Yellow Group LLC et al v. Uber Technologies, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Yellow Group LLC, Yellow Cab Affiliation Inc., Taxi Affiliation Services LLC, YC1 LLC, 5 Star Flash, Inc., Chicago Medallion One LLC and Your Private Limousine, Inc.
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv07967
Filed: October 4, 2012
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 18, 2015 139 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (jl)
May 26, 2015 138 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Status hearing held on 5/26/2015. The Court grants Plaintiffs' oral motion to voluntarily dismiss this action under F.R.C.P 41(a). Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (rj, )
May 18, 2015 137 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: At the parties' request, Status hearing set for 5/21/2015 is stricken and reset to 5/26/2015 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (rj, )
May 7, 2015 136 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Status hearing held on 5/7/15. The parties report this case is not in a settlement posture at this point in time. Accordingly, the settlement referral will be terminated and this case is returned to the assigned District Judge. If, as and when the parties would like to generate a new settlement referral, counsel shall inform the District Judge and a new settlement referral can be generated. Referral terminated. Mailed notice (ber, )
March 19, 2015 135 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION NO. 53. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 3/19/2015:Mailed notice(rj, )
March 12, 2015 133 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: At the parties' request, the status hearing set for 3/18/15 at 9:00 a.m. is stricken and reset for 5/7/15 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (lp, )
March 11, 2015 134 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Status hearing held on 3/11/2015. Parties report that discovery is ongoing. Status hearing set for 5/21/2015 at 1:30 PM to report on settlement.Mailed notice (rj, )
January 29, 2015 132 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/16/14 before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Court Reporter Contact Information: TRACEY D. McCULLOUGH, 312-435-5570, Tracey_Mccullough@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/2/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/29/2015. (Mccullough, Tracey)
January 27, 2015 131 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Status hearing held on 1/27/15 concerning the realistic possibility of settlement. Off-the record discussions held with counsel. Continued status hearing set for 3/18/15 at 9:00 a.m. If this date and time chosen unilaterally by the Court presents a conflict for counsel, they jointly should contact the Court's courtroom deputy to reschedule. Mailed notice (ber, )
January 7, 2015 130 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Per the Court's order entered on 12/16/14 129 , lead counsel for both parties, Michael Stiegel and Stephen Swedlow, confirmed a status hearing for 1/27/15 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ber, )
December 16, 2014 129 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Status hearing held on 12/16/14. Lead counsel for both parties, Michael A. Stiegel and Stephen A. Swedlow, shall call the Court's courtroom deputy to arrange a status hearing for a time convenient for counsel and the Court to discuss whether it makes sense for the parties to devote further efforts to the possibility of settlement. Mailed notice (ber, )
December 3, 2014 128 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Motion hearing held on 12/3/2014. Joint motion regarding discovery to compel Defendant Uber to respond to interrogatories and produce documents 126 is granted. Defendant, Uber to respond by 2/3/2015. Mailed notice (rj, )
November 24, 2014 127 NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Stiegel for presentment of motion to compel,, 126 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 12/3/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Stiegel, Michael)
November 24, 2014 126 MOTION by Plaintiffs 5 Star Flash, Inc., Chicago Medallion Eleven LLC, Chicago Medallion Five LLC, Chicago Medallion One LLC, Chicago Medallion Seven LLC, Chicago Medallion Six LLC, Taxi Affiliation Services LLC, Taxi Medallion Management, LLC, YC1 LLC, YC17 LLC, YC18 LLC, YC19 LLC, YC2 LLC, YC20 LLC, YC21 LLC, YC22 LLC, YC25 LLC, YC26 LLC, YC29 LLC, YC32 LLC, YC37 LLC, YC49 LLC, YC51 LLC, YC52 LLC, YC56 LLC, Yellow Cab Affiliation Inc., Yellow Group LLC, Your Private Limousine, Inc. to compel Defendant Uber to Respond to Interrogatories and Produce Documents (Stiegel, Michael)
September 9, 2014 125 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Status hearing held on 9/9/2014. Plaintiffs to file amended complaint by 10/9/2014. Discovery schedule: 26(a) disclosures due by 9/30/2014; written discovery to issue by 10/10/2014; fact discovery closes on 7/3/2015. Next status date set for 3/11/2015 at 9:30AM and parties are to report on settlement. As stated in open court, most significant depositions to be taken and documents exchanged by 10/9/2014. Mailed notice (rj, )
September 3, 2014 124 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Off the record and in person conference held with counsel to discuss the status of settlement discussions. No progress has been made. The parties are unable to agree informally to exchange information that would enable Plaintiffs to make a settlement demand. Defendant reports that it would like to proceed with formal discovery and revisit the possibility of settlement at a later date. The settlement referral will remain open, and a status hearing is set for 12/16/14 at 10:00 a.m. If the parties agree that they would like to schedule a settlement conference prior to the next status hearing, counsel JOINTLY should call the Court's courtroom deputy to schedule an earlier status hearing. Mailed notice (ber, )
August 29, 2014 123 AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY Order Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 8/29/2014.(mr, )
August 19, 2014 122 Notice of Withdrawal of Andrew H. Schapiro As Counsel by Uber Technologies, Inc. (Patel, Amit)
July 30, 2014 121 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Motion hearing held on 7/30/2014. Motion to reassign case 118 is denied without prejudice as stated in open court. Status hearing set for 8/13/14 is reset to 9/9/2014 at 09:30 AM. (lcw, )
July 24, 2014 120 ANSWER to amended complaint by Uber Technologies, Inc.(Swedlow, Stephen)
July 24, 2014 119 NOTICE of Motion by Edward W. Feldman for presentment of motion to reassign case, 118 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 7/30/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Feldman, Edward)
July 24, 2014 118 MOTION by Movant Illinois Transportation Trade Association plaintiffs in a related case to reassign case no. 14 cv 827 as related to this case (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A -- Part 2, # 3 Exhibit A -- Part 3, # 4 Exhibit B)(Feldman, Edward)
July 24, 2014 117 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant Illinois Transportation Trade Association plaintiffs in a related case by Edward W. Feldman (Feldman, Edward)
July 16, 2014 116 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Status hearing held on 7/16/14 and continued to 9/3/14 at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiffs' counsel reported they are planning to amend their complaint but they do not see that as being a material impediment to a settlement conference. Defendant also is willing to proceed with a settlement conference. Accordingly, the parties will meet and confer in an effort to agree on the production of documents and information that will aid them in assessing their respective settlement positions. The parties will report on their progress at the next status hearing and the Court will set additional dates in connection with this settlement referral as appropriate at that hearing. Mailed notice (ber, )
July 15, 2014 115 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice 114 is granted. Arthur Roberts is granted leave to appear on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc. (lcw, )
July 14, 2014 114 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9666685. (Roberts, Arthur)
July 10, 2014 113 Featured Case OPINION and Order. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 7/10/2014.(lcw, )
July 10, 2014 112 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Ubers motion to dismiss 89 is granted in part and denied in part. The Court grants the motion to dismiss the claims of the Taxi Affiliation Plaintiffs in Counts I and IV regarding alleged misrepresentations of insurance coverage. The Court denies the motion to dismiss with regard to all other claims by the Taxi Affiliation Plaintiffs. The Court further grants the motion to dismiss Your Private Limousines claims in Counts II, III, and V. Your Private Limousines claims in Counts I, IV, and VI survive. Finally, the Court dismisses all claims by the Medallion Owner Plaintiffs. All claims dismissed are dismissed without prejudice. (lcw, )
June 12, 2014 110 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert:Status hearing held on 6/12/14 and continued 7/16/14 at 10:15 a.m. Mailed notice (ber, )
June 11, 2014 111 STIPULATION and Order Regarding Case Schedule. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 6/11/2014. Fact discovery ordered closed 1/13/2015. Opening expert reports on issues on which the proponent bears the burden of proof by 2/23/2015. Rebuttal expert reports by 4/20/2015. Expert discovery ordered closed 5/14/2015. Deadline for filing any dispositive motions and Daubert challenges by 6/18/2015. Pretrial Conference and Trial to be set at a later date. Mailed notice(rj, )
May 22, 2014 108 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Case Schedule (Swedlow, Stephen)
May 21, 2014 107 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Gilbert to conduct a settlement conference. Status hearing scheduled for 6/12/14 at 11:00 a.m. Prior to the status hearing, the parties shall familiarize themselves with the subjects referenced in Magistrate Judge Gilbert's Standing Order for Settlement Conference posted on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges as applicable to referral cases. If the parties would like to schedule a date for a settlement conference prior to the status hearing, they shall contact the Court's chambers at 312-435-5672, to obtain dates the Court has available to conduct a settlement conference. The status hearing will proceed regardless of whether a date has been reserved for a settlement conference. Mailed notice (ber, )
May 15, 2014 109 Agreed Confidentiality Order. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 5/15/2014. Mailed notice(rj, )
May 15, 2014 106 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: settlement conference. (rj, )Mailed notice.
May 15, 2014 105 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Status hearing held on 5/15/2014. Motion for order 103 is granted. Enter Agreed Confidentiality Order. Status hearing set for 8/13/2014 at 9:30 AM. Parties to submit revised discovery schedule by 5/23/2014. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Gilbert for settlement conference. Mailed notice (rj, )
May 7, 2014 104 NOTICE of Motion by Stephen A. Swedlow for presentment of motion for order 103 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 5/15/2014 at 01:30 PM. (Swedlow, Stephen)
April 24, 2014 103 MOTION by Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. for order of confidentiality entered unopposed (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - confidentiality order (clean), # 2 Exhibit 2 - confidentiality order (redline))(Swedlow, Stephen)
March 28, 2014 102 SUPPLEMENT to response in opposition to motion,, 96 Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Stiegel, Michael)
March 17, 2014 101 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis:On the Court's own motion, Status hearing set for 3/20/2014 is stricken and reset to 5/15/2014 at 1:30 PM. Mailed notice (rj, )
March 10, 2014 100 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: TIME CHANGE. Status hearing set for 3/20/2014 at 9:30 AM is stricken and reset to 3/20/2014 at 1:30 PM. Mailed notice (rj, )
February 21, 2014 99 REPLY by Uber Technologies, Inc. to response in opposition to motion,, 96 (Swedlow, Stephen)
February 20, 2014 98 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs OF FILING (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Coble, Paul)
February 10, 2014 97 NOTICE by Uber Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Swedlow, Stephen)
January 31, 2014 96 RESPONSE by 5 Star Flash, Inc., Chicago Medallion Eleven LLC, Chicago Medallion Five LLC, Chicago Medallion One LLC, Chicago Medallion Seven LLC, Chicago Medallion Six LLC, Taxi Affiliation Services LLC, Taxi Medallion Management, LLC, YC1 LLC, YC17 LLC, YC18 LLC, YC19 LLC, YC2 LLC, YC20 LLC, YC21 LLC, YC22 LLC, YC25 LLC, YC26 LLC, YC29 LLC, YC32 LLC, YC37 LLC, YC49 LLC, YC51 LLC, YC52 LLC, YC56 LLC, Yellow Cab Affiliation Inc., Yellow Group LLC, Your Private Limousine, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM 89 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Stiegel, Michael)
January 13, 2014 95 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Stiegel, Michael)
January 9, 2014 94 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Plaintiffs and Defendants motion for an extension of time to and including 1/13/2014 to exchange Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures and to submit discovery plan 92 is granted. Mailed notice (rj, )
January 3, 2014 93 NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Stiegel for presentment of extension of time,, 92 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 1/9/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Stiegel, Michael)
January 3, 2014 92 MOTION by Plaintiffs 5 Star Flash, Inc., Chicago Medallion Eleven LLC, Chicago Medallion Five LLC, Chicago Medallion One LLC, Chicago Medallion Seven LLC, Chicago Medallion Six LLC, Taxi Affiliation Services LLC, Taxi Medallion Management, LLC, YC1 LLC, YC17 LLC, YC18 LLC, YC19 LLC, YC2 LLC, YC20 LLC, YC21 LLC, YC22 LLC, YC25 LLC, YC26 LLC, YC29 LLC, YC32 LLC, YC37 LLC, YC49 LLC, YC51 LLC, YC52 LLC, YC56 LLC, Yellow Cab Affiliation Inc., Yellow Group LLC, Your Private Limousine, Inc. for extension of time (Agreed) (Stiegel, Michael)
January 3, 2014 91 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs 5 Star Flash, Inc., Chicago Medallion Eleven LLC, Chicago Medallion Five LLC, Chicago Medallion One LLC, Chicago Medallion Seven LLC, Chicago Medallion Six LLC, Taxi Affiliation Services LLC, Taxi Medallion Management, LLC, YC1 LLC, YC17 LLC, YC18 LLC, YC19 LLC, YC2 LLC, YC20 LLC, YC21 LLC, YC22 LLC, YC25 LLC, YC26 LLC, YC29 LLC, YC32 LLC, YC37 LLC, YC49 LLC, YC51 LLC, YC52 LLC, YC56 LLC, Yellow Cab Affiliation Inc., Yellow Group LLC, Your Private Limousine, Inc. by Zachary J Watters (Watters, Zachary)
December 27, 2013 90 MEMORANDUM by Uber Technologies, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 89 (Attachments: # 1 Electronic Database Authority)(Swedlow, Stephen)
December 27, 2013 89 MOTION by Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Swedlow, Stephen)
December 18, 2013 88 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Motion hearing held on 12/18/2013. Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. motion to dismiss 82 is denied as moot. Motion to seal document 84 is withdrawn. Defendant's amended motion to dismiss is due by 12/27/2013. Responses due by 1/31/2014. Replies due by 2/21/2014. Ruling by mail. Status hearing set for 2/12/2014 is stricken and reset to 3/20/2014 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (rj, )
December 16, 2013 87 NOTICE of Motion by Stephen A. Swedlow for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction 82 , motion to seal document 84 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 12/18/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Swedlow, Stephen)
December 16, 2013 86 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Notice of motion [#85] setting motions [#82]and [#84] for 12/17/2013 at 9:30AM is vacated. Judge Ellis requires three (3) business days for noticed motions. Mailed notice (rj, )
December 13, 2013 85 NOTICE of Motion by Stephen A. Swedlow for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction 82 , motion to seal document 84 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 12/17/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Swedlow, Stephen)
December 13, 2013 84 MOTION by Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. to seal document (Swedlow, Stephen)
December 12, 2013 83 MEMORANDUM by Uber Technologies, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction 82 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Amit B. Patel, # 2 Exhibit A-E, # 3 Declaration Andrew Macdonald)(Swedlow, Stephen)
December 12, 2013 82 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION by Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Swedlow, Stephen)
December 11, 2013 81 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: MOTION by Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. for leave to exceed page limit for briefing of Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc's motion to dismiss 79 is granted. Defendant's motion to dismiss shall not exceed 20 pages. Plaintiff's response is limited to 15 pages. Mailed notice (rj, )
December 9, 2013 80 NOTICE of Motion by Stephen A. Swedlow for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 79 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 12/12/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Swedlow, Stephen)
December 9, 2013 79 MOTION by Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. for leave to file excess pages (Swedlow, Stephen)
November 14, 2013 78 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Status hearing held on 11/14/2013 and continued to 2/12/2014 at 09:30 AM. MOTION by Plaintiffs 5 Star Flash, Inc., Chicago Medallion One LLC, Taxi Affiliation Services LLC, YC1 LLC, Yellow Cab Affiliation Inc., Yellow Group LLC, Your Private Limousine, Inc. for leave to file Second Amended Complaint 76 is granted. Defendant to answer or otherwise plead by 12/12/2013. Briefing schedule as to Defendant's motion to dismiss: Response by 1/13/2014. Reply by 1/31/2014. Parties to exchange Rule 26(a) disclosures and submit a discovery plan to the Court by 1/6/2014. Mailed notice (rj, )
November 14, 2013 77 SECOND AMENDED complaint by Chicago Medallion One LLC, Taxi Affiliation Services LLC, Your Private Limousine, Inc., Yellow Cab Affiliation Inc., YC1 LLC, Yellow Group LLC, 5 Star Flash, Inc. against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Stiegel, Michael)
November 12, 2013 76 MOTION by Plaintiffs 5 Star Flash, Inc., Chicago Medallion One LLC, Taxi Affiliation Services LLC, YC1 LLC, Yellow Cab Affiliation Inc., Yellow Group LLC, Your Private Limousine, Inc. for leave to file Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Stiegel, Michael)
November 7, 2013 75 STATUS Report (Initial, for Reassigned Case) by 5 Star Flash, Inc., Chicago Medallion One LLC, Taxi Affiliation Services LLC, YC1 LLC, Yellow Cab Affiliation Inc., Yellow Group LLC, Your Private Limousine, Inc. (Coble, Paul)
November 6, 2013 74 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Reassignment Joint Status Conference set for 11/14/2013 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (rj, )
November 4, 2013 73 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Plaintiff's unopposed motion for an extension of time to file motion to amend the complaint by 11/12/13 72 is granted. Mailed notice (rj, )
October 31, 2013 72 MOTION by Plaintiffs 5 Star Flash, Inc., Chicago Medallion One LLC, Taxi Affiliation Services LLC, YC1 LLC, Yellow Cab Affiliation Inc., Yellow Group LLC, Your Private Limousine, Inc. for extension of time to file motion to amend complaint (UNOPPOSED) (Coble, Paul)
October 30, 2013 71 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc's agreed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead 21 days after service of Second Amended Complaint 68 is granted. Mailed notice (rj, )
October 28, 2013 70 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sara L. Ellis: This case has been re-assigned to the calendar of Judge Sara L. Ellis. All previously set status dates are stricken. All previously set discovery schedules remain intact. All previously set briefing schedules remain intact. Parties will not be required to file proposed orders along with their motions. All noticed motion dates are vacated. The Court will set new dates for filed but un-noticed motions at the reassignment joint status conference. The parties are directed not to notice any motions, with the exception of emergency motions, prior to appearing at the reassignment joint status conference. For all emergency motions arising prior to the date scheduled for the reassignment joint status conference, the parties are directed to contact chambers.To help the Court learn about the case, it is hereby ordered that within 10 calendar days of this order's entry, counsel are to confer, prepare, and file a joint status report, not to exceed five pages. If the defendant's counsel has not yet filed an appearance, the status report should be prepared by the plaintiff's counsel. The report shall contain the information requested in the attached Initial Status Report For Reassigned Case in the format provided. Mailed notice (Attachments: # 1 status) (ma,)
October 23, 2013 69 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that, pursuant to the Executive Committee Order entered on October 15, 2013, the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Sara L. Ellis, therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 291 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this order shall become effective on Thursday, October 24, 2013. Case reassigned to the Honorable Sara Lee Ellis for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/23/2013. (td, )
October 10, 2013 68 MOTION by Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. for extension of time (Swedlow, Stephen)
September 30, 2013 67 Featured Case ORDER: For the reasons that follow, plaintiffs' motion [ 23 ] for preliminary injunction is denied. For the same reasons, the court denies plaintiffs' motion [ 29 ] for expedited discovery. These denials are without prejudice to plaintiffs' right to conduct discovery in the ordinary course of these proceedings or to renew their requests for relief following further proceedings. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 9/30/2013. (For further details see order.) (kj, ) Modified on 9/30/2013 .
September 30, 2013 66 Featured Case ORDER Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 9/30/2013:Mailed notice(rth, )
September 30, 2013 65 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant's motion to dismiss 19 is granted in part and denied in part. Enter Order.Mailed notice (rth, )
August 4, 2013 64 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 7/9/13 before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: TRACEY D. McCULLOUGH, 312-435-5570, Tracey_McCullough@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/26/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/4/2013. (Mccullough, Tracey)
August 4, 2013 63 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 4/30/13 before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. CONTINUED HEARING. Court Reporter Contact Information: TRACEY D. McCULLOUGH, 312-435-5570, Tracey_McCullough@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/26/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/4/2013. (Mccullough, Tracey)
August 4, 2013 62 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 4/29/13 before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. HEARING. Court Reporter Contact Information: TRACEY D. McCULLOUGH, 312-435-5570, Tracey_McCullough@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/26/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/4/2013. (Mccullough, Tracey)
July 12, 2013 61 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Application by John B. Quinn for leave to appear pro hac vice 16 is granted.Mailed notice (rth, )
July 9, 2013 60 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 7/9/2013. Plaintiffs' motion to supplement its Motion for Preliminary Injunction with Newly Discovered Evidence 58 is granted. Mailed notice (rth, )
July 2, 2013 59 NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Stiegel for presentment of motion to supplement, 58 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 7/9/2013 at 08:45 AM. (Stiegel, Michael)
July 2, 2013 58 MOTION by Plaintiffs 5 Star Flash, Inc., Chicago Medallion One LLC, Taxi Affiliation Services LLC, YC1 LLC, Yellow Cab Affiliation Inc., Yellow Group LLC, Your Private Limousine, Inc. to supplement Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction with Newly Discovered Evidence (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Stiegel, Michael)
April 30, 2013 57 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 4/30/2013. Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction 23 is taken under advisement. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim/for lack of jurisdiction 19 is taken under advisement. Mailed notice (rth, )
April 29, 2013 56 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Evidentiary hearing held on 4/29/2013,. Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2013 at 10:00 AM. defendant's motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction 19 and plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction 23 . Each side will be allowed 20 minutes to argue. The entire hearing should take no more than 90 minutes as set forth in open court. Mailed notice (rth, )
April 28, 2013 55 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs 5 Star Flash, Inc., Chicago Medallion One LLC, Taxi Affiliation Services LLC, YC1 LLC, Yellow Cab Affiliation Inc., Yellow Group LLC, Your Private Limousine, Inc. to supplement 54 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Stiegel, Michael)
April 26, 2013 54 SUPPLEMENT to response in opposition to motion, 37 , reply to response to motion, 36 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Swedlow, Stephen)
April 26, 2013 53 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. by Amit Bhikhu Patel (Patel, Amit)
April 16, 2013 52 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 4/16/2013. There being no objection from the parties, pursuant to Local Rule 40.4,defendant's motion to reassign case for relatedness 46 is granted. Plaintiffs' motion to set evidentiary hearing 44 is granted. Evidentiary hearing set to 4/29/2013 at 9:30 a.m.Mailed notice (rth, )
April 16, 2013 51 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 4/16/13 before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Tracey D. McCullough, 312-435-5570, Tracey_Mccullough@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/7/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/17/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2013. (Mccullough, Tracey)
April 16, 2013 50 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 1/31/13 before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Tracey D. McCullough, 312-435-5570, Tracey_Mccullough@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/7/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/17/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2013. (Mccullough, Tracey)
April 15, 2013 49 NOTICE by Uber Technologies, Inc. OF FILING OF JOINT STATUS REPORT IN A RELATED ACTION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Swedlow, Stephen)
April 10, 2013 48 CERTIFICATE of Service by Stephen A. Swedlow on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc. regarding MOTION by Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. to reassign case 46 , notice of motion 47 (Swedlow, Stephen)
April 10, 2013 47 NOTICE of Motion by Stephen A. Swedlow for presentment of motion to reassign case 46 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 4/16/2013 at 08:45 AM. (Swedlow, Stephen)
April 10, 2013 46 MOTION by Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. to reassign case (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Swedlow, Stephen)
April 9, 2013 45 NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Stiegel for presentment of motion for hearing, 44 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 4/16/2013 at 08:45 AM. (Stiegel, Michael)
April 9, 2013 44 MOTION by Plaintiffs 5 Star Flash, Inc., Chicago Medallion One LLC, Taxi Affiliation Services LLC, YC1 LLC, Yellow Cab Affiliation Inc., Yellow Group LLC, Your Private Limousine, Inc. for hearing - Motion to Set Evidentiary Hearing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Stiegel, Michael)
March 27, 2013 43 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiffs' motion for extension of time to file reply 38 is granted. Reply due by 3/25/2013. No appearance required on 3/28/2013.Mailed notice (rth, )
March 25, 2013 42 APPENDIX reply, 40 Electronic Authoritiy (Stiegel, Michael)
March 25, 2013 41 DECLARATION of Norma Reyes (Stiegel, Michael)
March 25, 2013 40 REPLY by Plaintiffs 5 Star Flash, Inc., Chicago Medallion One LLC, Taxi Affiliation Services LLC, YC1 LLC, Yellow Cab Affiliation Inc., Yellow Group LLC, Your Private Limousine, Inc. to motion for preliminary injunction 23 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(Stiegel, Michael)
March 19, 2013 39 NOTICE of Motion by Paul R. Coble for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, 38 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 3/28/2013 at 08:45 AM. (Coble, Paul)
March 15, 2013 38 MOTION by Plaintiffs 5 Star Flash, Inc., Chicago Medallion One LLC, Taxi Affiliation Services LLC, YC1 LLC, Yellow Cab Affiliation Inc., Yellow Group LLC, Your Private Limousine, Inc. for extension of time to file response/reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (UNOPPOSED) (Stiegel, Michael)
March 5, 2013 37 RESPONSE by Uber Technologies, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs 5 Star Flash, Inc., Chicago Medallion One LLC, Taxi Affiliation Services LLC, YC1 LLC, Yellow Cab Affiliation Inc., Yellow Group LLC, Your Private Limousine, Inc. for preliminary injunction 23 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Exhibits A-E, # 3 Appendix Unpublished Authority)(Swedlow, Stephen)
March 5, 2013 36 REPLY by Uber Technologies, Inc. to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIMMOTION by Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction 19 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Appendix Unpublished Authority)(Swedlow, Stephen)
February 12, 2013 35 RESPONSE by 5 Star Flash, Inc., Chicago Medallion One LLC, Taxi Affiliation Services LLC, YC1 LLC, Yellow Cab Affiliation Inc., Yellow Group LLC, Your Private Limousine, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIMMOTION by Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction 19 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E, # 2 Appendix A - Electronic Authorities)(Stiegel, Michael)
February 6, 2013 34 REPLY by Plaintiffs 5 Star Flash, Inc., Chicago Medallion One LLC, Taxi Affiliation Services LLC, YC1 LLC, Yellow Cab Affiliation Inc., Yellow Group LLC, Your Private Limousine, Inc. to motion to expedite 29 [in Support of Their Motion for Expedited Discovery] (Stiegel, Michael)
February 4, 2013 33 MEMORANDUM by Uber Technologies, Inc. in Opposition to motion to expedite 29 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stephen A. Swedlow, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Swedlow, Stephen)
January 31, 2013 32 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 1/31/2013. On plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction 23 , response due by 3/5/2013. Reply due by 3/19/2013. On plaintiff's motion to expedite discovery 29 , Response due by 2/4/2013. Reply due by 2/6/2013. Said motion 29 taken under advisement. Oral argument on defendant's motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction 19 , plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction 23 , and plaintiff's motion to expedite 29 set for 4/29/2013 at 09:30 AM. Parties to advise the court if there will be witnesses.Mailed notice (rth, )
January 28, 2013 31 CERTIFICATE of Service by Michael A. Stiegel on behalf of All Plaintiffs regarding MOTION by Plaintiffs 5 Star Flash, Inc., Chicago Medallion One LLC, Taxi Affiliation Services LLC, YC1 LLC, Yellow Cab Affiliation Inc., Yellow Group LLC, Your Private Limousine, Inc. to expedite discovery 29 , declaration 28 , declaration 25 , MOTION by Plaintiffs 5 Star Flash, Inc., Chicago Medallion One LLC, Taxi Affiliation Services LLC, YC1 LLC, Yellow Cab Affiliation Inc., Yellow Group LLC, Your Private Limousine, Inc. for preliminary injunction 23 , notice of motion 30 , memorandum in support of motion, 24 , declaration 26 , declaration 27 (Stiegel, Michael)
January 28, 2013 30 NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Stiegel for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction 23 , motion to expedite 29 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 1/31/2013 at 08:45 AM. (Stiegel, Michael)
January 28, 2013 29 MOTION by Plaintiffs 5 Star Flash, Inc., Chicago Medallion One LLC, Taxi Affiliation Services LLC, YC1 LLC, Yellow Cab Affiliation Inc., Yellow Group LLC, Your Private Limousine, Inc. to expedite discovery (Stiegel, Michael)
January 28, 2013 28 DECLARATION of Allison Keller regarding motion for preliminary injunction 23 , memorandum in support of motion, 24 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4)(Stiegel, Michael)
January 28, 2013 27 DECLARATION of Henry Elizar regarding motion for preliminary injunction 23 , memorandum in support of motion, 24 (Stiegel, Michael)
January 28, 2013 26 DECLARATION of John Moberg regarding motion for preliminary injunction 23 , memorandum in support of motion, 24 (Stiegel, Michael)
January 28, 2013 25 DECLARATION of Tracy Raimer regarding motion for preliminary injunction 23 , memorandum in support of motion, 24 (Stiegel, Michael)
January 28, 2013 24 MEMORANDUM by 5 Star Flash, Inc., Chicago Medallion One LLC, Taxi Affiliation Services LLC, YC1 LLC, Yellow Cab Affiliation Inc., Yellow Group LLC, Your Private Limousine, Inc. in support of motion for preliminary injunction 23 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-M, # 2 Appendix A - Electronic Authorities)(Stiegel, Michael)
January 28, 2013 23 MOTION by Plaintiffs 5 Star Flash, Inc., Chicago Medallion One LLC, Taxi Affiliation Services LLC, YC1 LLC, Yellow Cab Affiliation Inc., Yellow Group LLC, Your Private Limousine, Inc. for preliminary injunction (Stiegel, Michael)
January 15, 2013 22 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 1/15/2013. Defendant's motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction 12 is stricken as duplicative. On defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction 19 , response due by 2/12/2013. Reply due by 3/5/2013. Status hearing set for 1/25/2013 is stricken and reset to 4/29/2013 at 09:00 AM. The court expects to have ruled on the motion to dismiss by the next status.Mailed notice (rth, )
January 9, 2013 21 NOTICE of Motion by Stephen A. Swedlow for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction 19 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 1/15/2013 at 08:45 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Swedlow, Stephen)
January 7, 2013 20 MEMORANDUM by Uber Technologies, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction 19 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Exhibit 1-4, # 3 Unpublished Authority)(Swedlow, Stephen)
January 7, 2013 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION by Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Swedlow, Stephen)
January 4, 2013 18 RESPONSE by 5 Star Flash, Inc., Chicago Medallion One LLC, Taxi Affiliation Services LLC, YC1 LLC, Yellow Cab Affiliation Inc., Yellow Group LLC, Your Private Limousine, Inc. to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIMMOTION by Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction 12 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Electronic database authority)(Coble, Paul)
December 20, 2012 17 First AMENDED complaint by Chicago Medallion One LLC, Taxi Affiliation Services LLC, Your Private Limousine, Inc., Yellow Cab Affiliation Inc., YC1 LLC, Yellow Group LLC, 5 Star Flash, Inc. against Uber Technologies, Inc. (Stiegel, Michael)
December 11, 2012 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7843753. (Quinn, John)
December 5, 2012 15 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 12/5/2012. On defendant's motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction 12 , response due by 1/4/2013. Reply due by 1/18/2013. Status hearing set for 1/25/2013 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (rth, )
November 28, 2012 14 NOTICE of Motion by Stephen A. Swedlow for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction 12 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 12/5/2012 at 08:45 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Swedlow, Stephen)
November 26, 2012 13 MEMORANDUM by Uber Technologies, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction 12 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5, # 2 Unpublished Authority)(Swedlow, Stephen)
November 26, 2012 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION by Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Swedlow, Stephen)
October 26, 2012 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. by Andrew H. Schapiro (Schapiro, Andrew)
October 26, 2012 10 MOTION by Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. for extension of time (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 26, 2012 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. by Stephen A. Swedlow (Swedlow, Stephen)
October 8, 2012 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chicago Medallion One LLC, Taxi Affiliation Services LLC, Your Private Limousine, Inc., Yellow Cab Affiliation Inc., YC1 LLC, Yellow Group LLC, 5 Star Flash, Inc. as to All Defendants. (Hall, Carrie)
October 5, 2012 8 MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (jmp, )
October 4, 2012 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. (aee, )
October 4, 2012 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs 5 Star Flash, Inc. d/b/a Flash Cab Company, Chicago Medallion One LLC, Taxi Affiliation Services LLC, YC1 LLC, Yellow Cab Affiliation Inc., Yellow Group LLC, Your Private Limousine, Inc. by Carrie A. Hall (Hall, Carrie)
October 4, 2012 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. (daj, )
October 4, 2012 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs 5 Star Flash, Inc. d/b/a Flash Cab Company, Chicago Medallion One LLC, Taxi Affiliation Services LLC, YC1 LLC, Yellow Cab Affiliation Inc., Yellow Group LLC, Your Private Limousine, Inc. by Paul R. Coble (Coble, Paul)
October 4, 2012 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs 5 Star Flash, Inc. d/b/a Flash Cab Company, Chicago Medallion One LLC, Taxi Affiliation Services LLC, YC1 LLC, Yellow Cab Affiliation Inc., Yellow Group LLC, Your Private Limousine, Inc. by Michael A. Stiegel (Stiegel, Michael)
October 4, 2012 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (Stiegel, Michael)
October 4, 2012 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Stiegel, Michael)
October 4, 2012 1 COMPLAINT filed by Chicago Medallion One LLC, Taxi Affiliation Services LLC, Your Private Limousine, Inc., Yellow Cab Affiliation Inc., YC1 LLC, Yellow Group LLC, 5 Star Flash, Inc. d/b/a Flash Cab Company; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-7622103.(Stiegel, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yellow Group LLC et al v. Uber Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yellow Group LLC
Represented By: Paul R. Coble
Represented By: Carrie A. Hall
Represented By: Michael A. Stiegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yellow Cab Affiliation Inc.
Represented By: Paul R. Coble
Represented By: Carrie A. Hall
Represented By: Michael A. Stiegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taxi Affiliation Services LLC
Represented By: Paul R. Coble
Represented By: Carrie A. Hall
Represented By: Michael A. Stiegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YC1 LLC
Represented By: Paul R. Coble
Represented By: Carrie A. Hall
Represented By: Michael A. Stiegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 5 Star Flash, Inc.
Represented By: Paul R. Coble
Represented By: Carrie A. Hall
Represented By: Michael A. Stiegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chicago Medallion One LLC
Represented By: Paul R. Coble
Represented By: Carrie A. Hall
Represented By: Michael A. Stiegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Your Private Limousine, Inc.
Represented By: Paul R. Coble
Represented By: Carrie A. Hall
Represented By: Michael A. Stiegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Represented By: Stephen A. Swedlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?