Loggerhead Tools, LLC v. Sears Holdings Corporation

Plaintiff: Loggerhead Tools, LLC
Defendant: Sears Holdings Corporation
Case Number: 1:2012cv09033
Filed: November 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John F. Grady
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 524 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/20/2018. Mailed notice. (etv, )
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 492 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 12/22/2017. Mailed notice. (etv, )
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 389 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 11/15/2016. (bg, )
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 375 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 9/20/2016. (bg, )
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on August 27, 2015. Mailed notice (ph, )
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 1/22/2015. (jh, )
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on November 6, 2013. Mailed notice (mgh, )
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 5/1/2013.(pcs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loggerhead Tools, LLC v. Sears Holdings Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loggerhead Tools, LLC
Represented By: Tejal P. Fowler
Represented By: Mark M. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears Holdings Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?