Hardy v. Quinn et al
Plaintiff: |
Nedrick Jeffrey Hardy, Sr |
Defendant: |
Pat Quinn, Salvador Godinez, State Of Illinois, Marcus Hardy, Jerry Baldwin, Luschinger, Gladye C Tayler, Colleen Franklin and Wexford Health Sources Inc. |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv06033 |
Filed: |
July 31, 2012 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois |
Office: |
Chicago Office |
County: |
Will |
Presiding Judge: |
Edmond E. Chang |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 12, 2017 |
Filing
130
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/12/2017.(gcy, )
|
May 9, 2013 |
Filing
19
WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/9/2013: Plaintiff may proceed with his amended complaint 16 against Stateville Counselor Jerry Baldwin, Grievance Officer Colleen Franklin, Chief Engineer G. Luschinger, former Warden Marcus Hardy, former and current IDOC Directors Gladye Taylor and Salvador Godinez. The clerk shall issue summonses for service of the amended complaint on these Defendants. Wexford Health Sources, as well as any other Defendant listed in the amended complaint or that is still listed on the docket from Plaintiff previous complaint, is dismissed. Mailed notices. (For further details see text below.)(pcs, )
|
February 7, 2013 |
Filing
8
WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 2/7/2013: Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [R 3 ] is granted. The Court authorizes and orders the trust fund officer at Plaintiffs place of incarceration to deduct $8.44 from Plaintiff's account for payment to the Clerk of Court as an initial partial filing fee, and to continue making monthly deductions in accordance with this order. The Clerk shall send a copy of this order to the trust fund office r at the Stateville Correctional Center. The complaint is dismissed without prejudice to Plaintiff's submitting an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this order. Plaintiff's failure to comply timely with this order will resu lt in summary dismissal of this case. The clerk is directed to send Plaintiff an amended complaint form. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction [R 4 ] is denied. His motion for the appointment of counsel [R 6 ] is denied. Mailed notices. (For further details see opinion.)(pcs, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?