Rush v. Dart
Plaintiff: Marcus Rush
Defendant: Tom Dart
Case Number: 1:2012cv08727
Filed: October 31, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Du Page
Presiding Judge: Samuel Der-Yeghiayan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 2/12/2013: Plaintiff was warned that if he failed to pay the filing fee or file an accurately and properly completed in forma pauperis application form with an updated prison trust acc ount statement by February 5, 2013, this case would be dismissed. The deadline has passed, and Plaintiff has failed to pay the filing fee or file an accurately and properly completed in forma pauperis application form with an updated prison trust account statement by February 5, 2013. Therefore, the instant action is dismissed. Civil case terminated. [For further details see opinion.] Mailed notice.(np, )
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 1/8/2013: Since Plaintiff is proceeding pro se, the court will grant Plaintiff one final extension. The in forma pauperis application form filed December 17, 2012 9 , is stricken with out prejudice. Plaintiff is given until February 5, 2013, to either pay the filing fee or file an accurately and properly completed in forma pauperis application form with an updated prison trust account statement. Plaintiff is warned that if he fail s to pay the filing fee or file an accurately and properly completed in forma pauperis application form with an updated prison trust account statement by February 5, 2013, this case will be dismissed. [For further details see opinion.] Mailed notice. (np, )
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 12/11/2012: The docket in this case indicates that a notice of change of address was entered in this case, and that on November 27, 2012, the Clerk's Office mailed Plaintiff anoth er copy of this court's November 7, 2012 ruling. Since Plaintiff is proceeding pro se and is incarcerated, the court will extend the deadlines in this case. Plaintiff is given until January 3, 2013, to either pay the filing fee or file an accura tely and properly completed in forma pauperis application form within an updated prison trust account statement. Plaintiff is warned that if he fails to pay the filing fee of file an accurately and properly completed in forma pauperis application form with an updated prison trust account statement by January 3, 2013, this case will be dismissed. [For further details see order.] Signed by the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 12/11/2012. Mailed notice. (np, )
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 11/7/2012: For the reasons stated below, Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis 3 is denied. Plaintiff is given until December 11, 2012, to either pay the fil ing fee or file an accurately and properly completed in forma pauperis application form with an updated prison trust account statement. Plaintiff is warned that if he fails to pay the filing fee or file an accurately and properly completed in forma pauperis application form with an updated prison trust account statement by December 11, 2012, this case will be dismissed. Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel 4 is denied. [For further details see opinion] Mailed notice. (np, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rush v. Dart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Dart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?