pedersen, Teresa Pemerton, Dawn Pence, Deborah Pepsak, Diane Perryman, Debra A. Petralia, Wendi J. Pierson, Karen L. Pirok, Brenda Lee Plessinger, Julie A. Plourde, Marie A. Plum, Bobbi E. Pollak, Anna C. Pomeroy, Melissa Poole, Sandra Porter, Susan E. Powell, Tina Preston, Joanne Price, Cherie S. Price-Palmer, April Prior, Catherine Probst, Annette D. Pruett, Brenda Pryczynski, B. Jeannie Purcell, Julie Purdy (f/k/a Ramson), Velma Renee Quartullo, Christian V Ramos, Elaina Marie Rande, Patricia Ann Rapp, Joyce Ratajczak, Joanne Rathmann, Jacqueline Ratliff, Linda B. Ray, Alicia Reese, Sheila Reeser, Rhonda Reeves, Linda Reid, Lorna Reinhart, Wendy H. Reisenauer, Debra K. Resimont, Krissy Reynolds, Beverly S. Richardson, Marie Ricksgers, Cheryl B. Rieper, Gail A. Riley, Les Rinehart, Helen Ring, Jenny S. Rink, Briget Rischawy, Parrish Ritchie, Leslie Robertson, Deanna L. Robinson, Steven Rodriquez, Eileen Roff, Gina Rogers, Lynn E. Rogers, Eileen Rollins, Lynda D. Romanek, Lecia Ropp, Jane L. Rose, Cathy J. Rowe, Mary Lou Rusbarsky, Toiee Angela Rushing, Linda Rutkowski, Jeanette Rydell, Bonnie Ryden, Rhea D. Safire, Constance D. Salvia, Judith A. Sanders, Kathy S. Sanders, Jan E Sandoval, Valerie B. Sawyer, Bonnie Scaia, Mary Teresa Schanz, Jenalyn Scheib, Patricia A. Schmutz, Deborah Schneider, Deborah K. Schneider, Shannon Schroeder, Kathleen M. Schuster, Sherry L. Schwartz, Benjamin Roy Scott, Christy L. Scott, Melinda Scott, Rosie Scott, Karyn B. Scrivener, Theresa K. Segady, Elizabeth A. Sennett, Debra Seuell, Dawn Shaffer, Jean M. Shang, Joy A Sharpe, Denise D. Shelby, Brenda Shelton, Patricia J. Shilling, Elaine Shortall, Cathryn Sibert, Debra H. Sills, Susan Silver, Debra Silviano, Cheryl Simmons, Kathleen M. Simons, Susanne Simonson, Robin Reid Wooten Simpson, Paige Singleton, Lisa Sinkler, Jean
April 7, 2014 Filing 276 REPLY by Transcend Services, Inc. to MOTION by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc.Defendants Motion To Decertify The Conditionally Certified Class #264 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Hines, Erin)
March 26, 2014 Filing 275 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino (Dolley, Kevin)
March 26, 2014 Filing 274 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Notice of motion hearing set for 4/1/2014 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Motion by Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino for leave to file Under Seal Exhibit 47 In Opposition To Defendants Motion For Decertification #269 is granted. Mailed notice (cjg, )
March 24, 2014 Filing 273 RESPONSE by Theresa Cosentinoin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc.Defendants Motion To Decertify The Conditionally Certified Class #264 (Dolley, Kevin)
March 24, 2014 Filing 272 Exhibit List Exhibits 36-70, Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Decertification by Theresa Cosentino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 36, #2 Exhibit 37, #3 Exhibit 38, #4 Exhibit 39, #5 Exhibit 40, #6 Exhibit 41, #7 Exhibit 42, #8 Exhibit 43, #9 Exhibit 44, #10 Exhibit 45, #11 Exhibit 46, #12 Exhibit 47, #13 Exhibit 48, #14 Exhibit 49, #15 Exhibit 50, #16 Exhibit 51, #17 Exhibit 52, #18 Exhibit 53, #19 Exhibit 54, #20 Exhibit 55, #21 Exhibit 56, #22 Exhibit 57, #23 Exhibit 58, #24 Exhibit 59, #25 Exhibit 60, #26 Exhibit 61, #27 Exhibit 62, #28 Exhibit 63, #29 Exhibit 64, #30 Exhibit 65, #31 Exhibit 66, #32 Exhibit 67, #33 Exhibit 68, #34 Exhibit 69, #35 Exhibit 70)(Dolley, Kevin)
March 24, 2014 Filing 271 Exhibit List Exhibits 1-35, Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Decertification by Theresa Cosentino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35)(Dolley, Kevin)
March 24, 2014 Filing 270 NOTICE of Motion by Kevin J. Dolley for presentment of (Dolley, Kevin)
March 24, 2014 Filing 269 MOTION by Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino for leave to file Under Seal Exhibit 47 In Opposition To Defendants Motion For Decertification (Dolley, Kevin)
March 20, 2014 Filing 268 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 01/28/2014 before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Judith A. Walsh, judith_walsh@ilnd.uscourts.gov.

< Redaction Request due 4/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/21/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2014. (walsh, Judy)
March 10, 2014 Filing 267 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Motion by Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino for leave to file excess pages for Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Decertification of the Conditionally Certified Class #266 is granted up to and including 40 pages. Mailed notice (cjg, )
March 7, 2014 Filing 266 MOTION by Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino for leave to file excess pages for Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Decertification of the Conditionally Certified Class (Dolley, Kevin)
March 3, 2014 Filing 265 MEMORANDUM by Transcend Services, Inc. in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #264 For Decertification Of The Conditionally Certified Class (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Hines, Erin)
March 3, 2014 Filing 264 MOTION by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc.Defendants Motion To Decertify The Conditionally Certified Class (Hines, Erin)
February 27, 2014 Filing 263 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: For purposes of efficiency, defendant need not refile its appendix on March 3, 2014 when it files its motion to decertify the class and memorandum in support. Moreover, defendant need not deliver additional courtesy copies to chambers. Mailed notice (cjg, )
February 26, 2014 Filing 262 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Defendant's motion for leave to file instanter its memorandum in support of its motion to decertify in excess of fifteen pages #249 is granted. Defendant to re-file its motion to decertify and memorandum in support on March 3, 2014. Any response due March 24, 2014 and any reply due April 7, 2014. Ruling by mail. Mailed notice (cjg, )
February 11, 2014 Filing 261 RESPONSE by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. To The Courts February 5, 2014 Order (Hines, Erin)
February 7, 2014 Filing 260 Defendants Supplemental Certification Regarding Current eBeyondTXT Timekeeping Capability by Transcend Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hines, Erin)
February 5, 2014 Filing 259 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing and motion hearings set for 2/7/2014 are stricken. Defendant's motion for leave to file instanter its memorandum in support of its motion to decertify in excess of fifteen pages #246 is entered and continued. Defendant's motion to decertify the class #247 is stricken without prejudice to renewal at a later date. The Court previously admonished the plaintiffs about the perils of seeking many additional pages (here, 22) on the date a brief is due. Dkt. # 77. Defendant elected to ignore the warning and filed a motion seeking leave to file its 37-page memorandum in support of its motion to decertify on the same day the motion was due. The Court entered the order regarding the due date for the motion to decertify on August 20, 2013, over five months ago. Defendant is directed to file no later than February 12, 2014 a statement detailing when it knew its memorandum was likely to exceed the 15-page limit set forth in the Local Rules and explaining why it decided to ignore the Court's admonition and not seek leave for the additional pages at the time it first realized it would need additional pages. Mailed notice (cjg, )
February 4, 2014 Filing 258 Defendants Certification Regarding Current eBeyondTXT Timekeeping Capability by Transcend Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hines, Erin)
February 4, 2014 Filing 257 Certification of Shailendra Sharma Regarding M*Modal Transition by Transcend Services, Inc. (Hines, Erin)
February 4, 2014 Filing 256 REPLY by Transcend Services, Inc. to MOTION by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. to file instanter Its Memorandum of Law In Support Of Decertification In Excess Of Fifteen Pages #249 , response in opposition to motion #255 (Hines, Erin)
February 4, 2014 Filing 255 RESPONSE by Theresa Cosentinoin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. to file instanter Its Memorandum of Law In Support Of Decertification In Excess Of Fifteen Pages #249 (Dolley, Kevin)
February 4, 2014 Filing 254 APPENDIX motion to file instanter #249 Memorandum In Support of Its Motion for Decertification of the Conditionally Certified Class (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 31, #2 Exhibit 32, #3 Exhibit 33, #4 Exhibit 34, #5 Exhibit 35, #6 Exhibit 36, #7 Exhibit 37, #8 Exhibit 38, #9 Exhibit 39, #10 Exhibit 40)(Hines, Erin)
February 3, 2014 Filing 253 APPENDIX motion to file instanter #249 Memorandum In Support of Its Motion for Decertification of the Conditionally Certified Class (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21 - Part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit 21 - Part 2 of 2, #3 Exhibit 22, #4 Exhibit 23, #5 Exhibit 24, #6 Exhibit 25, #7 Exhibit 26, #8 Exhibit 27, #9 Exhibit 28, #10 Exhibit 29, #11 Exhibit 30)(Hines, Erin)
February 3, 2014 Filing 252 APPENDIX motion to file instanter #249 Memorandum In Support of Its Motion for Decertification of the Conditionally Certified Class (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11, #2 Exhibit 12, #3 Exhibit 13, #4 Exhibit 14, #5 Exhibit 15, #6 Exhibit 16, #7 Exhibit 17, #8 Exhibit 18, #9 Exhibit 19, #10 Exhibit 20)(Hines, Erin)
February 3, 2014 Filing 251 APPENDIX motion to file instanter #249 Memorandum In Support of Its Motion for Decertification of the Conditionally Certified Class (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10 - Part 1 of 2, #11 Exhibit 10 - Part 2 of 2)(Hines, Erin)
February 3, 2014 Filing 250 NOTICE of Motion by Erin Bolan Hines for presentment of motion to file instanter #249 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 2/7/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Hines, Erin)
February 3, 2014 Filing 249 MOTION by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. to file instanter Its Memorandum of Law In Support Of Decertification In Excess Of Fifteen Pages (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hines, Erin)
February 3, 2014 Filing 248 NOTICE of Motion by Erin Bolan Hines for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #247 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 2/7/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Hines, Erin)
February 3, 2014 Filing 247 MOTION by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc.To Decertify The Conditionally Certified Class (Hines, Erin)
January 29, 2014 Filing 246 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 01/28/2014 before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Transcript of proceedings. Court Reporter Contact Information: Judith A. Walsh, CSR, RDR, CRR, 312.702.8865, judith_walsh@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/19/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/3/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/29/2014. (walsh, Judy)
January 28, 2014 Filing 245 Certification of Gregory V. Mersol Regarding BeyondTXT and eBeyondTXT Platforms by Transcend Services, Inc. (Hines, Erin)
January 28, 2014 Filing 244 Certification of Nancy A. Newark Regarding BeyondTXT and eBeyondTXT by Transcend Services, Inc. (Hines, Erin)
January 28, 2014 Filing 243 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing and motion hearing held on 1/28/2014. Motion by Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino to compel Production of Platform Data and for Order to Show Cause #238 and motion by Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino to compel Electronically Stored Information (ESI) and For Sanctions #240 are granted in part as stated in open court. Status hearing set for 2/7/2014 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (cjg, )
January 27, 2014 Filing 242 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 01/21/2014 before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Status hearing. Court Reporter Contact Information: Judith A. Walsh, CSR, RDR, CRR, 312.702-8865, judith_walsh@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/17/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/27/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2014. (walsh, Judy)
January 26, 2014 Filing 241 NOTICE of Motion by Kevin J. Dolley for presentment of motion to compel #240 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 1/28/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Dolley, Kevin)
January 26, 2014 Filing 240 MOTION by Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino to compel Electronically Stored Information (ESI) and For Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
January 24, 2014 Filing 239 NOTICE of Motion by Kevin J. Dolley for presentment of motion to compel #238 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 1/28/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Dolley, Kevin)
January 24, 2014 Filing 238 MOTION by Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino to compel Production of Platform Data and for Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Dolley, Kevin)
January 23, 2014 Filing 237 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9050294 (Jonathan Skrabacz) #204 is granted. Mailed notice (cjg, )
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 1/21/2014: Motion to compel #228 is denied in part, motion to compel #230 is denied, motion for extension of time #232 is granted. Mailed notice(cjg, )
January 21, 2014 Filing 235 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing held on 1/21/2014. Status hearing set for 1/28/2014 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (cjg, )
January 20, 2014 Filing 234 RESPONSE by Theresa Cosentinoin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Transcend Services, Inc., Transcend Services, Inc., Transcend Services, Inc., Transcend Services, Inc., Transcend Services, Inc., Transcend Services, Inc. to compel Plaintiffs' Production of Documents and Interrogatory Answ #230 (Dolley, Kevin)
January 17, 2014 Filing 233 NOTICE of Motion by Erin Bolan Hines for presentment of extension of time #232 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 1/21/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Hines, Erin)
January 17, 2014 Filing 232 MOTION by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. for extension of time For The Limited Purpose Of Complying With The Magistrate Judges January 8, 2014 Order (Agreed) (Hines, Erin)
January 17, 2014 Filing 231 NOTICE of Motion by Erin Bolan Hines for presentment of motion to compel,,,, #230 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 1/21/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Hines, Erin)
January 16, 2014 Filing 230 MOTION by Defendants Transcend Services, Inc., Transcend Services, Inc., Transcend Services, Inc., Transcend Services, Inc., Transcend Services, Inc., Transcend Services, Inc. to compel Plaintiffs' Production of Documents and Interrogatory Answers in Response to Transcend's First Request for Production and First Set of Interrogatories (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rapp depo, #2 Exhibit B - St. Georges depo, #3 Exhibit C - Hearing transcript excerpt, #4 Exhibit D - Def's RFP to Chancey, #5 Exhibit E - Chancey's responses to discovery requests, #6 Exhibit F - Correspondence, #7 Exhibit G - Denio responses, #8 Exhibit H - Failla responses, #9 Exhibit I - Hayes responses, #10 Exhibit J - Lindquist responses, #11 Exhibit K - Marques responses, #12 Exhibit L - Martin responses, #13 Exhibit M - McLemore responses, #14 Exhibit N - Schuster responses, #15 Exhibit O - Smith responses, #16 Exhibit P - Vaughn responses, #17 Exhibit Q - Wingler responses)(Ellerson, Tracey)
January 16, 2014 Filing 229 NOTICE of Motion by Kevin J. Dolley for presentment of motion to compel, #228 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 1/21/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Dolley, Kevin)
January 16, 2014 Filing 228 MOTION by Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino to compel Defendant to Complete Specific Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Dolley, Kevin)
January 13, 2014 Filing 227 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland:Parties called the Court today unable to resolve a dispute about the location of two Rule 30(b)(6) depositions that must be completed this week as discovery is set to close on 1/13/14. Defendant had originally indicated both days of 30(b)(6) depositions would take place in Atlanta, Georgia. Apparently, due to some medical issues, one of the Rule 30(b)(6) witnesses needs to be deposed in Clearwater, Florida. Due to the witness' medical issues, that deposition shall take place in Clearwater, Florida on 1/16/14. The parties were unable to resolve the dispute as to the location of the other Rule 30(b)(6) deposition. It is hereby ordered that the remaining 30(b)(6) deposition take place in Clearwater, Florida on 1/17/14.Mailed notice (gel, )
January 13, 2014 Filing 226 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: The remaining portion of Defendants Motion for a Protective Order Regarding Plaintiffs December 28, 2013 Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice #210 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. On January 10, 2014, as stated more fully on the record in open court, the Court granted in part and denied in part other matters raised in Defendants Motion for a Protective Order. (Dkt. 225). (See Order For Further Details) Mailed notice (lxs, )
January 10, 2014 Filing 225 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: As stated more fully on the record in open court, Defendant's Motion for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiffs' December 28, 2013 Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice #210 is granted in part, denied in part, and taken under advisement in part. The Court will rule by mail on the remaining issues related to Compliance Efforts. (See Dkt. 210 Ex. 1 at 83-92). (rbf, )
January 10, 2014 Filing 224 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland:Motion hearing held. As stated more fully on the record, Defendant's Motion to Compel Specific Opt-Ins to Participate in Discovery #214 is denied. Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order Limiting Length of Remaining Opt-In Plaintiffs' Depositions #218 is denied. Defendant's counsel is reminded that they should be respectful of the Opt-In Plaintiffs' time. As stated more fully on the record, Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Full and Complete Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories Directed to Defendant #217 is denied without prejudice. (rbf, )
January 9, 2014 Filing 223 RESPONSE by Theresa Cosentinoin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. for protective order And Incorporated Memorandum Of Law Regarding Plaintiffs December 28, 2013 Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice #210 (Dolley, Kevin)
January 9, 2014 Filing 222 RESPONSE by Theresa Cosentinoin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. to compel Specific Opt-Ins to Participate In Discovery #214 (Dolley, Kevin)
January 9, 2014 Filing 221 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/6/2013 before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Court Reporter Contact Information: ALEXANDRA ROTH, alexandra_roth@ilnd.uscourts.gov, (312) 408-5038. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 1/30/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/10/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/9/2014. (Roth, Alexandra)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories Directed to Defendant and Second Set of Requests for Production Directed to Defendant #205 is DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Court Order and for Order to Show Cause #206 is DENIED IN PART AND GRANTED IN PART. Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Fulland Complete Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Defendant and First Set of Requests for Production Directed to Defendant #207 isDENIED IN PART AND GRANTED IN PART. Signed by the Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 1/8/2014. [For Further Details See Order.] Mailed notice (meg, )
January 7, 2014 Filing 219 NOTICE of Motion by Kevin J. Dolley for presentment of motion to compel #217 , motion for protective order #218 before Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 1/10/2014 at 11:00 AM. (Dolley, Kevin)
January 7, 2014 Filing 218 MOTION by Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino for protective order Limiting Length of Remaining Opt-in Plaintiffs Depositions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dolley, Kevin)
January 7, 2014 Filing 217 MOTION by Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino to compel Full and Complete Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories Directed to Defendant (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Dolley, Kevin)
January 7, 2014 Filing 216 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendant's motion for protective order #210 and Defendant's motion to compel #214 are reset for 1/10/2014 at 11:00 AM. (NOTE DATE CHANGE)Mailed notice (gel, )
January 7, 2014 Filing 215 NOTICE of Motion by Erin Bolan Hines for presentment of motion to compel, #214 before Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 1/9/2014 at 09:15 AM. (Hines, Erin)
January 7, 2014 Filing 214 MOTION by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. to compel Specific Opt-Ins to Participate In Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Hines, Erin)
January 3, 2014 Filing 213 RESPONSE by Transcend Services, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino to compel Full and Complete Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Defendant and First Set of Requests for Production Directed to Defendant #207 , MOTION by Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino to compel Responses to Plaintiffs Second Set of Interrogatories Directed to Defendant and Second Set of Requests for Production Directed to Defendant #205 , MOTION by Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino to compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Court Order and for Order to Show Cause #206 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Hines, Erin)
January 3, 2014 Filing 212 NOTICE of Motion by Erin Bolan Hines for presentment of motion for protective order #210 before Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 1/9/2014 at 09:15 AM. (Hines, Erin)
January 3, 2014 Filing 211 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland:Defendants' oral motion to compel production of document heard telephonically. Motion granted. Parties called chambers from a deposition being conducted in Montana. Plaintiffs' counsel is ordered to produce the document of postings by deponent and others, as printed by deponent, to a website for those training to be MLSs. Documents to be produced for attorney's eyes only. Mailed notice (gel, )
January 3, 2014 Filing 210 MOTION by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. for protective order And Incorporated Memorandum Of Law Regarding Plaintiffs December 28, 2013 Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hines, Erin)
December 30, 2013 Filing 209 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland:Discovery status hearing held. The parties are on track to complete the depositions of the 21 representative opt-in plaintiffs. The personnel records for the plaintiff to be deposed in Montana on Friday, 1/3/14, MUST be produced by close of business 12/31/13. Plaintiff's three discovery motions [205, 206, 207] are taken under advisement. Defendant to file any response by 1/3/14. Plaintiff is to submit a sample of the payroll and timekeeping records discussed in open court to chambers by the close of business on 12/31/13. Plaintiffs should identify the samples produced for the Defendant. The Court will rule by mail. Mailed notice (gel, )
December 29, 2013 Filing 208 NOTICE of Motion by Kevin J. Dolley for presentment of (Dolley, Kevin)
December 29, 2013 Filing 207 MOTION by Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino to compel Full and Complete Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Defendant and First Set of Requests for Production Directed to Defendant (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
December 29, 2013 Filing 206 MOTION by Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino to compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Court Order and for Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
December 29, 2013 Filing 205 MOTION by Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino to compel Responses to Plaintiffs Second Set of Interrogatories Directed to Defendant and Second Set of Requests for Production Directed to Defendant (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
December 23, 2013 Filing 204 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9050294. (Dolley, Kevin)
December 13, 2013 Filing 203 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing set for 12/17/2013 is stricken and reset to 1/21/2014 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (cjg, )
December 6, 2013 Filing 202 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland:Motion hearing held. Defendant's Motion for Protective Order #197 is denied with prejudice. Status hearing held. The parties are working diligently to resolve several technically challenging production issues. Defendant has substantially complied with this Court's November 26, 2013 Orders [193 -195]. With respect to all of the plaintiffs to be deposed, Defendant is ordered to produce (1) Beyond Text Production Report (Edward's Dep Ex. 70); (2) Beyond Text Timelogs with Edits Reports (Edward's Dep Ex. 32); and (3) ADP Time Saver Card (Edwards Dep Ex. 31). Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition(s) to take place the week of 12/16/13. Case set for status on 12/30/2013 at 10:30 AM. Mailed notice (gel, )
December 5, 2013 Filing 201 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Notice of motion hearing set for 12/10/2013 is stricken. Defendant's motion to remove pleading as incorrectly filed #199 is granted. The Clerk's office is directed to remove document number #196 from the electronic docket as incorrectly filed. Mailed notice (cjg, )
December 4, 2013 Filing 200 NOTICE of Motion by Erin Bolan Hines for presentment of motion to amend/correct #199 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 12/10/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Hines, Erin)
December 4, 2013 Filing 199 MOTION by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. to amend/correct Motion For An Order To Remove Pleading Incorrectly Filed From The Court Docket (Hines, Erin)
December 4, 2013 Filing 198 NOTICE of Motion by Erin Bolan Hines for presentment of motion for protective order, #197 before Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 12/6/2013 at 08:30 AM. (Hines, Erin)
December 4, 2013 Filing 197 MOTION by Plaintiff Transcend Services, Inc., Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. for protective order And Incorporated Memorandum Of Law To Prevent Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition From Proceeding On December 5, 2013 Due To Unavailability Of Witness And Lack Of Reasonable Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hines, Erin)
December 4, 2013 Filing 196 Document removed per court order #201 . (Hines, Erin) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office.) ( Modified on 12/5/2013 (kj, ).
November 26, 2013 Filing 195 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Status hearing set for 12/6/2013 at 08:30 AM.Mailed notice (gel, )
November 26, 2013 Filing 194 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland:Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #189 is granted. The production as contained in Exhibits 6 and 7 to the Plaintiffs' Motion is inadequate. The plaintiffs are entitled to the information contained on the earnings statements received by each plaintiff at the end of every pay period. Defendant is ordered to produce this information for the 21 people subject to deposition by 12/6/13, to the extent it is available, other than in the data already produced. Furthermore, the parties are to confer on 11/27/13, and defendant is to explain the data to plaintiffs' counsel to allow counsel to calculate the information contained on the individual plaintiffs' earnings statements from the data provided. By 12/2/13, defendant shall identify the name of the ADP staff member who has been consulting with defendant on this matter. Plaintiff is encouraged to conduct, on an expedited basis, a Rule 30(b)(6) deposition about the data produced. Doing so will not prejudice plaintiffs' ability to conduct a further Rule 30(b)(6) deposition on matters other than the data, if otherwise appropriate. Defendant is not required to provide a privilege log for the information redacted from Exhibits 6 and 7. Mailed notice (gel, )
November 26, 2013 Filing 193 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland:Defendant's Motion To Compel #186 is granted in part and denied in part. Per Judge Guzman's 8/20/13 rulings, Defendant may depose no more than 35 plaintiffs, named or opt-in. Fourteen such depositions have already taken place. Defendant has identified 11 plaintiffs. Plaintiffs are to identify the remaining 10 plaintiffs by 10:00 AM CST on 11/27/13. Plaintiffs must identify every plaintiff whom they intend to call as a witness. Defendant is NOT required to depose all of these plaintiffs. Defendant's Motion is denied as to its request to require that plaintiffs who will be deposed have less time than allowed by the federal rules to respond to written discovery. Defendant is order to produce personnel files for all 21 people on a rolling basis with a goal of production by 12/6/2013. Mailed notice (gel, )
November 21, 2013 Filing 192 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland:Motion Hearing set for 11/26/2013 at 10:30 AM regarding Defendant's motion to compel #186 and Plaintiff's motion to compel #189 . Mailed notice (gel, )
November 20, 2013 Filing 191 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing set for 11/20/2013 is stricken and reset to 12/17/2013 at 09:30 AM. on Court's own motion. Mailed notice (cjg, )
November 20, 2013 Filing 190 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Mary M. Rowland for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision and all discovery motions including motion by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. to compel Plaintiffs Identification Of Opt-In Deponents To Comply With The Courts August 20, 2013 Scheduling Order And To Expedite Discovery #186 and motion by Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino to compel Defendant To Produce Payroll And Timekeeping Information For Plaintiffs #189 , without authority to extend discovery deadline. (cjg, )Mailed notice.
November 19, 2013 Filing 189 MOTION by Plaintiff Theresa Cosentino to compel Defendant To Produce Payroll And Timekeeping Information For Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
November 19, 2013 Filing 188 RESPONSE by Theresa Cosentinoin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. to compel Plaintiffs Identification Of Opt-In Deponents To Comply With The Courts August 20, 2013 Scheduling Order And To Expedite Discovery #186 (Dolley, Kevin)
November 15, 2013 Filing 187 NOTICE of Motion by Erin Bolan Hines for presentment of motion to compel, #186 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 11/20/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Hines, Erin)
November 15, 2013 Filing 186 MOTION by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. to compel Plaintiffs Identification Of Opt-In Deponents To Comply With The Courts August 20, 2013 Scheduling Order And To Expedite Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Hines, Erin)
November 4, 2013 Filing 185 MINUTE entry before Honorable Mary M. Rowland:Status hearing held on 11/4/2013 and continued to 1/21/2014 at 09:00 AM. Parties should be prepared to discuss whether they wish to set a settlement conference at the next status. Parties wishing to appear by telephone should contact chambers at least 1 business day before hearing by calling 312-435-5857. Mailed notice (gel, )
October 10, 2013 Filing 184 MINUTE entry before Honorable Mary M. Rowland:At the Parties request, the Settlement Conference previously set for 10/21/2013 is stricken. Status hearing set for 11/4/2013 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (gel, )
August 26, 2013 Filing 183 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Susan J. Jones by Kevin J. Dolley (Dolley, Kevin)
August 26, 2013 Filing 182 NOTICE by Susan J. Jones (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
August 26, 2013 Filing 181 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 8/20/13 before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy LaBella, 312-435-6890, Nancy_LaBella@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/16/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/26/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/25/2013. (Labella, Nancy)
August 26, 2013 Filing 180 MINUTE entry before Honorable Mary M. Rowland:Status hearing held on 8/26/2013. Settlement Conference set for 10/21/2013 at 09:00 AM. Plaintiff's demand letter is due by 10/7/2013. Defendant's reply letter is due by 10/14/2013. Parties should review and comply with Judge Rowland's standing order regarding settlement conferences which is located on Judge Rowland's web page on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov.Mailed notice (gel, )
August 22, 2013 Filing 179 MINUTE entry before Honorable Mary M. Rowland:Initial status hearing set for 8/26/2013 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mary M. Rowland for the purpose of scheduling a settlement conference. Parties are to bring dates when both clients and counsel will be available for a settlement conference. Judge Rowland generally conducts settlement conferences Mondays through Thursdays at 1:00 p.m. Other dates and times may be available as required by the Court or the parties. The parties are directed to review and to comply with Judge Rowland's Standing Order regarding Setting Settlement Conferences, which is available on Judge Rowland's webpage located on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov.Mailed notice (gel, )
August 21, 2013 Filing 178 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland for settlement conference. Signed by Executive Committee on August 21, 2013.(tlp, )
August 20, 2013 Filing 177 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing held on 8/20/2013. Fact discovery ordered closed by 1/17/2014. Defendant's motion to decertify class due by 2/3/2014. Response due 2/24/2014. Reply due 3/10/2014. Ruling by mail. Status hearing set for 11/20/2013 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (cjg, )
August 20, 2013 Filing 176 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Tanya Acquaire, Melissa J. Adelson, Angela Aldridge, Donna J. Alexander, Wendy Alkire, Lisa Allarde, Elizabeth Altgilbers, Karen Amelung, Dorothy L. Ancona, Darla J. Anderson, Joy L. Anderson, Tisha Anderson, Darlene M. Archie, Linda Armstrong, Ann Marie Armstrong-Deitch, Sherri M. Armuth, Susan H. Arthur, Vickie Astudillo, Joy Christine Atwell, Cheryl Ayers, Joyce Baena, Suzanne M. Bailey, Brenda Bain, Elizabeth Baker, Cindy A. Baker-Spriggs, Janice A. Baldwin, Elaine L. Ballance, Terri Ballard, Jennifer Ballentine, Holly Banner, Michelle Barbes, Michelle Bardo, Margaret Bardwell, Joy Bargerstock, Shannon Barnes, Alane M Barnes Garvik, Patricia C. Barragan, Katherin Barrow, Debra J. Barry, Deborah Bartelo, Jennette Bastion (Horner), Deborah Bauer, Judith Bean, Cheryl Beauchamp, Deanne L. Becker, Jacqueline Becker, Susan C. Becker, Helen I. Bell, Sheryl J. Bell, JoAnne A. Benson, Karen Berezoski, Roberta Bianchini, Gwendolyn Eartha Lee Bienvenu, Diane H. Birrer, Teresa Bischof, Gail Black, Cheryl J. Blake, Kay A. Bone, Carole J. Boom, Angela R. Booth, Laurie M. Boren, Marilyn M. Bower, Robin L. Bowers, Elizabeth Ann Bowman, Cecilia Bradford, Carol Brake, Stephanie R. Brammer, Linda Brewer, Cheryl Shaw Briggs, Anne C. Brinzea, Hope Brown, Susan Brown, Amy A. Bruce, Sandra J. Bruce, Leslie Brueckner, Tina Brush, Mary Christine Bryant, Wendy J. Buckheit, Judith A. Buckingham, Ellen K. Buffy, Vicki Bunch, Margaret M. Burchard, Diane Burgbacher, Kathleen C. Burke, Debra L. Burns, Shelly Buschman, Nancy Caldwell, Deborah A. Calendine, Rebecca S. Cameron, Debbie M. Campbell, Kellie L. Campbell, Ronda Campbell, Claudia Stella Cantelmi, Elizabeth M. Carithers, Eva L. Carlson, Jo Ellen Carnes, Margaret Diane Carter, Jolene Cartwright, Kevin P. Cartwright, Linda Carucci, Margaret Cary, Gwen Cashion, Kimberly Ceplenski, Kandace Chancey, Jennifer Chandler, Jeannette M. Chipka, Mary Ciesicki, Joanne Frances Cimo, Rosemary Cinquanti, Barbara Ciulla, Kim Claeys, Teresa Slater Clark, Harriet Sue Clarke, Lou Ann Cleary, Theresa Clubb, Patricia Clunk, Tina Coelho, Karen S. Colburn, Kimberly Coleman (f/k/a Lauffer), April E. Colleen, Vicki E. Collier, Ian Connors, Karl E. Constantino, Cindy Conwell, Sharon Cook, Lilia M. Cooper, Marcie Cooper, Nancy M Corcoran, Lois D. Cores, Tonna G. Cornett, Theresa Cosentino, Mary Kitra Cox, Arlene Bonnie Crafton, LeAnn M. Cramer, Theresa M Crane, Kimberly Crocker-Hendrickson, Kristen A. Crowe, Tamra Crowley, Jennifer Crutcher, Carolyn Cumings, Tara A. Cummings, Beverly M. Cundiff, Darcie J. Cunningham, M. Susan Cunningham, Susan Lynne Damasco, Connie G. Darling, Trudy Davenport, JoAnn Davey, Robin Davies, Joan M. Davis, Marcela C. DeBano, Janeen S. DeBoard, Teresa A. DeSchryver, Stephanie DeWitt, Rosemarie Dean, Rita A. Defino, Renee Demmery, Laura Denio, Pamela J. Denny, Kim N. Dent, Ana Derakshaw, Jennifer L. Dick, Patricia A. Dickerson, Shana Diekhoff, Valerie Dininni, Linda R. Dittmer, Sherma Donnelly, Sherry A. Doratio, Mark E. Dorn, Angela B. Dortch, Denese Dugay, Constance A. Duncan, Thelma S. Durgin, Sharon Dutton, Holly Dyer, Delois F. Easterling, Jessica Edwards, Lisa Edwards, Terian Edwards, Jessica Eik, Jennie Eisenstein, Rosemary Elmore, Carli L. Emerson, John English, Teri L Eriksen, Catherine M. Estep (f/k/a Foster), Mindy Faieta, Carol Failla, Melissa Fain, Donna Falco, Judy Fallon, Julie M. Farmer, Donna Farrell, Lori A. Favinger, Saundra Feighner, Laurel Jo Feiker, Robin Feltner, Paula Ferguson, Anna Feroe, Kelli Fisher, Wendy Fisher, Sharon A. Flemmings, Mari J. Floyd, Denise Foell, Amy L. Ford, Sheila R. Ford, Jennifer L. Foreman, Tracey Forsythe, Daniel Foster, Theresa D. Fox, Claudia M. Franklin, Kimberly Freda, Susan L. Frederick, Laura Frederiksen, Debra R. Friess, Rise Fritz, Jessica Fulghum, Lynn Galenza, Deanna Garcia, Lauren Gato, Kristen Votzakis Gauthier, Judith Gay, Cecilia Gaynor, Kristine E. Genrich, Judith Joyce Gerber, Kim Gersie-Scott, Laurie Gianquinto, Diane Gibas, Cynthia C. Gibson, Kimberly K. Gibson, Nikki R. Gilbert, Alice Elaine Gillespie, Karen Gland, Kimberly A. Glotfelty, Virginia Gomez, Sonia T. Gonzalez, Karen Goodrich, Francine Gorskie, Kenneth E. Grassman, Linda Gray, Randi Gray, Nancy M. Greene, Heather Greenslade, June A. Greenwood, Melinda Griffus, Deborah Guffey, Pamela J. Gugliotta, Lynne D. Hackaday, Marcia A. Hahn, Cathy Haines, Angela E. Hall, Mary Hall, Deloris P. Hamilton, Laura Hammersley, Darlene C. Hanson, Jane A. Hanson, Shannon Harbinson, Joanna Hardin, Cynthia M. Harp, Janet E. Harper, Pamela D. Harper, Rosemary Harrison, Tracy L. Harrod, Sarah M. Hatch, Nancy Haupt, Susan Haworth, Fayetta L. Hay, Annette P. Hayes, Patsy D. Hayes, Sheryl Hazelrigg, Ronda Hebenstreit, Vicki Heinecke, Lorraine L. Henderson, Janet A. Henkel, Lynsi Henson, Lisa Hering, Diane Hernandez, Marjorie Hess, Sherry D. Hess, Maureen Hicks, Rosalie Hicks, Paula B. Hightower, Dawn Hill, Edith M. Hinkle, Karen Hobbs, Lisa M. Hoefgen, Jason Hoffman, Cindy I. Holland, Cynthia S. Holley, Treby C. Hood, Janet Hook, Peggy M. Hopper, Lynn Horn, Connie Horton, Gail Hoskins, Shara Howard, Melissa Howe, Mary Ann Hren, Gail Hudson, Michelle Hughes, Karen Humensky, Kathleen Hussey, Carlotta Ingle, Carla Ingraham-Gaughan, Kathleen P. Irwin, Diana Iseminger, Tammy Isham, Donna L. Jackson, Lorraine Jackson, Bonnie M. Jakmauh, Patricia James, Kathleen J. Jandreau, Susan K. Janzen, Debra L. Johns, Dale Johnson (Medina), Catherine R. Johnson-Berger, Roberta L. Jonas, Christy S. Jones, Debra Jane Jones, Julie A. Jones, Shannon Jones, Dawn R. Jordan, Diana Jordan, Marita Patricia Joseph, Naomi I. Joslin, Jean Jouskey, Cleo Diane Joyner, Joni Joyner, Jodi Kabalin, Cheryl Kahl, Linda M. Kalbac, Mary D. Kane, Joanna Karneeb, Barbara Keenan, Kimberly Keevy, Jenette M. Kelly, Kathryn L. Kelly, Sharon Kendrick, Sharon Kenno, Vicki L. Kenobbie, Laura Key, Keula Francis Kilgore, Candace Kinsora, Mary Kleppin, Cheri Kline, Vicki J. LaPlante, Kathryn E. Lacey, Deborah J. Land, Joanne Lane, Rosemary Wood Langella, Coreen M. Larson, Yvonne Lawrence, Patricia Lawson, Diana LeVan, Elaine Leach, Janet Lee, Stacy S. Lee, Cathy S. Lefils, Daphne M. Leibowitz, Susan Lell, Carol Lindemon, Judy M. Lindquist, Jacqueline M. Linville, Christine G. Lockwood, Rebecca L. Loew, Lesa Logan, Julene Logue, Amy L. Long, Renee T. Long, Kristall Lopez, Melissa A. Love, Alice Lovingood, Kathy M. Lucas, Judith Lugo, Joy Lutz, Laurie Lynch, Jayden Nicole Lyons, Margaret E. Mackey, Elizabeth J. Maddox, Barbara Magliochetti, Judith A. Mannarini, Denise Marie Byrne, Sarena Marques, Konnie Marquis, Diane Martin, Sherry Martin, Steven Martin, Tammy Martinez, April G. Marx, Suzanne Mascola, Theresa L. Mashburn, Teri Massengale, Linda Mathias, Angela Matias, DeEnna L. Matthews, Kimberly Mauger, Evelyn R. Maynard, Jewel A. Mazur, Cheryl L. McAnich, Mary McClelland, Trinka D. McClure (f/k/a Pettyjohn), Michell McComas, Pamela McCord, Beverly McCoy, Pamela H. McCullough, Angela McDonough, Nina McFarlane, Donna McKenna, Claire McKinnon, Tonya Michelle McKnight, Mary M. McLaughlin, Joy McLemore, Bobbi McMillin, Margo McNeil, Karen McNeilan, Tina Mehler, Denise Melchior, Beverly Merkel, Marsha Merrell, Rae J. Messick, Yvonne Meyerhofer, Karen Milan, Sharron K. Miles, Carey L. Miller, Carol S. Miller, Joanne G. Miller, Kay L. Miller, Lillian L. Miller, Mary Miller, Janet K. Mitchell, Marilyn Mitchell, Tanya Mixon-White, Virginia M. Mize, Kathleen Moelter, Debra Ann Molitaris, Carol Montgomery, Ann Moore, Cathi R. Moore, Janet Moore, Kimberly Moore, Patricia A. Morgan, Pamela Morrow, Linda F. Morton, Michael Mosteller II, Traci M. Muchler, Juliene A. Munoz, Katherine Murphy, Jennifer Murrell, Tyesha Mustin, Angela W. Myers, Ann W. Myers, Debra L. Myers, Deidre Myers, Jessalynn Myers, Rebecca J. Nagy, Penelope C. Neal, Ruth Lynn Neely, Tamikka R. Nelson, Brenda Newberg, Janet M. Newsome, Veronica Nicholas, Renee A. Nichols, Carol A. Nigsarian, Deborah K Norton, Tacara Norwood, Mary Anne Novello, Dawn J. O'Connor, Dawn T. O'Connor, Theresa Ann O'Connor, Maureen O'Kelly, Emily Oates, Karla Ockerby, Wanda L. Olson, Wendi Ortiz, Brenda L. Osborne, Paige D. Owens (Hundley), Charlene Palmer, Debra H. Parent, Christina Anne Parman, Kelly Parsons, Betty M. Patton, Julianne Patton, Christie Patzer, Leona R. Payne, Jeanne A. Pedersen, Teresa Pemerton, Dawn Pence, Deborah Pepsak, Diane Perryman, Debra A. Petralia, Wendi J. Pierson, Karen L. Pirok, Brenda Lee Plessinger, Julie A. Plourde, Marie A. Plum, Bobbi E. Pollak, Anna C. Pomeroy, Melissa Poole, Sandra Porter, Susan E. Powell, Tina Preston, Joanne Price, Cherie S. Price-Palmer, April Prior, Catherine Probst, Annette D. Pruett, Brenda Pryczynski, B. Jeannie Purcell, Julie Purdy (f/k/a Ramson), Velma Renee Quartullo, Christian V Ramos, Elaina Marie Rande, Patricia Ann Rapp, Joyce Ratajczak, Joanne Rathmann, Jacqueline Ratliff, Linda B. Ray, Alicia Reese, Sheila Reeser, Rhonda Reeves, Linda Reid, Lorna Reinhart, Wendy H. Reisenauer, Debra K. Resimont, Krissy Reynolds, Beverly S. Richardson, Marie Ricksgers, Cheryl B. Rieper, Gail A. Riley, Les Rinehart, Helen Ring, Jenny S. Rink, Briget Rischawy, Parrish Ritchie, Leslie Robertson, Deanna L. Robinson, Steven Rodriquez, Eileen Roff, Gina Rogers, Lynn E. Rogers, Eileen Rollins, Lynda D. Romanek, Lecia Ropp, Jane L. Rose, Cathy J. Rowe, Mary Lou Rusbarsky, Toiee Angela Rushing, Linda Rutkowski, Jeanette Rydell, Bonnie Ryden, Rhea D. Safire, Constance D. Salvia, Judith A. Sanders, Kathy S. Sanders, Jan E Sandoval, Valerie B. Sawyer, Bonnie Scaia, Mary Teresa Schanz, Jenalyn Scheib, Patricia A. Schmutz, Deborah Schneider, Deborah K. Schneider, Shannon Schroeder, Kathleen M. Schuster, Sherry L. Schwartz, Benjamin Roy Scott, Christy L. Scott, Melinda Scott, Rosie Scott, Karyn B. Scrivener, Theresa K. Segady, Elizabeth A. Sennett, Debra Seuell, Dawn Shaffer, Jean M. Shang, Joy A Sharpe, Denise D. Shelby, Brenda Shelton, Patricia J. Shilling, Elaine Shortall, Cathryn Sibert, Debra H. Sills, Susan Silver, Debra Silviano, Cheryl Simmons, Kathleen M. Simons, Susanne Simonson, Robin Reid Wooten Simpson, Paige Singleton, Lisa Sinkler, Jean M. Sizemore,
August 20, 2013 Filing 175 NOTICE by John English, Cathy Haines (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
August 19, 2013 Filing 174 Defendant's Proposed Post Opt-In Scheduling Plan by Transcend Services, Inc. (Hines, Erin)
August 19, 2013 Filing 173 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Tanya Acquaire, Melissa J. Adelson, Angela Aldridge, Donna J. Alexander, Wendy Alkire, Lisa Allarde, Elizabeth Altgilbers, Karen Amelung, Dorothy L. Ancona, Darla J. Anderson, Joy L. Anderson, Tisha Anderson, Darlene M. Archie, Linda Armstrong, Ann Marie Armstrong-Deitch, Sherri M. Armuth, Susan H. Arthur, Vickie Astudillo, Joy Christine Atwell, Cheryl Ayers, Joyce Baena, Suzanne M. Bailey, Brenda Bain, Elizabeth Baker, Cindy A. Baker-Spriggs, Janice A. Baldwin, Elaine L. Ballance, Terri Ballard, Jennifer Ballentine, Holly Banner, Michelle Barbes, Michelle Bardo, Margaret Bardwell, Joy Bargerstock, Shannon Barnes, Alane M Barnes Garvik, Patricia C. Barragan, Katherin Barrow, Debra J. Barry, Deborah Bartelo, Jennette Bastion (Horner), Deborah Bauer, Judith Bean, Cheryl Beauchamp, Deanne L. Becker, Jacqueline Becker, Susan C. Becker, Helen I. Bell, Sheryl J. Bell, JoAnne A. Benson, Karen Berezoski, Roberta Bianchini, Gwendolyn Eartha Lee Bienvenu, Diane H. Birrer, Teresa Bischof, Gail Black, Cheryl J. Blake, Kay A. Bone, Carole J. Boom, Angela R. Booth, Laurie M. Boren, Marilyn M. Bower, Robin L. Bowers, Elizabeth Ann Bowman, Cecilia Bradford, Carol Brake, Stephanie R. Brammer, Linda Brewer, Cheryl Shaw Briggs, Anne C. Brinzea, Hope Brown, Susan Brown, Amy A. Bruce, Sandra J. Bruce, Leslie Brueckner, Tina Brush, Mary Christine Bryant, Wendy J. Buckheit, Judith A. Buckingham, Ellen K. Buffy, Vicki Bunch, Margaret M. Burchard, Diane Burgbacher, Kathleen C. Burke, Debra L. Burns, Shelly Buschman, Nancy Caldwell, Deborah A. Calendine, Rebecca S. Cameron, Debbie M. Campbell, Kellie L. Campbell, Ronda Campbell, Claudia Stella Cantelmi, Elizabeth M. Carithers, Eva L. Carlson, Jo Ellen Carnes, Margaret Diane Carter, Jolene Cartwright, Kevin P. Cartwright, Linda Carucci, Margaret Cary, Gwen Cashion, Kimberly Ceplenski, Kandace Chancey, Jennifer Chandler, Jeannette M. Chipka, Mary Ciesicki, Joanne Frances Cimo, Rosemary Cinquanti, Barbara Ciulla, Kim Claeys, Teresa Slater Clark, Harriet Sue Clarke, Lou Ann Cleary, Theresa Clubb, Patricia Clunk, Tina Coelho, Karen S. Colburn, Kimberly Coleman (f/k/a Lauffer), April E. Colleen, Vicki E. Collier, Ian Connors, Karl E. Constantino, Cindy Conwell, Sharon Cook, Lilia M. Cooper, Marcie Cooper, Nancy M Corcoran, Lois D. Cores, Tonna G. Cornett, Theresa Cosentino, Mary Kitra Cox, Arlene Bonnie Crafton, LeAnn M. Cramer, Theresa M Crane, Kimberly Crocker-Hendrickson, Kristen A. Crowe, Tamra Crowley, Jennifer Crutcher, Carolyn Cumings, Tara A. Cummings, Beverly M. Cundiff, Darcie J. Cunningham, M. Susan Cunningham, Susan Lynne Damasco, Connie G. Darling, Trudy Davenport, JoAnn Davey, Robin Davies, Joan M. Davis, Marcela C. DeBano, Janeen S. DeBoard, Teresa A. DeSchryver, Stephanie DeWitt, Rosemarie Dean, Rita A. Defino, Renee Demmery, Laura Denio, Pamela J. Denny, Kim N. Dent, Ana Derakshaw, Jennifer L. Dick, Patricia A. Dickerson, Shana Diekhoff, Valerie Dininni, Linda R. Dittmer, Sherma Donnelly, Sherry A. Doratio, Mark E. Dorn, Angela B. Dortch, Denese Dugay, Constance A. Duncan, Thelma S. Durgin, Sharon Dutton, Holly Dyer, Delois F. Easterling, Jessica Edwards, Lisa Edwards, Terian Edwards, Jessica Eik, Jennie Eisenstein, Rosemary Elmore, Carli L. Emerson, Teri L Eriksen, Catherine M. Estep (f/k/a Foster), Mindy Faieta, Carol Failla, Melissa Fain, Donna Falco, Judy Fallon, Julie M. Farmer, Donna Farrell, Lori A. Favinger, Saundra Feighner, Laurel Jo Feiker, Robin Feltner, Paula Ferguson, Anna Feroe, Kelli Fisher, Wendy Fisher, Sharon A. Flemmings, Mari J. Floyd, Denise Foell, Amy L. Ford, Sheila R. Ford, Jennifer L. Foreman, Tracey Forsythe, Daniel Foster, Theresa D. Fox, Claudia M. Franklin, Kimberly Freda, Susan L. Frederick, Laura Frederiksen, Debra R. Friess, Rise Fritz, Jessica Fulghum, Lynn Galenza, Deanna Garcia, Lauren Gato, Kristen Votzakis Gauthier, Judith Gay, Cecilia Gaynor, Kristine E. Genrich, Judith Joyce Gerber, Kim Gersie-Scott, Laurie Gianquinto, Diane Gibas, Cynthia C. Gibson, Kimberly K. Gibson, Nikki R. Gilbert, Alice Elaine Gillespie, Karen Gland, Kimberly A. Glotfelty, Virginia Gomez, Sonia T. Gonzalez, Karen Goodrich, Francine Gorskie, Kenneth E. Grassman, Linda Gray, Randi Gray, Nancy M. Greene, Heather Greenslade, June A. Greenwood, Melinda Griffus, Deborah Guffey, Pamela J. Gugliotta, Lynne D. Hackaday, Marcia A. Hahn, Angela E. Hall, Mary Hall, Deloris P. Hamilton, Laura Hammersley, Darlene C. Hanson, Jane A. Hanson, Shannon Harbinson, Joanna Hardin, Cynthia M. Harp, Janet E. Harper, Pamela D. Harper, Rosemary Harrison, Tracy L. Harrod, Sarah M. Hatch, Nancy Haupt, Susan Haworth, Fayetta L. Hay, Annette P. Hayes, Patsy D. Hayes, Sheryl Hazelrigg, Ronda Hebenstreit, Vicki Heinecke, Lorraine L. Henderson, Janet A. Henkel, Lynsi Henson, Lisa Hering, Diane Hernandez, Marjorie Hess, Sherry D. Hess, Maureen Hicks, Rosalie Hicks, Paula B. Hightower, Dawn Hill, Edith M. Hinkle, Karen Hobbs, Lisa M. Hoefgen, Jason Hoffman, Cindy I. Holland, Cynthia S. Holley, Treby C. Hood, Janet Hook, Peggy M. Hopper, Lynn Horn, Connie Horton, Gail Hoskins, Shara Howard, Melissa Howe, Mary Ann Hren, Gail Hudson, Michelle Hughes, Karen Humensky, Kathleen Hussey, Carlotta Ingle, Carla Ingraham-Gaughan, Kathleen P. Irwin, Diana Iseminger, Tammy Isham, Donna L. Jackson, Lorraine Jackson, Bonnie M. Jakmauh, Patricia James, Kathleen J. Jandreau, Susan K. Janzen, Debra L. Johns, Dale Johnson (Medina), Catherine R. Johnson-Berger, Roberta L. Jonas, Christy S. Jones, Debra Jane Jones, Julie A. Jones, Shannon Jones, Dawn R. Jordan, Diana Jordan, Marita Patricia Joseph, Naomi I. Joslin, Jean Jouskey, Cleo Diane Joyner, Joni Joyner, Jodi Kabalin, Cheryl Kahl, Linda M. Kalbac, Mary D. Kane, Joanna Karneeb, Barbara Keenan, Kimberly Keevy, Jenette M. Kelly, Kathryn L. Kelly, Sharon Kendrick, Sharon Kenno, Vicki L. Kenobbie, Laura Key, Keula Francis Kilgore, Candace Kinsora, Mary Kleppin, Cheri Kline, Vicki J. LaPlante, Kathryn E. Lacey, Deborah J. Land, Joanne Lane, Rosemary Wood Langella, Coreen M. Larson, Yvonne Lawrence, Patricia Lawson, Diana LeVan, Elaine Leach, Janet Lee, Stacy S. Lee, Cathy S. Lefils, Daphne M. Leibowitz, Susan Lell, Carol Lindemon, Judy M. Lindquist, Jacqueline M. Linville, Christine G. Lockwood, Rebecca L. Loew, Lesa Logan, Julene Logue, Amy L. Long, Renee T. Long, Kristall Lopez, Melissa A. Love, Alice Lovingood, Kathy M. Lucas, Judith Lugo, Joy Lutz, Laurie Lynch, Jayden Nicole Lyons, Margaret E. Mackey, Elizabeth J. Maddox, Barbara Magliochetti, Judith A. Mannarini, Denise Marie Byrne, Sarena Marques, Konnie Marquis, Diane Martin, Sherry Martin, Steven Martin, Tammy Martinez, April G. Marx, Suzanne Mascola, Theresa L. Mashburn, Teri Massengale, Linda Mathias, Angela Matias, DeEnna L. Matthews, Kimberly Mauger, Evelyn R. Maynard, Jewel A. Mazur, Cheryl L. McAnich, Mary McClelland, Trinka D. McClure (f/k/a Pettyjohn), Michell McComas, Pamela McCord, Beverly McCoy, Pamela H. McCullough, Angela McDonough, Nina McFarlane, Donna McKenna, Claire McKinnon, Tonya Michelle McKnight, Mary M. McLaughlin, Joy McLemore, Bobbi McMillin, Margo McNeil, Karen McNeilan, Tina Mehler, Denise Melchior, Beverly Merkel, Marsha Merrell, Rae J. Messick, Yvonne Meyerhofer, Karen Milan, Sharron K. Miles, Carey L. Miller, Carol S. Miller, Joanne G. Miller, Kay L. Miller, Lillian L. Miller, Mary Miller, Janet K. Mitchell, Marilyn Mitchell, Tanya Mixon-White, Virginia M. Mize, Kathleen Moelter, Debra Ann Molitaris, Carol Montgomery, Ann Moore, Cathi R. Moore, Janet Moore, Kimberly Moore, Patricia A. Morgan, Pamela Morrow, Linda F. Morton, Michael Mosteller II, Traci M. Muchler, Juliene A. Munoz, Katherine Murphy, Jennifer Murrell, Tyesha Mustin, Angela W. Myers, Ann W. Myers, Debra L. Myers, Deidre Myers, Jessalynn Myers, Rebecca J. Nagy, Penelope C. Neal, Ruth Lynn Neely, Tamikka R. Nelson, Brenda Newberg, Janet M. Newsome, Veronica Nicholas, Renee A. Nichols, Carol A. Nigsarian, Deborah K Norton, Tacara Norwood, Mary Anne Novello, Dawn J. O'Connor, Dawn T. O'Connor, Theresa Ann O'Connor, Maureen O'Kelly, Emily Oates, Karla Ockerby, Wanda L. Olson, Wendi Ortiz, Brenda L. Osborne, Paige D. Owens (Hundley), Charlene Palmer, Debra H. Parent, Christina Anne Parman, Kelly Parsons, Betty M. Patton, Julianne Patton, Christie Patzer, Leona R. Payne, Jeanne A. Pedersen, Teresa Pemerton, Dawn Pence, Deborah Pepsak, Diane Perryman, Debra A. Petralia, Wendi J. Pierson, Karen L. Pirok, Brenda Lee Plessinger, Julie A. Plourde, Marie A. Plum, Bobbi E. Pollak, Anna C. Pomeroy, Melissa Poole, Sandra Porter, Susan E. Powell, Tina Preston, Joanne Price, Cherie S. Price-Palmer, April Prior, Catherine Probst, Annette D. Pruett, Brenda Pryczynski, B. Jeannie Purcell, Julie Purdy (f/k/a Ramson), Velma Renee Quartullo, Christian V Ramos, Elaina Marie Rande, Patricia Ann Rapp, Joyce Ratajczak, Joanne Rathmann, Jacqueline Ratliff, Linda B. Ray, Alicia Reese, Sheila Reeser, Rhonda Reeves, Linda Reid, Lorna Reinhart, Wendy H. Reisenauer, Debra K. Resimont, Krissy Reynolds, Beverly S. Richardson, Marie Ricksgers, Cheryl B. Rieper, Gail A. Riley, Les Rinehart, Helen Ring, Jenny S. Rink, Briget Rischawy, Parrish Ritchie, Leslie Robertson, Deanna L. Robinson, Steven Rodriquez, Eileen Roff, Gina Rogers, Lynn E. Rogers, Eileen Rollins, Lynda D. Romanek, Lecia Ropp, Jane L. Rose, Cathy J. Rowe, Mary Lou Rusbarsky, Toiee Angela Rushing, Linda Rutkowski, Jeanette Rydell, Bonnie Ryden, Rhea D. Safire, Constance D. Salvia, Judith A. Sanders, Kathy S. Sanders, Jan E Sandoval, Valerie B. Sawyer, Bonnie Scaia, Mary Teresa Schanz, Jenalyn Scheib, Patricia A. Schmutz, Deborah Schneider, Deborah K. Schneider, Shannon Schroeder, Kathleen M. Schuster, Sherry L. Schwartz, Benjamin Roy Scott, Christy L. Scott, Melinda Scott, Rosie Scott, Karyn B. Scrivener, Theresa K. Segady, Elizabeth A. Sennett, Debra Seuell, Dawn Shaffer, Jean M. Shang, Joy A Sharpe, Denise D. Shelby, Brenda Shelton, Patricia J. Shilling, Elaine Shortall, Cathryn Sibert, Debra H. Sills, Susan Silver, Debra Silviano, Cheryl Simmons, Kathleen M. Simons, Susanne Simonson, Robin Reid Wooten Simpson, Paige Singleton, Lisa Sinkler, Jean M. Sizemore, David D. Sluder, Teresa D. S
August 19, 2013 Filing 172 NOTICE by Kellie L. Campbell, Deidre Myers, Alicia Reese, Jean M. Sizemore, Cheryl J. WIlliams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
August 16, 2013 Filing 171 Plaintiffs' Proposed Scheduling Plan by Theresa Cosentino (Dolley, Kevin)
August 13, 2013 Filing 170 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Tanya Acquaire, Melissa J. Adelson, Angela Aldridge, Donna J. Alexander, Wendy Alkire, Lisa Allarde, Elizabeth Altgilbers, Karen Amelung, Dorothy L. Ancona, Darla J. Anderson, Joy L. Anderson, Tisha Anderson, Darlene M. Archie, Linda Armstrong, Ann Marie Armstrong-Deitch, Sherri M. Armuth, Susan H. Arthur, Vickie Astudillo, Joy Christine Atwell, Cheryl Ayers, Joyce Baena, Suzanne M. Bailey, Brenda Bain, Elizabeth Baker, Cindy A. Baker-Spriggs, Janice A. Baldwin, Elaine L. Ballance, Terri Ballard, Jennifer Ballentine, Holly Banner, Michelle Barbes, Michelle Bardo, Margaret Bardwell, Joy Bargerstock, Shannon Barnes, Alane M Barnes Garvik, Patricia C. Barragan, Katherin Barrow, Debra J. Barry, Deborah Bartelo, Jennette Bastion (Horner), Deborah Bauer, Judith Bean, Cheryl Beauchamp, Deanne L. Becker, Jacqueline Becker, Susan C. Becker, Helen I. Bell, Sheryl J. Bell, JoAnne A. Benson, Karen Berezoski, Roberta Bianchini, Gwendolyn Eartha Lee Bienvenu, Diane H. Birrer, Teresa Bischof, Gail Black, Cheryl J. Blake, Kay A. Bone, Carole J. Boom, Angela R. Booth, Laurie M. Boren, Marilyn M. Bower, Robin L. Bowers, Elizabeth Ann Bowman, Cecilia Bradford, Carol Brake, Stephanie R. Brammer, Linda Brewer, Cheryl Shaw Briggs, Anne C. Brinzea, Hope Brown, Susan Brown, Amy A. Bruce, Sandra J. Bruce, Leslie Brueckner, Tina Brush, Mary Christine Bryant, Wendy J. Buckheit, Judith A. Buckingham, Ellen K. Buffy, Vicki Bunch, Margaret M. Burchard, Diane Burgbacher, Kathleen C. Burke, Debra L. Burns, Shelly Buschman, Nancy Caldwell, Deborah A. Calendine, Rebecca S. Cameron, Debbie M. Campbell, Ronda Campbell, Claudia Stella Cantelmi, Elizabeth M. Carithers, Eva L. Carlson, Jo Ellen Carnes, Margaret Diane Carter, Jolene Cartwright, Kevin P. Cartwright, Linda Carucci, Margaret Cary, Gwen Cashion, Kimberly Ceplenski, Kandace Chancey, Jennifer Chandler, Jeannette M. Chipka, Mary Ciesicki, Joanne Frances Cimo, Rosemary Cinquanti, Barbara Ciulla, Kim Claeys, Teresa Slater Clark, Harriet Sue Clarke, Lou Ann Cleary, Theresa Clubb, Patricia Clunk, Tina Coelho, Karen S. Colburn, Kimberly Coleman (f/k/a Lauffer), April E. Colleen, Vicki E. Collier, Ian Connors, Karl E. Constantino, Cindy Conwell, Sharon Cook, Lilia M. Cooper, Marcie Cooper, Nancy M Corcoran, Lois D. Cores, Tonna G. Cornett, Theresa Cosentino, Mary Kitra Cox, Arlene Bonnie Crafton, LeAnn M. Cramer, Theresa M Crane, Kimberly Crocker-Hendrickson, Kristen A. Crowe, Tamra Crowley, Jennifer Crutcher, Carolyn Cumings, Tara A. Cummings, Beverly M. Cundiff, Darcie J. Cunningham, M. Susan Cunningham, Susan Lynne Damasco, Connie G. Darling, Trudy Davenport, JoAnn Davey, Robin Davies, Joan M. Davis, Marcela C. DeBano, Janeen S. DeBoard, Teresa A. DeSchryver, Stephanie DeWitt, Rosemarie Dean, Rita A. Defino, Renee Demmery, Laura Denio, Pamela J. Denny, Kim N. Dent, Ana Derakshaw, Jennifer L. Dick, Patricia A. Dickerson, Shana Diekhoff, Valerie Dininni, Linda R. Dittmer, Sherma Donnelly, Sherry A. Doratio, Mark E. Dorn, Angela B. Dortch, Denese Dugay, Constance A. Duncan, Thelma S. Durgin, Sharon Dutton, Holly Dyer, Delois F. Easterling, Jessica Edwards, Lisa Edwards, Terian Edwards, Jessica Eik, Jennie Eisenstein, Rosemary Elmore, Carli L. Emerson, Teri L Eriksen, Catherine M. Estep (f/k/a Foster), Mindy Faieta, Carol Failla, Melissa Fain, Donna Falco, Judy Fallon, Julie M. Farmer, Donna Farrell, Lori A. Favinger, Saundra Feighner, Laurel Jo Feiker, Robin Feltner, Paula Ferguson, Anna Feroe, Kelli Fisher, Wendy Fisher, Sharon A. Flemmings, Mari J. Floyd, Denise Foell, Amy L. Ford, Sheila R. Ford, Jennifer L. Foreman, Tracey Forsythe, Daniel Foster, Theresa D. Fox, Claudia M. Franklin, Kimberly Freda, Susan L. Frederick, Laura Frederiksen, Debra R. Friess, Rise Fritz, Jessica Fulghum, Lynn Galenza, Deanna Garcia, Lauren Gato, Kristen Votzakis Gauthier, Judith Gay, Cecilia Gaynor, Kristine E. Genrich, Judith Joyce Gerber, Kim Gersie-Scott, Laurie Gianquinto, Diane Gibas, Cynthia C. Gibson, Kimberly K. Gibson, Nikki R. Gilbert, Alice Elaine Gillespie, Karen Gland, Kimberly A. Glotfelty, Virginia Gomez, Sonia T. Gonzalez, Karen Goodrich, Francine Gorskie, Kenneth E. Grassman, Linda Gray, Randi Gray, Nancy M. Greene, Heather Greenslade, June A. Greenwood, Melinda Griffus, Deborah Guffey, Pamela J. Gugliotta, Lynne D. Hackaday, Marcia A. Hahn, Angela E. Hall, Mary Hall, Deloris P. Hamilton, Laura Hammersley, Darlene C. Hanson, Jane A. Hanson, Shannon Harbinson, Joanna Hardin, Cynthia M. Harp, Janet E. Harper, Pamela D. Harper, Rosemary Harrison, Tracy L. Harrod, Sarah M. Hatch, Nancy Haupt, Susan Haworth, Fayetta L. Hay, Annette P. Hayes, Patsy D. Hayes, Sheryl Hazelrigg, Ronda Hebenstreit, Vicki Heinecke, Lorraine L. Henderson, Janet A. Henkel, Lynsi Henson, Lisa Hering, Diane Hernandez, Marjorie Hess, Sherry D. Hess, Maureen Hicks, Rosalie Hicks, Paula B. Hightower, Dawn Hill, Edith M. Hinkle, Karen Hobbs, Lisa M. Hoefgen, Jason Hoffman, Cindy I. Holland, Cynthia S. Holley, Treby C. Hood, Janet Hook, Peggy M. Hopper, Lynn Horn, Connie Horton, Gail Hoskins, Shara Howard, Melissa Howe, Mary Ann Hren, Gail Hudson, Michelle Hughes, Karen Humensky, Kathleen Hussey, Carlotta Ingle, Carla Ingraham-Gaughan, Kathleen P. Irwin, Diana Iseminger, Tammy Isham, Donna L. Jackson, Lorraine Jackson, Bonnie M. Jakmauh, Patricia James, Kathleen J. Jandreau, Susan K. Janzen, Debra L. Johns, Dale Johnson (Medina), Catherine R. Johnson-Berger, Roberta L. Jonas, Christy S. Jones, Debra Jane Jones, Julie A. Jones, Shannon Jones, Dawn R. Jordan, Diana Jordan, Marita Patricia Joseph, Naomi I. Joslin, Jean Jouskey, Cleo Diane Joyner, Joni Joyner, Jodi Kabalin, Cheryl Kahl, Linda M. Kalbac, Mary D. Kane, Joanna Karneeb, Barbara Keenan, Kimberly Keevy, Jenette M. Kelly, Kathryn L. Kelly, Sharon Kendrick, Sharon Kenno, Vicki L. Kenobbie, Laura Key, Keula Francis Kilgore, Candace Kinsora, Mary Kleppin, Cheri Kline, Vicki J. LaPlante, Kathryn E. Lacey, Deborah J. Land, Joanne Lane, Rosemary Wood Langella, Coreen M. Larson, Yvonne Lawrence, Patricia Lawson, Diana LeVan, Elaine Leach, Janet Lee, Stacy S. Lee, Cathy S. Lefils, Daphne M. Leibowitz, Susan Lell, Carol Lindemon, Judy M. Lindquist, Jacqueline M. Linville, Christine G. Lockwood, Rebecca L. Loew, Lesa Logan, Julene Logue, Amy L. Long, Renee T. Long, Kristall Lopez, Melissa A. Love, Alice Lovingood, Kathy M. Lucas, Judith Lugo, Joy Lutz, Laurie Lynch, Jayden Nicole Lyons, Margaret E. Mackey, Elizabeth J. Maddox, Barbara Magliochetti, Judith A. Mannarini, Denise Marie Byrne, Sarena Marques, Konnie Marquis, Diane Martin, Sherry Martin, Steven Martin, Tammy Martinez, April G. Marx, Suzanne Mascola, Theresa L. Mashburn, Teri Massengale, Linda Mathias, Angela Matias, DeEnna L. Matthews, Kimberly Mauger, Evelyn R. Maynard, Jewel A. Mazur, Cheryl L. McAnich, Mary McClelland, Trinka D. McClure (f/k/a Pettyjohn), Michell McComas, Pamela McCord, Beverly McCoy, Pamela H. McCullough, Angela McDonough, Nina McFarlane, Donna McKenna, Claire McKinnon, Tonya Michelle McKnight, Mary M. McLaughlin, Joy McLemore, Bobbi McMillin, Margo McNeil, Karen McNeilan, Tina Mehler, Denise Melchior, Beverly Merkel, Marsha Merrell, Rae J. Messick, Yvonne Meyerhofer, Karen Milan, Sharron K. Miles, Carey L. Miller, Carol S. Miller, Joanne G. Miller, Kay L. Miller, Lillian L. Miller, Mary Miller, Janet K. Mitchell, Marilyn Mitchell, Tanya Mixon-White, Virginia M. Mize, Kathleen Moelter, Debra Ann Molitaris, Carol Montgomery, Ann Moore, Cathi R. Moore, Janet Moore, Kimberly Moore, Patricia A. Morgan, Pamela Morrow, Linda F. Morton, Michael Mosteller II, Traci M. Muchler, Juliene A. Munoz, Katherine Murphy, Jennifer Murrell, Tyesha Mustin, Angela W. Myers, Ann W. Myers, Debra L. Myers, Jessalynn Myers, Rebecca J. Nagy, Penelope C. Neal, Ruth Lynn Neely, Tamikka R. Nelson, Brenda Newberg, Janet M. Newsome, Veronica Nicholas, Renee A. Nichols, Carol A. Nigsarian, Deborah K Norton, Tacara Norwood, Mary Anne Novello, Dawn J. O'Connor, Dawn T. O'Connor, Theresa Ann O'Connor, Maureen O'Kelly, Emily Oates, Karla Ockerby, Wanda L. Olson, Wendi Ortiz, Brenda L. Osborne, Paige D. Owens (Hundley), Charlene Palmer, Debra H. Parent, Christina Anne Parman, Kelly Parsons, Betty M. Patton, Julianne Patton, Christie Patzer, Leona R. Payne, Jeanne A. Pedersen, Teresa Pemerton, Dawn Pence, Deborah Pepsak, Diane Perryman, Debra A. Petralia, Wendi J. Pierson, Karen L. Pirok, Brenda Lee Plessinger, Julie A. Plourde, Marie A. Plum, Bobbi E. Pollak, Anna C. Pomeroy, Melissa Poole, Sandra Porter, Susan E. Powell, Tina Preston, Joanne Price, Cherie S. Price-Palmer, April Prior, Catherine Probst, Annette D. Pruett, Brenda Pryczynski, B. Jeannie Purcell, Julie Purdy (f/k/a Ramson), Velma Renee Quartullo, Christian V Ramos, Elaina Marie Rande, Patricia Ann Rapp, Joyce Ratajczak, Joanne Rathmann, Jacqueline Ratliff, Linda B. Ray, Sheila Reeser, Rhonda Reeves, Linda Reid, Lorna Reinhart, Wendy H. Reisenauer, Debra K. Resimont, Krissy Reynolds, Beverly S. Richardson, Marie Ricksgers, Cheryl B. Rieper, Gail A. Riley, Les Rinehart, Helen Ring, Jenny S. Rink, Briget Rischawy, Parrish Ritchie, Leslie Robertson, Deanna L. Robinson, Steven Rodriquez, Eileen Roff, Gina Rogers, Lynn E. Rogers, Eileen Rollins, Lynda D. Romanek, Lecia Ropp, Jane L. Rose, Cathy J. Rowe, Mary Lou Rusbarsky, Toiee Angela Rushing, Linda Rutkowski, Jeanette Rydell, Bonnie Ryden, Rhea D. Safire, Constance D. Salvia, Judith A. Sanders, Kathy S. Sanders, Jan E Sandoval, Valerie B. Sawyer, Bonnie Scaia, Mary Teresa Schanz, Jenalyn Scheib, Patricia A. Schmutz, Deborah Schneider, Deborah K. Schneider, Shannon Schroeder, Kathleen M. Schuster, Sherry L. Schwartz, Benjamin Roy Scott, Christy L. Scott, Melinda Scott, Rosie Scott, Karyn B. Scrivener, Theresa K. Segady, Elizabeth A. Sennett, Debra Seuell, Dawn Shaffer, Jean M. Shang, Joy A Sharpe, Denise D. Shelby, Brenda Shelton, Patricia J. Shilling, Elaine Shortall, Cathryn Sibert, Debra H. Sills, Susan Silver, Debra Silviano, Cheryl Simmons, Kathleen M. Simons, Susanne Simonson, Robin Reid Wooten Simpson, Paige Singleton, Lisa Sinkler, David D. Sluder, Teresa D. Smiljanic, Connie S. Smith, Jamie Smith, Janis B. Smith, Lisa Smith
August 13, 2013 Filing 169 NOTICE by Susan H. Arthur, Karen Berezoski, Patricia A. Dickerson, Daniel Foster, Kenneth E. Grassman, Annette P. Hayes, Paula B. Hightower, Carla Ingraham-Gaughan, Cleo Diane Joyner, Laura Key, Barbara Magliochetti, Tyesha Mustin, Deanna L. Robinson, Mary Lou Rusbarsky, Susan Travis, Sandra L. Zier-Teitler (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
August 3, 2013 Filing 168 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Tanya Acquaire, Melissa J. Adelson, Angela Aldridge, Donna J. Alexander, Wendy Alkire, Lisa Allarde, Elizabeth Altgilbers, Karen Amelung, Dorothy L. Ancona, Darla J. Anderson, Joy L. Anderson, Tisha Anderson, Darlene M. Archie, Linda Armstrong, Ann Marie Armstrong-Deitch, Sherri M. Armuth, Vickie Astudillo, Joy Christine Atwell, Cheryl Ayers, Joyce Baena, Suzanne M. Bailey, Brenda Bain, Elizabeth Baker, Cindy A. Baker-Spriggs, Janice A. Baldwin, Elaine L. Ballance, Terri Ballard, Jennifer Ballentine, Holly Banner, Michelle Barbes, Michelle Bardo, Margaret Bardwell, Joy Bargerstock, Shannon Barnes, Alane M Barnes Garvik, Patricia C. Barragan, Katherin Barrow, Debra J. Barry, Deborah Bartelo, Jennette Bastion (Horner), Deborah Bauer, Judith Bean, Cheryl Beauchamp, Deanne L. Becker, Jacqueline Becker, Susan C. Becker, Helen I. Bell, Sheryl J. Bell, JoAnne A. Benson, Roberta Bianchini, Gwendolyn Eartha Lee Bienvenu, Diane H. Birrer, Teresa Bischof, Gail Black, Cheryl J. Blake, Kay A. Bone, Carole J. Boom, Angela R. Booth, Laurie M. Boren, Marilyn M. Bower, Robin L. Bowers, Elizabeth Ann Bowman, Cecilia Bradford, Carol Brake, Stephanie R. Brammer, Linda Brewer, Cheryl Shaw Briggs, Anne C. Brinzea, Hope Brown, Susan Brown, Amy A. Bruce, Sandra J. Bruce, Leslie Brueckner, Tina Brush, Mary Christine Bryant, Wendy J. Buckheit, Judith A. Buckingham, Ellen K. Buffy, Vicki Bunch, Margaret M. Burchard, Diane Burgbacher, Kathleen C. Burke, Debra L. Burns, Shelly Buschman, Nancy Caldwell, Deborah A. Calendine, Rebecca S. Cameron, Debbie M. Campbell, Ronda Campbell, Claudia Stella Cantelmi, Elizabeth M. Carithers, Eva L. Carlson, Jo Ellen Carnes, Margaret Diane Carter, Jolene Cartwright, Kevin P. Cartwright, Linda Carucci, Margaret Cary, Gwen Cashion, Kimberly Ceplenski, Kandace Chancey, Jennifer Chandler, Jeannette M. Chipka, Mary Ciesicki, Joanne Frances Cimo, Rosemary Cinquanti, Barbara Ciulla, Kim Claeys, Teresa Slater Clark, Harriet Sue Clarke, Lou Ann Cleary, Theresa Clubb, Patricia Clunk, Tina Coelho, Karen S. Colburn, Kimberly Coleman (f/k/a Lauffer), April E. Colleen, Vicki E. Collier, Ian Connors, Karl E. Constantino, Cindy Conwell, Sharon Cook, Lilia M. Cooper, Marcie Cooper, Nancy M Corcoran, Lois D. Cores, Tonna G. Cornett, Theresa Cosentino, Mary Kitra Cox, Arlene Bonnie Crafton, LeAnn M. Cramer, Theresa M Crane, Kimberly Crocker-Hendrickson, Kristen A. Crowe, Tamra Crowley, Jennifer Crutcher, Carolyn Cumings, Tara A. Cummings, Beverly M. Cundiff, Darcie J. Cunningham, M. Susan Cunningham, Susan Lynne Damasco, Connie G. Darling, Trudy Davenport, JoAnn Davey, Robin Davies, Joan M. Davis, Marcela C. DeBano, Janeen S. DeBoard, Teresa A. DeSchryver, Stephanie DeWitt, Rosemarie Dean, Rita A. Defino, Renee Demmery, Laura Denio, Pamela J. Denny, Kim N. Dent, Ana Derakshaw, Jennifer L. Dick, Shana Diekhoff, Valerie Dininni, Linda R. Dittmer, Sherma Donnelly, Sherry A. Doratio, Mark E. Dorn, Angela B. Dortch, Denese Dugay, Constance A. Duncan, Thelma S. Durgin, Sharon Dutton, Holly Dyer, Delois F. Easterling, Jessica Edwards, Lisa Edwards, Terian Edwards, Jessica Eik, Jennie Eisenstein, Rosemary Elmore, Carli L. Emerson, Teri L Eriksen, Catherine M. Estep (f/k/a Foster), Mindy Faieta, Carol Failla, Melissa Fain, Donna Falco, Judy Fallon, Julie M. Farmer, Donna Farrell, Lori A. Favinger, Saundra Feighner, Laurel Jo Feiker, Robin Feltner, Paula Ferguson, Anna Feroe, Kelli Fisher, Wendy Fisher, Sharon A. Flemmings, Mari J. Floyd, Denise Foell, Amy L. Ford, Sheila R. Ford, Jennifer L. Foreman, Tracey Forsythe, Theresa D. Fox, Claudia M. Franklin, Kimberly Freda, Susan L. Frederick, Laura Frederiksen, Debra R. Friess, Rise Fritz, Jessica Fulghum, Lynn Galenza, Deanna Garcia, Lauren Gato, Kristen Votzakis Gauthier, Judith Gay, Cecilia Gaynor, Kristine E. Genrich, Judith Joyce Gerber, Kim Gersie-Scott, Laurie Gianquinto, Diane Gibas, Cynthia C. Gibson, Kimberly K. Gibson, Nikki R. Gilbert, Alice Elaine Gillespie, Karen Gland, Kimberly A. Glotfelty, Virginia Gomez, Sonia T. Gonzalez, Karen Goodrich, Francine Gorskie, Linda Gray, Randi Gray, Nancy M. Greene, Heather Greenslade, June A. Greenwood, Melinda Griffus, Deborah Guffey, Pamela J. Gugliotta, Lynne D. Hackaday, Marcia A. Hahn, Angela E. Hall, Mary Hall, Deloris P. Hamilton, Laura Hammersley, Darlene C. Hanson, Jane A. Hanson, Shannon Harbinson, Joanna Hardin, Cynthia M. Harp, Janet E. Harper, Pamela D. Harper, Rosemary Harrison, Tracy L. Harrod, Sarah M. Hatch, Nancy Haupt, Susan Haworth, Fayetta L. Hay, Patsy D. Hayes, Sheryl Hazelrigg, Ronda Hebenstreit, Vicki Heinecke, Lorraine L. Henderson, Janet A. Henkel, Lynsi Henson, Lisa Hering, Diane Hernandez, Marjorie Hess, Sherry D. Hess, Maureen Hicks, Rosalie Hicks, Dawn Hill, Edith M. Hinkle, Karen Hobbs, Lisa M. Hoefgen, Jason Hoffman, Cindy I. Holland, Cynthia S. Holley, Treby C. Hood, Janet Hook, Peggy M. Hopper, Lynn Horn, Connie Horton, Gail Hoskins, Shara Howard, Melissa Howe, Mary Ann Hren, Gail Hudson, Michelle Hughes, Karen Humensky, Kathleen Hussey, Carlotta Ingle, Kathleen P. Irwin, Diana Iseminger, Tammy Isham, Donna L. Jackson, Lorraine Jackson, Bonnie M. Jakmauh, Patricia James, Kathleen J. Jandreau, Susan K. Janzen, Debra L. Johns, Dale Johnson (Medina), Catherine R. Johnson-Berger, Roberta L. Jonas, Christy S. Jones, Debra Jane Jones, Julie A. Jones, Shannon Jones, Dawn R. Jordan, Diana Jordan, Marita Patricia Joseph, Naomi I. Joslin, Jean Jouskey, Joni Joyner, Jodi Kabalin, Cheryl Kahl, Linda M. Kalbac, Mary D. Kane, Joanna Karneeb, Barbara Keenan, Kimberly Keevy, Jenette M. Kelly, Kathryn L. Kelly, Sharon Kendrick, Sharon Kenno, Vicki L. Kenobbie, Keula Francis Kilgore, Candace Kinsora, Mary Kleppin, Cheri Kline, Vicki J. LaPlante, Kathryn E. Lacey, Deborah J. Land, Joanne Lane, Rosemary Wood Langella, Coreen M. Larson, Yvonne Lawrence, Patricia Lawson, Diana LeVan, Elaine Leach, Janet Lee, Stacy S. Lee, Cathy S. Lefils, Daphne M. Leibowitz, Susan Lell, Carol Lindemon, Judy M. Lindquist, Jacqueline M. Linville, Christine G. Lockwood, Rebecca L. Loew, Lesa Logan, Julene Logue, Amy L. Long, Renee T. Long, Kristall Lopez, Melissa A. Love, Alice Lovingood, Kathy M. Lucas, Judith Lugo, Joy Lutz, Laurie Lynch, Jayden Nicole Lyons, Margaret E. Mackey, Elizabeth J. Maddox, Judith A. Mannarini, Denise Marie Byrne, Sarena Marques, Konnie Marquis, Diane Martin, Sherry Martin, Steven Martin, Tammy Martinez, April G. Marx, Suzanne Mascola, Theresa L. Mashburn, Teri Massengale, Linda Mathias, Angela Matias, DeEnna L. Matthews, Kimberly Mauger, Evelyn R. Maynard, Jewel A. Mazur, Cheryl L. McAnich, Mary McClelland, Trinka D. McClure (f/k/a Pettyjohn), Michell McComas, Pamela McCord, Beverly McCoy, Pamela H. McCullough, Angela McDonough, Nina McFarlane, Donna McKenna, Claire McKinnon, Tonya Michelle McKnight, Mary M. McLaughlin, Joy McLemore, Bobbi McMillin, Margo McNeil, Karen McNeilan, Tina Mehler, Denise Melchior, Beverly Merkel, Marsha Merrell, Rae J. Messick, Yvonne Meyerhofer, Karen Milan, Sharron K. Miles, Carey L. Miller, Carol S. Miller, Joanne G. Miller, Kay L. Miller, Lillian L. Miller, Mary Miller, Janet K. Mitchell, Marilyn Mitchell, Tanya Mixon-White, Virginia M. Mize, Kathleen Moelter, Debra Ann Molitaris, Carol Montgomery, Ann Moore, Cathi R. Moore, Janet Moore, Kimberly Moore, Patricia A. Morgan, Pamela Morrow, Linda F. Morton, Michael Mosteller II, Traci M. Muchler, Juliene A. Munoz, Katherine Murphy, Jennifer Murrell, Angela W. Myers, Ann W. Myers, Debra L. Myers, Jessalynn Myers, Rebecca J. Nagy, Penelope C. Neal, Ruth Lynn Neely, Tamikka R. Nelson, Brenda Newberg, Janet M. Newsome, Veronica Nicholas, Renee A. Nichols, Carol A. Nigsarian, Deborah K Norton, Tacara Norwood, Mary Anne Novello, Dawn J. O'Connor, Dawn T. O'Connor, Theresa Ann O'Connor, Maureen O'Kelly, Emily Oates, Karla Ockerby, Wanda L. Olson, Wendi Ortiz, Brenda L. Osborne, Paige D. Owens (Hundley), Charlene Palmer, Debra H. Parent, Christina Anne Parman, Kelly Parsons, Betty M. Patton, Julianne Patton, Christie Patzer, Leona R. Payne, Jeanne A. Pedersen, Teresa Pemerton, Dawn Pence, Deborah Pepsak, Diane Perryman, Debra A. Petralia, Wendi J. Pierson, Karen L. Pirok, Brenda Lee Plessinger, Julie A. Plourde, Marie A. Plum, Bobbi E. Pollak, Anna C. Pomeroy, Melissa Poole, Sandra Porter, Susan E. Powell, Tina Preston, Joanne Price, Cherie S. Price-Palmer, April Prior, Catherine Probst, Annette D. Pruett, Brenda Pryczynski, B. Jeannie Purcell, Julie Purdy (f/k/a Ramson), Velma Renee Quartullo, Christian V Ramos, Elaina Marie Rande, Patricia Ann Rapp, Joyce Ratajczak, Joanne Rathmann, Jacqueline Ratliff, Linda B. Ray, Sheila Reeser, Rhonda Reeves, Linda Reid, Lorna Reinhart, Wendy H. Reisenauer, Debra K. Resimont, Krissy Reynolds, Beverly S. Richardson, Marie Ricksgers, Cheryl B. Rieper, Gail A. Riley, Les Rinehart, Helen Ring, Jenny S. Rink, Briget Rischawy, Parrish Ritchie, Leslie Robertson, Steven Rodriquez, Eileen Roff, Gina Rogers, Lynn E. Rogers, Eileen Rollins, Lynda D. Romanek, Lecia Ropp, Jane L. Rose, Cathy J. Rowe, Toiee Angela Rushing, Linda Rutkowski, Jeanette Rydell, Bonnie Ryden, Rhea D. Safire, Constance D. Salvia, Judith A. Sanders, Kathy S. Sanders, Jan E Sandoval, Valerie B. Sawyer, Bonnie Scaia, Mary Teresa Schanz, Jenalyn Scheib, Patricia A. Schmutz, Deborah Schneider, Deborah K. Schneider, Shannon Schroeder, Kathleen M. Schuster, Sherry L. Schwartz, Benjamin Roy Scott, Christy L. Scott, Melinda Scott, Rosie Scott, Karyn B. Scrivener, Theresa K. Segady, Elizabeth A. Sennett, Debra Seuell, Dawn Shaffer, Jean M. Shang, Joy A Sharpe, Denise D. Shelby, Brenda Shelton, Patricia J. Shilling, Elaine Shortall, Cathryn Sibert, Debra H. Sills, Susan Silver, Debra Silviano, Cheryl Simmons, Kathleen M. Simons, Susanne Simonson, Robin Reid Wooten Simpson, Paige Singleton, Lisa Sinkler, David D. Sluder, Teresa D. Smiljanic, Connie S. Smith, Jamie Smith, Janis B. Smith, Lisa Smith, Lori M. Smith, Nicole Elizabeth Smith, Wendolyn Smith, Patricia C. Solari, Amanda Solorza, Leslea Souvigney, Diane Spencer, Jacqueline A. Spires-Purdy, Deborah L. Spittle, Jacqueline St. Georges, Jacqueline St. Georges, Margaret Staffer, Kristi Stanford, Rebec
August 3, 2013 Filing 167 NOTICE by Melissa J. Adelson, Angela Aldridge, Karen Amelung, Elizabeth Ann Bowman, Lilia M. Cooper, Marcie Cooper, Jennifer Crutcher, Carolyn Cumings, Trudy Davenport, Kim N. Dent, Thelma S. Durgin, Wendy Fisher, Kimberly A. Glotfelty, June A. Greenwood, Karen Hobbs, Teri Massengale, Trinka D. McClure (f/k/a Pettyjohn), Jeanne A. Pedersen, Velma Renee Quartullo, Parrish Ritchie, Linda Rutkowski, Kathleen M. Schuster, Patricia J. Shilling, Virginia Storm, Kimberly V. Tallitsch, Sheryl Wise (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
July 28, 2013 Filing 166 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Tanya Acquaire, Donna J. Alexander, Wendy Alkire, Lisa Allarde, Elizabeth Altgilbers, Dorothy L. Ancona, Darla J. Anderson, Joy L. Anderson, Tisha Anderson, Darlene M. Archie, Linda Armstrong, Ann Marie Armstrong-Deitch, Sherri M. Armuth, Vickie Astudillo, Joy Christine Atwell, Cheryl Ayers, Joyce Baena, Suzanne M. Bailey, Brenda Bain, Elizabeth Baker, Cindy A. Baker-Spriggs, Janice A. Baldwin, Elaine L. Ballance, Terri Ballard, Jennifer Ballentine, Holly Banner, Michelle Barbes, Michelle Bardo, Margaret Bardwell, Joy Bargerstock, Shannon Barnes, Alane M Barnes Garvik, Patricia C. Barragan, Katherin Barrow, Debra J. Barry, Deborah Bartelo, Jennette Bastion (Horner), Deborah Bauer, Judith Bean, Cheryl Beauchamp, Deanne L. Becker, Jacqueline Becker, Susan C. Becker, Helen I. Bell, Sheryl J. Bell, JoAnne A. Benson, Roberta Bianchini, Gwendolyn Eartha Lee Bienvenu, Diane H. Birrer, Teresa Bischof, Gail Black, Cheryl J. Blake, Kay A. Bone, Carole J. Boom, Angela R. Booth, Laurie M. Boren, Marilyn M. Bower, Robin L. Bowers, Cecilia Bradford, Carol Brake, Stephanie R. Brammer, Linda Brewer, Cheryl Shaw Briggs, Anne C. Brinzea, Hope Brown, Susan Brown, Amy A. Bruce, Sandra J. Bruce, Leslie Brueckner, Tina Brush, Mary Christine Bryant, Wendy J. Buckheit, Judith A. Buckingham, Ellen K. Buffy, Vicki Bunch, Margaret M. Burchard, Diane Burgbacher, Kathleen C. Burke, Debra L. Burns, Shelly Buschman, Nancy Caldwell, Deborah A. Calendine, Rebecca S. Cameron, Debbie M. Campbell, Ronda Campbell, Claudia Stella Cantelmi, Elizabeth M. Carithers, Eva L. Carlson, Jo Ellen Carnes, Margaret Diane Carter, Jolene Cartwright, Kevin P. Cartwright, Linda Carucci, Margaret Cary, Gwen Cashion, Kimberly Ceplenski, Kandace Chancey, Jennifer Chandler, Jeannette M. Chipka, Mary Ciesicki, Joanne Frances Cimo, Rosemary Cinquanti, Barbara Ciulla, Kim Claeys, Teresa Slater Clark, Harriet Sue Clarke, Lou Ann Cleary, Theresa Clubb, Patricia Clunk, Tina Coelho, Karen S. Colburn, Kimberly Coleman (f/k/a Lauffer), April E. Colleen, Vicki E. Collier, Ian Connors, Karl E. Constantino, Cindy Conwell, Sharon Cook, Nancy M Corcoran, Lois D. Cores, Tonna G. Cornett, Theresa Cosentino, Mary Kitra Cox, Arlene Bonnie Crafton, LeAnn M. Cramer, Theresa M Crane, Kimberly Crocker-Hendrickson, Kristen A. Crowe, Tamra Crowley, Tara A. Cummings, Beverly M. Cundiff, Darcie J. Cunningham, M. Susan Cunningham, Susan Lynne Damasco, Connie G. Darling, JoAnn Davey, Robin Davies, Joan M. Davis, Marcela C. DeBano, Janeen S. DeBoard, Teresa A. DeSchryver, Stephanie DeWitt, Rosemarie Dean, Rita A. Defino, Renee Demmery, Laura Denio, Pamela J. Denny, Ana Derakshaw, Jennifer L. Dick, Shana Diekhoff, Valerie Dininni, Linda R. Dittmer, Sherma Donnelly, Sherry A. Doratio, Mark E. Dorn, Angela B. Dortch, Denese Dugay, Constance A. Duncan, Sharon Dutton, Holly Dyer, Delois F. Easterling, Jessica Edwards, Lisa Edwards, Terian Edwards, Jessica Eik, Jennie Eisenstein, Rosemary Elmore, Carli L. Emerson, Teri L Eriksen, Catherine M. Estep (f/k/a Foster), Mindy Faieta, Carol Failla, Melissa Fain, Donna Falco, Judy Fallon, Julie M. Farmer, Donna Farrell, Lori A. Favinger, Saundra Feighner, Laurel Jo Feiker, Robin Feltner, Paula Ferguson, Anna Feroe, Kelli Fisher, Sharon A. Flemmings, Mari J. Floyd, Denise Foell, Amy L. Ford, Sheila R. Ford, Jennifer L. Foreman, Tracey Forsythe, Theresa D. Fox, Claudia M. Franklin, Kimberly Freda, Susan L. Frederick, Laura Frederiksen, Debra R. Friess, Rise Fritz, Jessica Fulghum, Lynn Galenza, Deanna Garcia, Lauren Gato, Kristen Votzakis Gauthier, Judith Gay, Cecilia Gaynor, Kristine E. Genrich, Judith Joyce Gerber, Kim Gersie-Scott, Laurie Gianquinto, Diane Gibas, Cynthia C. Gibson, Kimberly K. Gibson, Nikki R. Gilbert, Alice Elaine Gillespie, Karen Gland, Virginia Gomez, Sonia T. Gonzalez, Karen Goodrich, Francine Gorskie, Linda Gray, Randi Gray, Nancy M. Greene, Heather Greenslade, Melinda Griffus, Deborah Guffey, Pamela J. Gugliotta, Lynne D. Hackaday, Marcia A. Hahn, Angela E. Hall, Mary Hall, Deloris P. Hamilton, Laura Hammersley, Darlene C. Hanson, Jane A. Hanson, Shannon Harbinson, Joanna Hardin, Cynthia M. Harp, Janet E. Harper, Pamela D. Harper, Rosemary Harrison, Tracy L. Harrod, Sarah M. Hatch, Nancy Haupt, Susan Haworth, Fayetta L. Hay, Patsy D. Hayes, Sheryl Hazelrigg, Ronda Hebenstreit, Vicki Heinecke, Lorraine L. Henderson, Janet A. Henkel, Lynsi Henson, Lisa Hering, Diane Hernandez, Marjorie Hess, Sherry D. Hess, Maureen Hicks, Rosalie Hicks, Dawn Hill, Edith M. Hinkle, Lisa M. Hoefgen, Jason Hoffman, Cindy I. Holland, Cynthia S. Holley, Treby C. Hood, Janet Hook, Peggy M. Hopper, Lynn Horn, Connie Horton, Gail Hoskins, Shara Howard, Melissa Howe, Mary Ann Hren, Gail Hudson, Michelle Hughes, Karen Humensky, Kathleen Hussey, Carlotta Ingle, Kathleen P. Irwin, Diana Iseminger, Tammy Isham, Donna L. Jackson, Lorraine Jackson, Bonnie M. Jakmauh, Patricia James, Kathleen J. Jandreau, Susan K. Janzen, Debra L. Johns, Dale Johnson (Medina), Catherine R. Johnson-Berger, Roberta L. Jonas, Christy S. Jones, Debra Jane Jones, Julie A. Jones, Shannon Jones, Dawn R. Jordan, Diana Jordan, Marita Patricia Joseph, Naomi I. Joslin, Jean Jouskey, Joni Joyner, Jodi Kabalin, Cheryl Kahl, Linda M. Kalbac, Mary D. Kane, Joanna Karneeb, Barbara Keenan, Kimberly Keevy, Jenette M. Kelly, Kathryn L. Kelly, Sharon Kendrick, Sharon Kenno, Vicki L. Kenobbie, Keula Francis Kilgore, Candace Kinsora, Mary Kleppin, Cheri Kline, Vicki J. LaPlante, Kathryn E. Lacey, Deborah J. Land, Joanne Lane, Rosemary Wood Langella, Coreen M. Larson, Yvonne Lawrence, Patricia Lawson, Diana LeVan, Elaine Leach, Janet Lee, Stacy S. Lee, Cathy S. Lefils, Daphne M. Leibowitz, Susan Lell, Carol Lindemon, Judy M. Lindquist, Jacqueline M. Linville, Christine G. Lockwood, Rebecca L. Loew, Lesa Logan, Julene Logue, Amy L. Long, Renee T. Long, Kristall Lopez, Melissa A. Love, Alice Lovingood, Kathy M. Lucas, Judith Lugo, Joy Lutz, Laurie Lynch, Jayden Nicole Lyons, Margaret E. Mackey, Elizabeth J. Maddox, Judith A. Mannarini, Denise Marie Byrne, Sarena Marques, Konnie Marquis, Diane Martin, Sherry Martin, Steven Martin, Tammy Martinez, April G. Marx, Suzanne Mascola, Theresa L. Mashburn, Linda Mathias, Angela Matias, DeEnna L. Matthews, Kimberly Mauger, Evelyn R. Maynard, Jewel A. Mazur, Cheryl L. McAnich, Mary McClelland, Michell McComas, Pamela McCord, Beverly McCoy, Pamela H. McCullough, Angela McDonough, Nina McFarlane, Donna McKenna, Claire McKinnon, Tonya Michelle McKnight, Mary M. McLaughlin, Joy McLemore, Bobbi McMillin, Margo McNeil, Karen McNeilan, Tina Mehler, Denise Melchior, Beverly Merkel, Marsha Merrell, Rae J. Messick, Yvonne Meyerhofer, Karen Milan, Sharron K. Miles, Carey L. Miller, Carol S. Miller, Joanne G. Miller, Kay L. Miller, Lillian L. Miller, Mary Miller, Janet K. Mitchell, Marilyn Mitchell, Tanya Mixon-White, Virginia M. Mize, Kathleen Moelter, Debra Ann Molitaris, Carol Montgomery, Ann Moore, Cathi R. Moore, Janet Moore, Kimberly Moore, Patricia A. Morgan, Pamela Morrow, Linda F. Morton, Michael Mosteller II, Traci M. Muchler, Juliene A. Munoz, Katherine Murphy, Jennifer Murrell, Angela W. Myers, Ann W. Myers, Debra L. Myers, Jessalynn Myers, Rebecca J. Nagy, Penelope C. Neal, Ruth Lynn Neely, Tamikka R. Nelson, Brenda Newberg, Janet M. Newsome, Veronica Nicholas, Renee A. Nichols, Carol A. Nigsarian, Deborah K Norton, Tacara Norwood, Mary Anne Novello, Dawn J. O'Connor, Dawn T. O'Connor, Theresa Ann O'Connor, Maureen O'Kelly, Emily Oates, Karla Ockerby, Wanda L. Olson, Wendi Ortiz, Brenda L. Osborne, Paige D. Owens (Hundley), Charlene Palmer, Debra H. Parent, Christina Anne Parman, Kelly Parsons, Betty M. Patton, Julianne Patton, Christie Patzer, Leona R. Payne, Teresa Pemerton, Dawn Pence, Deborah Pepsak, Diane Perryman, Debra A. Petralia, Wendi J. Pierson, Karen L. Pirok, Brenda Lee Plessinger, Julie A. Plourde, Marie A. Plum, Bobbi E. Pollak, Anna C. Pomeroy, Melissa Poole, Sandra Porter, Susan E. Powell, Tina Preston, Joanne Price, Cherie S. Price-Palmer, April Prior, Catherine Probst, Annette D. Pruett, Brenda Pryczynski, B. Jeannie Purcell, Julie Purdy (f/k/a Ramson), Christian V Ramos, Elaina Marie Rande, Patricia Ann Rapp, Joyce Ratajczak, Joanne Rathmann, Jacqueline Ratliff, Linda B. Ray, Sheila Reeser, Rhonda Reeves, Linda Reid, Lorna Reinhart, Wendy H. Reisenauer, Debra K. Resimont, Krissy Reynolds, Beverly S. Richardson, Marie Ricksgers, Cheryl B. Rieper, Gail A. Riley, Les Rinehart, Helen Ring, Jenny S. Rink, Briget Rischawy, Leslie Robertson, Steven Rodriquez, Eileen Roff, Gina Rogers, Lynn E. Rogers, Eileen Rollins, Lynda D. Romanek, Lecia Ropp, Jane L. Rose, Cathy J. Rowe, Toiee Angela Rushing, Jeanette Rydell, Bonnie Ryden, Rhea D. Safire, Constance D. Salvia, Judith A. Sanders, Kathy S. Sanders, Jan E Sandoval, Valerie B. Sawyer, Bonnie Scaia, Mary Teresa Schanz, Jenalyn Scheib, Patricia A. Schmutz, Deborah Schneider, Deborah K. Schneider, Shannon Schroeder, Sherry L. Schwartz, Benjamin Roy Scott, Christy L. Scott, Melinda Scott, Rosie Scott, Karyn B. Scrivener, Theresa K. Segady, Elizabeth A. Sennett, Debra Seuell, Dawn Shaffer, Jean M. Shang, Joy A Sharpe, Denise D. Shelby, Brenda Shelton, Elaine Shortall, Cathryn Sibert, Debra H. Sills, Susan Silver, Debra Silviano, Cheryl Simmons, Kathleen M. Simons, Susanne Simonson, Robin Reid Wooten Simpson, Paige Singleton, Lisa Sinkler, David D. Sluder, Teresa D. Smiljanic, Connie S. Smith, Jamie Smith, Janis B. Smith, Lisa Smith, Lori M. Smith, Nicole Elizabeth Smith, Wendolyn Smith, Patricia C. Solari, Amanda Solorza, Leslea Souvigney, Diane Spencer, Jacqueline A. Spires-Purdy, Deborah L. Spittle, Jacqueline St. Georges, Jacqueline St. Georges, Margaret Staffer, Kristi Stanford, Rebecca A. Stanley, Barbara A. Stark, Janet Statzer, Melinda J. Stec, Patricia J. Stefanik, Leida Stewart, Debra G. Still, Linda Studley, Tracie Stutzman, Cheryl Sullivan, Jan P. Surprise, Cynthia Swaim, Mary Swanson, Rachel Sweeney, Martha J. Sweitzer, Jennifer M. Synak, Katherine Tate, Patricia E. Taylor, Wanda J. Taylor, Donna Thomas, Theresa R. Thomsen, Margaret Anne Thorpe, Leanne M. Tierney, Kelli Tiffee, Patricia Tilton, Samanth
July 28, 2013 Filing 165 NOTICE by Elaine L. Ballance, Debra J. Barry, Helen I. Bell, Deborah A. Calendine, Karen S. Colburn, Sharon Cook, Sherry A. Doratio, Tracey Forsythe, Candace Kinsora, Vicki J. LaPlante, Kristall Lopez, Traci M. Muchler, Debra L. Myers, Jessalynn Myers, Dawn J. O'Connor, Cheryl B. Rieper, Paige Singleton, Kelli Tiffee, Rhonda Whitely (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
July 22, 2013 Filing 164 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing held on 7/22/2013. Status hearing set for 8/20/2013 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (cjg, )
July 19, 2013 Filing 163 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Tanya Acquaire, Donna J. Alexander, Wendy Alkire, Lisa Allarde, Elizabeth Altgilbers, Dorothy L. Ancona, Darla J. Anderson, Joy L. Anderson, Tisha Anderson, Darlene M. Archie, Linda Armstrong, Ann Marie Armstrong-Deitch, Sherri M. Armuth, Vickie Astudillo, Joy Christine Atwell, Cheryl Ayers, Joyce Baena, Suzanne M. Bailey, Brenda Bain, Elizabeth Baker, Cindy A. Baker-Spriggs, Janice A. Baldwin, Terri Ballard, Jennifer Ballentine, Holly Banner, Michelle Barbes, Michelle Bardo, Margaret Bardwell, Joy Bargerstock, Shannon Barnes, Alane M Barnes Garvik, Patricia C. Barragan, Katherin Barrow, Deborah Bartelo, Jennette Bastion (Horner), Deborah Bauer, Judith Bean, Cheryl Beauchamp, Deanne L. Becker, Jacqueline Becker, Susan C. Becker, Sheryl J. Bell, JoAnne A. Benson, Roberta Bianchini, Gwendolyn Eartha Lee Bienvenu, Diane H. Birrer, Teresa Bischof, Gail Black, Cheryl J. Blake, Kay A. Bone, Carole J. Boom, Angela R. Booth, Laurie M. Boren, Marilyn M. Bower, Robin L. Bowers, Cecilia Bradford, Carol Brake, Stephanie R. Brammer, Linda Brewer, Cheryl Shaw Briggs, Anne C. Brinzea, Hope Brown, Susan Brown, Amy A. Bruce, Sandra J. Bruce, Leslie Brueckner, Tina Brush, Mary Christine Bryant, Wendy J. Buckheit, Judith A. Buckingham, Ellen K. Buffy, Vicki Bunch, Margaret M. Burchard, Diane Burgbacher, Kathleen C. Burke, Debra L. Burns, Shelly Buschman, Nancy Caldwell, Rebecca S. Cameron, Debbie M. Campbell, Ronda Campbell, Claudia Stella Cantelmi, Elizabeth M. Carithers, Eva L. Carlson, Jo Ellen Carnes, Margaret Diane Carter, Jolene Cartwright, Kevin P. Cartwright, Linda Carucci, Margaret Cary, Gwen Cashion, Kimberly Ceplenski, Kandace Chancey, Jennifer Chandler, Jeannette M. Chipka, Mary Ciesicki, Joanne Frances Cimo, Rosemary Cinquanti, Barbara Ciulla, Kim Claeys, Teresa Slater Clark, Harriet Sue Clarke, Lou Ann Cleary, Theresa Clubb, Patricia Clunk, Tina Coelho, Kimberly Coleman (f/k/a Lauffer), April E. Colleen, Vicki E. Collier, Ian Connors, Karl E. Constantino, Cindy Conwell, Nancy M Corcoran, Lois D. Cores, Tonna G. Cornett, Theresa Cosentino, Mary Kitra Cox, Arlene Bonnie Crafton, LeAnn M. Cramer, Theresa M Crane, Kimberly Crocker-Hendrickson, Kristen A. Crowe, Tamra Crowley, Tara A. Cummings, Beverly M. Cundiff, Darcie J. Cunningham, M. Susan Cunningham, Susan Lynne Damasco, Connie G. Darling, JoAnn Davey, Robin Davies, Joan M. Davis, Marcela C. DeBano, Janeen S. DeBoard, Teresa A. DeSchryver, Stephanie DeWitt, Rosemarie Dean, Rita A. Defino, Renee Demmery, Laura Denio, Pamela J. Denny, Ana Derakshaw, Jennifer L. Dick, Shana Diekhoff, Valerie Dininni, Linda R. Dittmer, Sherma Donnelly, Mark E. Dorn, Angela B. Dortch, Denese Dugay, Constance A. Duncan, Sharon Dutton, Holly Dyer, Delois F. Easterling, Jessica Edwards, Lisa Edwards, Terian Edwards, Jessica Eik, Jennie Eisenstein, Rosemary Elmore, Carli L. Emerson, Teri L Eriksen, Catherine M. Estep (f/k/a Foster), Mindy Faieta, Carol Failla, Melissa Fain, Donna Falco, Judy Fallon, Julie M. Farmer, Donna Farrell, Lori A. Favinger, Saundra Feighner, Laurel Jo Feiker, Robin Feltner, Paula Ferguson, Anna Feroe, Kelli Fisher, Sharon A. Flemmings, Mari J. Floyd, Denise Foell, Amy L. Ford, Sheila R. Ford, Jennifer L. Foreman, Theresa D. Fox, Claudia M. Franklin, Kimberly Freda, Susan L. Frederick, Laura Frederiksen, Debra R. Friess, Rise Fritz, Jessica Fulghum, Lynn Galenza, Deanna Garcia, Lauren Gato, Kristen Votzakis Gauthier, Judith Gay, Cecilia Gaynor, Kristine E. Genrich, Judith Joyce Gerber, Kim Gersie-Scott, Laurie Gianquinto, Diane Gibas, Cynthia C. Gibson, Kimberly K. Gibson, Nikki R. Gilbert, Alice Elaine Gillespie, Karen Gland, Virginia Gomez, Sonia T. Gonzalez, Karen Goodrich, Francine Gorskie, Linda Gray, Randi Gray, Nancy M. Greene, Heather Greenslade, Melinda Griffus, Deborah Guffey, Pamela J. Gugliotta, Lynne D. Hackaday, Marcia A. Hahn, Angela E. Hall, Mary Hall, Deloris P. Hamilton, Laura Hammersley, Darlene C. Hanson, Jane A. Hanson, Shannon Harbinson, Joanna Hardin, Cynthia M. Harp, Janet E. Harper, Pamela D. Harper, Rosemary Harrison, Tracy L. Harrod, Sarah M. Hatch, Nancy Haupt, Susan Haworth, Fayetta L. Hay, Patsy D. Hayes, Sheryl Hazelrigg, Ronda Hebenstreit, Vicki Heinecke, Lorraine L. Henderson, Janet A. Henkel, Lynsi Henson, Lisa Hering, Diane Hernandez, Marjorie Hess, Sherry D. Hess, Maureen Hicks, Rosalie Hicks, Dawn Hill, Edith M. Hinkle, Lisa M. Hoefgen, Jason Hoffman, Cindy I. Holland, Cynthia S. Holley, Treby C. Hood, Janet Hook, Peggy M. Hopper, Lynn Horn, Connie Horton, Gail Hoskins, Shara Howard, Melissa Howe, Mary Ann Hren, Gail Hudson, Michelle Hughes, Karen Humensky, Kathleen Hussey, Carlotta Ingle, Kathleen P. Irwin, Diana Iseminger, Tammy Isham, Donna L. Jackson, Lorraine Jackson, Bonnie M. Jakmauh, Patricia James, Kathleen J. Jandreau, Susan K. Janzen, Debra L. Johns, Dale Johnson (Medina), Catherine R. Johnson-Berger, Roberta L. Jonas, Christy S. Jones, Debra Jane Jones, Julie A. Jones, Shannon Jones, Dawn R. Jordan, Diana Jordan, Marita Patricia Joseph, Naomi I. Joslin, Jean Jouskey, Joni Joyner, Jodi Kabalin, Cheryl Kahl, Linda M. Kalbac, Mary D. Kane, Joanna Karneeb, Barbara Keenan, Kimberly Keevy, Jenette M. Kelly, Kathryn L. Kelly, Sharon Kendrick, Sharon Kenno, Vicki L. Kenobbie, Keula Francis Kilgore, Mary Kleppin, Cheri Kline, Kathryn E. Lacey, Deborah J. Land, Joanne Lane, Rosemary Wood Langella, Coreen M. Larson, Yvonne Lawrence, Patricia Lawson, Diana LeVan, Elaine Leach, Janet Lee, Stacy S. Lee, Cathy S. Lefils, Daphne M. Leibowitz, Susan Lell, Carol Lindemon, Judy M. Lindquist, Jacqueline M. Linville, Christine G. Lockwood, Rebecca L. Loew, Lesa Logan, Julene Logue, Amy L. Long, Renee T. Long, Melissa A. Love, Alice Lovingood, Kathy M. Lucas, Judith Lugo, Joy Lutz, Laurie Lynch, Jayden Nicole Lyons, Margaret E. Mackey, Elizabeth J. Maddox, Judith A. Mannarini, Denise Marie Byrne, Sarena Marques, Konnie Marquis, Diane Martin, Sherry Martin, Steven Martin, Tammy Martinez, April G. Marx, Suzanne Mascola, Theresa L. Mashburn, Linda Mathias, Angela Matias, DeEnna L. Matthews, Kimberly Mauger, Evelyn R. Maynard, Jewel A. Mazur, Cheryl L. McAnich, Mary McClelland, Michell McComas, Pamela McCord, Beverly McCoy, Pamela H. McCullough, Angela McDonough, Nina McFarlane, Donna McKenna, Claire McKinnon, Tonya Michelle McKnight, Mary M. McLaughlin, Joy McLemore, Bobbi McMillin, Margo McNeil, Karen McNeilan, Tina Mehler, Denise Melchior, Beverly Merkel, Marsha Merrell, Rae J. Messick, Yvonne Meyerhofer, Karen Milan, Sharron K. Miles, Carey L. Miller, Carol S. Miller, Joanne G. Miller, Kay L. Miller, Lillian L. Miller, Mary Miller, Janet K. Mitchell, Marilyn Mitchell, Tanya Mixon-White, Virginia M. Mize, Kathleen Moelter, Debra Ann Molitaris, Carol Montgomery, Ann Moore, Cathi R. Moore, Janet Moore, Kimberly Moore, Patricia A. Morgan, Pamela Morrow, Linda F. Morton, Michael Mosteller II, Juliene A. Munoz, Katherine Murphy, Jennifer Murrell, Angela W. Myers, Ann W. Myers, Rebecca J. Nagy, Penelope C. Neal, Ruth Lynn Neely, Tamikka R. Nelson, Brenda Newberg, Janet M. Newsome, Veronica Nicholas, Renee A. Nichols, Carol A. Nigsarian, Deborah K Norton, Tacara Norwood, Mary Anne Novello, Dawn T. O'Connor, Theresa Ann O'Connor, Maureen O'Kelly, Emily Oates, Karla Ockerby, Wanda L. Olson, Wendi Ortiz, Brenda L. Osborne, Paige D. Owens (Hundley), Charlene Palmer, Debra H. Parent, Christina Anne Parman, Kelly Parsons, Betty M. Patton, Julianne Patton, Christie Patzer, Leona R. Payne, Teresa Pemerton, Dawn Pence, Deborah Pepsak, Diane Perryman, Debra A. Petralia, Wendi J. Pierson, Karen L. Pirok, Brenda Lee Plessinger, Julie A. Plourde, Marie A. Plum, Bobbi E. Pollak, Anna C. Pomeroy, Melissa Poole, Sandra Porter, Susan E. Powell, Tina Preston, Joanne Price, Cherie S. Price-Palmer, April Prior, Catherine Probst, Annette D. Pruett, Brenda Pryczynski, B. Jeannie Purcell, Julie Purdy (f/k/a Ramson), Christian V Ramos, Elaina Marie Rande, Patricia Ann Rapp, Joyce Ratajczak, Joanne Rathmann, Jacqueline Ratliff, Linda B. Ray, Sheila Reeser, Rhonda Reeves, Linda Reid, Lorna Reinhart, Wendy H. Reisenauer, Debra K. Resimont, Krissy Reynolds, Beverly S. Richardson, Marie Ricksgers, Gail A. Riley, Les Rinehart, Helen Ring, Jenny S. Rink, Briget Rischawy, Leslie Robertson, Steven Rodriquez, Eileen Roff, Gina Rogers, Lynn E. Rogers, Eileen Rollins, Lynda D. Romanek, Lecia Ropp, Jane L. Rose, Cathy J. Rowe, Toiee Angela Rushing, Jeanette Rydell, Bonnie Ryden, Rhea D. Safire, Constance D. Salvia, Judith A. Sanders, Kathy S. Sanders, Jan E Sandoval, Valerie B. Sawyer, Bonnie Scaia, Mary Teresa Schanz, Jenalyn Scheib, Patricia A. Schmutz, Deborah Schneider, Deborah K. Schneider, Shannon Schroeder, Sherry L. Schwartz, Benjamin Roy Scott, Christy L. Scott, Melinda Scott, Rosie Scott, Karyn B. Scrivener, Theresa K. Segady, Elizabeth A. Sennett, Debra Seuell, Dawn Shaffer, Jean M. Shang, Joy A Sharpe, Denise D. Shelby, Brenda Shelton, Elaine Shortall, Cathryn Sibert, Debra H. Sills, Susan Silver, Debra Silviano, Cheryl Simmons, Kathleen M. Simons, Susanne Simonson, Robin Reid Wooten Simpson, Lisa Sinkler, David D. Sluder, Teresa D. Smiljanic, Connie S. Smith, Jamie Smith, Janis B. Smith, Lisa Smith, Lori M. Smith, Nicole Elizabeth Smith, Wendolyn Smith, Patricia C. Solari, Amanda Solorza, Leslea Souvigney, Diane Spencer, Jacqueline A. Spires-Purdy, Deborah L. Spittle, Jacqueline St. Georges, Jacqueline St. Georges, Margaret Staffer, Kristi Stanford, Rebecca A. Stanley, Barbara A. Stark, Janet Statzer, Melinda J. Stec, Patricia J. Stefanik, Leida Stewart, Debra G. Still, Linda Studley, Tracie Stutzman, Cheryl Sullivan, Jan P. Surprise, Cynthia Swaim, Mary Swanson, Rachel Sweeney, Martha J. Sweitzer, Jennifer M. Synak, Katherine Tate, Patricia E. Taylor, Wanda J. Taylor, Donna Thomas, Theresa R. Thomsen, Margaret Anne Thorpe, Leanne M. Tierney, Patricia Tilton, Samantha Tipton, Michael J. Todd, Debora Tolles, Patricia Townsend, Penny Trammel-MacKenzie, Tanya M. Troutman, Jamie Tullock, Peggy H. Tumlin, Susan E. Turley, Vanessa A. Turner, Ellen D. Tyler, Tangela Tyran, Kelly A. Ustinovich, Yvonne R. Valdez, Brian Varner, Barbara Vaughn, Karen Velasquez, Lucy Viola, Veronica
July 19, 2013 Filing 162 NOTICE by Michelle Barbes, Rebecca S. Cameron, Terian Edwards, Rise Fritz, Patricia Tilton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
July 17, 2013 Filing 161 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Tanya Acquaire, Donna J. Alexander, Wendy Alkire, Lisa Allarde, Elizabeth Altgilbers, Dorothy L. Ancona, Darla J. Anderson, Joy L. Anderson, Tisha Anderson, Darlene M. Archie, Linda Armstrong, Ann Marie Armstrong-Deitch, Sherri M. Armuth, Vickie Astudillo, Joy Christine Atwell, Cheryl Ayers, Joyce Baena, Suzanne M. Bailey, Brenda Bain, Elizabeth Baker, Cindy A. Baker-Spriggs, Janice A. Baldwin, Terri Ballard, Jennifer Ballentine, Holly Banner, Michelle Bardo, Margaret Bardwell, Joy Bargerstock, Shannon Barnes, Alane M Barnes Garvik, Patricia C. Barragan, Katherin Barrow, Deborah Bartelo, Jennette Bastion (Horner), Deborah Bauer, Judith Bean, Cheryl Beauchamp, Deanne L. Becker, Jacqueline Becker, Susan C. Becker, Sheryl J. Bell, JoAnne A. Benson, Roberta Bianchini, Gwendolyn Eartha Lee Bienvenu, Diane H. Birrer, Teresa Bischof, Gail Black, Cheryl J. Blake, Kay A. Bone, Carole J. Boom, Angela R. Booth, Laurie M. Boren, Marilyn M. Bower, Robin L. Bowers, Cecilia Bradford, Carol Brake, Stephanie R. Brammer, Linda Brewer, Cheryl Shaw Briggs, Anne C. Brinzea, Hope Brown, Susan Brown, Amy A. Bruce, Sandra J. Bruce, Leslie Brueckner, Tina Brush, Mary Christine Bryant, Wendy J. Buckheit, Judith A. Buckingham, Ellen K. Buffy, Vicki Bunch, Margaret M. Burchard, Diane Burgbacher, Kathleen C. Burke, Debra L. Burns, Shelly Buschman, Nancy Caldwell, Debbie M. Campbell, Ronda Campbell, Claudia Stella Cantelmi, Elizabeth M. Carithers, Eva L. Carlson, Jo Ellen Carnes, Margaret Diane Carter, Jolene Cartwright, Kevin P. Cartwright, Linda Carucci, Margaret Cary, Gwen Cashion, Kimberly Ceplenski, Kandace Chancey, Jennifer Chandler, Jeannette M. Chipka, Mary Ciesicki, Joanne Frances Cimo, Rosemary Cinquanti, Barbara Ciulla, Kim Claeys, Teresa Slater Clark, Harriet Sue Clarke, Lou Ann Cleary, Theresa Clubb, Patricia Clunk, Tina Coelho, Kimberly Coleman (f/k/a Lauffer), April E. Colleen, Vicki E. Collier, Ian Connors, Karl E. Constantino, Cindy Conwell, Nancy M Corcoran, Lois D. Cores, Tonna G. Cornett, Theresa Cosentino, Mary Kitra Cox, Arlene Bonnie Crafton, LeAnn M. Cramer, Theresa M Crane, Kimberly Crocker-Hendrickson, Kristen A. Crowe, Tamra Crowley, Tara A. Cummings, Beverly M. Cundiff, Darcie J. Cunningham, M. Susan Cunningham, Susan Lynne Damasco, Connie G. Darling, JoAnn Davey, Robin Davies, Joan M. Davis, Marcela C. DeBano, Janeen S. DeBoard, Teresa A. DeSchryver, Stephanie DeWitt, Rosemarie Dean, Rita A. Defino, Renee Demmery, Laura Denio, Pamela J. Denny, Ana Derakshaw, Jennifer L. Dick, Shana Diekhoff, Valerie Dininni, Linda R. Dittmer, Sherma Donnelly, Mark E. Dorn, Angela B. Dortch, Denese Dugay, Constance A. Duncan, Sharon Dutton, Holly Dyer, Delois F. Easterling, Jessica Edwards, Lisa Edwards, Jessica Eik, Jennie Eisenstein, Rosemary Elmore, Carli L. Emerson, Teri L Eriksen, Catherine M. Estep (f/k/a Foster), Mindy Faieta, Carol Failla, Melissa Fain, Donna Falco, Judy Fallon, Julie M. Farmer, Donna Farrell, Lori A. Favinger, Saundra Feighner, Laurel Jo Feiker, Robin Feltner, Paula Ferguson, Anna Feroe, Kelli Fisher, Sharon A. Flemmings, Mari J. Floyd, Denise Foell, Amy L. Ford, Sheila R. Ford, Jennifer L. Foreman, Theresa D. Fox, Claudia M. Franklin, Kimberly Freda, Susan L. Frederick, Laura Frederiksen, Debra R. Friess, Jessica Fulghum, Lynn Galenza, Deanna Garcia, Lauren Gato, Kristen Votzakis Gauthier, Judith Gay, Cecilia Gaynor, Kristine E. Genrich, Judith Joyce Gerber, Kim Gersie-Scott, Laurie Gianquinto, Diane Gibas, Cynthia C. Gibson, Kimberly K. Gibson, Nikki R. Gilbert, Alice Elaine Gillespie, Karen Gland, Virginia Gomez, Sonia T. Gonzalez, Karen Goodrich, Francine Gorskie, Linda Gray, Randi Gray, Nancy M. Greene, Heather Greenslade, Melinda Griffus, Deborah Guffey, Pamela J. Gugliotta, Lynne D. Hackaday, Marcia A. Hahn, Angela E. Hall, Mary Hall, Deloris P. Hamilton, Laura Hammersley, Darlene C. Hanson, Jane A. Hanson, Shannon Harbinson, Joanna Hardin, Cynthia M. Harp, Janet E. Harper, Pamela D. Harper, Rosemary Harrison, Tracy L. Harrod, Sarah M. Hatch, Nancy Haupt, Susan Haworth, Fayetta L. Hay, Patsy D. Hayes, Sheryl Hazelrigg, Ronda Hebenstreit, Vicki Heinecke, Lorraine L. Henderson, Janet A. Henkel, Lynsi Henson, Lisa Hering, Diane Hernandez, Marjorie Hess, Sherry D. Hess, Maureen Hicks, Rosalie Hicks, Dawn Hill, Edith M. Hinkle, Lisa M. Hoefgen, Jason Hoffman, Cindy I. Holland, Cynthia S. Holley, Treby C. Hood, Janet Hook, Peggy M. Hopper, Lynn Horn, Connie Horton, Gail Hoskins, Shara Howard, Melissa Howe, Mary Ann Hren, Gail Hudson, Michelle Hughes, Karen Humensky, Kathleen Hussey, Carlotta Ingle, Kathleen P. Irwin, Diana Iseminger, Tammy Isham, Donna L. Jackson, Lorraine Jackson, Bonnie M. Jakmauh, Patricia James, Kathleen J. Jandreau, Susan K. Janzen, Debra L. Johns, Dale Johnson (Medina), Catherine R. Johnson-Berger, Roberta L. Jonas, Christy S. Jones, Debra Jane Jones, Julie A. Jones, Shannon Jones, Dawn R. Jordan, Diana Jordan, Marita Patricia Joseph, Naomi I. Joslin, Jean Jouskey, Joni Joyner, Jodi Kabalin, Cheryl Kahl, Linda M. Kalbac, Mary D. Kane, Joanna Karneeb, Barbara Keenan, Kimberly Keevy, Jenette M. Kelly, Kathryn L. Kelly, Sharon Kendrick, Sharon Kenno, Vicki L. Kenobbie, Keula Francis Kilgore, Mary Kleppin, Cheri Kline, Kathryn E. Lacey, Deborah J. Land, Joanne Lane, Rosemary Wood Langella, Coreen M. Larson, Yvonne Lawrence, Patricia Lawson, Diana LeVan, Elaine Leach, Janet Lee, Stacy S. Lee, Cathy S. Lefils, Daphne M. Leibowitz, Susan Lell, Carol Lindemon, Judy M. Lindquist, Jacqueline M. Linville, Christine G. Lockwood, Rebecca L. Loew, Lesa Logan, Julene Logue, Amy L. Long, Renee T. Long, Melissa A. Love, Alice Lovingood, Kathy M. Lucas, Judith Lugo, Joy Lutz, Laurie Lynch, Jayden Nicole Lyons, Margaret E. Mackey, Elizabeth J. Maddox, Judith A. Mannarini, Denise Marie Byrne, Sarena Marques, Konnie Marquis, Diane Martin, Sherry Martin, Steven Martin, Tammy Martinez, April G. Marx, Suzanne Mascola, Theresa L. Mashburn, Linda Mathias, Angela Matias, DeEnna L. Matthews, Kimberly Mauger, Evelyn R. Maynard, Jewel A. Mazur, Cheryl L. McAnich, Mary McClelland, Michell McComas, Pamela McCord, Beverly McCoy, Pamela H. McCullough, Angela McDonough, Nina McFarlane, Donna McKenna, Claire McKinnon, Tonya Michelle McKnight, Mary M. McLaughlin, Joy McLemore, Bobbi McMillin, Margo McNeil, Karen McNeilan, Tina Mehler, Denise Melchior, Beverly Merkel, Marsha Merrell, Rae J. Messick, Yvonne Meyerhofer, Karen Milan, Sharron K. Miles, Carey L. Miller, Carol S. Miller, Joanne G. Miller, Kay L. Miller, Lillian L. Miller, Mary Miller, Janet K. Mitchell, Marilyn Mitchell, Tanya Mixon-White, Virginia M. Mize, Kathleen Moelter, Debra Ann Molitaris, Carol Montgomery, Ann Moore, Cathi R. Moore, Janet Moore, Kimberly Moore, Patricia A. Morgan, Pamela Morrow, Linda F. Morton, Michael Mosteller II, Juliene A. Munoz, Katherine Murphy, Jennifer Murrell, Angela W. Myers, Ann W. Myers, Rebecca J. Nagy, Penelope C. Neal, Ruth Lynn Neely, Tamikka R. Nelson, Brenda Newberg, Janet M. Newsome, Veronica Nicholas, Renee A. Nichols, Carol A. Nigsarian, Deborah K Norton, Tacara Norwood, Mary Anne Novello, Dawn T. O'Connor, Theresa Ann O'Connor, Maureen O'Kelly, Emily Oates, Karla Ockerby, Wanda L. Olson, Wendi Ortiz, Brenda L. Osborne, Paige D. Owens (Hundley), Charlene Palmer, Debra H. Parent, Christina Anne Parman, Kelly Parsons, Betty M. Patton, Julianne Patton, Christie Patzer, Leona R. Payne, Teresa Pemerton, Dawn Pence, Deborah Pepsak, Diane Perryman, Debra A. Petralia, Wendi J. Pierson, Karen L. Pirok, Brenda Lee Plessinger, Julie A. Plourde, Marie A. Plum, Bobbi E. Pollak, Anna C. Pomeroy, Melissa Poole, Sandra Porter, Susan E. Powell, Tina Preston, Joanne Price, Cherie S. Price-Palmer, April Prior, Catherine Probst, Annette D. Pruett, Brenda Pryczynski, B. Jeannie Purcell, Julie Purdy (f/k/a Ramson), Christian V Ramos, Elaina Marie Rande, Patricia Ann Rapp, Joyce Ratajczak, Joanne Rathmann, Jacqueline Ratliff, Linda B. Ray, Sheila Reeser, Rhonda Reeves, Linda Reid, Lorna Reinhart, Wendy H. Reisenauer, Debra K. Resimont, Krissy Reynolds, Beverly S. Richardson, Marie Ricksgers, Gail A. Riley, Les Rinehart, Helen Ring, Jenny S. Rink, Briget Rischawy, Leslie Robertson, Steven Rodriquez, Eileen Roff, Gina Rogers, Lynn E. Rogers, Eileen Rollins, Lynda D. Romanek, Lecia Ropp, Jane L. Rose, Cathy J. Rowe, Toiee Angela Rushing, Jeanette Rydell, Bonnie Ryden, Rhea D. Safire, Constance D. Salvia, Judith A. Sanders, Kathy S. Sanders, Jan E Sandoval, Valerie B. Sawyer, Bonnie Scaia, Mary Teresa Schanz, Jenalyn Scheib, Patricia A. Schmutz, Deborah Schneider, Deborah K. Schneider, Shannon Schroeder, Sherry L. Schwartz, Benjamin Roy Scott, Christy L. Scott, Melinda Scott, Rosie Scott, Karyn B. Scrivener, Theresa K. Segady, Elizabeth A. Sennett, Debra Seuell, Dawn Shaffer, Jean M. Shang, Joy A Sharpe, Denise D. Shelby, Brenda Shelton, Elaine Shortall, Cathryn Sibert, Debra H. Sills, Susan Silver, Debra Silviano, Cheryl Simmons, Kathleen M. Simons, Susanne Simonson, Robin Reid Wooten Simpson, Lisa Sinkler, David D. Sluder, Teresa D. Smiljanic, Connie S. Smith, Jamie Smith, Janis B. Smith, Lisa Smith, Lori M. Smith, Nicole Elizabeth Smith, Wendolyn Smith, Patricia C. Solari, Amanda Solorza, Leslea Souvigney, Diane Spencer, Jacqueline A. Spires-Purdy, Deborah L. Spittle, Jacqueline St. Georges, Jacqueline St. Georges, Margaret Staffer, Kristi Stanford, Rebecca A. Stanley, Barbara A. Stark, Janet Statzer, Melinda J. Stec, Patricia J. Stefanik, Leida Stewart, Debra G. Still, Linda Studley, Tracie Stutzman, Cheryl Sullivan, Jan P. Surprise, Cynthia Swaim, Mary Swanson, Rachel Sweeney, Martha J. Sweitzer, Jennifer M. Synak, Katherine Tate, Patricia E. Taylor, Wanda J. Taylor, Donna Thomas, Theresa R. Thomsen, Margaret Anne Thorpe, Leanne M. Tierney, Samantha Tipton, Michael J. Todd, Debora Tolles, Patricia Townsend, Penny Trammel-MacKenzie, Tanya M. Troutman, Jamie Tullock, Peggy H. Tumlin, Susan E. Turley, Vanessa A. Turner, Ellen D. Tyler, Tangela Tyran, Kelly A. Ustinovich, Yvonne R. Valdez, Brian Varner, Barbara Vaughn, Karen Velasquez, Lucy Viola, Veronica Vitari, Ann Wagner, Deborah Waldman, Mary Lynn Walker, Jodi B. Walsh, Andrea Walt
July 17, 2013 Filing 160 NOTICE by Marcela C. DeBano, Jane A. Hanson, Yvonne Lawrence, Melinda Scott, Kristi Stanford, Donna Thomas, Lynn M. Winebaugh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
July 16, 2013 Filing 159 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Tanya Acquaire, Donna J. Alexander, Wendy Alkire, Lisa Allarde, Elizabeth Altgilbers, Dorothy L. Ancona, Darla J. Anderson, Joy L. Anderson, Tisha Anderson, Darlene M. Archie, Linda Armstrong, Ann Marie Armstrong-Deitch, Sherri M. Armuth, Vickie Astudillo, Joy Christine Atwell, Cheryl Ayers, Joyce Baena, Suzanne M. Bailey, Brenda Bain, Elizabeth Baker, Cindy A. Baker-Spriggs, Janice A. Baldwin, Terri Ballard, Jennifer Ballentine, Holly Banner, Michelle Bardo, Margaret Bardwell, Joy Bargerstock, Shannon Barnes, Alane M Barnes Garvik, Patricia C. Barragan, Katherin Barrow, Deborah Bartelo, Jennette Bastion (Horner), Deborah Bauer, Judith Bean, Cheryl Beauchamp, Deanne L. Becker, Jacqueline Becker, Susan C. Becker, Sheryl J. Bell, JoAnne A. Benson, Roberta Bianchini, Gwendolyn Eartha Lee Bienvenu, Diane H. Birrer, Teresa Bischof, Gail Black, Cheryl J. Blake, Kay A. Bone, Carole J. Boom, Angela R. Booth, Laurie M. Boren, Marilyn M. Bower, Robin L. Bowers, Cecilia Bradford, Carol Brake, Stephanie R. Brammer, Linda Brewer, Cheryl Shaw Briggs, Anne C. Brinzea, Hope Brown, Susan Brown, Amy A. Bruce, Sandra J. Bruce, Leslie Brueckner, Tina Brush, Mary Christine Bryant, Wendy J. Buckheit, Judith A. Buckingham, Ellen K. Buffy, Vicki Bunch, Margaret M. Burchard, Diane Burgbacher, Kathleen C. Burke, Debra L. Burns, Shelly Buschman, Nancy Caldwell, Debbie M. Campbell, Ronda Campbell, Claudia Stella Cantelmi, Elizabeth M. Carithers, Eva L. Carlson, Jo Ellen Carnes, Margaret Diane Carter, Jolene Cartwright, Kevin P. Cartwright, Linda Carucci, Margaret Cary, Gwen Cashion, Kimberly Ceplenski, Kandace Chancey, Jennifer Chandler, Jeannette M. Chipka, Mary Ciesicki, Joanne Frances Cimo, Rosemary Cinquanti, Barbara Ciulla, Kim Claeys, Teresa Slater Clark, Harriet Sue Clarke, Lou Ann Cleary, Theresa Clubb, Patricia Clunk, Tina Coelho, Kimberly Coleman (f/k/a Lauffer), April E. Colleen, Vicki E. Collier, Ian Connors, Karl E. Constantino, Cindy Conwell, Nancy M Corcoran, Lois D. Cores, Tonna G. Cornett, Theresa Cosentino, Mary Kitra Cox, Arlene Bonnie Crafton, LeAnn M. Cramer, Theresa M Crane, Kimberly Crocker-Hendrickson, Kristen A. Crowe, Tamra Crowley, Tara A. Cummings, Beverly M. Cundiff, Darcie J. Cunningham, M. Susan Cunningham, Susan Lynne Damasco, Connie G. Darling, JoAnn Davey, Robin Davies, Joan M. Davis, Janeen S. DeBoard, Teresa A. DeSchryver, Stephanie DeWitt, Rosemarie Dean, Rita A. Defino, Renee Demmery, Laura Denio, Pamela J. Denny, Ana Derakshaw, Jennifer L. Dick, Shana Diekhoff, Valerie Dininni, Linda R. Dittmer, Sherma Donnelly, Mark E. Dorn, Angela B. Dortch, Denese Dugay, Constance A. Duncan, Sharon Dutton, Holly Dyer, Delois F. Easterling, Jessica Edwards, Lisa Edwards, Jessica Eik, Jennie Eisenstein, Rosemary Elmore, Carli L. Emerson, Teri L Eriksen, Catherine M. Estep (f/k/a Foster), Mindy Faieta, Carol Failla, Melissa Fain, Donna Falco, Judy Fallon, Julie M. Farmer, Donna Farrell, Lori A. Favinger, Saundra Feighner, Laurel Jo Feiker, Robin Feltner, Paula Ferguson, Anna Feroe, Kelli Fisher, Sharon A. Flemmings, Mari J. Floyd, Denise Foell, Amy L. Ford, Sheila R. Ford, Jennifer L. Foreman, Theresa D. Fox, Claudia M. Franklin, Kimberly Freda, Susan L. Frederick, Laura Frederiksen, Debra R. Friess, Jessica Fulghum, Lynn Galenza, Deanna Garcia, Lauren Gato, Kristen Votzakis Gauthier, Judith Gay, Cecilia Gaynor, Kristine E. Genrich, Judith Joyce Gerber, Kim Gersie-Scott, Laurie Gianquinto, Diane Gibas, Cynthia C. Gibson, Kimberly K. Gibson, Nikki R. Gilbert, Alice Elaine Gillespie, Karen Gland, Virginia Gomez, Sonia T. Gonzalez, Karen Goodrich, Francine Gorskie, Linda Gray, Randi Gray, Nancy M. Greene, Heather Greenslade, Melinda Griffus, Deborah Guffey, Pamela J. Gugliotta, Lynne D. Hackaday, Marcia A. Hahn, Angela E. Hall, Mary Hall, Deloris P. Hamilton, Laura Hammersley, Darlene C. Hanson, Shannon Harbinson, Joanna Hardin, Cynthia M. Harp, Janet E. Harper, Pamela D. Harper, Rosemary Harrison, Tracy L. Harrod, Sarah M. Hatch, Nancy Haupt, Susan Haworth, Fayetta L. Hay, Patsy D. Hayes, Sheryl Hazelrigg, Ronda Hebenstreit, Vicki Heinecke, Lorraine L. Henderson, Janet A. Henkel, Lynsi Henson, Lisa Hering, Diane Hernandez, Marjorie Hess, Sherry D. Hess, Maureen Hicks, Rosalie Hicks, Dawn Hill, Edith M. Hinkle, Lisa M. Hoefgen, Jason Hoffman, Cindy I. Holland, Cynthia S. Holley, Treby C. Hood, Janet Hook, Peggy M. Hopper, Lynn Horn, Connie Horton, Gail Hoskins, Shara Howard, Melissa Howe, Mary Ann Hren, Gail Hudson, Michelle Hughes, Karen Humensky, Kathleen Hussey, Carlotta Ingle, Kathleen P. Irwin, Diana Iseminger, Tammy Isham, Donna L. Jackson, Lorraine Jackson, Bonnie M. Jakmauh, Patricia James, Kathleen J. Jandreau, Susan K. Janzen, Debra L. Johns, Dale Johnson (Medina), Catherine R. Johnson-Berger, Roberta L. Jonas, Christy S. Jones, Debra Jane Jones, Julie A. Jones, Shannon Jones, Dawn R. Jordan, Diana Jordan, Marita Patricia Joseph, Naomi I. Joslin, Jean Jouskey, Joni Joyner, Jodi Kabalin, Cheryl Kahl, Linda M. Kalbac, Mary D. Kane, Joanna Karneeb, Barbara Keenan, Kimberly Keevy, Jenette M. Kelly, Kathryn L. Kelly, Sharon Kendrick, Sharon Kenno, Vicki L. Kenobbie, Keula Francis Kilgore, Mary Kleppin, Cheri Kline, Kathryn E. Lacey, Deborah J. Land, Joanne Lane, Rosemary Wood Langella, Coreen M. Larson, Patricia Lawson, Diana LeVan, Elaine Leach, Janet Lee, Stacy S. Lee, Cathy S. Lefils, Daphne M. Leibowitz, Susan Lell, Carol Lindemon, Judy M. Lindquist, Jacqueline M. Linville, Christine G. Lockwood, Rebecca L. Loew, Lesa Logan, Julene Logue, Amy L. Long, Renee T. Long, Melissa A. Love, Alice Lovingood, Kathy M. Lucas, Judith Lugo, Joy Lutz, Laurie Lynch, Jayden Nicole Lyons, Margaret E. Mackey, Elizabeth J. Maddox, Judith A. Mannarini, Denise Marie Byrne, Sarena Marques, Konnie Marquis, Diane Martin, Sherry Martin, Steven Martin, Tammy Martinez, April G. Marx, Suzanne Mascola, Theresa L. Mashburn, Linda Mathias, Angela Matias, DeEnna L. Matthews, Kimberly Mauger, Evelyn R. Maynard, Jewel A. Mazur, Cheryl L. McAnich, Mary McClelland, Michell McComas, Pamela McCord, Beverly McCoy, Pamela H. McCullough, Angela McDonough, Nina McFarlane, Donna McKenna, Claire McKinnon, Tonya Michelle McKnight, Mary M. McLaughlin, Joy McLemore, Bobbi McMillin, Margo McNeil, Karen McNeilan, Tina Mehler, Denise Melchior, Beverly Merkel, Marsha Merrell, Rae J. Messick, Yvonne Meyerhofer, Karen Milan, Sharron K. Miles, Carey L. Miller, Carol S. Miller, Joanne G. Miller, Kay L. Miller, Lillian L. Miller, Mary Miller, Janet K. Mitchell, Marilyn Mitchell, Tanya Mixon-White, Virginia M. Mize, Kathleen Moelter, Debra Ann Molitaris, Carol Montgomery, Ann Moore, Cathi R. Moore, Janet Moore, Kimberly Moore, Patricia A. Morgan, Pamela Morrow, Linda F. Morton, Michael Mosteller II, Juliene A. Munoz, Katherine Murphy, Jennifer Murrell, Angela W. Myers, Ann W. Myers, Rebecca J. Nagy, Penelope C. Neal, Ruth Lynn Neely, Tamikka R. Nelson, Brenda Newberg, Janet M. Newsome, Veronica Nicholas, Renee A. Nichols, Carol A. Nigsarian, Deborah K Norton, Tacara Norwood, Mary Anne Novello, Dawn T. O'Connor, Theresa Ann O'Connor, Maureen O'Kelly, Emily Oates, Karla Ockerby, Wanda L. Olson, Wendi Ortiz, Brenda L. Osborne, Paige D. Owens (Hundley), Charlene Palmer, Debra H. Parent, Christina Anne Parman, Kelly Parsons, Betty M. Patton, Julianne Patton, Christie Patzer, Leona R. Payne, Teresa Pemerton, Dawn Pence, Deborah Pepsak, Diane Perryman, Debra A. Petralia, Wendi J. Pierson, Karen L. Pirok, Brenda Lee Plessinger, Julie A. Plourde, Marie A. Plum, Bobbi E. Pollak, Anna C. Pomeroy, Melissa Poole, Sandra Porter, Susan E. Powell, Tina Preston, Joanne Price, Cherie S. Price-Palmer, April Prior, Catherine Probst, Annette D. Pruett, Brenda Pryczynski, B. Jeannie Purcell, Julie Purdy (f/k/a Ramson), Christian V Ramos, Elaina Marie Rande, Patricia Ann Rapp, Joyce Ratajczak, Joanne Rathmann, Jacqueline Ratliff, Linda B. Ray, Sheila Reeser, Rhonda Reeves, Linda Reid, Lorna Reinhart, Wendy H. Reisenauer, Debra K. Resimont, Krissy Reynolds, Beverly S. Richardson, Marie Ricksgers, Gail A. Riley, Les Rinehart, Helen Ring, Jenny S. Rink, Briget Rischawy, Leslie Robertson, Steven Rodriquez, Eileen Roff, Gina Rogers, Lynn E. Rogers, Eileen Rollins, Lynda D. Romanek, Lecia Ropp, Jane L. Rose, Cathy J. Rowe, Toiee Angela Rushing, Jeanette Rydell, Bonnie Ryden, Rhea D. Safire, Constance D. Salvia, Judith A. Sanders, Kathy S. Sanders, Jan E Sandoval, Valerie B. Sawyer, Bonnie Scaia, Mary Teresa Schanz, Jenalyn Scheib, Patricia A. Schmutz, Deborah Schneider, Deborah K. Schneider, Shannon Schroeder, Sherry L. Schwartz, Benjamin Roy Scott, Christy L. Scott, Rosie Scott, Karyn B. Scrivener, Theresa K. Segady, Elizabeth A. Sennett, Debra Seuell, Dawn Shaffer, Jean M. Shang, Joy A Sharpe, Denise D. Shelby, Brenda Shelton, Elaine Shortall, Cathryn Sibert, Debra H. Sills, Susan Silver, Debra Silviano, Cheryl Simmons, Kathleen M. Simons, Susanne Simonson, Robin Reid Wooten Simpson, Lisa Sinkler, David D. Sluder, Teresa D. Smiljanic, Connie S. Smith, Jamie Smith, Janis B. Smith, Lisa Smith, Lori M. Smith, Nicole Elizabeth Smith, Wendolyn Smith, Patricia C. Solari, Amanda Solorza, Leslea Souvigney, Diane Spencer, Jacqueline A. Spires-Purdy, Deborah L. Spittle, Jacqueline St. Georges, Jacqueline St. Georges, Margaret Staffer, Rebecca A. Stanley, Barbara A. Stark, Janet Statzer, Melinda J. Stec, Patricia J. Stefanik, Leida Stewart, Debra G. Still, Linda Studley, Tracie Stutzman, Cheryl Sullivan, Jan P. Surprise, Cynthia Swaim, Mary Swanson, Rachel Sweeney, Martha J. Sweitzer, Jennifer M. Synak, Katherine Tate, Patricia E. Taylor, Wanda J. Taylor, Theresa R. Thomsen, Margaret Anne Thorpe, Leanne M. Tierney, Samantha Tipton, Michael J. Todd, Debora Tolles, Patricia Townsend, Penny Trammel-MacKenzie, Tanya M. Troutman, Jamie Tullock, Peggy H. Tumlin, Susan E. Turley, Vanessa A. Turner, Ellen D. Tyler, Tangela Tyran, Kelly A. Ustinovich, Yvonne R. Valdez, Brian Varner, Barbara Vaughn, Karen Velasquez, Lucy Viola, Veronica Vitari, Ann Wagner, Deborah Waldman, Mary Lynn Walker, Jodi B. Walsh, Andrea Walton, Derek Ware, Elizabeth Warfield, Melinda Warnecke, Robin L. Watkins, Connie Watson, Deborah Wat
July 15, 2013 Filing 158 NOTICE by Diane H. Birrer, Renee Demmery, Saundra Feighner, Sonia T. Gonzalez, Kathleen Hussey, Theresa L. Mashburn, Dawn T. O'Connor, Leslie Robertson, Kathy S. Sanders, Deborah Schneider, Elaine Shortall, Yvonne R. Valdez, Denise Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
July 8, 2013 Filing 157 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Tanya Acquaire, Donna J. Alexander, Wendy Alkire, Lisa Allarde, Elizabeth Altgilbers, Dorothy L. Ancona, Darla J. Anderson, Joy L. Anderson, Tisha Anderson, Darlene M. Archie, Linda Armstrong, Ann Marie Armstrong-Deitch, Sherri M. Armuth, Vickie Astudillo, Joy Christine Atwell, Cheryl Ayers, Joyce Baena, Suzanne M. Bailey, Brenda Bain, Elizabeth Baker, Cindy A. Baker-Spriggs, Janice A. Baldwin, Terri Ballard, Jennifer Ballentine, Holly Banner, Michelle Bardo, Margaret Bardwell, Joy Bargerstock, Shannon Barnes, Alane M Barnes Garvik, Patricia C. Barragan, Katherin Barrow, Deborah Bartelo, Jennette Bastion (Horner), Deborah Bauer, Judith Bean, Cheryl Beauchamp, Deanne L. Becker, Jacqueline Becker, Susan C. Becker, Sheryl J. Bell, JoAnne A. Benson, Roberta Bianchini, Gwendolyn Eartha Lee Bienvenu, Teresa Bischof, Gail Black, Cheryl J. Blake, Kay A. Bone, Carole J. Boom, Angela R. Booth, Laurie M. Boren, Marilyn M. Bower, Robin L. Bowers, Cecilia Bradford, Carol Brake, Stephanie R. Brammer, Linda Brewer, Cheryl Shaw Briggs, Anne C. Brinzea, Hope Brown, Susan Brown, Amy A. Bruce, Sandra J. Bruce, Leslie Brueckner, Tina Brush, Mary Christine Bryant, Wendy J. Buckheit, Judith A. Buckingham, Ellen K. Buffy, Vicki Bunch, Margaret M. Burchard, Diane Burgbacher, Kathleen C. Burke, Debra L. Burns, Shelly Buschman, Nancy Caldwell, Debbie M. Campbell, Ronda Campbell, Claudia Stella Cantelmi, Elizabeth M. Carithers, Eva L. Carlson, Jo Ellen Carnes, Margaret Diane Carter, Jolene Cartwright, Kevin P. Cartwright, Linda Carucci, Margaret Cary, Gwen Cashion, Kimberly Ceplenski, Kandace Chancey, Jennifer Chandler, Jeannette M. Chipka, Mary Ciesicki, Joanne Frances Cimo, Rosemary Cinquanti, Barbara Ciulla, Kim Claeys, Teresa Slater Clark, Harriet Sue Clarke, Lou Ann Cleary, Theresa Clubb, Patricia Clunk, Tina Coelho, Kimberly Coleman (f/k/a Lauffer), April E. Colleen, Vicki E. Collier, Ian Connors, Karl E. Constantino, Cindy Conwell, Nancy M Corcoran, Lois D. Cores, Tonna G. Cornett, Theresa Cosentino, Mary Kitra Cox, Arlene Bonnie Crafton, LeAnn M. Cramer, Theresa M Crane, Kimberly Crocker-Hendrickson, Kristen A. Crowe, Tamra Crowley, Tara A. Cummings, Beverly M. Cundiff, Darcie J. Cunningham, M. Susan Cunningham, Susan Lynne Damasco, Connie G. Darling, JoAnn Davey, Robin Davies, Joan M. Davis, Janeen S. DeBoard, Teresa A. DeSchryver, Stephanie DeWitt, Rosemarie Dean, Rita A. Defino, Laura Denio, Pamela J. Denny, Ana Derakshaw, Jennifer L. Dick, Shana Diekhoff, Valerie Dininni, Linda R. Dittmer, Sherma Donnelly, Mark E. Dorn, Angela B. Dortch, Denese Dugay, Constance A. Duncan, Sharon Dutton, Holly Dyer, Delois F. Easterling, Jessica Edwards, Lisa Edwards, Jessica Eik, Jennie Eisenstein, Rosemary Elmore, Carli L. Emerson, Teri L Eriksen, Catherine M. Estep (f/k/a Foster), Mindy Faieta, Carol Failla, Melissa Fain, Donna Falco, Judy Fallon, Julie M. Farmer, Donna Farrell, Lori A. Favinger, Laurel Jo Feiker, Robin Feltner, Paula Ferguson, Anna Feroe, Kelli Fisher, Sharon A. Flemmings, Mari J. Floyd, Denise Foell, Amy L. Ford, Sheila R. Ford, Jennifer L. Foreman, Theresa D. Fox, Claudia M. Franklin, Kimberly Freda, Susan L. Frederick, Laura Frederiksen, Debra R. Friess, Jessica Fulghum, Lynn Galenza, Deanna Garcia, Lauren Gato, Kristen Votzakis Gauthier, Judith Gay, Cecilia Gaynor, Kristine E. Genrich, Judith Joyce Gerber, Kim Gersie-Scott, Laurie Gianquinto, Diane Gibas, Cynthia C. Gibson, Kimberly K. Gibson, Nikki R. Gilbert, Alice Elaine Gillespie, Karen Gland, Virginia Gomez, Karen Goodrich, Francine Gorskie, Linda Gray, Randi Gray, Nancy M. Greene, Heather Greenslade, Melinda Griffus, Deborah Guffey, Pamela J. Gugliotta, Lynne D. Hackaday, Marcia A. Hahn, Angela E. Hall, Mary Hall, Deloris P. Hamilton, Laura Hammersley, Darlene C. Hanson, Shannon Harbinson, Joanna Hardin, Cynthia M. Harp, Janet E. Harper, Pamela D. Harper, Rosemary Harrison, Tracy L. Harrod, Sarah M. Hatch, Nancy Haupt, Susan Haworth, Fayetta L. Hay, Patsy D. Hayes, Sheryl Hazelrigg, Ronda Hebenstreit, Vicki Heinecke, Lorraine L. Henderson, Janet A. Henkel, Lynsi Henson, Lisa Hering, Diane Hernandez, Marjorie Hess, Sherry D. Hess, Maureen Hicks, Rosalie Hicks, Dawn Hill, Edith M. Hinkle, Lisa M. Hoefgen, Jason Hoffman, Cindy I. Holland, Cynthia S. Holley, Treby C. Hood, Janet Hook, Peggy M. Hopper, Lynn Horn, Connie Horton, Gail Hoskins, Shara Howard, Melissa Howe, Mary Ann Hren, Gail Hudson, Michelle Hughes, Karen Humensky, Carlotta Ingle, Kathleen P. Irwin, Diana Iseminger, Tammy Isham, Donna L. Jackson, Lorraine Jackson, Bonnie M. Jakmauh, Patricia James, Kathleen J. Jandreau, Susan K. Janzen, Debra L. Johns, Dale Johnson (Medina), Catherine R. Johnson-Berger, Roberta L. Jonas, Christy S. Jones, Debra Jane Jones, Julie A. Jones, Shannon Jones, Dawn R. Jordan, Diana Jordan, Marita Patricia Joseph, Naomi I. Joslin, Jean Jouskey, Joni Joyner, Jodi Kabalin, Cheryl Kahl, Linda M. Kalbac, Mary D. Kane, Joanna Karneeb, Barbara Keenan, Kimberly Keevy, Jenette M. Kelly, Kathryn L. Kelly, Sharon Kendrick, Sharon Kenno, Vicki L. Kenobbie, Keula Francis Kilgore, Mary Kleppin, Cheri Kline, Kathryn E. Lacey, Deborah J. Land, Joanne Lane, Rosemary Wood Langella, Coreen M. Larson, Patricia Lawson, Diana LeVan, Elaine Leach, Janet Lee, Stacy S. Lee, Cathy S. Lefils, Daphne M. Leibowitz, Susan Lell, Carol Lindemon, Judy M. Lindquist, Jacqueline M. Linville, Christine G. Lockwood, Rebecca L. Loew, Lesa Logan, Julene Logue, Amy L. Long, Renee T. Long, Melissa A. Love, Alice Lovingood, Kathy M. Lucas, Judith Lugo, Joy Lutz, Laurie Lynch, Jayden Nicole Lyons, Margaret E. Mackey, Elizabeth J. Maddox, Judith A. Mannarini, Denise Marie Byrne, Sarena Marques, Konnie Marquis, Diane Martin, Sherry Martin, Steven Martin, Tammy Martinez, April G. Marx, Suzanne Mascola, Linda Mathias, Angela Matias, DeEnna L. Matthews, Kimberly Mauger, Evelyn R. Maynard, Jewel A. Mazur, Cheryl L. McAnich, Mary McClelland, Michell McComas, Pamela McCord, Beverly McCoy, Pamela H. McCullough, Angela McDonough, Nina McFarlane, Donna McKenna, Claire McKinnon, Tonya Michelle McKnight, Mary M. McLaughlin, Joy McLemore, Bobbi McMillin, Margo McNeil, Karen McNeilan, Tina Mehler, Denise Melchior, Beverly Merkel, Marsha Merrell, Rae J. Messick, Yvonne Meyerhofer, Karen Milan, Sharron K. Miles, Carey L. Miller, Carol S. Miller, Joanne G. Miller, Kay L. Miller, Lillian L. Miller, Mary Miller, Janet K. Mitchell, Marilyn Mitchell, Tanya Mixon-White, Virginia M. Mize, Kathleen Moelter, Debra Ann Molitaris, Carol Montgomery, Ann Moore, Cathi R. Moore, Janet Moore, Kimberly Moore, Patricia A. Morgan, Pamela Morrow, Linda F. Morton, Michael Mosteller II, Juliene A. Munoz, Katherine Murphy, Jennifer Murrell, Angela W. Myers, Ann W. Myers, Rebecca J. Nagy, Penelope C. Neal, Ruth Lynn Neely, Tamikka R. Nelson, Brenda Newberg, Janet M. Newsome, Veronica Nicholas, Renee A. Nichols, Carol A. Nigsarian, Deborah K Norton, Tacara Norwood, Mary Anne Novello, Theresa Ann O'Connor, Maureen O'Kelly, Emily Oates, Karla Ockerby, Wanda L. Olson, Wendi Ortiz, Brenda L. Osborne, Paige D. Owens (Hundley), Charlene Palmer, Debra H. Parent, Christina Anne Parman, Kelly Parsons, Betty M. Patton, Julianne Patton, Christie Patzer, Leona R. Payne, Teresa Pemerton, Dawn Pence, Deborah Pepsak, Diane Perryman, Debra A. Petralia, Wendi J. Pierson, Karen L. Pirok, Brenda Lee Plessinger, Julie A. Plourde, Marie A. Plum, Bobbi E. Pollak, Anna C. Pomeroy, Melissa Poole, Sandra Porter, Susan E. Powell, Tina Preston, Joanne Price, Cherie S. Price-Palmer, April Prior, Catherine Probst, Annette D. Pruett, Brenda Pryczynski, B. Jeannie Purcell, Julie Purdy (f/k/a Ramson), Christian V Ramos, Elaina Marie Rande, Patricia Ann Rapp, Joyce Ratajczak, Joanne Rathmann, Jacqueline Ratliff, Linda B. Ray, Sheila Reeser, Rhonda Reeves, Linda Reid, Lorna Reinhart, Wendy H. Reisenauer, Debra K. Resimont, Krissy Reynolds, Beverly S. Richardson, Marie Ricksgers, Gail A. Riley, Les Rinehart, Helen Ring, Jenny S. Rink, Briget Rischawy, Steven Rodriquez, Eileen Roff, Gina Rogers, Lynn E. Rogers, Eileen Rollins, Lynda D. Romanek, Lecia Ropp, Jane L. Rose, Cathy J. Rowe, Toiee Angela Rushing, Jeanette Rydell, Bonnie Ryden, Rhea D. Safire, Constance D. Salvia, Judith A. Sanders, Jan E Sandoval, Valerie B. Sawyer, Bonnie Scaia, Mary Teresa Schanz, Jenalyn Scheib, Patricia A. Schmutz, Deborah K. Schneider, Shannon Schroeder, Sherry L. Schwartz, Benjamin Roy Scott, Christy L. Scott, Rosie Scott, Karyn B. Scrivener, Theresa K. Segady, Elizabeth A. Sennett, Debra Seuell, Dawn Shaffer, Jean M. Shang, Joy A Sharpe, Denise D. Shelby, Brenda Shelton, Cathryn Sibert, Debra H. Sills, Susan Silver, Debra Silviano, Cheryl Simmons, Kathleen M. Simons, Susanne Simonson, Robin Reid Wooten Simpson, Lisa Sinkler, David D. Sluder, Teresa D. Smiljanic, Connie S. Smith, Jamie Smith, Janis B. Smith, Lisa Smith, Lori M. Smith, Nicole Elizabeth Smith, Wendolyn Smith, Patricia C. Solari, Amanda Solorza, Leslea Souvigney, Diane Spencer, Jacqueline A. Spires-Purdy, Deborah L. Spittle, Jacqueline St. Georges, Jacqueline St. Georges, Margaret Staffer, Rebecca A. Stanley, Barbara A. Stark, Janet Statzer, Melinda J. Stec, Patricia J. Stefanik, Leida Stewart, Debra G. Still, Linda Studley, Tracie Stutzman, Cheryl Sullivan, Jan P. Surprise, Cynthia Swaim, Mary Swanson, Rachel Sweeney, Martha J. Sweitzer, Jennifer M. Synak, Katherine Tate, Patricia E. Taylor, Wanda J. Taylor, Theresa R. Thomsen, Margaret Anne Thorpe, Leanne M. Tierney, Samantha Tipton, Michael J. Todd, Debora Tolles, Patricia Townsend, Penny Trammel-MacKenzie, Tanya M. Troutman, Jamie Tullock, Peggy H. Tumlin, Susan E. Turley, Vanessa A. Turner, Ellen D. Tyler, Tangela Tyran, Kelly A. Ustinovich, Brian Varner, Barbara Vaughn, Karen Velasquez, Lucy Viola, Veronica Vitari, Ann Wagner, Deborah Waldman, Mary Lynn Walker, Jodi B. Walsh, Andrea Walton, Derek Ware, Elizabeth Warfield, Melinda Warnecke, Robin L. Watkins, Connie Watson, Deborah Watts, Dorothy A. Weise, Carla Weiss, Susan Westlund, Terri Wheeler, Carolyn White, Nickie White, Myrtis A. Whitely, Julie M. Wickersham, Cheryl Williams, Connee A. Williams, Deborah H. Williams, Kimberly A. Williams,
July 8, 2013 Filing 156 NOTICE by Donna J. Alexander, Elizabeth Altgilbers, Joyce Baena, Anne C. Brinzea, Angela B. Dortch, Mindy Faieta, Sharon A. Flemmings, Kimberly K. Gibson, Lynne D. Hackaday, Debra L. Johns, Jean Jouskey, Elizabeth J. Maddox, Pamela H. McCullough, Cathi R. Moore, Tamikka R. Nelson, Renee A. Nichols, Karen L. Pirok, Lecia Ropp, Susanne Simonson, Connie S. Smith, Katherine Tate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
July 1, 2013 Filing 155 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Tanya Acquaire, Wendy Alkire, Lisa Allarde, Dorothy L. Ancona, Darla J. Anderson, Joy L. Anderson, Tisha Anderson, Darlene M. Archie, Linda Armstrong, Ann Marie Armstrong-Deitch, Sherri M. Armuth, Vickie Astudillo, Joy Christine Atwell, Cheryl Ayers, Suzanne M. Bailey, Brenda Bain, Elizabeth Baker, Cindy A. Baker-Spriggs, Janice A. Baldwin, Terri Ballard, Jennifer Ballentine, Holly Banner, Michelle Bardo, Margaret Bardwell, Joy Bargerstock, Shannon Barnes, Alane M Barnes Garvik, Patricia C. Barragan, Katherin Barrow, Deborah Bartelo, Jennette Bastion (Horner), Deborah Bauer, Judith Bean, Cheryl Beauchamp, Deanne L. Becker, Jacqueline Becker, Susan C. Becker, Sheryl J. Bell, JoAnne A. Benson, Roberta Bianchini, Gwendolyn Eartha Lee Bienvenu, Teresa Bischof, Gail Black, Cheryl J. Blake, Kay A. Bone, Carole J. Boom, Angela R. Booth, Laurie M. Boren, Marilyn M. Bower, Robin L. Bowers, Cecilia Bradford, Carol Brake, Stephanie R. Brammer, Linda Brewer, Cheryl Shaw Briggs, Hope Brown, Susan Brown, Amy A. Bruce, Sandra J. Bruce, Leslie Brueckner, Tina Brush, Mary Christine Bryant, Wendy J. Buckheit, Judith A. Buckingham, Ellen K. Buffy, Vicki Bunch, Margaret M. Burchard, Diane Burgbacher, Kathleen C. Burke, Debra L. Burns, Shelly Buschman, Nancy Caldwell, Debbie M. Campbell, Ronda Campbell, Claudia Stella Cantelmi, Elizabeth M. Carithers, Eva L. Carlson, Jo Ellen Carnes, Margaret Diane Carter, Jolene Cartwright, Kevin P. Cartwright, Linda Carucci, Margaret Cary, Gwen Cashion, Kimberly Ceplenski, Kandace Chancey, Jennifer Chandler, Jeannette M. Chipka, Mary Ciesicki, Joanne Frances Cimo, Rosemary Cinquanti, Barbara Ciulla, Kim Claeys, Teresa Slater Clark, Harriet Sue Clarke, Lou Ann Cleary, Theresa Clubb, Patricia Clunk, Tina Coelho, Kimberly Coleman (f/k/a Lauffer), April E. Colleen, Vicki E. Collier, Ian Connors, Karl E. Constantino, Cindy Conwell, Nancy M Corcoran, Lois D. Cores, Tonna G. Cornett, Theresa Cosentino, Mary Kitra Cox, Arlene Bonnie Crafton, LeAnn M. Cramer, Theresa M Crane, Kimberly Crocker-Hendrickson, Kristen A. Crowe, Tamra Crowley, Tara A. Cummings, Beverly M. Cundiff, Darcie J. Cunningham, M. Susan Cunningham, Susan Lynne Damasco, Connie G. Darling, JoAnn Davey, Robin Davies, Joan M. Davis, Janeen S. DeBoard, Teresa A. DeSchryver, Stephanie DeWitt, Rosemarie Dean, Rita A. Defino, Laura Denio, Pamela J. Denny, Ana Derakshaw, Jennifer L. Dick, Shana Diekhoff, Valerie Dininni, Linda R. Dittmer, Sherma Donnelly, Mark E. Dorn, Denese Dugay, Constance A. Duncan, Sharon Dutton, Holly Dyer, Delois F. Easterling, Jessica Edwards, Lisa Edwards, Jessica Eik, Jennie Eisenstein, Rosemary Elmore, Carli L. Emerson, Teri L Eriksen, Catherine M. Estep (f/k/a Foster), Carol Failla, Melissa Fain, Donna Falco, Judy Fallon, Julie M. Farmer, Donna Farrell, Lori A. Favinger, Laurel Jo Feiker, Robin Feltner, Paula Ferguson, Anna Feroe, Kelli Fisher, Mari J. Floyd, Denise Foell, Amy L. Ford, Sheila R. Ford, Jennifer L. Foreman, Theresa D. Fox, Claudia M. Franklin, Kimberly Freda, Susan L. Frederick, Laura Frederiksen, Debra R. Friess, Jessica Fulghum, Lynn Galenza, Deanna Garcia, Lauren Gato, Kristen Votzakis Gauthier, Judith Gay, Cecilia Gaynor, Kristine E. Genrich, Judith Joyce Gerber, Kim Gersie-Scott, Laurie Gianquinto, Diane Gibas, Cynthia C. Gibson, Nikki R. Gilbert, Alice Elaine Gillespie, Karen Gland, Virginia Gomez, Karen Goodrich, Francine Gorskie, Linda Gray, Randi Gray, Nancy M. Greene, Heather Greenslade, Melinda Griffus, Deborah Guffey, Pamela J. Gugliotta, Marcia A. Hahn, Angela E. Hall, Mary Hall, Deloris P. Hamilton, Laura Hammersley, Darlene C. Hanson, Shannon Harbinson, Joanna Hardin, Cynthia M. Harp, Janet E. Harper, Pamela D. Harper, Rosemary Harrison, Tracy L. Harrod, Sarah M. Hatch, Nancy Haupt, Susan Haworth, Fayetta L. Hay, Patsy D. Hayes, Sheryl Hazelrigg, Ronda Hebenstreit, Vicki Heinecke, Lorraine L. Henderson, Janet A. Henkel, Lynsi Henson, Lisa Hering, Diane Hernandez, Marjorie Hess, Sherry D. Hess, Maureen Hicks, Rosalie Hicks, Dawn Hill, Edith M. Hinkle, Lisa M. Hoefgen, Jason Hoffman, Cindy I. Holland, Cynthia S. Holley, Treby C. Hood, Janet Hook, Peggy M. Hopper, Lynn Horn, Connie Horton, Gail Hoskins, Shara Howard, Melissa Howe, Mary Ann Hren, Gail Hudson, Michelle Hughes, Karen Humensky, Carlotta Ingle, Kathleen P. Irwin, Diana Iseminger, Tammy Isham, Donna L. Jackson, Lorraine Jackson, Bonnie M. Jakmauh, Patricia James, Kathleen J. Jandreau, Susan K. Janzen, Dale Johnson (Medina), Catherine R. Johnson-Berger, Roberta L. Jonas, Christy S. Jones, Debra Jane Jones, Julie A. Jones, Shannon Jones, Dawn R. Jordan, Diana Jordan, Marita Patricia Joseph, Naomi I. Joslin, Joni Joyner, Jodi Kabalin, Cheryl Kahl, Linda M. Kalbac, Mary D. Kane, Joanna Karneeb, Barbara Keenan, Kimberly Keevy, Jenette M. Kelly, Kathryn L. Kelly, Sharon Kendrick, Sharon Kenno, Vicki L. Kenobbie, Keula Francis Kilgore, Mary Kleppin, Cheri Kline, Kathryn E. Lacey, Deborah J. Land, Joanne Lane, Rosemary Wood Langella, Coreen M. Larson, Patricia Lawson, Diana LeVan, Elaine Leach, Janet Lee, Stacy S. Lee, Cathy S. Lefils, Daphne M. Leibowitz, Susan Lell, Carol Lindemon, Judy M. Lindquist, Jacqueline M. Linville, Christine G. Lockwood, Rebecca L. Loew, Lesa Logan, Julene Logue, Amy L. Long, Renee T. Long, Melissa A. Love, Alice Lovingood, Kathy M. Lucas, Judith Lugo, Joy Lutz, Laurie Lynch, Jayden Nicole Lyons, Margaret E. Mackey, Judith A. Mannarini, Denise Marie Byrne, Sarena Marques, Konnie Marquis, Diane Martin, Sherry Martin, Steven Martin, Tammy Martinez, April G. Marx, Suzanne Mascola, Linda Mathias, Angela Matias, DeEnna L. Matthews, Kimberly Mauger, Evelyn R. Maynard, Jewel A. Mazur, Cheryl L. McAnich, Mary McClelland, Michell McComas, Pamela McCord, Beverly McCoy, Angela McDonough, Nina McFarlane, Donna McKenna, Claire McKinnon, Tonya Michelle McKnight, Mary M. McLaughlin, Joy McLemore, Bobbi McMillin, Margo McNeil, Karen McNeilan, Tina Mehler, Denise Melchior, Beverly Merkel, Marsha Merrell, Rae J. Messick, Yvonne Meyerhofer, Karen Milan, Sharron K. Miles, Carey L. Miller, Carol S. Miller, Joanne G. Miller, Kay L. Miller, Lillian L. Miller, Mary Miller, Janet K. Mitchell, Marilyn Mitchell, Tanya Mixon-White, Virginia M. Mize, Kathleen Moelter, Debra Ann Molitaris, Carol Montgomery, Ann Moore, Janet Moore, Kimberly Moore, Patricia A. Morgan, Pamela Morrow, Linda F. Morton, Michael Mosteller II, Juliene A. Munoz, Katherine Murphy, Jennifer Murrell, Angela W. Myers, Ann W. Myers, Rebecca J. Nagy, Penelope C. Neal, Ruth Lynn Neely, Brenda Newberg, Janet M. Newsome, Veronica Nicholas, Carol A. Nigsarian, Deborah K Norton, Tacara Norwood, Mary Anne Novello, Theresa Ann O'Connor, Maureen O'Kelly, Emily Oates, Karla Ockerby, Wanda L. Olson, Wendi Ortiz, Brenda L. Osborne, Paige D. Owens (Hundley), Charlene Palmer, Debra H. Parent, Christina Anne Parman, Kelly Parsons, Betty M. Patton, Julianne Patton, Christie Patzer, Leona R. Payne, Teresa Pemerton, Dawn Pence, Deborah Pepsak, Diane Perryman, Debra A. Petralia, Wendi J. Pierson, Brenda Lee Plessinger, Julie A. Plourde, Marie A. Plum, Bobbi E. Pollak, Anna C. Pomeroy, Melissa Poole, Sandra Porter, Susan E. Powell, Tina Preston, Joanne Price, Cherie S. Price-Palmer, April Prior, Catherine Probst, Annette D. Pruett, Brenda Pryczynski, B. Jeannie Purcell, Julie Purdy (f/k/a Ramson), Christian V Ramos, Elaina Marie Rande, Patricia Ann Rapp, Joyce Ratajczak, Joanne Rathmann, Jacqueline Ratliff, Linda B. Ray, Sheila Reeser, Rhonda Reeves, Linda Reid, Lorna Reinhart, Wendy H. Reisenauer, Debra K. Resimont, Krissy Reynolds, Beverly S. Richardson, Marie Ricksgers, Gail A. Riley, Les Rinehart, Helen Ring, Jenny S. Rink, Briget Rischawy, Steven Rodriquez, Eileen Roff, Gina Rogers, Lynn E. Rogers, Eileen Rollins, Lynda D. Romanek, Jane L. Rose, Cathy J. Rowe, Toiee Angela Rushing, Jeanette Rydell, Bonnie Ryden, Rhea D. Safire, Constance D. Salvia, Judith A. Sanders, Jan E Sandoval, Valerie B. Sawyer, Bonnie Scaia, Mary Teresa Schanz, Jenalyn Scheib, Patricia A. Schmutz, Deborah K. Schneider, Shannon Schroeder, Sherry L. Schwartz, Benjamin Roy Scott, Christy L. Scott, Rosie Scott, Karyn B. Scrivener, Theresa K. Segady, Elizabeth A. Sennett, Debra Seuell, Dawn Shaffer, Jean M. Shang, Joy A Sharpe, Denise D. Shelby, Brenda Shelton, Cathryn Sibert, Debra H. Sills, Susan Silver, Debra Silviano, Cheryl Simmons, Kathleen M. Simons, Robin Reid Wooten Simpson, Lisa Sinkler, David D. Sluder, Teresa D. Smiljanic, Jamie Smith, Janis B. Smith, Lisa Smith, Lori M. Smith, Nicole Elizabeth Smith, Wendolyn Smith, Patricia C. Solari, Amanda Solorza, Leslea Souvigney, Diane Spencer, Jacqueline A. Spires-Purdy, Deborah L. Spittle, Jacqueline St. Georges, Jacqueline St. Georges, Margaret Staffer, Rebecca A. Stanley, Barbara A. Stark, Janet Statzer, Melinda J. Stec, Patricia J. Stefanik, Leida Stewart, Debra G. Still, Linda Studley, Tracie Stutzman, Cheryl Sullivan, Jan P. Surprise, Cynthia Swaim, Mary Swanson, Rachel Sweeney, Martha J. Sweitzer, Jennifer M. Synak, Patricia E. Taylor, Wanda J. Taylor, Theresa R. Thomsen, Margaret Anne Thorpe, Leanne M. Tierney, Samantha Tipton, Michael J. Todd, Debora Tolles, Patricia Townsend, Penny Trammel-MacKenzie, Tanya M. Troutman, Jamie Tullock, Peggy H. Tumlin, Susan E. Turley, Vanessa A. Turner, Ellen D. Tyler, Tangela Tyran, Kelly A. Ustinovich, Brian Varner, Barbara Vaughn, Karen Velasquez, Lucy Viola, Veronica Vitari, Ann Wagner, Deborah Waldman, Mary Lynn Walker, Jodi B. Walsh, Andrea Walton, Derek Ware, Elizabeth Warfield, Melinda Warnecke, Robin L. Watkins, Connie Watson, Deborah Watts, Dorothy A. Weise, Carla Weiss, Susan Westlund, Terri Wheeler, Carolyn White, Nickie White, Myrtis A. Whitely, Julie M. Wickersham, Cheryl Williams, Connee A. Williams, Deborah H. Williams, Kimberly A. Williams, Sandra E. Williams, Tammy L Williams, Marie Willis, Marilyn Wilson, Regina Wilson, Sherry L. Wilson, Susan Wilson, Darcy Wingler, Cathleen Wojtaszek, Dee A. Woodward, Julia Faye Worrell, Julie Wright, Robin L York, Elizabeth A. Zaayer, Denise M. Zafuto, Rebecca L. Zentz, Penny E. Zimmerman, E. Brucette Zirn, Carole Zmuda by Kevin J. Dolley (Dolley, Kevin)
July 1, 2013 Filing 154 NOTICE by Margaret Diane Carter, Teri L Eriksen, Melinda Griffus, Joni Joyner, Keula Francis Kilgore, Brenda Newberg, Deborah K Norton, Wanda L. Olson, Debra A. Petralia, Christian V Ramos, Beverly S. Richardson, Les Rinehart, Jan E Sandoval, Theresa K. Segady, Patricia J. Stefanik, Barbara Vaughn, Mary Lynn Walker, Tammy L Williams, Marilyn Wilson, Susan Wilson, Robin L York (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
June 27, 2013 Filing 153 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing set for 7/3/2013 is stricken and reset to 7/22/2013 at 09:30 AM. on request of parties. Mailed notice (cjg, )
June 25, 2013 Filing 152 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman:Status hearing set for 8/28/2013 is stricken and reset to 7/3/2013 at 09:30 AM. on Court's own motion. Mailed notice (cjg, )
June 25, 2013 Filing 151 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Tanya Acquaire, Wendy Alkire, Lisa Allarde, Dorothy L. Ancona, Darla J. Anderson, Joy L. Anderson, Tisha Anderson, Darlene M. Archie, Linda Armstrong, Ann Marie Armstrong-Deitch, Sherri M. Armuth, Vickie Astudillo, Joy Christine Atwell, Cheryl Ayers, Suzanne M. Bailey, Brenda Bain, Elizabeth Baker, Cindy A. Baker-Spriggs, Janice A. Baldwin, Terri Ballard, Jennifer Ballentine, Holly Banner, Michelle Bardo, Margaret Bardwell, Joy Bargerstock, Shannon Barnes, Alane M Barnes Garvik, Patricia C. Barragan, Katherin Barrow, Deborah Bartelo, Jennette Bastion (Horner), Deborah Bauer, Judith Bean, Cheryl Beauchamp, Deanne L. Becker, Jacqueline Becker, Susan C. Becker, Sheryl J. Bell, JoAnne A. Benson, Roberta Bianchini, Gwendolyn Eartha Lee Bienvenu, Teresa Bischof, Gail Black, Cheryl J. Blake, Kay A. Bone, Carole J. Boom, Angela R. Booth, Laurie M. Boren, Marilyn M. Bower, Robin L. Bowers, Cecilia Bradford, Carol Brake, Stephanie R. Brammer, Linda Brewer, Cheryl Shaw Briggs, Hope Brown, Susan Brown, Amy A. Bruce, Sandra J. Bruce, Leslie Brueckner, Tina Brush, Mary Christine Bryant, Wendy J. Buckheit, Judith A. Buckingham, Ellen K. Buffy, Vicki Bunch, Margaret M. Burchard, Diane Burgbacher, Kathleen C. Burke, Debra L. Burns, Shelly Buschman, Nancy Caldwell, Debbie M. Campbell, Ronda Campbell, Claudia Stella Cantelmi, Elizabeth M. Carithers, Eva L. Carlson, Jo Ellen Carnes, Jolene Cartwright, Kevin P. Cartwright, Linda Carucci, Margaret Cary, Gwen Cashion, Kimberly Ceplenski, Kandace Chancey, Jennifer Chandler, Jeannette M. Chipka, Mary Ciesicki, Joanne Frances Cimo, Rosemary Cinquanti, Barbara Ciulla, Kim Claeys, Teresa Slater Clark, Harriet Sue Clarke, Lou Ann Cleary, Theresa Clubb, Patricia Clunk, Tina Coelho, Kimberly Coleman (f/k/a Lauffer), April E. Colleen, Vicki E. Collier, Ian Connors, Karl E. Constantino, Cindy Conwell, Nancy M Corcoran, Lois D. Cores, Tonna G. Cornett, Theresa Cosentino, Mary Kitra Cox, Arlene Bonnie Crafton, LeAnn M. Cramer, Theresa M Crane, Kimberly Crocker-Hendrickson, Kristen A. Crowe, Tamra Crowley, Tara A. Cummings, Beverly M. Cundiff, Darcie J. Cunningham, M. Susan Cunningham, Susan Lynne Damasco, Connie G. Darling, JoAnn Davey, Robin Davies, Joan M. Davis, Janeen S. DeBoard, Teresa A. DeSchryver, Stephanie DeWitt, Rosemarie Dean, Rita A. Defino, Laura Denio, Pamela J. Denny, Ana Derakshaw, Jennifer L. Dick, Shana Diekhoff, Valerie Dininni, Linda R. Dittmer, Sherma Donnelly, Mark E. Dorn, Denese Dugay, Constance A. Duncan, Sharon Dutton, Holly Dyer, Delois F. Easterling, Jessica Edwards, Lisa Edwards, Jessica Eik, Jennie Eisenstein, Rosemary Elmore, Carli L. Emerson, Catherine M. Estep (f/k/a Foster), Carol Failla, Melissa Fain, Donna Falco, Judy Fallon, Julie M. Farmer, Donna Farrell, Lori A. Favinger, Laurel Jo Feiker, Robin Feltner, Paula Ferguson, Anna Feroe, Kelli Fisher, Mari J. Floyd, Denise Foell, Amy L. Ford, Sheila R. Ford, Jennifer L. Foreman, Theresa D. Fox, Claudia M. Franklin, Kimberly Freda, Susan L. Frederick, Laura Frederiksen, Debra R. Friess, Jessica Fulghum, Lynn Galenza, Deanna Garcia, Lauren Gato, Kristen Votzakis Gauthier, Judith Gay, Cecilia Gaynor, Kristine E. Genrich, Judith Joyce Gerber, Kim Gersie-Scott, Laurie Gianquinto, Diane Gibas, Cynthia C. Gibson, Nikki R. Gilbert, Alice Elaine Gillespie, Karen Gland, Virginia Gomez, Karen Goodrich, Francine Gorskie, Linda Gray, Randi Gray, Nancy M. Greene, Heather Greenslade, Deborah Guffey, Pamela J. Gugliotta, Marcia A. Hahn, Angela E. Hall, Mary Hall, Deloris P. Hamilton, Laura Hammersley, Darlene C. Hanson, Shannon Harbinson, Joanna Hardin, Cynthia M. Harp, Janet E. Harper, Pamela D. Harper, Rosemary Harrison, Tracy L. Harrod, Sarah M. Hatch, Nancy Haupt, Susan Haworth, Fayetta L. Hay, Patsy D. Hayes, Sheryl Hazelrigg, Ronda Hebenstreit, Vicki Heinecke, Lorraine L. Henderson, Janet A. Henkel, Lynsi Henson, Lisa Hering, Diane Hernandez, Marjorie Hess, Sherry D. Hess, Maureen Hicks, Rosalie Hicks, Dawn Hill, Edith M. Hinkle, Lisa M. Hoefgen, Jason Hoffman, Cindy I. Holland, Cynthia S. Holley, Treby C. Hood, Janet Hook, Peggy M. Hopper, Lynn Horn, Connie Horton, Gail Hoskins, Shara Howard, Melissa Howe, Mary Ann Hren, Gail Hudson, Michelle Hughes, Karen Humensky, Carlotta Ingle, Kathleen P. Irwin, Diana Iseminger, Tammy Isham, Donna L. Jackson, Lorraine Jackson, Bonnie M. Jakmauh, Patricia James, Kathleen J. Jandreau, Susan K. Janzen, Dale Johnson (Medina), Catherine R. Johnson-Berger, Roberta L. Jonas, Christy S. Jones, Debra Jane Jones, Julie A. Jones, Shannon Jones, Dawn R. Jordan, Diana Jordan, Marita Patricia Joseph, Naomi I. Joslin, Jodi Kabalin, Cheryl Kahl, Linda M. Kalbac, Mary D. Kane, Joanna Karneeb, Barbara Keenan, Kimberly Keevy, Jenette M. Kelly, Kathryn L. Kelly, Sharon Kendrick, Sharon Kenno, Vicki L. Kenobbie, Mary Kleppin, Cheri Kline, Kathryn E. Lacey, Deborah J. Land, Joanne Lane, Rosemary Wood Langella, Coreen M. Larson, Patricia Lawson, Diana LeVan, Elaine Leach, Janet Lee, Stacy S. Lee, Cathy S. Lefils, Daphne M. Leibowitz, Susan Lell, Carol Lindemon, Judy M. Lindquist, Jacqueline M. Linville, Christine G. Lockwood, Rebecca L. Loew, Lesa Logan, Julene Logue, Amy L. Long, Renee T. Long, Melissa A. Love, Alice Lovingood, Kathy M. Lucas, Judith Lugo, Joy Lutz, Laurie Lynch, Jayden Nicole Lyons, Margaret E. Mackey, Judith A. Mannarini, Denise Marie Byrne, Sarena Marques, Konnie Marquis, Diane Martin, Sherry Martin, Steven Martin, Tammy Martinez, April G. Marx, Suzanne Mascola, Linda Mathias, Angela Matias, DeEnna L. Matthews, Kimberly Mauger, Evelyn R. Maynard, Jewel A. Mazur, Cheryl L. McAnich, Mary McClelland, Michell McComas, Pamela McCord, Beverly McCoy, Angela McDonough, Nina McFarlane, Donna McKenna, Claire McKinnon, Tonya Michelle McKnight, Mary M. McLaughlin, Joy McLemore, Bobbi McMillin, Margo McNeil, Karen McNeilan, Tina Mehler, Denise Melchior, Beverly Merkel, Marsha Merrell, Rae J. Messick, Yvonne Meyerhofer, Karen Milan, Sharron K. Miles, Carey L. Miller, Carol S. Miller, Joanne G. Miller, Kay L. Miller, Lillian L. Miller, Mary Miller, Janet K. Mitchell, Marilyn Mitchell, Tanya Mixon-White, Virginia M. Mize, Kathleen Moelter, Debra Ann Molitaris, Carol Montgomery, Ann Moore, Janet Moore, Kimberly Moore, Patricia A. Morgan, Pamela Morrow, Linda F. Morton, Michael Mosteller II, Juliene A. Munoz, Katherine Murphy, Jennifer Murrell, Angela W. Myers, Ann W. Myers, Rebecca J. Nagy, Penelope C. Neal, Ruth Lynn Neely, Janet M. Newsome, Veronica Nicholas, Carol A. Nigsarian, Tacara Norwood, Mary Anne Novello, Theresa Ann O'Connor, Maureen O'Kelly, Emily Oates, Karla Ockerby, Wendi Ortiz, Brenda L. Osborne, Paige D. Owens (Hundley), Charlene Palmer, Debra H. Parent, Christina Anne Parman, Kelly Parsons, Betty M. Patton, Julianne Patton, Christie Patzer, Leona R. Payne, Teresa Pemerton, Dawn Pence, Deborah Pepsak, Diane Perryman, Wendi J. Pierson, Brenda Lee Plessinger, Julie A. Plourde, Marie A. Plum, Bobbi E. Pollak, Anna C. Pomeroy, Melissa Poole, Sandra Porter, Susan E. Powell, Tina Preston, Joanne Price, Cherie S. Price-Palmer, April Prior, Catherine Probst, Annette D. Pruett, Brenda Pryczynski, B. Jeannie Purcell, Julie Purdy (f/k/a Ramson), Elaina Marie Rande, Patricia Ann Rapp, Joyce Ratajczak, Joanne Rathmann, Jacqueline Ratliff, Linda B. Ray, Sheila Reeser, Rhonda Reeves, Linda Reid, Lorna Reinhart, Wendy H. Reisenauer, Debra K. Resimont, Krissy Reynolds, Marie Ricksgers, Gail A. Riley, Helen Ring, Jenny S. Rink, Briget Rischawy, Steven Rodriquez, Eileen Roff, Gina Rogers, Lynn E. Rogers, Eileen Rollins, Lynda D. Romanek, Jane L. Rose, Cathy J. Rowe, Toiee Angela Rushing, Jeanette Rydell, Bonnie Ryden, Rhea D. Safire, Constance D. Salvia, Judith A. Sanders, Valerie B. Sawyer, Bonnie Scaia, Mary Teresa Schanz, Jenalyn Scheib, Patricia A. Schmutz, Deborah K. Schneider, Shannon Schroeder, Sherry L. Schwartz, Benjamin Roy Scott, Christy L. Scott, Rosie Scott, Karyn B. Scrivener, Elizabeth A. Sennett, Debra Seuell, Dawn Shaffer, Jean M. Shang, Joy A Sharpe, Denise D. Shelby, Brenda Shelton, Cathryn Sibert, Debra H. Sills, Susan Silver, Debra Silviano, Cheryl Simmons, Kathleen M. Simons, Robin Reid Wooten Simpson, Lisa Sinkler, David D. Sluder, Teresa D. Smiljanic, Jamie Smith, Janis B. Smith, Lisa Smith, Lori M. Smith, Nicole Elizabeth Smith, Wendolyn Smith, Patricia C. Solari, Amanda Solorza, Leslea Souvigney, Diane Spencer, Jacqueline A. Spires-Purdy, Deborah L. Spittle, Jacqueline St. Georges, Jacqueline St. Georges, Margaret Staffer, Rebecca A. Stanley, Barbara A. Stark, Janet Statzer, Melinda J. Stec, Leida Stewart, Debra G. Still, Linda Studley, Tracie Stutzman, Cheryl Sullivan, Jan P. Surprise, Cynthia Swaim, Mary Swanson, Rachel Sweeney, Martha J. Sweitzer, Jennifer M. Synak, Patricia E. Taylor, Wanda J. Taylor, Theresa R. Thomsen, Margaret Anne Thorpe, Leanne M. Tierney, Samantha Tipton, Michael J. Todd, Debora Tolles, Patricia Townsend, Penny Trammel-MacKenzie, Tanya M. Troutman, Jamie Tullock, Peggy H. Tumlin, Susan E. Turley, Vanessa A. Turner, Ellen D. Tyler, Tangela Tyran, Kelly A. Ustinovich, Brian Varner, Karen Velasquez, Lucy Viola, Veronica Vitari, Ann Wagner, Deborah Waldman, Jodi B. Walsh, Andrea Walton, Derek Ware, Elizabeth Warfield, Melinda Warnecke, Robin L. Watkins, Connie Watson, Deborah Watts, Dorothy A. Weise, Carla Weiss, Susan Westlund, Terri Wheeler, Carolyn White, Nickie White, Myrtis A. Whitely, Julie M. Wickersham, Cheryl Williams, Connee A. Williams, Deborah H. Williams, Kimberly A. Williams, Sandra E. Williams, Marie Willis, Regina Wilson, Sherry L. Wilson, Darcy Wingler, Cathleen Wojtaszek, Dee A. Woodward, Julia Faye Worrell, Julie Wright, Elizabeth A. Zaayer, Denise M. Zafuto, Rebecca L. Zentz, Penny E. Zimmerman, E. Brucette Zirn, Carole Zmuda by Kevin J. Dolley (Dolley, Kevin)
June 25, 2013 Filing 150 NOTICE by Lisa Allarde, Tisha Anderson, Margaret Bardwell, Cecilia Bradford, Tina Brush, Janeen S. DeBoard, Valerie Dininni, Mark E. Dorn, Holly Dyer, Susan L. Frederick, Jessica Fulghum, Pamela D. Harper, Vicki Heinecke, Lorraine L. Henderson, Janet A. Henkel, Rosalie Hicks, Christy S. Jones, Diana Jordan, Barbara Keenan, Sharon Kendrick, Angela Matias, Kimberly Mauger, Joanne G. Miller, Tanya Mixon-White, Virginia M. Mize, Michael Mosteller II, Maureen O'Kelly, Patricia Ann Rapp, Joyce Ratajczak, Marie Ricksgers, Toiee Angela Rushing, Elizabeth A. Sennett, Cheryl Simmons, Linda Studley, Cynthia Swaim, Robin L. Watkins, Dorothy A. Weise, Cheryl Williams, E. Brucette Zirn (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
June 25, 2013 Filing 149 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing set for 8/28/2013 is stricken and reset to 7/3/2013 at 09:30 AM. on Court's own motion. Mailed notice (cjg, )
June 21, 2013 Filing 148 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Tanya Acquaire, Wendy Alkire, Dorothy L. Ancona, Darla J. Anderson, Joy L. Anderson, Darlene M. Archie, Linda Armstrong, Ann Marie Armstrong-Deitch, Sherri M. Armuth, Vickie Astudillo, Joy Christine Atwell, Cheryl Ayers, Suzanne M. Bailey, Brenda Bain, Elizabeth Baker, Cindy A. Baker-Spriggs, Janice A. Baldwin, Terri Ballard, Jennifer Ballentine, Holly Banner, Michelle Bardo, Joy Bargerstock, Shannon Barnes, Alane M Barnes Garvik, Patricia C. Barragan, Katherin Barrow, Deborah Bartelo, Jennette Bastion (Horner), Deborah Bauer, Judith Bean, Cheryl Beauchamp, Deanne L. Becker, Jacqueline Becker, Susan C. Becker, Sheryl J. Bell, JoAnne A. Benson, Roberta Bianchini, Gwendolyn Eartha Lee Bienvenu, Teresa Bischof, Gail Black, Cheryl J. Blake, Kay A. Bone, Carole J. Boom, Angela R. Booth, Laurie M. Boren, Marilyn M. Bower, Robin L. Bowers, Carol Brake, Stephanie R. Brammer, Linda Brewer, Cheryl Shaw Briggs, Hope Brown, Susan Brown, Amy A. Bruce, Sandra J. Bruce, Leslie Brueckner, Mary Christine Bryant, Wendy J. Buckheit, Judith A. Buckingham, Ellen K. Buffy, Vicki Bunch, Margaret M. Burchard, Diane Burgbacher, Kathleen C. Burke, Debra L. Burns, Shelly Buschman, Nancy Caldwell, Debbie M. Campbell, Ronda Campbell, Claudia Stella Cantelmi, Elizabeth M. Carithers, Eva L. Carlson, Jo Ellen Carnes, Jolene Cartwright, Kevin P. Cartwright, Linda Carucci, Margaret Cary, Gwen Cashion, Kimberly Ceplenski, Kandace Chancey, Jennifer Chandler, Jeannette M. Chipka, Mary Ciesicki, Joanne Frances Cimo, Rosemary Cinquanti, Barbara Ciulla, Kim Claeys, Teresa Slater Clark, Harriet Sue Clarke, Lou Ann Cleary, Theresa Clubb, Patricia Clunk, Tina Coelho, Kimberly Coleman (f/k/a Lauffer), April E. Colleen, Vicki E. Collier, Ian Connors, Karl E. Constantino, Cindy Conwell, Nancy M Corcoran, Lois D. Cores, Tonna G. Cornett, Theresa Cosentino, Mary Kitra Cox, Arlene Bonnie Crafton, LeAnn M. Cramer, Theresa M Crane, Kimberly Crocker-Hendrickson, Kristen A. Crowe, Tamra Crowley, Tara A. Cummings, Beverly M. Cundiff, Darcie J. Cunningham, M. Susan Cunningham, Susan Lynne Damasco, Connie G. Darling, JoAnn Davey, Robin Davies, Joan M. Davis, Teresa A. DeSchryver, Stephanie DeWitt, Rosemarie Dean, Rita A. Defino, Laura Denio, Pamela J. Denny, Ana Derakshaw, Jennifer L. Dick, Shana Diekhoff, Linda R. Dittmer, Sherma Donnelly, Denese Dugay, Constance A. Duncan, Sharon Dutton, Delois F. Easterling, Jessica Edwards, Lisa Edwards, Jessica Eik, Jennie Eisenstein, Rosemary Elmore, Carli L. Emerson, Catherine M. Estep (f/k/a Foster), Carol Failla, Melissa Fain, Donna Falco, Judy Fallon, Julie M. Farmer, Donna Farrell, Lori A. Favinger, Laurel Jo Feiker, Robin Feltner, Paula Ferguson, Anna Feroe, Kelli Fisher, Mari J. Floyd, Denise Foell, Amy L. Ford, Sheila R. Ford, Jennifer L. Foreman, Theresa D. Fox, Claudia M. Franklin, Kimberly Freda, Laura Frederiksen, Debra R. Friess, Lynn Galenza, Deanna Garcia, Lauren Gato, Kristen Votzakis Gauthier, Judith Gay, Cecilia Gaynor, Kristine E. Genrich, Judith Joyce Gerber, Kim Gersie-Scott, Laurie Gianquinto, Diane Gibas, Cynthia C. Gibson, Nikki R. Gilbert, Alice Elaine Gillespie, Karen Gland, Virginia Gomez, Karen Goodrich, Francine Gorskie, Linda Gray, Randi Gray, Nancy M. Greene, Heather Greenslade, Deborah Guffey, Pamela J. Gugliotta, Marcia A. Hahn, Angela E. Hall, Mary Hall, Deloris P. Hamilton, Laura Hammersley, Darlene C. Hanson, Shannon Harbinson, Joanna Hardin, Cynthia M. Harp, Janet E. Harper, Rosemary Harrison, Tracy L. Harrod, Sarah M. Hatch, Nancy Haupt, Susan Haworth, Fayetta L. Hay, Patsy D. Hayes, Sheryl Hazelrigg, Ronda Hebenstreit, Lynsi Henson, Lisa Hering, Diane Hernandez, Marjorie Hess, Sherry D. Hess, Maureen Hicks, Dawn Hill, Edith M. Hinkle, Lisa M. Hoefgen, Jason Hoffman, Cindy I. Holland, Cynthia S. Holley, Treby C. Hood, Janet Hook, Peggy M. Hopper, Lynn Horn, Connie Horton, Gail Hoskins, Shara Howard, Melissa Howe, Mary Ann Hren, Gail Hudson, Michelle Hughes, Karen Humensky, Carlotta Ingle, Kathleen P. Irwin, Diana Iseminger, Tammy Isham, Donna L. Jackson, Lorraine Jackson, Bonnie M. Jakmauh, Patricia James, Kathleen J. Jandreau, Susan K. Janzen, Dale Johnson (Medina), Catherine R. Johnson-Berger, Roberta L. Jonas, Debra Jane Jones, Julie A. Jones, Shannon Jones, Dawn R. Jordan, Marita Patricia Joseph, Naomi I. Joslin, Jodi Kabalin, Cheryl Kahl, Linda M. Kalbac, Mary D. Kane, Joanna Karneeb, Kimberly Keevy, Jenette M. Kelly, Kathryn L. Kelly, Sharon Kenno, Vicki L. Kenobbie, Mary Kleppin, Cheri Kline, Kathryn E. Lacey, Deborah J. Land, Joanne Lane, Rosemary Wood Langella, Coreen M. Larson, Patricia Lawson, Diana LeVan, Elaine Leach, Janet Lee, Stacy S. Lee, Cathy S. Lefils, Daphne M. Leibowitz, Susan Lell, Carol Lindemon, Judy M. Lindquist, Jacqueline M. Linville, Christine G. Lockwood, Rebecca L. Loew, Lesa Logan, Julene Logue, Amy L. Long, Renee T. Long, Melissa A. Love, Alice Lovingood, Kathy M. Lucas, Judith Lugo, Joy Lutz, Laurie Lynch, Jayden Nicole Lyons, Margaret E. Mackey, Judith A. Mannarini, Denise Marie Byrne, Sarena Marques, Konnie Marquis, Diane Martin, Sherry Martin, Steven Martin, Tammy Martinez, April G. Marx, Suzanne Mascola, Linda Mathias, DeEnna L. Matthews, Evelyn R. Maynard, Jewel A. Mazur, Cheryl L. McAnich, Mary McClelland, Michell McComas, Pamela McCord, Beverly McCoy, Angela McDonough, Nina McFarlane, Donna McKenna, Claire McKinnon, Tonya Michelle McKnight, Mary M. McLaughlin, Joy McLemore, Bobbi McMillin, Margo McNeil, Karen McNeilan, Tina Mehler, Denise Melchior, Beverly Merkel, Marsha Merrell, Rae J. Messick, Yvonne Meyerhofer, Karen Milan, Sharron K. Miles, Carey L. Miller, Carol S. Miller, Kay L. Miller, Lillian L. Miller, Mary Miller, Janet K. Mitchell, Marilyn Mitchell, Kathleen Moelter, Debra Ann Molitaris, Carol Montgomery, Ann Moore, Janet Moore, Kimberly Moore, Patricia A. Morgan, Pamela Morrow, Linda F. Morton, Juliene A. Munoz, Katherine Murphy, Jennifer Murrell, Angela W. Myers, Ann W. Myers, Rebecca J. Nagy, Penelope C. Neal, Ruth Lynn Neely, Janet M. Newsome, Veronica Nicholas, Carol A. Nigsarian, Tacara Norwood, Mary Anne Novello, Theresa Ann O'Connor, Emily Oates, Karla Ockerby, Wendi Ortiz, Brenda L. Osborne, Paige D. Owens (Hundley), Charlene Palmer, Debra H. Parent, Christina Anne Parman, Kelly Parsons, Betty M. Patton, Julianne Patton, Christie Patzer, Leona R. Payne, Teresa Pemerton, Dawn Pence, Deborah Pepsak, Diane Perryman, Wendi J. Pierson, Brenda Lee Plessinger, Julie A. Plourde, Marie A. Plum, Bobbi E. Pollak, Anna C. Pomeroy, Melissa Poole, Sandra Porter, Susan E. Powell, Tina Preston, Joanne Price, Cherie S. Price-Palmer, April Prior, Catherine Probst, Annette D. Pruett, Brenda Pryczynski, B. Jeannie Purcell, Julie Purdy (f/k/a Ramson), Elaina Marie Rande, Joanne Rathmann, Jacqueline Ratliff, Linda B. Ray, Sheila Reeser, Rhonda Reeves, Linda Reid, Lorna Reinhart, Wendy H. Reisenauer, Debra K. Resimont, Krissy Reynolds, Gail A. Riley, Helen Ring, Jenny S. Rink, Briget Rischawy, Steven Rodriquez, Eileen Roff, Gina Rogers, Lynn E. Rogers, Eileen Rollins, Lynda D. Romanek, Jane L. Rose, Cathy J. Rowe, Jeanette Rydell, Bonnie Ryden, Rhea D. Safire, Constance D. Salvia, Judith A. Sanders, Valerie B. Sawyer, Bonnie Scaia, Mary Teresa Schanz, Jenalyn Scheib, Patricia A. Schmutz, Deborah K. Schneider, Shannon Schroeder, Sherry L. Schwartz, Benjamin Roy Scott, Christy L. Scott, Rosie Scott, Karyn B. Scrivener, Debra Seuell, Dawn Shaffer, Jean M. Shang, Joy A Sharpe, Denise D. Shelby, Brenda Shelton, Cathryn Sibert, Debra H. Sills, Susan Silver, Debra Silviano, Kathleen M. Simons, Robin Reid Wooten Simpson, Lisa Sinkler, David D. Sluder, Teresa D. Smiljanic, Jamie Smith, Janis B. Smith, Lisa Smith, Lori M. Smith, Nicole Elizabeth Smith, Wendolyn Smith, Patricia C. Solari, Amanda Solorza, Leslea Souvigney, Diane Spencer, Jacqueline A. Spires-Purdy, Deborah L. Spittle, Jacqueline St. Georges, Jacqueline St. Georges, Margaret Staffer, Rebecca A. Stanley, Barbara A. Stark, Janet Statzer, Melinda J. Stec, Leida Stewart, Debra G. Still, Tracie Stutzman, Cheryl Sullivan, Jan P. Surprise, Mary Swanson, Rachel Sweeney, Martha J. Sweitzer, Jennifer M. Synak, Patricia E. Taylor, Wanda J. Taylor, Theresa R. Thomsen, Margaret Anne Thorpe, Leanne M. Tierney, Samantha Tipton, Michael J. Todd, Debora Tolles, Patricia Townsend, Penny Trammel-MacKenzie, Tanya M. Troutman, Jamie Tullock, Peggy H. Tumlin, Susan E. Turley, Vanessa A. Turner, Ellen D. Tyler, Tangela Tyran, Kelly A. Ustinovich, Brian Varner, Karen Velasquez, Lucy Viola, Veronica Vitari, Ann Wagner, Deborah Waldman, Jodi B. Walsh, Andrea Walton, Derek Ware, Elizabeth Warfield, Melinda Warnecke, Connie Watson, Deborah Watts, Carla Weiss, Susan Westlund, Terri Wheeler, Carolyn White, Nickie White, Myrtis A. Whitely, Julie M. Wickersham, Connee A. Williams, Deborah H. Williams, Kimberly A. Williams, Sandra E. Williams, Marie Willis, Regina Wilson, Sherry L. Wilson, Darcy Wingler, Cathleen Wojtaszek, Dee A. Woodward, Julia Faye Worrell, Julie Wright, Elizabeth A. Zaayer, Denise M. Zafuto, Rebecca L. Zentz, Penny E. Zimmerman, Carole Zmuda by Kevin J. Dolley (Dolley, Kevin)
June 21, 2013 Filing 147 NOTICE by Holly Banner, Deborah Bartelo, Cindy Conwell, Beverly M. Cundiff, Denese Dugay, Delois F. Easterling, Carli L. Emerson, Francine Gorskie, Marcia A. Hahn, Gail Hoskins, Bonnie M. Jakmauh, Kimberly Keevy, Tammy Martinez, Karen McNeilan, Sharron K. Miles, Julie Purdy (f/k/a Ramson), Rhonda Reeves, Cathy J. Rowe, Robin Reid Wooten Simpson, Wanda J. Taylor, Derek Ware (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
June 20, 2013 Filing 146 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing set for 7/12/2013 is stricken and reset to 8/28/2013 at 09:30 AM. on request of parties. Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-8389787. (Vlasek, Jeffrey) #120 is granted. Mailed notice (cjg, )
June 14, 2013 Filing 145 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Tanya Acquaire, Wendy Alkire, Dorothy L. Ancona, Darla J. Anderson, Joy L. Anderson, Darlene M. Archie, Linda Armstrong, Ann Marie Armstrong-Deitch, Sherri M. Armuth, Vickie Astudillo, Joy Christine Atwell, Cheryl Ayers, Suzanne M. Bailey, Brenda Bain, Elizabeth Baker, Cindy A. Baker-Spriggs, Janice A. Baldwin, Terri Ballard, Jennifer Ballentine, Michelle Bardo, Joy Bargerstock, Shannon Barnes, Alane M Barnes Garvik, Patricia C. Barragan, Katherin Barrow, Jennette Bastion (Horner), Deborah Bauer, Judith Bean, Cheryl Beauchamp, Deanne L. Becker, Jacqueline Becker, Susan C. Becker, Sheryl J. Bell, JoAnne A. Benson, Roberta Bianchini, Gwendolyn Eartha Lee Bienvenu, Teresa Bischof, Gail Black, Cheryl J. Blake, Kay A. Bone, Carole J. Boom, Angela R. Booth, Laurie M. Boren, Marilyn M. Bower, Robin L. Bowers, Carol Brake, Stephanie R. Brammer, Linda Brewer, Cheryl Shaw Briggs, Hope Brown, Susan Brown, Amy A. Bruce, Sandra J. Bruce, Leslie Brueckner, Mary Christine Bryant, Wendy J. Buckheit, Judith A. Buckingham, Ellen K. Buffy, Vicki Bunch, Margaret M. Burchard, Diane Burgbacher, Kathleen C. Burke, Debra L. Burns, Shelly Buschman, Nancy Caldwell, Debbie M. Campbell, Ronda Campbell, Claudia Stella Cantelmi, Elizabeth M. Carithers, Eva L. Carlson, Jo Ellen Carnes, Jolene Cartwright, Kevin P. Cartwright, Linda Carucci, Margaret Cary, Gwen Cashion, Kimberly Ceplenski, Kandace Chancey, Jennifer Chandler, Jeannette M. Chipka, Mary Ciesicki, Joanne Frances Cimo, Rosemary Cinquanti, Barbara Ciulla, Kim Claeys, Teresa Slater Clark, Harriet Sue Clarke, Lou Ann Cleary, Theresa Clubb, Patricia Clunk, Tina Coelho, Kimberly Coleman (f/k/a Lauffer), April E. Colleen, Vicki E. Collier, Ian Connors, Karl E. Constantino, Nancy M Corcoran, Lois D. Cores, Tonna G. Cornett, Theresa Cosentino, Mary Kitra Cox, Arlene Bonnie Crafton, LeAnn M. Cramer, Theresa M Crane, Kimberly Crocker-Hendrickson, Kristen A. Crowe, Tamra Crowley, Tara A. Cummings, Darcie J. Cunningham, M. Susan Cunningham, Susan Lynne Damasco, Connie G. Darling, JoAnn Davey, Robin Davies, Joan M. Davis, Teresa A. DeSchryver, Stephanie DeWitt, Rosemarie Dean, Rita A. Defino, Laura Denio, Pamela J. Denny, Ana Derakshaw, Jennifer L. Dick, Shana Diekhoff, Linda R. Dittmer, Sherma Donnelly, Constance A. Duncan, Sharon Dutton, Jessica Edwards, Lisa Edwards, Jessica Eik, Jennie Eisenstein, Rosemary Elmore, Catherine M. Estep (f/k/a Foster), Carol Failla, Melissa Fain, Donna Falco, Judy Fallon, Julie M. Farmer, Donna Farrell, Lori A. Favinger, Laurel Jo Feiker, Robin Feltner, Paula Ferguson, Anna Feroe, Kelli Fisher, Mari J. Floyd, Denise Foell, Amy L. Ford, Sheila R. Ford, Jennifer L. Foreman, Theresa D. Fox, Claudia M. Franklin, Kimberly Freda, Laura Frederiksen, Debra R. Friess, Lynn Galenza, Deanna Garcia, Lauren Gato, Kristen Votzakis Gauthier, Judith Gay, Cecilia Gaynor, Kristine E. Genrich, Judith Joyce Gerber, Kim Gersie-Scott, Laurie Gianquinto, Diane Gibas, Cynthia C. Gibson, Nikki R. Gilbert, Alice Elaine Gillespie, Karen Gland, Virginia Gomez, Karen Goodrich, Linda Gray, Randi Gray, Nancy M. Greene, Heather Greenslade, Deborah Guffey, Pamela J. Gugliotta, Angela E. Hall, Mary Hall, Deloris P. Hamilton, Laura Hammersley, Darlene C. Hanson, Shannon Harbinson, Joanna Hardin, Cynthia M. Harp, Janet E. Harper, Rosemary Harrison, Tracy L. Harrod, Sarah M. Hatch, Nancy Haupt, Susan Haworth, Fayetta L. Hay, Patsy D. Hayes, Sheryl Hazelrigg, Ronda Hebenstreit, Lynsi Henson, Lisa Hering, Diane Hernandez, Marjorie Hess, Sherry D. Hess, Maureen Hicks, Dawn Hill, Edith M. Hinkle, Lisa M. Hoefgen, Jason Hoffman, Cindy I. Holland, Cynthia S. Holley, Treby C. Hood, Janet Hook, Peggy M. Hopper, Lynn Horn, Connie Horton, Shara Howard, Melissa Howe, Mary Ann Hren, Gail Hudson, Michelle Hughes, Karen Humensky, Carlotta Ingle, Kathleen P. Irwin, Diana Iseminger, Tammy Isham, Donna L. Jackson, Lorraine Jackson, Patricia James, Kathleen J. Jandreau, Susan K. Janzen, Dale Johnson (Medina), Catherine R. Johnson-Berger, Roberta L. Jonas, Debra Jane Jones, Julie A. Jones, Shannon Jones, Dawn R. Jordan, Marita Patricia Joseph, Naomi I. Joslin, Jodi Kabalin, Cheryl Kahl, Linda M. Kalbac, Mary D. Kane, Joanna Karneeb, Jenette M. Kelly, Kathryn L. Kelly, Sharon Kenno, Vicki L. Kenobbie, Mary Kleppin, Cheri Kline, Kathryn E. Lacey, Deborah J. Land, Joanne Lane, Rosemary Wood Langella, Coreen M. Larson, Patricia Lawson, Diana LeVan, Elaine Leach, Janet Lee, Stacy S. Lee, Cathy S. Lefils, Daphne M. Leibowitz, Susan Lell, Carol Lindemon, Judy M. Lindquist, Jacqueline M. Linville, Christine G. Lockwood, Rebecca L. Loew, Lesa Logan, Julene Logue, Amy L. Long, Renee T. Long, Melissa A. Love, Alice Lovingood, Kathy M. Lucas, Judith Lugo, Joy Lutz, Laurie Lynch, Jayden Nicole Lyons, Margaret E. Mackey, Judith A. Mannarini, Denise Marie Byrne, Sarena Marques, Konnie Marquis, Diane Martin, Sherry Martin, Steven Martin, April G. Marx, Suzanne Mascola, Linda Mathias, DeEnna L. Matthews, Evelyn R. Maynard, Jewel A. Mazur, Cheryl L. McAnich, Mary McClelland, Michell McComas, Pamela McCord, Beverly McCoy, Angela McDonough, Nina McFarlane, Donna McKenna, Claire McKinnon, Tonya Michelle McKnight, Mary M. McLaughlin, Joy McLemore, Bobbi McMillin, Margo McNeil, Tina Mehler, Denise Melchior, Beverly Merkel, Marsha Merrell, Rae J. Messick, Yvonne Meyerhofer, Karen Milan, Carey L. Miller, Carol S. Miller, Kay L. Miller, Lillian L. Miller, Mary Miller, Janet K. Mitchell, Marilyn Mitchell, Kathleen Moelter, Debra Ann Molitaris, Carol Montgomery, Ann Moore, Janet Moore, Kimberly Moore, Patricia A. Morgan, Pamela Morrow, Linda F. Morton, Juliene A. Munoz, Katherine Murphy, Jennifer Murrell, Angela W. Myers, Ann W. Myers, Rebecca J. Nagy, Penelope C. Neal, Ruth Lynn Neely, Janet M. Newsome, Veronica Nicholas, Carol A. Nigsarian, Tacara Norwood, Mary Anne Novello, Theresa Ann O'Connor, Emily Oates, Karla Ockerby, Wendi Ortiz, Brenda L. Osborne, Paige D. Owens (Hundley), Charlene Palmer, Debra H. Parent, Christina Anne Parman, Kelly Parsons, Betty M. Patton, Julianne Patton, Christie Patzer, Leona R. Payne, Teresa Pemerton, Dawn Pence, Deborah Pepsak, Diane Perryman, Wendi J. Pierson, Brenda Lee Plessinger, Julie A. Plourde, Marie A. Plum, Bobbi E. Pollak, Anna C. Pomeroy, Melissa Poole, Sandra Porter, Susan E. Powell, Tina Preston, Joanne Price, Cherie S. Price-Palmer, April Prior, Catherine Probst, Annette D. Pruett, Brenda Pryczynski, B. Jeannie Purcell, Elaina Marie Rande, Joanne Rathmann, Jacqueline Ratliff, Linda B. Ray, Sheila Reeser, Linda Reid, Lorna Reinhart, Wendy H. Reisenauer, Debra K. Resimont, Krissy Reynolds, Gail A. Riley, Helen Ring, Jenny S. Rink, Briget Rischawy, Steven Rodriquez, Eileen Roff, Gina Rogers, Lynn E. Rogers, Eileen Rollins, Lynda D. Romanek, Jane L. Rose, Jeanette Rydell, Bonnie Ryden, Rhea D. Safire, Constance D. Salvia, Judith A. Sanders, Valerie B. Sawyer, Bonnie Scaia, Mary Teresa Schanz, Jenalyn Scheib, Patricia A. Schmutz, Deborah K. Schneider, Shannon Schroeder, Sherry L. Schwartz, Benjamin Roy Scott, Christy L. Scott, Rosie Scott, Karyn B. Scrivener, Debra Seuell, Dawn Shaffer, Jean M. Shang, Joy A Sharpe, Denise D. Shelby, Brenda Shelton, Cathryn Sibert, Debra H. Sills, Susan Silver, Debra Silviano, Kathleen M. Simons, Lisa Sinkler, David D. Sluder, Teresa D. Smiljanic, Jamie Smith, Janis B. Smith, Lisa Smith, Lori M. Smith, Nicole Elizabeth Smith, Wendolyn Smith, Patricia C. Solari, Amanda Solorza, Leslea Souvigney, Diane Spencer, Jacqueline A. Spires-Purdy, Deborah L. Spittle, Jacqueline St. Georges, Jacqueline St. Georges, Margaret Staffer, Rebecca A. Stanley, Barbara A. Stark, Janet Statzer, Melinda J. Stec, Leida Stewart, Debra G. Still, Tracie Stutzman, Cheryl Sullivan, Jan P. Surprise, Mary Swanson, Rachel Sweeney, Martha J. Sweitzer, Jennifer M. Synak, Patricia E. Taylor, Theresa R. Thomsen, Margaret Anne Thorpe, Leanne M. Tierney, Samantha Tipton, Michael J. Todd, Debora Tolles, Patricia Townsend, Penny Trammel-MacKenzie, Tanya M. Troutman, Jamie Tullock, Peggy H. Tumlin, Susan E. Turley, Vanessa A. Turner, Ellen D. Tyler, Tangela Tyran, Kelly A. Ustinovich, Brian Varner, Karen Velasquez, Lucy Viola, Veronica Vitari, Ann Wagner, Deborah Waldman, Jodi B. Walsh, Andrea Walton, Elizabeth Warfield, Melinda Warnecke, Connie Watson, Deborah Watts, Carla Weiss, Susan Westlund, Terri Wheeler, Carolyn White, Nickie White, Myrtis A. Whitely, Julie M. Wickersham, Connee A. Williams, Deborah H. Williams, Kimberly A. Williams, Sandra E. Williams, Marie Willis, Regina Wilson, Sherry L. Wilson, Darcy Wingler, Cathleen Wojtaszek, Dee A. Woodward, Julia Faye Worrell, Julie Wright, Elizabeth A. Zaayer, Denise M. Zafuto, Rebecca L. Zentz, Penny E. Zimmerman, Carole Zmuda by Kevin J. Dolley (Dolley, Kevin)
June 14, 2013 Filing 144 NOTICE by Kristen Votzakis Gauthier, Heather Greenslade, Deloris P. Hamilton, Katherine Murphy, Mary Teresa Schanz (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
June 13, 2013 Filing 143 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Tanya Acquaire, Wendy Alkire, Dorothy L. Ancona, Darla J. Anderson, Joy L. Anderson, Darlene M. Archie, Linda Armstrong, Ann Marie Armstrong-Deitch, Sherri M. Armuth, Vickie Astudillo, Joy Christine Atwell, Cheryl Ayers, Suzanne M. Bailey, Brenda Bain, Elizabeth Baker, Cindy A. Baker-Spriggs, Janice A. Baldwin, Terri Ballard, Jennifer Ballentine, Michelle Bardo, Joy Bargerstock, Shannon Barnes, Alane M Barnes Garvik, Patricia C. Barragan, Katherin Barrow, Jennette Bastion (Horner), Deborah Bauer, Judith Bean, Cheryl Beauchamp, Deanne L. Becker, Jacqueline Becker, Susan C. Becker, Sheryl J. Bell, JoAnne A. Benson, Roberta Bianchini, Gwendolyn Eartha Lee Bienvenu, Teresa Bischof, Gail Black, Cheryl J. Blake, Kay A. Bone, Carole J. Boom, Angela R. Booth, Laurie M. Boren, Marilyn M. Bower, Robin L. Bowers, Carol Brake, Stephanie R. Brammer, Linda Brewer, Cheryl Shaw Briggs, Hope Brown, Susan Brown, Amy A. Bruce, Sandra J. Bruce, Leslie Brueckner, Mary Christine Bryant, Wendy J. Buckheit, Judith A. Buckingham, Ellen K. Buffy, Vicki Bunch, Margaret M. Burchard, Diane Burgbacher, Kathleen C. Burke, Debra L. Burns, Shelly Buschman, Nancy Caldwell, Debbie M. Campbell, Ronda Campbell, Claudia Stella Cantelmi, Elizabeth M. Carithers, Eva L. Carlson, Jo Ellen Carnes, Jolene Cartwright, Kevin P. Cartwright, Linda Carucci, Margaret Cary, Gwen Cashion, Kimberly Ceplenski, Kandace Chancey, Jennifer Chandler, Jeannette M. Chipka, Mary Ciesicki, Joanne Frances Cimo, Rosemary Cinquanti, Barbara Ciulla, Kim Claeys, Teresa Slater Clark, Harriet Sue Clarke, Lou Ann Cleary, Theresa Clubb, Patricia Clunk, Tina Coelho, Kimberly Coleman (f/k/a Lauffer), April E. Colleen, Vicki E. Collier, Ian Connors, Karl E. Constantino, Nancy M Corcoran, Lois D. Cores, Tonna G. Cornett, Theresa Cosentino, Mary Kitra Cox, Arlene Bonnie Crafton, LeAnn M. Cramer, Theresa M Crane, Kimberly Crocker-Hendrickson, Kristen A. Crowe, Tamra Crowley, Tara A. Cummings, Darcie J. Cunningham, M. Susan Cunningham, Susan Lynne Damasco, Connie G. Darling, JoAnn Davey, Robin Davies, Joan M. Davis, Teresa A. DeSchryver, Stephanie DeWitt, Rosemarie Dean, Rita A. Defino, Laura Denio, Pamela J. Denny, Ana Derakshaw, Jennifer L. Dick, Shana Diekhoff, Linda R. Dittmer, Sherma Donnelly, Constance A. Duncan, Sharon Dutton, Jessica Edwards, Lisa Edwards, Jessica Eik, Jennie Eisenstein, Rosemary Elmore, Catherine M. Estep (f/k/a Foster), Carol Failla, Melissa Fain, Donna Falco, Judy Fallon, Julie M. Farmer, Donna Farrell, Lori A. Favinger, Laurel Jo Feiker, Robin Feltner, Paula Ferguson, Anna Feroe, Kelli Fisher, Mari J. Floyd, Denise Foell, Amy L. Ford, Sheila R. Ford, Jennifer L. Foreman, Theresa D. Fox, Claudia M. Franklin, Kimberly Freda, Laura Frederiksen, Debra R. Friess, Lynn Galenza, Deanna Garcia, Lauren Gato, Judith Gay, Cecilia Gaynor, Kristine E. Genrich, Judith Joyce Gerber, Kim Gersie-Scott, Laurie Gianquinto, Diane Gibas, Cynthia C. Gibson, Nikki R. Gilbert, Alice Elaine Gillespie, Karen Gland, Virginia Gomez, Karen Goodrich, Linda Gray, Randi Gray, Nancy M. Greene, Deborah Guffey, Pamela J. Gugliotta, Angela E. Hall, Mary Hall, Laura Hammersley, Darlene C. Hanson, Shannon Harbinson, Joanna Hardin, Cynthia M. Harp, Janet E. Harper, Rosemary Harrison, Tracy L. Harrod, Sarah M. Hatch, Nancy Haupt, Susan Haworth, Fayetta L. Hay, Patsy D. Hayes, Sheryl Hazelrigg, Ronda Hebenstreit, Lynsi Henson, Lisa Hering, Diane Hernandez, Marjorie Hess, Sherry D. Hess, Maureen Hicks, Dawn Hill, Edith M. Hinkle, Lisa M. Hoefgen, Jason Hoffman, Cindy I. Holland, Cynthia S. Holley, Treby C. Hood, Janet Hook, Peggy M. Hopper, Lynn Horn, Connie Horton, Shara Howard, Melissa Howe, Mary Ann Hren, Gail Hudson, Michelle Hughes, Karen Humensky, Carlotta Ingle, Kathleen P. Irwin, Diana Iseminger, Tammy Isham, Donna L. Jackson, Lorraine Jackson, Patricia James, Kathleen J. Jandreau, Susan K. Janzen, Dale Johnson (Medina), Catherine R. Johnson-Berger, Roberta L. Jonas, Debra Jane Jones, Julie A. Jones, Shannon Jones, Dawn R. Jordan, Marita Patricia Joseph, Naomi I. Joslin, Jodi Kabalin, Cheryl Kahl, Linda M. Kalbac, Mary D. Kane, Joanna Karneeb, Jenette M. Kelly, Kathryn L. Kelly, Sharon Kenno, Vicki L. Kenobbie, Mary Kleppin, Cheri Kline, Kathryn E. Lacey, Deborah J. Land, Joanne Lane, Rosemary Wood Langella, Coreen M. Larson, Patricia Lawson, Diana LeVan, Elaine Leach, Janet Lee, Stacy S. Lee, Cathy S. Lefils, Daphne M. Leibowitz, Susan Lell, Carol Lindemon, Judy M. Lindquist, Jacqueline M. Linville, Christine G. Lockwood, Rebecca L. Loew, Lesa Logan, Julene Logue, Amy L. Long, Renee T. Long, Melissa A. Love, Alice Lovingood, Kathy M. Lucas, Judith Lugo, Joy Lutz, Laurie Lynch, Jayden Nicole Lyons, Margaret E. Mackey, Judith A. Mannarini, Denise Marie Byrne, Sarena Marques, Konnie Marquis, Diane Martin, Sherry Martin, Steven Martin, April G. Marx, Suzanne Mascola, Linda Mathias, DeEnna L. Matthews, Evelyn R. Maynard, Jewel A. Mazur, Cheryl L. McAnich, Mary McClelland, Michell McComas, Pamela McCord, Beverly McCoy, Angela McDonough, Nina McFarlane, Donna McKenna, Claire McKinnon, Tonya Michelle McKnight, Mary M. McLaughlin, Joy McLemore, Bobbi McMillin, Margo McNeil, Tina Mehler, Denise Melchior, Beverly Merkel, Marsha Merrell, Rae J. Messick, Yvonne Meyerhofer, Karen Milan, Carey L. Miller, Carol S. Miller, Kay L. Miller, Lillian L. Miller, Mary Miller, Janet K. Mitchell, Marilyn Mitchell, Kathleen Moelter, Debra Ann Molitaris, Carol Montgomery, Ann Moore, Janet Moore, Kimberly Moore, Patricia A. Morgan, Pamela Morrow, Linda F. Morton, Juliene A. Munoz, Jennifer Murrell, Angela W. Myers, Ann W. Myers, Rebecca J. Nagy, Penelope C. Neal, Ruth Lynn Neely, Janet M. Newsome, Veronica Nicholas, Carol A. Nigsarian, Tacara Norwood, Mary Anne Novello, Theresa Ann O'Connor, Emily Oates, Karla Ockerby, Wendi Ortiz, Brenda L. Osborne, Paige D. Owens (Hundley), Charlene Palmer, Debra H. Parent, Christina Anne Parman, Kelly Parsons, Betty M. Patton, Julianne Patton, Christie Patzer, Leona R. Payne, Teresa Pemerton, Dawn Pence, Deborah Pepsak, Diane Perryman, Wendi J. Pierson, Brenda Lee Plessinger, Julie A. Plourde, Marie A. Plum, Bobbi E. Pollak, Anna C. Pomeroy, Melissa Poole, Sandra Porter, Susan E. Powell, Tina Preston, Joanne Price, Cherie S. Price-Palmer, April Prior, Catherine Probst, Annette D. Pruett, Brenda Pryczynski, B. Jeannie Purcell, Elaina Marie Rande, Joanne Rathmann, Jacqueline Ratliff, Linda B. Ray, Sheila Reeser, Linda Reid, Lorna Reinhart, Wendy H. Reisenauer, Debra K. Resimont, Krissy Reynolds, Gail A. Riley, Helen Ring, Jenny S. Rink, Briget Rischawy, Steven Rodriquez, Eileen Roff, Gina Rogers, Lynn E. Rogers, Eileen Rollins, Lynda D. Romanek, Jane L. Rose, Jeanette Rydell, Bonnie Ryden, Rhea D. Safire, Constance D. Salvia, Judith A. Sanders, Valerie B. Sawyer, Bonnie Scaia, Jenalyn Scheib, Patricia A. Schmutz, Deborah K. Schneider, Shannon Schroeder, Sherry L. Schwartz, Benjamin Roy Scott, Christy L. Scott, Rosie Scott, Karyn B. Scrivener, Debra Seuell, Dawn Shaffer, Jean M. Shang, Joy A Sharpe, Denise D. Shelby, Brenda Shelton, Cathryn Sibert, Debra H. Sills, Susan Silver, Debra Silviano, Kathleen M. Simons, Lisa Sinkler, David D. Sluder, Teresa D. Smiljanic, Jamie Smith, Janis B. Smith, Lisa Smith, Lori M. Smith, Nicole Elizabeth Smith, Wendolyn Smith, Patricia C. Solari, Amanda Solorza, Leslea Souvigney, Diane Spencer, Jacqueline A. Spires-Purdy, Deborah L. Spittle, Jacqueline St. Georges, Jacqueline St. Georges, Margaret Staffer, Rebecca A. Stanley, Barbara A. Stark, Janet Statzer, Melinda J. Stec, Leida Stewart, Debra G. Still, Tracie Stutzman, Cheryl Sullivan, Jan P. Surprise, Mary Swanson, Rachel Sweeney, Martha J. Sweitzer, Jennifer M. Synak, Patricia E. Taylor, Theresa R. Thomsen, Margaret Anne Thorpe, Leanne M. Tierney, Samantha Tipton, Michael J. Todd, Debora Tolles, Patricia Townsend, Penny Trammel-MacKenzie, Tanya M. Troutman, Jamie Tullock, Peggy H. Tumlin, Susan E. Turley, Vanessa A. Turner, Ellen D. Tyler, Tangela Tyran, Kelly A. Ustinovich, Brian Varner, Karen Velasquez, Lucy Viola, Veronica Vitari, Ann Wagner, Deborah Waldman, Jodi B. Walsh, Andrea Walton, Elizabeth Warfield, Melinda Warnecke, Connie Watson, Deborah Watts, Carla Weiss, Susan Westlund, Terri Wheeler, Carolyn White, Nickie White, Myrtis A. Whitely, Julie M. Wickersham, Connee A. Williams, Deborah H. Williams, Kimberly A. Williams, Sandra E. Williams, Marie Willis, Regina Wilson, Sherry L. Wilson, Darcy Wingler, Cathleen Wojtaszek, Dee A. Woodward, Julia Faye Worrell, Julie Wright, Elizabeth A. Zaayer, Denise M. Zafuto, Rebecca L. Zentz, Penny E. Zimmerman, Carole Zmuda by Kevin J. Dolley (Dolley, Kevin)
June 13, 2013 Filing 142 NOTICE by Kimberly Coleman (f/k/a Lauffer), Elizabeth Warfield, Bobbi E. Pollak, Jeannette M. Chipka, Mary Miller, Wendolyn Smith, Edith M. Hinkle, Bonnie Scaia, Amy A. Bruce, Connie G. Darling, Deanna Garcia, Diana Iseminger, Amy L. Ford, Cherie S. Price-Palmer, Tonya Michelle McKnight, Deborah Pepsak, Jane L. Rose, Joan M. Davis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
June 11, 2013 Filing 141 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Tanya Acquaire, Wendy Alkire, Dorothy L. Ancona, Darla J. Anderson, Joy L. Anderson, Darlene M. Archie, Linda Armstrong, Ann Marie Armstrong-Deitch, Sherri M. Armuth, Vickie Astudillo, Joy Christine Atwell, Cheryl Ayers, Suzanne M. Bailey, Brenda Bain, Elizabeth Baker, Cindy A. Baker-Spriggs, Janice A. Baldwin, Terri Ballard, Jennifer Ballentine, Michelle Bardo, Joy Bargerstock, Shannon Barnes, Alane M Barnes Garvik, Patricia C. Barragan, Katherin Barrow, Jennette Bastion (Horner), Deborah Bauer, Judith Bean, Cheryl Beauchamp, Deanne L. Becker, Jacqueline Becker, Susan C. Becker, Sheryl J. Bell, JoAnne A. Benson, Roberta Bianchini, Gwendolyn Eartha Lee Bienvenu, Teresa Bischof, Gail Black, Cheryl J. Blake, Kay A. Bone, Carole J. Boom, Angela R. Booth, Laurie M. Boren, Marilyn M. Bower, Robin L. Bowers, Carol Brake, Stephanie R. Brammer, Linda Brewer, Cheryl Shaw Briggs, Hope Brown, Susan Brown, Sandra J. Bruce, Leslie Brueckner, Mary Christine Bryant, Wendy J. Buckheit, Judith A. Buckingham, Ellen K. Buffy, Vicki Bunch, Margaret M. Burchard, Diane Burgbacher, Kathleen C. Burke, Debra L. Burns, Shelly Buschman, Nancy Caldwell, Debbie M. Campbell, Ronda Campbell, Claudia Stella Cantelmi, Elizabeth M. Carithers, Eva L. Carlson, Jo Ellen Carnes, Jolene Cartwright, Kevin P. Cartwright, Linda Carucci, Margaret Cary, Gwen Cashion, Kimberly Ceplenski, Kandace Chancey, Jennifer Chandler, Mary Ciesicki, Joanne Frances Cimo, Rosemary Cinquanti, Barbara Ciulla, Kim Claeys, Teresa Slater Clark, Harriet Sue Clarke, Lou Ann Cleary, Theresa Clubb, Patricia Clunk, Tina Coelho, April E. Colleen, Vicki E. Collier, Ian Connors, Karl E. Constantino, Nancy M Corcoran, Lois D. Cores, Tonna G. Cornett, Theresa Cosentino, Mary Kitra Cox, Arlene Bonnie Crafton, LeAnn M. Cramer, Theresa M Crane, Kimberly Crocker-Hendrickson, Kristen A. Crowe, Tamra Crowley, Tara A. Cummings, Darcie J. Cunningham, M. Susan Cunningham, Susan Lynne Damasco, JoAnn Davey, Robin Davies, Teresa A. DeSchryver, Stephanie DeWitt, Rosemarie Dean, Rita A. Defino, Laura Denio, Pamela J. Denny, Ana Derakshaw, Jennifer L. Dick, Shana Diekhoff, Linda R. Dittmer, Sherma Donnelly, Constance A. Duncan, Sharon Dutton, Jessica Edwards, Lisa Edwards, Jessica Eik, Jennie Eisenstein, Rosemary Elmore, Catherine M. Estep (f/k/a Foster), Carol Failla, Melissa Fain, Donna Falco, Judy Fallon, Julie M. Farmer, Donna Farrell, Lori A. Favinger, Laurel Jo Feiker, Robin Feltner, Paula Ferguson, Anna Feroe, Kelli Fisher, Mari J. Floyd, Denise Foell, Sheila R. Ford, Jennifer L. Foreman, Theresa D. Fox, Claudia M. Franklin, Kimberly Freda, Laura Frederiksen, Debra R. Friess, Lynn Galenza, Lauren Gato, Judith Gay, Cecilia Gaynor, Kristine E. Genrich, Judith Joyce Gerber, Kim Gersie-Scott, Laurie Gianquinto, Diane Gibas, Cynthia C. Gibson, Nikki R. Gilbert, Alice Elaine Gillespie, Karen Gland, Virginia Gomez, Karen Goodrich, Linda Gray, Randi Gray, Nancy M. Greene, Deborah Guffey, Pamela J. Gugliotta, Angela E. Hall, Mary Hall, Laura Hammersley, Darlene C. Hanson, Shannon Harbinson, Joanna Hardin, Cynthia M. Harp, Janet E. Harper, Rosemary Harrison, Tracy L. Harrod, Sarah M. Hatch, Nancy Haupt, Susan Haworth, Fayetta L. Hay, Patsy D. Hayes, Sheryl Hazelrigg, Ronda Hebenstreit, Lynsi Henson, Lisa Hering, Diane Hernandez, Marjorie Hess, Sherry D. Hess, Maureen Hicks, Dawn Hill, Lisa M. Hoefgen, Jason Hoffman, Cindy I. Holland, Cynthia S. Holley, Treby C. Hood, Janet Hook, Peggy M. Hopper, Lynn Horn, Connie Horton, Shara Howard, Melissa Howe, Mary Ann Hren, Gail Hudson, Michelle Hughes, Karen Humensky, Carlotta Ingle, Kathleen P. Irwin, Tammy Isham, Donna L. Jackson, Lorraine Jackson, Patricia James, Kathleen J. Jandreau, Susan K. Janzen, Dale Johnson (Medina), Catherine R. Johnson-Berger, Roberta L. Jonas, Debra Jane Jones, Julie A. Jones, Shannon Jones, Dawn R. Jordan, Marita Patricia Joseph, Naomi I. Joslin, Jodi Kabalin, Cheryl Kahl, Linda M. Kalbac, Mary D. Kane, Joanna Karneeb, Jenette M. Kelly, Kathryn L. Kelly, Sharon Kenno, Vicki L. Kenobbie, Mary Kleppin, Cheri Kline, Kathryn E. Lacey, Deborah J. Land, Joanne Lane, Rosemary Wood Langella, Coreen M. Larson, Patricia Lawson, Diana LeVan, Elaine Leach, Janet Lee, Stacy S. Lee, Cathy S. Lefils, Daphne M. Leibowitz, Susan Lell, Carol Lindemon, Judy M. Lindquist, Jacqueline M. Linville, Christine G. Lockwood, Rebecca L. Loew, Lesa Logan, Julene Logue, Amy L. Long, Renee T. Long, Melissa A. Love, Alice Lovingood, Kathy M. Lucas, Judith Lugo, Joy Lutz, Laurie Lynch, Jayden Nicole Lyons, Margaret E. Mackey, Judith A. Mannarini, Denise Marie Byrne, Sarena Marques, Konnie Marquis, Diane Martin, Sherry Martin, Steven Martin, April G. Marx, Suzanne Mascola, Linda Mathias, DeEnna L. Matthews, Evelyn R. Maynard, Jewel A. Mazur, Cheryl L. McAnich, Mary McClelland, Michell McComas, Pamela McCord, Beverly McCoy, Angela McDonough, Nina McFarlane, Donna McKenna, Claire McKinnon, Mary M. McLaughlin, Joy McLemore, Bobbi McMillin, Margo McNeil, Tina Mehler, Denise Melchior, Beverly Merkel, Marsha Merrell, Rae J. Messick, Yvonne Meyerhofer, Karen Milan, Carey L. Miller, Carol S. Miller, Kay L. Miller, Lillian L. Miller, Janet K. Mitchell, Marilyn Mitchell, Kathleen Moelter, Debra Ann Molitaris, Carol Montgomery, Ann Moore, Janet Moore, Kimberly Moore, Patricia A. Morgan, Pamela Morrow, Linda F. Morton, Juliene A. Munoz, Jennifer Murrell, Angela W. Myers, Ann W. Myers, Rebecca J. Nagy, Penelope C. Neal, Ruth Lynn Neely, Janet M. Newsome, Veronica Nicholas, Carol A. Nigsarian, Tacara Norwood, Mary Anne Novello, Theresa Ann O'Connor, Emily Oates, Karla Ockerby, Wendi Ortiz, Brenda L. Osborne, Paige D. Owens (Hundley), Charlene Palmer, Debra H. Parent, Christina Anne Parman, Kelly Parsons, Betty M. Patton, Julianne Patton, Christie Patzer, Leona R. Payne, Teresa Pemerton, Dawn Pence, Diane Perryman, Wendi J. Pierson, Brenda Lee Plessinger, Julie A. Plourde, Marie A. Plum, Anna C. Pomeroy, Melissa Poole, Sandra Porter, Susan E. Powell, Tina Preston, Joanne Price, April Prior, Catherine Probst, Annette D. Pruett, Brenda Pryczynski, B. Jeannie Purcell, Elaina Marie Rande, Joanne Rathmann, Jacqueline Ratliff, Linda B. Ray, Sheila Reeser, Linda Reid, Lorna Reinhart, Wendy H. Reisenauer, Debra K. Resimont, Krissy Reynolds, Gail A. Riley, Helen Ring, Jenny S. Rink, Briget Rischawy, Steven Rodriquez, Eileen Roff, Gina Rogers, Lynn E. Rogers, Eileen Rollins, Lynda D. Romanek, Jeanette Rydell, Bonnie Ryden, Rhea D. Safire, Constance D. Salvia, Judith A. Sanders, Valerie B. Sawyer, Jenalyn Scheib, Patricia A. Schmutz, Deborah K. Schneider, Shannon Schroeder, Sherry L. Schwartz, Benjamin Roy Scott, Christy L. Scott, Rosie Scott, Karyn B. Scrivener, Debra Seuell, Dawn Shaffer, Jean M. Shang, Joy A Sharpe, Denise D. Shelby, Brenda Shelton, Cathryn Sibert, Debra H. Sills, Susan Silver, Debra Silviano, Kathleen M. Simons, Lisa Sinkler, David D. Sluder, Teresa D. Smiljanic, Jamie Smith, Janis B. Smith, Lisa Smith, Lori M. Smith, Nicole Elizabeth Smith, Patricia C. Solari, Amanda Solorza, Leslea Souvigney, Diane Spencer, Jacqueline A. Spires-Purdy, Deborah L. Spittle, Jacqueline St. Georges, Jacqueline St. Georges, Margaret Staffer, Rebecca A. Stanley, Barbara A. Stark, Janet Statzer, Melinda J. Stec, Leida Stewart, Debra G. Still, Tracie Stutzman, Cheryl Sullivan, Jan P. Surprise, Mary Swanson, Rachel Sweeney, Martha J. Sweitzer, Jennifer M. Synak, Patricia E. Taylor, Theresa R. Thomsen, Margaret Anne Thorpe, Leanne M. Tierney, Samantha Tipton, Michael J. Todd, Debora Tolles, Patricia Townsend, Penny Trammel-MacKenzie, Tanya M. Troutman, Jamie Tullock, Peggy H. Tumlin, Susan E. Turley, Vanessa A. Turner, Ellen D. Tyler, Tangela Tyran, Kelly A. Ustinovich, Brian Varner, Karen Velasquez, Lucy Viola, Veronica Vitari, Ann Wagner, Deborah Waldman, Jodi B. Walsh, Andrea Walton, Melinda Warnecke, Connie Watson, Deborah Watts, Carla Weiss, Susan Westlund, Terri Wheeler, Carolyn White, Nickie White, Myrtis A. Whitely, Julie M. Wickersham, Connee A. Williams, Deborah H. Williams, Kimberly A. Williams, Sandra E. Williams, Marie Willis, Regina Wilson, Sherry L. Wilson, Darcy Wingler, Cathleen Wojtaszek, Dee A. Woodward, Julia Faye Worrell, Julie Wright, Elizabeth A. Zaayer, Denise M. Zafuto, Rebecca L. Zentz, Penny E. Zimmerman, Carole Zmuda by Kevin J. Dolley (Dolley, Kevin)
June 11, 2013 Filing 140 NOTICE by Ann W. Myers, Jan P. Surprise, Kathleen P. Irwin, Sherry L. Wilson, Barbara A. Stark, Dee A. Woodward, Sharon Kenno, Catherine M. Estep (f/k/a Foster) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
June 10, 2013 Filing 139 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Tanya Acquaire, Wendy Alkire, Dorothy L. Ancona, Darla J. Anderson, Joy L. Anderson, Darlene M. Archie, Linda Armstrong, Ann Marie Armstrong-Deitch, Sherri M. Armuth, Vickie Astudillo, Joy Christine Atwell, Cheryl Ayers, Suzanne M. Bailey, Brenda Bain, Elizabeth Baker, Cindy A. Baker-Spriggs, Janice A. Baldwin, Terri Ballard, Jennifer Ballentine, Michelle Bardo, Joy Bargerstock, Shannon Barnes, Alane M Barnes Garvik, Patricia C. Barragan, Katherin Barrow, Jennette Bastion (Horner), Deborah Bauer, Judith Bean, Cheryl Beauchamp, Deanne L. Becker, Jacqueline Becker, Susan C. Becker, Sheryl J. Bell, JoAnne A. Benson, Roberta Bianchini, Gwendolyn Eartha Lee Bienvenu, Teresa Bischof, Gail Black, Cheryl J. Blake, Kay A. Bone, Carole J. Boom, Angela R. Booth, Laurie M. Boren, Marilyn M. Bower, Robin L. Bowers, Carol Brake, Stephanie R. Brammer, Linda Brewer, Cheryl Shaw Briggs, Hope Brown, Susan Brown, Sandra J. Bruce, Leslie Brueckner, Mary Christine Bryant, Wendy J. Buckheit, Judith A. Buckingham, Ellen K. Buffy, Vicki Bunch, Margaret M. Burchard, Diane Burgbacher, Kathleen C. Burke, Debra L. Burns, Shelly Buschman, Nancy Caldwell, Debbie M. Campbell, Ronda Campbell, Claudia Stella Cantelmi, Elizabeth M. Carithers, Eva L. Carlson, Jo Ellen Carnes, Jolene Cartwright, Kevin P. Cartwright, Linda Carucci, Margaret Cary, Gwen Cashion, Kimberly Ceplenski, Kandace Chancey, Jennifer Chandler, Mary Ciesicki, Joanne Frances Cimo, Rosemary Cinquanti, Barbara Ciulla, Kim Claeys, Teresa Slater Clark, Harriet Sue Clarke, Lou Ann Cleary, Theresa Clubb, Patricia Clunk, Tina Coelho, April E. Colleen, Vicki E. Collier, Ian Connors, Karl E. Constantino, Nancy M Corcoran, Lois D. Cores, Tonna G. Cornett, Theresa Cosentino, Mary Kitra Cox, Arlene Bonnie Crafton, LeAnn M. Cramer, Theresa M Crane, Kimberly Crocker-Hendrickson, Kristen A. Crowe, Tamra Crowley, Tara A. Cummings, Darcie J. Cunningham, M. Susan Cunningham, Susan Lynne Damasco, JoAnn Davey, Robin Davies, Teresa A. DeSchryver, Stephanie DeWitt, Rosemarie Dean, Rita A. Defino, Laura Denio, Pamela J. Denny, Ana Derakshaw, Jennifer L. Dick, Shana Diekhoff, Linda R. Dittmer, Sherma Donnelly, Constance A. Duncan, Sharon Dutton, Jessica Edwards, Lisa Edwards, Jessica Eik, Jennie Eisenstein, Rosemary Elmore, Carol Failla, Melissa Fain, Donna Falco, Judy Fallon, Julie M. Farmer, Donna Farrell, Lori A. Favinger, Laurel Jo Feiker, Robin Feltner, Paula Ferguson, Anna Feroe, Kelli Fisher, Mari J. Floyd, Denise Foell, Sheila R. Ford, Jennifer L. Foreman, Theresa D. Fox, Claudia M. Franklin, Kimberly Freda, Laura Frederiksen, Debra R. Friess, Lynn Galenza, Lauren Gato, Judith Gay, Cecilia Gaynor, Kristine E. Genrich, Judith Joyce Gerber, Kim Gersie-Scott, Laurie Gianquinto, Diane Gibas, Cynthia C. Gibson, Nikki R. Gilbert, Alice Elaine Gillespie, Karen Gland, Virginia Gomez, Karen Goodrich, Linda Gray, Randi Gray, Nancy M. Greene, Deborah Guffey, Pamela J. Gugliotta, Angela E. Hall, Mary Hall, Laura Hammersley, Darlene C. Hanson, Shannon Harbinson, Joanna Hardin, Cynthia M. Harp, Janet E. Harper, Rosemary Harrison, Tracy L. Harrod, Sarah M. Hatch, Nancy Haupt, Susan Haworth, Fayetta L. Hay, Patsy D. Hayes, Sheryl Hazelrigg, Ronda Hebenstreit, Lynsi Henson, Lisa Hering, Diane Hernandez, Marjorie Hess, Sherry D. Hess, Maureen Hicks, Dawn Hill, Lisa M. Hoefgen, Jason Hoffman, Cindy I. Holland, Cynthia S. Holley, Treby C. Hood, Janet Hook, Peggy M. Hopper, Lynn Horn, Connie Horton, Shara Howard, Melissa Howe, Mary Ann Hren, Gail Hudson, Michelle Hughes, Karen Humensky, Carlotta Ingle, Tammy Isham, Donna L. Jackson, Lorraine Jackson, Patricia James, Kathleen J. Jandreau, Susan K. Janzen, Dale Johnson (Medina), Catherine R. Johnson-Berger, Roberta L. Jonas, Debra Jane Jones, Julie A. Jones, Shannon Jones, Dawn R. Jordan, Marita Patricia Joseph, Naomi I. Joslin, Jodi Kabalin, Cheryl Kahl, Linda M. Kalbac, Mary D. Kane, Joanna Karneeb, Jenette M. Kelly, Kathryn L. Kelly, Vicki L. Kenobbie, Mary Kleppin, Cheri Kline, Kathryn E. Lacey, Deborah J. Land, Joanne Lane, Rosemary Wood Langella, Coreen M. Larson, Patricia Lawson, Diana LeVan, Elaine Leach, Janet Lee, Stacy S. Lee, Cathy S. Lefils, Daphne M. Leibowitz, Susan Lell, Carol Lindemon, Judy M. Lindquist, Jacqueline M. Linville, Christine G. Lockwood, Rebecca L. Loew, Lesa Logan, Julene Logue, Amy L. Long, Renee T. Long, Melissa A. Love, Alice Lovingood, Kathy M. Lucas, Judith Lugo, Joy Lutz, Laurie Lynch, Jayden Nicole Lyons, Margaret E. Mackey, Judith A. Mannarini, Denise Marie Byrne, Sarena Marques, Konnie Marquis, Diane Martin, Sherry Martin, Steven Martin, April G. Marx, Suzanne Mascola, Linda Mathias, DeEnna L. Matthews, Evelyn R. Maynard, Jewel A. Mazur, Cheryl L. McAnich, Mary McClelland, Michell McComas, Pamela McCord, Beverly McCoy, Angela McDonough, Nina McFarlane, Donna McKenna, Claire McKinnon, Mary M. McLaughlin, Joy McLemore, Bobbi McMillin, Margo McNeil, Tina Mehler, Denise Melchior, Beverly Merkel, Marsha Merrell, Rae J. Messick, Yvonne Meyerhofer, Karen Milan, Carey L. Miller, Carol S. Miller, Kay L. Miller, Lillian L. Miller, Janet K. Mitchell, Marilyn Mitchell, Kathleen Moelter, Debra Ann Molitaris, Carol Montgomery, Ann Moore, Janet Moore, Kimberly Moore, Patricia A. Morgan, Pamela Morrow, Linda F. Morton, Juliene A. Munoz, Jennifer Murrell, Angela W. Myers, Rebecca J. Nagy, Penelope C. Neal, Ruth Lynn Neely, Janet M. Newsome, Veronica Nicholas, Carol A. Nigsarian, Tacara Norwood, Mary Anne Novello, Theresa Ann O'Connor, Emily Oates, Karla Ockerby, Wendi Ortiz, Brenda L. Osborne, Paige D. Owens (Hundley), Charlene Palmer, Debra H. Parent, Christina Anne Parman, Kelly Parsons, Betty M. Patton, Julianne Patton, Christie Patzer, Leona R. Payne, Teresa Pemerton, Dawn Pence, Diane Perryman, Wendi J. Pierson, Brenda Lee Plessinger, Julie A. Plourde, Marie A. Plum, Anna C. Pomeroy, Melissa Poole, Sandra Porter, Susan E. Powell, Tina Preston, Joanne Price, April Prior, Catherine Probst, Annette D. Pruett, Brenda Pryczynski, B. Jeannie Purcell, Elaina Marie Rande, Joanne Rathmann, Jacqueline Ratliff, Linda B. Ray, Sheila Reeser, Linda Reid, Lorna Reinhart, Wendy H. Reisenauer, Debra K. Resimont, Krissy Reynolds, Gail A. Riley, Helen Ring, Jenny S. Rink, Briget Rischawy, Steven Rodriquez, Eileen Roff, Gina Rogers, Lynn E. Rogers, Eileen Rollins, Lynda D. Romanek, Jeanette Rydell, Bonnie Ryden, Rhea D. Safire, Constance D. Salvia, Judith A. Sanders, Valerie B. Sawyer, Jenalyn Scheib, Patricia A. Schmutz, Deborah K. Schneider, Shannon Schroeder, Sherry L. Schwartz, Benjamin Roy Scott, Christy L. Scott, Rosie Scott, Karyn B. Scrivener, Debra Seuell, Dawn Shaffer, Jean M. Shang, Joy A Sharpe, Denise D. Shelby, Brenda Shelton, Cathryn Sibert, Debra H. Sills, Susan Silver, Debra Silviano, Kathleen M. Simons, Lisa Sinkler, David D. Sluder, Teresa D. Smiljanic, Jamie Smith, Janis B. Smith, Lisa Smith, Lori M. Smith, Nicole Elizabeth Smith, Patricia C. Solari, Amanda Solorza, Leslea Souvigney, Diane Spencer, Jacqueline A. Spires-Purdy, Deborah L. Spittle, Jacqueline St. Georges, Jacqueline St. Georges, Margaret Staffer, Rebecca A. Stanley, Janet Statzer, Melinda J. Stec, Leida Stewart, Debra G. Still, Tracie Stutzman, Cheryl Sullivan, Mary Swanson, Rachel Sweeney, Martha J. Sweitzer, Jennifer M. Synak, Patricia E. Taylor, Theresa R. Thomsen, Margaret Anne Thorpe, Leanne M. Tierney, Samantha Tipton, Michael J. Todd, Debora Tolles, Patricia Townsend, Penny Trammel-MacKenzie, Tanya M. Troutman, Jamie Tullock, Peggy H. Tumlin, Susan E. Turley, Vanessa A. Turner, Ellen D. Tyler, Tangela Tyran, Kelly A. Ustinovich, Brian Varner, Karen Velasquez, Lucy Viola, Veronica Vitari, Ann Wagner, Deborah Waldman, Jodi B. Walsh, Andrea Walton, Melinda Warnecke, Connie Watson, Deborah Watts, Carla Weiss, Susan Westlund, Terri Wheeler, Carolyn White, Nickie White, Myrtis A. Whitely, Julie M. Wickersham, Connee A. Williams, Deborah H. Williams, Kimberly A. Williams, Sandra E. Williams, Marie Willis, Regina Wilson, Darcy Wingler, Cathleen Wojtaszek, Julia Faye Worrell, Julie Wright, Elizabeth A. Zaayer, Denise M. Zafuto, Rebecca L. Zentz, Penny E. Zimmerman, Carole Zmuda by Kevin J. Dolley (Dolley, Kevin)
June 10, 2013 Filing 138 NOTICE by Patricia E. Taylor, Tina Preston, Laura Hammersley, Rosemarie Dean, Elaina Marie Rande, Judith Joyce Gerber, Julia Faye Worrell, Patricia C. Barragan, Gail Hudson, Suzanne Mascola, Christina Anne Parman, Jennifer L. Foreman, Nickie White, Kathleen C. Burke, Tracy L. Harrod, Gwendolyn Eartha Lee Bienvenu, Patricia Townsend, Maureen Hicks, Susan Lell, Karl E. Constantino, Kay L. Miller, Darcie J. Cunningham, Deborah K. Schneider, Gail Black, Jennifer M. Synak, Christine G. Lockwood, Amanda Solorza, Vanessa A. Turner, Patsy D. Hayes, Eva L. Carlson, Debra Jane Jones, Angela McDonough, Rebecca A. Stanley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
June 9, 2013 Filing 137 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Tanya Acquaire, Wendy Alkire, Dorothy L. Ancona, Darla J. Anderson, Joy L. Anderson, Darlene M. Archie, Linda Armstrong, Ann Marie Armstrong-Deitch, Sherri M. Armuth, Vickie Astudillo, Joy Christine Atwell, Cheryl Ayers, Suzanne M. Bailey, Brenda Bain, Elizabeth Baker, Cindy A. Baker-Spriggs, Janice A. Baldwin, Terri Ballard, Jennifer Ballentine, Michelle Bardo, Joy Bargerstock, Shannon Barnes, Alane M Barnes Garvik, Katherin Barrow, Jennette Bastion (Horner), Deborah Bauer, Judith Bean, Cheryl Beauchamp, Deanne L. Becker, Jacqueline Becker, Susan C. Becker, Sheryl J. Bell, JoAnne A. Benson, Roberta Bianchini, Teresa Bischof, Cheryl J. Blake, Kay A. Bone, Carole J. Boom, Angela R. Booth, Laurie M. Boren, Marilyn M. Bower, Robin L. Bowers, Carol Brake, Stephanie R. Brammer, Linda Brewer, Cheryl Shaw Briggs, Hope Brown, Susan Brown, Sandra J. Bruce, Leslie Brueckner, Mary Christine Bryant, Wendy J. Buckheit, Judith A. Buckingham, Ellen K. Buffy, Vicki Bunch, Margaret M. Burchard, Diane Burgbacher, Debra L. Burns, Shelly Buschman, Nancy Caldwell, Debbie M. Campbell, Ronda Campbell, Claudia Stella Cantelmi, Elizabeth M. Carithers, Jo Ellen Carnes, Jolene Cartwright, Kevin P. Cartwright, Linda Carucci, Margaret Cary, Gwen Cashion, Kimberly Ceplenski, Kandace Chancey, Jennifer Chandler, Mary Ciesicki, Joanne Frances Cimo, Rosemary Cinquanti, Barbara Ciulla, Kim Claeys, Teresa Slater Clark, Harriet Sue Clarke, Lou Ann Cleary, Theresa Clubb, Patricia Clunk, Tina Coelho, April E. Colleen, Vicki E. Collier, Ian Connors, Nancy M Corcoran, Lois D. Cores, Tonna G. Cornett, Theresa Cosentino, Mary Kitra Cox, Arlene Bonnie Crafton, LeAnn M. Cramer, Theresa M Crane, Kimberly Crocker-Hendrickson, Kristen A. Crowe, Tamra Crowley, Tara A. Cummings, M. Susan Cunningham, Susan Lynne Damasco, JoAnn Davey, Robin Davies, Teresa A. DeSchryver, Stephanie DeWitt, Rita A. Defino, Laura Denio, Pamela J. Denny, Ana Derakshaw, Jennifer L. Dick, Shana Diekhoff, Linda R. Dittmer, Sherma Donnelly, Constance A. Duncan, Sharon Dutton, Jessica Edwards, Lisa Edwards, Jessica Eik, Jennie Eisenstein, Rosemary Elmore, Carol Failla, Melissa Fain, Donna Falco, Judy Fallon, Julie M. Farmer, Donna Farrell, Lori A. Favinger, Laurel Jo Feiker, Robin Feltner, Paula Ferguson, Anna Feroe, Kelli Fisher, Mari J. Floyd, Denise Foell, Sheila R. Ford, Theresa D. Fox, Claudia M. Franklin, Kimberly Freda, Laura Frederiksen, Debra R. Friess, Lynn Galenza, Lauren Gato, Judith Gay, Cecilia Gaynor, Kristine E. Genrich, Kim Gersie-Scott, Laurie Gianquinto, Diane Gibas, Cynthia C. Gibson, Nikki R. Gilbert, Alice Elaine Gillespie, Karen Gland, Virginia Gomez, Karen Goodrich, Linda Gray, Randi Gray, Nancy M. Greene, Deborah Guffey, Pamela J. Gugliotta, Angela E. Hall, Mary Hall, Darlene C. Hanson, Shannon Harbinson, Joanna Hardin, Cynthia M. Harp, Janet E. Harper, Rosemary Harrison, Sarah M. Hatch, Nancy Haupt, Susan Haworth, Fayetta L. Hay, Sheryl Hazelrigg, Ronda Hebenstreit, Lynsi Henson, Lisa Hering, Diane Hernandez, Marjorie Hess, Sherry D. Hess, Dawn Hill, Lisa M. Hoefgen, Jason Hoffman, Cindy I. Holland, Cynthia S. Holley, Treby C. Hood, Janet Hook, Peggy M. Hopper, Lynn Horn, Connie Horton, Shara Howard, Melissa Howe, Mary Ann Hren, Michelle Hughes, Karen Humensky, Carlotta Ingle, Tammy Isham, Donna L. Jackson, Lorraine Jackson, Patricia James, Kathleen J. Jandreau, Susan K. Janzen, Dale Johnson (Medina), Catherine R. Johnson-Berger, Roberta L. Jonas, Julie A. Jones, Shannon Jones, Dawn R. Jordan, Marita Patricia Joseph, Naomi I. Joslin, Jodi Kabalin, Cheryl Kahl, Linda M. Kalbac, Mary D. Kane, Joanna Karneeb, Jenette M. Kelly, Kathryn L. Kelly, Vicki L. Kenobbie, Mary Kleppin, Cheri Kline, Kathryn E. Lacey, Deborah J. Land, Joanne Lane, Rosemary Wood Langella, Coreen M. Larson, Patricia Lawson, Diana LeVan, Elaine Leach, Janet Lee, Stacy S. Lee, Cathy S. Lefils, Daphne M. Leibowitz, Carol Lindemon, Judy M. Lindquist, Jacqueline M. Linville, Rebecca L. Loew, Lesa Logan, Julene Logue, Amy L. Long, Renee T. Long, Melissa A. Love, Alice Lovingood, Kathy M. Lucas, Judith Lugo, Joy Lutz, Laurie Lynch, Jayden Nicole Lyons, Margaret E. Mackey, Judith A. Mannarini, Denise Marie Byrne, Sarena Marques, Konnie Marquis, Diane Martin, Sherry Martin, Steven Martin, April G. Marx, Linda Mathias, DeEnna L. Matthews, Evelyn R. Maynard, Jewel A. Mazur, Cheryl L. McAnich, Mary McClelland, Michell McComas, Pamela McCord, Beverly McCoy, Nina McFarlane, Donna McKenna, Claire McKinnon, Mary M. McLaughlin, Joy McLemore, Bobbi McMillin, Margo McNeil, Tina Mehler, Denise Melchior, Beverly Merkel, Marsha Merrell, Rae J. Messick, Yvonne Meyerhofer, Karen Milan, Carey L. Miller, Carol S. Miller, Lillian L. Miller, Janet K. Mitchell, Marilyn Mitchell, Kathleen Moelter, Debra Ann Molitaris, Carol Montgomery, Ann Moore, Janet Moore, Kimberly Moore, Patricia A. Morgan, Pamela Morrow, Linda F. Morton, Juliene A. Munoz, Jennifer Murrell, Angela W. Myers, Rebecca J. Nagy, Penelope C. Neal, Ruth Lynn Neely, Janet M. Newsome, Veronica Nicholas, Carol A. Nigsarian, Tacara Norwood, Mary Anne Novello, Theresa Ann O'Connor, Emily Oates, Karla Ockerby, Wendi Ortiz, Brenda L. Osborne, Paige D. Owens (Hundley), Charlene Palmer, Debra H. Parent, Kelly Parsons, Betty M. Patton, Julianne Patton, Christie Patzer, Leona R. Payne, Teresa Pemerton, Dawn Pence, Diane Perryman, Wendi J. Pierson, Brenda Lee Plessinger, Julie A. Plourde, Marie A. Plum, Anna C. Pomeroy, Melissa Poole, Sandra Porter, Susan E. Powell, Joanne Price, April Prior, Catherine Probst, Annette D. Pruett, Brenda Pryczynski, B. Jeannie Purcell, Joanne Rathmann, Jacqueline Ratliff, Linda B. Ray, Sheila Reeser, Linda Reid, Lorna Reinhart, Wendy H. Reisenauer, Debra K. Resimont, Krissy Reynolds, Gail A. Riley, Helen Ring, Jenny S. Rink, Briget Rischawy, Steven Rodriquez, Eileen Roff, Gina Rogers, Lynn E. Rogers, Eileen Rollins, Lynda D. Romanek, Jeanette Rydell, Bonnie Ryden, Rhea D. Safire, Constance D. Salvia, Judith A. Sanders, Valerie B. Sawyer, Jenalyn Scheib, Patricia A. Schmutz, Shannon Schroeder, Sherry L. Schwartz, Benjamin Roy Scott, Christy L. Scott, Rosie Scott, Karyn B. Scrivener, Debra Seuell, Dawn Shaffer, Jean M. Shang, Joy A Sharpe, Denise D. Shelby, Brenda Shelton, Cathryn Sibert, Debra H. Sills, Susan Silver, Debra Silviano, Kathleen M. Simons, Lisa Sinkler, David D. Sluder, Teresa D. Smiljanic, Jamie Smith, Janis B. Smith, Lisa Smith, Lori M. Smith, Nicole Elizabeth Smith, Patricia C. Solari, Leslea Souvigney, Diane Spencer, Jacqueline A. Spires-Purdy, Deborah L. Spittle, Jacqueline St. Georges, Jacqueline St. Georges, Margaret Staffer, Janet Statzer, Melinda J. Stec, Leida Stewart, Debra G. Still, Tracie Stutzman, Cheryl Sullivan, Mary Swanson, Rachel Sweeney, Martha J. Sweitzer, Theresa R. Thomsen, Margaret Anne Thorpe, Leanne M. Tierney, Samantha Tipton, Michael J. Todd, Debora Tolles, Penny Trammel-MacKenzie, Tanya M. Troutman, Jamie Tullock, Peggy H. Tumlin, Susan E. Turley, Ellen D. Tyler, Tangela Tyran, Kelly A. Ustinovich, Brian Varner, Karen Velasquez, Lucy Viola, Veronica Vitari, Ann Wagner, Deborah Waldman, Jodi B. Walsh, Andrea Walton, Melinda Warnecke, Connie Watson, Deborah Watts, Carla Weiss, Susan Westlund, Terri Wheeler, Carolyn White, Myrtis A. Whitely, Julie M. Wickersham, Connee A. Williams, Deborah H. Williams, Kimberly A. Williams, Sandra E. Williams, Marie Willis, Regina Wilson, Darcy Wingler, Cathleen Wojtaszek, Julie Wright, Elizabeth A. Zaayer, Denise M. Zafuto, Rebecca L. Zentz, Penny E. Zimmerman, Carole Zmuda by Kevin J. Dolley (Dolley, Kevin)
June 9, 2013 Filing 136 NOTICE by Sherri M. Armuth, Michael J. Todd, Terri Wheeler, Debra K. Resimont, Nikki R. Gilbert, Jodi Kabalin, Debbie M. Campbell, Veronica Vitari, Claudia Stella Cantelmi, Diane Martin, Jennifer Murrell, Rebecca J. Nagy, Cynthia M. Harp, Vicki L. Kenobbie, Darla J. Anderson, Renee T. Long, Deborah Watts, Linda Reid, Emily Oates, Susan C. Becker, Melissa A. Love, Suzanne M. Bailey, Jolene Cartwright, Sherry L. Schwartz, Kimberly Crocker-Hendrickson, Sandra J. Bruce, Roberta Bianchini, Janice A. Baldwin, Tina Coelho, Pamela McCord, Kathryn L. Kelly, Julene Logue, Jennie Eisenstein, Susan Lynne Damasco, Teresa Bischof, Jacqueline A. Spires-Purdy, Dale Johnson (Medina), Janet Lee, Dawn R. Jordan, Alice Elaine Gillespie, Joanne Frances Cimo, Janet Statzer, Jennifer Ballentine, Marilyn Mitchell, Margaret E. Mackey, Linda Brewer, Sheryl Hazelrigg, Elizabeth Baker, Constance A. Duncan, Connie Horton, Marie A. Plum (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
June 6, 2013 Filing 135 NOTICE by Ellen K. Buffy, Laurie M. Boren, Beverly McCoy, Kimberly A. Williams, Margaret M. Burchard, Lou Ann Cleary, Melinda Warnecke, Benjamin Roy Scott, Susan Silver, Marjorie Hess, Teresa Pemerton, Tanya M. Troutman, Laurel Jo Feiker, Anna Feroe, Darlene M. Archie, Lori A. Favinger, Jacqueline St. Georges, Teresa D. Smiljanic, Cathryn Sibert, Diane Spencer, Karen Humensky, Donna McKenna, Annette D. Pruett, Joanna Karneeb, Kathleen M. Simons, Steven Rodriquez, Julie M. Farmer, Martha J. Sweitzer, Lori M. Smith, Carol Montgomery, Teresa Slater Clark, Arlene Bonnie Crafton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
June 5, 2013 Filing 134 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Tanya Acquaire, Wendy Alkire, Dorothy L. Ancona, Joy L. Anderson, Linda Armstrong, Ann Marie Armstrong-Deitch, Vickie Astudillo, Joy Christine Atwell, Cheryl Ayers, Brenda Bain, Cindy A. Baker-Spriggs, Terri Ballard, Michelle Bardo, Joy Bargerstock, Shannon Barnes, Alane M Barnes Garvik, Katherin Barrow, Jennette Bastion (Horner), Deborah Bauer, Judith Bean, Cheryl Beauchamp, Deanne L. Becker, Jacqueline Becker, Sheryl J. Bell, JoAnne A. Benson, Cheryl J. Blake, Kay A. Bone, Carole J. Boom, Angela R. Booth, Marilyn M. Bower, Robin L. Bowers, Carol Brake, Stephanie R. Brammer, Cheryl Shaw Briggs, Hope Brown, Susan Brown, Leslie Brueckner, Mary Christine Bryant, Wendy J. Buckheit, Judith A. Buckingham, Vicki Bunch, Diane Burgbacher, Debra L. Burns, Shelly Buschman, Nancy Caldwell, Ronda Campbell, Elizabeth M. Carithers, Jo Ellen Carnes, Kevin P. Cartwright, Linda Carucci, Margaret Cary, Gwen Cashion, Kimberly Ceplenski, Kandace Chancey, Jennifer Chandler, Mary Ciesicki, Rosemary Cinquanti, Barbara Ciulla, Kim Claeys, Harriet Sue Clarke, Theresa Clubb, Patricia Clunk, April E. Colleen, Vicki E. Collier, Ian Connors, Nancy M Corcoran, Lois D. Cores, Tonna G. Cornett, Theresa Cosentino, Mary Kitra Cox, LeAnn M. Cramer, Theresa M Crane, Kristen A. Crowe, Tamra Crowley, Tara A. Cummings, M. Susan Cunningham, JoAnn Davey, Robin Davies, Teresa A. DeSchryver, Stephanie DeWitt, Rita A. Defino, Laura Denio, Pamela J. Denny, Ana Derakshaw, Jennifer L. Dick, Shana Diekhoff, Linda R. Dittmer, Sherma Donnelly, Sharon Dutton, Jessica Edwards, Lisa Edwards, Jessica Eik, Rosemary Elmore, Carol Failla, Melissa Fain, Donna Falco, Judy Fallon, Donna Farrell, Robin Feltner, Paula Ferguson, Kelli Fisher, Mari J. Floyd, Denise Foell, Sheila R. Ford, Theresa D. Fox, Claudia M. Franklin, Kimberly Freda, Laura Frederiksen, Debra R. Friess, Lynn Galenza, Lauren Gato, Judith Gay, Cecilia Gaynor, Kristine E. Genrich, Kim Gersie-Scott, Laurie Gianquinto, Diane Gibas, Cynthia C. Gibson, Karen Gland, Virginia Gomez, Karen Goodrich, Linda Gray, Randi Gray, Nancy M. Greene, Deborah Guffey, Pamela J. Gugliotta, Angela E. Hall, Mary Hall, Darlene C. Hanson, Shannon Harbinson, Joanna Hardin, Janet E. Harper, Rosemary Harrison, Sarah M. Hatch, Nancy Haupt, Susan Haworth, Fayetta L. Hay, Ronda Hebenstreit, Lynsi Henson, Lisa Hering, Diane Hernandez, Sherry D. Hess, Dawn Hill, Lisa M. Hoefgen, Jason Hoffman, Cindy I. Holland, Cynthia S. Holley, Treby C. Hood, Janet Hook, Peggy M. Hopper, Lynn Horn, Shara Howard, Melissa Howe, Mary Ann Hren, Michelle Hughes, Carlotta Ingle, Tammy Isham, Donna L. Jackson, Lorraine Jackson, Patricia James, Kathleen J. Jandreau, Susan K. Janzen, Catherine R. Johnson-Berger, Roberta L. Jonas, Julie A. Jones, Shannon Jones, Marita Patricia Joseph, Naomi I. Joslin, Cheryl Kahl, Linda M. Kalbac, Mary D. Kane, Jenette M. Kelly, Mary Kleppin, Cheri Kline, Kathryn E. Lacey, Deborah J. Land, Joanne Lane, Rosemary Wood Langella, Coreen M. Larson, Patricia Lawson, Diana LeVan, Elaine Leach, Stacy S. Lee, Cathy S. Lefils, Daphne M. Leibowitz, Carol Lindemon, Judy M. Lindquist, Jacqueline M. Linville, Rebecca L. Loew, Lesa Logan, Amy L. Long, Alice Lovingood, Kathy M. Lucas, Judith Lugo, Joy Lutz, Laurie Lynch, Jayden Nicole Lyons, Judith A. Mannarini, Denise Marie Byrne, Sarena Marques, Konnie Marquis, Sherry Martin, Steven Martin, April G. Marx, Linda Mathias, DeEnna L. Matthews, Evelyn R. Maynard, Jewel A. Mazur, Cheryl L. McAnich, Mary McClelland, Michell McComas, Nina McFarlane, Claire McKinnon, Mary M. McLaughlin, Joy McLemore, Bobbi McMillin, Margo McNeil, Tina Mehler, Denise Melchior, Beverly Merkel, Marsha Merrell, Rae J. Messick, Yvonne Meyerhofer, Karen Milan, Carey L. Miller, Carol S. Miller, Lillian L. Miller, Janet K. Mitchell, Kathleen Moelter, Debra Ann Molitaris, Ann Moore, Janet Moore, Kimberly Moore, Patricia A. Morgan, Pamela Morrow, Linda F. Morton, Juliene A. Munoz, Angela W. Myers, Penelope C. Neal, Ruth Lynn Neely, Janet M. Newsome, Veronica Nicholas, Carol A. Nigsarian, Tacara Norwood, Mary Anne Novello, Theresa Ann O'Connor, Karla Ockerby, Wendi Ortiz, Brenda L. Osborne, Paige D. Owens (Hundley), Charlene Palmer, Debra H. Parent, Kelly Parsons, Betty M. Patton, Julianne Patton, Christie Patzer, Leona R. Payne, Dawn Pence, Diane Perryman, Wendi J. Pierson, Brenda Lee Plessinger, Julie A. Plourde, Anna C. Pomeroy, Melissa Poole, Sandra Porter, Susan E. Powell, Joanne Price, April Prior, Catherine Probst, Brenda Pryczynski, B. Jeannie Purcell, Joanne Rathmann, Jacqueline Ratliff, Linda B. Ray, Sheila Reeser, Lorna Reinhart, Wendy H. Reisenauer, Krissy Reynolds, Gail A. Riley, Helen Ring, Jenny S. Rink, Briget Rischawy, Eileen Roff, Gina Rogers, Lynn E. Rogers, Eileen Rollins, Lynda D. Romanek, Jeanette Rydell, Bonnie Ryden, Rhea D. Safire, Constance D. Salvia, Judith A. Sanders, Valerie B. Sawyer, Jenalyn Scheib, Patricia A. Schmutz, Shannon Schroeder, Christy L. Scott, Rosie Scott, Karyn B. Scrivener, Debra Seuell, Dawn Shaffer, Jean M. Shang, Joy A Sharpe, Denise D. Shelby, Brenda Shelton, Debra H. Sills, Debra Silviano, Lisa Sinkler, David D. Sluder, Jamie Smith, Janis B. Smith, Lisa Smith, Nicole Elizabeth Smith, Patricia C. Solari, Leslea Souvigney, Deborah L. Spittle, Jacqueline St. Georges, Margaret Staffer, Melinda J. Stec, Leida Stewart, Debra G. Still, Tracie Stutzman, Cheryl Sullivan, Mary Swanson, Rachel Sweeney, Theresa R. Thomsen, Margaret Anne Thorpe, Leanne M. Tierney, Samantha Tipton, Debora Tolles, Penny Trammel-MacKenzie, Jamie Tullock, Peggy H. Tumlin, Susan E. Turley, Ellen D. Tyler, Tangela Tyran, Kelly A. Ustinovich, Brian Varner, Karen Velasquez, Lucy Viola, Ann Wagner, Deborah Waldman, Jodi B. Walsh, Andrea Walton, Connie Watson, Carla Weiss, Susan Westlund, Carolyn White, Myrtis A. Whitely, Julie M. Wickersham, Connee A. Williams, Deborah H. Williams, Sandra E. Williams, Marie Willis, Regina Wilson, Darcy Wingler, Cathleen Wojtaszek, Julie Wright, Elizabeth A. Zaayer, Denise M. Zafuto, Rebecca L. Zentz, Penny E. Zimmerman, Carole Zmuda by Kevin J. Dolley (Dolley, Kevin)
June 5, 2013 Filing 133 NOTICE by Lisa Sinkler, Teresa A. DeSchryver, Tara A. Cummings, Margaret Staffer, Laura Frederiksen, Fayetta L. Hay, Christy L. Scott, Cathy S. Lefils, Kandace Chancey, Kristen A. Crowe, Evelyn R. Maynard (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
June 4, 2013 Filing 132 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Tanya Acquaire, Wendy Alkire, Dorothy L. Ancona, Joy L. Anderson, Linda Armstrong, Ann Marie Armstrong-Deitch, Vickie Astudillo, Joy Christine Atwell, Cheryl Ayers, Brenda Bain, Cindy A. Baker-Spriggs, Terri Ballard, Michelle Bardo, Joy Bargerstock, Shannon Barnes, Alane M Barnes Garvik, Katherin Barrow, Jennette Bastion (Horner), Deborah Bauer, Judith Bean, Cheryl Beauchamp, Deanne L. Becker, Jacqueline Becker, Sheryl J. Bell, JoAnne A. Benson, Cheryl J. Blake, Kay A. Bone, Carole J. Boom, Angela R. Booth, Marilyn M. Bower, Robin L. Bowers, Carol Brake, Stephanie R. Brammer, Cheryl Shaw Briggs, Hope Brown, Susan Brown, Leslie Brueckner, Mary Christine Bryant, Wendy J. Buckheit, Judith A. Buckingham, Vicki Bunch, Diane Burgbacher, Debra L. Burns, Shelly Buschman, Nancy Caldwell, Ronda Campbell, Elizabeth M. Carithers, Jo Ellen Carnes, Kevin P. Cartwright, Linda Carucci, Margaret Cary, Gwen Cashion, Kimberly Ceplenski, Jennifer Chandler, Mary Ciesicki, Rosemary Cinquanti, Barbara Ciulla, Kim Claeys, Harriet Sue Clarke, Theresa Clubb, Patricia Clunk, April E. Colleen, Vicki E. Collier, Ian Connors, Nancy M Corcoran, Lois D. Cores, Tonna G. Cornett, Theresa Cosentino, Mary Kitra Cox, LeAnn M. Cramer, Theresa M Crane, Tamra Crowley, M. Susan Cunningham, JoAnn Davey, Robin Davies, Stephanie DeWitt, Rita A. Defino, Laura Denio, Pamela J. Denny, Ana Derakshaw, Jennifer L. Dick, Shana Diekhoff, Linda R. Dittmer, Sherma Donnelly, Sharon Dutton, Jessica Edwards, Lisa Edwards, Jessica Eik, Rosemary Elmore, Carol Failla, Melissa Fain, Donna Falco, Judy Fallon, Donna Farrell, Robin Feltner, Paula Ferguson, Kelli Fisher, Mari J. Floyd, Denise Foell, Sheila R. Ford, Theresa D. Fox, Claudia M. Franklin, Kimberly Freda, Debra R. Friess, Lynn Galenza, Lauren Gato, Judith Gay, Cecilia Gaynor, Kristine E. Genrich, Kim Gersie-Scott, Laurie Gianquinto, Diane Gibas, Cynthia C. Gibson, Karen Gland, Virginia Gomez, Karen Goodrich, Linda Gray, Randi Gray, Nancy M. Greene, Deborah Guffey, Pamela J. Gugliotta, Angela E. Hall, Mary Hall, Darlene C. Hanson, Shannon Harbinson, Joanna Hardin, Janet E. Harper, Rosemary Harrison, Sarah M. Hatch, Nancy Haupt, Susan Haworth, Ronda Hebenstreit, Lynsi Henson, Lisa Hering, Diane Hernandez, Sherry D. Hess, Dawn Hill, Lisa M. Hoefgen, Jason Hoffman, Cindy I. Holland, Cynthia S. Holley, Treby C. Hood, Janet Hook, Peggy M. Hopper, Lynn Horn, Shara Howard, Melissa Howe, Mary Ann Hren, Michelle Hughes, Carlotta Ingle, Tammy Isham, Donna L. Jackson, Lorraine Jackson, Patricia James, Kathleen J. Jandreau, Susan K. Janzen, Catherine R. Johnson-Berger, Roberta L. Jonas, Julie A. Jones, Shannon Jones, Marita Patricia Joseph, Naomi I. Joslin, Cheryl Kahl, Linda M. Kalbac, Mary D. Kane, Jenette M. Kelly, Mary Kleppin, Cheri Kline, Kathryn E. Lacey, Deborah J. Land, Joanne Lane, Rosemary Wood Langella, Coreen M. Larson, Patricia Lawson, Diana LeVan, Elaine Leach, Stacy S. Lee, Daphne M. Leibowitz, Carol Lindemon, Judy M. Lindquist, Jacqueline M. Linville, Rebecca L. Loew, Lesa Logan, Amy L. Long, Alice Lovingood, Kathy M. Lucas, Judith Lugo, Joy Lutz, Laurie Lynch, Jayden Nicole Lyons, Judith A. Mannarini, Denise Marie Byrne, Sarena Marques, Konnie Marquis, Sherry Martin, Steven Martin, April G. Marx, Linda Mathias, DeEnna L. Matthews, Jewel A. Mazur, Cheryl L. McAnich, Mary McClelland, Michell McComas, Nina McFarlane, Claire McKinnon, Mary M. McLaughlin, Joy McLemore, Bobbi McMillin, Margo McNeil, Tina Mehler, Denise Melchior, Beverly Merkel, Marsha Merrell, Rae J. Messick, Yvonne Meyerhofer, Karen Milan, Carey L. Miller, Carol S. Miller, Lillian L. Miller, Janet K. Mitchell, Kathleen Moelter, Debra Ann Molitaris, Ann Moore, Janet Moore, Kimberly Moore, Patricia A. Morgan, Pamela Morrow, Linda F. Morton, Juliene A. Munoz, Angela W. Myers, Penelope C. Neal, Ruth Lynn Neely, Janet M. Newsome, Veronica Nicholas, Carol A. Nigsarian, Tacara Norwood, Mary Anne Novello, Theresa Ann O'Connor, Karla Ockerby, Wendi Ortiz, Brenda L. Osborne, Paige D. Owens (Hundley), Charlene Palmer, Debra H. Parent, Kelly Parsons, Betty M. Patton, Julianne Patton, Christie Patzer, Leona R. Payne, Dawn Pence, Diane Perryman, Wendi J. Pierson, Brenda Lee Plessinger, Julie A. Plourde, Anna C. Pomeroy, Melissa Poole, Sandra Porter, Susan E. Powell, Joanne Price, April Prior, Catherine Probst, Brenda Pryczynski, B. Jeannie Purcell, Joanne Rathmann, Jacqueline Ratliff, Linda B. Ray, Sheila Reeser, Lorna Reinhart, Wendy H. Reisenauer, Krissy Reynolds, Gail A. Riley, Helen Ring, Jenny S. Rink, Briget Rischawy, Eileen Roff, Gina Rogers, Lynn E. Rogers, Eileen Rollins, Lynda D. Romanek, Jeanette Rydell, Bonnie Ryden, Rhea D. Safire, Constance D. Salvia, Judith A. Sanders, Valerie B. Sawyer, Jenalyn Scheib, Patricia A. Schmutz, Shannon Schroeder, Rosie Scott, Karyn B. Scrivener, Debra Seuell, Dawn Shaffer, Jean M. Shang, Joy A Sharpe, Denise D. Shelby, Brenda Shelton, Debra H. Sills, Debra Silviano, David D. Sluder, Jamie Smith, Janis B. Smith, Lisa Smith, Nicole Elizabeth Smith, Patricia C. Solari, Leslea Souvigney, Deborah L. Spittle, Jacqueline St. Georges, Melinda J. Stec, Leida Stewart, Debra G. Still, Tracie Stutzman, Cheryl Sullivan, Mary Swanson, Rachel Sweeney, Theresa R. Thomsen, Margaret Anne Thorpe, Leanne M. Tierney, Samantha Tipton, Debora Tolles, Penny Trammel-MacKenzie, Jamie Tullock, Peggy H. Tumlin, Susan E. Turley, Ellen D. Tyler, Tangela Tyran, Kelly A. Ustinovich, Brian Varner, Karen Velasquez, Lucy Viola, Ann Wagner, Deborah Waldman, Jodi B. Walsh, Andrea Walton, Connie Watson, Carla Weiss, Susan Westlund, Carolyn White, Myrtis A. Whitely, Julie M. Wickersham, Connee A. Williams, Deborah H. Williams, Sandra E. Williams, Marie Willis, Regina Wilson, Darcy Wingler, Cathleen Wojtaszek, Julie Wright, Elizabeth A. Zaayer, Denise M. Zafuto, Rebecca L. Zentz, Penny E. Zimmerman, Carole Zmuda by Kevin J. Dolley (Dolley, Kevin)
June 4, 2013 Filing 131 NOTICE by Kelli Fisher, Carol S. Miller, Wendi J. Pierson, Mary Swanson, Elizabeth A. Zaayer, Rebecca L. Loew, Tacara Norwood, Carole J. Boom, Nina McFarlane, Stephanie R. Brammer, Samantha Tipton, Cheryl Kahl, Sarah M. Hatch, Julie Wright, Kim Gersie-Scott, Gina Rogers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
June 3, 2013 Filing 130 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Tanya Acquaire, Wendy Alkire, Dorothy L. Ancona, Joy L. Anderson, Linda Armstrong, Ann Marie Armstrong-Deitch, Vickie Astudillo, Joy Christine Atwell, Cheryl Ayers, Brenda Bain, Cindy A. Baker-Spriggs, Terri Ballard, Michelle Bardo, Joy Bargerstock, Shannon Barnes, Alane M Barnes Garvik, Katherin Barrow, Jennette Bastion (Horner), Deborah Bauer, Judith Bean, Cheryl Beauchamp, Deanne L. Becker, Jacqueline Becker, Sheryl J. Bell, JoAnne A. Benson, Cheryl J. Blake, Kay A. Bone, Angela R. Booth, Marilyn M. Bower, Robin L. Bowers, Carol Brake, Cheryl Shaw Briggs, Hope Brown, Susan Brown, Leslie Brueckner, Mary Christine Bryant, Wendy J. Buckheit, Judith A. Buckingham, Vicki Bunch, Diane Burgbacher, Debra L. Burns, Shelly Buschman, Nancy Caldwell, Ronda Campbell, Elizabeth M. Carithers, Jo Ellen Carnes, Kevin P. Cartwright, Linda Carucci, Margaret Cary, Gwen Cashion, Kimberly Ceplenski, Jennifer Chandler, Mary Ciesicki, Rosemary Cinquanti, Barbara Ciulla, Kim Claeys, Harriet Sue Clarke, Theresa Clubb, Patricia Clunk, April E. Colleen, Vicki E. Collier, Ian Connors, Nancy M Corcoran, Lois D. Cores, Tonna G. Cornett, Theresa Cosentino, Mary Kitra Cox, LeAnn M. Cramer, Theresa M Crane, Tamra Crowley, M. Susan Cunningham, JoAnn Davey, Robin Davies, Stephanie DeWitt, Rita A. Defino, Laura Denio, Pamela J. Denny, Ana Derakshaw, Jennifer L. Dick, Shana Diekhoff, Linda R. Dittmer, Sherma Donnelly, Sharon Dutton, Jessica Edwards, Lisa Edwards, Jessica Eik, Rosemary Elmore, Carol Failla, Melissa Fain, Donna Falco, Judy Fallon, Donna Farrell, Robin Feltner, Paula Ferguson, Mari J. Floyd, Denise Foell, Sheila R. Ford, Theresa D. Fox, Claudia M. Franklin, Kimberly Freda, Debra R. Friess, Lynn Galenza, Lauren Gato, Judith Gay, Cecilia Gaynor, Kristine E. Genrich, Laurie Gianquinto, Diane Gibas, Cynthia C. Gibson, Karen Gland, Virginia Gomez, Karen Goodrich, Linda Gray, Randi Gray, Nancy M. Greene, Deborah Guffey, Pamela J. Gugliotta, Angela E. Hall, Mary Hall, Darlene C. Hanson, Shannon Harbinson, Joanna Hardin, Janet E. Harper, Rosemary Harrison, Nancy Haupt, Susan Haworth, Ronda Hebenstreit, Lynsi Henson, Lisa Hering, Diane Hernandez, Sherry D. Hess, Dawn Hill, Lisa M. Hoefgen, Jason Hoffman, Cindy I. Holland, Cynthia S. Holley, Treby C. Hood, Janet Hook, Peggy M. Hopper, Lynn Horn, Shara Howard, Melissa Howe, Mary Ann Hren, Michelle Hughes, Carlotta Ingle, Tammy Isham, Donna L. Jackson, Lorraine Jackson, Patricia James, Kathleen J. Jandreau, Susan K. Janzen, Catherine R. Johnson-Berger, Roberta L. Jonas, Julie A. Jones, Shannon Jones, Marita Patricia Joseph, Naomi I. Joslin, Linda M. Kalbac, Mary D. Kane, Jenette M. Kelly, Mary Kleppin, Cheri Kline, Kathryn E. Lacey, Deborah J. Land, Joanne Lane, Rosemary Wood Langella, Coreen M. Larson, Patricia Lawson, Diana LeVan, Elaine Leach, Stacy S. Lee, Daphne M. Leibowitz, Carol Lindemon, Judy M. Lindquist, Jacqueline M. Linville, Lesa Logan, Amy L. Long, Alice Lovingood, Kathy M. Lucas, Judith Lugo, Joy Lutz, Laurie Lynch, Jayden Nicole Lyons, Judith A. Mannarini, Denise Marie Byrne, Sarena Marques, Konnie Marquis, Sherry Martin, Steven Martin, April G. Marx, Linda Mathias, DeEnna L. Matthews, Jewel A. Mazur, Cheryl L. McAnich, Mary McClelland, Michell McComas, Claire McKinnon, Mary M. McLaughlin, Joy McLemore, Bobbi McMillin, Margo McNeil, Tina Mehler, Denise Melchior, Beverly Merkel, Marsha Merrell, Rae J. Messick, Yvonne Meyerhofer, Karen Milan, Carey L. Miller, Lillian L. Miller, Janet K. Mitchell, Kathleen Moelter, Debra Ann Molitaris, Ann Moore, Janet Moore, Kimberly Moore, Patricia A. Morgan, Pamela Morrow, Linda F. Morton, Juliene A. Munoz, Angela W. Myers, Penelope C. Neal, Ruth Lynn Neely, Janet M. Newsome, Veronica Nicholas, Carol A. Nigsarian, Mary Anne Novello, Theresa Ann O'Connor, Karla Ockerby, Wendi Ortiz, Brenda L. Osborne, Paige D. Owens (Hundley), Charlene Palmer, Debra H. Parent, Kelly Parsons, Betty M. Patton, Julianne Patton, Christie Patzer, Leona R. Payne, Dawn Pence, Diane Perryman, Brenda Lee Plessinger, Julie A. Plourde, Anna C. Pomeroy, Melissa Poole, Sandra Porter, Susan E. Powell, Joanne Price, April Prior, Catherine Probst, Brenda Pryczynski, B. Jeannie Purcell, Joanne Rathmann, Jacqueline Ratliff, Linda B. Ray, Sheila Reeser, Lorna Reinhart, Wendy H. Reisenauer, Krissy Reynolds, Gail A. Riley, Helen Ring, Jenny S. Rink, Briget Rischawy, Eileen Roff, Lynn E. Rogers, Eileen Rollins, Lynda D. Romanek, Jeanette Rydell, Bonnie Ryden, Rhea D. Safire, Constance D. Salvia, Judith A. Sanders, Valerie B. Sawyer, Jenalyn Scheib, Patricia A. Schmutz, Shannon Schroeder, Rosie Scott, Karyn B. Scrivener, Debra Seuell, Dawn Shaffer, Jean M. Shang, Joy A Sharpe, Denise D. Shelby, Brenda Shelton, Debra H. Sills, Debra Silviano, David D. Sluder, Jamie Smith, Janis B. Smith, Lisa Smith, Nicole Elizabeth Smith, Patricia C. Solari, Leslea Souvigney, Deborah L. Spittle, Jacqueline St. Georges, Melinda J. Stec, Leida Stewart, Debra G. Still, Tracie Stutzman, Cheryl Sullivan, Rachel Sweeney, Theresa R. Thomsen, Margaret Anne Thorpe, Leanne M. Tierney, Debora Tolles, Penny Trammel-MacKenzie, Jamie Tullock, Peggy H. Tumlin, Susan E. Turley, Ellen D. Tyler, Tangela Tyran, Kelly A. Ustinovich, Brian Varner, Karen Velasquez, Lucy Viola, Ann Wagner, Deborah Waldman, Jodi B. Walsh, Andrea Walton, Connie Watson, Carla Weiss, Susan Westlund, Carolyn White, Myrtis A. Whitely, Julie M. Wickersham, Connee A. Williams, Deborah H. Williams, Sandra E. Williams, Marie Willis, Regina Wilson, Darcy Wingler, Cathleen Wojtaszek, Denise M. Zafuto, Rebecca L. Zentz, Penny E. Zimmerman, Carole Zmuda by Kevin J. Dolley (Dolley, Kevin)
June 3, 2013 Filing 129 NOTICE by Jamie Smith, Leslie Brueckner, Penny E. Zimmerman, Wendy J. Buckheit, Treby C. Hood, Lorna Reinhart, Deborah H. Williams, Rita A. Defino, Kathleen J. Jandreau, Janet Hook, Lynn Galenza, Tracie Stutzman, Konnie Marquis, Charlene Palmer, Regina Wilson, Diana LeVan, Jenette M. Kelly, Donna Farrell, Nancy M. Greene, Lillian L. Miller, Peggy M. Hopper, Cecilia Gaynor, Julianne Patton, Gwen Cashion, Karen Goodrich, Marita Patricia Joseph, Mary Kitra Cox, Karen Velasquez, Mary Ciesicki, Brenda Shelton, Ronda Hebenstreit, Carlotta Ingle, Anna C. Pomeroy, Theresa R. Thomsen, Diane Hernandez, Tamra Crowley, Cheryl J. Blake, Pamela J. Gugliotta, Lois D. Cores, Joanne Price, Melissa Poole, Roberta L. Jonas, Lucy Viola, Lynn E. Rogers, Peggy H. Tumlin, Mary McClelland, Robin Feltner, Paige D. Owens (Hundley), Claire McKinnon, Janet K. Mitchell, Robin Davies, Jeanette Rydell, Gail A. Riley, Brenda Lee Plessinger, Mary M. McLaughlin, Vicki E. Collier, Karyn B. Scrivener, Bonnie Ryden, Shana Diekhoff, Tanya Acquaire, Rhea D. Safire, Kay A. Bone, David D. Sluder, April G. Marx, Susan E. Powell, Sandra Porter, Jenny S. Rink, Robin L. Bowers, Jennifer L. Dick, Cathleen Wojtaszek, Patricia James, Lauren Gato, Lynn Horn, Nicole Elizabeth Smith, Debra H. Parent, Wendy H. Reisenauer, JoAnn Davey, Patricia A. Morgan, Tonna G. Cornett, Joanne Rathmann, Debra G. Still, Leanne M. Tierney, Debra L. Burns, Marsha Merrell, Jodi B. Walsh, B. Jeannie Purcell, Connee A. Williams, Elizabeth M. Carithers, Ian Connors, April Prior, Sherma Donnelly, Patricia C. Solari, Kevin P. Cartwright, Mary Anne Novello, Jean M. Shang, Ann Wagner, Michell McComas, Yvonne Meyerhofer, Sherry D. Hess, Lesa Logan, Kelly A. Ustinovich, Laurie Lynch, Claudia M. Franklin, Rae J. Messick, Katherin Barrow, Eileen Rollins, Margo McNeil, Shannon Schroeder, Jenalyn Scheib, Julie A. Plourde, Rosemary Cinquanti, Lisa Hering, Jacqueline M. Linville, Marie Willis, Janet E. Harper, Briget Rischawy, Beverly Merkel, DeEnna L. Matthews, Darlene C. Hanson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
May 31, 2013 Filing 128 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Wendy Alkire, Dorothy L. Ancona, Joy L. Anderson, Linda Armstrong, Ann Marie Armstrong-Deitch, Vickie Astudillo, Joy Christine Atwell, Cheryl Ayers, Brenda Bain, Cindy A. Baker-Spriggs, Terri Ballard, Michelle Bardo, Joy Bargerstock, Shannon Barnes, Alane M Barnes Garvik, Jennette Bastion (Horner), Deborah Bauer, Judith Bean, Cheryl Beauchamp, Deanne L. Becker, Jacqueline Becker, Sheryl J. Bell, JoAnne A. Benson, Angela R. Booth, Marilyn M. Bower, Carol Brake, Cheryl Shaw Briggs, Hope Brown, Susan Brown, Mary Christine Bryant, Judith A. Buckingham, Vicki Bunch, Diane Burgbacher, Shelly Buschman, Nancy Caldwell, Ronda Campbell, Jo Ellen Carnes, Linda Carucci, Margaret Cary, Kimberly Ceplenski, Jennifer Chandler, Barbara Ciulla, Kim Claeys, Harriet Sue Clarke, Theresa Clubb, Patricia Clunk, April E. Colleen, Nancy M Corcoran, Theresa Cosentino, LeAnn M. Cramer, Theresa M Crane, M. Susan Cunningham, Stephanie DeWitt, Laura Denio, Pamela J. Denny, Ana Derakshaw, Linda R. Dittmer, Sharon Dutton, Jessica Edwards, Lisa Edwards, Jessica Eik, Rosemary Elmore, Carol Failla, Melissa Fain, Donna Falco, Judy Fallon, Paula Ferguson, Mari J. Floyd, Denise Foell, Sheila R. Ford, Theresa D. Fox, Kimberly Freda, Debra R. Friess, Judith Gay, Kristine E. Genrich, Laurie Gianquinto, Diane Gibas, Cynthia C. Gibson, Karen Gland, Virginia Gomez, Linda Gray, Randi Gray, Deborah Guffey, Angela E. Hall, Mary Hall, Shannon Harbinson, Joanna Hardin, Rosemary Harrison, Nancy Haupt, Susan Haworth, Lynsi Henson, Dawn Hill, Lisa M. Hoefgen, Jason Hoffman, Cindy I. Holland, Cynthia S. Holley, Shara Howard, Melissa Howe, Mary Ann Hren, Michelle Hughes, Tammy Isham, Donna L. Jackson, Lorraine Jackson, Susan K. Janzen, Catherine R. Johnson-Berger, Julie A. Jones, Shannon Jones, Naomi I. Joslin, Linda M. Kalbac, Mary D. Kane, Mary Kleppin, Cheri Kline, Kathryn E. Lacey, Deborah J. Land, Joanne Lane, Rosemary Wood Langella, Coreen M. Larson, Patricia Lawson, Elaine Leach, Stacy S. Lee, Daphne M. Leibowitz, Carol Lindemon, Judy M. Lindquist, Amy L. Long, Alice Lovingood, Kathy M. Lucas, Judith Lugo, Joy Lutz, Jayden Nicole Lyons, Judith A. Mannarini, Denise Marie Byrne, Sarena Marques, Sherry Martin, Steven Martin, Linda Mathias, Jewel A. Mazur, Cheryl L. McAnich, Joy McLemore, Bobbi McMillin, Tina Mehler, Denise Melchior, Karen Milan, Carey L. Miller, Kathleen Moelter, Debra Ann Molitaris, Ann Moore, Janet Moore, Kimberly Moore, Pamela Morrow, Linda F. Morton, Juliene A. Munoz, Angela W. Myers, Penelope C. Neal, Ruth Lynn Neely, Janet M. Newsome, Veronica Nicholas, Carol A. Nigsarian, Theresa Ann O'Connor, Karla Ockerby, Wendi Ortiz, Brenda L. Osborne, Kelly Parsons, Betty M. Patton, Christie Patzer, Leona R. Payne, Dawn Pence, Diane Perryman, Catherine Probst, Brenda Pryczynski, Jacqueline Ratliff, Linda B. Ray, Sheila Reeser, Krissy Reynolds, Helen Ring, Eileen Roff, Lynda D. Romanek, Constance D. Salvia, Judith A. Sanders, Valerie B. Sawyer, Patricia A. Schmutz, Rosie Scott, Debra Seuell, Dawn Shaffer, Joy A Sharpe, Denise D. Shelby, Debra H. Sills, Debra Silviano, Janis B. Smith, Lisa Smith, Leslea Souvigney, Deborah L. Spittle, Jacqueline St. Georges, Melinda J. Stec, Leida Stewart, Cheryl Sullivan, Rachel Sweeney, Margaret Anne Thorpe, Debora Tolles, Penny Trammel-MacKenzie, Jamie Tullock, Susan E. Turley, Ellen D. Tyler, Tangela Tyran, Brian Varner, Deborah Waldman, Andrea Walton, Connie Watson, Carla Weiss, Susan Westlund, Carolyn White, Myrtis A. Whitely, Julie M. Wickersham, Sandra E. Williams, Darcy Wingler, Denise M. Zafuto, Rebecca L. Zentz, Carole Zmuda by Kevin J. Dolley (Dolley, Kevin)
May 31, 2013 Filing 127 NOTICE by Linda M. Kalbac, Debra Ann Molitaris, Denise M. Zafuto, Judith A. Sanders, Linda R. Dittmer, Linda F. Morton, Kathy M. Lucas, Melissa Howe, Kristine E. Genrich, Jacqueline Becker, Kimberly Freda, Deborah J. Land, Ronda Campbell, Rosie Scott, Carol A. Nigsarian, Joanne Lane, Randi Gray, Alice Lovingood, Valerie B. Sawyer, Denise D. Shelby, Julie A. Jones, April E. Colleen, Stephanie DeWitt, Rosemary Wood Langella, Catherine R. Johnson-Berger, Donna Falco, Theresa D. Fox, Rebecca L. Zentz, Ellen D. Tyler, Deborah L. Spittle, Nancy Caldwell, Debra R. Friess, Catherine Probst, Brian Varner, Cynthia S. Holley, Coreen M. Larson, Jennette Bastion (Horner), Angela E. Hall, Angela W. Myers, Cheryl Sullivan, Sheryl J. Bell, Elaine Leach, Marilyn M. Bower, Kathryn E. Lacey, Margaret Cary, Carey L. Miller, Dorothy L. Ancona, Debra Silviano, Sandra E. Williams, Naomi I. Joslin, Lisa M. Hoefgen, Cindy A. Baker-Spriggs, Melissa Fain, Brenda L. Osborne, Jewel A. Mazur, Daphne M. Leibowitz, Theresa Ann O'Connor, Deanne L. Becker, Hope Brown, Denise Foell, Judith Gay, Debra H. Sills, Janet Moore, Virginia Gomez, Lynda D. Romanek, Kim Claeys, Penelope C. Neal, Karen Gland, Vicki Bunch, Denise Melchior, Lorraine Jackson, Leida Stewart, Cheryl Shaw Briggs, Angela R. Booth, Ruth Lynn Neely, Constance D. Salvia, Michelle Bardo, Shannon Harbinson, Betty M. Patton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
May 30, 2013 Filing 126 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Wendy Alkire, Joy L. Anderson, Linda Armstrong, Ann Marie Armstrong-Deitch, Vickie Astudillo, Joy Christine Atwell, Cheryl Ayers, Brenda Bain, Terri Ballard, Joy Bargerstock, Shannon Barnes, Alane M Barnes Garvik, Deborah Bauer, Judith Bean, Cheryl Beauchamp, JoAnne A. Benson, Carol Brake, Susan Brown, Mary Christine Bryant, Judith A. Buckingham, Diane Burgbacher, Shelly Buschman, Jo Ellen Carnes, Linda Carucci, Kimberly Ceplenski, Jennifer Chandler, Barbara Ciulla, Harriet Sue Clarke, Theresa Clubb, Patricia Clunk, Nancy M Corcoran, Theresa Cosentino, LeAnn M. Cramer, Theresa M Crane, M. Susan Cunningham, Laura Denio, Pamela J. Denny, Ana Derakshaw, Sharon Dutton, Jessica Edwards, Lisa Edwards, Jessica Eik, Rosemary Elmore, Carol Failla, Judy Fallon, Paula Ferguson, Mari J. Floyd, Sheila R. Ford, Laurie Gianquinto, Diane Gibas, Cynthia C. Gibson, Linda Gray, Deborah Guffey, Mary Hall, Joanna Hardin, Rosemary Harrison, Nancy Haupt, Susan Haworth, Lynsi Henson, Dawn Hill, Jason Hoffman, Cindy I. Holland, Shara Howard, Mary Ann Hren, Michelle Hughes, Tammy Isham, Donna L. Jackson, Susan K. Janzen, Shannon Jones, Mary D. Kane, Mary Kleppin, Cheri Kline, Patricia Lawson, Stacy S. Lee, Carol Lindemon, Judy M. Lindquist, Amy L. Long, Judith Lugo, Joy Lutz, Jayden Nicole Lyons, Judith A. Mannarini, Denise Marie Byrne, Sarena Marques, Sherry Martin, Steven Martin, Linda Mathias, Cheryl L. McAnich, Joy McLemore, Bobbi McMillin, Tina Mehler, Karen Milan, Kathleen Moelter, Ann Moore, Kimberly Moore, Pamela Morrow, Juliene A. Munoz, Janet M. Newsome, Veronica Nicholas, Karla Ockerby, Wendi Ortiz, Kelly Parsons, Christie Patzer, Leona R. Payne, Dawn Pence, Diane Perryman, Brenda Pryczynski, Jacqueline Ratliff, Linda B. Ray, Sheila Reeser, Krissy Reynolds, Helen Ring, Eileen Roff, Patricia A. Schmutz, Debra Seuell, Dawn Shaffer, Joy A Sharpe, Janis B. Smith, Lisa Smith, Leslea Souvigney, Jacqueline St. Georges, Melinda J. Stec, Rachel Sweeney, Margaret Anne Thorpe, Debora Tolles, Penny Trammel-MacKenzie, Jamie Tullock, Susan E. Turley, Tangela Tyran, Deborah Waldman, Andrea Walton, Connie Watson, Carla Weiss, Susan Westlund, Carolyn White, Myrtis A. Whitely, Julie M. Wickersham, Darcy Wingler, Carole Zmuda by Kevin J. Dolley (Dolley, Kevin)
May 30, 2013 Filing 125 NOTICE by Joanna Hardin, Barbara Ciulla, Kelly Parsons, Rosemary Elmore, Cheri Kline, Cindy I. Holland, Melinda J. Stec, Joy Christine Atwell, Rosemary Harrison, Shannon Jones, Kimberly Ceplenski, Patricia A. Schmutz, Cynthia C. Gibson, Laurie Gianquinto, Jamie Tullock, Judith A. Buckingham, Judy M. Lindquist, Carole Zmuda, LeAnn M. Cramer, Susan E. Turley, Penny Trammel-MacKenzie, Sheila R. Ford, Deborah Bauer, Diane Gibas, Stacy S. Lee, Patricia Lawson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
May 29, 2013 Filing 124 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Wendy Alkire, Joy L. Anderson, Linda Armstrong, Ann Marie Armstrong-Deitch, Vickie Astudillo, Cheryl Ayers, Brenda Bain, Terri Ballard, Joy Bargerstock, Shannon Barnes, Alane M Barnes Garvik, Judith Bean, Cheryl Beauchamp, JoAnne A. Benson, Carol Brake, Susan Brown, Mary Christine Bryant, Diane Burgbacher, Shelly Buschman, Jo Ellen Carnes, Linda Carucci, Jennifer Chandler, Harriet Sue Clarke, Theresa Clubb, Patricia Clunk, Nancy M Corcoran, Theresa Cosentino, Theresa M Crane, M. Susan Cunningham, Laura Denio, Pamela J. Denny, Ana Derakshaw, Sharon Dutton, Jessica Edwards, Lisa Edwards, Jessica Eik, Carol Failla, Judy Fallon, Paula Ferguson, Mari J. Floyd, Linda Gray, Deborah Guffey, Mary Hall, Nancy Haupt, Susan Haworth, Lynsi Henson, Dawn Hill, Jason Hoffman, Shara Howard, Mary Ann Hren, Michelle Hughes, Tammy Isham, Donna L. Jackson, Susan K. Janzen, Mary D. Kane, Mary Kleppin, Carol Lindemon, Amy L. Long, Judith Lugo, Joy Lutz, Jayden Nicole Lyons, Judith A. Mannarini, Denise Marie Byrne, Sarena Marques, Sherry Martin, Steven Martin, Linda Mathias, Cheryl L. McAnich, Joy McLemore, Bobbi McMillin, Tina Mehler, Karen Milan, Kathleen Moelter, Ann Moore, Kimberly Moore, Pamela Morrow, Juliene A. Munoz, Janet M. Newsome, Veronica Nicholas, Karla Ockerby, Wendi Ortiz, Christie Patzer, Leona R. Payne, Dawn Pence, Diane Perryman, Brenda Pryczynski, Jacqueline Ratliff, Linda B. Ray, Sheila Reeser, Krissy Reynolds, Helen Ring, Eileen Roff, Debra Seuell, Dawn Shaffer, Joy A Sharpe, Janis B. Smith, Lisa Smith, Leslea Souvigney, Jacqueline St. Georges, Rachel Sweeney, Margaret Anne Thorpe, Debora Tolles, Tangela Tyran, Deborah Waldman, Andrea Walton, Connie Watson, Carla Weiss, Susan Westlund, Carolyn White, Myrtis A. Whitely, Julie M. Wickersham, Darcy Wingler by Kevin J. Dolley Attorney Appearance for Sherry Martin and Kimberly A. Moore (Dolley, Kevin)
May 29, 2013 Filing 123 NOTICE by Sherry Martin, Kimberly Moore (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
May 29, 2013 Filing 122 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Wendy Alkire, Joy L. Anderson, Linda Armstrong, Ann Marie Armstrong-Deitch, Vickie Astudillo, Cheryl Ayers, Brenda Bain, Terri Ballard, Joy Bargerstock, Shannon Barnes, Alane M Barnes Garvik, Judith Bean, Cheryl Beauchamp, JoAnne A. Benson, Carol Brake, Susan Brown, Mary Christine Bryant, Diane Burgbacher, Shelly Buschman, Jo Ellen Carnes, Linda Carucci, Jennifer Chandler, Harriet Sue Clarke, Theresa Clubb, Patricia Clunk, Nancy M Corcoran, Theresa Cosentino, Theresa M Crane, M. Susan Cunningham, Laura Denio, Pamela J. Denny, Ana Derakshaw, Sharon Dutton, Jessica Edwards, Lisa Edwards, Jessica Eik, Carol Failla, Judy Fallon, Paula Ferguson, Mari J. Floyd, Linda Gray, Deborah Guffey, Mary Hall, Nancy Haupt, Susan Haworth, Lynsi Henson, Dawn Hill, Jason Hoffman, Shara Howard, Mary Ann Hren, Michelle Hughes, Tammy Isham, Donna L. Jackson, Susan K. Janzen, Mary D. Kane, Mary Kleppin, Carol Lindemon, Amy L. Long, Judith Lugo, Joy Lutz, Jayden Nicole Lyons, Judith A. Mannarini, Denise Marie Byrne, Sarena Marques, Steven Martin, Linda Mathias, Cheryl L. McAnich, Joy McLemore, Bobbi McMillin, Tina Mehler, Karen Milan, Kathleen Moelter, Ann Moore, Pamela Morrow, Juliene A. Munoz, Janet M. Newsome, Veronica Nicholas, Karla Ockerby, Wendi Ortiz, Christie Patzer, Leona R. Payne, Dawn Pence, Diane Perryman, Brenda Pryczynski, Jacqueline Ratliff, Linda B. Ray, Sheila Reeser, Krissy Reynolds, Helen Ring, Eileen Roff, Debra Seuell, Dawn Shaffer, Joy A Sharpe, Janis B. Smith, Lisa Smith, Leslea Souvigney, Jacqueline St. Georges, Rachel Sweeney, Margaret Anne Thorpe, Debora Tolles, Tangela Tyran, Deborah Waldman, Andrea Walton, Connie Watson, Carla Weiss, Susan Westlund, Carolyn White, Myrtis A. Whitely, Julie M. Wickersham, Darcy Wingler by Kevin J. Dolley (Dolley, Kevin)
May 29, 2013 Filing 121 NOTICE by Wendy Alkire, Ann Marie Armstrong-Deitch, Cheryl Ayers, Brenda Bain, Terri Ballard, Alane M Barnes Garvik, Shannon Barnes, Carol Brake, Susan Brown, Shelly Buschman, Denise Marie Byrne, Linda Carucci, Harriet Sue Clarke, Nancy M Corcoran, Theresa M Crane, M. Susan Cunningham, Laura Denio, Pamela J. Denny, Sharon Dutton, Jessica Edwards, Jessica Eik, Paula Ferguson, Mari J. Floyd, Deborah Guffey, Lynsi Henson, Dawn Hill, Jason Hoffman, Mary Ann Hren, Donna L. Jackson, Susan K. Janzen, Mary D. Kane, Carol Lindemon, Amy L. Long, Joy Lutz, Jayden Nicole Lyons, Judith A. Mannarini, Sarena Marques, Cheryl L. McAnich, Bobbi McMillin, Tina Mehler, Kathleen Moelter, Ann Moore, Pamela Morrow, Juliene A. Munoz, Janet M. Newsome, Veronica Nicholas, Karla Ockerby, Wendi Ortiz, Christie Patzer, Leona R. Payne, Brenda Pryczynski, Linda B. Ray, Krissy Reynolds, Helen Ring, Eileen Roff, Debra Seuell, Joy A Sharpe, Janis B. Smith, Leslea Souvigney, Tangela Tyran, Andrea Walton, Connie Watson, Carla Weiss, Susan Westlund, Julie M. Wickersham, Carolyn White, Myrtis A. Whitely (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
May 29, 2013 Filing 120 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-8389787. (Vlasek, Jeffrey)
May 27, 2013 Filing 119 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mary Christine Bryant by Kevin J. Dolley (Dolley, Kevin)
May 27, 2013 Filing 118 NOTICE by Mary Christine Bryant (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
May 27, 2013 Filing 117 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cheryl Beauchamp by Kevin J. Dolley (Dolley, Kevin)
May 27, 2013 Filing 116 NOTICE by Cheryl Beauchamp (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
May 27, 2013 Filing 115 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Judith Bean by Kevin J. Dolley (Dolley, Kevin)
May 27, 2013 Filing 114 NOTICE by Judith Bean (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
May 27, 2013 Filing 113 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Vickie Astudillo by Kevin J. Dolley (Dolley, Kevin)
May 27, 2013 Filing 112 NOTICE by Vickie Astudillo (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
May 24, 2013 Filing 111 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michelle Hughes by Kevin J. Dolley (Dolley, Kevin)
May 24, 2013 Filing 110 NOTICE by Michelle Hughes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
May 24, 2013 Filing 109 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jo Ellen Carnes by Kevin J. Dolley (Dolley, Kevin)
May 24, 2013 Filing 108 NOTICE by Jo Ellen Carnes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
May 23, 2013 Filing 107 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Theresa Clubb by Kevin J. Dolley (Dolley, Kevin)
May 23, 2013 Filing 106 NOTICE by Theresa Clubb (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
May 23, 2013 Filing 105 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jennifer Chandler by Kevin J. Dolley (Dolley, Kevin)
May 23, 2013 Filing 104 NOTICE by Jennifer Chandler (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
April 16, 2013 Filing 103 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Clerk's Office is directed to strike minute entry dated 4/16/2013 [doc. 102] and replace it with corrected uploaded document. Mailed notice (cjg, )
April 16, 2013 Filing 102 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court concludes that notice shall be provided by U.S. Mail. In the likelihood that a certain number of notices will be returned as undeliverable, the defendant shall also provide to the plaintiffs, within 14 days of the date of entry of this order, the telephone numbers and e-mail addresses of the putative class members, which shall be used for the sole purpose of verifying the mailing addresses of the potential plaintiffs. The proposed notice is approved and the opt-in period shall be 90 days. Status is set for July 12, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (cjg, ) (Main Document 102 replaced on 4/17/2013 per court order dated 04/16/2013) (np, ).
April 12, 2013 Filing 101 Parties' Joint Position Statement STATEMENT by Theresa Cosentino (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
March 22, 2013 Filing 100 NOTICE by Carol Failla Notice of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
March 22, 2013 Filing 99 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Carol Failla by Kevin J. Dolley (Dolley, Kevin)
March 19, 2013 Filing 98 WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 3/19/2013: For the reasons stated below, the plaintiffs' motion to conditionally certify the class [72-1] is granted. The parties are directed to meet and confer within 14 days of the date of entry of this order regarding their positions on the contents of the form of the proposed notice and consent and the date and manner in which the putative plaintiffs' contact information will be disclosed to the plaintiffs. No more than 10 days after the meet and confer, the parties shall submit to the Court a joint position statement regarding the status of the notice and consent forms and disclosure of contact information, including authority for remaining disputed issues. Mailed notice (cjg, )
January 22, 2013 Filing 97 NOTICE by Ana Derakshaw Notice of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
January 22, 2013 Filing 96 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ana Derakshaw by Kevin J. Dolley (Dolley, Kevin)
December 15, 2012 Filing 95 REPLY by Theresa Cosentino to response in opposition to motion,,,, #90 (Dolley, Kevin)
December 11, 2012 Filing 94 RESPONSE by Transcend Services, Inc.in Support of MOTION by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. to strike exhibit,,,,, #74 1-15 #81 Reply in Support of its Motion to Strike Declarations in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chart)(Ellerson, Tracey)
December 11, 2012 Filing 93 NOTICE by Darcy Wingler Notice of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
December 11, 2012 Filing 92 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Darcy Wingler by Kevin J. Dolley (Dolley, Kevin)
December 6, 2012 Filing 91 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/15/12 before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy LaBella, 312-435-6890, Nancy_LaBella@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 12/27/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2013. (Labella, Nancy)
November 30, 2012 Filing 90 RESPONSE by Transcend Services, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Theresa Consentino to certify class Plaintiffs' Motion to Conditionally Certify Class, Order Disclosure of Putative Class Members' Names and Contact Information, and Facilitate Class Notice #72 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Armstrong Dep., #3 Exhibit 3 - Bargerstock Dep., #4 Exhibit 4 - Clunk Dep., #5 Exhibit 5 - Cosentino Dep., #6 Exhibit 6 - Edwards Dep., #7 Exhibit 7 - Howard Dep., #8 Exhibit 8 - Lugo Dep., #9 Exhibit 9 - Martin Dep., #10 Exhibit 10 - Mathias Dep., #11 Exhibit 11 - Milan Dep., #12 Exhibit 12 - Penco Dep., #13 Exhibit 13 - Smith Dep., #14 Exhibit 14 - Tolles Dep., #15 Exhibit 15 - Waldman Dep., #16 Exhibit 16 - E-Mail, #17 Exhibit 17 - E-Mail, #18 Exhibit 18 - Gulley Dep., #19 Exhibit 19 - Handbooks, #20 Exhibit 20 - Orientation, #21 Exhibit 21 - E-Mail, #22 Exhibit 22 - Chart, #23 Exhibit 23 - E-Mail, #24 Exhibit 24 - Chart, #25 Exhibit 25 - Powerpoint, #26 Exhibit 26 - Proposed NTC Description)(Ellerson, Tracey)
November 27, 2012 Filing 89 RESPONSE by Theresa Cosentino to MOTION by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. to strike exhibit,,,,, #74 1-15 #81 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Dolley, Kevin)
November 15, 2012 Filing 88 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Minute entry dated 11/15/12 [doc. 87] is corrected to read as follows: Motion hearing held on 11/15/2012. Motion by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. to compel #82 is denied as stated in open court. Reset deadlines as to motion by Plaintiff Theresa Consentino to certify class #72 : Response due by 11/30/2012. Reply due by 12/14/2012. Ruling by mail. Status hearing set for 12/3/12 is stricken. Mailed notice (cjg, )
November 15, 2012 Filing 87 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Motion hearing held on 11/15/2012. Motion by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. to compel #82 is granted as stated in open court. Reset deadlines as to motion by Plaintiff Theresa Consentino to certify class #72 : Response due by 11/30/2012. Reply due by 12/14/2012. Ruling to be by mail. Status hearing set for 12/3/12 is stricken. Mailed notice (cjg, )
November 14, 2012 Filing 86 RESPONSE by Theresa Consentinoin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. to compel Plaintiff's Production of Documents and Electronic Data Responsive to Transcend's First Request for Production of Documents #82 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Dolley, Kevin)
November 13, 2012 Filing 85 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Defendant's motion to exceed page limit [79-1] is granted in part. Defendant may file a response no more than 18 additional pages over the 15-page limit. Defendant's motion to strike [81-1] is taken under advisement. Plaintiff has 14 days to respond and defendant has 14 days thereafter to file a reply. Ruling by mail. Mailed notice (cjg, )
November 12, 2012 Filing 84 NOTICE of Motion by Tracey L. Ellerson for presentment of motion to strike,, motion for relief, #81 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 11/15/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Ellerson, Tracey)
November 12, 2012 Filing 83 NOTICE of Motion by Tracey L. Ellerson for presentment of motion to compel,,,,,, #82 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 11/15/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Ellerson, Tracey)
November 12, 2012 Filing 82 MOTION by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. to compel Plaintiff's Production of Documents and Electronic Data Responsive to Transcend's First Request for Production of Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Sample of Document Requests to Plaintiffs and Opt-in, #2 Exhibit B Sample of Plaintiffs Responses to the Defendants Document Requests, #3 Exhibit C - Correspondence from Dolley to Ellerson, Sept. 7, 2012, #4 Exhibit D Excerpts from the deposition of Judith Lugo, Sept. 24, 2012, #5 Exhibit E - Excerpts from the deposition of Debra Tolles, Oct. 2, 2012, #6 Exhibit F - Excerpts from the deposition of Linda Armstrong, Oct. 4, 2012, #7 Exhibit G Excerpts from the deposition of Linda Mathias, Oct. 15, 2012, #8 Exhibit H - Excerpts from the deposition of Patricia Clunk, Oct. 12, 2012, #9 Exhibit I - Excerpts from the deposition of Deborah Waldman, Sept. 25, 2012, #10 Exhibit J - Excerpts from the deposition of Theresa Consentino, Oct. 3, 2012, #11 Exhibit K - Excerpts from the deposition of Dawn Pence, Oct. 8, 2012, #12 Exhibit L - Correspondence from Cummins to Dolley, Oct. 12, 2012, #13 Exhibit M - Correspondence from Ellerson to Dolley, Oct. 16, 2012, #14 Exhibit N - Correspondence from Ellerson to Dolley, Oct. 17, 2012, #15 Exhibit O - Correspondence from Dolley in response to Cumminss Oct. 12, 2012, letter, #16 Exhibit P - Excerpts from the deposition of Dawn Pence, Oct. 8, 2012, #17 Exhibit Q - Excerpts from the deposition of Lisa Edwards, Sept. 26, 2012, #18 Exhibit R - Excerpts of blog postings relating to this lawsuit exist, #19 Exhibit S - Sample Email screenshots from Shara Howard Production)(Ellerson, Tracey)
November 12, 2012 Filing 81 MOTION by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. to strike exhibit,,,,, #74 1-15 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Requests for Production, #2 Exhibit B - First Set of Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit C - Responses to Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit D - Letter, #5 Exhibit E - Waldman deposition excerpt, #6 Exhibit F - Clunk deposition excerpt, #7 Exhibit G - Bargerstock deposition excerpt)(Ellerson, Tracey)
November 12, 2012 Filing 80 NOTICE of Motion by Tracey L. Ellerson for presentment of motion for leave to file #79 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 11/15/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Ellerson, Tracey)
November 12, 2012 Filing 79 MOTION by Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. for leave to file Unoppsed Motion for Leave to Exceed 15-Page Limit (Ellerson, Tracey)
November 12, 2012 Filing 78 NOTICE by JoAnne A. Benson to Become Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Benson Consent Form)(Koupal, Mark)
November 5, 2012 Filing 77 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court's order of November 5, 2012 [76-1] is amended to clarify that the Court grants leave to Plaintiffs to file 18 pages in excess of the normal 15-page limitation. The Court notes that parties filing motions seeking additional pages on the date the substantive motion is due do so at their own peril. Plaintiffs are admonished that in the future, motions seeking additional pages (particularly those seeking 18 additional pages) shall be filed well before the due date of the substantive motion in order to give the Court adequate time to consider the motion. Mailed notice (cjg, )
November 5, 2012 Filing 76 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Notice of motion set for 11/8/12 is stricken. Motion by Plaintiff Theresa Consentino for leave to file Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations for Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Certify FLSA Collective Class #70 is granted to and including 18 pages. Mailed notice (cjg, )
November 2, 2012 Filing 75 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman:Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7600790. (Obermeyer, Mark) #66 is granted. Motion for leave to appear #67 is stricken. Motion to appoint counsel #67 is stricken. Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7608428. (Moore, Samuel) #67 is granted. Mailed notice (cjg, )
November 2, 2012 Filing 74 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Theresa Consentino Exhibits in Support of Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Conditionally Certify Class, Order Disclosure of Putative Class Members' Names and Contact Information, and to Facilitate Class Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit, #52 Exhibit, #53 Exhibit, #54 Exhibit, #55 Exhibit, #56 Exhibit, #57 Exhibit, #58 Exhibit, #59 Exhibit, #60 Exhibit, #61 Exhibit, #62 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
November 2, 2012 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM by Theresa Consentino in support of motion to certify class, #72 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Conditionally Certify Class, Order Disclosure of Putative Class Members' Names and Contact Information, and to Facilitate Class Notice (Dolley, Kevin)
November 2, 2012 Filing 72 MOTION by Plaintiff Theresa Consentino to certify class Plaintiffs' Motion to Conditionally Certify Class, Order Disclosure of Putative Class Members' Names and Contact Information, and Facilitate Class Notice Responses due by 11/16/2012 (Dolley, Kevin)
November 2, 2012 Filing 71 NOTICE of Motion by Kevin J. Dolley for presentment of motion for leave to file #70 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 11/8/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Dolley, Kevin)
November 2, 2012 Filing 70 MOTION by Plaintiff Theresa Consentino for leave to file Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations for Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Certify FLSA Collective Class (Dolley, Kevin)
October 30, 2012 Filing 69 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 9/6/12 before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy LaBella, 312-435-6890, Nancy_LaBella@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 11/20/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2013. (Labella, Nancy)
October 30, 2012 Filing 68 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 7/25/12 before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy LaBella, 312-435-6890, Nancy_LaBella@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 11/20/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2013. (Labella, Nancy)
October 2, 2012 Filing 67 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice MOTION by Plaintiff Theresa Consentino for leave to appear as Pro Hac Vice Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, MOTION by Plaintiff Theresa Consentino to appoint counsel Samuel W. Moore, MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7608428. (Moore, Samuel)
September 28, 2012 Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7600790. (Obermeyer, Mark)
September 25, 2012 Filing 65 MOTION by Plaintiff Theresa Consentino to dismiss Plaintiff Mary Kleppin Without Prejudice (Dolley, Kevin)
September 14, 2012 Filing 64 MOTION by Plaintiffs Jacqueline St. Georges, Theresa Consentino to dismiss Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Party Plaintiffs Diane Burgbacher and Jacqueline St. Georges Without Prejudice (Dolley, Kevin)
September 14, 2012 Filing 63 MOTION by Plaintiffs Diane Burgbacher, Theresa Consentino to dismiss Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Party Plaintiffs Diane Burgbacher and Jacqueline St. Georges Without Prejudice (Dolley, Kevin)
September 11, 2012 Filing 62 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 09/06/2012 before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura Renke, CSR, RDR, CRR Contract Court Reporter 708.447.0905 laurarenke@hotmail.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/2/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/12/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/10/2012. (np, )
September 11, 2012 Filing 61 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Motion hearing held on 9/11/2012. Joint Motion for Extension of Time #56 is granted. Conditional certification discovery ordered closed by 10/19/2012. Class certification motion to be filed on or before 11/2/2012. Response due 11/16/12. Reply due 11/30/12. Ruling to be by mail. Status hearing set for 12/3/12 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (cjg, )
September 6, 2012 Filing 60 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Motion Hearing set for 9/18/12 is reset to 9/11/2012 at 09:30 AM. on request of parties as to joint motion for extension of discovery and briefing schedules #56 . Mailed notice (cjg, )
September 6, 2012 Filing 59 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Motion hearing held on 9/6/2012 regarding joint motion for extension of the discovery and briefing deadlines #56 and continued to 9/18/2012 at 09:30 AM. Lead counsel for all parties are ordered to be present. Mailed notice (cjg, )
September 5, 2012 Filing 58 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman:Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7499607. (Koupal, Mark) #49 is granted. Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7504952. (Shaughnessy, Kevin) #50 is granted. Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7508867. (Moran, Marilyn) #51 is granted. Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7509159. (Muldowney, Patrick) #52 is granted. Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7509381. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce) #53 is granted. Mailed notice (cjg, )
September 4, 2012 Filing 57 NOTICE of Motion by Kevin J. Dolley for presentment of extension of time #56 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 9/6/2012 at 09:15 AM. (Dolley, Kevin)
September 4, 2012 Filing 56 MOTION by Plaintiff Theresa Consentino for extension of time Joint Motion for Extension of Time (Dolley, Kevin)
August 31, 2012 Filing 55 NOTICE by Judy Fallon Notice of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
August 31, 2012 Filing 54 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Judy Fallon by Kevin J. Dolley Attorney Appearance Form (Dolley, Kevin)
August 31, 2012 Filing 53 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7509381. (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce)
August 31, 2012 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7509159. (Muldowney, Patrick)
August 31, 2012 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7508867. (Moran, Marilyn)
August 30, 2012 Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7504952. (Shaughnessy, Kevin)
August 29, 2012 Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7499607. (Koupal, Mark)
July 25, 2012 Filing 48 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7383998. (Cummins, Tiffany) #47 is granted. Mailed notice (cjg, )
July 25, 2012 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7383998. (Cummins, Tiffany)
July 25, 2012 Filing 46 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing held on 7/25/2012. Class discovery as stated in open court ordered closed by 9/24/2012. Class certification motion to be filed on or before 10/19/2012. Response due 11/2/12. Reply due 11/16/12. Ruling to be by mail. Mailed notice (cjg, )
July 23, 2012 Filing 45 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Linda Gray by Kevin J. Dolley (Dolley, Kevin)
July 23, 2012 Filing 44 NOTICE by Linda Gray Notice of Filing to Become Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
July 10, 2012 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman:Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7252830. Tracey L. Ellerson #36 and application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7252850. Gregory V. Mersol #37 are granted. Mailed notice (cjg, )
July 10, 2012 Filing 42 NOTICE by Mary Hall Notice of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
July 10, 2012 Filing 41 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mary Hall by Kevin J. Dolley (Dolley, Kevin)
July 9, 2012 Filing 40 NOTICE by Susan Haworth Notice of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Become Party Plaintiff)(Dolley, Kevin)
July 9, 2012 Filing 39 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Susan Haworth by Kevin J. Dolley (Dolley, Kevin)
July 5, 2012 Filing 38 Defendant's Amended ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by Transcend Services, Inc.(Hines, Erin)
June 13, 2012 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7252850. Gregory V. Mersol (Hines, Erin)
June 13, 2012 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7252830. Tracey L. Ellerson (Hines, Erin)
June 13, 2012 Filing 35 DEFENDANTS' DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Transcend Services, Inc. (Hines, Erin) (Docket Text modified by Clerks' Office.)
June 13, 2012 Filing 34 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to Defenses to Complaint by Transcend Services, Inc.(Hines, Erin) (Docket Text modified by Clerks' Office.)
June 13, 2012 Filing 33 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. by Erin Bolan Hines (Hines, Erin)
June 13, 2012 Filing 32 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Karen Milan by Kevin J. Dolley (Dolley, Kevin)
June 13, 2012 Filing 31 NOTICE by Karen Milan Notice of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
June 13, 2012 Filing 30 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Joy L. Anderson, Linda Armstrong, Joy Bargerstock, Diane Burgbacher, Patricia Clunk, Theresa Consentino, Lisa Edwards, Nancy Haupt, Shara Howard, Tammy Isham, Mary Kleppin, Judith Lugo, Steven Martin, Linda Mathias, Joy McLemore, Dawn Pence, Diane Perryman, Jacqueline Ratliff, Sheila Reeser, Dawn Shaffer, Lisa Smith, Jacqueline St. Georges, Rachel Sweeney, Margaret Anne Thorpe, Debora Tolles, Deborah Waldman by Kevin J. Dolley (Dolley, Kevin)
June 13, 2012 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa Consentino as to Transcend Services, Inc. on 05/23/2012, answer due 06/13/2012(Dolley, Kevin) (Docket Text modified by Clerks' Office.)
June 12, 2012 Filing 28 NOTICE of Correction regarding #9 , #10 , #11 , #12 , #13 , #14 . (psm, )
June 12, 2012 Filing 27 NOTICE by Margaret Anne Thorpe Notice of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
June 12, 2012 Filing 26 NOTICE by Rachel Sweeney Notice of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
June 12, 2012 Filing 25 NOTICE by Lisa Smith Notice of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
June 12, 2012 Filing 24 NOTICE by Dawn Shaffer Notice of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
June 12, 2012 Filing 23 NOTICE by Sheila Reeser Notice of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
June 12, 2012 Filing 22 NOTICE by Jacqueline Ratliff Notice of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
June 12, 2012 Filing 21 NOTICE by Diane Perryman Notice of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
June 12, 2012 Filing 20 NOTICE by Joy McLemore Notice of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
June 12, 2012 Filing 19 NOTICE by Steven Martin Notice of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
June 12, 2012 Filing 18 NOTICE by Tammy Isham Notice of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
June 12, 2012 Filing 17 NOTICE by Shara Howard Notice of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
June 12, 2012 Filing 16 NOTICE by Nancy Haupt Notice of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
June 12, 2012 Filing 15 NOTICE by Joy L. Anderson Notice of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
June 12, 2012 Filing 14 MOTION by Plaintiff Joy McLemore for joinder Notice of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
June 12, 2012 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Martin for joinder Notice of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
June 12, 2012 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiff Tammy Isham for joinder Notice of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
June 12, 2012 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Shara Howard for joinder Notice of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
June 12, 2012 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Nancy Haupt for joinder Notice of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
June 12, 2012 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Joy L. Anderson for joinder Notice of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dolley, Kevin)
June 12, 2012 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Armstrong as to All Defendants. (Dolley, Kevin)
June 12, 2012 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Linda Armstrong, Joy Bargerstock, Diane Burgbacher, Patricia Clunk, Theresa Consentino, Lisa Edwards, Mary Kleppin, Judith Lugo, Linda Mathias, Dawn Pence, Jacqueline St. Georges, Debora Tolles, Deborah Waldman by Kevin J. Dolley Entry Of Appearance (Dolley, Kevin)
May 31, 2012 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Linda Armstrong, Joy Bargerstock, Diane Burgbacher, Patricia Clunk, Theresa Consentino, Lisa Edwards, Mary Kleppin, Judith Lugo, Linda Mathias, Dawn Pence, Jacqueline St. Georges, Debora Tolles, Deborah Waldman by Russell C Riggan Entry of Appearance (Riggan, Russell)
May 29, 2012 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman:Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7143620 Kevin J. Dolley #3 is granted. Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7143634 Russell C. Riggan #4 is granted. The Court orders the parties to appear for an initial status hearing. All parties shall refer to and comply with Judge Guzman's requirements for the initial appearance as outlined in Judge Guzman's case management procedures, which can be found at: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Status hearing set for 7/25/2012 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (cjg, )
May 11, 2012 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Transcend Services, Inc. (ma,)
May 11, 2012 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Martin C. Ashman. (daj, )
May 11, 2012 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7143634. (Sciara, Anthony)
May 11, 2012 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7143620. (Sciara, Anthony)
May 11, 2012 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sciara, Anthony)
May 11, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Lisa Edwards, Jacqueline St. Georges, Joy Bargerstock, Mary Kleppin, Linda Mathias, Debora Tolles, Linda Armstrong, Judith Lugo, Diane Burgbacher, Theresa Consentino, Deborah Waldman, Dawn Pence, Patricia Clunk; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-7143359. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff Consent Form, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff Consent Form, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff Consent Form, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff Consent Form, #5 Exhibit Plaintiff Consent Form, #6 Exhibit Plaintiff Consent Form, #7 Exhibit Plaintiff Consent Form, #8 Exhibit Plaintiff Consent Form, #9 Exhibit Plaintiff Consent Form, #10 Exhibit Plaintiff Consent Form, #11 Exhibit Plaintiff Consent Form, #12 Exhibit Plaintiff Consent Form, #13 Exhibit Plaintiff Consent Form)(Sciara, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cosentino et al v. Transcend Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra L. Zier-Teitler
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret E. Mackey
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denese Dugay
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Seuell
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christie Patzer
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth A. Sennett
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie A. Plum
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Lynn Neely
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Faye Worrell
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April G. Marx
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Rathmann
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty M. Patton
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Silver
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Thomas
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Miller
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl L. McAnich
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Hicks
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Rutkowski
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy M. Lindquist
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela McCord
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Poole
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debora Tolles
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Anthony M. Sciara
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Represented By: Russell C Riggan
Represented By: Mark Anthony Koupal, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Joseph Obermeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Coelho
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy M Corcoran
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Silviano
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Caldwell
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tangela Tyran
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Lane
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Christine Bryant
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Bain
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeEnna L. Matthews
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherie S. Price-Palmer
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronda Campbell
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl Wise
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Todd
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristi Stanford
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine E. Genrich
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keula Francis Kilgore
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry L. Wilson
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Roff
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie A. Jones
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline St. Georges
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Anthony M. Sciara
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Represented By: Russell C Riggan
Represented By: Mark Anthony Koupal, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Joseph Obermeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla Ockerby
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Brewer
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy A Sharpe
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Becker
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Ring
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyesha Mustin
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Fisher
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paige Singleton
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Tilton
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet A. Henkel
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Pryczynski
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan P. Surprise
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Failla
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Williams
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Forsythe
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian V Ramos
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Burgbacher
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Anthony M. Sciara
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Represented By: Russell C Riggan
Represented By: Mark Anthony Koupal, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Joseph Obermeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Claeys
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Brush
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn T. O'Connor
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Sullivan
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila R. Ford
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Slater Clark
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lecia Ropp
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carey L. Miller
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Swaim
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance A. Duncan
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee T. Long
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna L. Robinson
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Chandler
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Crocker-Hendrickson
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Robertson
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer L. Dick
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julianne Patton
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia S. Holley
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Eik
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Gomez
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra L. Burns
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Ferguson
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne M. Bailey
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Ryden
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alane M Barnes Garvik
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita A. Defino
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Bianchini
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Storm
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy M. Hopper
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Williams
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole J. Boom
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Scaia
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcela C. DeBano
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Mathias
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Anthony M. Sciara
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Represented By: Russell C Riggan
Represented By: Mark Anthony Koupal, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Joseph Obermeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Ceplenski
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna J. Alexander
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracie Stutzman
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie S. Smith
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda J. Stec
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Solorza
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Ballentine
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia A. Dickerson
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Gianquinto
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Anne Thorpe
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Anthony M. Sciara
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Represented By: Russell C Riggan
Represented By: Mark Anthony Koupal, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Joseph Obermeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joni Joyner
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janis B. Smith
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rise Fritz
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Ratajczak
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra G. Still
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Montgomery
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Wilson
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Dutton
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Wagner
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly V. Tallitsch
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynda D. Romanek
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Reid Wooten Simpson
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Clubb
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah L. Spittle
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellie L. Campbell
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara A. Stark
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca S. Cameron
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Gersie-Scott
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen P. Irwin
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy S. Lefils
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Barnes
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean M. Shang
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne A. Pedersen
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Rollins
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Vitari
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette D. Pruett
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Tipton
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Simmons
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelli Fisher
Represented By: Kevin J. Dolley
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times |