Munive v. Town of Cicero et al

Plaintiff: G. Cesar Munive
Defendant: Town of Cicero, Schullo and Other Unknown Cicero Police Officers
Case Number: 1:2012cv05481
Filed: July 11, 2012
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Samuel Der-Yeghiayan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2016 349 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. The Court denies Cicero's motion for reconsideration, or in the alternative, to certify interlocutory appeal or bifurcate 339 and Garrity's motion for leave to file a motion to bifurcate claims 345 . Defenda nts may file motions to bifurcate, if appropriate, after motions in limine are decided. The briefing schedule on Garrity's motion to bifurcate 347 is vacated. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 1/25/2016. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
December 21, 2015 343 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. The Court rejects Cicero's alternative arguments in support of its motion for summary judgment on plaintiff's negligent hiring and supervision claims. The Court's December 1, 2015 order reinstating those claims against Cicero stands. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/21/2015. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
December 1, 2015 336 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. The Court grants in part and strikes as moot in part plaintiff's motion for reconsideration or to certify interlocutory appeal 334 . The motion for reconsideration is granted, the Court vacates the portion of its October 19, 2015 Memorandum Opinion and Order granting summary judgment to Cicero on plaintiff's negligent hiring claims (Counts VIII and IX), and reinstates those claims against Cicero. Plaintiff's motion to certify an interlocutory appeal is stricken as moot. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/1/2015. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
October 19, 2015 331 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. The Court overrules plaintiff's objections to Magistrate Judge Schenkier's Order 302 and grants Cicero's motion for summary judgment on Counts VIII and IX of the third amended complaint 292 . Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 10/19/2015. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
August 21, 2015 300 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 8/21/2015. Mailed notice.(jj, )
August 3, 2015 286 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 8/3/2015. Mailed notice.(jj, )
January 14, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Arlander Keys on 1/14/2014. Mailed notice(tlp, )
March 28, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Arlander Keys on 3/28/2013: Mailed notice(ac, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munive v. Town of Cicero et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. Cesar Munive
Represented By: Daniel J. Stohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Cicero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other Unknown Cicero Police Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?