Great Northern Insurance Company, et al v. Cellar Advisors, LLC

Plaintiff: Great Northern Insurance Company
Defendant: Cellar Advisors, LLC
Case Number: 1:2012cv09343
Filed: November 21, 2012
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: James B. Zagel
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 18, 2016 206 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, Flagship's Motion for New Trial 180 and Motion for Remittitur 181 are both denied. Ruling set for 9/13/16 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Signed by the Honorable James B. Zagel on 8/18/2016. Mailed notice(ep, )
March 14, 2016 160 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, CA's Rule 26(a)(2) disclosure (Exhibit 24) is admissible into evidence as an admission by a party opponent. Although Exhibit 24 is admissible, CA is not bound to it, a point that I have already made clear when I ruled on Flagship's motion for summary judgment. See Order for further details. Signed by the Honorable James B. Zagel on 3/14/2016. Mailed notice(ep, )
May 6, 2015 131 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable James B. Zagel on 5/6/2015. Mailed notice(ep, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Northern Insurance Company, et al v. Cellar Advisors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul R Bartolacci
Represented By: Kevin John Hughes
Represented By: Marisa L. Saber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cellar Advisors, LLC
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Fozo
Represented By: Joseph R. Vallort
Represented By: Jon Yambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?