1st Technology, LLC v. Facebook Featured Case
Plaintiff: 1st Technology, LLC
Defendant: Facebook
Case Number: 1:2012cv09104
Filed: November 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2012 Filing 8 MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (mr, )
November 19, 2012 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4l(1)(1)(A)(i), Plaintiff voluntarily dismisses this action without prejudice. Mailed notice (tbk, )
November 16, 2012 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 1st Technology, LLC (La Porte, Michael)
November 14, 2012 Filing 5 MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (mr, )
November 13, 2012 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. (nsf, )
November 13, 2012 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff 1st Technology, LLC by William W. Flachsbart (Flachsbart, William)
November 13, 2012 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff 1st Technology, LLC by Michael R. La Porte (La Porte, Michael)
November 13, 2012 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (La Porte, Michael)
November 13, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by 1st Technology, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-7749387.(La Porte, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1st Technology, LLC v. Facebook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1st Technology, LLC
Represented By: William W. Flachsbart
Represented By: Michael R. La Porte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?