Artunduaga v. The University of Chicago Medical Center et al

Plaintiff: Maria Artunduaga
Defendant: The University of Chicago Medical Center and David Song
Case Number: 1:2012cv08733
Filed: October 31, 2012
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: James B. Zagel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2017 290 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 4/13/2017:Mailed notice(kef, )
December 21, 2016 240 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 12/21/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
December 8, 2016 217 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 12/8/2016:Mailed notice(kef, )
June 19, 2015 101 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable James B. Zagel on 6/19/2015. Mailed notice(ep, )
May 16, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable James B. Zagel on 5/16/2013. Mailed notice(ep, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Artunduaga v. The University of Chicago Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Artunduaga
Represented By: Alejandro Caffarelli
Represented By: Madeline Kate Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University of Chicago Medical Center
Represented By: Michael G. Cleveland
Represented By: Andrea Louise Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Song
Represented By: Michael G. Cleveland
Represented By: Andrea Louise Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?